September 6, 2013 |
Filing
65
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 09/05/13 recommending that defendants' motions for summary judgment 57 and 60 be granted. Motions 57 and 60 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
November 1, 2012 |
Filing
59
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/31/12 ordering plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel 50 is denied. Defendants' motion to modify the schedule to permit plaintiff's deposition to be taken should this ma tter not be resolved on summary judgment 52 is granted. Defendants' motion to modify the schedule 56 to extend the time for filing dispositive motions is granted. Dispositive motions are due by 11/06/12. Plaintiff's motion for an order setting a case management conference 54 is denied. (Plummer, M)
|
March 28, 2012 |
Filing
48
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/27/12 ORDERING that Defendants motions to compel and for sanctions 42 & 43 are GRANTED; Plaintiff shall appear at his properly noticed deposition; Within 30 days of the date of this order, p laintiff shall pay $500.00 to counsel for defendant Medina; Within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall pay $500.00 to counsel for the remaining defendants; The parties requests for modification of the schedule for this case 42 , 43 , 44 , 46 , & 47 are granted; The parties may conduct discovery June 25, 2012; and Dispositive motions are due within 120 days of the close of discovery. (Dillon, M)
|
January 12, 2012 |
Filing
41
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/11/2012 ORDERING that the USM's request for reimbursement of service costs is DENIED; and the 36 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. (cc: USM) (Yin, K)
|
December 16, 2011 |
Filing
37
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/16/11 DENYING 35 Motion for a case management conference to be set. (Dillon, M)
|
December 9, 2011 |
Filing
36
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/8/2011 ORDERING that defendant Medina's 30 "Notice of Waiver" is DISREGARDED; defendant Medina shall file a response to the complaint within 30 days; and defendant Medina shall SHOW CAUSE in writing, within 30 days, why the USM's 34 request should not be granted.(Yin, K)
|
November 21, 2011 |
Filing
32
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/21/11 ordering plaintiff's motion for default judgment is construed as a request for entry of default. So construed 31 plaintiff's request is denied. (Plummer, M)
|
August 25, 2011 |
Filing
29
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/24/11: The parties may conduct discovery until December 23, 2011. All dispositive motions shall be filed within 90 days after the discovery cut-off date. At a later stage in the proceedings, the court will issue a final scheduling order. (Kaminski, H)
|
May 10, 2011 |
Filing
21
ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/10/2011 ORDERING that the 16 findings and recommendations filed February 11, 2011, are adopted infull. This action proceeds on plaintiff's Eighth Amendment medical care claim against defendants Petersen, Hogan, Martin, Arnold, Medina, and Swingle only and all other defendants and claims are dismissed with prejudice. (Duong, D)
|
February 11, 2011 |
Filing
16
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 2/10/2011 RECOMMENDING that this action proceed on pltf's Eighth Amenedment medical care claim against dfts Petersen, Hogan, Martin, Arnold, Medina, and Swingle only; all other dfts and claims be dismissed. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections due w/in 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
November 10, 2010 |
Filing
12
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/09/10 ordering that plaintiff may file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of service of this order. (Plummer, M)
|
May 4, 2010 |
Filing
3
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/3/2010 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall submit on the form provided by the Clerk of the Court, within 30 days from the date of this order, a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with the required certified copy of his trust account statement, or the appropriate filing fee. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Duong, D)
|