(PC) Villareal v. Hernandez et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Villareal
Defendant: D.B. Hernandez, Hampton, Wolfe and Butler
Case Number: 1:2022cv01376
Filed: October 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Ana de Alba
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2022 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Ana de Alba and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The new case number is: 1:22-cv-01376-ADA-BAM (PC). (Rivera, O)
November 18, 2022 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rivera, O)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; ORDER DIRECTING Payment of Inmate Filing Fee by California Department of Corrections, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Rivera, O)
November 18, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: 6 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Anthony Villareal. (Rivera, O)
November 18, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Anthony Villareal. (Rivera, O)
October 28, 2022 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 12/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Flores, E)
October 28, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Anthony Villareal. (Flores, E)
October 26, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Anthony Villareal. (Flores, E)
October 26, 2022 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Butler, Hampton, D.B. Hernandez, Wolfe by Anthony Villareal.(Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Villareal v. Hernandez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Villareal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.B. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?