Brownlee v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Justin Brownlee
Defendant: Scott Jones, Hays, Hernandez, Lisa Gayman, Yee, Rose, Smolich, S. Anderson, Douglas, Jackson, Thompson, James, Blist, Fry, Smith, Grinder, Going, Gomes and Schmenk
Case Number: 2:2017cv00872
Filed: April 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION and ORDER DISMISSING signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 06/24/20 ORDERING entire action, including all claims and counterclaims stated herein against all parties, is hereby dismissed with prejudice. All pending motions are terminated. ECF Nos. 55 , 57 , 59 . pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). CASE CLOSED. (Plummer, M)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/1/2020 DENYING plaintiff's 66 request to schedule a settlement conference in this matter. (Yin, K)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 03/18/20 DENYING 58 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Plummer, M)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/18/2019 DENYING without prejudice plaintiff's 52 motion for the appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/12/19 ADOPTING 37 Findings and Recommendations in full. This case is PROCEEDING only on the Eighth Amendment deliberate indifference claims against defendants Jackson, Thompson, James, Smi th, Goings, Grinder, Gomez, and Schmenk. The remaining claims against defendants Jones, Hernandez, Gayman, Rosales, Smolich, Anderson, Douglas, Rose, Peoples, Fry, Blyst, Yee and Hayz, and the verbal harassment claim against defendant James are DISMISSED for failing to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. The matter is REFERRED back to the assigned magistrate judge for all further pretrial proceedings. (Coll, A)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/26/18 DENYING 40 Motion to Appoint Counsel without prejudice; GRANTING 40 Motion for 90 day Extension in which to submit the documents necessary to effect service on defendants ; GRANTING one last 30 day extension in which to file objections to this court's 40 Findings and Recommendations. (Benson, A.)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/30/18 GRANTING plaintiff 30 days from the date of this order to complete and submit service documents and GRANTING plaintiff 14 days from the date of this order to file any objections to 37 Findings and Recommendations. (Coll, A)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/17/18 ORDERING the Clerk of Court randomly assign this case to a district judge. Also, RECOMMENDING The remaining claims against defendants Jones, Hernandez, Gayman, Rosales, Smolich, Anderson, Douglas, Rose, Peoples, Fry, Blyst, Yee and Hayz, and the verbal harassment claim against defendant James be dismissed for failing to state a claim upon which relief can be granted; and, this case proceed only on the Eighth Amendment deliberate indifference claims against defendants Jackson, Thompson, James, Smith, Goings, Grinder, Gomez, and Schmenk. Assigned and referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 09/19/18 ORDERING plaintiff has the option: a) to proceed immediately on his Eighth Amendment deliberate indifference claims against defendants Jackson, Thompson, James, Smith, Goings, Grinder, Gomez, and Schmenk; or, b) to amend the complaint to try to fix the deficiencies with the remaining defendants except the verbal harassment claim against defendant James. Within twenty-one days of service of this order, plaintiff shall complete and return the attached form notifying the court whether he wants to proceed on the current first amended complaint or whether he wants time to file a second amended complaint.(Plummer, M)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/11/2018 DENYING 27 request for the appointment of counsel; and DENYING plaintiff's 27 request for an investigator, large print materials, and phone access. (Yin, K)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/22/2018 DENYING without prejudice 23 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff has failed to meet his burden of demonstrating exceptional circumstances warranting the appointment of counsel at this time. (Fabillaran, J)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/14/2017 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Benjamin Justin Brownlee. The Director of the CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/16/2017 DENYING plaintiff's 13 motion for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 06/06/17. (Plummer, M)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/10/2017 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, a completed affidavit to proceed ifp; the Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application; and plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days, a certified copy of his trust account statement. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brownlee v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Justin Brownlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Gayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smolich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Going
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schmenk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?