December 21, 2023 |
Filing
85
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/20/2023 DENYING 76 Motion for Settlement. (Clemente Licea, O)
|
November 2, 2023 |
Filing
84
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/02/2023 RECOMMENDING that the 76 Motion for Defendants to pay Plaintiff $1050 be denied. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these Findings and Recommendations.(Lopez, K)
|
July 26, 2023 |
Filing
81
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 07/26/2023 GRANTING the 79 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's reply brief concerning his motion for enforcement of a settlement agreement due within 30 days. (Spichka, K.)
|
July 5, 2023 |
Filing
77
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/30/2023 ORDERING, within 21 days, defendants to file a response to plaintiff's 76 motion seeking enforcement of the settlement agreement. Plaintiff may file a reply within 14 days of service of the response. (Yin, K)
|
December 15, 2022 |
Filing
74
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/15/22 ADOPTING in full 71 Findings and Recommendations and GRANTING 70 defendants' request for dismissal. This action is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
|
October 4, 2022 |
Filing
71
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/4/2022 RECOMMENDING that 70 Request for Dismissal be granted, and that this matter be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Referred to District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Huang, H)
|
June 13, 2022 |
Filing
69
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/13/2022 GRANTING defendants' 67 request for continuance of Court ordered settlement deadline. Defendants have an additional 90 days from 6/10/2022 to submit the appropriate dismissal documents. (Yin, K)
|
February 11, 2022 |
Filing
63
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/11/22 ORDERING the Custodian to produce by zoom video conference Dylan Scott Corral on 3/14/22 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Erica P. G rosjean. The custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ. The clerk of court shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: I.T. Dept, Sacramento and EPG)(Plummer, M)
|
January 27, 2022 |
Filing
62
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/27/22, ( Settlement Conference set for 3/14/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean.) The conference will be held remotely by Zoom. Defendants shall provide a confidential s ettlement statement no later than March 7, 2022, to the following email address: epgorders@caed.uscourts.gov. If plaintiff does not have access to email, plaintiff shall mail his confidential settlement statement, clearly captioned "Confide ntial Settlement Conference Statement," Attn: Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean, United States District Court, 2500 Tulare Street, Room 1501, Fresno, CA 93721 so that it arrives no later than March 7, 2022. Parties shall also file a Notice of S ubmission of Confidential Settlement Conference Statement which advises the Court and other parties that a Confidential Settlement Conference Statement has been submitted to the Court. The Confidential Settlement Conference Statement shall not be filed on the docket or served on any other party. Each statement shall be clearly marked "confidential" with the date and time of the settlement conference clearly noted on the first page. (cc: ADR and EPG)(Plummer, M)
|
April 14, 2021 |
Filing
60
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/13/21 DENYING 58 Motion to appear remotely at trial to renewal after a trial date is set.. (Plummer, M)
|
February 12, 2020 |
Filing
50
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/11/2020 ADOPTING 49 Findings and Recommendations in full and DENYING defendants' 38 Motion to Dismiss. (Zignago, K.)
|
January 13, 2020 |
Filing
49
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/13/20 DENYING 38 Request for Judicial Notice. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion to dismiss 38 be denied. Motion 38 referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
April 18, 2019 |
Filing
30
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/18/19 ORDERING Service is appropriate for defendant Berlier. The Clerk of the Court shall send plaintiff a USM-285 form, one summons, an instruction sheet and a copy of the second amended complaint to be completed and returned within 30 days. The Clerk of the Court assign a district court judge to this case. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendants Woodman, Melgarejo and Bouldin be dismissed. Assigned and referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
October 18, 2018 |
Filing
25
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/18/18 GRANTING 21 Motion to Amend the Complaint; DISMISSING Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; and GRANTING 30 days within which to file a Second Amended Complaint that complies with all of the terms of this court's 5/3/18 screening order. (Coll, A)
|
May 3, 2018 |
Filing
11
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/3/2018 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Dylan Scott Corral. The Director of the CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
|
January 12, 2018 |
Filing
3
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/12/18 ORDERING plaintiff shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the clerk of court or the required fees in the amount of $400.00 The clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff a new application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. (Plummer, M)
|