(PC) Van Huisen v. Rosenburg et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Scott Van Huisen
Defendant: Chuck Rosenburg and DEA
Case Number: 2:2024cv00055
Filed: January 5, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Research by Gregory Scott Van Huisen. (Murphy, J)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Gregory Scott Van Huisen. (Woodson, A)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lopez, K)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Senior Judge William B. Shubb and Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. The new case number is: 2:24-cv-00055 WBS JDP. (Murphy, J)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 6 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Gregory Scott Van Huisen. (Murphy, J)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT by Gregory Scott Van Huisen. (Murphy, J)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Gregory Scott Van Huisen. (Murphy, J)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Gregory Scott Van Huisen. (Murphy, J)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT (Duplicate of #1 ) against DEA, Chuck Rosenburg by Gregory Scott Van Huisen.(Murphy, J)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Murphy, J)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 01/11/2024 DIRECTING Plaintiff to submit an IFP Application or pay the appropriate filing fee within 30 days from the date of this Order.(Lopez, K)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and IFP Application served on Gregory Scott Van Huisen. (Lopez, K)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *1/5/2024*. Consent or Decline due by 2/12/2024. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Murphy, J)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY E-MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Gregory Scott Van Huisen. (Murphy, J)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Gregory Scott Van Huisen. (Murphy, J)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against DEA, Chuck Rosenburg by Gregory Scott Van Huisen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murphy, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Van Huisen v. Rosenburg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Scott Van Huisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Rosenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?