Flores v. Cruz, et al.
Plaintiff: Carlos Manuel Flores
Defendant: Cruz, - Custer, Gonzalez, Rivera, Garza, Nichols and Lomeli
Case Number: 1:2015cv01184
Filed: July 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss his claim against Defendant Cruz be Granted, without prejudice re 48 MOTION to DISMISS filed by Carlos Manuel Flores ; referred to Judge Drozd,signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/12/18. Objections to F&R due by 2/2/2018 (Martin-Gill, S)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/13/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due within Fourteen Days. (Sant Agata, S)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 20 23 Motions for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/26/2017. (Flores, E)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 29 Motion for Summary Judgment, without prejudice as premature; ORDER Setting Deadline for Motion for Evidentiary Determination on Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 09/19/17. (Defendant deadline: 09/29/2017) (Martin-Gill, S)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND DECLINING TO ADOPT IN PART 34 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 17 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/13/2017. (Jessen, A)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign District Judge to Action; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 17 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment for the Failure to Exhaust Available Administrative Remedies be GRANTED re [ 1] Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/8/2017. This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The new case number is 1:15-cv-01184-DAD-BAM (PC) Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting Defendant's 17 Motion to Stay Discovery; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 19 Motion to Proceed with Pretrial Discovery, and Plaintiff's 22 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 01/30/2017. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores v. Cruz, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Manuel Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Custer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lomeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?