Corena v. Holland et al
Plaintiff: Jorge Corena
Defendant: Kim Holland, Fiddler, Smith, Jones, Rodriguez, Cerveza, Winifred Kokor and Ugawueze
Case Number: 1:2016cv01025
Filed: July 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion to enforce settlement agreement, without prejudice 111 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/22/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 109 Request for Transcript of Confidential Settlement Terms and Proceedings, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/18/19. (Gonzalez, R)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Directing the Clerk of Court to Close the Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/11/19. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Granting 100 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 05/23/2019. (Flores, E)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Plaintiff Jorge Corena, CDCR #AI-8181, to Settlement Conference on June 6, 2019 at 9:00 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 05/20/2019. (Flores, E)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/20/2019. (Dunbar-Kari, K)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Requiring Settlement Conference and Directing Defense Counsel to Contact ADR Coordinator, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/16/19. (Gonzalez, R)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Adopting 89 Findings and Recommendations re 51 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/15/19. (Gonzalez, R)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Defendant's 51 Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted in Part, and that Plaintiff be Deemed to have Exhausted his Available Administrative Remedies as to One Claim; Objections, if any, Due within Fourteen (14) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/17/2019. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Sant Agata, S)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE and ORDER that Inmate Witness is No Longer Needed as Witness in these Proceedings, and that the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is DISCHARGED as to Jorge Corena signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/27/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Jorge Corena, CDCR #AI-8181 on 03/27/2019 at 11:00a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/7/19. (Gonzalez, R)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 77 Motion for Attendance of Witnesses, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/1/19. (Gonzalez, R)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER ADOPTING 73 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 02/14/2019. (Flores, E)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending that Plaintiff's 70 Motion for Preliminary Injunction be Denied, without Prejudice to Plaintiff Filing a Separate Action Based on his Allegations and Seeking Injunctive Relief in that Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/8/19. Referred to Judge O'Neill. 21-Day Objections Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Requiring Evidentiary Hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/20/18. (Marrujo, C)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 49 Request for Court to Forward Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/16/2018. (Flores, E)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER following hearing and status conference re 39 , 43 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/17/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting Defendant's 44 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Lodge Documentary Support for In Camara Review signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 09/11/2018. (Flores, E)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Requiring Response to Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 08/28/2018. Seven-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Following Initial Scheduling Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/27/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Adopting 22 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/19/18. (Gonzalez, R)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Claims Consistent with Magistrate Judge's Prior Order in Light of Williams Decision signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/08/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd; Fourteen-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED SCREENING ORDER; ORDER Finding Cognizable Claims Against Defendants Rodriguez, Cerveza, and Doe for Excessive Force in Violation of the Eighth Amendment, Against Defendant Doe for Failure to Protect in Violation of the Eighth Amendment, and Against Defendants Rodriguez and Doe for Retaliation in Violation of the First Amendment, and Dismissing all other Claims and Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 09/26/2017. (Flores, E)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 10 Motion for Extension of Time and ORDER DENYING without prejudice Plaintiff's 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 03/07/17.(30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corena v. Holland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Corena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiddler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerveza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winifred Kokor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ugawueze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?