Flowers v. Davey, et al.
Plaintiff: Rupert Flowers
Defendant: Dave Davey, Clark and McCabe
Case Number: 1:2016cv01363
Filed: September 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADOPTING 18 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Denial of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order; ORDER DENYING 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 09/18/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Action be DISMISSED, With Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim, Failure to Obey a Court Order, and Failure to Prosecute re 10 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/11/2017. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Denial of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order 6 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/18/17: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISCHARGING 12 Order to File Consent or Decline Form or Show Cause Why This Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/3/2017. (Jessen, A)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to FILE Consent or Decline Form or SHOW CAUSE Why this Action should not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute; Twenty-One (21) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/19/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 8 Motion to Supplement Pleadings; ORDER to Clerk of Court to File Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/5/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flowers v. Davey, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rupert Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Davey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?