Winters, et al v. Jordan, et al

Plaintiff: Brent Winters, Susan Winters, Jeremiah Winters, Cacey Winters, Jennifer Winters, Christy Winters, Joy Winters, Clark Winters and Jill Winters
Defendant: Delores Jordan, Tamaran Cook, Kelly Carpenter, Thomas M. Anderson, Charles O'Rourke, Delores Spindler, Adult Protective Services of Nevada County, Hilary Burget, Connie Beckett, Audrey Golden, Kiera Jefferson, Teresa Long, Burrows' Security Forces, Ryan Burrows, Sean Metroka, Keith Royal, Jan Paul Miller, Guy Selleck, Richard Kimball, Klutz, Joe McCormack, Zsa Zsa Wied, Robert Bringolf, Dominique Lafountain, Tess Kingsbury, J. Martin, - - Saunders, Hutson, Jesse King, Micah Arbaugh, C. Sharp, Susan McGuire, Judy Ford, David Silber, Matt Steen, Clifford Newell, John Taylor, Cheryl Wade, Elaine LaCroix, Alicia Milhous, Jeffrey S. Brown, Valerie Logsdon, Patrick Chesley, Hilary Frooman, Bernard Coleman, Dewey Harpainter, Candace Heidelberger, Michael Armstrong and Virginia Armstrong
Case Number: 2:2009cv00522
Filed: February 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: El Dorado
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1983 Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER with FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/25/2013. Defendant Nevada County's 352 354 358 361 364 Motions to Compel are DENIED without prejudice as MOOT. All scheduled date and deadlines in action are VACATED. Court is RECOMMENDING action be dismissed with prejudice and Clerk be directed to close this case. These Findings and Recommendations are SUBMITTED to Judge District Judge John A. Mendez. Within 14 days after being served with these F/Rs, any party may file written Objections with Court and serve a copy on all parties. All Discovery and Motion practice in action are STAYED pending resolution of Findings and Recommendations by District Judge Mendez. (Marciel, M)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/9/13 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' objections (ECF No. 386 ) are OVERRULED; All provisions of the court's 9/23/13 order (ECF No. 385 ) remain in full effect; The Thursday 10/24/13 he aring and discovery conference, set to take place at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 25 before the undersigned is CONFIRMED. All plaintiffs and all remaining defendants (or counsel for those defendants) shall personally appear at the hearing and conference, and no telephonic appearances will be permitted by any party. (Becknal, R)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/23/2013 OVERRULING 383 Objections; DENYING 383 Renewed Request for Electronic Filing; SETTING a Hearing on Nevada County's Motions to Compel as well as a Discovery Hearing for 10/24/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman; ORDERING all plaintiffs and all remaining defendants (or counsel for those defendants) to personally appear at said hearing. (Michel, G)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/13/13 ORDERING that for purposes of clarity, all provisions of the court's 9/6/13 order remain in full effect; Failure to timely pay the monetary sanctions imposed by the 9/6/13 order and /or failure to appear in person at the 9/19/13 hearing by any plaintiff(s) will result in a recommendation that all claims of that plaintiff (s) in this action be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (Becknal, R)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/6/13 ORDERING that Within seven (7) days of this order, each plaintiff shall individually pay $100 in monetary sanctions based on their failure to substantially comply with the Court� 39;s 8/9/13 order and Local Rule 251. All plaintiffs shall personally appear at the 9/19/13 hearing on Nevada County's motions to compel, which will take place at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 25. Plaintiffs shall be prepared to discuss the d iscovery dispute and why additional sanctions, including payment of Nevada Countys attorneys fees related to the motions to compel, should not be imposed. No telephonic appearances will be permitted. Failure to timely pay the monetary sanctions imposed by this order and/or failure to appear in person at the 9/19/13 hearing by any Plaintiff(s) will result in a recommendation that all claims of that Plaintiff (s) in this action be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(b).(Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/9/13 ORDERING that Plaintiffs shall meet and confer in good faith with defendant Nevada County with respect to defendant's motions to compel. If the parties are unable to resolve their dispute informally, the parties shall file a joint statement regarding their discovery disagreement no later than 9/6/2013. The court will not consider any additional legal argument or briefing. (Kastilahn, A)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/21/12 ORDERING that 346 plaintiffs' motion for leave to file objections to the magistrate's findings andrecommendations re: attorney fees for defendant Ford, construed as a request to submit a late-filed motion for reconsideration, is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' 347 "objections", construed as a motion for reconsideration, are DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/9/2012 ORDERING 124 , 125 The Marshal's request for reimbursement of service-related fees as to defendant Dewey Harpainter is GRANTED; within 45 days of the date of this order, Harpainte r shall pay to the United States Marshals Service the amount of $153.00; Harpainter shall file a very brief notice of payment with the court within 14 days of such payment; the Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshals Service. (cc: USM)(Reader, L)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/10/12 DENYING 128 Request for Reimbursement of Fees. Within 45 days of the date of service of this order, defendants Dewey Harpainter, Sue Roderick, Donald R. Staggs, Kathy Hammen McBride, Jan Paul Mill, er Steven Tinsley, and John Taylor shall either (1) show good cause why he or she failed to waive service, or (2) pay to the United States Marshals Service the costs of personal service reflected on the USM-285 form associated with the service of that defendant. If any of these defendants chooses to pay the costs rather than show good cause, he or she shall promptly notify the court of such payment. (cc: USM). (Meuleman, A)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/26/12 ORDERING that attorney David S. Silber is SANCTIONED in amount of $250, payable to the Clerk of this court within 30 days of the date of this order. (Benson, A.)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/15/2012 GRANTING Plaintiffs 30 day from 3/15/2012 to effectuate service of process on Defendant Cheryl Wade. By the close of the above-described 30-day period, plaintiffs shall file a declaration under penalty of perjury that explains their efforts to serve Wade. (Michel, G)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER adopting 311 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/9/12. Defendant Delores Jordans motion to dismiss 257 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendant David Silber's motion to dismiss 258 is GRANTED. All of plaintiffs' claims alleged against Silber are dismissed with prejudice, and Silber is dismissed from this action. Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment 189 is DENIED as to defendant Delores Jordan. (Kastilahn, A) (Kastilahn, A)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/7/12; The request of plaintiffs Brent, Susan, Christy, Cacey, and Jennifer Winters to appear by telephone at the March 15, 2012 status conference is granted. Plaintiffs shall promptly contact t he undersigned's Courtroom Deputy, at (916) 930-4187, and provide a land-line telephone number at which all plaintiffs may be reached at the time of the conference by telephone. The failure of any plaintiff to appear at the conference may result in the imposition of monetary or non-monetary sanctions on that plaintiff.(Matson, R)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER adopting 306 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 2/10/12: 116 Motion to Dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. The County Defendants' motion for a more definite statement is denied. (Kaminski, H)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/3/12; A Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference shall be held on March 15, 2012, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom No. 25. All parties or their respective counsel shall appear either in person or by telephone. If any party wishes to appear by telephone, he or she shall contact the undersigned's Courtroom Deputy, at (916) 930-4187, at least seven days prior to the scheduling conference to discuss the manner in which appearances by telephone proceed. The parties shall file a status report, or a joint status report if possible, on or before March 1, 2012. The status report or reports shall address the topics identified in paragraph 5 of the court's Scheduling Order (Dkt. No. 3), Loc al Rule 240(a), and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(c)(2). To the extent that any appearing defendants against whom claims remain have not filed answers to the Third Amended Complaint, they shall do so no later than February 17, 2012. The defenda nts who are the subject of the pending findings and recommendations (Dkt. Nos. 306, 311), and defendants Adult Protective Services, Kelly Carpenter, and Tamaran Cook, shall file answers to the Third Amended Complaint within 14 days of the resolution of those pending findings and recommendations. (Matson, R)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 311 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/1/12 Recommending that Defendant Delores Jordan's MOTION TO DISMISS 257 be granted in part and denied in part. Defendant David Silber's Motion to Dismiss 258 be granted. Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judment 189 be denied as to defendant Delores Jordan. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to U.S. District Judge John A. Mendez. Objections to these F&R due within fourteen days. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 306 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/9/2011 RECOMMENDING that the County defendants' # 116 motion to dismiss be granted in part and denied in part; and the County defendants motion for a more definite statement be denied; Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these F & R's. (Reader, L)
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/19/2011 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 292 are ADOPTED; pltfs' # 189 motion for default judgment is DENIED; dft John Taylor's motion to dismiss # 199 is GRANTED on the ground that this Court lacks personal jurisdiction over him, and Taylor is DISMISSED from this action; dfts 186 motion to dismiss is GRANTED on the ground that this court lacks personal jurisdiction over them, and these dfts are DISMISSED from this action. (Reader, L)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/6/11 ORDERING that to the extent 294 Objections to Findings and Recommendations is an application for reconsideration of 284 Order, that application for reconsideration is DENIED. (Meuleman, A)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/20/11, ORDERING that 232 plaintiffs' Motion to Join Defendants Benjamin Wagner and J. Earlene Gordon is DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 292 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 06/17/11 RECOMMENDING that the 189 Motion for Default Judgment be denied, 199 MOTION to DISMISS be granted, and the 186 Motion to Dismiss be granted. Motions referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Michel, G)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER adopting 268 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/10/11. Dfts' 116 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART; all claims against dfts Adult Protective Services, Kelly Carpenter and Tamaran Cook - except pltf Susan Winters equal protection claim (claim 7) - are DISMISSED with prejudice. All claims against Jeffrey S. Brown are DISMISSED with prejudice and Jeffrey S. Brown is DISMISSED from this action. (Manzer, C)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/20/11 ORDERING Defendant Judy Ford's motion for attorneys' fees and costs (Dkt. No. 204) is denied without prejudice. Ford may file and serve supplemental materials substantiating a re vised award of attorneys' fees and costs sought. Plaintiffs' may file objections to any supplemental filing, and shall do so within seven days of being served with the supplemental filing. Plaintiff's objections shall not exceed ten pa ges; Defendant Valerie Logsdon's motion for attorney's fees and costs (Dkt. No. 202) is granted; Defendant Valerie Logsdon is awarded a total of $12,925.00 in attorney's fees and $368.70 in costs, to be paid jointly and severally by the following plaintiffs: Brent Allan Winters, Cacey Winters, Christy Winters, Jennifer Winters, Jeremiah Winters, and Susan Winters. (Matson, R)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 281 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/14/2011 RECOMMENDING that Pltf Jeremiah Winters's be permitted to withdraw as a Pltf in this action, subject to conditions. Pltf Jeremiah Winters's be subject to the judgments already entered in favor of dfs Judy Ford, Ryan Arbuckle, and Burrows Security Force. Pltf Jeremiah Winters's remain jointly and severally liable for any award of attorneys' fees and costs that the undersigned awards to dfts Ford and Logsdon pursuant to California's anti-SLAPP statute as a result of Ford's and Logsdon's successful anti-SLAPP motions. Any remaining claims asserted by Pltf Jeremiah Winters be dismissed with prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Zignago, K.)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 268 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/11/11 RECOMMENDING that 116 Motion to Dismiss be granted in part as to the following named defendants: Adult Protective Services, Kelly Carpenter, Tamaran Cook, and Jeff rey S. Brown; All of plaintiffs claims alleged against defendants Adult Protective Services, Kelly Carpenter, and Tamaran Cook except plaintiff Susan Winterss equal protection claim (claim 7)be dismissed with prejudice; All of plaintiffs claims alleged against defendant Jeffrey S. Brown be dismissed with prejudice, and that defendant Jeffrey S. Brown be dismissed from this action. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 267 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/8/11 RECOMMENDING that Defendant Dewey Harpainter's motion to dismiss the Third Amended Complaint 131 be granted in part and denied in part; and All of plaintiffs&# 039; claims alleged against Defendant Dewey Harpainter, except the claim of trespass on land asserted by plaintiffs Cacey and Jennifer Winters, be dismissed with prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Becknal, R)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 02/18/11 ORDERING that the 253 , 254 Ex Parte Applications for leave to file responsive motions is GRANTED; the ( 253 ) 257 , ( 254 ) 258 Motions to Dismiss are deemed filed 02/17/11 and sha ll be heard 03/31/11 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Mr. Silber shall serve plfs with the ex parte applications, this order, and the moving papers in support of the two responsive motions w/i 7 days and shall then file a brief declaration attesting that he timely served the documents identified above on plaintiff. (Benson, A.) Modified on 2/18/2011 (Benson, A.).
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/14/2011 GRANITNG 248 Request for Telephonic Appearance. (Zignago, K.)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 247 MINUTE ORDER by Courtroom Deputy M. Caspar for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/11/2011 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' notice of rescheduling the February 17, 2011 hearing on their motion for default judgment 232 is DISREGARDED because: (1) the motion is fully briefed, (2) plaintiffs have provided no basis for rescheduling the hearing, and (3) several other motions in this case are on for hearing on February 17, 2011, and plaintiffs have requested that those matters be submitted on the briefs. Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment will be heard on February 17, 2011, unless the court submits that motion on the briefs in advance of the hearing. (Caspar, M)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/2/2011 ORDERING that plaintiff's 203 Motion to File Electronically is DENIED. (Duong, D)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/31/11 on 1/31/11 ORDERING the findings and recommendations 211 are ADOPTED; and the minor pltfs Joy Winters, Clark Winters and Jill Winters are DISMISSED from this case without prejudice. (Carlos, K)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/24/2011 ORDERING that the hearing on Pltfs' 203 motion to file electronically will remain on calendar for 2/3/2011. The hearing date re 189 motion for default judgment, 186 motion to dismiss, 199 motion to dismiss, 202 motion for attorney's fees and 204 motion for attorney's fees is CONTINUED to 2/17/2011. Pltfs shall show cause, by 2/3/2011, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to prosecute and failure to file timely written oppositions. Pltfs shall also file separate oppositions to each motion to dismiss and each motion for attorneys fees by 2/3/2011. The Federal Dfts shall show cause, by 2/3/2011, why sanctions should not be imposed for their failure file a written opposition to Pltfs' motion for default judgment. The Federal Dfts shall also file a written opposition to Pltf's motion for default judgment by 2/3/2011. (Zignago, K.)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/16/2010 GRANTING 208 AND 209 Motion to Continue; The hearing on plaintiffs' motion for default judgment (Dkt. No. 189) is continued from December 30, 2010, to February 3, 2011; The hea ring on plaintiffs' motion to file electronically (Dkt. No. 203) is continued from December 30, 2010, to February 3, 2011; The hearing on the motion to dismiss plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by the Federal Defendants (Dkt. No. 18 6) is continued from December 30, 2010,to February 3, 2011; The hearing on defendant John Taylor's motion to dismiss plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 199, 200) is continued from December 30, 2010, to February 3, 2011. At least 28 days prior to the continued hearing date, defendant John Taylor shall file aproof of service evidencing proper service of his motion on plaintiffs, who are proceeding pro se. The hearing on defendant Valerie Logsdon's motion for attorney' ;s fees (Dkt. No. 202) is continued from December 30, 2010, to February 3, 2011. The hearing on defendant Judy Ford's motion for attorney's fees (Dkt. No. 204) is continued from December 30, 2010, to February 3, 2011. In their oppositions to the motions listed above, plaintiffs shall also state whether they will attend the February 3, 2011 hearing on the motions, unless the undersignedtakes the motions under submission without a hearing.(Matson, R)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 211 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/16/2010 recommending that minor plts Joy Winters, Clark Winters and Jill Winters be dismissed from this case without prejudice. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations.(Duong, D)
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 201 JUDGMENT dated *11/8/10* for Defendants Burrows Security Forces and Ryan Arbuckle signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/5/10. (Becknal, R)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 198 JUDGMENT For Defendants Burrows Security Forces and Rayn Arbuckle signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/26/10. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 194 JUDGMENT dated *10/20/2010* in favor of Judy Ford against each and all plaintiffs pursuant to order signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/20/2010. (Matson, R)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting 184 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/15/10. The time for dft Taylor to file his responsive pleading to the [Third] Amended Complaint is hereby extended to and until 11/15/10.(Kastilahn, A)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/13/10 ORDERING that the Proposed FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 8/02/10 148 are ADOPTED; Defendants Burrows' Security Forces' and Ryan Arbuckle's MOTION to DISMISS the Third Amended Complaint 79 is GRANTED. All of Plaintiffs' claims alleged against Defendants Burrows Security Forces and Ryan Arbuckle are DISMISSED with prejudice. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/25/10: The OSC entered August 4, 2010 is discharged 149 . Plaintiffs' improperly brought motions for miscellaneous relief as to defendant Harpainter are denied 119 . (Kaminski, H)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/4/10 ORDERING that the hrg on dft Dewey Harpainter's motion to dismiss is reset to 9/9/10; Plaintiffs shall show cause, in writing, by 8/12/10, why sanctions, including dismissal of their c laims against Harpainter, should not be imposed for failure to timely file an opposition or statement of non-opposition to the pending motion; Plaintiffs shall file a written opposition or statement of non-opposition to the pending motion to dismiss by 8/19/10. Failure to file a written opposition shall be deemed a statement of non-opposition, and shall constitute additional grounds for the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including dismissal; Defendant Harpainter may file a reply to plaintiffs' opposition, if needed, on or before 9/2/10. (Becknal, R)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 148 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 07/29/10 RECOMMENDING that the 79 motion to dismiss be granted and that all claims alleged against dfts Burrows Security Forces and Ryan Arbuckle be dismissed with prejudice. Motion referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Manzer, C)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 147 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/26/10 Recommending that Defendant Virginia Armstrong's MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint 84 be granted in part. The civil battery claim alleged on Joy W inters' behalf be dismissed with prejudice. All of the remaining claims alleged against Virginia Armstrong, except for Plaintiff Christy Winters' civil battery claim (claim 9) and Plaintiffs' breach of contract claim (claim 22) be dism issed with prejudice. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to U.S. District Judge John A. Mendez. Within fourteen days after being served with these Findings and Recommendations, any party may file written objections with the Court and serve a copyon all parties. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 146 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/19/2010 recommending that Defendant Michael Armstrong's motion to dismiss the Third Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 82, 85) be granted; and all of plaintiffs' claims alleged against Michael Armstrong be dismissed with prejudice. Objections to F&R due w/in 14 days. (Matson, R)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 144 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/19/10 RECOMMENDING that the Judicial Defendants' motion to dismiss 107 be granted and that plaintiffs' claims against defendants Thomas A. Anderson, Candace He idelberger, Delores Spindler, Hilary Berardi (formerly known as Hilary Burget), Connie Beckett, Audrey Golden, Kiira Jefferson, Teresa Long, and Sean Metroka be dismissed with prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Becknal, R)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/15/2010 ORDERING that defendant Valerie Logsdon's 77 answer to plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint is stricken without prejudice to refiling. If necessary, Logsdon may file an answe r to the Third Amended Complaint within 14 days after the court has fully resolved her special 72 motion to strike and motion to dismiss. The court will resolve Logsdon's special motion to strike and motion to dismiss through a separate order and/or proposed findings and recommendations.(Duong, D)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/15/2010 ORDERING Plaintiffs' motion to vacate the January 20, 2010 hearing, Dckt. No. 101, is granted; The January 20, 2010 hearings on the pending motions to strike, dismiss, and/or for more definite statement are vacated; and Plaintiffs' motion to remove attorney David Silber, Dckt. No. 100, is denied without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 230.(Matson, R)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/13/09: Plaintiffs' October 8, 2009 objection to the September 24, 2009 order, is construed as a request for reconsideration of that order and is denied 71 . Plaintiffs' October 8, 20 09 affidavit is construed as a response to the September 24, 2009 order to show cause and that order to show cause, is discharged 68 . The Clerk of the Court is directed to issue forthwith all process for those defendants named in plaintiffs' t hird amended complaint. The Clerk of Court shall send plaintiffs the aforementioned summons, along with 52 USM-285 forms, a copy of the complaint, this court's February 24, 2009 scheduling order, this court's September 24, 2009 order, this order, and the forms providing notice of the magistrate judge's availability to exercise jurisdiction for all purposes and the court's voluntary dispute resolution program. The Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of this order on the USM. St atus Conference RESET for 3/17/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. HEARING as to 72 MOTION to STRIKE, 84 MOTION to DISMISS, 85 AMENDED MOTION to DISMISS, 69 MOTION to STRIKE, 79 MOTION to DISMISS RESET for 1/20/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Kaminski, H)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/16/09 ORDERING that the proposed Findings and Recommendations filed 8/24/09, are ADOPTED; Plaintiffs' motion to stay this action, 17 , is DENIED; and Plaintiffs' motions for default judgment on their Second Amended Complaint, and related motion to amend, 57 , 60 , and 64 , are DENIED. (Becknal, R) Modified on 10/19/2009 (Becknal, R).
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/21/09 ORDERING that Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint is dismissed with leave to file a Third Amended Complaint that is in strict conformance with the require ments set forth herein. Plaintiffs shall file their Third Amended Complaint within 30 days after the filing date of this order. Plaintiffs shall complete service of process of their Third Amended Complaint, as set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, and de scribed herein, within 60 days after it is filed. Failure of plaintiffs to timely file a Third Amended Complaint, or failure of the Third Amended Complaint to strictly comply with the requirements set forth herein, shall result in a recommendation t hat this action be dismissed with prejudice. Defendants' 33 34 42 motions to dismiss and to strike the Second Amended Complaint, are DENIED as moot. Plaintiffs' 52 "Information Notice of Refusal to Consent to Magistrate' s Hearing of Motions and to Vacate Hearing,", construed as a motion to have all pretrial matters heard by the district judge, is DENIED. Plaintiffs' 7 request for reimbursement of their filing fee in Civ. No. 09- 0534 FCD DAD PS is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Plaintiffs' 17 motion to stay this action, be denied. Objections due within ten days after being served with these findings and recommendations.(Duong, D) Modified on 10/20/2009 (Becknal, R).
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 41 and 47 Motions to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/19/09. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the USCA for the Ninth Circuit. (Kastilahn, A)
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/16/2009 ORDERING 4 MOTION emergency ex parte telephonic hearing is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that 5 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION be denied; Pltfs ' "Motion for Emergency Injunctive Relief," Dckt. No. 5, be DENIED; Nevada County Superior Court Case No. M09-0139 a, and b (Dckt. No. 6), and Nos.74512, 74513, and 74515 (Dckt. No. 8) be REMANDED to the Nevada County Superior Court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1446(c)(4). Objections to F&R due w/in 10 days. (Matson, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winters, et al v. Jordan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cacey Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clark Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delores Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamaran Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas M. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delores Spindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adult Protective Services of Nevada County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilary Burget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Beckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiera Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burrows' Security Forces
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Burrows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Metroka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Royal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Paul Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Selleck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Kimball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Klutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zsa Zsa Wied
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bringolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominique Lafountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tess Kingsbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - - Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micah Arbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Silber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Steen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine LaCroix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Milhous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey S. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Logsdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Chesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilary Frooman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewey Harpainter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candace Heidelberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?