November 21, 2012 |
Filing
75
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/20/2012 ORDERING that because plaintiff brings a frivolous appeal, his request to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. (Zignago, K.)
|
July 10, 2012 |
Filing
65
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/10/2012 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
May 15, 2012 |
Filing
61
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/15/12 denying 59 Motion for a protective order. Plaintiff must file an opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment no later than 30 days from the date of this order. Absent good cause, the court does not intend to grant additional extensions of time. As a 1 time courtesy, the clerk is directed to mail to plaintiff a copy of the docket sheet in this action. (Plummer, M)
|
April 19, 2012 |
Filing
58
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/19/12 ORDERING that the pltf shall file either an opposition or a statement of non-opposition to the 53 Motion for Summary Judgment within 21 days. (Manzer, C)
|
March 19, 2012 |
Filing
57
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/16/12 DENYING 55 Motion for delivery of property. (Dillon, M)
|
March 6, 2012 |
Filing
56
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/5/2012 DENYING plaintiff's 51 request for appointment of counsel and his 52 request for an extension of time. (Yin, K)
|
November 9, 2011 |
Filing
48
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/9/2011 DENYING 46 Motion to Appoint Counsel; GRANTING, in part, 42 Motion to Compel, Plaintiff shall provide discovery responses and submit to deposition as stated herein, Defendants' request for monetary sanctions is DENIED; GRANTING 44 Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order. Despositive Motions due within 90 days. (Michel, G)
|
September 20, 2011 |
Filing
45
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 09/20/11 ordering the order to show cause issued 05/17/11 is discharged. Within 21 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file either an opposition to the motion to compel filed 07/14/11 or a statement of non opposition. (Plummer, M)
|
July 28, 2011 |
Filing
43
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/27/11 ORDERING that, upon reconsideration, the order of the magistrate judge filed 5/17/11, is AFFIRMED. (Becknal, R)
|
May 17, 2011 |
Filing
39
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/17/2011 ORDERING that pltf's 31 request for appointment of counsel is DENIED; w/in 45 days, dfts shall inquire into the status of any restrictions on pltf's access to his legal materials, eyeglasses, and the law library and any restrictions on pltf's ability to write and shall SHOW CAUSE why a protective order limiting or lifting such restrictions should not issue.(Yin, K)
|
December 8, 2010 |
Filing
19
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/8/10 ORDERING that plaintiff has 20 days from the date of this order either to explain his failure to comply with the November 16, 2010 order, or to submit three copies of his October 18, 2010 amended complaint. Clerk of the Court is directed to send to plaintiff one copy of the October 18, 2010 pleading. (Dillon, M)
|
November 16, 2010 |
Filing
17
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/16/10 ORDERING claims against dfts Mathew L. Cate and E. A. Reyes are DISMISSED with 30 days leave to amend; the allegations in the amended complaint are sufficient at least to state cognizable claims against dfts Machado, Knipp, Martel, Lucas, Vanderlip, DeBoard, and Bueno; the Clerk shall provide pltf a blank summons, copy of 10/18/10 amended complaint, 7 USM forms and instructions for service. Pltf to return completed documents within 30 days of service of this order. (Carlos, K)
|
August 13, 2010 |
Filing
12
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/12/10 ORDERING that pltf's 8 request to proceed IFP is GRANTED; pltf to pay the $350.00 filing fee in accordance w/ the concurrent CDC order (filed 8/6/10); the cmplt is DISMISSED w/ leave to amend w/in 30 days. (Yin, K)
|
August 6, 2010 |
Filing
10
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/5/10 ORDERING the director of the CDC to collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter, forward payment from the prison trust account of Earl Warner to the cler k until the balance of $350 is paid in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Director of the CDC. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial, CDC Prisoner Payment Orders )(Dillon, M)
|
November 4, 2009 |
Filing
7
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/4/09 ORDERING that pltf has 30 days to submit either the filing fee or the ifp application; the clerk to mail pltf an ifp application form. (Yin, K)
|