(PC) Bryant v. Kibler et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Bryant
Defendant: Robert Peery, Crother, Brian Kibler, Silva, Jason Pickett, Kathleen Allison, Crowe, Rigling, Mark Hudson and Mark Williams
Case Number: 2:2021cv00060
Filed: January 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kastilahn, A)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/21/2021 ORDERING Clerk to randomly assign a District Judge and update the docket to reflect the new case number. This case has been assigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. The new case number is: 2:21-cv-0060 TLN DMC (PC). (Henshaw, R)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. The new case number is: 2:21-cv-0060 TLN DMC (PC). (Henshaw, R)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #2 Motion to Proceed IFP served on CDCR. (Henshaw, R)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/21/2021 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Kevin Bryant. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/21/2021 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. (Henshaw, R)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/21/2021 DENYING #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Henshaw, R)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/21/2021 DENYING as unnecessary #6 Motion to File Complaint in Excess of 95 Pages. (Henshaw, R)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order, #11 Order, #12 Order, #15 Order, and #9 Order served on Kevin Bryant. (Henshaw, R)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Consent or Decline due by 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Rivera, O)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TRANSFERRING Case to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/13/2021. CASE TRANSFERRRED to SACRAMENTO Division. New Case Number 2:21-cv-000060-DMC (PC) . Old Case Number 1:21-cv-00033-GSA (PC). (Rivera, O)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order, #8 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Kevin Bryant. (Rivera, O)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION For Court Authorization to File an Initial Complaint of Ninety Five Pages, by Kevin Bryant. (Maldonado, C)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Kevin Bryant. (Maldonado, C)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for the Court to Accept Plaintiff's Letter of Undertaking, by Kevin Bryant. (Maldonado, C)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Kevin Bryant. (Maldonado, C)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Kevin Bryant. (Maldonado, C)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Kathleen Allison, Crother, Crowe, Mark Hudson, Brian Kibler, Robert Peery, Jason Pickett, Rigling, Silva, Mark Williams by Kevin Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maldonado, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Bryant v. Kibler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Peery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crother
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kibler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rigling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?