March 31, 2025 |
Filing
167
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/31/2025 GRANTING plaintiff's 127 motion to file an oversized brief, DENYING plaintiff's 137 motion to file an extended opposition as unnecessary, DENYING plaintiff's 134 motion for leave to file a sur-reply and for sanctions, GRANTING in part and DENYING in part defendants Faggianelli and Schwimmer's motion to withdraw or amend admissions and for an extension of time to respond to plaintiff's requests fo r admission as follows: a. The request for an extension of time is GRANTED, nunc pro tunc, and defendants' responses are deemed timely; and b. The motion to withdraw or amend admissions is DENIED as moot, DENYING as unnecessary defendant Perera 's 125 motion for an extension of time to respond to requests for production as unnecessary, DENYING plaintiff's 149 , 151 , 154 , 156 motions to compel, and DENYING plaintiff's 164 , 165 motions for reconsideration and court assistance. Within 45 days the parties may file any dispositive motions. (Deputy Clerk KLY)
|
February 22, 2024 |
Filing
163
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 02/21/2024 GRANTING 161 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have until 03/13/2024 to file a reply in support of his Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's 162 Motion to Appoint Counsel and re-open Discovery is DENIED.(Lopez, K)
|
December 5, 2023 |
Filing
159
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/05/2023 GRANTING 155 Motion for Extension of Time and DEEMING TIMELY 156 Motion to Compel. (Woodson, A)
|
November 16, 2023 |
Filing
153
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/16/2023 DIRECTING the Warden of Folsom State Prison to produce Lawrence George Hash, #P-00376, on 12/4/2023 at 9:00 AM via Zoom videoconference before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Spichka, K.)
|
October 5, 2023 |
Filing
147
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/04/2023 GRANTING 145 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have until 11/17/2023 to file a Motion to Compel. (Lopez, K)
|
September 11, 2023 |
Filing
143
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/11/2023 GRANTING the 141 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall have until 10/18/2023 to file any discovery motions related to any outstanding discovery disputes. (Spichka, K.)
|
August 18, 2023 |
Filing
139
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 08/17/2023 ORDERING that rulings on objections inserted in hybrid discovery responses be deferred to the time of trial to be determined by trial judge. This stipulation does not apply to discovery responses consisting solely of objections. (Spichka, K.)
|
July 20, 2023 |
Filing
132
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/20/2023 GRANTING 131 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff is GRANTED 30 days from the service of this order to file his opposition to 125 Motion for Extension of Time. (Huang, H)
|
June 15, 2023 |
Filing
123
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/14/2023 ORDERING that the parties shall have until 8/17/2023, to file any discovery motions related to any outstanding discovery disputes. Responses to such motions will be due 30 days from service of the motion and replies will be due 21 days from service of the response. (Huang, H)
|
June 8, 2023 |
Filing
121
ORDER AND WRIT FOR HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM BY VIDEO CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/8/2023 ORDERING the Custodian to produce by zoom video conference, Lawrence George Hash, on 6/14/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. The custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and writ on the custodian. (Huang, H)
|
April 19, 2023 |
Filing
116
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 04/19/2023 GRANTING the 115 Motion for Extension of Time and EXTENDING the discovery deadline to 06/19/2023. (Spichka, K.)
|
April 13, 2023 |
Filing
114
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/13/2023 GRANTING plaintiff's 112 motion to exceed the page limit, STAYING the briefing on plaintiff's pending 106 , 113 motions to compel, and VACATING the deadlines for filing motions to compel. Defendants have 45 days to schedule and conduct a meeting with plaintiff to discuss any disputes plaintiff has with respect to discovery responses he has received, including those disputes outlined in the pending motions to compel. (Yin, K)
|
March 29, 2023 |
Filing
111
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/29/2023 GRANTING the 110 Extension of Time. Defendants' Opposition to 106 Motion to Compel due by 04/13/2023. (Spichka, K.)
|
March 23, 2023 |
Filing
109
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/22/2023 GRANTING-IN-PART AND DENYING-IN-PART 108 Motion for Extension of Time and GRANTING 108 -5 Request to update the name of this case. Plaintiff shall serve written discovery requests on defendants Faggianelli, Farinas and Schwimmer within 30 days. Any Motions to Compel against these defendants shall be filed by 06/23/2023. To the extent plaintiff is seeking an extension of time to serve written discovery on defendants Austin, Boyd, Brida, Cruzen, Johnson, Just, Lemmons, Muhammad, Perera, Sandy, Shirley, Silva, Solorzano, and Thomas, the motion is DENIED. (Spichka, K.)
|
February 28, 2023 |
Filing
107
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 02/27/2023 GRANTING the 105 Request for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. Response from Defendants Boyd and Perera to 106 Motion to Compel due within 30 days. (Spichka, K.)
|
January 24, 2023 |
Filing
101
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/23/2023 ORDERING that all deadlines and requirements set forth in the Discovery and Scheduling Order 99 , shall also apply to the proceedings between plaintiff and defendant Schwimmer.(Reader, L)
|
January 9, 2023 |
Filing
97
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 01/09/2023 GRANTING 95 Motion for Extension of Time and EXTENDING the Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Discovery Requests to 02/09/2023. Plaintiff shall have until 03/10/2023, to file any necessary Motions to Compel. (Rodriguez, E)
|
December 28, 2022 |
Filing
92
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/27/22 GRANTING 91 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Shirley & Just to Respond to Interrogatories, Requests for Admissions and Requests for Production of Documents, Set One, by 1/18/23. Defendant Perera to Respond to Interrogatories, Request for Admissions and Request for Production of Documents, Set One, by 1/24/23. (Woodworth, M.)
|
October 14, 2022 |
Filing
79
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/13/2022 GRANTING 76 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff has 30 days to serve requests for discovery. Plaintiff also has until 1/13/23 to file any motions necessary to compel discovery.(Her, S)
|
September 28, 2022 |
Filing
75
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/28/2022 GRANTING 74 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff has until 10/12/2022 to serve requests for discovery. Plaintiff also has until 12/12/2022 to file any motions necessary to compel discovery. (Spichka, K.)
|
June 16, 2022 |
Filing
63
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 06/15/22 ADOPTING 55 Findings and Recommendations in full and DENYING 44 Motion to Revoke Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status and Dismiss. Defendants shall file a response to the Complaint within 21 days of this order. (Licea Chavez, V)
|
June 10, 2022 |
Filing
60
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/10/2022 DENYING as moot plaintiff's 59 motion to compel production of documents or issue a third-party subpoena. Within 30 days, defendants shall file and serve a formal notice of sugg estion of death as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(a). The notice of suggestion of death must identify defendant Farinas' personal representative or successor in interest. Plaintiff must move to substitute defendant Farinas' personal representative or successor in interest within 90 days of the filing and proper service of the notice of suggestion of death as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(a)(1). (Yin, K)
|
April 25, 2022 |
Filing
58
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/22/2022 DENYING without prejudice 57 motion for service of subpoenas. Plaintiff's requests for production to defendant Brida (ECF No. 57 at 6-10) are limited as set forth in order.(Perdue, C.)
|
March 18, 2022 |
Filing
55
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/17/22 GRANTING 44 -1 Request for judicial notice. Plaintiff's motion for court intervention or leave to conduct discovery, 50 , 27 , is DENIED as to the r equest for intervention and GRANTED as to the request to conduct discovery. Discovery is opened for the limited purpose of allowing plaintiff to identify defendants Johnson and the representative of defendant Farinas' estate. Within 21 days of the service of this order, plaintiff may serve requests for discovery on defendants or make a request to the court for the service of subpoenas. Discovery is limited to obtaining information necessary for the service of these defendants. If necessary , plaintiff may file a motion to compel within 60 days of the service of this order. Within 90 days of the service of this order, plaintiff must file a motion to substitute a proper party for defendant Farinas. The motion must be accompanied by a com pleted USM-285 form for the proposed substitute party. Within 90 days of the service of this order, plaintiff must submit a completedUSM-285 form for defendant Johnson or show good cause why he cannot provide such information. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send to plaintiff two USM-285 forms, along with an instruction sheet. Plaintiff's motion for a copy of the Local Rules (ECF No. 51) is GRANTED and the Clerk of the Court shall serve on plaintiff a copy of the Local Rules of Court. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion to revoke plaintiff's in forma pauperis status and dismiss the action 44 be denied. Defendants be required to file a response to the complaint within 21 days of any order adopting these findings and recommendations. Motion 44 referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 21 days.(Plummer, M)
|
June 17, 2021 |
Filing
49
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/17/2021 DENYING 48 Request for Copy of Local Rules. (Henshaw, R)
|
May 10, 2021 |
Filing
45
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/10/2021 DENYING 43 Motion for Judicial Intervention and Open Discovery and GRANTING 44 at page 10 Defendants' Request to Stay their Responsive Pleading Deadline. The deadline for defendants to respond to the complaint will be set, as necessary, upon resolution of pending 44 Motion to Revoke Plaintiff's IFP Status. (Henshaw, R)
|
April 9, 2021 |
Filing
42
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/08/21 GRANTING 41 Motion to opt out of the post-screening ADR project; and LIFTING the STAY of this action. Within 30 days of the filing of this order, defendants shall file a response to the complaint. (Plummer, M)
|
February 25, 2021 |
Filing
39
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 02/24/21 DENYING 38 Motion for Extension of Time. Also, REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. (Plummer, M)
|
January 25, 2021 |
Filing
33
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/25/2021 GRANTING defendants' 32 request for an extension of time. The deadline to file waivers of service of process in this case is extended to 2/12/2021. (Yin, K)
|
January 7, 2021 |
Filing
31
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/07/21 ORDERING within 90 days of the service of this order, plaintiff must file either (1) a noticethat he is voluntarily dismissing defendant Farinas or (2) a motion to substitute a proper party for defendant Farinas that includes information necessary to serve the proposed substitute party. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send to plaintiff three USM-285 forms, along with an instruction sheet. Within 60 days from the service of this or der, plaintiff mustcomplete and submit completed USM-285 forms for defendants Faggianelli, Schwimmer, and Johnson that include additional information for identifying these defendants or show good cause why he cannot provide such information.(Plummer, M)
|
June 25, 2020 |
Filing
22
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/24/2020 ADOPTING in FULL 18 Findings and Recommendations. Claim One, against Defendants Rallos, Pfile, Allen, and Zamora, is severed from this case and the Clerk of Court is directed to Open a separate civil action, 2:20-CV-1272 TLN AC (PC) against Defendants Rallos, Pfile, Allen, and Zamora, DEEMED filed as of 8/11/2017.(Reader, L)
|
April 16, 2020 |
Filing
19
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/15/2020 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Lawrence George Hash. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
|
September 6, 2017 |
Filing
7
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/05/17 ORDERING plaintiff shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, an application in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the clerk of court, or the required fees in the amount of $400.00. The clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff a new application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. (Plummer, M)
|