ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal et al v. Bowen et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, John Doe #1 and National Organization for Marriage California PAC
Defendant: Debra Bowen, Edmund G. Brown, Jr., Dean C. Logan, Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco, Jan Scully, Eileen M Teichert, Ross Johnson, Timothy Hodson, Eugene Huguenin, Jr., Robert Leidigh, Ray Remy, Dennis J. Herrera, Lynn Montgomery, Ronald Rotunda, Ann Ravel, Sean Eskovitz and Kamala Harris
Case Number: 2:2009cv00058
Filed: January 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Constitutional - State Statute Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2018 Filing 315 NOTICE of Disassociation of Counsel by Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco. (Lee, Mollie)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 314 JUDGMENT dated *8/19/14* entered pursuant to order signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 8/18/14. (Kastilahn, A)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 8/18/14 ORDERING that the Court now vacates its decision and judgment in Defendant's favor on Plaintiff's as-applied challenges only and instead dismisses those causes of action as non-justiciable. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 8/19/2014 (Kastilahn, A). (cc: USCA)
August 4, 2014 Filing 312 NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL by Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco, Dennis J. Herrera. Attorney Givner, Jonathan added. (Givner, Jonathan)
July 25, 2014 Filing 311 USCA MANDATE as to #297 Notice of Appeal ORDERING that The decision of the District Court is AFFIRMED in part; DISMISSED in part; and REMANDED with instructions. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 20, 2014 Filing 310 OPINION of USCA as to #297 Notice of Appeal, filed by National Organization for Marriage California PAC, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, John Doe #1: Decision of the District Court AFFIRMED in part; DISMISSED in part; and REMANDED with instructions. (Kaminski, H) Modified on 7/16/2014 (Kaminski, H).
August 16, 2013 Filing 309 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE: Attorney Tamar Pachter ADDED for Debra Bowen; Attorney Daniel J. Powell TERMINATED. (Pachter, Tamar) Modified on 8/19/2013 (Michel, G).
August 30, 2012 Filing 308 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Sean Eskovitz, Ann Ravel, Ray Remy, Ronald Rotunda. Attorney Rowan, Heather M. added. (Rowan, Heather)
July 10, 2012 Filing 307 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND EMAIL ADDRESSES by All Plaintiffs. (Hacker, David) Modified on 7/11/2012 (Michel, G).
June 1, 2012 Filing 306 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL of COUNSEL as to attorney Noel H. Johnson by all plaintiffs. (Bopp, James) Modified on 6/4/2012 (Marciel, M)
March 23, 2012 Filing 305 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Kaylan Phillips as Counsel by All Plaintiffs. (Phillips, Kaylan)
January 6, 2012 Filing 304 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by CRD S. Deutsch for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court is in receipt of the Motion to Withdraw as Attorney #303 . The Motion as filed is deficient and is directed to be renoticed in compliance with Local Rule 230(a). Accordingly, the motion is terminated. (Deutsch, S)
January 5, 2012 Filing 303 MOTION to WITHDRAW as ATTORNEY by National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8. Attorney La Rue, Joseph Eugene added. (La Rue, Joseph)
December 21, 2011 Filing 302 USCA CASE NUMBER 11-17884 for #297 Notice of Appeal, filed by National Organization for Marriage California PAC, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, John Doe #1. (Zignago, K.)
December 20, 2011 Filing 301 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by John Doe #1, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8 re #297 Notice of Appeal, (Phillips, Kaylan)
December 13, 2011 Filing 300 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 20, 2011, before Judge Morrison C. England, Jr, filed by Court Reporter Diane Shepard, Phone number 916-554-7460 E-mail diane.shepard@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 1/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/12/2012. (Shepard, D)
December 5, 2011 Filing 299 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re #297 Notice of Appeal, filed by National Organization for Marriage California PAC, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, John Doe #1. Filed dates for Notice of Appeal *12/02/11*, Complaint *05/28/09* and Appealed Order / Judgment *11/04/11*. Court Reporter: *D. Shepard; J. Anderson,*. *Fee Status: Paid on 12/02/11 in the amount of $455.00* ** (Attachments: #1 Appeal Information) (Benson, A.)
December 5, 2011 RECEIPT number #CAE200040477 $455.00 by James Bopp Jr on 12/5/2011. (Becknal, R)
December 2, 2011 Filing 297 NOTICE of APPEAL by John Doe #1, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8 as to #296 Judgment, #295 Order Dismissing Case,. Attorney Phillips, Kaylan L. added. (Phillips, Kaylan)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 296 (VACATED, per #313 Order) JUDGMENT dated *11/4/2011* in favor of Defendants against Plaintiffs pursuant to order signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/4/2011. (Michel, G) Modified on 8/19/2014 (Kastilahn, A).
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 295 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/4/2011 DENYING Plaintiffs' #245 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING Defendants' #259 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING Defendants' #271 Motion to Strike as moot. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G)
November 2, 2011 Filing 294 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney by Debra Bowen, Kamala D. Harris. Attorney Powell, Daniel J. added. (Powell, Daniel)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 293 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/24/2011 ORDERING the Court hereby CONFIRMS for the record that the Court's ruling at the hearing on Thursday, 10/20/2011, was preliminary ONLY. The basis for the Court's decision and any statements the Court made on the record do not bind the Court or form the basis for the Court's ultimate decision, which, as stated at the hearing, will ultimately be documented in a formal written order. Until the formal order is issued, there is no final judgment in this matter.(Reader, L)
October 20, 2011 Filing 292 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Judge Morrison C. England, Jr: After hearing argument from counsel, the Court denied Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment #245 , denied Defendants' Motion to Strike #271 , and granted Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment #259 . A formal order will follow. Plaintiffs' Counsel Joseph La Rue and David Hacker present. Defendants' Counsel Lawrence Woodlock, Mollie Lee, Jonathan Givner, Zackery Morazzini, Kristina Hall, Daniel Powell present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Diane Shepard. Interpreter None present. (Deutsch, S)
October 19, 2011 Filing 291 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by John Doe #1, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bopp, James)
October 19, 2011 RECEIPT number #CAE2000139401 for $180.00 for Pro Hac Vice for Noel H. Johnson to appear for pltfs from James Bopp, Jr. #274 (Reader, L)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 289 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/14/11. Added attorney Noel H. Johnson, PHV for ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 288 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/14/2011 re #281 Pro Hac Vice Application and Proposed Order. Added attorney Joseph Eugene La Rue, PHV for Plaintiffs Protect Marriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal and National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage. (Waggoner, D)
October 13, 2011 Filing 287 REPLY by Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco, Dennis J. Herrera to RESPONSE to #259 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Lee, Mollie)
October 13, 2011 Filing 286 REPLY by Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco, Dennis J. Herrera to RESPONSE to #271 Motion to Strike plaintiffs' Exhibits 3 & 4 in support of Motion for Summary Judgment. (Lee, Mollie)
October 11, 2011 Filing 285 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by CRD S. Deutsch for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment #245 , Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment #259 and Defendants' Motion to Strike #271 , areconfirmed for oral argument on 10/20/2011 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 7. Counsel are order to personally appear. Telephonic appearances are disallowed for these motion hearings. (Deutsch, S)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 284 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/6/2011 ADDING attorney Kaylan L. Phillips, PHV for National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8. (Michel, G)
October 7, 2011 Filing 283 AMENDED DOCUMENT by John Doe #1, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8: Amended #274 Pro Hac Vice Application and Proposed Order,. (Hacker, David)
October 6, 2011 RECEIPT number CAE200039056 for $180.00 for Pro Hac Vice Aopl for Joseph E La Rue from James Bopp, Jr.. (Kastilahn, A)
October 5, 2011 Filing 281 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by John Doe #1, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8 for attorney Joseph E. La Rue to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Hacker, David)
October 4, 2011 RECEIPT number CAE200038979 for $180 for Pro Hac Vice Appl #279 Kaylan L. Phillips from James Bopp, Jr.. (Kastilahn, A)
October 3, 2011 Filing 279 AMENDED DOCUMENT by John Doe #1, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8: Amended #273 Pro Hac Vice Application and Proposed Order,. (Hacker, David)
September 29, 2011 Filing 278 RESPONSE by plts to #262 dfts' Objections to plts' Evidence. (Bopp, James) Modified on 9/29/2011 (Duong, D).
September 29, 2011 Filing 277 OPPOSITION by plts to #271 dfts' Motion to Strike plaintiffs' Exhibits 3 & 4 in support of Motion for Summary Judgment. (Bopp, James)
September 29, 2011 Filing 276 RESPONSE by plts to #269 dfts' Statement of Undisputed Facts. (Bopp, James) Modified on 9/29/2011 (Duong, D).
September 29, 2011 Filing 275 REPLY in support of #245 plts' Motion for Summary Judgment and OPPOSITION by plts to #259 dfts' Motion for Summary Judgment . (Bopp, James) Modified on 9/29/2011 (Duong, D).
September 26, 2011 Filing 274 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by John Doe #1, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8 for attorney Noel H. Johnson to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Hacker, David)
September 26, 2011 Filing 273 (DISREGARD and refer to [279 Amended Pro Hac Vice Appl.) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by John Doe #1, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8 for attorney Kaylan L. Phillips to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Hacker, David Jonathan added. (Hacker, David) Modified on 10/4/2011 (Kastilahn, A).
September 20, 2011 Filing 272 ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: Added attorney Zackery Paul Morazzini for Sean Eskovitz,Zackery Paul Morazzini for Lynn Montgomery,Zackery Paul Morazzini for Ann Ravel,Zackery Paul Morazzini for Ronald Rotunda. (Woodlock, Lawrence)
September 15, 2011 Filing 271 MOTION to STRIKE plaintiffs' Exhibits 3 and 4 in support of their Motion for Summary Judgment by defendants. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2011 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Lee, Mollie) Modified on 9/27/2011 (Marciel, M).
September 15, 2011 Filing 270 RESPONSE by Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco, Dennis J. Herrera to #251 Statement of Undisputed Facts by Plaintiffs. (Lee, Mollie) Modified on 9/22/2011 (Meuleman, A).
September 15, 2011 Filing 269 STATEMENT of Undisputed Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco, Dennis J. Herrera re #259 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Lee, Mollie)
September 15, 2011 Filing 268 DECLARATION of Chris Reynolds in SUPPORT OF #259 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Lee, Mollie)
September 15, 2011 Filing 267 DECLARATION of Paul Mandabach in SUPPORT OF #259 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Signature page, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Lee, Mollie)
September 15, 2011 Filing 266 DECLARATION of Daniel Martinez Hosang in SUPPORT OF #259 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Lee, Mollie)
September 15, 2011 Filing 265 DECLARATION of Lynda Cassady in SUPPORT OF #259 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Lee, Mollie)
September 15, 2011 Filing 264 DECLARATION of William N. Eskridge in SUPPORT OF #259 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Lee, Mollie)
September 15, 2011 Filing 263 DECLARATION of Mollie M. Lee in SUPPORT OF #259 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Lee, Mollie)
September 15, 2011 Filing 262 OBJECTIONS by Defendants Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco, Dennis J. Herrera to #255 Notice of Intent to Offer Evidence under FRE 807. (Lee, Mollie) Modified on 9/22/2011 (Meuleman, A).
September 15, 2011 Filing 261 STATEMENT of Position by Defendant Jan Scully re #259 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #245 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Cassidy, Terence)
September 15, 2011 Filing 260 MEMORANDUM by Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco, Dennis J. Herrera in SUPPORT of #259 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Lee, Mollie)
September 15, 2011 Filing 259 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco, Dennis J. Herrera. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2011 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Lee, Mollie)
September 6, 2011 Filing 258 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by John Doe #1, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8. (Bopp, James)
September 1, 2011 Filing 256 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel Jared M. Haynie by plts. (Haynie, Jared) Modified on 9/2/2011 (Duong, D).
August 31, 2011 Filing 257 SEALED EVENT (Donati, J)
August 25, 2011 Filing 255 NOTICE of Intent to Offer Evidence under FRE 807 by John Doe #1, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8. (Haynie, Jared)
August 25, 2011 Filing 254 NOTICE of Filing (Sealed) Reference List by John Doe #1, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8 re #192 Stipulation and Order, #88 Order, Terminate Motions, #29 Order,,. (Haynie, Jared)
August 25, 2011 Filing 253 NOTICE of Conventional Filing (Video) by John Doe #1, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8 re #246 Memorandum in Support of Motion,. (Haynie, Jared) (1 audio/video disc rec'd and routed to file room) Modified on 9/2/2011 (Benson, A.).
August 25, 2011 Filing 252 NOTICE of Conventional Filing (Audio) by John Doe #1, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8 re #246 Memorandum in Support of Motion,. (Haynie, Jared) (1 audio/video disc rec'd and routed to file room) Modified on 9/2/2011 (Benson, A.).
August 25, 2011 Filing 251 STATEMENT of Undisputed Facts by Plaintiffs John Doe #1, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8 re #246 Memorandum in Support of Motion,. (Haynie, Jared)
August 25, 2011 Filing 250 EXHIBIT 4, Part 13 by John Doe #1, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8 re #246 Memorandum in Support of Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, Part 14, #2 Exhibit 4, Part 15, #3 Exhibit 4, Part 16)(Haynie, Jared)
August 25, 2011 Filing 249 EXHIBIT 4, Part 9 by John Doe #1, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8 re #246 Memorandum in Support of Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, Part 10, #2 Exhibit 4, Part 11, #3 Exhibit 4, Part 12)(Haynie, Jared)
August 25, 2011 Filing 248 EXHIBIT 4, Part 5 by John Doe #1, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8 re #246 Memorandum in Support of Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, Part 6, #2 Exhibit 4, Part 7, #3 Exhibit 4, Part 8)(Haynie, Jared)
August 25, 2011 Filing 247 EXHIBIT 4, Part 1 by John Doe #1, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8 re #246 Memorandum in Support of Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, Part 2, #2 Exhibit 4, Part 3, #3 Exhibit 4, Part 4)(Haynie, Jared)
August 25, 2011 Filing 246 MEMORANDUM by John Doe #1, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8 in SUPPORT of #245 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Part 1 of 2), #2 Exhibit 1, Part 2 of 2 #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Haynie, Jared) Modified on 8/26/2011 (Meuleman, A).
August 25, 2011 Filing 245 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by John Doe #1, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Haynie, Jared)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/15/11 ORDERING that having reviewed Pltfs' request to extend the pg limitations for briefing set in the Court's Second Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order #225 filed 6/3/10, and good cause appearing, the Court's Scheduling Order is modified as follows: the points and authorities submitted in support of the Pltfs' Motion for Summary Judgment may be up to 40 pgs; the opposition points and authorities to Pltfs' Motion for Summary Judgment may also be up to 40 pgs; and this order does not affect the Scheduling Order as it relates to the applicable pg limit for Pltfs' reply brief. (Becknal, R)
August 11, 2011 Filing 243 REQUEST for Additional Pages for Plaintiffs' Opening Summary Judgment Brief by John Doe #1, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8. Attorney Haynie, Jared M. added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haynie, Jared)
July 26, 2011 Filing 242 DESIGNATION/DISCLOSURE of EXPERT WITNESS by Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco, Dennis J. Herrera. (Lee, Mollie)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/14/11 ORDERING the removal of Dan Schnur, Edmund G. Brown, Jr and Timothy Hodson as defendants; and adding Ann Ravel, Sean Eskovitz and Kamala D. Harris as defendants. (Meuleman, A)
July 7, 2011 Filing 240 NOTICE of Substitution of Parties and Amendment of Caption by Edmund G. Brown, Jr, Timothy Hodson, Eugene Huguenin, Jr, Lynn Montgomery, Ronald Rotunda. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rowan, Heather) Modified on 7/8/2011 (Zignago, K.).
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 239 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/26/2011 ORDERING #237 Attorney Jared M. Haynie, for National Organization for Marriage California-Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, and ProtectMarriage.com-Yes on 8. (Reader, L)
December 29, 2010 RECEIPT number #CAE200031967 $180.00 fbo Jared M. Haynie by James Bopp Jr., re Pro Hac Vice Application #237 . (Becknal, R)
December 29, 2010 RECEIPT number #CAE200031967 $180.00 fbo Jared M. Haynie by James Bopp Jr., re Pro Hac Vice Application 237 . (Becknal, R)
December 22, 2010 Filing 237 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8 for attorney Jared Haynie to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Hacker, David)
December 22, 2010 Filing 236 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by David Jonathan Hacker on behalf of National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8. Attorney Hacker, David Jonathan added. (Hacker, David)
December 22, 2010 Filing 235 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL of Attorney Timothy D. Chandler and Change of Address by John Doe #1, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8. (Chandler, Timothy) Modified on 12/28/2010 (Carlos, K).
December 22, 2010 Filing 234 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Barry A. Bostrom, PHV for John Doe #1,James Bopp, JrPHV,Richard E. Coleson, PHV,Barry A. Bostrom, PHV,Benjamin W. Bull, PHV,Timothy Donald Chandler for National Organization for Marriage California PAC (Bopp, James)
December 22, 2010 Filing 233 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE., attorney Scott F. Bieniek, PHV terminated (Bopp, James)
September 28, 2010 Filing 232 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL: attorney Sarah E. Troupis, PHV is terminated. (Bieniek, Scott) Modified on 9/29/2010 (Marciel, M).
August 19, 2010 Filing 231 NOTICE of Change in Counsel by Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco, Dennis J. Herrera. (Lee, Mollie) Modified on 9/28/2010 (Marciel, M).
July 14, 2010 Filing 230 TRANSCRIPT of Defendant's Bowen and Brown's Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories, Production of Documents and Sanctions Proceedings held on 06/04/10, before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 8/5/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/16/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2010 filed by ECRO Jonathan Anderson, Phone number 916-930-4072 E-mail janderson@caed.uscourts.gov. (Anderson, J)
June 17, 2010 Filing 229 RESPONSE by Dennis J. Herrera, Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco to #228 Objections TO #225 Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order. (Lee, Mollie) Modified on 6/18/2010 (Duong, D).
June 10, 2010 Filing 228 Plaintiffs' OBJECTIONS to #225 Amended Scheduling Order. (Bieniek, Scott) Modified on 6/11/2010 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 06/08/10 GRANTING in part; DENYING in part #218 MOTION to COMPEL. (Williams, D)
June 4, 2010 Filing 226 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd: MOTION HEARING held on 6/4/2010 re #218 MOTION to COMPEL Responses to Interrogatories, Production of Documents, and Sanctions filed by Debra Bowen, Edmund G. Brown, Jr. After hearing, for reasons stated on the record, defendant's #218 Motion to Compel granted in part as stated on the record in open, subject to a stipulation of the parties as stated on the record. Defendant's motion for sanctions denied. Court to issue written brief summary order. Defendant's counsel shall submit the stipulation to the court, thereafter, court to attach stipulation to court's written brief summary order. Plaintiffs Counsel Sarah Troupis present. Defendants Counsel Erin Peth, Jill Habig, Mollie Lee, Lawrence Woodlock present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Jonathan Anderson/1. (Buzo, P)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 225 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/3/2010: All Discovery shall be completed by 5/26/2011. Disclosure of Expert Witnesses shall be tendered no later than 7/26/2011. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 8/25/2011. Hearings on such Motions shall be set for 10/20/2011 at 2:00 PM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2012 at 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 3/26/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE). Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement shall be filed no later than 1/5/2012 and Trial Briefs shall be submitted no later than 1/12/2012 at 4:00 PM. (Marciel, M)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 224 AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/2/2010 ORDERING Discovery due by 5/26/2012; Disclosure of Expert Witnesses due by 7/26/2012; Pltfs' Dispositive Motions filed by 8/25/2012, dfts' opposition and cross-motion by 9/15/2012, pltfs' reply and opposition 9/29/2012, dfts' reply by 10/13/2012; hearing on such motions shall be on 10/20/2012 at 2:00 PM; Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr., Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement filed by 1/5/2012; trial briefs by 1/12/2012 by 4:00 PM; Any evidentiary or procedural motions are to be filed by 1/5/2012; Oppositions must be filed by 1/12/2012; and any reply must be filed by 1/19/2012. Jury Trial set for 3/26/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Reader, L)
May 25, 2010 Filing 223 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jill Ellen Habig on behalf of Dennis J. Herrera, Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco. Attorney Habig, Jill Ellen added. (Habig, Jill)
May 24, 2010 Filing 222 JOINT STATEMENT re: Discovery Disagreement by Defendants Debra Bowen, Edmund G. Brown, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Peth, Erin) Modified on 5/26/2010 (Engbretson, K.).
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/13/10 GRANTING #210 Motion to modify the Pretrial Scheduling Order. The court will issue an amended pretrial scheduling order within 10 days of the date of this order.(Donati, J)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only): On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the #210 Motion to modify scheduling order, scheduled for hearing on 5/13/2010, is submitted without oral argument. The hearing date of 5/13/2010 is vacated. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed, it will be scheduled at a later date. Signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/11/2010. (Jones, K)
May 10, 2010 Filing 219 REPLY by Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco re #215 Opposition to Motion. (Givner, Jonathan)
May 7, 2010 Filing 218 MOTION to COMPEL Responses to Interrogatories, Production of Documents, and Sanctions by Debra Bowen, Edmund G. Brown, Jr. Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DAD) before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Peth, Erin)
May 7, 2010 Filing 217 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Erin Peth on behalf of Debra Bowen, Edmund G. Brown, Jr. Attorney Peth, Erin added. (Peth, Erin)
May 5, 2010 Filing 216 DECLARATION of Sarah E. Troupis in OPPOSITION TO #210 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. (Troupis, Sarah)
May 5, 2010 Filing 215 OPPOSITION by plts to #210 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Attorney Troupis, Sarah E. added. (Troupis, Sarah) Modified on 5/6/2010 (Duong, D).
April 30, 2010 Filing 214 NOTICE OF HEARING on motion to #210 MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER by Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco . Hearing SET for 5/13/2010 2:00pm Courtroom 7, before the Honorable Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Givner, Jonathan) Modified on 5/3/2010 (Duong, D).
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/29/10 GRANTING Defts' #207 Motion to Shorten Time; Defts are directed to notice their #210 Motion to Modify for hearing on 5/13/10 at 2:00 PM. (Owen, K)
April 27, 2010 Filing 212 PROPOSED ORDER re #210 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order by Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco. (Givner, Jonathan) Modified on 4/28/2010 (Owen, K).
April 27, 2010 Filing 211 DECLARATION of Mollie Lee in Support of #210 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Givner, Jonathan) Modified on 4/28/2010 (Owen, K).
April 27, 2010 Filing 210 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order to Extend Deadlines by Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco. (Givner, Jonathan) Modified on 4/28/2010 (Owen, K).
April 27, 2010 Filing 209 PROPOSED ORDER re #207 MOTION to SHORTEN TIME for Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Modify Scheduling Order to Extend Deadlines by Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco. (Givner, Jonathan)
April 27, 2010 Filing 208 DECLARATION of Mollie Lee in Support of #207 MOTION to SHORTEN TIME for Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Modify Scheduling Order to Extend Deadlines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - C)(Givner, Jonathan)
April 27, 2010 Filing 207 MOTION to SHORTEN TIME for Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Modify Scheduling Order to Extend Deadlines by Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco. Attorney Givner, Jonathan added. (Givner, Jonathan)
December 9, 2009 Filing 206 NOTICE Certificate of Service - Notice to Members of the Defendant Class of Elected Attorneys by all plaintiffs re #203 Stipulation and Order. (Bieniek, Scott)
December 9, 2009 Filing 205 NOTICE Certificate of Service - Notice to Members of the Defendant Class of District Attorneys by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, John Doe #1 re #203 Stipulation and Order. (Bieniek, Scott)
December 9, 2009 Filing 204 NOTICE Certificate of Service - Notice to Members of the Plaintiff Class of Major Donors by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, John Doe #1. (Bieniek, Scott)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 203 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/25/09 altering the Order Certifying the Plaintiff Class of Major Donors and Request to Approve Class Notice #199 . (Carlos, K) (Benson, A.).
November 9, 2009 Filing 202 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Alter the Order Certifying the plf class of Major Donors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Notice to Pl. Class of Major Donors, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Notice to Def. Class of District Attorneys, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Notice to Def. Class of Elected Attorneys, #4 Exhibit D - Proposed Opt-Out Form, #5 Certificate of Service)(Bieniek, Scott) Modified on 11/10/2009 (Benson, A.).
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/22/09 ORDERING that the Court hereby removes Robert Leidigh and Ray Remy as defendants in this action, and adds as defendants Lynn Montgomery and Ronald Rotunda, in their official capacities as Commissioners of the Fair Political Practices Commission. The caption of this case shall be amended. (Becknal, R)
September 22, 2009 Filing 200 NOTICE of Substitution of Parties by Timothy Hodson, Eugene Huguenin, Jr, Robert Leidigh, Ray Remy, Ross Johnson and Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order )(Woodlock, Lawrence) Modified on 9/23/2009 (Duong, D).
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/27/09 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION to Certify Class #108 is GRANTED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only): On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 78-230(h), the Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class #108 , scheduled for hearing on 8/13/2009, is submitted without oral argument. The hearing date of 8/13/2009 is vacated. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed, it will be scheduled at a later date.Signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/6/2009. (Deutsch, S)
July 30, 2009 Filing 197 STATEMENT of No Position Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Certification of Class Action by Defendant Jan Scully. (Cassidy, Terence)
July 27, 2009 Filing 196 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Dennis J. Herrera, Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco to #108 MOTION to CERTIFY CLASS. Attorney Shen, Andrew N added. (Shen, Andrew)
July 27, 2009 Filing 195 STATEMENT of No Position by Defendant Dean C. Logan re #108 MOTION to CERTIFY CLASS. (Whitehurst, Judy)
July 27, 2009 Filing 194 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Timothy Hodson, Eugene Huguenin, Jr, Robert Leidigh, Ray Remy, Debra Bowen, Edmund G. Brown, Jr, Ross Johnson to #108 MOTION to CERTIFY CLASS. (Morazzini, Zackery)
July 15, 2009 Filing 193 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, John Doe #1. (Bieniek, Scott)
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 192 STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential materials signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/14/09. (Carlos, K)
July 13, 2009 Filing 191 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER (corrected) by Dennis J. Herrera, Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco. (Lee, Mollie)
July 13, 2009 Filing 190 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER by Dennis J. Herrera, Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco. (Lee, Mollie)
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/23/2009 ORDERING #171 Motion is GRANTED; and #110 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice.(Matson, R)
June 23, 2009 Filing 188 PROPOSED ORDER re #187 Notice - Other by Timothy Hodson, Eugene Huguenin, Jr, Robert Leidigh, Ray Remy, Ross Johnson. (Woodlock, Lawrence)
June 23, 2009 Filing 187 NOTICE Of Substitution of Parties by Timothy Hodson, Eugene Huguenin, Jr, Robert Leidigh, Ray Remy, Ross Johnson. (Woodlock, Lawrence)
June 17, 2009 Filing 186 REPLY by defendants in support of #171 Rule 56(f) Motion. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mollie M. Lee in support of Reply #2 Exhibit A #3 Exhibit B) (Lee, Mollie) Modified on 6/18/2009 (Marciel, M).
June 17, 2009 Filing 185 REPLY by defendants in support of #171 Rule 56(f) Motion. (Lee, Mollie) Modified on 6/18/2009 (Marciel, M).
June 17, 2009 Filing 184 REPLY by defendants in support of #171 Rule 56(f) Motion. (Morazzini, Zackery) Modified on 6/18/2009 (Marciel, M).
June 16, 2009 Filing 183 STATEMENT of Non-Opposition to Rule 56(f) Motion filed by defendant Jan Scully. (Cassidy, Terence) Modified on 6/17/2009 (Marciel, M).
June 16, 2009 Filing 182 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only): On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 78-230(h), Defendants' Motion Under Rule 56(f), scheduled for hearing on 6/18/2009 at 10:00 a.m. #171 , is submitted without oral argument. The hearing date of 6/18/2009 is vacated and the requests for telephonic appearance are denied as moot. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed, it will be scheduled at a later date. (Schultz, C)
June 16, 2009 Filing 181 OPPOSITION by plaintiffs #171 Motion under Rule 56(f). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott F. Bieniek in support of) (Bieniek, Scott) Modified on 6/16/2009 (Marciel, M).
June 15, 2009 Filing 180 REQUEST for Telephonic Appearance for Counsel for Notice of Rule 56(f) Motion by Dean C. Logan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order requesting telephonic appearance by counsel for Dean C. Logan) (Whitehurst, Judy) Modified on 6/16/2009 (Marciel, M).
June 15, 2009 Filing 179 STATEMENT of no position to State defendants' #171 Motion under Rule 56(f) by defendant Dean C. Logan. (Whitehurst, Judy) Modified on 6/16/2009 (Marciel, M).
June 15, 2009 Filing 178 ANSWER to THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial by defendant Jan Scully.(Cassidy, Terence) Modified on 6/16/2009 (Marciel, M).
June 15, 2009 Filing 177 REQUEST for Telephonic Appearance on #171 Motion under Rule 56(f) Hearing by plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting Request for Telephonic Appearance) (Bieniek, Scott) Modified on 6/16/2009 (Marciel, M).
June 15, 2009 Filing 176 STIPULATION to and REQUEST for Continuance of #171 Motion under Rule 56(f) Hearing by plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting Request for Continuance) (Bieniek, Scott) Modified on 6/16/2009 (Marciel, M).
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/11/2009 GRANTING #166 the State Defendants' ex parte application shorten time on their Rule 56(f) Motion; the State Defendants' rule 56(f) motion is to be filed no later than 6/10/2009, by 4:00 P.M. PST. Any opposition thereto must be filed by no later than 6/16/2009, by 4:00 p.m. PST. Any reply must be filed by no later than 6/17/2009, by 4:00 P.M. PST. Hearing on the motion is set for 6/18/2009, at 10:00 A.M. PST, in Courtroom 7. (Reader, L)
June 11, 2009 Filing 174 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT (3rd Amended Complaint) by Dean C. Logan.(Whitehurst, Judy)
June 11, 2009 Filing 173 JOINDER by Dennis J. Herrera, Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco in. State Defendants' Rule 56(F) Motion (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mollie M. Lee In Support of San Francisco Defendants' Notice of Joinder in State Defendants' Rule 56(F) Motion)(Lee, Mollie)
June 11, 2009 Filing 172 ANSWER to COMPLAINT by Dennis J. Herrera, Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco.(Lee, Mollie)
June 10, 2009 Filing 171 MOTION under Rule 56(f) by defendants. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2009 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence T. Woodlock) (Morazzini, Zackery) Modified on 6/16/2009 (Marciel, M).
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only): The Court is in receipt of Defendants' Motion Under Rule 56(f) #169 . The Motion as filed is deficient and the Defendants are directed to renotice the Motion in compliance with Local Rule 78-230(a). Accordingly, the motion is terminated. Signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/10/2009. (Deutsch, S)
June 10, 2009 Filing 169 MOTION under Rule 56(f) by Timothy Hodson, Eugene Huguenin, Jr, Robert Leidigh, Ray Remy, Debra Bowen, Edmund G. Brown, Jr, Ross Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Woodlock)(Morazzini, Zackery)
June 8, 2009 Filing 168 SEALED EVENT (Gaydosh, J)
June 5, 2009 Filing 167 PROPOSED ORDER on Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time. (Morazzini, Zackery)
June 5, 2009 Filing 166 MOTION to SHORTEN TIME for Hearing on Rule 56(f) Motion by Timothy Hodson, Eugene Huguenin, Jr, Robert Leidigh, Ray Remy, Debra Bowen, Edmund G. Brown, Jr, Ross Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Morazzini)(Morazzini, Zackery)
June 5, 2009 Filing 165 State Defendants' ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT by Timothy Hodson, Eugene Huguenin, Jr, Robert Leidigh, Ray Remy, Debra Bowen, Edmund G. Brown, Jr, Ross Johnson.(Morazzini, Zackery)
June 4, 2009 Filing 164 NOTICE OF FILING/LODGING DOCUMENT IN PAPER by pltfs: Audio Files Lodged with court pursuant to Local Rule. (Bieniek, Scott) Modified on 6/9/2009 (Kastilahn, A).
June 4, 2009 Filing 163 NOTICE OF FILING/LODGING DOCUMENT IN PAPER by pltfs: Reference List Filed Under Seal with court pursuant to Order of the Court. (Bieniek, Scott) Modified on 6/9/2009 (Kastilahn, A).
June 4, 2009 Filing 162 DECLARATION of John Doe #43 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bieniek, Scott) Modified on 6/4/2009 (Matson, R).
June 3, 2009 Filing 161 DECLARATION of John Doe #58 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 160 DECLARATION of John Doe #57 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 159 DECLARATION of John Doe #56 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 158 DECLARATION of John Doe #55 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 157 DECLARATION of John Doe #54 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1Exhibit A)(Bieniek, Scott) Modified on 6/4/2009 (Matson, R).
June 3, 2009 Filing 156 DECLARATION of John Doe #53 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 155 DECLARATION of John Doe #52 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D)(Bieniek, Scott) Modified on 6/4/2009 (Matson, R).
June 3, 2009 Filing 154 DECLARATION of John Doe #51 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 153 DECLARATION of John Doe #50 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 152 DECLARATION of John Doe #49 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 151 DECLARATION of John Doe #48 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 150 DECLARATION of John Doe #47 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bieniek, Scott) Modified on 6/4/2009 (Matson, R).
June 3, 2009 Filing 149 DECLARATION of John Doe #46 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 148 DECLARATION of John Doe #45 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 147 DECLARATION of John Doe #44 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 146 DECLARATION of John Doe #43 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bieniek, Scott) Modified on 6/4/2009 (Matson, R).
June 3, 2009 Filing 145 DECLARATION of John Doe #42 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bieniek, Scott) Modified on 6/4/2009 (Matson, R).
June 3, 2009 Filing 144 DECLARATION of John Doe #41 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 143 DECLARATION of John Doe #40 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 142 DECLARATION of John Doe #39 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 141 DECLARATION of John Doe #38 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 140 DECLARATION of John Doe #37 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 139 DECLARATION of John Doe #36 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 138 DECLARATION of John Doe #35 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 137 DECLARATION of John Doe #34 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 136 DECLARATION of John Doe #33 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 135 DECLARATION of John Doe #32 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bieniek, Scott) Modified on 6/4/2009 (Matson, R).
June 3, 2009 Filing 134 DECLARATION of John Doe #31 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 133 DECLARATION of John Doe #30 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bieniek, Scott) Modified on 6/4/2009 (Matson, R).
June 3, 2009 Filing 132 DECLARATION of John Doe #29 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Bieniek, Scott) Modified on 6/4/2009 (Matson, R).
June 3, 2009 Filing 131 DECLARATION of John Doe #28 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Bieniek, Scott) Modified on 6/4/2009 (Matson, R).
June 3, 2009 Filing 130 DECLARATION of John Doe #27 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bieniek, Scott) Modified on 6/4/2009 (Matson, R).
June 3, 2009 Filing 129 DECLARATION of John Doe #26 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 128 DECLARATION of John Doe #25 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 127 DECLARATION of John Doe #24 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 126 DECLARATION of John Doe #23 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 125 DECLARATION of John Doe #22 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 124 DECLARATION of John Doe #21 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 123 DECLARATION of John Doe #20 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bieniek, Scott) Modified on 6/4/2009 (Matson, R).
June 3, 2009 Filing 122 DECLARATION of John Doe #19 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 121 DECLARATION of John Doe #18 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 120 DECLARATION of John Doe #17 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 119 DECLARATION of John Doe #16 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 118 DECLARATION of John Doe #15 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 117 DECLARATION of John Doe #14 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 116 DECLARATION of John Doe #13 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 115 DECLARATION of John Doe #12 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 114 DECLARATION of John Doe #11 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 113 DECLARATION of John Doe #10 in SUPPORT OF #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bieniek, Scott) Modified on 6/4/2009 (Matson, R).
June 3, 2009 Filing 112 STATEMENT of Undisputed Facts in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, John Doe #1 re #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Court Summary of John Doe Decl. #1 - #9, #2 Appendix Summary of John Doe Decl. #10 - #58)(Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 111 MEMORANDUM by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, John Doe #1 in SUPPORT of #110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 110 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, John Doe #1. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2009 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 109 MEMORANDUM by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, John Doe #1 in SUPPORT of #108 MOTION to CERTIFY CLASS. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 3, 2009 Filing 108 MOTION to CERTIFY CLASS by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, John Doe #1. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2009 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Bieniek, Scott)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/1/09 ORDERING that the MOTION for RECONSIDERATION #101 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 28, 2009 Filing 106 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, National Organization for Marriage California PAC, John Doe #1. Attorney Bieniek, Scott F. added.(Bieniek, Scott)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/27/09 ORDERING that the page limitations attendant to the Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification shall be modified as follows: 1) The points and authorities submitted in support of the Plaintiffs' Motion may be up to twenty-five (25) pages in length; 2) The opposition points and authorities to said Motion may also be up to twenty-five (25) pages in length; and 3) Any reply shall not exceed ten (10) pages. (Becknal, R)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/27/09 GRANTING the stipulation #97 to file a Third Amended Complaint. (Becknal, R)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/27/09 ORDERING that the page limitations attendant to the Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment shall be modified as follows: 1) The points and authorities submitted in support of the Plaintiffs' Motion may be up to fifty-five (55) pages in length;2) The opposition points and authorities to said Motion may also be up to fifty-five (55) pages in length; and 3) Any reply shall not exceed twenty-five (25) pages. (Becknal, R)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/27/09 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' Rule 20 Motion #98 to Add Plaintiff National Organization for Marriage California PAC is GRANTED. (Becknal, R)
May 26, 2009 Filing 101 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION and REQUEST from non-party to correct clerical error under Rule 60(a). (Streeter, J) Modified on 6/1/2009 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
May 20, 2009 Filing 100 REQUEST to Exceed Page Limits for Memorandum in Support of Motion for Class Certification by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage #1. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order .(Bieniek, Scott) Modified on 5/21/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 20, 2009 Filing 99 REQUEST to Exceed Page Limits for Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Bieniek, Scott) Modified on 5/21/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 20, 2009 Filing 98 EX PARTE MOTION to Add Plaintiff National Organization for Marriage California PAC re #97 MOTION to AMEND (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Bieniek, Scott) Modified on 5/21/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 20, 2009 Filing 97 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to AMEND the #68 Amended Complaint #1. (Attachments: #1 Third Amended Complaint)(Bieniek, Scott) Modified on 5/21/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 96 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 05/15/09:Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 7/14/2010. Discovery due by 5/14/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 9/16/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/27/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Trial Briefs filed not later than 1/13/11 by 4:00 PM; evidentiary or procedural motions are to be filed by 1/6/11, oppositions by 1/13/11, any replied by 1/20/11. Jury Trial set for 3/14/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.(Streeter, J)
March 6, 2009 Filing 95 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Timothy Hodson, Eugene Huguenin, Jr, Robert Leidigh, Ray Remy, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, Dennis J. Herrera, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, Debra Bowen, Edmund G. Brown, Jr, Dean C. Logan, Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco, John Doe #1, Jan Scully, Ross Johnson. (Bieniek, Scott)
February 11, 2009 Filing 94 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Lawrence Thomas Woodlock on behalf of Timothy Hodson, Eugene Huguenin, Jr, Robert Leidigh, Ray Remy, Ross Johnson. Attorney Woodlock, Lawrence Thomas added. (Woodlock, Lawrence)
February 5, 2009 Filing 93 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT by Dennis J. Herrera, Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco.(Lee, Mollie) Modified on 2/6/2009 (Kaminski, H).
February 5, 2009 Filing 92 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT by Dean C. Logan.(Whitehurst, Judy)
February 5, 2009 Filing 91 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, John Doe #1. Dennis J. Herrera served on 1/23/2009, answer due 2/12/2009. (Chandler, Timothy)
February 5, 2009 Filing 90 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL by Jan Scully.(Cassidy, Terence)
February 3, 2009 Filing 89 ANSWER to SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Timothy Hodson, Eugene Huguenin, Jr, Robert Leidigh, Ray Remy, Debra Bowen, Edmund G. Brown, Jr, Ross Johnson.(Morazzini, Zackery) Modified on 2/4/2009 (Kaminski, H).
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/30/09 DENYING #16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and GRANTING #13 Motion to Extend the Existing Protective Order. (Donati, J)
January 29, 2009 Filing 87 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Judge Morrison C. England, Jr: MOTION HEARING held on 1/29/2009. Plaintiffs' Motion to Expedite #11 and Motion for Preliminary Injunction #16 are DENIED. Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order #13 will issue as requested by the Plaintiffs. Plaintiffs' Counsel: Richard Coleson, Scott Bieniek and Timonthy Chandler. Defendants' Counsel: Zackery Morazzini, Kristina Hall, Mollie Lee, Scott Hallabrin, Lawrence Woodlock and Timothy Chandler. Court Reporter/CD Number: Diane Shepard. (Deutsch, S)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 01/27/09 re #80 Pro Hac Vice Application. Added attorney Benjamin W. Bull, PHV for ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, John Doe # 1. (Streeter, J)
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/26/09: The time for Defendant SCULLY to file a response to the Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Protective Order shall be extended up to and including 4:00 p.m. on January 23, 2009. (Kaminski, H)
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 PRO HAC VICE ORDER Added attorney Richard E Coleson for ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, John Doe # 1, signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/26/09. (Kaminski, H).
January 26, 2009 Filing 83 REPLY/RESPONSE to State Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Evidence by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, John Doe #1 re #74 Objections. (Bopp, James)
January 26, 2009 Filing 81 REPLY by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, John Doe #1 to RESPONSE to #13 MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER and Leave to File Documents Under Seal, #16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Attorney Bopp, James added. (Bopp, James)
January 26, 2009 Filing 80 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, John Doe #1 for attorney Benjamin W. Bull to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Chandler, Timothy)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only): The Court will not entertain Requests for Telephonic Appearance by the parties for the January 29, 2009 Motions Hearing at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 7. Signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/26/2009. (Deutsch, S)
January 26, 2009 RECEIPT number #CAE200013773 $180.00 fbo Benjamin W. Bull by Timothy Chandler on 1/26/2009 re Pro Hac Vice Application 80 . (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 26, 2009 RECEIPT number #CAE200013773 $180.00 fbo Benjamin W. Bull by Timothy Chandler on 1/26/2009 re Pro Hac Vice Application #80 . (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 23, 2009 Filing 78 OPPOSITION by Jan Scully to #16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Protective Order. (Cassidy, Terence) Modified on 1/26/2009 (Streeter, J).
January 23, 2009 Filing 77 AMENDED STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Amended Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant Jan Scully to File a Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Protective Order by Jan Scully. (Cassidy, Terence) Modified on 1/26/2009 (Streeter, J).
January 22, 2009 Filing 76 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendant Jan Scully to File a Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Protective Order by Jan Scully. Attorney Cassidy, Terence John added. (Cassidy, Terence)
January 22, 2009 Filing 75 NOTICE OF JOINDER in opposition to plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction by Dennis J. Herrera, Department of Elections City and County of San Francisco. Attorney Lee, Mollie Mindes added. (Lee, Mollie) Modified on 1/27/2009 (Reader, L).
January 22, 2009 Filing 74 OBJECTIONS by Defendants Timothy Hodson, Eugene Huguenin, Jr, Robert Leidigh, Ray Remy, Debra Bowen, Edmund G. Brown, Jr, Ross Johnson. to plaintiffs' evidence (Morazzini, Zackery)
January 22, 2009 Filing 73 DECLARATION of Cassady in support of opposition #16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Morazzini, Zackery)
January 22, 2009 Filing 72 DECLARATION of Woodlock in support of opposition #16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Morazzini, Zackery)
January 22, 2009 Filing 71 OPPOSITION by Timothy Hodson, Eugene Huguenin, Jr, Robert Leidigh, Ray Remy, Debra Bowen, Edmund G. Brown, Jr, Ross Johnson. to motion for preliminary injuction (Morazzini, Zackery)
January 22, 2009 Filing 70 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Dennis J. Herrera* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Timothy D. Chandler* *Alliance Defense Fund* *101 Parkshore Dr., Suite 100* *Folsom, CA 95630*. (Benson, A.)
January 22, 2009 Filing 69 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION to #16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Dean C. Logan. Attorney Whitehurst, Judy Welch added. (Whitehurst, Judy) Modified on 1/22/2009 (Marciel, M).
January 22, 2009 Filing 68 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants by plaintiffs. (Chandler, Timothy) Modified on 1/22/2009 (Benson, A.)
January 22, 2009 Filing 67 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by plaintiffs for #66 Order on Motion to Amend the Complaint filed 1/22/2009. (Chandler, Timothy) Modified on 1/22/2009 (Marciel, M).
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION and ORDER granting #51 Motion to Amend the Complaint signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/21/09. (Duong, D)
January 21, 2009 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by plaintiffs for #60 Order filed 1/21/2009. (Chandler, Timothy) Modified on 1/22/2009 (Marciel, M).
January 21, 2009 Filing 64 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by plaintiffs. Jan Scully served on 1/14/2009, answer due 2/3/2009. (Chandler, Timothy) Modified on 1/22/2009 (Marciel, M).
January 21, 2009 Filing 63 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by plaintiffs. Ray Remy served on 1/14/2009, answer due 2/3/2009. (Chandler, Timothy) Modified on 1/22/2009 (Marciel, M).
January 21, 2009 Filing 62 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by plaintiffs. Dean C Logan served on 1/14/2009, answer due 2/3/2009. (Chandler, Timothy) Modified on 1/22/2009 (Marciel, M).
January 21, 2009 Filing 61 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by plaintiffs. Robert Leidigh served on 1/14/2009, answer due 2/3/2009. (Chandler, Timothy) Modified on 1/22/2009 (Marciel, M).
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/20/09 ORDERING that #50 plfts' Ex Parte Rule 21 Motion to Dismiss dft Teichert and join dft Dennis J. Herrera is GRANTED. (Kastilahn, A)
January 21, 2009 Filing 59 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by plaintiffs. Ross Johnson served on 1/14/2009, answer due 2/3/2009. (Chandler, Timothy) Modified on 1/22/2009 (Marciel, M).
January 21, 2009 Filing 58 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by plaintiffs. Eugene Huguenin, Jr served on 1/14/2009, answer due 2/3/2009. (Chandler, Timothy) Modified on 1/22/2009 (Marciel, M).
January 21, 2009 Filing 57 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by plaintiffs. Timothy Hodson served on 1/14/2009, answer due 2/3/2009. (Chandler, Timothy) Modified on 1/22/2009 (Marciel, M).
January 21, 2009 Filing 56 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by plaintiffs. Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco served on 1/14/2009, answer due 2/3/2009. (Chandler, Timothy) Modified on 1/22/2009 (Marciel, M).
January 21, 2009 Filing 55 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by plaintiffs. Edmund G. Brown, Jr served on 1/14/2009, answer due 2/3/2009. (Chandler, Timothy) Modified on 1/22/2009 (Marciel, M).
January 21, 2009 Filing 54 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by plaintiffs. Debra Bowen served on 1/14/2009, answer due 2/3/2009. (Chandler, Timothy) Modified on 1/22/2009 (Marciel, M).
January 20, 2009 Filing 52 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, John Doe #1 for attorney Richard E. Coleson to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Chandler, Timothy)
January 20, 2009 Filing 51 MOTION to AMEND the COMPLAINT amending #10 Amended Complaint and regarding #50 Motion for Leave to Drop and Add Party (FRCP 21) by pltfs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint)(Bieniek, Scott) Modified on 1/20/2009 (Manzer, C).
January 20, 2009 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to Drop and Add Party (FRCP 21) re #10 Amended Complaint by pltfs (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Rule 21 Motion)(Bieniek, Scott) Modified on 1/20/2009 (Manzer, C).
January 20, 2009 RECEIPT number # CAE200013609 $180.00 fbo Pro Hace Vice applicant Richard E. Coleson by attorney James Bopp, Jr. on 1/20/2009. (Marciel, M)
January 20, 2009 RECEIPT number # CAE200013609 $180.00 fbo Pro Hace Vice applicant Richard E. Coleson by attorney James Bopp, Jr. on 1/20/2009. (Marciel, M)
January 16, 2009 Filing 49 NOTICE Plaintiffs' Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by all plaintiffs. (Bieniek, Scott)
January 16, 2009 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, John Doe #1 re #43 Pro Hac Vice Order, #42 Pro Hac Vice Order, #29 Order,, #31 Pro Hac Vice Order, #41 Pro Hac Vice Order, #28 Order,,, Set/Reset Motion Hearing,,. Attorney Bieniek, Scott F. added. (Bieniek, Scott)
January 15, 2009 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, John Doe #1 re #45 . (Chandler, Timothy)
January 15, 2009 Filing 46 NOTICE OF FILING / LODGING DOCUMENT IN PAPER by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, John Doe #1: Reference List Pursuant to FRCP 5.2(g) Filed with court pursuant to Order of the Court dated January 14, 2009. (Chandler, Timothy)
January 15, 2009 Filing 45 DECLARATION of John Doe #3 in SUPPORT OF #16 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Chandler, Timothy)
January 15, 2009 Filing 44 DECLARATION of David Bauer in SUPPORT OF #16 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (Chandler, Timothy)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/14/2009 ORDERING #2 Attorney Barry A. Bostrom to appear for ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, and National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8. (Reader, L)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/14/2009 ORDERING #4 Attorney Scott F. Bieniek to appear for ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, and National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8. (Reader, L)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/14/2009 ORDERING #5 Attorney Sarah E. Troupis to appear for ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, and National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8. (Reader, L)
January 15, 2009 Filing 40 DECLARATION of John Doe #9 in SUPPORT OF #16 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chandler, Timothy)
January 15, 2009 Filing 39 DECLARATION of John Doe #8 in SUPPORT OF #16 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Chandler, Timothy)
January 15, 2009 Filing 38 DECLARATION of John Doe #7 in SUPPORT OF #16 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chandler, Timothy)
January 15, 2009 Filing 37 DECLARATION of John Doe #6 in SUPPORT OF #16 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chandler, Timothy)
January 15, 2009 Filing 36 DECLARATION of John Doe #5 in SUPPORT OF #16 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chandler, Timothy)
January 15, 2009 Filing 35 DECLARATION of John Doe #4 in SUPPORT OF #16 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Chandler, Timothy)
January 15, 2009 Filing 34 [DISREGARD - ATTORNEY TO REFILE] DECLARATION of John Doe #3 in SUPPORT OF #16 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Chandler, Timothy) Modified on 1/15/2009 (Manzer, C).
January 15, 2009 Filing 33 DECLARATION of John Doe #2 in SUPPORT OF #16 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chandler, Timothy)
January 15, 2009 Filing 32 DECLARATION of John Doe #1 in Support Of #16 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chandler, Timothy)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/14/2009 ORDERING #3 Attorney James Bopp, Jr. to appear for ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, and National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8.(Reader, L)
January 15, 2009 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Sarah E. Troupis (Second) in SUPPORT OF #16 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Chandler, Timothy)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/14/09 ORDERING that Plaintiffs are granted leave to redact any personal information from any and all filings not filed under seal that could be used to identify supporters of Proposition 8 or members of or donors to ProtectMarriage.com or NOM-California. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file reference lists pursuant to FRCP 5.2(g) at the Court's request. By 4:00 p.m. on 1/15/09, pursuant to the terms just stated, Plaintiffs are directed to file with the Court all currently existing and previously unsubmitted evidence on which they intend to rely in support of their Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Protective Order.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/14/09 ORDERING that the hearing on Plaintiff's MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #16 and MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER #13 shall be held on 1/29/2009 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7. Defendants shall file any response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Protective Order no later than 4:00 p.m. on 1/22/09. Plaintiffs shall file any reply no later than 4:00 p.m. on 1/26/09. Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration is otherwise DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 13, 2009 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Scott F. Bieniek in OPPOSITION TO #23 MOTION for RECONSIDERATION re #18 Ex Parte Application, to Shorten Time on Hearing on Preliminary Injunction MOTION for RECONSIDERATION re #18 Ex Parte Application, to Shorten Time on Hearing on Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Chandler, Timothy)
January 13, 2009 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Sarah E. Troupis in OPPOSITION TO #23 MOTION for RECONSIDERATION re #18 Ex Parte Application, to Shorten Time on Hearing on Preliminary Injunction MOTION for RECONSIDERATION re #18 Ex Parte Application, to Shorten Time on Hearing on Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Chandler, Timothy)
January 13, 2009 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Michele L. Schmidt in OPPOSITION TO #23 MOTION for RECONSIDERATION re #18 Ex Parte Application, to Shorten Time on Hearing on Preliminary Injunction MOTION for RECONSIDERATION re #18 Ex Parte Application, to Shorten Time on Hearing on Preliminary Injunction. (Chandler, Timothy)
January 13, 2009 Filing 24 OPPOSITION by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, John Doe #1 to #23 MOTION for RECONSIDERATION re #18 Ex Parte Application, to Shorten Time on Hearing on Preliminary Injunction MOTION for RECONSIDERATION re #18 Ex Parte Application, to Shorten Time on Hearing on Preliminary Injunction. (Chandler, Timothy)
January 13, 2009 Filing 23 MOTION for RECONSIDERATION re #18 Ex Parte Application, to Shorten Time on Hearing on Preliminary Injunction by Timothy Hodson, Eugene Huguenin, Jr, Robert Leidigh, Ray Remy, Debra Bowen, Edmund G. Brown, Jr, Ross Johnson. Attorney Morazzini, Zackery Paul added. (Morazzini, Zackery)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/12/2009 ORDERING #11 Plaintiffs Motion to Expedite is DENIED without prejudice. (Reader, L)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/12/2009 ORDERING #15 that the page limitations attendant to the pltf's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, tentatively set for 1/26/09, shall be modified: The points and authorities submitted in support of Plaintiff's Motion may be up to 40 pages in length; and The opposition points and authorities to said Motion may also be up to 40 pages in length; any reply shall not exceed 20 pages. (Reader, L) Modified on 1/13/2009 (Reader, L).
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/12/2009 ORDERING #13 , #16 , #18 Motions Hearing SET for 1/26/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.; Dfts response filing to Pltfs' motions due by 1/19/2009, at 4:00 PM.; Pltfs reply to any opposition due by 1/22/2009 at 12:00 PM. (Reader, L) Modified on 1/13/2009 (Reader, L).
January 12, 2009 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Sarah E. Troupis in SUPPORT OF #16 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Attorney Chandler, Timothy Donald added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-M, #2 Exhibit N-V, #3 Exhibit W-AD, #4 Exhibit AE-AS, #5 Exhibit AT-BF)(Chandler, Timothy)
January 9, 2009 Filing 18 EX PARTE APPLICATION by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, John Doe #1 for to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion to Expedite, and Motion for Protective Order and Time to File Opposition and Replies to the Same. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit)(Chandler, Timothy)
January 9, 2009 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, John Doe #1 in SUPPORT of #16 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (Chandler, Timothy)
January 9, 2009 Filing 16 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, John Doe #1. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chandler, Timothy)
January 9, 2009 Filing 15 EX PARTE APPLICATION by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, John Doe #1 for permission to exceed the page limits for Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chandler, Timothy)
January 9, 2009 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, John Doe #1 in SUPPORT of #13 MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER and Leave to File Documents Under Seal. (Chandler, Timothy)
January 9, 2009 Filing 13 MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER and Leave to File Documents Under Seal by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, John Doe #1. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chandler, Timothy) Modified on 1/13/2009 (Carlos, K).
January 9, 2009 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in support of motion to expidite #11 by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, John Doe #1. (Chandler, Timothy) Modified on 1/13/2009 (Carlos, K).
January 9, 2009 Filing 11 MOTION to expedite this action by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage, John Doe #1. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chandler, Timothy) Modified on 1/13/2009 (Carlos, K).
January 9, 2009 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants by John Doe #1, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage. Attorney Chandler, Timothy Donald added.(Chandler, Timothy) Modified on 1/13/2009 (Carlos, K).
January 8, 2009 Filing 9 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage. (Chandler, Timothy)
January 8, 2009 Filing 8 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms, #2 VDRP Forms) (Reader, L)
January 8, 2009 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Timothy Hodson, Eugene Huguenin, Jr, Robert Leidigh, Ray Remy, Debra Bowen, Edmund G. Brown, Jr, Dean C Logan, Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco, Jan Scully, Eileen M Teichert, Ross Johnson* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Timothy D. Chandler, Esquire* *Alliance Defense Fund* *101 Parkshore Drive., Suite 100* *Folsom, California 95630*. (Reader, L)
January 8, 2009 RECEIPT number #CAE200013322 $350.00 Civil Filing Fee fbo ProtectMarriage.com Yes on 8 by Timothy Chandler on 1/8/2009. (Reader, L)
January 8, 2009 RECEIPT number #CAE200013323 $720.00 fbo ProtectMarriage.com Yes on 8 by James Bopp Jr. on 1/8/2009, for Pro Hac Vice for James Bopp, Jr., Barry A. Bostrom, Sarah E. Troupis, and Scott F. Bieniek. (Reader, L) Modified on 1/8/2009 (Reader, L).
January 8, 2009 RECEIPT number #CAE200013322 $350.00 Civil Filing Fee fbo ProtectMarriage.com Yes on 8 by Timothy Chandler on 1/8/2009. (Reader, L)
January 8, 2009 RECEIPT number #CAE200013323 $720.00 fbo ProtectMarriage.com Yes on 8 by James Bopp Jr. on 1/8/2009, for Pro Hac Vice for James Bopp, Jr., Barry A. Bostrom, Sarah E. Troupis, and Scott F. Bieniek. (Reader, L) Modified on 1/8/2009 (Reader, L).
January 7, 2009 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage for attorney Sarah E. Troupis to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Chandler, Timothy)
January 7, 2009 Filing 4 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage for attorney Scott F. Bieniek to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Chandler, Timothy)
January 7, 2009 Filing 3 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage for attorney James Bopp, Jr. to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Chandler, Timothy)
January 7, 2009 Filing 2 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage for attorney Barry A. Bostrom to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Chandler, Timothy)
January 7, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage. Attorney Chandler, Timothy Donald added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chandler, Timothy)
January 7, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants by ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal, National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage. Attorney Chandler, Timothy Donald added. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chandler, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, a Project of California Renewal et al v. Bowen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Richard E. Coleson, PHV
Represented By: Barry A. Bostrom, PHV
Represented By: Benjamin W. Bull, PHV
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr.
Represented By: Jared M. Haynie, PHV
Represented By: Joseph Eugene La Rue, PHV
Represented By: Kaylan L. Phillips, PHV
Represented By: Noel H. Johnson, PHV
Represented By: Sarah E. Troupis, PHV
Represented By: Scott F. Bieniek, PHV
Represented By: Timothy Donald Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Organization for Marriage California - Yes on 8, Sponsored by National Organization for Marriage
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Richard E. Coleson, PHV
Represented By: Barry A. Bostrom, PHV
Represented By: Benjamin W. Bull, PHV
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr.
Represented By: Jared M. Haynie, PHV
Represented By: Joseph Eugene La Rue, PHV
Represented By: Kaylan L. Phillips, PHV
Represented By: Sarah E. Troupis, PHV
Represented By: Scott F. Bieniek, PHV
Represented By: Timothy Donald Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe #1
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Richard E. Coleson, PHV
Represented By: Barry A. Bostrom, PHV
Represented By: Benjamin W. Bull, PHV
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr.
Represented By: Jared M. Haynie, PHV
Represented By: Kaylan L. Phillips, PHV
Represented By: Sarah E. Troupis, PHV
Represented By: Scott F. Bieniek, PHV
Represented By: Timothy Donald Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Organization for Marriage California PAC
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Joseph Eugene La Rue, PHV
Represented By: Barry A. Bostrom, PHV
Represented By: Benjamin W. Bull, PHV
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr.
Represented By: Jared M. Haynie, PHV
Represented By: Kaylan L. Phillips, PHV
Represented By: Richard E. Coleson, PHV
Represented By: Sarah E. Troupis, PHV
Represented By: Scott F. Bieniek, PHV
Represented By: Timothy Donald Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Bowen
Represented By: Daniel J. Powell
Represented By: Tamar Pachter
Represented By: Douglas J. Woods
Represented By: Erin Peth
Represented By: Seth Eden Goldstein
Represented By: Zackery Paul Morazzini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Erin Peth
Represented By: Seth Eden Goldstein
Represented By: Zackery Paul Morazzini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean C. Logan
Represented By: Judy Welch Whitehurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Elections - City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Andrew N Shen
Represented By: Jonathan Givner
Represented By: Jill Ellen Habig
Represented By: Mollie Mindes Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Scully
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eileen M Teichert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Johnson
Represented By: Lawrence Thomas Woodlock
Represented By: Zackery Paul Morazzini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Hodson
Represented By: Lawrence Thomas Woodlock
Represented By: Zackery Paul Morazzini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Huguenin, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence Thomas Woodlock
Represented By: Zackery Paul Morazzini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Leidigh
Represented By: Lawrence Thomas Woodlock
Represented By: Zackery Paul Morazzini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Remy
Represented By: Heather M. Rowan
Represented By: Jack C. Woodside
Represented By: Lawrence Thomas Woodlock
Represented By: Zackery Paul Morazzini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis J. Herrera
Represented By: Andrew N Shen
Represented By: Jonathan Givner
Represented By: Jill Ellen Habig
Represented By: Mollie Mindes Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Montgomery
Represented By: Zackery Paul Morazzini
Represented By: Lawrence Thomas Woodlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Rotunda
Represented By: Heather M. Rowan
Represented By: Jack C. Woodside
Represented By: Zackery Paul Morazzini
Represented By: Lawrence Thomas Woodlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Ravel
Represented By: Heather M. Rowan
Represented By: Jack C. Woodside
Represented By: Zackery Paul Morazzini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Eskovitz
Represented By: Heather M. Rowan
Represented By: Jack C. Woodside
Represented By: Zackery Paul Morazzini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala Harris
Represented By: Daniel J. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?