Jeff Walker v. Robles et al
Plaintiff: Jeff Walker
Defendant: David Robles, David Avila, Ed Fernandes, Chan and Audra King
Case Number: 1:2016cv01886
Filed: December 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING Action Without Prejudice and Denying 6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order as Moot; ORDER DIRECTING Case Closure by Court Clerk, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/18/17. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING 9 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; Denying Plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; and Ordering Plaintiff to Pay the Filing Fee in Full signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 08/01/2017. (Flores, E)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Because of Untrue Poverty Allegation 2 , 7 , 8 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/12/17: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Case Should Not be Dismissed Because of Plaintiff's Untrue Allegation of Poverty in Filing for In Forma Pauperis Status signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/8/2017. Show Cause Response due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeff Walker v. Robles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Fernandes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audra King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?