January 18, 2017 |
Filing
45
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/18/17 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Mark Shane Thompson at 9:00 am on 2/14/17 in Courtroom 25 before Judge Kendall J. Newman. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD)(Dillon, M)
|
January 5, 2017 |
Filing
40
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/5/17 ORDERING that the stay of this action is extended through January 19, 2017; Defendant Lopez motion (ECF No. 39 ) is PARTIALLY GRANTED; and defendant Lopez is relieved of the obligation to file a responsive pleading pending further order of court.(Dillon, M)
|
December 1, 2016 |
Filing
37
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/1/2016 ORDERING the Clerk shall serve a copy of 7/21/2016 order and the 7/28/2016 minute order on counsel for defendant Bates. (Yin, K)
|
July 21, 2016 |
Filing
28
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 90 DAYS. The parties shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. The assigned DAG shall contact Courtroom Deputy, Matt Caspar, within 3 0 days to schedule a settlement conference. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. The Clerk shall serve copies of (a) plaintiff's complaint, (b) the screening order, and (c) the instant order, on Supervising DAG Monica Anderson. (cc: Monica Anderson) signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 07/21/16. (Plummer, M)
|
July 18, 2016 |
Filing
22
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/15/16 recommending that defendant Rosales be dismissed from this action without prejudice. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
March 16, 2016 |
Filing
14
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Mark Shane Thompson signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/16/16. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
|
January 6, 2016 |
Filing
11
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/6/2016 GRANTING plaintiff's 10 motion for an extension of time. Plaintiff has 30 days to file a completed ifp application. The court requests the litigation coordinator or other prison o fficial at CSP-Corcoran assist plaintiff in obtaining the certified trust account statement he has sought since 11/8/2015. The Clerk shall serve a copy of this order on C. Sonksen, "Litigations", and Mary Kimbrell, Litigation Coordinator, or her assistant, at the CSP-Corcoran. Plaintiff's 9 request to proceed IFP is DENIED without prejudice to submission of the completed application form. (Yin, K)
|
December 1, 2015 |
Filing
8
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/1/15 ORDERING that the October 28, 2015 findings and recommendations (ECF No. 6 ) are VACATED; and plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of this order in which to comply with the September 18, 2015 order.(Dillon, M)
|
October 28, 2015 |
Filing
6
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/28/15 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
September 18, 2015 |
Filing
3
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/18/15 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court, or the required fees in the amount of $400.00; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner. (Dillon, M)
|