August 31, 2012 |
Filing
67
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/31/12 ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Dillon, M)
|
August 17, 2012 |
Filing
65
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/17/12 ORDERING that defendants notify this court, within seven days, whether they have any objection to the dismissal of this action. Should defendants fail to respond, plaintiffs request will be granted. (Dillon, M)
|
April 30, 2012 |
Filing
61
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 04/30/12 granting 59 Motion for leave to file an answer. Defendants' answer filed on 04/27/12 is deemed timely filed. (Plummer, M)
|
March 28, 2012 |
Filing
55
ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/27/12; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that in regard to the Motion To Dismiss (Dkt. No. 19) and the Findings and Recommendations (Dkt. No. 54): 1. The following Findings and Recommendations are adopted in full: a. The denial of defendants' motion to dismiss Claim VI; and b. the denial of the motion to dismiss the complaint based upon qualified immunity. 2. The court declines to adopt the Findings and Recommendations granting defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss Claims I and II for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. 3. This matter is returned to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings not inconsistent with this order. IT IS SO ORDERED.(Matson, R)
|
January 10, 2012 |
Filing
54
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/10/12 ORDERING that Defendants motion to apply Local Rule 230 46 is GRANTED; However, the court does not require oral argument as to the instant motion to di smiss. Plaintiffs motion for the issuance of subpoenas 50 is DENIED without prejudice to renewal at the proper time. It is RECOMMENDED that 19 Motion to Dismiss be granted in part and denied in part. The motion should be granted on Claims I and II of the complaint. The motion should be denied as to Claim VI. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; Objections to F&R due within 21 days.(Dillon, M)
|
September 28, 2011 |
Filing
45
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/28/11 ORDERING that Plaintiffs motions for the address or location of defendants 33 and for a court order requiring defendants to provide service addresses 36 aregranted in part and denied in part. Defendants Singh, Picco, Fox, Sandy and Flores, acting through their counsel, have fourteen days from the entry of this order in which to inform the court whether they are able to provide, after a reasonably diligent inquiry with the CDCR or other resources, the current addresses of defendants D.K. Sisto, R. Wong and C. Scavetta. If defendants obtain that information within the next fourteen days, they shall provide it to the court, through their counsel, under seal. If they are unable to obtain that information, their counsel shall provide a status report, also under seal, describing (1) the extent and nature of their attempts to obtain the necessary information and (2) whether they expect to be able to obtain the information in a reasonable time upon further good faith inquiry. (Dillon, M)
|
September 16, 2011 |
Filing
41
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 09/16/11 denying 37 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 39 Motion for Extension of time. (Plummer, M)
|
June 4, 2010 |
Filing
16
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 06/03/10 granting plaintiff's motion for an extension of time 15 . Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of this order in which to submit the documents necessary for service. To the extent plaintiff requests the court to order CDCR to provide information to facilitate service of process, the request 15 is denied. (Plummer, M)
|
April 28, 2010 |
Filing
14
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/27/10 ORDERING the director of the CDC to collect, from monthly pmts from the plaintiff's prison trust account until the fee is paid in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Director of the CDC. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial, CDC Prisoner Payment Orders ). (Becknal, R)
|
November 19, 2009 |
Filing
9
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/19/09 ORDERING pltf to submit w/in 30 days the certification required on the application form and the signed authorization for collection of the filing fee from his trust acct, pltf's failure to comply will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed w/out prejudice; the clerk to send pltf a new ifp application.(Yin, K)
|
October 23, 2009 |
Filing
6
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/22/2009 ORDERING that Clerk shall provide pltf another copy of the IFP; pltf shall submit completed IFP application within 30 days. (Suttles, J)
|