Rebidoux v. Macomber et al
Plaintiff: Vernon Rebidoux
Defendant: J. Macomber, Jones, Russell, Johnson, Mendoza, Brady, Dierdre Bodenhamer, D. Sahota and J. Kelley
Case Number: 2:2016cv01033
Filed: May 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 10/16/20 ORDERING ( Settlement Conference set for 12/1/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney.) Parties are directed to submit confidential settlement state ments no later than November 17, 2020 to ckdorders@caed.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff shall mail his confidential settlement statement Attn: Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney, USDC CAED, 501 I Street, Suite 4-200, Sacramento, California 95814 so it arrives no later than November 17, 2020. The envelope shall be marked CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT STATEMENT. Parties are also directed to file a Notice of Submission of Confidential Settlement Statement (See L.R. 270(d)). The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Litigation Office at Napa State Hospital, via facsimile at (707) 253-5299 or via email. (cc: CKD) (Plummer, M) Modified on 10/16/2020 (Plummer, M).
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 4/29/2020 GRANTING plaintiff's 50 motion for an extension of time to conduct discovery, construed as a motion to modify the scheduling order. The 10/25/2019 scheduling order is modified as s pecified below: The parties may conduct discover until 9/7/2020; All requests for discovery pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30, 31, 33, 34, 36, and 45 shall be served by this discovery cut-off date; Any motions necessary to compel discovery shall be filed within 60 days from this cut-off date; and All dispositive motions shall be filed within 90 days after the discovery cut-off date specified above. (Yin, K)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/28/17: The findings and recommendations filed March 8, 2017 16 , are ADOPTED IN FULL. Plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief 2 is DENIED. (Kaminski, H)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/8/2017 RECOMMEDING plaintiff's 2 motion for injunctive relief be denied. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/1/17 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court is directed to randomly assign a District Judge to this case and to update the docket to reflect the new case number. U.S. District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. has been randomly assigned to this case. The new case number is 2:16-cv-1033 MCE CMK.(Dillon, M)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Vernon Rebidoux signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/11/2016. Plaintiff's 3 , 7 , 8 motions to proceed IFP are GRANTED. Plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 fil ing fee for this action. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial) (Yin, K)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/28/2016 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, a complete application to proceed ifp; and the Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rebidoux v. Macomber et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon Rebidoux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Macomber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dierdre Bodenhamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Sahota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?