Flores v. Cruz, et al.
Plaintiff: |
Carlos Manuel Flores |
Defendant: |
Cruz, - Custer, Gonzalez, Rivera, Garza, Nichols and Lomeli |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv01184 |
Filed: |
July 30, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Fresno Office |
County: |
Kern |
Presiding Judge: |
Barbara A. McAuliffe |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 16, 2018 |
Filing
49
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss his claim against Defendant Cruz be Granted, without prejudice re 48 MOTION to DISMISS filed by Carlos Manuel Flores ; referred to Judge Drozd,signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/12/18. Objections to F&R due by 2/2/2018 (Martin-Gill, S)
|
December 13, 2017 |
Filing
47
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/13/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due within Fourteen Days. (Sant Agata, S)
|
September 27, 2017 |
Filing
45
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 20 23 Motions for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/26/2017. (Flores, E)
|
September 19, 2017 |
Filing
42
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 29 Motion for Summary Judgment, without prejudice as premature; ORDER Setting Deadline for Motion for Evidentiary Determination on Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 09/19/17. (Defendant deadline: 09/29/2017) (Martin-Gill, S)
|
September 14, 2017 |
Filing
39
ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND DECLINING TO ADOPT IN PART 34 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 17 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/13/2017. (Jessen, A)
|
August 9, 2017 |
Filing
34
ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign District Judge to Action; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 17 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment for the Failure to Exhaust Available Administrative Remedies be GRANTED re [ 1] Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/8/2017. This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The new case number is 1:15-cv-01184-DAD-BAM (PC) Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
|
January 30, 2017 |
Filing
27
ORDER Granting Defendant's 17 Motion to Stay Discovery; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 19 Motion to Proceed with Pretrial Discovery, and Plaintiff's 22 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 01/30/2017. (Flores, E)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?