Johnson v. North Kern State Prison et al
Plaintiff: Cedric Chester Johnson
Defendant: North Kern State Prison, Speakman, K, Rocha and Jones
Case Number: 1:2016cv01371
Filed: September 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending dismissal of action, with prejudice, for failure to prosecute and failure to obey a court order 50 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/30/2018. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd; Objections to F&R due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER requiring Plaintiff to file opposition or statement of non-opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment 46 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/2/2018. 21-Day Filing Deadline. (Lundstrom, T)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DENYING 40 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/18/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER striking 33 Response to Defendant's Answer signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/18/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ADOPTING 15 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS THAT CERTAIN CLAIMS AND DEFENDANTS BE DISMISSED AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BE ALLOWED TO PROCEED ON COGNIZABLE CLAIMS signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/21/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 21 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to respond to 20 Order to Show Cause signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/13/2017. (Filing Deadline: 3/20/2017). (Lundstrom, T)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Defendants Rocha, Jones, and Mrs. K Should Not be Dismissed From This Action for Failure to Provide Sufficient Information to Effectuate Service, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/26/17. Show Cause Response Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Certain Claims and Defendants be DISMISSED re 12 First Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/15/2016. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. North Kern State Prison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric Chester Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Kern State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speakman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?