Staggs et al v. Doctors Hospital of Manteca, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Linnie Staggs and Melissa Staggs
Defendant: Doctor's Hospital of Manteca, Inc., Ivan D. Clay, Tim Virga, Frank X. Chavez, Sharon Aungst, Jack St. Clair, Curtis Allen, Edwin Bangi, John Krpan, Georgia Thomatos, Lincoln Russin, James P. Owen, Mario Sattah and Jose Valera
Case Number: 2:2011cv00414
Filed: February 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 302 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/1/2021 SUBSTITUTING attorney Carolyn L. Northrop, Esq. with her new associated law firm of Schuering, Zimmerman & Doyle, LLP, State Bar No. 237989, as counsel of record for Doctors Hospital of Manteca, Inc., in place of Carolyn L. Northrop, Esq. with her former associated law firm of Dummit, Buchholz & Trapp. (Zignago, K.)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 291 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/12/2020 GRANTING the request to extend the deadline to disclose rebuttal experts by an additional four days. Defendants shall disclose their rebuttal expert(s) to Plaintiffs' damages expert, Daniel Vasquez, by no later than 6/16/2020. (Kastilahn, A)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 289 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/1/2020 GRANTING the request to extend the deadline to disclose rebuttal experts by fourteen days. Defendants shall disclose their rebuttal expert(s) to Plaintiffs' damages expert, Daniel Vasquez, by no later than 6/12/2020. The Joint Statement on whether leave to file any motion will be sought concerning the damages experts is now due by 6/19/2020. (Zignago, K.)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 287 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/30/2020 GRANTING the parties' request to extend the deadline to disclose rebuttal experts by 60 days. Defendants shall disclose their rebuttal expert(s) to Plaintiffs damages expert, Daniel Vasquez, by no later than 5/29/2020. The Joint Statement on whether leave to file any motion will be sought concerning the damages experts is now due by 6/9/2020.(Kastilahn, A)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/3/2020 GRANTING 278 Motion for to Allow Late Designation of Expert Witness. (Coll, A)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/25/2019 GRANTING permission for attorney Stephanie Roundy to appear on behalf of Mario P. Sattah, M.D., to attend the Final Pretrial Conference on 12/4/2019, and to discuss and argue all pretrial conference issues. (Zignago, K.)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/10/2019 CLARIFYING 233 Supplemental Pretrial Scheduling Order as follows: All motions in limine, oppositions, and replies are to be filed in 1 document. Parties filing multiple motions in limine must submit their motions and the supporting exhibits in 1 document for the Court. Responses to motions in limine must also be submitted in 1 document. (Huang, H)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 230 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/29/19 GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 204 Motion for Reconsideration. (Kaminski, H)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/13/2018 GRANTING request for additional time to comply, contained within 227 Response to Order to Show Cause and EXTENDING Time to not later than 1/2/2019, for the parties to file dispositional documents. (York, M)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/28/18 ORDERING counsel for plaintiff and defendant Russin to SHOW CAUSE within 14 days why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to comply with the court's order directing those parties to file dispositional documents. (Benson, A.)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/23/18 ORDERING that the deadline for Plaintiffs and Defendant Russin to file dispositional documents is EXTENDED until on or before 11/26/2018. (Kastilahn, A)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT AS TO DEFENDANT RUSSIN signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/24/18. The case was before the court for a settlement conference conducted in Chambers on September 20, 2018. Pursuant to the representations by counse l for the parties, the court has determined that the matter has settled only as to defendant Dr. Lincoln Russin. The court now orders that dispositional documents disposing of plaintiffs' claims as to defendant Russin are to be filed not later than thirty (30) days from the date of this order. (Becknal, R)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/30/18 GRANTING 206 Request to Seal Document. (Kaminski, H)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/20/2018 GRANTING Plaintiffs' 188 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, GRANTING Defendants' 182 Motion for Summary Judgment with respect to the sixth cause of action, and otherwise DENYING that Motion. Plaintiffs' Objections, (ECF No. 196-4), are OVERRULED and Plaintiffs' 200 Motion to Strike is DENIED. (York, M)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 7/11/17 ORDERING that the page limit on Defendants' points and authorities in support of a joint motion for summary judgment shall be extended from 20 pages to 30 pages. The page li mit on Plaintiffs' points and authorities in opposition to Defendants' joint motion for summary judgment shall likewise be extended from 20 pages to 30 pages. Defendants' joint reply papers in support of summary judgment shall be extended from 10 pages to 20 pages. (Kastilahn, A)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/18/17: This action against Defendant Owen is dismissed with prejudice. (Kaminski, H)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/16/2017 ORDERING DK # 164 Designation/Disclosure of Expert Witness to be SEALED. ORDERING Defendant to refile an appropriately redacted version not later than 14 days from the date of electronic filing of this order. (Washington, S)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 STIPULATION and ORDER EXTENDING Expert Disclosure deadline signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/4/17. The deadline for disclosure of expert testimony is EXTENDED to 5/5/2017. All other dates in the scheduling order remain unchanged. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 152 Motion to Strike and 153 Motion to Strike signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/26/16: Defendant Sattah's Twelfth Affirmative Defense and Defendant DHM's First and Sixth Affirmative Defenses are hereby STRICKEN. (Kaminski, H)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/7/2016 ORDERING that Defendants' 121 , 124 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Plaintiffs' 126 Motion to Strike is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiffs' 130 Motion to Strike is DENIED. (Zignago, K.)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 3/3/16 ORDERING that all discovery, with the exception of expert discovery, shall be completed by 3/1/2017. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 5/1/2017. The last day to hear dispositive motions shall be 9/7/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/11/16 ORDERING that the hearing on Plaintiffs' MOTION to STRIKE 126 is CONTINUED to 2/25/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr. The dates for filing opposition and reply papers are to be based on the new hearing date of 2/25/16.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/15/2015 ORDERING that the parties' stipulated request for a ten-day extension for Defendants Allen, Bangi, Krpan, and St. Clair to respond to the fourth amended complaint is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their answer on or before 12/24/2015. (Zignago, K.)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/9/15 granting 102 Motion to Amend the Complaint and denying as moot 98 , 99 , 103 Motions to Dismiss. (Kaminski, H)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 9/2/15 ORDERING that the Clerk is directed to re-open this action. The Court's Order 88 is VACATED in its entirety, except with regard to the dismissal of Plaintiffs' fifth caus e of action, which remains DISMISSED with prejudice. This action will proceed on Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint 84 . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367(a), this Court has and will exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' st ate-law claims. Given the passage of time, however, Defendants Sattah, Russin, and Owen's Motion to Dismiss 72 and Defendant Doctors Hospital of Manteca, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss 74 -both of which were denied as moot by way of the Court's 88 Order-are hereby DENIED without prejudice to refiling now. Not later than 30 days following the date this Order is electronically filed, the parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report with the Court. (Kastilahn, A)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/25/2013 ORDERING that the 76 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Allen, Bangi, Benak, Krpan and St. Clair is GRANTED with respect to Plaintiffs' FIRST and FIFTH claims for relief wit hout leave to amend. Having dismissed Plaintiffs federal claims, the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' remaining state-law claims and dismisses those claims without prejudice. The Court DENIES as moot the 72 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Sattah, Russin and Owen and the 74 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Doctor's Hospital of Manteca. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER re 75 Stipulation signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/8/13 ORDERING the first, second, fourth, and fifth claims for relief do not apply to Defendant Doctors Hospital of Manteca, Inc. (hereinafter " ;DHM"). The Decedent's estate is not entitled to recover damages for pain, suffering, or emotional distress, that Decedent incurred prior to his death against Defendant DHM. These damages do not survive the death of Decedent in the state law negligence claims, and only state law negligence claims are alleged against Defendant DHM in Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs do not seek an award of punitive damages against Defendant DHM in their Third Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs do not seek an award of attorneys' fees against Defendant DHM in their Third Amended Complaint. This stipulation only applies to Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant DHM and is not intended to apply to any of Plaintiffs' claims against other defendants in this action.(Matson, R)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/06/12 ORDERING that plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint shall be filed by 11/20/12; the Joint Status Report shall be filed within 21 days of the resolution, by stipulatio n or court order, of any motions to dismiss, or, in the alternative, 21 days after the deadline for filing such motions to dismiss, should no motion be filed. Defendants will have 28 days from the date plaintiffs file their third amended complaint to file their response to the amended pleading. (Benson, A.)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 10/16/12, ORDERING that Defendants' 59 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First claim for relief is GRANTED with leave to amend. Plaintiffs are directed to file an amended complaint, should they choose to do so, within 20 days of this Order. If no amended complaint is filed within said 20 days, this action will be dismissed without leave to amend without any further notice from the Court. (Kastilahn, A)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION and ORDER 62 signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 7/5/12, ORDERING that plaintiffs are allowed to file corrected opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss. (Kastilahn, A)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/4/12 CLARIFYING portions of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint as to Defendant Doctors Hospital of Manteca, Inc. (Meuleman, A)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/18/12 ORDERING that portions of the second amended complaint are STRICKEN pursuant to this order. The dfts Russin, Owen and Sattah are granted an extension of time to file a response to the first amended complaint within 10 days. (Manzer, C)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 04/20/12 ORDERING that plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint shall be filed by 05/02/12; the Joint Status Report shall be filed within 21 days of the resolution, by stipulation or court order, of any motions to dismiss, or, in the alternative, 21 days after the deadline for filing such motions to dismiss, should no motion be filed. (Benson, A.)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/28/12 ORDERING that Defendants' MOTION TO DISMISS Plaintiffs' First Claim for relif 33 is GRANTED with leave to amend. The Court dismisses Plaintiffs' Fifth claim for relief sua sponte with leave to amend. Having dismissed Plaintiffs federal claims, the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' remaining state-law claims at this time. Plaintiffs are directed to file an amended complaint, should they choose to do so, within twenty (20) days of this order. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/20/2011 re 40 ORDERING that the plaintiffs' actions against Defendants Aungst, Chavez, Clay, and Virga are hereby dismissed. The case remains active against other defendants. (Duong, D)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/12/11 CLARIFYING portions of plaintiffs' first amended complaint as to defendant Doctors Hospital of Manteca. (Meuleman, A)
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/5/2011 re 32 ORDERING that the Joint Pretrial Statement is due to be filed within 14 days of the resolution, by stipulation or court order, of the motions to dismiss set to be heard on September 29, 2011.(Duong, D)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re 8 Stipulation, signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 7/8/11. Defendants Russin, Owen, and Sattah are GRANTED an extension of time to file a responsive pleading to the first amended complaint until 10 days after the date of this order. (Kastilahn, A)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/7/11 ORDERING that Defendants Allen, Bangi, Chavez, Clay, Krpan, St. Clair, and Virga shall file their response to the first amended complaint on or before 8/1/11. This order shall apply to Defendants Aungst and Benak if they are subsequently represented by the Office of the Attorney General. (Becknal, R)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/20/11 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall have until an additional thirty days from the date this Order is filed to serve the Amended Complaint on the Defendants. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Staggs et al v. Doctors Hospital of Manteca, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linnie Staggs
Represented By: Carter Capps White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Staggs
Represented By: Carter Capps White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor's Hospital of Manteca, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivan D. Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Virga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank X. Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Aungst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack St. Clair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Bangi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Krpan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Thomatos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Russin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P. Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Sattah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Valera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?