Bun v. Felker et al
Plaintiff: Chanthon Bun
Defendant: L Balding, T. Felker, Wright, R Wong, T. Perez, Jackson, Dangler, J Kelly, Dhrlingue, G. Marshall, D. J. Brown, J Marsh, M. Speiker, L Wolcott, H. Weaver, M Perry, M. DeForest, J Ehrilich, Cagle, H. Kirkland, R. Essman, M Williams, S Summer, R Robison, Sanchez, Kisssinger, R Gardiner, M Johnston, S Conway, B Phelps, C. Lower, C Ringer, D Probst, K. Lawrence, D Milbride, C. Barcus, J. Hook, J Smith, B Ramsey, O. Smith, G Crowe, S. Spalding, T Kich, T Smith, D - Fletcher, D Pittman, E Meraz, B Hurlbert, C Walker, L Betti, C Aston, J Colman, K Callison, D Guilbeax, D Phang, K Kingsley, P Sherman, K. Gullion, Z Aurich, J Little, R - Adams, K Silva, G Handschumaker, J Ramsey, J. Barron, J Barton, R Kampa, D Eldridge, D Cooper, Hays, Renner, - Gill, Logan, Stone, Mowry, S Jones, S Acton, G Jones, Stalter, Homes, Beasly, R Garate, Menner, J. Watkins, M Garrison and F - Bates
Case Number: 2:2009cv00631
Filed: March 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/11/14 ORDERING that no later than Wednesday, September 17, 2014, defendants shall file and serve a document stipulating to dismissal of this action without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii),1 or otherwise respond to plaintiffs motion to dismiss. (Dillon, M)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/28/14: Jury trial is scheduled to begin on November 17, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom No. 8, 13th Floor, before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. The Clerk of the Court is directed to update and delete Felker from the case caption. The Clerk of the Court shall terminate docket numbers 118, 127, 129, and 130. (Kaminski, H)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/12/13 ordering the clerk of the court is directed to vacate the order of dismissal and judgement 115 , 116 and reopen this case. Plaintiff's request for appointment of counsel 117 is denied. Defendants shall file a pretrial statement within 30 days of the date of this order. (Plummer, M)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/03/13 ordering this action is dismissed without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Plummer, M)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/14/13 ordering plaintiff's request for court assistance 113 is denied. (Plummer, M)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/30/13 ORDERING that any hearing dates currently set before the undersigned are VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court reassign this case to the Honorable Edmund F. Brennan, United States Magistrate Judge. All future documents filed in the abovecaptioned case shall reference the following case number: No. Civ. S-09-0631 EFB P.(Dillon, M)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/18/13 ORDERING that within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file and serve a pretrial statement and any motions necessary to obtain the attendance of witnesses at trial. De fendants shall file a pretrial statement not later than 30 days after the filing of plaintiffs statement. Pretrial conference (as described in Local Rule 282) will be conducted on the file only, without appearance by either party. The date for jury trial before the assigned district judge will be set in the pretrial order.(Dillon, M)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/09/13 ordering the parties to this action shall each, no later than 30 days from the date of this order, submit confidential statements as decribed below. The confidenital statments shall not be served on the opposing party or filed with the court, but instead, delivered by mai, fax, email or personal delivery to the court's Alternative Dispute Resolution (ADR) division at the address, fax number or email address below and marked confidential. (see order for further details)(cc: ADR Director)(Plummer, M)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/7/13 ORDERING that the findings and recommendations filed 3/26/13, are adopted in full; Defendants' 8/3/12 motion for summary judgment is granted as to defendants Brown, Marsh, Watkins, and Felker ; and this action proceeds only on plaintiff's requests for damages and injunctive relief based on the following claims: an Eighth Amendment claim against defendants Perry, Hook, Lower, Handshumacker, and Ramsey based on the escort in freezing temperatures with restraints andminimal clothing; an Eighth Amendment claim against defendants Sanchez and Essman based on the denial of food from 11/25/06 to 11/28/06; an Eighth Amendment claim against defendant Kirkland based on the rough treatment of plaintiff in the holding cell; an Eighth Amendment claims against defendants Kirkland, Kissinger, Sanchez, Garate, and Aurich based on their tampering with/denial of food, and frequent cell searches, resulting in the flooding of plaintiff's cell and bedding and the confiscation or destruction of his toiletries; and a First Amendment retaliation claim against defendants Kirkland,Kissinger, Sanchez, Garate, and Aurich based on their destruction of plaintiff's personal property, mail, and inmate appeals because plaintiff filed, or attempted to file, administrative appeals. (Becknal, R)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 03/26/13 recommending that defendants' 08/03/12 motion for summary judgment be granted as to defendants Brown, Marsh, Watkins, and Felker; and that this action proceed on plaintiff's request for damages and injunctive relief based on the following claims: a)an Eighth Amendment claim against defendants Perry, Hook, Lower, Handshumacker, and Ramsey based on the escort in freezing temperatures with restraints and minimal clothing; b) an Eighth Amendment claim against defendants Sanchez and Essman based on the denial of food from 11/25/06 to 11/28/06; c) an Eighth Amendment claim against defendant Kirkland based on the rough treatment of plaintiff in the hold ing cell; d) an Eighth Amendment claims against defendants Kirkland, Kissinger, Sanchez, Garate and Aurich based on their tampering with/denial of food, and frequent cell searches, resulting in the flooding of plaintiff's cell and bedding and th e confiscation or destruction of his toiletries; and e) a First Amendment retaliation claim against defendants Kirkland, Kissinger, Sanchez, Garate and Aurich based on their destruction of plaintiff's personal property, mail and inmate appeals because plaintiff filed, or attempted to file, administrative appeals. MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 86 referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/24/2012 ORDERING that defendants' 79 motion for summary judgment is DENIED without prejudice; within 14 days, defendants may re-file and re-serve the 1/27/12 motion for summary judgment a long with the Rand Notice; if defendants re-serve their motion, plaintiff may thereafter file and serve an amended opposition within 30 days; if plaintiff files an amended opposition, defendants may file an amended reply within 14 days thereafter. (Yin, K)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 06/18/12 ordering that the clerk of the court terminate docket entries 72 , 73 and 80 . (Plummer, M)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/5/11 ORDERING that Defendants 74 request for an extension of time, is GRANTED; Defendants 76 notice of withdrawal and motion to strike, is GRANTED, and defendants 75 opposition brief, is STRICKEN. Defendants shall file their oppositions to plaintiffs motions to modify the discovery and scheduling order and to compel discovery, on or before December 12, 2011.(Dillon, M)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/30/11 ORDERING that 65 "proposed motion for discovery" is STRICKEN and the Clerk ofthe Court shall make a notation on the docket to that effect; 67 Motion for Extension of time is GRANTED. (Dillon, M)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/17/2011 ORDERING that Pltf's 59 Motion to Stay Discovery is GRANTED. The discovery deadlines set forth in the 5/23/2011 order are VACATED. The dispositive motion deadline set forth in the 3/30/2011 order is VACATED. Pltf shall inform the court, within 7 days, of his return to the CSATF or other CDCR institution. Thereafter, the court will issue an amended discovery and scheduling order for the completion of discovery and filing of dispositive motions. (Zignago, K.)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/23/2011 ORDERING 50 Motion to Stay Discovery is GRANTED to the extent that the 3/30/2011 discovery and scheduling order is modified as provided in this order; denying 55 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 56 Motion for an interpreter. (Waggoner, D)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/3/2011 GRANTING dfts' 52 request to conduct pltf's deposition via video-conference. (Yin, K)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 04/05/11 granting 40 Motion to Amend the Complaint. Defendants are excused from responding to an amended complaint, should it be filed, as it will state no new allegations against them. The clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff a copy of the complaint filed 03/06/09. (Plummer, M)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/30/11 ORDERING that 44 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. (Dillon, M)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/25/11 ORDERING the findings and recommendations 42 are adopted in full; and Defendants' motion to dismiss for failure to exhaust administrative remedies 23 is denied.(Becknal, R)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/16/2011 ORDERING dfts to Show Cause, w/in 14 days, as to why it was proper for them to file pltf's unredacted medical records w/ the court.(Yin, K)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/28/11 RECOMMENDING that 23 Motion to Dismiss for failure to exhaust administrative remedies be denied. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/08/10 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 11/24/10 REQUEST for appointment of Counsel 39 is DENIED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying 17 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/3/10. (Kaminski, H)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 04/12/10 ordering that plaintiff's claims against all remaining defendants are dismissed without prejudice. (C Aston; L Balding; C. Barcus; J. Barron; J Barton; F Bates; Beasly; L Betti; Cag le; K Callison; J Colman; S Conway; D Cooper; G Crowe; Dangler; M. DeForest; Dhrlingue; J Ehrigich; D Eldridge; D Fletcher; R Gardiner; M Garrison; Gill; D Guilbeax; K. Gullion; Hays; Homes; B Hurlbert; Jackson; M Johnston; G Jones; S Jones; R Kampa; J Kelly; T Kich; K Kingsley; K. Lawrence; J Little; Logan; G. Marshall; Menner; E Meraz; D Milbride; Mowry; T. Perez; D Phang; B Phelps; D Pittman; D Probst; J Ramsey; Renner; C Ringer; R Robison; P Sherman; K Silva; J Smith; O. Smith; T Smith; S. Spalding; M. Speiker; Stalter; Stone; S Summer; C Walker; H. Weaver; M Williams; L Wolcott; R Wong; Wright; S Acton and R Adams terminated.)(Plummer, M)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/25/10 DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT SERVICE DOCUMENTS and USM-285 Forms within 20 days. Service is appropriate for Watkins, Perry, Hook, Lower, Hanshumaker, Ramsey, Sanchez, Essman, Kirkland, Garate, Kissinger, Marsh, Brown, Aurich, and Felker. Clerk to send plaintiff: 1 Summons, 15 USM-285 Forms, and 1 copy of the Amended Complaint filed on 3/26/09. Plaintiff's 8 Motion to proceed IFP is GRANTED.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bun v. Felker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Balding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Felker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dangler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dhrlingue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. J. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Speiker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Wolcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. DeForest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Ehrilich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Essman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Summer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Robison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kisssinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Gardiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Lower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Ringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Probst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Milbride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Barcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Crowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Kich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D - Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Meraz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Hurlbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Betti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Aston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Colman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Callison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Guilbeax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Phang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Kingsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Gullion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z Aurich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R - Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Handschumaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Kampa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Acton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beasly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Garate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F - Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chanthon Bun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?