(PC) Gann v. Valley State Prison et al
Plaintiff: Oscar Zelaya, Michael Warzek, Thomas Michael Joseph Fox, Jose Reyes, John F. Weston, Nathaniel Marcus Gann, Carlos Rodolfo Marroquin, Larry Eugene Boyce, Vladimir R. Ebel, David E. Phillips, Manfred Schockner, Alton King, Matthew Wilke Morgan, Jeramie Prier and Melvin Hiram Thomas
Defendant: T. Thornton, Valley State Prison, Timothy Anderson, Keene, Paez, Clements, Raythel Fisher, Jr., California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Statewide Religious Review Committee, Avila-Gonzalez and J. Knight
Case Number: 1:2019cv01797
Filed: December 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 20 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Nathaniel Marcus Gann. (Rivera, O)
February 3, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #19 Order served on Nathaniel Marcus Gann. (Orozco, A)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING Vladimir Ebel's #18 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/3/2020. (Orozco, A)
January 30, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE to Sever from Complaint, by Vladimir R. Ebel. (Marrujo, C)
January 30, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #17 Order, served on Nathaniel Marcus Gann and Manfred Schockner. (Orozco, A)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER STRIKING #14 Consent/Decline Form Filed by Manfred Schockner as Improperly Filed in this Case; ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to Serve a Copy of this Order on Manfred Schockner, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form). (Orozco, A)
January 30, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #16 Order, served on Nathaniel Marcus Gann and Michael R. Warzek. (Orozco, A)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER STRIKING #12 Consent/Decline Form Filed by Michael R. Warzek as Improperly Filed in this Case; ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to Serve a Copy of this Order on Michael R. Warzek, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form). (Orozco, A)
January 30, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #15 Order, served on Nathaniel Marcus Gann and Thomas M.J. Fox. (Orozco, A)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER STRIKING Consent/Decline Form Filed by Thomas M.J. Fox as Improperly Filed in this Case #11 ; ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to Serve a Copy of this Order on Thomas M.J. Fox, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form). (Orozco, A)
January 27, 2020 Filing 14 ***STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER #17 *** CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Orozco, A)
January 10, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Jessen, A)
January 10, 2020 Filing 12 ***STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER #12 *** CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Jessen, A)
January 8, 2020 Filing 11 ***STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER #15 *** CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Jessen, A)
January 7, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint served on Nathaniel Marcus Gann. (Jessen, A)
January 7, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order served on Nathaniel Marcus Gann. (Jessen, A)
January 7, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order on Motions served on Larry Eugene Boyce, Vladimir R. Ebel, Thomas Michael Joseph Fox, Nathaniel Marcus Gann, Alton King, Carlos Rodolfo Marroquin, Matthew Wilke Morgan, David E. Phillips, Jeramie Prier, Jose Reyes, Manfred Schockner, Melvin Hiram Thomas, Michael Warzek, John F. Weston, Oscar Zelaya. (Jessen, A)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SEVERING Plaintiffs' Claims and Directing Clerk to Open New Actions for Fourteen Plaintiffs Pursuant to This Order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/6/2020. First Amended Complaint due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form). (Jessen, A)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Exception to the 25-Page Limit for the Complaint Filed on December 26, 2019; and ORDER DENYING #5 Motion for Class Certification signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/6/2020. (Jessen, A)
January 3, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, served on Nathaniel Marcus Gann (Orozco, A).
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Nathaniel Marcus Gann's #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; ORDER DIRECTING Payment of Inmate Filing Fee by California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 01/03/2020. (Orozco, A)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on VSP. (Rivera, O)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *12/26/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 2/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Rivera, O)
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Class Certification by Nathaniel Marcus Gann. (Rivera, O)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for E-filing Procedures Exception, Page Limitation. by Nathaniel Marcus Gann. (Rivera, O)
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Nathaniel Marcus Gann. (Rivera, O)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Nathaniel Marcus Gann. (Rivera, O)
December 26, 2019 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Timothy Anderson, Avila-Gonzalez, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Statewide Religious Review Committee, Clements, Raythel Fisher, Jr, Keene, J. Knight, Paez, J. Thornton, Valley State Prison by Thomas Michael Joseph Fox, Larry Eugene Boyce, Melvin Hiram Thomas, Nathaniel Marcus Gann, Carlos Rodolfo Marroquin, John F. Weston, David E. Phillips, Manfred Schockner, Jeramie Prier, Vladimir R. Ebel, Oscar Zelaya, Michael Warzek, Jose Reyes, Matthew Wilke Morgan, Alton King. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rivera, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Gann v. Valley State Prison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Zelaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Warzek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Michael Joseph Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John F. Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Marcus Gann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Rodolfo Marroquin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Eugene Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vladimir R. Ebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David E. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manfred Schockner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alton King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Wilke Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeramie Prier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Hiram Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raythel Fisher, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Statewide Religious Review Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avila-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?