Elmore v. Arong et al
Plaintiff: Tonie Elmore
Defendant: - Arong, - Davidson, Wedell, Mitchell, - Latteri, Williams, Heintschel, Garcia, Maxham, Moreno, Pereira, - Stiles, - Hawkins, May, MacNeil, - Knipp, Bunnell, Rendon and Kernan
Case Number: 2:2007cv01463
Filed: July 23, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 12/17/10 ORDERING that, re 80 F&Rs, dft Turella's 70 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. (Benson, A.)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/9/2010 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 41(b). Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections due w/in 21 days. (Yin, K)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/05/10 ordering that within 21 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition, if any, to the motion for summary judgment. (Plummer, M)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/24/10 ordering within 5 days of the date of this order, defendant Turella shall re-serve plaintiff with his summary judgment motion and file proof of service with the court. Plaintiff's opposition to defendant's summary judgment motion is due within 30 days of the date of this order. (Plummer, M)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 6/23/10 ORDERING that the 69 Findings and Recommendations are ADOPTED in full; the 48 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to Defts Maxham, Moreno, Rendon, and Perfino. (Owen, K)
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/20/2010 RECOMMENDING that the 48 motion for summary judgment filed by Perfino, Rendon, Moreno, Maxham be granted. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due w/in 21 days. (Yin, K)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/4/10 ORDERING that 55 Motion for law library access, construed as a protective order is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff is granted 21 days from the date of service of this order to file an opposition to defendants motion for summary judgment. No more extensions will be granted. (Dillon, M)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/26/10 RECOMMENDING that 36 MOTION to DISMISS be denied, and defendant be directed to file an answer within 30 days of any order adopting these findings and recommendations. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 01/12/10 denying 54 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Defendants Maxham, Moreno, Rendon and Perfino shall file a response to plaintiff's 12/09/09 motion for a preliminary injunction no later than 14 days from the date of this order. Plaintiff's 12/21/09, 01/04/10 and 01/07/10 motions 56 , 57 , 58 are granted to the extent that plaintiff has 60 days from the date this order is served to file and serve a response to defendants' motion for summary judgment. The court does not intend to grant additional requests for extensions of time. (Plummer, M)
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/4/09 ORDERING that pltf's 51 request for appointment of counsel is DENIED; and w/in 21 days, pltf to file either an opposition or statement of non-opposition to the 48 motion for summary judgment, pltf's failure to comply will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed under F.R.Civ.P. 41(b). (Yin, K)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/29/09 ORDERING that w/in 20 days pltf to file either an opposition or statment of no opposition to the 48 motion for summary judgment.(Yin, K)
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/5/09 GRANTING 24 and 25 Requests. Defendants have until 3/9/09 to file a responsive pleading.(Dillon, M)
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 01/22/09 ADOPTING 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiff's claims against defendants Wedell, Heintschell, Williamson, May, Kaley and Hawkins are DISMISSED without prejudice. (Streeter, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elmore v. Arong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonie Elmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Arong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wedell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Latteri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heintschel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pereira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Stiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MacNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Knipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bunnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?