Birrell, et al., v. Fox, et al.,
Plaintiff: David Wesley Birrell, Raymond D. Jackson, Sr., Sidney Ross Deegan, Jr., Steven Joseph Toussaint, Duane Reed Moore, Sr., Jeffrey Scott Sargent, Danny Bell, Randy Lee Gutschenritter, Richard Leon Loughmiller, Homer L. Preyer, Jose Alvarez, Christian Lownes, Thomas T. Alford, Alfred T. White, Claude Parker , Jr., Anton Acevedo, Perry Lewis, Hilliard Williams, Guillermo Chavez, Willis Dunham, Robert M Fenenbock, Juan Garcia, Orlando Ellis, John Hendrix, Teague H. Scott, Tracy Smith, Timothy Smedley, Benjamin Lagree, Nathan M. Seastrunk, Anthony Jasper, Peter Brown and Bobby Gary
Defendant: Robert W. Fox, Joseph A. Bick, M. Cordero-Boucher, S. Vandermey, Bill Russell, Johnnie Mathews, Jerry Carter, Scott Kernan, Brian Duffy, Jon Camp and Vimal J. Singh
Case Number: 2:2016cv01818
Filed: August 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/10/2019 ADOPTING IN PART 50 Findings and Recommendations and DISMISSING from this action plaintiffs Danny Bell, Raymond D. Jackson, Sr., Perry Lewis, Randy Lee Gutschenritter, Claude Parker, Jr., and Alfred Ray White. The magistrate judge's recommendation that plaintiff Thomas Temple Alford be dismissed is NOT ADOPTED. (York, M)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/10/19 DENYING 47 Motion for relief from court order. (Plummer, M)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/08/19 RECOMMENDING that defendants Alford, Bell, Jackson, Lewis, Gutschenritter, Parker and White be dismissed from this action. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/18/19 DIRECTING attorney Paul R. Martin to file an affidavit with the court within 7 days indicating that he has turned over all material in his possession relevant to this this case to plaintiff David Wesley Birrell if he has complied with 26 Order. If Mr. Martin has not turned over his case materials to plaintiff Birrell, Mr. Martin shall explain why not within 7 days. (Coll, A)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/31/2018 ORDERING within 30 days, Mr. Paul R. Martin shall turn over all material in his possession relevant to this case to plaintiff David Wesley Birrell and shall file an affidavit with t he court indicating he has done so. The Clerk shall serve this order upon the 17 plaintiffs identified in plaintiffs' amended complaint at the addresses identified in Mr. Martin's motion to withdraw. Within 30 days, any of the 16 plainti ffs identified in the amended complaint other than plaintiff Birrell may file with the court notice that they wish to remain a plaintiff in this case, and, if they do wish to remain, they must explain why. Plaintiff Birrell's request for the appointment of counsel is DENIED. (Yin, K)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/27/2018 ORDERING counsel for plaintiffs shall serve a copy of his 21 motion to withdraw on plaintiff Randy Gutschenritter and file a certificate of service with this court by 10/3/2018. Counsel's failure to do so may result in monetary sanctions. The deadlines established in the court's 11/1/2017 scheduling order are STAYED. (Yin, K)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/28/17 ORDERING that the findings and recommendations filed 8/30/17 are ADOPTED in full; and All defendants other than defendant Fox in his official capacity as Warden theCalifornia Medical Facility are DISMISSED.(Becknal, R)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/30/17 ORDERING that defendant Fox shall reply to plaintiffs' amended complaint within the time provided in FRCP 21(a). Also, RECOMMENDING that all defendants other than defendant Fox in his official capacity as Warden of the California Medical Facility be dismissed. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/23/2017 ORDERING the court's 1/18/2017 6 findings and recommendations are VACATED. Plaintiff's request to file an amended complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiff's original complaint is DISMISSED and plaintiff has 30 days to file an amended complaint. Counsel for plaintiff is GRANTED 14 days within which to pay the $400.00 filing fee for this action. If plaintiff pays the filing fee, additional plaintiff's may be joined to the amended complaint as long as doing so complies with Fed.R.Civ.P. 20(a)(1). (Yin, K)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/18/17 granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Service is appropriate for defendant Fox. The clerk of the court shall send counsel for plaintiff a USM-285 form, a summons, instruction sheet and a copy of the complaint to be completed and returned with the notice of submission of documents within 30 days. Also, RECOMMENDING that all defendants other than defendant Fox in his official capacity as Warden of the California Medical Facility be dismissed. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Copy of this order, summons, instruction sheet, 1 USM, 285 form and a copy of the complaint served on the Attorney for plaintiff by mail). (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Birrell, et al., v. Fox, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Wesley Birrell
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond D. Jackson, Sr.
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidney Ross Deegan, Jr.
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Joseph Toussaint
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Reed Moore, Sr.
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Scott Sargent
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Bell
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Lee Gutschenritter
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Leon Loughmiller
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homer L. Preyer
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Alvarez
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Lownes
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas T. Alford
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred T. White
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude Parker , Jr.
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anton Acevedo
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Lewis
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilliard Williams
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Chavez
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willis Dunham
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert M Fenenbock
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Garcia
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Ellis
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hendrix
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teague H. Scott
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Smith
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Smedley
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Lagree
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan M. Seastrunk
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Jasper
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Brown
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Gary
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A. Bick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Cordero-Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Vandermey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnnie Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vimal J. Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?