In re TRANSPACIFIC PASSENGER AIR TRANSPORTATION ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Plaintiff: Stephanie Jung, David Murphy, Justin LaBarge, Reiko Hirai, Larry Chen, Tori Kitagawa, Tracey Wadmore Smith, Sarah Tran, Scott Frederick, Kathryn Lavin, Andrew Barton, Lori Barrett, Lolly Randall, Matthew Evans, Cherokii Verduzco, Michael Benson, Margaret Garcia, Kevin Moy, Lax & Company, Inc., David Kuo, Christian Duke, Ireatha Diane Mitchell, Donald Wortman, Mark Foy, Judah M. Feigenbaum, Ed Park, Dickson Leung, Titi Tran, William Adams, Brenden G. Maloof, Meor Adlin, All Plaintiffs, Robert Casteel, III, James Stewart, Clyde H. Campbell, Micah Abrams, Caroline Joy, Stephen Gaffigan, Trong Nguyen, Woodrow Clark, II, Martin Kaufman, Franklyn Ajaye, Linda Williams, Rufus Browning, Thomas Schelly, Bruce Hut, James Evans, Rachel Diller and Jason Gregory Turner
Defendant: Air France, S.A., Qantas Airways, Ltd., All Nippon Airways, Cathay Pacific Airways, Air New Zealand, KLM Royal Dutch Airline, Malaysian Airline System Berhad, Northwest Airlines, Eva Airways, Japan Airlines International, Malaysia Airlines, Vietnam Airlines, British Airways, Thai Airways, Philippine Airlines, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., SAS AB, China Airlines, Swiss International AG, Deutsche Lufthansa AG, Singapore Airlines, United Airlines and Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V.
Interested Party: United States of America
Other: Amy Yang
Case Number: 3:2007cv05634
Filed: November 6, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 1313 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/15/2019 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by All Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1312 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles R. Breyer: Motion Hearing held on 11/15/2019 - Re #1308 Motion for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion For Final Approval Of Settlement With Defendant All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd. - Motion Granted; Re #1307 Motion for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses - Motion taken under submission. Court will issue an order. (Total Time in Court: 8 Minutes) Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorney: Adam J. Zapala, Elizabeth T. Castillo, Christopher L. Lesbock and Seth R. Gassman. Defendant Attorney: Ankur Kapoor (All Nippon Airways). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/15/2019)
October 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1307 MOTION for Attorney Fees PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2019 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1311 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION for Attorney Fees hearing on October 18, 2019 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. Motion Hearing reset for 11/15/2019 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1308 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion For Final Approval Of Settlement With Defendant All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2019 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1310 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT on October 18, 2019 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. Motion Hearing reset for 11/15/2019 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1307 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Fairness Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2019 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1309 CLERK'S NOTICE : MOTION for Attorney Fees and Fairness hearing time reset for October 18, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1308 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion For Final Approval Of Settlement With Defendant All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd. filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 10/18/2019. Replies due by 10/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Lebsock, #2 Declaration of Joel Botzet, #3 Declaration of Shannon Wheatman, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Proposed Final Judgment)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1307 MOTION for Attorney Fees PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 9/13/2019. Replies due by 10/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Joint Declaration, #3 Declaration of Richard M. Pearl)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 8/9/2019) Modified on 8/12/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1306 SECOND AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANT ALL NIPPON AIRWAYS CO., LTD AND OF NOTICE PROGRAM, NOTICE FORMS, AND PLAN OF ALLOCATION - Re #1305 Proposed Order, filed by All Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/29/2019. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1305 Proposed Order re #1303 Order, #1301 Notice (Other), #1302 Order, [PROPOSED] SECOND AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANT ALL NIPPON AIRWAYS CO., LTD AND OF NOTICE PROGRAM, NOTICE FORMS, AND PLAN OF ALLOCATION by All Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1304 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 10, 2019, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, telephone number (602) 391-6990. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2019. (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1303 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANT ALL NIPPON AIRWAYS CO., LTD AND OF NOTICE PROGRAM, NOTICE FORMS, AND PLAN OF ALLOCATIONS. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/20/2019. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1302 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANT ALL NIPPON AIRWAYS CO., LTD AND OF NOTICE PROGRAM, NOTICE FORMS AND PLAN OF ALLOCATION - Re #1301 Notice (Other), filed by All Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/20/2019. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1301 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re 1299 Motion Hearing,,, Order on Motion for Settlement,, Plaintiffs' Notice of Revised Notice Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A, #2 Exhibit 1B, #3 Exhibit 2A, #4 Exhibit 2B, #5 Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1300 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/10/2019 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by All Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1299 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles R. Breyer: Motion Hearing held on 5/10/2019 - Granting with modifications of the preliminary settlement as outlined by the Court - #1297 Motion for Settlement. (Total Time in Court: 5 Minutes) Court Reporter: Marla Knox. Plaintiff Attorney: Michael P. Lehmann, Adam J. Zapala and Elizabeth Castillo. Defendant Attorney: Jesse W. Markham, Jr. and Ankur Kapoor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/10/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1298 Supplemental Brief re #1297 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Defendant All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd and for Approval of Notice Program, Notice Forms, and Plan of Allocation Plaintiffs' Supplemental Filing Regarding Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Defendant All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd. and for Approval of Notice Program, Notice Forms, and Plan of Allocation filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #1297 ) (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1297 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Defendant All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd and for Approval of Notice Program, Notice Forms, and Plan of Allocation filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 4/19/2019. Replies due by 4/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Joint Declaration, #3 Wheatman Declaration, #4 Feinberg Declaration)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 4/5/2019) Modified on 4/8/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1296 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULE FOR FILING OF PRELIMINARY APPROVAL MOTION by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #1295 Stipulation. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of the settlement with ANA due by 4/5/2019. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1295 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1293 Order on Stipulation Modifying Schedule For Filing Of Preliminary Approval Motion filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1294 NOTICE of Change of Address by Allan Steyer (Steyer, Allan) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1293 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING STAY OF TRIAL SCHEDULE by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #1292 Stipulation. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1292 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Stay of Trial Schedule filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1291 Ex Parte ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Removal from service list filed by Amy Yang. Responses due by 2/12/2019. (Dawson, Aaron) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 1290 NOTICE by Amy Yang Request for Removal from Service List (Frank, Theodore) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 1289 NOTICE by Amy Yang Request for Removal from Service List (St. John, Anna) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1288 NOTICE of Change of Address by Eugene A. Spector for Spector Roseman & Kodroff PC (Spector, Eugene) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 2, 2019 Filing 1287 CLERK'S NOTICE: The 1/3/2019 hearing on the joint discovery letter #1284 is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2019) Modified on 1/2/2019 (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1286 ORDER Setting Telephonic Hearing on #1284 Joint Discovery Letter Brief on behalf of Plaintiffs and ANA: Hearing set for 1/3/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/21/2018. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1285 Letter from William Karas, Counsel for JAL . (Karas, William) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1284 Joint Discovery Letter Brief on behalf of Plaintiffs and ANA filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 12/17/2018) Modified on 12/18/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1283 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING TRIAL SCHEDULE by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/10/2018: Granting #1282 Stipulation. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1282 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Letter enclosing stipulation and proposed order filed by All Nippon Airways. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1281 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #1271 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1280 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION to Take Deposition from Fusako Cahill (ECF No. 1279) on December 21, 2018 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. Counsel shall re-notice the motion hearing before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1279 MOTION to Take Deposition from Fusako Cahill; and Joan Kamei Motion for Leave to Take Videotaped Trial Deposition of Fusako Cahill and Joan Kamei filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 12/4/2018. Replies due by 12/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher L. Lebsock, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1278 ORDER of USCA (USCA # 18-80097) : The court denies the petition for permission to appeal the district court's 8/8/18 order. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1277 RESPONSE to re #1274 Response ( Non Motion ) ANA Reply letter to the United States Department of Transportation Replying to Plaintiffs 11/05/18 Response letter (Docket No. 1274-1) by All Nippon Airways. (Malone, Gary) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1276 Declaration of Alan Larson in support of expert testimony by All Nippon Airways. (Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 11/8/2018) Modified on 11/8/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2018 Filing 1275 NOTICE by All Nippon Airways Expert Report of Alan Larson (Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1274 RESPONSE to re #1267 Notice (Other), Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd.'s Request for Declaration by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1273 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Expert Report and Declaration of Michael Levine (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1272 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #1271 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Report of Russell Mangum III, Ph.D. Expert Report of Russell Mangum III, Ph.D. - Redacted Public Version (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1271 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Report of Russell Mangum III, Ph.D. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Adam Zapala, #3 Expert Report of Russell Mangum III, Ph.D. - Redacted Public Version, #4 Expert Report of Russell Mangum III, Ph.D. - Submitted Under Seal, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1270 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Expert Report and Declaration of Michael F. Stone (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1269 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Expert Report and Declaration of Paul Gretch (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1268 List of Trial Witness by All Nippon Airways (Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 10/29/2018) Modified on 10/30/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2018 Filing 1267 Request for Declaration from United States Department of Transportation by All Nippon Airways (Attachments: #1 cover letter to U.S. Department of Transportation, #2 Declaration of Gary J. Malone)(Malone, Gary) (Filed on 10/29/2018) Modified on 10/30/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1266 ORDER APPROVING PLAINTIFFS' LITIGATION CLASS NOTICE PROGRAM - Re #1265 Notice (Other) filed by All Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/26/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1265 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #1249 Transcript,,, Plaintiffs' Notice of Revised Class Notice Program and Revised Class Notice Forms; [Proposed] Order Approving Class Notice Program and Class Notice Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1263 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 12, 2018, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #1261 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2019. (Related documents(s) #1261 ) (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1262 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 12, 2018 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by All Nippon Airways, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1261 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/12/2018 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by All Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1264 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles R. Breyer: Motion Hearing held on 10/12/2018 re #1251 Motion in Limine filed by All Nippon Airways. Court will allow reference to ANA plea in class notice. Court tentatively rules that plea as to both counts would be admissible at trial, but will defer final ruling until later date. (Total Time in Court: 30 Minutes) Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorney: Christopher Lebsock and Michael P. Lehmann. Defendant Attorney: Ankur Kapoor, Seth G. Gassman and Elizabeth T. Castillo. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/12/2018)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1260 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT CHINA AIRLINES, LTD. - Re #1243 Proposed Order, filed by All Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/11/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1259 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS WITH DEFENDANTS PHILIPPINE AIRLINES, INC., AIR NEW ZEALAND LIMITED, CHINA AIRLINES, LTD., AND EVA AIRWAYS CORPORATION - Re #1234 Motion for Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with Defendants Philippine Airlines, Inc., Air New Zealand Limited, China Airlines, Ltd., and EVA Airways Corporation and Memorandum in Support The filed by All Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/11/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2018: #1 Signature) (lsS, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2018 Filing 1258 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT AIR NEW ZEALAND LIMITED. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/11/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1257 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT EVA AIRWAYS CORPORATION. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/11/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1256 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT PHILIPPINE AIRLINES, INC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/11/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1255 REPLY (re #1251 MOTION in Limine ) filed byAll Nippon Airways. (Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1254 NOTICE by Mark Foy of Change of Firm Name (Girard, Daniel) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1253 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1251 MOTION in Limine ) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1252 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR FEES. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/24/2018. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1251 MOTION in Limine filed by All Nippon Airways. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 9/28/2018. Replies due by 10/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ankur Kapoor, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1250 ORDER - Re #1247 Notice (Other) filed by All Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/18/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 1249 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/14/18, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #1246 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2018. (Related documents(s) #1246 ) (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1248 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/14/2018 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by All Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1247 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Withdrawal of Appearance of Michaela Spero and [PROPOSED] Order. (Spero, Michaela) (Filed on 9/14/2018) Modified on 9/14/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2018 Filing 1246 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on September 14, 2018 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by All Nippon Airways, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1245 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles R. Breyer: Motion Hearing held on 9/14/2018 - Re #1234 Motion for Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with Defendants Philippine Airlines, Inc., Air New Zealand Limited, China Airlines, Ltd., and EVA Airways Corporation and Memorandum in Support The filed by All Plaintiffs - The Court Granted the Motion; Re #1227 Motion for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Class Representative Incentive Awards; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by All Plaintiffs - The Court Granted the motion; Re #1165 Motion for Final Fairness Hearing held. Motion in limine by All Nippon Airways due by 9/21/2018. Opposition/Response due by 9/28/2018. Replies due by 10/5/2018. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. The Court ordered counsel, Ankur Kappor to order the transcript of today's proceedings and provide a copy of the transcript to his client. Court will issue an order. (Total Time in Court: 1 Hour and 18 minutes) Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce. Plaintiff Attorney: Adam J. Zapala, Christopher Lebsock and Seth R. Gassman. Defendant Attorney: Anita Stork (Philippine Airlines), Tammy A. Tsoumas (Eva Airways), Ankur Kapoor (All Nippon Airways), James V. Dick (China Airlines) and Scott D. Cunningham (Air New Zealand-CourtCall). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/14/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1244 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Of Intent To Raise Issue Regarding All Nippon Airways Co., Inc's Guilty Plea At The September 14, 2018 Court Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1243 Proposed Order re #1236 Proposed Order, #1234 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with Defendants Philippine Airlines, Inc., Air New Zealand Limited, China Airlines, Ltd., and EVA Airways Corporation and Memorandum in Support The [Proposed] Amended Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant China Airlines, Ltd. by All Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motions in limine will be fully briefed and filed by 1/14/2019. Daubert motions due by 1/11/2019. Oppositions to Motions in limine due by 1/7/2019. There will be no replies on motions in limine. Jury Trial set for 3/4/2019 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Pretrial Conference/Daubert Motions set for 2/15/2019 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 3/5/2019 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 3/6/2019 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 3/7/2019 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 3/8/2019 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 3/11/2019 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 3/12/2019 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 3/13/2019 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 3/14/2019 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 3/15/2019 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1242 Declaration of Christopher L. Lebsock in Support of #1233 Order Supplemental Declaration of Christopher C. Lebsock In Support Of Motion For Attorneys' Fees And Reimbursement Of Expenses filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #1233 ) (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1241 MODIFIED ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION REGARDING PROPOSED TRIAL SCHEDULE AND CLASS NOTICE PROGRAM by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting in part #1231 Administrative Motion. REFER TO ORDER FOR MODIFICATIONS. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1240 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting Plaintiffs' Leave to File Reply and GRANTING Defendant ANA's Request for Hearing. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1239 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Reply in Support of Administrative Motion Regarding Proposed Trial Schedule and Class Notice Program filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 9/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Plaintiffs' Reply In Support of Administration Motion re Proposed Trial Schedule and Class Notice Program)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1238 Proposed Order [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Philippine Airlines, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1237 Proposed Order [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant EVA Airways Corporation by All Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1236 Proposed Order [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant China Airlines, Ltd. by All Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1235 Proposed Order [Proposed] Final Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Air New Zealand Limited by All Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1234 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlements with Defendants Philippine Airlines, Inc., Air New Zealand Limited, China Airlines, Ltd., and EVA Airways Corporation and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 9/14/2018. Replies due by 9/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order with Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Adam Zapala with Exhibits 1-4, #3 Declaration of Joel Botzet with Exhibits A-C, #4 Declaration of Shannon R. Wheatman, Ph.D. with Exhibits 1-6)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1233 ORDER DIRECTING SUPPLEMENTAL FILING REGARDING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/31/2018. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1232 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1231 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Regarding Proposed Trial Schedule and Class Notice Program ) filed byAll Nippon Airways. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1231 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Regarding Proposed Trial Schedule and Class Notice Program filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 8/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Shannon R. Wheatman)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1230 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Trott (Trott, Adam) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1229 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala in Support of #1227 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Class Representative Incentive Awards; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Declaration of Adam J. Zapala in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #1227 ) (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1228 Declaration of Christopher L. Lebsock in Support of #1227 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Class Representative Incentive Awards; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Declaration of Christopher L. Lebsock in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Class Representative Incentive Awards filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Jennie Lee Anderson, #7 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, #8 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Susan G. Kupfer, #9 Exhibit 9 - Declaration of Robert G. Eisler, #10 Exhibit 10 - Declaration of Adam C. Belsky, #11 Exhibit 11 - Declaration of Daniel C. Hedlund, #12 Exhibit 12 - Declaration of Jessica N. Servais, #13 Exhibit 13 - Declaration of Brian S. Kabateck, #14 Exhibit 14 - Declaration of Joseph J. DePalma, #15 Exhibit 15 - Declaration of Sean Tamura-Sato, #16 Exhibit 16 - Declaration of Elizabeth C. Pritzker, #17 Exhibit 17 - Declaration of Garrett D. Blanchfield, #18 Exhibit 18 - Declaration of Alexander Saveri, #19 Exhibit 19 - Declaration of Allan Steyer, #20 Exhibit 20 - Declaration of Kimberly A. Kralowec, #21 Exhibit 21 - Declaration of Mario N. Alioto, #22 Exhibit 22 - Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti)(Related document(s) #1227 ) (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1227 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Class Representative Incentive Awards; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 8/24/2018. Replies due by 8/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1226 Letter from Ankur Kapoor attaching Sur-Reply Expert Report of Edward A. Snyder, Ph.D. (Attachments: #1 Sur-Reply Expert Report of Edward A. Snyder, Ph.D)(Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1225 ORDER GRANTING ALL NIPPON AIRWAYS CO., LTD.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE A SUR-REPLY EXPERT REPORT OF EDWARD A. SNYDER, PH.D. by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #1220 Administrative Motion. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1224 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting (1119) Motion to Certify Class; denying (1188) Motion to Strike ; denying (1206) Motion to Strike ; denying (1207) Administrative Motion in case 3:07-cv-05634-CRB. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1223 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO TEMPORARILY STAY THE ORDER ON CLASS CERTIFICATION PENDING A WRITTEN ORDER filed by All Nippon Airways. Responses due by 8/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1222 Transcript of Proceedings held on August 3, 2018, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #1217 Transcript Order, #1218 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2018. (Related documents(s) #1217 , #1218 ) (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1221 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1220 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT THE SUR-REPLY EXPERT REPORT OF EDWARD A. SNYDER, Ph.D. ) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1220 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT THE SUR-REPLY EXPERT REPORT OF EDWARD A. SNYDER, Ph.D. filed by All Nippon Airways. Responses due by 8/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 SUR-REPLY EXPERT REPORT OF EDWARD A. SNYDER, Ph.D., #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1219 REPLY (re #1206 MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of Russell Mangum III, Ph.D. ) filed byAll Nippon Airways. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1218 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on August 3, 2018 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by All Nippon Airways, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1217 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/03/2018 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by All Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1216 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles R. Breyer: Motion Hearing held on 8/3/2018 - Re #1119 Motion to Certify Class filed by All Plaintiffs - Motion Granted. Court will issue an order. (Total Time in Court: 25 Minutes) Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorney: Adam Zapala, Elizabeth T. Castillo, Christopher L. Lebsock, Seth Gassman and Michaela Spero. Defendant Attorney: Ankur Kappor, Harrison McAvoy, Rebecca Kirk Fair and Jesse W. Markham, Jr. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/3/2018)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1215 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Regarding Filing of Unredacted Documents (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Plaintiffs' Opposition to ANA's Motion to Strike Expert Testimony of Dr. Mangum, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Seth Gassman in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1214 ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #1209 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1213 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ALL NIPPON AIRWAYS CO., LTD.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #1204 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1212 ORDER GRANTING ALL NIPPON AIRWAYS CO., LTD.S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A BRIEF IN EXCESS OF FIFTEEN PAGES by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #1202 Ex Parte Application. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1211 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re #1209 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1210 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1206 MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of Russell Mangum III, Ph.D. ) [Redacted] filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Seth Gassman, #2 Exhibit A [Under Seal])(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1209 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michaela Spero, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Strike Expert Testimony of Russell W. Mangum III, Ph.D., #4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Strike Expert Testimony of Russell W. Mangum III, Ph.D., #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A to Declaration of Seth Gassman)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1208 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1207 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Strike All Nippon Airways Co. Ltd.'s Motion to Strike Expert Testimony of Russell W. Mangum III, PH.D. ) filed byAll Nippon Airways. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Ankur Kapoor, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 7/17/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1207 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Strike All Nippon Airways Co. Ltd.'s Motion to Strike Expert Testimony of Russell W. Mangum III, PH.D. filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 7/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher L. Lebsock, #2 Proposed Order)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1206 MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of Russell Mangum III, Ph.D. filed by All Nippon Airways. Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 7/27/2018. Replies due by 8/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Ankur Kapoor, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2 (Redacted), #5 Exhibit 3 (Redacted), #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1205 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1202 Ex Parte Application to File Brief in Excess of Fifteen-Page Limit ) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher L. Lebsock)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1204 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 2 and 3 to The Declaration of Ankur Kapoor In Support of All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd., Motion to Strike Expert Testimony of Russell Mangum III, Ph.D. filed by All Nippon Airways. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ankur Kapoor, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit 2 (Redacted), #5 Exhibit 2 (Unredacted), #6 Exhibit 3 (Redacted), #7 Exhibit 3 (Unredacted))(Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1202 Ex Parte Application to File Brief in Excess of Fifteen-Page Limit filed by All Nippon Airways. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 1203 OBJECTIONS to Settlement by Bruce Wheatley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 1201 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Regarding filing of Unredacted Documents (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Michaela Spero, #3 Reply Report of Dr. Russell Mangum)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1200 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ALL NIPPON AIRWAYS CO., LTDS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #1195 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1199 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL (SEE MODIFICATIONS) by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #1189 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits D-E to the Declaration of Michaela Spero in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 1198 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Adam J. Zapala re: Withdrawal of Ana Gardea (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 1197 REPLY (re #1188 MOTION to Strike #1157 Opposition/Response to Motion, DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATION OF MASAKAZU ISHII SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND A P ) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 3, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1119 MOTION to Certify Class . Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2018)
July 3, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1119 MOTION to Certify Class . Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 1196 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1188 MOTION to Strike #1157 Opposition/Response to Motion, DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATION OF MASAKAZU ISHII SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND A P ) filed byAll Nippon Airways. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ankur Kapoor, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F (Redacted), #8 Exhibit G (Redacted), #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I (Redacted), #11 Exhibit J (Redacted), #12 Proposed Order, #13 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 1195 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal exhibits F, G, I, and J to Ankur Kapoor Declaration in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Evidence Offered in Opposition to Class Certification filed by All Nippon Airways. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ankur Kapoor, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit F (Redacted), #5 Exhibit F (Unredacted), #6 Exhibit G (Redacted), #7 Exhibit G (Unredacted), #8 Exhibit I (Redacted), #9 Exhibit I (Unredacted), #10 Exhibit J (Redacted), #11 Exhibit J (Unredacted))(Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1194 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #1158 Motion for Summary Judgment. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2018)
June 22, 2018 Filing 1193 Declaration of Ankur Kapoor in Support of #1189 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(e)(1) filed byAll Nippon Airways. (Related document(s) #1189 ) (Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 6/22/2018)
June 20, 2018 Filing 1192 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/15/18, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court ReporterKatherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #1186 Transcript Order, #1185 Transcript Order, #1187 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 7/11/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/18/2018. (Related documents(s) #1186 , #1185 , #1187 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 6/20/2018)
June 19, 2018 Filing 1191 NOTICE by All Nippon Airways Regarding Filing of Unredacted Documents (Attachments: #1 Reply Brief In Support for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit 4)(Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 6/19/2018)
June 18, 2018 Filing 1190 REPLY (re #1119 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Reply Report of Expert Russell Mangum, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
June 18, 2018 Filing 1189 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification, #5 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification, #6 Redacted Version of Exhibit C, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, #8 Redacted Version of Exhibit D, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D, #10 Redacted Version of Exhibit E, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit E, #12 Redacted Version of the Reply Report of Dr. Russell Mangum, #13 Unredacted Version of the Reply Report of Dr. Russell Mangum)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
June 18, 2018 Filing 1188 MOTION to Strike #1157 Opposition/Response to Motion, DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATION OF MASAKAZU ISHII SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND A PREVIOUSLY UNPRODUCED DOCUMENT ON WHICH ALL NIPPON AIRWAYS CO., LTD.'S EXPERT RELIES TO FORM OPINIONS IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, AS WELL AS ANY MATERIALS THAT RELY THEREON AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 7/2/2018. Replies due by 7/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Seth Gassman, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
June 15, 2018 Filing 1187 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/15/2018 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by All Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Spero, Michaela) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
June 15, 2018 Filing 1186 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/15/2018 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by All Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
June 15, 2018 Filing 1185 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on June 15, 2018 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by All Nippon Airways, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
June 15, 2018 Filing 1184 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles R. Breyer: Motion Hearing held on 6/15/2018 - Re #1158 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by All Nippon Airways. Court will issue an order. Motion to Certify Class hearing set for July 27, 2018 is vacated. (Total Time in Court: 1 Hour and 20 Minutes) Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorney: Adam J. Zapala, Christipher L. Lebsock and Seth R. Gassman. Defendant Attorney: Ankur Kapoor and Jesse W. Markham, Jr. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/15/2018)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1183 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ALL NIPPON AIRWAYS CO., LTDS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #1179 Administrative Motion. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
June 14, 2018 Filing 1182 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1179 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Record In Support of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment re #1158 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Gardea, Ana) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
June 14, 2018 Filing 1181 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Slip Opinion)(Related document(s) #1163 , #1158 ) (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
June 14, 2018 Filing 1180 Amended Declaration of Ankur Kapoor in Support of #1179 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Record In Support of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment re #1158 MOTION for Summary Judgment Amended Declaration of Ankur Kapoor filed byAll Nippon Airways. (Related document(s) #1179 ) (Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 6/14/2018) Modified on 6/14/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2018 Filing 1179 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Record In Support of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment re #1158 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by All Nippon Airways. Responses due by 6/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ankur Kapoor, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1178 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #1167 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1177 CORRECTED ORDER SETTING FINAL APPROVAL HEARING AND SETTING INTERIM DEADLINES RE: PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS WITH DEFENDANTS PHILIPPINE AIRLINES, INC., AIR NEW ZEALAND LIMITED, CHINA AIRLINES, LTD., AND EVA AIRWAYS CORPORATION - Re #1176 Proposed Order, filed by All Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/6/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2018)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1176 Proposed Order CORRECTED [PROPOSED] ORDER SETTING FINAL APPROVAL HEARING AND SETTING INTERIM DEADLINES RE: PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS WITH DEFENDANTS PHILIPPINE AIRLINES, INC., AIR NEW ZEALAND LIMITED, CHINA AIRLINES, LTD., AND EVA AIRWAYS CORPORATION by All Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1175 NOTICE of Appearance by Ana Gardea (Gardea, Ana) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1174 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Regarding Filing of Unredacted Documents (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Plaintiffs' Opposition to ANA's MSJ, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit L, #6 Exhibit M, #7 Exhibit N, #8 Exhibit O, #9 Exhibit P, #10 Declaration Unredacted Declaration of Michael Stone)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1173 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #1162 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1172 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF NOTICE PROGRAM, NOTICE FORMS, AND PLAN OF ALLOCATION. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/1/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
June 1, 2018 Filing 1171 Proposed Order re #1169 Notice (Other), Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Notice Program, Notice Forms and Plan of Allocation by All Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
May 30, 2018 Filing 1170 DECLARATION of Michaela Spero in Opposition to #1166 Declaration in Support (Declaration in Response to Declaration of Ankur Kapoor in Support of Filing Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 79-5(e)(1)) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #1166 ) (Spero, Michaela) (Filed on 5/30/2018)
May 29, 2018 Filing 1169 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #1160 Supplemental Brief, Plaintiffs' Notice of Revised Class Notice Forms in Support of Motion to Approve the Class Notice Program (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
May 29, 2018 Filing 1168 REPLY (re #1158 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byAll Nippon Airways. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ankur Kapoor, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4 slip sheet, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
May 29, 2018 Filing 1167 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by All Nippon Airways. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Wyatt Fore, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Redacted Reply Brief, #5 Unredacted Reply Brief, #6 Exhibit 4 Slip sheet, #7 Exhibit 4 Unredacted Copy)(Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
May 25, 2018 Filing 1166 Declaration of Ankur Kapoor in Support of #1162 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 79-5(e)(1) filed byAll Nippon Airways. (Related document(s) #1162 ) (Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1165 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING FINAL APPROVAL HEARING AND SETTING INTERIM DEADLINES RE: PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS WITH DEFENDANTS PHILIPPINE AIRLINES, INC., AIR NEW ZEALAND LIMITED, CHINA AIRLINES, LTD., AND EVA AIRWAYS CORPORATION by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #1164 Stipulation. Motion for Final Fairness Hearing set for 9/14/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018)
May 22, 2018 Filing 1164 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Final Approval Hearing and Setting Interim Deadlines Re: Preliminary Approval of Settlements With Defendants Philippine Airlines, Inc., Air New Zealand Limited, China Airlines, Ltd., and EVA Airways Corporation filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 1163 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1158 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Stone, #2 Declaration of Michaela Spero, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 1162 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michaela Spero, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to ANA's Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to ANA's Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Redacted Version of Declaration of Michael Stone, #6 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Michael Stone, #7 Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit C, #10 Exhibit L, #11 Exhibit M, #12 Exhibit N, #13 Exhibit O, #14 Exhibit P, #15 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1161 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer GRANTING MOTIONS FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
May 11, 2018 Filing 1160 Supplemental Brief re 1146 Motion Hearing,,, #1130 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion For Approval of Notice Program, Notice Forms, and Plan of Allocation filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Shannon R. Wheatman, #3 Declaration of Eric Goldstein)(Related document(s) 1146 , #1130 ) (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1159 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ALL NIPPON AIRWAYS CO., LTDS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #1156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
May 7, 2018 Filing 1158 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by All Nippon Airways. Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 5/21/2018. Replies due by 5/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ankur Kapoor, #2 Exhibits 1 and 10 through 21 (redacted), #3 Exhibits 2 through 9, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 7, 2018 Filing 1157 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1119 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byAll Nippon Airways. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Harrison J. McAvoy, #2 Exhibits 1, 2, 3, 9, and 10 (redacted), #3 Exhibits 4 through 8, #4 Declaration of Masakazu Ishii, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 7, 2018 Filing 1156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by All Nippon Airways. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Harrison J. McAvoy, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Redacted Brief in Opposition to Class Certification, #5 Unredacted Brief in Opposition to Class Certification, #6 Redacted Exhibits to McAvoy Declaration, #7 Unredacted Exhibits to McAvoy Declaration, #8 Redacted Ishii Declaration, #9 Unredacted Ishii Declaration, #10 Redacted Motion for Summary Judgment, #11 Unredacted Motion for Summary Judgment, #12 Redacted Exhibits to Kapoor Declaration, #13 Unredacted Exhibits to Kapoor Declaration)(Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1155 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #1153 Ex Parte Application. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 1154 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1153 Ex Parte Application to File Brief in Excess of Fifteen-Page Limit ) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 1153 Ex Parte Application to File Brief in Excess of Fifteen-Page Limit filed by All Nippon Airways. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 1152 NOTICE of Appearance by Ankur Kapoor of Harrison J. McAvoy (Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 1, 2018 Filing 1151 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on April 27, 2018 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by All Nippon Airways, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
May 1, 2018 Filing 1150 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on April 27, 2018 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Air New Zealand, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Cunningham, Scott) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
May 1, 2018 Filing 1149 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/27/18, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #1147 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2018. (Related documents(s) #1147 ) (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
April 30, 2018 Filing 1148 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/27/2018 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Eva Airways, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Tsoumas, Tammy) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
April 27, 2018 Filing 1147 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/27/2018 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by All Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
April 27, 2018 Filing 1146 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles R. Breyer: Motion Hearing held on 4/27/2018 - Re #1129 Motion for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement With Defendant EVA Airways Corporation filed by All Plaintiffs; Re #1130 Motion for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion For Approval of Notice Program, Notice Forms, and Plan of Allocation filed by All Plaintiffs. Plaintiff will file supplemental briefing within two weeks addressing notice and the adequacy of notice. The Court Certified the Class. (Total Time in Court: 20 Minutes) Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce. Plaintiff Attorney: Christopher L. Lebsock and Adam J. Zapala. Defendant Attorney: Scott D. Cunningham (Courtcall); Anita Stork, Tammy A. Tsoumas, and James V. Dick. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/27/2018)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1145 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AIR NEW ZEALANDS APPLICATION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #1144 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall make arrangements through CourtCall. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
April 24, 2018 Filing 1144 MOTION to Appear by Telephone via Courtcall at the hearing scheduled on April 27, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Air New Zealand. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Scott) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1143 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #1141 Ex Parte Application to Extend Time. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
April 19, 2018 Filing 1142 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1141 Ex Parte Application to Extend Time to Oppose Motion for Class Certification ) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 19, 2018 Filing 1141 Ex Parte Application to Extend Time to Oppose Motion for Class Certification filed by All Nippon Airways. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ankur Kapoor, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1140 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #1137 Motion to Modify Case Schedule and Vacating Trial Date. (crblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
April 6, 2018 Filing 1139 Statement of Non-Opposition re #1137 MOTION to Modify the Case Schedule and Adjourn the Trial (Unopposed) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #1137 ) (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
April 6, 2018 Filing 1138 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1137 MOTION to Modify the Case Schedule and Adjourn the Trial (Unopposed) Shortening the Time to Decide the Motion filed by All Nippon Airways. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ankur Kapoor)(Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
April 6, 2018 Filing 1137 MOTION to Modify the Case Schedule and Adjourn the Trial (Unopposed) filed by All Nippon Airways. Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 4/20/2018. Replies due by 4/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald Earl Childress III, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
April 5, 2018 Filing 1136 AMENDED GUIDELINES FOR TRIAL AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IN CIVIL JURY CASES. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/5/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
April 4, 2018 Filing 1135 GUIDELINES FOR TRIAL AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IN CIVIL JURY CASES. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/4/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 1134 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 6/26/2018 at 2:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1133 ORDER of U.S. Supreme Court (USCA Nos. 15-15362, 15-15364) : the petition for a writ of certiorari is denied.(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 1132 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Request for Final Pretrial Conference and Notice of Denial of Defendant's Petition for Writ of Certiorari (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 1131 NOTICE of Appearance by Michaela Spero (Spero, Michaela) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 13, 2018 Filing 1130 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion For Approval of Notice Program, Notice Forms, and Plan of Allocation filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 3/27/2018. Replies due by 4/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Lebsock, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Declaration of Shannon Wheatman, #5 Proposed Order)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
March 13, 2018 Filing 1129 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement With Defendant EVA Airways Corporation filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 3/27/2018. Replies due by 4/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Lebsock, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
March 5, 2018 Filing 1128 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY SETTLEMENT hearing set for March 9, 2018.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
February 22, 2018 Filing 1127 NOTICE of Change of Address by Garrett D. Blanchfield, Jr (Blanchfield, Garrett) (Filed on 2/22/2018)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1126 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5 (ECF NO. 1118) AND VACATING ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5 (ECF NO. 1122) - Re #1124 Proposed Order filed by All Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/2/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
February 2, 2018 Filing 1125 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles R. Breyer: Status Conference held on 2/2/2018. Counsel will submit the "notice and motion for preliminary approval" after the board has approved the proposal. The only remaining defendant is All Nippon Airways. Jury Trial set for 7/9/2018 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (Total Time in Court: 9 Minutes) Court Reporter: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Christopher L. Lebsock and Adam J. Zapala. Defendant Attorney: Anita Stork, Tammy A. Tsoumas, Ankur Kapoor and Jesse W. Markham, Jr.; Scott D. Cunningham and James V. Dick (via CourtCall) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/2/2018)
February 1, 2018 Filing 1124 Proposed Order re #1122 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AMENDED [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5 (ECF NO. 1118) AND VACATING ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5 (ECF NO. 1122) by All Plaintiffs. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
January 30, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1119 Motion to Certify Class. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 1123 CLERK'S NOTICE: Motion for Class Certification Hearing reset to 10/5/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. The briefing schedule remains the same: Opposition due by 6/25/2018; Reply due by 8/24/2018. The hearing set for 9/28/2018 is vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1122 ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5 by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Denying #1118 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1121 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AIR NEW ZEALAND'S APPLICATION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #1117 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall make arrangements through CourtCall. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 26, 2018 Filing 1120 Request for Judicial Notice re #1119 MOTION to Certify Class filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) #1119 ) (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 26, 2018 Filing 1119 MOTION to Certify Class filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 6/25/2018. Replies due by 8/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Expert Report - Redacted, #3 Declaration of Adam Zapala, #4 Exhibit 1-43 Redacted, #5 Exhibit 44, #6 Exhibit 45)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 26, 2018 Filing 1118 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Class Cert Brief Redacted, #5 Class Cert Brief Under Seal, #6 Expert Report Redacted, #7 Expert Report Under Seal, #8 Exhibits 1-43 Redacted, #9 Exhibit 1, #10 Exhibit 2, #11 Exhibit 3, #12 Exhibit 4, #13 Exhibit 5, #14 Exhibit 6, #15 Exhibit 7, #16 Exhibit 8, #17 Exhibit 9, #18 Exhibit 10, #19 Exhibit 11, #20 Exhibit 12, #21 Exhibit 13, #22 Exhibit 14, #23 Exhibit 15, #24 Exhibit 16, #25 Exhibit 17, #26 Exhibit 18, #27 Exhibit 19, #28 Exhibit 20, #29 Exhibit 21, #30 Exhibit 22, #31 Exhibit 23, #32 Exhibit 24, #33 Exhibit 25, #34 Exhibit 26, #35 Exhibit 27, #36 Exhibit 28, #37 Exhibit 29, #38 Exhibit 30, #39 Exhibit 31, #40 Exhibit 32, #41 Exhibit 33, #42 Exhibit 34, #43 Exhibit 35, #44 Exhibit 36, #45 Exhibit 37, #46 Exhibit 38, #47 Exhibit 39, #48 Exhibit 40, #49 Exhibit 41, #50 Exhibit 42, #51 Exhibit 43)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 25, 2018 Filing 1117 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at status conference 2/2/18 filed by Air New Zealand. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Scott) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 25, 2018 Filing 1116 Statement of Non-Opposition re #1112 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements With Defendants Phillippine Airlines, Inc., Air New Zealand Limited and China Airlines, Ltd. filed byAir New Zealand. (Related document(s) #1112 ) (Cunningham, Scott) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 11, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1112 Motion for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements With Defendants Phillippine Airlines, Inc., Air New Zealand Limited and China Airlines, Ltd. Responses due by 1/24/2018. Replies due by 1/31/2018. Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
January 11, 2018 Filing 1115 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING set for February 16, 2018 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. Motion for Settlement hearing reset for March 9, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. The briefing schedule remains the same: Opposition due by January 24, 2018; Reply due by January 31, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
January 11, 2018 Filing 1114 CLERK'S NOTICE: Status Conference set for 2/2/2018 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Charles R. Breyer.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
January 10, 2018 Filing 1113 ERRATA re #1112 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements With Defendants Phillippine Airlines, Inc., Air New Zealand Limited and China Airlines, Ltd. by All Plaintiffs. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 10, 2018 Filing 1112 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements With Defendants Phillippine Airlines, Inc., Air New Zealand Limited and China Airlines, Ltd. filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 1/24/2018. Replies due by 1/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher L. Lebsock, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Order)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 5, 2018 Filing 1111 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Adam John Zapala Re: Withdrawal of Steven N. Williams (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1110 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #1109 Stipulation. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
January 2, 2018 Filing 1109 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Class Certification Briefing Schedule filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 1/2/2018)
December 13, 2017 Filing 1108 U.S. Supreme Court Notice that the petition for a writ of certiorari is denied (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 6, 2017 Filing 1107 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Marvin L. Frank for Lawrence D. McCabe (Frank, Marvin) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
November 21, 2017 Filing 1106 NOTICE by Eva Airways of Withdrawal of Jason Kelly as Attorney for Defendant EVA Airways Corporation (Canner, Heather) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 21, 2017 Filing 1105 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather F. Canner (Canner, Heather) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1104 ORDER of U.S. Supreme Court as to USCA Nos. 15-15362, 15-15364 : the petition for a writ of certiorari was filed 10/18/17 and placed on the docket as No. 17-659. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1103 ORDER of U.S. Supreme Court as to #1026 Notice of Appeal, filed by Amy Yang. The petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on 10/31/17 and placed on the docket as No. 17-662. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1102 ORDER (MODIFIED) GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO RESCHEDULE CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #1100 Ex Parte Application. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
October 20, 2017 Filing 1101 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #1100 Ex Parte Application to Reschedule Class Certification ) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 16, 2017 Filing 1100 Ex Parte Application to Reschedule Class Certification filed by Eva Airways. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Tsoumas, Tammy) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 6, 2017 Filing 1099 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles R. Breyer: Status Conference held on 10/6/2017. Motion for Class Certification due by 1/5/2018. Motion Hearing (hearing date modified) set for 2/23/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (Total Time in Court: 5 Minutes) Court Reporter: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Jenie L. Anderson (CourtCall), Christopher L. Lebsock, Adam J. Zapala and Seth Gassman (in-person). Defendant Attorney: Scott D. Cunningham, James V. Dick, Aakul Kapoor, Anita F. Stork and Tammy Tsoumas (CourtCall). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/6/2017)
October 4, 2017 Filing 1098 STATUS REPORT : Updated JOINT Status Report in Advance of October 6, 2017 Status Conference filed by Eva Airways. (Tsoumas, Tammy) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
October 4, 2017 Filing 1097 CLERK'S NOTICE: Counsel may appear by phone at the Status Conference set for October 6 at 8:30 a.m. Telephone appearances may be arranged by calling CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 not later than 3:00 p.m. the court day prior to the hearing date. An updated Status Conference Statement due on October 4, 2017 by close of business. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF)
October 3, 2017 Filing 1096 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) And Request For Continuance And/Or Telephonic Conference filed by Eva Airways. (Tsoumas, Tammy) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
September 29, 2017 Filing 1095 CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Status Report due by close of business on 10/4/2017. Status Conference set for 10/6/2017 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 1094 CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel re #1093 . (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 1093 MANDATE of USCA as to #1026 Notice of Appeal, filed by Amy Yang. The judgment of this Court, entered 6/26/17, takes effect this date. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1092 ORDER of USCA as to #1026 Notice of Appeal, filed by Amy Yang. The petition for rehearing is denied and the petition for rehearing en banc is denied. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
July 5, 2017 Filing 1091 USCA Memorandum as to #1026 Notice of Appeal, filed by Amy Yang. The decision of the district court is affirmed. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/5/2017: #1 Dissent) (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2017 Filing 1090 CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel re #1089 . (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 19, 2017 Filing 1089 MANDATE of USCA as to USCA No. 15-15364 : The judgment of this Court, entered 4/14/17, takes effect this date.(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 19, 2017 Filing 1088 CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel re #1087 . (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 19, 2017 Filing 1087 MANDATE of USCA as to #981 Notice of Appeal, filed by All Nippon Airways. The judgment of this Court, entered 4/14/17, takes effect this date. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1086 ORDER of USCA (USCA Nos. 15-15362, 15-15364) denying the petitions for panel rehearing and rehearing en banc filed by Appellants. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
June 14, 2017 Filing 1085 NOTICE by Justin LaBarge NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE (Spector, Eugene) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
May 25, 2017 Filing 1084 NOTICE by All Nippon Airways of Withdrawal of Counsel (Malone, Gary) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 19, 2017 Filing 1083 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Withdrawal of Counsel (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1082 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #1081 Stipulation. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2017)
May 16, 2017 Filing 1081 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule on Class Certification filed by Donald Wortman. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
April 14, 2017 Filing 1080 USCA Opinion as to #981 Notice of Appeal, filed by All Nippon Airways. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2017)
February 3, 2017 Filing 1079 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Richard Alexander Saveri (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
January 18, 2017 Filing 1078 NOTICE of Change of Address by Terry Gross and Firm Name Change (Gross, Terry) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1077 ORDER of USCA as to USCA No. 15-15364 : The respective motions of Defendants-Appellants Philippine Airlines, Inc. and Air New Zealand, Ltd requesting dismissal as parties without prejudice are granted.(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1076 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #1075 Motion to Withdraw (J A Meckes of Squire Patton Boggs (US) is removed as named counsel for China Airlines. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
September 29, 2016 Filing 1075 MOTION to Withdraw ; [PROPOSED] Order filed by China Airlines. Responses due by 10/13/2016. Replies due by 10/20/2016. (Dick, James) (Filed on 9/29/2016) Modified on 9/29/2016 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2016 Filing 1074 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Steven Noel Williams re Withdrawal of Niki B. Okcu (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
September 19, 2016 Filing 1073 NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel Cohen (Cohen, Daniel) (Filed on 9/19/2016)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1072 ORDER relating cases C-15-4085WHA, C-15-4223MMC and C-15-4459JCS to 08-md-1913CRB, C-07-5634CRB and specifically to C-15-3090 by Judge Charles R. Breyer. (granting #1069 Motion to Relate Case; granting #1070 Motion to Relate Case). The parties are instructed that all future filings in any reassigned case are to bear the initials of the newly assigned judge (CRB) immediately after the case number. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 9, 2015 Filing 1071 NOTICE of Change of Address by Anna W St. John and Theodore H. Frank (St. John, Anna) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
September 29, 2015 Filing 1070 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Lax & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Whitney E. Street, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Lax & Co. Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Boston Amateur Basketball Club Complaint, #4 Proposed Order)(Street, Whitney) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
September 22, 2015 Filing 1069 MOTION to Relate Case 3:15-cv-04223-MMC filed by Linda Williams. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence G. Papale, #2 Exhibit to Motion; Complaint in Williams v. American Airlines, #3 Proposed Order)(Papale, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/22/2015)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1068 ORDER of USCA (USCA # 15-15362) : The Clerk shall remove counsel Terrell as counsel of record for plaintiff-appellee Castell. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2015)
September 3, 2015 Filing 1067 NOTICE by Deutsche Lufthansa AG, Swiss International AG , NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY ERIC J. MAHR (Lange, Perry) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1066 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #1065 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (J S Cohen). (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 26, 2015 Filing 1065 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jay S. Cohen of Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis, PC filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 9/9/2015. Replies due by 9/16/2015. (Cohen, Jay) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
August 18, 2015 Filing 1064 NOTICE of Change of Address by Francis Onofrei Scarpulla (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
August 14, 2015 Filing 1063 NOTICE of Change of Address by Derek G. Howard one of the attorneys for Plaintiff Maloof (Howard, Derek) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1062 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #1029 Motion for Attorney Fees. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2015)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1061 ORDER RELATING CASES C-15-3497CRB and C-15-3520CRB to C-07-5634 (08-md-1913) and specifically to C-15-3090CRB. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/4/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2015)
August 2, 2015 Filing 1060 Declaration of Theodore H. Frank in Support of #1029 MOTION for Attorney Fees in response to #1053 ORDER filed byAmy Yang. (Related document(s) #1029 ) (Frank, Theodore) (Filed on 8/2/2015)
July 30, 2015 Filing 1059 NOTICE by Micah Abrams Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (Corbitt, Craig) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1058 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #1050 Motion for change of firm affiliations of John G. Emerson and Scott E. Poynter. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1057 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #1049 Motion for change of firm affiliation of John G. Emerson and Scott E. Poynter (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1056 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #1048 Motion to Withdraw William T. Crowder and Corey D. McGaha as Attorney of Record. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1055 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting (1047) Motion to Relate Case; granting (1051) Motion to Relate Case; granting (1052) Motion to Relate Case; granting (1054) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:07-cv-05634-CRB and specifically to C-15-3090CRB. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
July 28, 2015 Filing 1054 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Edward Park. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aron K. Liang in Support of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Case Should be Related, #2 Proposed Order Relating Case)(Lee, Jack) (Filed on 7/28/2015)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1053 ORDER DIRECTING FILING RE ATTORNEY HOURS. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/28/2015. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2015)
July 28, 2015 Filing 1052 MOTION to Relate Case filed by James Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of Stewart v. American Airlines Complaint, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Mehdi, Azra) (Filed on 7/28/2015)
July 28, 2015 Filing 1051 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by Sarah Tran. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF ROSEMARY M. RIVAS IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED (Civil Local Rules 3-12 and 7-11), #2 Proposed Order RELATING CASES, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 7/28/2015)
July 24, 2015 Filing 1050 MOTION Change of Firm Affiliations and contact information of Scott E. Poynter and John G. Emerson filed by Lolly Randall. Responses due by 8/3/2015. Replies due by 8/10/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Mtn for change of Firm Affiliation of Scott E. Poynter and John G. Emerson)(Poynter, Scott) (Filed on 7/24/2015)
July 24, 2015 Filing 1049 MOTION Change of Firm Affiliations & contact information for John G. Emerson & Scott E. Poynter filed by Lolly Randall. Responses due by 8/1/2015. Replies due by 8/10/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Motion for Change of Firm Affiliations for John G. Emerson and Scott E. Poynter)(Emerson, John) (Filed on 7/24/2015)
July 24, 2015 Filing 1048 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record-W Crowder and C. McGaha filed by Lolly Randall. Responses due by 8/7/2015. Replies due by 8/14/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Withdrawal of William T. Crowder and Corey D. McGaha)(Emerson, John) (Filed on 7/24/2015)
July 23, 2015 Filing 1047 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Additional Cases Should Be Related filed by Kathryn Lavin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Declaration of Christopher L. Lebsock, #3 Proposed Order)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 7/23/2015)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1046 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #1041 Motion to Relate Case; granting #1043 Motion to Relate Case; granting #1044 Motion to Relate Case (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2015)
July 23, 2015 Filing 1045 CLERK'S NOTICE: The case management scheduling order setting a conference for 7/31/2015 at 10:00 a.m. IS ONLY for the newly related cases and NOT for the 08-md-1913 case or lead case C-07-5634CRB. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2015)
July 22, 2015 Filing 1044 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Additional Case Should Be Related filed by Kathryn Lavin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Declaration of Christopher L. Lebsock, #3 Proposed Order)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
July 22, 2015 Filing 1043 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Cherokii Verduzco. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Guido Saveri, #2 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
July 22, 2015 Filing 1042 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER and Standing Orders. Counsel are to follow Judge Breyer's standing orders. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
July 21, 2015 Filing 1041 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Stephanie Jung. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steve Williams, #2 Proposed Order)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 7/21/2015)
July 20, 2015 Filing 1040 REPLY (re #1029 MOTION for Attorney Fees ) filed byAmy Yang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Theodore H. Frank)(St. John, Anna) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1039 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #1038 Motion to Relate Case C-15-3222JSC, C-15-3296CRB and C-15-3269DMR to C-07-5634CRB and specially to C-15-3090CRB (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
July 16, 2015 Filing 1038 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Kathryn Lavin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher L. Lebsock, #2 [Proposed] Order)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 7/16/2015)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1037 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting (1035) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:07-cv-05634-CRB. Cases C-15-3090CRB, C-15-3111CRB, C-15-3137CRB and C-15-3176CRB are related to one another. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1036 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #1032 Motion to Relate Cases C-15-3090, C-15-3111 and C-15-3137 to C-7-5634CRB. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2015)
July 13, 2015 Filing 1035 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Micah Abrams. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 7/13/2015)
July 13, 2015 Filing 1034 RESPONSE (re #1032 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related ) Defendants Opposition to Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed byAll Nippon Airways. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Malone, Gary) (Filed on 7/13/2015)
July 13, 2015 Filing 1033 RESPONSE (re #1029 MOTION for Attorney Fees ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Objector Amy Yang's Motion for Attorneys' Fees; Memorandum of Points and Authorites filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 7/13/2015)
July 9, 2015 Filing 1032 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Kathryn Lavin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Lavin Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Backus Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Andrade Complaint, #4 Declaration of Christopher L. Lebsock, #5 Proposed Order)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
July 9, 2015 Filing 1031 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 5/22/2015 before Judge Charles R. Breyer, (St. John, Anna) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
July 2, 2015 Filing 1030 USCA Case Number 15-16280 for #1026 Notice of Appeal, filed by Amy Yang. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
June 29, 2015 Filing 1029 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Amy Yang. Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 7/13/2015. Replies due by 7/20/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anna St. John, #2 Proposed Order)(St. John, Anna) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
June 25, 2015 Filing 1028 NOTICE by Eva Airways of Withdrawal of Elizabeth M. Kim, Pantea Yashar, and Andrew P. Young as Attorneys for Defendant EVA Airways Corporation (Tsoumas, Tammy) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
June 25, 2015 Filing 1027 Statement re #1026 Notice of Appeal, of Representation by Amy Yang. (St. John, Anna) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
June 25, 2015 Filing 1026 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Amy Yang. Appeal of Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion for Settlement #1009 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-9630020 paid.) (St. John, Anna) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
June 23, 2015 Filing 1025 NOTICE of Change of Address by Susan Gilah Kupfer and Change of Firm Name (Kupfer, Susan) (Filed on 6/23/2015)
June 18, 2015 Filing 1024 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5-22-2015, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (1010 in 3:07-cv-05634-CRB) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/16/2015. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
June 15, 2015 Filing 1023 CORRECTED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT JAPAN AIRLINES COMPANY, LTD (with Judge's Signature) re #1015 Judgment. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
June 15, 2015 Filing 1022 Notice of Change in Counsel Sara A. Slavin filed by Thai Airways. (Wilson, Rowan) (Filed on 6/15/2015) Modified on 6/16/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2015 Filing 1021 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT VIETNAM AIRLINES CORPORATION. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/11/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
June 15, 2015 Filing 1020 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT THAI AIRWAYS INTERNATIONAL PUBLIC CO., LTD.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/11/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
June 15, 2015 Filing 1019 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT SOCIETE AIR FRANCE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/11/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015) Modified on 6/16/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2015 Filing 1018 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT SINGAPORE AIRLINES LIMITED. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/11/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
June 15, 2015 Filing 1017 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT QANTAS AIRWAYS LIMITED. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/11/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
June 15, 2015 Filing 1016 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT MALAYSIAN AIRLINE SYSTEM BERHAD. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/11/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
June 15, 2015 Filing 1015 **SEE DOC #1023 FOR CORRECTED JUDGMENT *** FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT JAPAN AIRLINES COMPANY, LTD.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/11/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015) Modified on 6/17/2015 (beS, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2015 Filing 1014 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT CATHAY PACIFIC AIRWAYS LIMITED. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/11/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1013 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #1011 Stipulation Regarding Entry of Final Judgments of Dismissal With Respect to the Settling Defendants (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
June 8, 2015 Filing 1012 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kimberly Ann Kralowec and The Kralowec Law Group (Kralowec, Kimberly) (Filed on 6/8/2015)
June 4, 2015 Filing 1011 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Entry of Final Judgments of Dismissal With Respect to the Settling Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
May 27, 2015 Filing 1010 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by All Plaintiffs for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 5/27/2015)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1009 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #986 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting #999 Motion for Settlement. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
May 22, 2015 Filing 1008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Charles R. Breyer: Motion Hearing held on 5/22/2015. re #999 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlements With Defendants Societe Air France, Cathay Pacific Airways Ltd, Japan Airlines Int'l Co., Ltd., Malaysian Airline System Berhad, Qa filed by All Plaintiffs, #986 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Class Representative Incentive Awards filed by All Plaintiffs. Court approves expenses and class representative incentive awards and awards attorney fees in the amount of $9 million. Motion for final approval of settlements approved subject to review of objection, order to be issued by the Court. Court Reporter: Debra Pas.Plaintiff Attorney Christopher Lebsock, Adam Zapala, Steven Williams, Michael Lehmann, Allan Steyer, Elizabeth Tran. Defendant Attorney : William Sherman, Edward Han, David Bamberger, Robert Hawk, Brenda DiLuigi, Rowan Wilson, Kenneth Ewing, Jeff Davidson.Objector Attorney: Anna St. John. This is a text only Minute Entry (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/22/2015)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1007 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting as modified #1002 Motion for Leave to File Declaration of Theodore H. Frank. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
May 19, 2015 Filing 1006 RESPONSE (re #1002 MOTION for Leave to File Declaration of Theodore H. Frank ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Objector Amy Yang's Motion for Administrative Relief for Leave to File Declaration of Theodore H. Frank filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
May 15, 2015 Filing 1005 Letter from Anita F. Stork Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval. (Stork, Anita) (Filed on 5/15/2015)
May 15, 2015 Filing 1004 Proposed Order re #986 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Class Representative Incentive Awards; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof [Proposed] Amended Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Class Representative Incentive Awards by All Plaintiffs. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 5/15/2015) Modified on 5/18/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2015 Filing 1003 Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of #986 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Class Representative Incentive Awards; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Supplemental Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Class Representative Awards filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #986 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 5/15/2015)
May 15, 2015 Filing 1002 MOTION for Leave to File Declaration of Theodore H. Frank filed by Amy Yang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(St. John, Anna) (Filed on 5/15/2015)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1001 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #997 Stipulation Regarding Partial Withdrawal of Objection of Amy Yang (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
May 11, 2015 Filing 1000 Declaration of Isrin Saaid Shaharuddin in Support of #999 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlements With Defendants Societe Air France, Cathay Pacific Airways Limited, Japan Airlines International Company, Ltd., Malaysian Airline System Berhad, Qa filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #999 ) (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 5/11/2015)
May 8, 2015 Filing 999 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlements With Defendants Societe Air France, Cathay Pacific Airways Limited, Japan Airlines International Company, Ltd., Malaysian Airline System Berhad, Qantas Airways Limited, Singapore Airlines Limited, Thai Airways International Public Co., Ltd. and Vietnam Airlines Corporation; and Memorandum In Support Thereof filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 5/22/2015. Replies due by 5/29/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher L. Lebsock, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Declaration of Shannon Wheatman (Part 1), #18 Declaration of Shannon Wheatman (Part 2), #19 Declaration of Joel Botzet, #20 Declaration of Takeshi Aratani, #21 Declaration of David H. Bamberger, #22 Declaration of William R. Sherman, #23 Declaration of James R. Warnot, Jr., #24 Declaration of J. Christopher Mitchell, #25 Proposed Order)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
May 7, 2015 Filing 998 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael John Fanelli (Fanelli, Michael) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
May 7, 2015 Filing 997 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Partial Withdrawal of Objection of Amy Yang filed by Amy Yang. (St. John, Anna) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
April 30, 2015 Filing 996 NOTICE of Appearance by Neyleen Sara Beljajev (Beljajev, Neyleen) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
April 30, 2015 Filing 995 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Heather Kent (Kent, Amanda) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
April 22, 2015 Filing 994 NOTICE of Change of Address by James V Dick Change of Address, Firm Name, Email, and Facsimile (Dick, James) (Filed on 4/22/2015)
April 17, 2015 Filing 993 OBJECTIONS to Proposed Settlements with Defendants [921-3, 921-4, 921-5, 921-6, 921-7, 921-8, 942-2, 942-3] and Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Incentive Awards #986 by Amy Yang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amy Yang, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order)(St. John, Anna) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
April 14, 2015 Filing 992 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Harold Frank (Frank, Theodore) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
April 13, 2015 Filing 991 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron M Dawson (Dawson, Aaron) (Filed on 4/13/2015)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 990 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #985 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (A St. John) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2015)
April 8, 2015 Filing 989 NOTICE by Donald Wortman of Compliance with Court Order and Plaintiffs' Class Notice Program (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 4/8/2015)
April 7, 2015 Filing 988 Declaration of Christopher L. Lebsock in Support of #986 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Class Representative Incentive Awards; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Declaration of Christopher L. Lebsock in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #986 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 4/7/2015) Modified on 4/8/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2015 Filing 987 Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of #986 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Class Representative Incentive Awards; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Class Representative Incentive Awards filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Jennie Lee Anderson, #7 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Philip A. Baker, #8 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Joseph J. Tabacco, Jr., #9 Exhibit 9 - Declaration of Christopher J. Cormier, #10 Exhibit 10 - Declaration of Daniel Cohen, #11 Exhibit 11 - Declaration of John G. Emerson, #12 Exhibit 12 - Declaration of Walter J. Lack, #13 Exhibit 13 - Declaration of William H. London, #14 Exhibit 14 - Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, #15 Exhibit 15 - Declaration of Thomas V. Girardi, #16 Exhibit 16 - Declaration of Susan G. Kupfer, #17 Exhibit 17 - Declaration of Robert G. Eisler, #18 Exhibit 18 - Declaration of Adam C. Belsky, #19 Exhibit 19 - Declaration of Daniel C. Hedlund, #20 Exhibit 20 - Declaration of Jessica N. Servais, #21 Exhibit 21 - Declaration of Joshua H. Haffner, #22 Exhibit 22 - Declaration of Richard J. Kilsheimer, #23 Exhibit 23 - Declaration of Jay L. Himes, #24 Exhibit 24 - Declaration of Brian Barry, #25 Exhibit 25 - Declaration of Sherman Kassof, #26 Exhibit 26 - Declaration of Steven J. Greenfogel, #27 Exhibit 27 - Declaration of W. Joseph Bruckner, #28 Exhibit 28 - Declaration of Steven J. Greenfogel, #29 Exhibit 29 - Declaration of Paul F. Novak, #30 Exhibit 30 - Declaration of Jack W. Lee, #31 Exhibit 31 - Declaration of G. Scott Emblidge, #32 Exhibit 32 - Declaration of Dianne M. Nast, #33 Exhibit 33 - Declaration of Bruce L. Simon, #34 Exhibit 34 - Declaration of Marc I. Gross, #35 Exhibit 35 - Declaration of Elizabeth C. Pritzker, #36 Exhibit 36 - Declaration of Garret D. Blanchfield, #37 Exhibit 37 - Declaration of Hollis Salzman, #38 Exhibit 38 - Declaration of R. Alexander Saveri, #39 Exhibit 39 - Declaration of Jay S. Cohen, #40 Exhibit 40 - Declaration of Allan Steyer, #41 Exhibit 41 - Declaration of Kimberly A. Kralowec, #42 Exhibit 42 - Declaration of Mario N. Alioto, #43 Exhibit 43 - Declaration of Craig C. Corbitt)(Related document(s) #986 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 4/7/2015)
April 7, 2015 Filing 986 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Class Representative Incentive Awards; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 4/17/2015. Replies due by 5/8/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 4/7/2015)
April 7, 2015 Filing 985 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9421906.) filed by Amy Yang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(St. John, Anna) (Filed on 4/7/2015)
March 25, 2015 Filing 984 NOTICE by Micah Abrams Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 3/25/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 983 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 08/15/2014 and 11/01/2010 before Judge Charles R. Breyer, Amended Transcript Designation Form (Lannin, Cortlin) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 982 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 8/15/14 and 11/01/10 before Judge Breyer, Amended Transcript Designation Form (Malone, Gary) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 12, 2015 Filing 981 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by All Nippon Airways. Appeal of Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,, #945 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-9353980 paid.) (Malone, Gary) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 9, 2015 Filing 979 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 8/15/14 before Judge Breyer, (Malone, Gary) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
March 6, 2015 Filing 980 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505, receipt number 3461103511. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
March 6, 2015 Filing 978 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 8/15/14 before Judge Breyer, (Lannin, Cortlin) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 977 ORDER of USCA (USCA Nos. 14-80164, 14-80166) : The petitions for permission to appeal the district court's 9/23/14 order pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) are granted. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
March 4, 2015 Filing 976 USCA Case Number 15-15364 - Donald Wortman et al v. Philippine Airlines, Inc. et al. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
March 4, 2015 Filing 975 USCA Case Number 15-15362 - Donald Wortman et al v. All Nippon Airways. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 974 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #971 Stipulation Re Amendments To Notice Program Regarding Settlements With Certain Defendants (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
March 3, 2015 Filing 973 NOTICE by Bruce Hut NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MARC M. SELTZER, DANIEL J. WALKER AND SUSMAN GODFREY L.L.P. AS ATTORNEYS FOR PLAINTIFF BRUCE HUT (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
March 3, 2015 Filing 972 AMENDED DOCUMENT by All Plaintiffs. Amendment to #971 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Amendments To Notice Program Regarding Settlements With Certain Defendants . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Declaration of Shannon R. Wheatman)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
March 2, 2015 Filing 971 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Amendments To Notice Program Regarding Settlements With Certain Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Declaration of Shannon R. Wheatman)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 3/2/2015) Modified on 3/4/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2015 Filing 970 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12-12-2014, before Judge CRB. Court Reporter Joanne M. Farrell, Telephone number 415-302-1781, jsanrafael@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #969 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/6/2015. (Related documents(s) #969 ) (Farrell, Joanne) (Filed on 1/4/2015)
December 19, 2014 Filing 969 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by All Plaintiffs for Court Reporter Joanne Farrell. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 968 ORDER granting #948 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Notice Program, Notice Forms, and Plan of Allocation;and Memorandum In Support Thereof filed by All Plaintiffs. Fairness earing set for 5/22/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/15/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 15, 2014 Filing 967 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Charles R. Breyer: Motion Hearing held on 12/12/2014, granting #948 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Notice Program, Notice Forms, and Plan of Allocation filed by All Plaintiffs. Court Reporter Name - Joanne Farrell. Plaintiff Attorney - Christopher Lebsock, Adam Zapada. Defendant Attorney - Robert Hawk, Rowan Wilson. This is a text only Minute Entry (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/15/2014)
December 12, 2014 Filing 966 Proposed Order re #948 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Notice Program, Notice Forms, and Plan of Allocation;and Memorandum In Support Thereof [Proposed] Amended Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Notice Program, Notice Forms, and Plan of Allocation by All Plaintiffs. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
December 10, 2014 Filing 965 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Plaintiffs' Notice of Subsequent Information Re: Motion for Approval of Notice Program, Notice Forms, and Plan of Allocation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
November 19, 2014 Filing 964 USCA Case Number 14-80166 as to the Petition for Permission to Appeal under 1292(b) (Wortman et al v. Philipine Airlines, Inc. et al) (mclS, COURT STAFF)
November 19, 2014 Filing 963 USCA Case Number 14-80164 as to the Petition for Permission to Appeal under 1292(b) (Wortman et al v. All Nippon Airways). (mclS, COURT STAFF) (
November 12, 2014 Filing 962 NOTICE by Singapore Airlines of Withdrawal of Appearance of Counsel (Kolhatkar, Rahul) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 961 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting as modified #947 Motion for Certificate of Appealability (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
November 3, 2014 Filing 960 REPLY (re #948 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Notice Program, Notice Forms, and Plan of Allocation;and Memorandum In Support Thereof ) Plaintiffs' Reply Re: Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Notice Program filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
October 30, 2014 Filing 959 REPLY (re #947 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Certain Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Certify Order Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) for Interlocutory Appeal and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) filed byPhilippine Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rani Gupta in Support of Certain Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Certify Order Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) for Interlocutory Appeal, #2 Exhibit A)(Stork, Anita) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 29, 2014 Filing 958 REPLY (re #946 MOTION for Leave to Appeal ANA Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Or MOTION for Leave to File ANA Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration Concerning Filed Rate Doctrine ) filed byAll Nippon Airways. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Malone, Gary) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
October 27, 2014 Filing 957 Joinder re #948 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Notice Program, Notice Forms, and Plan of Allocation;and Memorandum In Support Thereof by Vietnam Airlines. (Hawk, Robert) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
October 27, 2014 Filing 956 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Ivan Smith, Jr (Smith, Gary) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
October 22, 2014 Filing 955 RESPONSE (re #946 MOTION for Leave to Appeal ANA Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Or MOTION for Leave to File ANA Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration Concerning Filed Rate Doctrine, #947 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Certain Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Certify Order Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) for Interlocutory Appeal and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 10/22/2014)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 954 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #952 Stipulation (Setting Briefing Schedule on Class Certification filed ) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 953 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #949 Motion to Shorten Time (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 15, 2014 Filing 952 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule on Class Certification filed by Air New Zealand. (Holland, Michael) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 951 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #942 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. The Court appoints Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, LLP and Hausfeld LLP, to serve as Settlement Class Counsel and appoints Plaintiffs Meor Adlin, Franklin Ajaye, Andrew Barton, Rachel Diller, Scott Fredrick, David Kuo, Dickson Leung, Brendan Maloof, Donald Wortman, Harley Oda, Roy Onomura, Shinsuke Kobayashi, Patricia Lee, Nancy Kajiyama, Della Ewing Chow, and James Kawaguchi to serve as Class Representatives on behalf of the Settlement Classes. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 13, 2014 Filing 949 MOTION to Shorten Time Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for An Order Specially Setting Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Notice Program, Notice Forms, and Plan of Allocation [Dkt. No. 948] filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher L. Lebsock, #2 Proposed Order)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 10/13/2014)
October 13, 2014 Filing 948 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Notice Program, Notice Forms, and Plan of Allocation;and Memorandum In Support Thereof filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 10/27/2014. Replies due by 11/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher L. Lebsock, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Declaration of Shannon R. Wheatman, #5 Proposed Order)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 10/13/2014)
October 10, 2014 Filing 950 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/10/2014 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 10/10/2014) re #942 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Defendants Qantas Airways Limited and Singapore Airlines Limited; and Memorandum In Support Thereof filed by All Plaintiffs. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/10/2014)
October 9, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #947 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Certain Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Certify Order Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) for Interlocutory Appeal and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2014 10:00 AM before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
October 9, 2014 Filing 947 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Certain Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Certify Order Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) for Interlocutory Appeal and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Philippine Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ryan M. Buschell in Support of Motion to Certifiy Order Under 28. U.S.C. Section 1292(b) for Interlocutory Appeal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Certifying Order of September 23, 2014, for Interlocutory Appeal Under 28 U.S. Section 1292(b))(Stork, Anita) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
October 8, 2014 Filing 946 MOTION for Leave to Appeal ANA Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Or, MOTION for Leave to File ANA Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration Concerning Filed Rate Doctrine filed by All Nippon Airways. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 10/22/2014. Replies due by 10/29/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. ANA [Proposed] Motion for Reconsideration Concerning Filed Rate Doctrine, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Proposed Order Granting ANA Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration Concerning Filed Rate Doctrine, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting ANA Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Malone, Gary) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 945 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part #724 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #731 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #753 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #763 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #792 Motion for Summary Judgment. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 944 ORDER granting Motion #943 MOTION for Hearing filed by All Plaintiffs. Reset Hearing as to #942 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Defendants Qantas Airways Limited and Singapore Airlines Limited. Motion Hearing reset for 10/10/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/17/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 16, 2014 Filing 943 Motion for hearing re #942 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Defendants Qantas Airways Limited and Singapore Airlines Limited; and Memorandum In Support Thereof Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for An Order Specially Setting Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Defendants Qantas Airways Limited and Singapore Airlines Limited for Hearing on October 10, 2014 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher L. Lebsock, #2 Proposed Order)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 9/16/2014) Modified on 9/17/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2014 Filing 942 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Defendants Qantas Airways Limited and Singapore Airlines Limited; and Memorandum In Support Thereof filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 9/30/2014. Replies due by 10/7/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher L. Lebsock, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 941 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #937 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kimberly N. Shaw terminated (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
August 28, 2014 Filing 940 NOTICE of Appearance by Hollis L. Salzman (Salzman, Hollis) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
August 26, 2014 Filing 939 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Vietnam Airlines for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Hawk, Robert) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
August 26, 2014 Filing 938 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/15/2014, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #934 Transcript Order, #931 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/24/2014. (Related documents(s) #934 , #931 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
August 25, 2014 Filing 937 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kimberly N. Shaw filed by Qantas Airways, Ltd.. Responses due by 9/8/2014. Replies due by 9/15/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller, W.) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
August 22, 2014 Filing 936 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Vietnam Airlines for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Hawk, Robert) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 22, 2014 Filing 935 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/08/2014, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, Tel. No.(415) 264-0580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (925 in 3:07-cv-05634-CRB) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2014. (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 18, 2014 Filing 934 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by All Nippon Airways for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 933 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #927 Stipulation (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 932 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #926 Stipulation (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 15, 2014 Filing 931 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by All Plaintiffs for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Tran, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 15, 2014 Filing 930 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/15/2014 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 8/15/2014) re #763 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Philippine Airlines, Inc., #753 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Air New Zealand, #724 MOTION for Summary Judgment ANAs Motion for Summary Judgment Based On The Filed Rate Doctrine filed by All Nippon Airways. #792 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Eva Airways, #731 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by China Airlines(Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/15/2014) Modified on 9/4/2014 (beS, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2014 Filing 929 Letter from Steven N. Williams re Hearing on Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment Based on the Filed Rate Doctrine. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
August 13, 2014 Filing 928 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #885 , #869 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
August 13, 2014 Filing 927 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #786 MOTION for Summary Judgment [NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION] OF DEFENDANT SINGAPORE AIRLINES LIMITED FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL CLAIMS IN THE SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF< Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Withdrawal of Singapore Airlines Limited's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
August 12, 2014 Filing 926 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #761 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Filed Rate Doctrine filed by Qantas Airways, Ltd.. (Miller, W.) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 11, 2014 Filing 925 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by All Plaintiffs for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 924 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #921 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
August 8, 2014 Filing 923 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/8/2014 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 8/8/2014) re #921 Amended MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Defendants Japan Airlines International Company, Ltd; Societe Air France; Vietnam Airlines Company, Ltd.; Thai Airways In filed by All Plaintiffs. (Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina.) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/8/2014)
August 7, 2014 Filing 922 Joinder re #921 Amended MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Defendants Japan Airlines International Company, Ltd; Societe Air France; Vietnam Airlines Company, Ltd.; Thai Airways In Support of Motion with Defendant Cathay Pacific Airways Ltd. by Cathay Pacific Airways. (Cairo, Deana) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
August 5, 2014 Filing 921 Amended MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Defendants Japan Airlines International Company, Ltd; Societe Air France; Vietnam Airlines Company, Ltd.; Thai Airways International Public Company, Ltd.; Malaysian Airline Systems Berhad; and Cathay Pacific Airways, Limited; and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 7/9/2014. Replies due by 7/16/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Amended Declaration of Christopher L. Lebsock, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 920 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyergranting #919 Stipulation Regarding Withdrawal of Cathay Pacific Airways, Ltd.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on all Claims in the First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
July 31, 2014 Filing 919 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #727 Request for Judicial Notice, #726 Declaration in Support, #725 MOTION for Summary Judgment Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Withdrawal of Cathay Pacific Airways, Ltd.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on all Claims in the First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
July 30, 2014 Filing 918 REPLY (re #792 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byEva Airways. (Tsoumas, Tammy) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 30, 2014 Filing 917 REPLY (re #763 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) Joint Reply Memorandum of Certain Defendants filed byPhilippine Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan M. Buschell, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Stork, Anita) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 30, 2014 Filing 916 REPLY (re #763 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byPhilippine Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cortlin Lannin, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Stork, Anita) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 30, 2014 Filing 915 REPLY (re #731 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byChina Airlines. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Dick, #2 Exhibit 1 and 2, #3 Exhibit 3 (Part 1), #4 Exhibit 3 (Part 2), #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5 and 6)(Dick, James) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 30, 2014 Filing 914 REPLY (re #724 MOTION for Summary Judgment ANAs Motion for Summary Judgment Based On The Filed Rate Doctrine ) filed byAll Nippon Airways. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Malone, Gary) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 30, 2014 Filing 913 REPLY (re #753 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) on the Filed Rate Doctrine filed byAir New Zealand. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Holland, #2 Exhibit A - Excerpts from Deposition of Michael E. Levine, #3 Exhibit B - Excerpts from DOT website, #4 Exhibit C - Exhibit 6 of Deposition of Jonathan Schwartz, #5 Exhibit D - Exhibit 7 of Deposition of Jonathan Schwartz, #6 Exhibit E - Excerpts from Deposition of Jonathan Schwartz)(Holland, Michael) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 30, 2014 Filing 912 NOTICE by Cathay Pacific Airways re #903 Opposition/Response to Motion, Cathay Pacific's Notice of Withdrawal of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Certain Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bamberger, David) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 29, 2014 Filing 911 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING HEARING as to #731 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #761 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Filed Rate Doctrine, #753 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #786 MOTION for Summary Judgment [NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION] OF DEFENDANT SINGAPORE AIRLINES LIMITED FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL CLAIMS IN THE SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF<, #792 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #725 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #724 MOTION for Summary Judgment ANAs Motion for Summary Judgment Based On The Filed Rate Doctrine, #763 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 8/15/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
July 28, 2014 Filing 910 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ankur Kapoor (Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 24, 2014 Filing 909 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kimberly Ann Kralowec and The Kralowec Law Group (Kralowec, Kimberly) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 908 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #905 Stipulation Extending Time to Reply (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 17, 2014 Filing 907 Joinder re #906 Reply to Opposition/Response,, (Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements With Defendants Japan Airlines International Company, Ltd; Societe Air France; Vietnam Airlines Company, Ltd; Thai Airways International Public Company, Ltd; and Malaysian Airline Systems Berhad) of Settling Defendants to Plaintiffs Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements With Defendants Japan Airlines International Company, Ltd; Societe Air France; Vietnam Airlines Company, Ltd; Thai Airways International Public Company, Ltd; and Malaysian Airline Systems Berhad by Air France. (Warnot, James) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 16, 2014 Filing 906 REPLY (re #900 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Defendants Japan Airlines International Company, Ltd; Societe Air France; Vietnam Airlines Company, Ltd; Thai Airways International Publ ) Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements With Defendants Japan Airlines International Company, Ltd; Societe Air France; Vietnam Airlines Company, Ltd; Thai Airways International Public Company, Ltd; and Malaysian Airline Systems Berhad filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 905 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #866 Order on Stipulation Extending Time to Reply filed by Air New Zealand, All Nippon Airways, China Airlines, Eva Airways, Philippine Airlines, Inc., Qantas Airways, Ltd.. (Holland, Michael) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 10, 2014 Filing 904 Declaration of Christopher L. Lebsock in Support of #900 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Defendants Japan Airlines International Company, Ltd; Societe Air France; Vietnam Airlines Company, Ltd; Thai Airways International Publ AMENDED Declaration of Christopher L. Lebsock In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Defendants filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - JAL Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Air France Settlement Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - VN Settlement Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Thai Airways Settlement Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - Malaysian Air Settlement Agreement)(Related document(s) #900 ) (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 9, 2014 Filing 903 RESPONSE (re #900 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Defendants Japan Airlines International Company, Ltd; Societe Air France; Vietnam Airlines Company, Ltd; Thai Airways International Publ ) filed by Philippine Airlines, Inc., Air New Zealand, All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd., Cathay Pacific Airways, China Airlines, Eva Airways Corporation. (Stork, Anita) (Filed on 7/9/2014) Modified on 7/31/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2014 Filing 902 Joinder re #900 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Defendants Japan Airlines International Company, Ltd; Societe Air France; Vietnam Airlines Company, Ltd; Thai Airways International Publ by Vietnam Airlines. (Hawk, Robert) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
July 2, 2014 Filing 901 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara A. Slavin (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Slavin, Sara) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
June 25, 2014 Filing 900 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with Defendants Japan Airlines International Company, Ltd; Societe Air France; Vietnam Airlines Company, Ltd; Thai Airways International Public Company, Ltd; and Malaysian Airline Systems Berhad; and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 7/9/2014. Replies due by 7/16/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher L. Lebsock, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Proposed Order)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 23, 2014 Filing 899 DECLARATION of Frank Avent in Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment. Amended Declaration of Frank Avent in Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #869 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/23/2014) Modified on 6/24/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2014 Filing 898 DECLARATION of Michael Levine in Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment Amended Declaration of Michael Levine in Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #869 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 6/23/2014) Modified on 6/24/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2014 Filing 897 NOTICE by Larry Chen, Titi Tran of Withdrawal of Thomas K. Boardman as Counsel for Plaintiffs Larry Chen and Titi Tran (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
May 8, 2014 Filing 896 ERRATA re #873 Declaration in Support, #886 Declaration in Support, #888 Errata, Amended Errata to the Declaration of Jonathan Schwartz Regarding Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment Based on the Filed Rate Doctrine by All Plaintiffs. (Gassman, Seth) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 895 ORDER by Judge Charles R.Breyer granting #894 Stipulation Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 6-2 and 7-12 Regarding Deposition of Former Employee Following Fact Discovery Cut-Off (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 18, 2014 Filing 894 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 6-2 and 7-12 Regarding Deposition of Former Employee Following Fact Discovery Cut-Off filed by Micah Abrams. (Anderson, Jennie) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
April 17, 2014 Filing 893 Amended Request for International Judicial Assistance Regarding Taking Deposition of Huang Cheng Eng (Letter Rogatory). Motions terminated: #891 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Micah Abrams. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/17/14. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014).
April 17, 2014 Filing 892 Amended Request for International Judicial Assistance Regarding Taking Deposition of Ee Kim Lye (Letter Rogatory) re #891 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Micah Abrams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/17/14. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
April 17, 2014 Filing 891 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Micah Abrams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Letter Rogatory for Ee Kim Lye, #2 Proposed Amended Letter Rogatory for Huang Cheng Eng)(Anderson, Jennie) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 890 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu #889 Regarding Deposition of Osamu Shinobe.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 14, 2014 Filing 889 Proposed Order Letter Seeking Order Permitting the Deposition of ANA's Mr. Osamu Shinobe and [Proposed] Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 4/14/2014) Modified on 4/15/2014 (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2014 Filing 888 ERRATA re #873 Declaration in Support, #886 Declaration in Support, Errata to the Declaration of Jonathan Schwartz Regarding Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment Based on the Filed Rate Doctrine by All Plaintiffs. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
March 26, 2014 Filing 887 EXHIBITS re #871 Declaration in Support,, #880 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 2, 3, 4, 5, 8, 9 and 10 to the Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment - Previously Submitted Under Seal filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) #871 , #880 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 Filing 886 Declaration of Jonathan Schwartz in Support of #873 Declaration in Support, #880 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Jonathan Schwartz Regarding Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants Motions for Summary Judgment Based on the Filed Rate Doctrine - Previously Submitted Under Seal filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-34)(Related document(s) #873 , #880 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 Filing 885 RESPONSE (re #753 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #786 MOTION for Summary Judgment [NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION] OF DEFENDANT SINGAPORE AIRLINES LIMITED FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL CLAIMS IN THE SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF725 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #792 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #724 MOTION for Summary Judgment ANAs Motion for Summary Judgment Based On The Filed Rate Doctrine, #731 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #761 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Filed Rate Doctrine ) Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment - Previously Submitted Under Seal as Docket Number 869 filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 884 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re #881 , #882 , #883 Discovery Letter Briefs.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 883 Discovery Letter BriefANA Correcting Statement in ANA Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Deposition of Osamu Shinobe (Dkt. No. 882) filed by All Nippon Airways. (Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 882 Discovery Letter BriefANA Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Deposition of Osamu Shinobe filed by All Nippon Airways. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 21, 2014 Filing 881 Discovery Letter Briefre Motion to Compel Deposition of Osamu Shinobe filed by All Plaintiffs. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 880 Order by Hon. Charles R. Breyer denying #868 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 19, 2014 Filing 879 EXHIBITS re #874 Declaration in Opposition Exhibits to the Declaration of Frank Avent filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #874 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 878 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #877 Stipulation re Deposition Protocol.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
March 13, 2014 Filing 877 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Deposition Protocol filed by Singapore Airlines. (Bauer, Ashley) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 876 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re #868 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 875 Declaration of Elizabeth Tran in Support of #869 Opposition/Response to Motion,,, Declaration of Elizabeth Tran in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #869 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 874 DECLARATION of Frank Avent in Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #869 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/10/2014) Modified on 3/11/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2014 Filing 873 Declaration of Jonathan Schwartz in Support of #868 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #869 Opposition/Response to Motion,,, Declaration of Jonathan Schwartz Regarding Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment Based on Filed Rate Doctrine filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-34)(Related document(s) #868 , #869 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 872 DECLARATION of Michael E. Levine in Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #869 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/10/2014) Modified on 3/11/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2014 Filing 871 Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of #868 Administrative Motion to File Unde Seal, #869 Opposition/Response to Motion, Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Related document(s) #868 , #869 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 870 Request for Judicial Notice re #869 Opposition/Response to Motion,,, Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28)(Related document(s) #869 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 869 RESPONSE (re #763 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #753 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #786 MOTION for Summary Judgment [NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION] OF DEFENDANT SINGAPORE AIRLINES LIMITED FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL CLAIMS IN THE SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF725 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #792 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #724 MOTION for Summary Judgment ANAs Motion for Summary Judgment Based On The Filed Rate Doctrine, #731 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #868 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #761 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Filed Rate Doctrine ) Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 868 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven N. Williams, #2 Proposed Order Denying Administrative Motion, #3 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to Seal, #4 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment, #5 Unredacted Version ofPlaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment, #6 Redacted Version of Declaration of Jonathan Schwartz Regarding Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Based on the Filed Rate Doctrine, #7 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Jonathan Schwartz Regarding Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Based on the Filed Rate Doctrine, #8 Redacted Exhibits 1-34 to Declaration of Jonathan Schwartz Regarding Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Based on the Filed Rate Doctrine, #9 Unredacted Exhibits 1-34 to Declaration of Jonathan Schwartz Regarding Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Based on the Filed Rate Doctrine, #10 Redacted Version of Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #12 Redacted Version of Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #14 Redacted Version of Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #16 Redacted Version of Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #18 Redacted Version of Exhibit 8 to the Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8 to the Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #20 Redacted Version of Exhibit 9 to the Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #21 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9 to the Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #22 Redacted Version of Exhibit 10 to the Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #23 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10 to the Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 867 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu Granting #816 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Deposition.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 866 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #865 Stipulation regarding briefing limits (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 865 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING LIMITS filed by Singapore Airlines. (Bauer, Ashley) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 864 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re #806 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 863 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 13, 2014, before Judge Donna M. Ryu. Transcriber Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/22/2014. (Related documents(s) #858 , #857 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 858 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by All Nippon Airways for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 857 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by All Plaintiffs for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 13, 2014 Filing 862 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing HELD on 2/13/2014 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re #820 Joint Discovery Letter Brieffrom Plaintiffs and Philippine Airlines, Inc. filed by Donald Wortman, #819 Joint Discovery Letter Brief with Plaintiffs and EVA Airways Corporation filed by Donald Wortman, #856 Supplemental Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Docket No. 820 filed by Philippine Airlines, Inc. Motion to compel further responses granted. See minutes for particulars. (FTR Recording 4:40-4:49.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/13/2014)
February 13, 2014 Filing 861 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing HELD on 2/13/2014 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re #816 Joint Discovery Letter Briefre deposition of Osamu Shinobe filed by Donald Wortman. Motion granted. Written Order to be issued by the Court. (FTR Recording 4:17-4:40.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/13/2014)
February 13, 2014 Filing 860 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing HELD on 2/13/2014 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re #806 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by China Airlines. Motion taken under submission. Written Order to be issued by the Court. (FTR Recording 3:44-4:17.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/13/2014)
February 13, 2014 Filing 859 PLEASE DISREGARD ENTRY NO. 859 AND GO TO ENTRY NO. 860 INSTEAD, DUE TO PLAINTIFFS' ATTORNEYS NAMES NOT PROPERLY ALIGNED ON THE MINUTES Minute Entry: Motion Hearing HELD on 2/13/2014 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re #806 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by China Airlines. Motion taken under submission. Written order to be issued by the Court. (Recording 3:44-4:17.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/13/2014) Modified on 2/18/2014 (ig, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2014 Filing 856 Supplemental Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Docket No. 820 filed by Philippine Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Lannin, Cortlin) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 855 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #847 Stipulation Re: Time to Bring Motions to Compel between Plaintiffs and Defendant Eva Airways Corp. See Order for all particulars. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 854 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #846 Stipulation and Order Re: Time to Bring Motions to Compel between Plaintiffs and Defendant Singaport Airlines, Ltd. See Order for all particulars. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 853 STIPULATION AND ORDER Re: Time to Bring Motions to Compel between Plaintiffs and Defendant Cathay Pacific Airways, Ltd. re #843 Proposed Order, filed by All Plaintiffs. See Order for all particulars. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/5/14. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 852 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Named Plaintiff Franklin Ajaye by All Plaintiffs (Tran, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
January 31, 2014 Filing 851 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig C. Corbitt (Corbitt, Craig) (Filed on 1/31/2014)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 850 ORDER granting notice of attorney withdrawal ( B A Nigro, Jr. and J D Roth). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/29/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 849 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #842 Stipulation re deposition following fact discovery cut-off (J Pignataro, SIA) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 848 ORDER re #840 Stipulation re Plaintiffs' Response to Summary Judgment Motions and Hearing DateProposed Order filed by All Plaintiffs. Hearing currently set for SJ motions on 4/18/2014 vacated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/29/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 29, 2014 Filing 847 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Time to Bring Motions to Compel Between Plaintiffs and Defendant EVA Airways Corporation filed by Eva Airways. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tammy A. Tsoumas)(Tsoumas, Tammy) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 29, 2014 Filing 846 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING TIME TO BRING MOTION TO COMPEL BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT SINGAPORE AIRLINES LIMITED filed by Singapore Airlines. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Bauer, Ashley) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 29, 2014 Filing 845 Minute Entry: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 1/29/2014 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu (Date Filed: 1/29/2014). (Court Reporter Not recorded.) (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/29/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 844 NOTICE by United Airlines Request by Edward D. Johnson to be Removed from Service and Notice Lists (Johnson, Edward) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 843 Proposed Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Time to Bring Motions to Compel Between Plaintiffs and Defendant Cathay Pacific Airways, Ltd. by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steve Williams)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 842 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 6-2 AND 7-12 REGARDING DEPOSITIONS FOLLOWING FACT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF filed by Singapore Airlines. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Bauer, Ashley) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 841 ORDER re #840 , Continuing Hearing on Discovery Letter Briefs #806 , #816 , #819 , #820 . Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2014 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/27/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 840 Proposed Order re #821 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Plaintiffs' Response to Summary Judgment Motions and Hearing Date by All Plaintiffs. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 839 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #830 Stipulation regarding withdrawl of Thai Airways' motion for summary judgment on filed rate issues (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 838 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #829 Stipulation regarding depositions following fact discovery cut-off (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 24, 2014 Filing 837 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Jeffrey Faria (Faria, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 836 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #825 Stipulation regarding depositions following fact discovery cut-off (Revilla, Vinas, Sotocinal, Trespeses and PAL) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 835 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #823 Stipulation regarding depositions following fact discovery cut-off (Yoo, Foged, Gilmore, Higashi and Sykes) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 834 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #826 Stipulation regarding depositions following fact discovery cutoff (Manning, Ueba, Cheng, Lo) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 833 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #827 Stipulation regarding depositions following fact discovery cutoff (Eugene Lee & Mrs. Ryujin) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 832 ORDER re #822 Stipulation filed by Singapore Airlines (Oshima). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/22/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 831 ORDER re #822 Stipulation filed by Singapore Airlines (Okamoto). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/22/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 830 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER ("Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Withdrawal of Thai Airways' Motion for Summary Judgment on Filed Rate Issues") filed by Thai Airways. (Wilson, Rowan) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 829 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 6-2 and 7-12 Regarding Depositions Following Fact Discovery Cut-Off filed by All Nippon Airways. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ankur Kapoor, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 828 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #817 Stipulation regarding depositions following fact discovery cut-off (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 827 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 6-2 and 7-12 Regarding Depositions Following Fact Discovery Cut-Off filed by China Airlines. (Meckes, Joseph) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 17, 2014 Filing 826 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 6-2 and 7-12 Regarding Depositions Following Fact Discovery Cut-Off filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick B. Clayton)(Corbitt, Craig) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
January 17, 2014 Filing 825 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 6-2 and 7-12 Regarding Depositions Following Fact Discovery Cut-off filed by Philippine Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cortlin Lannin in Support of the Stipulation Regarding Depositions Following Fact Discovery Cut-off)(Stork, Anita) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
January 17, 2014 Filing 824 Declaration of Michael J. Holland in Support of #823 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 6-2 and 7-12 Regarding Depositions Following Fact Discovery Cut-Off filed byAir New Zealand. (Related document(s) #823 ) (Holland, Michael) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
January 17, 2014 Filing 823 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 6-2 and 7-12 Regarding Depositions Following Fact Discovery Cut-Off filed by Air New Zealand. (Holland, Michael) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
January 16, 2014 Filing 822 STIPULATION REGARDING DEPOSITIONS OF TOSHIAKI OSHIMA AND KAZUHISA OKAMOTO filed by Singapore Airlines. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Okamoto), #2 Proposed Order (Oshima))(Bauer, Ashley) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 821 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motions #806 Joint Discovery Letter Brief, #816 Joint Discovery Letter Briefre deposition of Osamu Shinobe, #820 Joint Discovery Letter Brieffrom Plaintiffs and Philippine Airlines, Inc., #819 Joint Discovery Letter Brief with Plaintiffs and EVA Airways Corporation : Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2014 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/16/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 15, 2014 Filing 820 Joint Discovery Letter Brieffrom Plaintiffs and Philippine Airlines, Inc. filed by Donald Wortman. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 15, 2014 Filing 819 Joint Discovery Letter Brief with Plaintiffs and EVA Airways Corporation filed by Donald Wortman. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 15, 2014 Filing 818 Declaration of Jason Kelly in Support of #817 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Pursuant to Local Rule 6-2 and 7-12 Regarding Depositions Following Fact Discovery Cut-Off filed byEva Airways. (Related document(s) #817 ) (Tsoumas, Tammy) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 15, 2014 Filing 817 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Pursuant to Local Rule 6-2 and 7-12 Regarding Depositions Following Fact Discovery Cut-Off filed by Eva Airways. (Tsoumas, Tammy) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 14, 2014 Filing 816 Joint Discovery Letter Briefre deposition of Osamu Shinobe filed by Donald Wortman. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 815 ORDER granting #795 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Christopher D. Jennings filed by All Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/10/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 814 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #810 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Ishai Mooreville) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 10, 2014 Filing 813 NOTICE of Appearance by Rahul Kaustubh Kolhatkar on behalf of Defendant Singapore Airlines Limited (Kolhatkar, Rahul) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 7, 2014 Filing 812 CLERKS NOTICE Resetting Hearing as to #761 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Filed Rate Doctrine, #753 MOTION for Summary Judgment (text entry only, no doucment associated with this entry). Motion Hearing reset for 4/18/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 811 ORDER Setting Hearing on #806 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2014 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/06/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 2, 2014 Filing 810 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8266490.) filed by Qantas Airways, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Mooreville, Ishai) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 809 ORDER GRANTING #807 Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White for Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/30/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 808 ORDER GRANTING #807 Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White for Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/30/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 27, 2013 Filing 807 Discovery Letter Brief filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Andreoli, Dana) (Filed on 12/27/2013)
December 23, 2013 Filing 806 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by China Airlines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Meckes, Joseph) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 805 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #796 Request for International Judicial Assistance regarding taking Deposition of Chan Seck Fun (Letter Rogatory). Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/23/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 804 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #796 Request for International Judicial Assistance regarding taking Deposition of Huang Cheng Eng (Letter Rogatory). Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/23/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2013) .
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 803 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #796 Request for International Judicial Assistance regarding taking Deposition of Ee Kim Lye (Letter Rogatory) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 802 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thai Airways re #801 Declaration in Support, #800 Declaration in Support, (Wilson, Rowan) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 801 Declaration of Rowan Wilson in Support of #788 MOTION for Summary Judgment ("Defendant Thai Airways International Public Company Limited's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment Based on the Filed Rate Doctrine") filed byThai Airways. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Wilson Declaration)(Related document(s) #788 ) (Wilson, Rowan) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 800 Declaration of Viroj Sirihorachai in Support of #788 MOTION for Summary Judgment ("Defendant Thai Airways International Public Company Limited's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment Based on the Filed Rate Doctrine") (Amended) filed byThai Airways. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Amended Sirihorachai Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Amended Sirihorachai Declaration)(Related document(s) #788 ) (Wilson, Rowan) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 799 ORDER re #796 Discovery Letter Brief. Any opposition to Plaintiffs' request for letters rogatory due by 10:00 a.m. on 12/23/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/20/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 798 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re #756 , #757 , #758 , #774 Discovery Letter Briefs.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 797 Discovery Letter Brief to Judge Donna M. Ryu Regarding Location for Taking of Air New Zealand Witness Depositions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 796 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Rachel Diller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Letter Rogatory for Ee Kim Lye, #2 Proposed Letter Rogatory for Huang Cheng Eng, #3 Proposed Letter Rogatory for Chan Seck Fun)(Andreoli, Dana) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 795 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Christopher D. Jennings filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 1/3/2014. Replies due by 1/10/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Poynter, Scott) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 19, 2013 Filing 794 Letter from Philippine Airlines, Inc. to Magistrate Judge Ryu. (Stork, Anita) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 19, 2013 Filing 793 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 12/18/2013 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu (Date Filed: 12/19/2013). See minutes for particulars. (Recording #FTR 2:41-3:16.) (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/19/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 792 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Eva Airways. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 12/31/2013. Replies due by 1/7/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 (Declaration of Tina Kuo), #5 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Tina Kuo, #6 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Tina Kuo, #7 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Tina Kuo, #8 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Tina Kuo, #9 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Tina Kuo, #10 Proposed Order)(Tsoumas, Tammy) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 791 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thai Airways re #788 MOTION for Summary Judgment ("Defendant Thai Airways International Public Company Limited's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment Based on the Filed Rate Doctrine"), #790 Declaration in Support, #789 Declaration in Support, (Wilson, Rowan) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 790 Declaration of Rowan Wilson in Support of #788 MOTION for Summary Judgment ("Defendant Thai Airways International Public Company Limited's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment Based on the Filed Rate Doctrine") filed byThai Airways. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Wilson Declaration)(Related document(s) #788 ) (Wilson, Rowan) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 789 Declaration of Viroj Sirihorachai in Support of #788 MOTION for Summary Judgment ("Defendant Thai Airways International Public Company Limited's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment Based on the Filed Rate Doctrine") filed byThai Airways. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Sirihorachai Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Sirihorachai Declaration)(Related document(s) #788 ) (Wilson, Rowan) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 788 MOTION for Summary Judgment ("Defendant Thai Airways International Public Company Limited's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment Based on the Filed Rate Doctrine") filed by Thai Airways. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 12/31/2013. Replies due by 1/7/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wilson, Rowan) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 787 Declaration of JUDY KU LEUNG in Support of #786 MOTION for Summary Judgment [NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION] OF DEFENDANT SINGAPORE AIRLINES LIMITED FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL CLAIMS IN THE SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF< filed bySingapore Airlines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit a, #6 Exhibit 5b)(Related document(s) #786 ) (Bauer, Ashley) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 786 MOTION for Summary Judgment [NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION] OF DEFENDANT SINGAPORE AIRLINES LIMITED FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL CLAIMS IN THE SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Singapore Airlines. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 12/31/2013. Replies due by 1/7/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bauer, Ashley) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 785 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #781 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (S Bojedla) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 784 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #783 Motion to Appear by Telephone.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 16, 2013 Filing 783 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Cathay Pacific Airways. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Cairo, Deana) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 Filing 782 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Anthony Meckes (Meckes, Joseph) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 13, 2013 Filing 781 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8223396.) Filing fee previously paid on 12/11/2013 filed by All Plaintiffs, Rachel Diller. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 780 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #762 Stipulation Regarding Certain Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 779 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #754 Stipulation ORDER REGARDING SETTLING DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO CLASS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 778 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #750 Stipulation REGARDING SETTLING DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO CLASS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
December 11, 2013 Filing 777 CLERKS NOTICE: A hearing on #774 Supplemental Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Location for Taking of Air New Zealand Witness Depositions is set for 12/18/2013 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY DOCKET ENTRY. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013) Modified on 12/12/2013 (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2013 Filing 776 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8223396.) filed by All Plaintiffs, Rachel Diller. (Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
December 11, 2013 Filing 775 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert B. Hawk (Hawk, Robert) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
December 10, 2013 Filing 774 Supplemental Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Location for Taking of Air New Zealand Witness Depositions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Gassman, Seth) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 773 ORDER: Set/Reset Hearing as to #756 Joint Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Location for Taking of Air New Zealand Witness Depositions, #758 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Location for Taking of Philippine Airlines, Inc. Witness Depositions, #757 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Location for Taking of China Airlines Witness Depositions. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2013 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/10/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
December 9, 2013 Filing 772 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byEva Airways. (Tsoumas, Tammy) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 771 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #755 Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant Societe Air France to Answer Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 9, 2013 Filing 770 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Continental Airlines Inc., Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V., and SAS AB by All Plaintiffs (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 9, 2013 Filing 769 Qantas Airways Limited's ANSWER to Amended Complaint byQantas Airways, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Shaw, Kimberly) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 9, 2013 Filing 768 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byAll Nippon Airways. (Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 9, 2013 Filing 767 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Singapore Airlines Limited's Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consoliated Class Action Complaint bySingapore Airlines. (Bauer, Ashley) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 9, 2013 Filing 766 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Lori Sambol Brody (Brody, Lori) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 9, 2013 Filing 765 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byPhilippine Airlines, Inc.. (Stork, Anita) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 6, 2013 Filing 764 Declaration of Cortlin H. Lannin in Support of #763 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byPhilippine Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #763 ) (Stork, Anita) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 6, 2013 Filing 763 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Philippine Airlines, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 2/18/2014. Replies due by 4/4/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Anna Mae Lynn Ang, #2 Proposed Order)(Stork, Anita) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 6, 2013 Filing 762 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Certain Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Cathay Pacific Airways. (Cairo, Deana) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 6, 2013 Filing 761 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Filed Rate Doctrine filed by Qantas Airways, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 12/20/2013. Replies due by 12/27/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 (Declaration of Carolina Day), #4 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Carolina Day, #5 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Carolina Day, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service, #7 Proposed Order)(Miller, W.) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 6, 2013 Filing 760 NOTICE of Appearance by Ankur Kapoor for Leigh B. Orliner (Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 6, 2013 Filing 759 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byAir New Zealand. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Holland, Michael) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 5, 2013 Filing 758 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Location for Taking of Philippine Airlines, Inc. Witness Depositions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Gassman, Seth) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 5, 2013 Filing 757 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Location for Taking of China Airlines Witness Depositions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Gassman, Seth) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 5, 2013 Filing 756 Joint Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Location for Taking of Air New Zealand Witness Depositions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Gassman, Seth) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 5, 2013 Filing 755 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Defendant Societe Air France to Answer Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Air France. (Warnot, James) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 5, 2013 Filing 754 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING SETTLING DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO CLASS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 5, 2013 Filing 753 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Air New Zealand. Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 12/26/2013. Replies due by 1/2/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robyn Brown, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Robyn Brown, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Holland, Michael) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 5, 2013 Filing 752 Declaration of Rowan D. Wilson in Support of #751 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER ("Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Briefing Schedule for Thai Airways' Motion for Summary Judgment re: File Rate Issues") filed byThai Airways. (Related document(s) #751 ) (Wilson, Rowan) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 5, 2013 Filing 751 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER ("Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Briefing Schedule for Thai Airways' Motion for Summary Judgment re: File Rate Issues") filed by Thai Airways. (Wilson, Rowan) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 5, 2013 Filing 750 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING SETTLING DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO CLASS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs. (Gassman, Seth) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 5, 2013 Filing 749 NOTICE of Appearance by Deana Louise Cairo for Robin A. Williams (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Cairo, Deana) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 748 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #745 Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule for EVA Airways Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment Re: Filed Rate Issues (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 747 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #743 Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule for Singapore Airlines Limited's Motion for Summary Judgment Re: Filed Rate Issues (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
December 3, 2013 Filing 746 Declaration of Tammy A. Tsoumas in Support of #745 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for EVA Airways Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment Re: Filed Rate Issues filed byEva Airways. (Related document(s) #745 ) (Tsoumas, Tammy) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
December 3, 2013 Filing 745 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for EVA Airways Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment Re: Filed Rate Issues filed by Eva Airways. (Tsoumas, Tammy) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
November 27, 2013 Filing 744 Declaration of Ashley M. Bauer in Support of #743 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for Singapore Airlines Limited's Motoin for Summary Judgment Re: Filed Rate Issues filed bySingapore Airlines. (Related document(s) #743 ) (Bauer, Ashley) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 27, 2013 Filing 743 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for Singapore Airlines Limited's Motion for Summary Judgment Re: Filed Rate Issues filed by Singapore Airlines. (Bauer, Ashley) (Filed on 11/27/2013) Modified on 11/27/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2013 Filing 742 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/22/2013 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 11/22/2013) re #735 MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Substitute Plaintiffs and for Leave to Amend First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. ***granted #735 MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Substitute Plaintiffs and for Leave to Amend First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/22/2013)
November 22, 2013 Filing 741 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint against Air France, Air New Zealand, All Nippon Airways, Cathay Pacific Airways, China Airlines, Continental Airlines, Inc., Eva Airways, Japan Airlines International, KLM Royal Dutch Airline, Malaysian Airline System Berhad, Philippine Airlines, Inc., Qantas Airways, Ltd., SAS AB, Singapore Airlines, Thai Airways, Vietnam Airlines. Filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 12, 2013 Filing 740 NOTICE of Appearance by Deana Louise Cairo for F. Martin Dajani (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Cairo, Deana) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 5, 2013 Filing 739 REPLY (re #735 MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Substitute Plaintiffs and for Leave to Amend First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) filed byDonald Wortman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Zapala)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 738 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #737 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 Filing 737 Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Taking of Deposition of Isao Ono at The United States Consulate in Osaka, Japan filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
October 29, 2013 Filing 736 RESPONSE (re #735 MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Substitute Plaintiffs and for Leave to Amend First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) filed byAir New Zealand, All Nippon Airways, Cathay Pacific Airways, China Airlines, Eva Airways, Philippine Airlines, Inc., Qantas Airways, Ltd., Singapore Airlines, Thai Airways. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Cortlin H. Lannin, #2 Proposed Order)(Stork, Anita) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
October 15, 2013 Filing 735 MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Substitute Plaintiffs and for Leave to Amend First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 11/22/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 10/29/2013. Replies due by 11/5/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven N. Williams, #2 Proposed Order)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 734 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #732 Stipulation setting briefing schedule (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 4, 2013 Filing 733 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jesse William Markham (Markham, Jesse) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
September 24, 2013 Filing 732 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for Defendants Summary Judgment Motions Based on the Filed Rate Doctrine and Modifying the Schedule for Briefing on Class Certification filed by Qantas Airways, Ltd.. (Miller, W.) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 10, 2013 Filing 731 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by China Airlines. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 9/24/2013. Replies due by 10/1/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hsiao Sui Wu, #2 Declaration of Peter C. Alfano)(Dick, James) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 10, 2013 Filing 730 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs, Rachel Diller NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM AFFILIATION (Gassman, Seth) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 10, 2013 Filing 729 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cathay Pacific Airways re #727 Request for Judicial Notice, #726 Declaration in Support, #725 MOTION for Summary Judgment #728 Certain Defendants' Joint Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Bamberger, David) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 10, 2013 Filing 728 Certain Defendants' JOINT MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of #725 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Cathay Pacific Airways. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joanna Bryant)(Bamberger, David) (Filed on 9/10/2013) Modified on 9/10/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2013 Filing 727 Request for Judicial Notice re #725 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCathay Pacific Airways. (Related document(s) #725 ) (Bamberger, David) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 10, 2013 Filing 726 Declaration of Deana L. Cairo in Support of #725 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCathay Pacific Airways. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-F)(Related document(s) #725 ) (Bamberger, David) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 10, 2013 Filing 725 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cathay Pacific Airways. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 9/24/2013. Replies due by 10/1/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Fanny Chan, #2 Declaration of Yan Man Chi Shirley, #3 Proposed Order)(Bamberger, David) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 10, 2013 Filing 724 MOTION for Summary Judgment ANAs Motion for Summary Judgment Based On The Filed Rate Doctrine filed by All Nippon Airways. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 9/24/2013. Replies due by 10/1/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Yusaku Osumi In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A-B to Declaration of Yusaku Osumi, #3 Declaration of Isao Ono In Support of Motion, #4 Exhibit A-C to Declaration of Isao Ono, #5 Declaration of Ami Keriyone In Support of Motion, #6 Declaration of Mina Ko In Support of Motion, #7 Exhibit A-E to Declaration of Mina Ko, #8 Declaration of Suzuko Shibata In Support of Motion, #9 Exhibit A-B to Declaration of Suzuko Shibata, #10 Declaration of Joanna C. Bryant In Support of Motion, #11 Exhibit 1-6 to Declaration of Joanna C. Bryant, #12 Proposed Order, #13 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Malone, Gary) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 6, 2013 Filing 723 Supplemental Brief re #717 Opposition/Response to Motion PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND THE BRIEFING AND DISCOVERY SCHEDULE filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #717 ) (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 722 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #718 Ex Parte Application (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
September 4, 2013 Filing 721 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Yuegin Kelly (Kelly, Jason) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 720 Order by Hon. Charles R. Breyer on #715 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Extend Briefing and Discovery Schedule. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 719 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #716 Stipulation extending time to respond (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
August 21, 2013 Filing 718 Ex Parte Application re #715 MOTION TO EXTEND BRIEFING AND DISCOVERY SCHEDULE PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND BRIEFING AND DISCOVERY SCHEDULE filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
August 20, 2013 Filing 717 RESPONSE (re #715 MOTION TO EXTEND BRIEFING AND DISCOVERY SCHEDULE PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND BRIEFING AND DISCOVERY SCHEDULE ) filed byAir New Zealand. (Holland, Michael) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
August 15, 2013 Filing 716 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #715 MOTION TO EXTEND BRIEFING AND DISCOVERY SCHEDULE PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND BRIEFING AND DISCOVERY SCHEDULE filed by Air New Zealand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holland, Michael) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 9, 2013 Filing 715 MOTION TO EXTEND BRIEFING AND DISCOVERY SCHEDULE PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND BRIEFING AND DISCOVERY SCHEDULE filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 8/23/2013. Replies due by 8/30/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion, #2 Declaration of Christopher L. Lebsock In Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit A-B to Declaration of Christopher L. Lebsock, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
July 25, 2013 Filing 714 NOTICE of Change of Address by Scott E. Poynter Emerson Poynter - Little Rock (Attachments: #1 Declaration C.O.S.)(Poynter, Scott) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
July 15, 2013 Filing 713 STIPULATION Re Voluntary Dismissal of Continental Airlines, Inc. filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Snyder, Richard) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 712 ORDER Vacating July 11, 2013 Discovery Hearing, Motions terminated: #701 Discovery Letter BriefJoint Letter on Outstanding Discovery Issues filed by Donald Wortman, #700 Joint Discovery Letter Brief on Discovery Disputes (Vietnam Airlines' Requests for Admission to Plaintiffs) filed by Vietnam Airlines, #699 Joint Discovery Letter Brief on Disputes (Vietnam Airlines' Interrogatories to Plaintiffs) filed by Vietnam Airlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/03/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
July 2, 2013 Filing 711 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report to the Court re Pending Discovery Disputes with Vietnam Airlines by Donald Wortman. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
May 23, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #701 Discovery Letter BriefJoint Letter on Outstanding Discovery Issues, #699 Joint Discovery Letter Brief on Disputes (Vietnam Airlines' Interrogatories to Plaintiffs), #700 Joint Discovery Letter Brief on Discovery Disputes (Vietnam Airlines' Requests for Admission to Plaintiffs). Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 710 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu dated 5/23/13 granting #709 Stipulation to Continue the 5/30/2013 11:00 AM Hearing on Motions to Compel filed by Plaintiffs and Vietnam Airlines Co. Ltd. to 7/11/2013 11:00 AM (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 21, 2013 Filing 709 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order continuing May 30, 2013 hearing on Motions to Compel file by Plaintiffs and Vietnam Airlines Company Limited filed by Vietnam Airlines. (Hawk, Robert) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
April 24, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 24, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #701 Discovery Letter BriefJoint Letter on Outstanding Discovery Issues, #699 Joint Discovery Letter Brief on Disputes (Vietnam Airlines' Interrogatories to Plaintiffs), #700 Joint Discovery Letter Brief on Discovery Disputes (Vietnam Airlines' Requests for Admission to Plaintiffs). Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 24, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery Hearing set for 5/30/2013 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 708 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #707 Stipulation Continuing May 2, 2013 Hearing. Hearing continued to 5/30/2013 at 11:00 a.m. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 24, 2013 Filing 707 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING MAY 2, 2013 HEARING ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL FILED BY PLAINTIFFS AND VIETNAM AIRLINES COMPANY LIMITED filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 706 ORDER to File Supplemental Brief Regarding #701 Discovery Letter BriefJoint Letter on Outstanding Discovery Issues filed by Donald Wortman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/24/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 705 ORDER to File Status Report re #700 Joint Discovery Letter Brief on Discovery Disputes (Vietnam Airlines' Requests for Admission to Plaintiffs) filed by Vietnam Airlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/23/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
March 27, 2013 Filing 704 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Vietnam Airlines for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Hawk, Robert) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 22, 2013 Filing 703 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 14, 2013, before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/20/2013. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 702 ORDER Setting Hearing on #701 Discovery Letter BriefJoint Letter on Outstanding Discovery Issues, #699 Joint Discovery Letter Brief on Disputes (Vietnam Airlines' Interrogatories to Plaintiffs), #700 Joint Discovery Letter Brief on Discovery Disputes (Vietnam Airlines' Requests for Admission to Plaintiffs) : Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/20/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 15, 2013 Filing 701 Discovery Letter BriefJoint Letter on Outstanding Discovery Issues filed by Donald Wortman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
March 15, 2013 Filing 700 Joint Discovery Letter Brief on Discovery Disputes (Vietnam Airlines' Requests for Admission to Plaintiffs) filed by Vietnam Airlines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hawk, Robert) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
March 15, 2013 Filing 699 Joint Discovery Letter Brief on Disputes (Vietnam Airlines' Interrogatories to Plaintiffs) filed by Vietnam Airlines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hawk, Robert) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
March 13, 2013 Filing 698 NOTICE of Appearance by Janice Seyoung Yi (Yi, Janice) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
March 13, 2013 Filing 697 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina H Sharp (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
March 13, 2013 Filing 696 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C. Girard (Girard, Daniel) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 695 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #694 Stipulation (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
February 27, 2013 Filing 694 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Non-Jury Trial filed by Air New Zealand. (Holland, Michael) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 21, 2013 Filing 693 STATUS REPORT Status Update Regarding Interim Discovery Deadlines by Donald Wortman. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
February 19, 2013 Filing 692 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 2/14/2013 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu (Date Filed: 2/19/2013). (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/19/2013)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 691 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DEPOSITION LIMITS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/14/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 690 AMENDED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #688 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/14/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 689 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. SEE #690 *** Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #688 Motion to Appear by Telephone.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013) Modified on 2/15/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2013 Filing 688 Joint MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Qantas Airways, Ltd.. (Miller, W.) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 687 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #684 Stipulation re Interim Discovery Deadlines.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
February 5, 2013 Filing 686 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian P. Murray (Murray, Brian) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
February 5, 2013 Filing 685 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lee Albert (Albert, Lee) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
January 31, 2013 Filing 684 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #679 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Interim Discovery Deadlines filed by Donald Wortman. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 683 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #682 Stipulation re Interim Discovery Deadlines.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 22, 2013 Filing 682 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #679 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Interim Discovery Deadlines filed by Donald Wortman. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
January 22, 2013 Filing 681 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Heather Kent for Plaintiff Andrew Barton (Kent, Amanda) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
January 22, 2013 Filing 680 NOTICE of Appearance by Neyleen Sara Beljajev for Plaintiff Andrew Barton (Beljajev, Neyleen) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 679 ORDER Regarding Discovery Disputes, Setting Hearing on Motion #675 Discovery Letter Brief re Interim Discovery Deadlines, #668 Joint Discovery Letter Brief : Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/17/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
January 15, 2013 Filing 678 Discovery Letter Briefre: Plaintiffs' Letter Regarding Joint Letter Brief on Interim Discovery Deadlines filed by Cathay Pacific Airways. (Cairo, Deana) (Filed on 1/15/2013)
January 15, 2013 Filing 677 NOTICE by Eva Airways NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Wang, Nien-Ping) (Filed on 1/15/2013)
January 14, 2013 Filing 676 Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Portion of Joint Letter on Interim Discovery Deadlines filed by Donald Wortman. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
January 11, 2013 Filing 675 Discovery Letter Briefre Interim Discovery Deadlines filed by Donald Wortman. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
January 11, 2013 Filing 674 Discovery Letter Briefre ANA Preservation and Search Meet and Confer filed by Donald Wortman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 673 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re December 28, 2012 and December 31, 2012 Discovery Letters #671 , #672 , Denying #670 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013) Modified on 1/3/2013 (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/3/2013 (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF).
December 31, 2012 Filing 672 Letter Brief re #671 Discovery Letter Brief filed byAll Nippon Airways. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #671 ) (Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 12/31/2012)
December 31, 2012 Filing 671 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Donald Wortman. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 12/31/2012)
December 28, 2012 Filing 670 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Administrative Motion for Sealing Order Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(d) filed by Donald Wortman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 12/28/2012)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 669 ORDER re #668 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Donald Wortman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/27/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
December 14, 2012 Filing 668 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Donald Wortman. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
December 5, 2012 Filing 667 NOTICE of Change of Address by Reiko Hirai (Nast, Dianne) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 666 ORDER granting #663 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V. filed by All Plaintiffs, Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V. terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/3/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 665 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #664 Stipulation (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2012)
November 27, 2012 Filing 664 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE CLASS CERTIFICATION AND DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Singapore Airlines. (Sherman, William) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
November 16, 2012 Filing 663 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
November 6, 2012 Filing 662 NOTICE by Rachel Diller NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL JON T. KING (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
September 20, 2012 Filing 661 NOTICE by Eva Airways NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Casamassima, Christopher) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 660 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu Regarding #658 August 28, 2012 Joint Discovery Letter.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
September 11, 2012 Filing 659 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Caroline Joy (Emblidge, G.) (Filed on 9/11/2012)
August 28, 2012 Filing 658 Joint Discovery Letter Briefto Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 657 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO SUBMIT JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/24/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
August 23, 2012 Filing 656 Letter to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 655 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu ruling on #642 Discovery Letter Brief. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
August 13, 2012 Filing 654 Transcript of Proceedings held on August 9, 2012, before Judge Donna M. Ryu. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number (510)451-7530, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 9/4/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2012. (rhm, ) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 9, 2012 Filing 653 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/9/2012 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu (Date Filed: 8/9/2012) re #642 Joint Discovery Letter Briefto Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu filed by All Plaintiffs. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/9/2012)
July 9, 2012 Filing 652 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert B. Hawk (Hawk, Robert) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 651 ORDER re #649 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Hearing Date filed by Philippine Airlines, Inc., Motions terminated: #649 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Hearing Date filed by Philippine Airlines, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2012 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/22/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 22, 2012 Filing 650 Declaration of Anita F. Stork in Support of #649 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Hearing Date filed byPhilippine Airlines, Inc.. (Related document(s) #649 ) (Stork, Anita) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 22, 2012 Filing 649 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Hearing Date filed by Philippine Airlines, Inc.. (Stork, Anita) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
May 31, 2012 Filing 648 NOTICE of Appearance by Kavita B Ramakrishnan for Defendant Thai Airways International Public Company Limited (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Ramakrishnan, Kavita) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
May 30, 2012 Filing 647 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Sutton Snyder of Craig Minerva (Snyder, Richard) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
May 29, 2012 Filing 646 NOTICE by Philippine Airlines, Inc. re #643 Order, Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, PAL's Filing of Documents (Attachments: #1 Declaration Clara De Castro)(Stork, Anita) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 29, 2012 Filing 645 EXHIBITS re #642 Joint Discovery Letter Briefto Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu, #643 Order, Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, Plaintiffs' Submission Pursuant to the Court's May 22, 2012 Order filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #642 , #643 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 23, 2012 Filing 644 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Lori Sambol Brody . (Brody, Lori) (Filed on 5/23/2012) Modified on 5/24/2012 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 643 ORDER Requiring Supporting Documentation and Setting Hearing on #642 Joint Discovery Letter Brief : Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/22/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
May 18, 2012 Filing 642 Joint Discovery Letter Briefto Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 641 ORDER re #640 Joint Letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/18/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
May 17, 2012 Filing 640 Letter from Plaintiffs and Defendant Philippine Airlines, Inc. to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
May 17, 2012 Filing 639 NOTICE of Appearance by Cortlin Hall Lannin for Defendant Philippine Airlines, Inc. (Lannin, Cortlin) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 638 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #633 Stipulation re Motion for Class Certification (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
March 9, 2012 Filing 637 NOTICE of Appearance by Bernard Angelo Nigro, Jr (Nigro, Bernard) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
March 9, 2012 Filing 636 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas H. Flaum (Flaum, Douglas) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
March 9, 2012 Filing 635 NOTICE of Appearance by Shahzeb Lari (Lari, Shahzeb) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
March 9, 2012 Filing 634 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Daniel Roth (Roth, Joshua) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
March 9, 2012 Filing 633 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by All Plaintiffs. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
March 1, 2012 Filing 632 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Anita Fern Stork, Esq (Stork, Anita) (Filed on 3/1/2012)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ORDER RE Production of Air Cargo Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/14/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 630 ORDER RE PROTOCOL FOR REVIEW AND SELECTION PROCEDURE FOR AIR CARGO DOCUMENTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/14/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
February 13, 2012 Filing 629 Letter from All Parties to Hon. Judge Donna M. Ryu regarding the Court's Tentative Ruling and Proposed Order (Dkt. Nos. 627, 627-1). (Bauer, Ashley) (Filed on 2/13/2012)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 628 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #626 Stipulation, Regarding the Production of Electronically Stored Information.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2012)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 627 ORDER Re Parties' Submissions Re Protocol for Review and Selection Procedure for Air Cargo Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/06/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2012)
February 1, 2012 Filing 626 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #625 Letter Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding the Production of Electronically Stored Information filed by All Plaintiffs. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/1/2012)
February 1, 2012 Filing 625 Letter from Steven N. Williams . (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/1/2012)
January 26, 2012 Filing 624 Letter from All Parties Joint Letter re Proposed Orders. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Proposed Order, #2 Defendants' Proposed Order)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 1/26/2012)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 623 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #622 Stipulation on the timing for filing a joint submission regarding a procedure for discovery of Air Cargo materials.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2012)
January 19, 2012 Filing 622 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [JOINT] ON THE TIMING FOR FILING OF A JOINT SUBMISSION REGARDING A PROCEDURE FOR DISCOVERY OF AIR CARGO MATERIALS filed by Singapore Airlines. (Bauer, Ashley) (Filed on 1/19/2012)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 621 ORDER re Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #610 #601 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/18/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
January 12, 2012 Filing 620 CORRECTION OF DOCKET #619 . Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 1/12/2012 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu (Date Filed: 1/12/2012). Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #601 DENIED without prejudice. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/12/2012)
January 12, 2012 Filing 619 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #620 ***Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 1/12/2012 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu (Date Filed: 1/12/2012). Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #610 DENIED without prejudice. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/12/2012) Modified on 1/12/2012 (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2012 Filing 618 NOTICE by All Nippon Airways NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY (Mooney, Richard) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
January 6, 2012 Filing 617 NOTICE by All Nippon Airways NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE (Mooney, Richard) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
January 6, 2012 Filing 616 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jesse William Markham (Markham, Jesse) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
January 5, 2012 Filing 615 NOTICE of Appearance by Ankur Kapoor of Alysia Solow (Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 5, 2012 Filing 614 NOTICE of Appearance by Ankur Kapoor Gary J. Malone (Kapoor, Ankur) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 613 ORDER Setting Hearing on #610 #601 Joint Discovery Letters. Discovery Hearing set for 1/12/2012 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/03/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
December 28, 2011 Filing 612 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian Joseph Barry, Esq (Barry, Brian) (Filed on 12/28/2011)
December 19, 2011 Filing 611 Letter Brief re #610 Letter Brief, Clarifying Certain Information With Respect To Air New Zealand filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #610 ) (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 14, 2011 Filing 610 Letter Brief re #601 Letter Brief, #609 Order, #604 Letter Joint Letter Brief filed byAir France, Air New Zealand, All Plaintiffs, Cathay Pacific Airways, China Airlines, Continental Airlines, Inc., Eva Airways, KLM Royal Dutch Airline, Malaysian Airline System Berhad, Philippine Airlines, Inc., Qantas Airways, Ltd., Singapore Airlines, Thai Airways, Vietnam Airlines. (Related document(s) #601 , #609 , #604 ) (Snyder, Richard) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 609 ORDER re #601 #604 Joint Letter Briefs Re Discovery Dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/12/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 6, 2011 Filing 608 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint #493 Amended Complaint,, byThai Airways. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Wilson, Rowan) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
December 6, 2011 Filing 607 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #606 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, by All Nippon Airways, All Plaintiffs. (Mooney, Richard) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ORDER granting #602 Defendant All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd's (ANA) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Judge Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Plaintiffs and Defendant ANA's Joint Letter Brief pursuant to the Court's Standing Order is to be filed Under Seal with this court, and is ordered Sealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu 12/6/2011. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
December 2, 2011 Filing 605 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Mitchell Leff Stoltz (Stoltz, Mitchell) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
December 1, 2011 Filing 604 Letter from Richard Snyder to Judge Ryu. (Snyder, Richard) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
November 30, 2011 Filing 603 Declaration of Richard Mooney in Support of #602 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAll Nippon Airways. (Related document(s) #602 ) (Mooney, Richard) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 30, 2011 Filing 602 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by All Nippon Airways. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mooney, Richard) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 30, 2011 Filing 601 Letter Brief Joint Letter Brief (Redacted) filed by All Nippon Airways, All Plaintiffs. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 11/30/2011) Modified on 12/1/2011 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2011 Filing 600 NOTICE of Change of Address by David Andrew Senior (Senior, David) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 15, 2011 Filing 599 ANSWER with Jury Damand to Amended Complaint byAll Nippon Airways. (Stoltz, Mitchell) (Filed on 11/15/2011) Modified on 11/16/2011 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2011 Filing 598 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byEva Airways. (Casamassima, Christopher) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 15, 2011 Filing 597 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byPhilippine Airlines, Inc.. (Stork, Anita) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 15, 2011 Filing 596 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byQantas Airways, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Shaw, Kimberly) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 15, 2011 Filing 595 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Vietnam Airlines Company Limited's Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint byVietnam Airlines. (Hawk, Robert) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 15, 2011 Filing 594 Answer to Amended Complaint bySingapore Airlines. (Sherman, William) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 15, 2011 Filing 593 Answer to Amended Complaint #493 Amended Complaint,, ("Answer of Defendant Thai Airways International Public Company Limited to Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint") byThai Airways. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Wilson, Rowan) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 15, 2011 Filing 592 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byMalaysian Airline System Berhad. (Senior, David) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 15, 2011 Filing 591 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byKoninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V.. (MacDonald, Gary) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 15, 2011 Filing 590 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF SAS AB by Micah Abrams, William Adams, Meor Adlin, Franklyn Ajaye, All Plaintiffs, Lori Barrett, Andrew Barton, Michael Benson, Brenden G. Maloof, Rufus Browning, Clyde H. Campbell, Robert Casteel, III, Larry Chen, Woodrow Clark, II, Rachel Diller, Christian Duke, James Evans, Matthew Evans, Mark Foy, Scott Frederick, Stephen Gaffigan, Margaret Garcia, Reiko Hirai, Bruce Hut, Caroline Joy, Martin Kaufman, Tori Kitagawa, David Kuo, Justin LaBarge, Dickson Leung, Ireatha Diane Mitchell, Kevin Moy, David Murphy, Lolly Randall, Thomas Schelly, Tracey Wadmore Smith, Titi Tran, Jason Gregory Turner, Donald Wortman (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 15, 2011 Filing 589 Answer to Amended Complaint byChina Airlines. (Dick, James) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 15, 2011 Filing 588 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byContinental Airlines, Inc.. (Yde, Paul) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 15, 2011 Filing 587 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byCathay Pacific Airways. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Cairo, Deana) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 15, 2011 Filing 586 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byAir France. (Warnot, James) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 15, 2011 Filing 585 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byAir New Zealand. (Holland, Michael) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 10, 2011 Filing 584 STIPULATION [JOINT] FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Singapore Airlines. (Bauer, Ashley) (Filed on 11/10/2011)
October 31, 2011 Filing 583 ERRATA re #557 Transcript,,, Errata Sheet to Transcript of Proceedings Held on September 30, 2011 by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Snyder, Richard) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
October 27, 2011 Filing 582 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/27/2011 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re #546 MOTION to Compel. Motion DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Court Reporter Jennifer Macato.) (Recorded on FTR at 3:59-4:16). ***Motions terminated: #546 MOTION to Compel. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/27/2011) Modified on 10/27/2011 (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2011 Filing 581 Statement Pursuant to Judge Ryu October 20, 2011 Order re: Plaintiffs Motion to Compel by All Nippon Airways. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stoltz, Mitchell) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 25, 2011 Filing 580 EXHIBITS re #574 Statement Attachment E (Part 2 of 2) filed byChina Airlines. (Related document(s) #574 ) (Dick, James) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 25, 2011 Filing 579 EXHIBITS re #574 Statement Attachment E (Part 1 of 2) filed byChina Airlines. (Related document(s) #574 ) (Dick, James) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 25, 2011 Filing 578 EXHIBITS re #574 Statement Attachment D filed byChina Airlines. (Related document(s) #574 ) (Dick, James) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 25, 2011 Filing 577 EXHIBITS re #574 Statement Attachment C filed byChina Airlines. (Related document(s) #574 ) (Dick, James) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 25, 2011 Filing 576 EXHIBITS re #574 Statement Attachment B filed byChina Airlines. (Related document(s) #574 ) (Dick, James) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 25, 2011 Filing 575 EXHIBITS re #574 Statement Attachment A filed byChina Airlines. (Related document(s) #574 ) (Dick, James) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 25, 2011 Filing 574 Statement Pursuant to 10/20/11 Order by China Airlines. (Dick, James) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 573 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #572 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (M J Fanelli) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 571 ORDER re #546 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/20/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
October 18, 2011 Filing 572 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Michael J. Fanelli) ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611065979.) filed by Philippine Airlines, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
October 12, 2011 Filing 570 Declaration of Tom Matzen in Support of #568 Reply to Opposition/Response, Declaration of Tom Matzen filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #568 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
October 12, 2011 Filing 569 Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of #568 Reply to Opposition/Response, Reply Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of Motion to Compel Defendants All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd. and China Airlines, Ltd. to Provide Discovery filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #568 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
October 12, 2011 Filing 568 REPLY (re #546 MOTION to Compel Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Defendants All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd. and China Airlines, Ltd. to Provide Discovery ) Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Defendants All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd. and China Airlines, Ltd. to Provide Discovery filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #565 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (E. Katcher) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #564 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (R.N. Kaplan) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
October 6, 2011 Filing 565 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Elana Katcher) ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611065498.) filed by Stephen Gaffigan, Bruce Hut. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
October 6, 2011 Filing 564 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Robert N. Kaplan) ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611065498.) filed by Stephen Gaffigan, Bruce Hut. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
October 5, 2011 Filing 563 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #546 MOTION to Compel Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Defendants All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd. and China Airlines, Ltd. to Provide Discovery ) Certificate of Service filed byAll Nippon Airways. (Mooney, Richard) (Filed on 10/5/2011) Modified on 10/6/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2011 Filing 562 Declaration of Robert E. Singleton in support of #546 MOTION to Compel Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Defendants All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd. and China Airlines, Ltd. to Provide Discovery ) Declaration of Robert E. Singleton filed byAll Nippon Airways. (Mooney, Richard) (Filed on 10/5/2011) Modified on 10/6/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2011 Filing 561 Declaration of Takeshi Arakawa in support of #546 MOTION to Compel Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Defendants All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd. and China Airlines, Ltd. to Provide Discovery ) Declaration of Takeshi Arakawa in Support of Defendant All Nippon Airways Co. Ltd.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed byAll Nippon Airways. (Mooney, Richard) (Filed on 10/5/2011) Modified on 10/6/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2011 Filing 560 Declaration of James V. Dick in support of #546 MOTION to Compel Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Defendants All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd. and China Airlines, Ltd. to Provide Discovery ) Declaration of James V. Dick filed byAll Nippon Airways. (Mooney, Richard) (Filed on 10/5/2011) Modified on 10/6/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2011 Filing 559 Declaration of Alysia A. Solow in support of #546 MOTION to Compel Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Defendants All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd. and China Airlines, Ltd. to Provide Discovery ) Declaration of Alysia A. Solow in Support of Defendant All Nippon Airways Co. Ltd.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed byAll Nippon Airways. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Mooney, Richard) (Filed on 10/5/2011) Modified on 10/6/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2011 Filing 558 RESPONSE (re #546 MOTION to Compel Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Defendants All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd. and China Airlines, Ltd. to Provide Discovery ) All Nippon Airways Co. Ltd. and China Airlines' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery filed byAll Nippon Airways. (Mooney, Richard) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 4, 2011 Filing 557 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 30, 2011, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 10/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/4/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2012. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 556 ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF SINGAPORE AIRLINES AND DENYING MOTIONS OF MALAYSIAN AIRLINES, THE EUROPEAN CARRIERS, AND CONTINENTAL AIRLINES. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/4/2011. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 555 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part (554) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re (554 in 3:07-cv-05634-CRB) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Local Rule 6-3 Motion of All Nippon Airways and China Airlines for Modification of Time Within Which To File Opposition to Motion To Compel, (546 in 3:07-cv-05634-CRB) MOTION to Compel Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Defendants All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd. and China Airlines, Ltd. to Provide Discovery ( Responses due by 10/5/2011., Replies due by 10/12/2011.) in case 3:07-cv-05634-CRB.Associated Cases: 3:07-cv-05634-CRB, 3:07-cv-06394-CRB, 3:08-cv-01453-CRB, 3:08-cv-01912-CRB, 3:10-cv-04137-CRB(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 30, 2011 Filing 554 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Local Rule 6-3 Motion of All Nippon Airways and China Airlines for Modification of Time Within Which To File Opposition to Motion To Compel filed by All Nippon Airways, China Airlines. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ankur Kapoor ISO Local Rule 6-3 Motion of All Nippon Airways and China Airlines for Modification of Time Within Which to File Opposition to Motion to Compel, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting All Nippon Airways and China Airlines Local Rule 6-3 Motion for Modification of Time Within Which To File Opposition to Motion To Compel)(Mooney, Richard) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 30, 2011 Filing 553 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/30/2011 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 9/30/2011) re #518 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Malaysian Airline System Berhad, #516 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Singapore Airlines, #520 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Continental Airlines, Inc., #519 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V., SAS AB, Air France, KLM Royal Dutch Airline. ***Motions terminated: #518 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Malaysian Airline System Berhad, #519 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V., SAS AB, Air France, KLM Royal Dutch Airline, #520 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Continental Airlines, Inc., #516 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Singapore Airlines. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/30/2011)
September 22, 2011 Filing 552 NOTICE of Appearance by Nien-Ping Ian Wang for EVA Airways Corporation (Wang, Nien-Ping) (Filed on 9/22/2011)
September 22, 2011 Filing 551 NOTICE of Appearance by Tammy Ann Tsoumas for EVA Airways Corporation (Tsoumas, Tammy) (Filed on 9/22/2011)
September 22, 2011 Filing 550 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Minjue Kim for EVA Airways Corporation (Kim, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/22/2011)
September 19, 2011 Filing 549 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel re #548 . (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 19, 2011 Filing 548 MANDATE of USCA as to #484 Notice of Appeal filed by Vietnam Airlines. The judgment of this Court, entered 8/10/11, takes effect this date. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 16, 2011 Filing 547 Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of #546 MOTION to Compel Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Defendants All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd. and China Airlines, Ltd. to Provide Discovery Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Defendants All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd. and China Airlines, Ltd. to Provide Discovery filed byDonald Wortman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Related document(s) #546 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 16, 2011 Filing 546 MOTION to Compel Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Defendants All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd. and China Airlines, Ltd. to Provide Discovery filed by Donald Wortman. Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 9/30/2011. Replies due by 10/7/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Compel)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 9, 2011 Filing 545 REPLY (re #519 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Portions of Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) filed byAir France, KLM Royal Dutch Airline, Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V., SAS AB. (Warnot, James) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 9, 2011 Filing 544 REPLY (re #518 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Re Fraudulent Concealment In Plaintiffs First Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant To F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6) By Certain Defendants; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof MOTION to Dismiss Claims Re Fraudulent Concealment In Plaintiffs First Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant To F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6) By Certain Defendants; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof ) filed byMalaysian Airline System Berhad. (Senior, David) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 9, 2011 Filing 543 Declaration of Richard S. Synder in Support of #520 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(1); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(1); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byContinental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #520 ) (Yde, Paul) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 9, 2011 Filing 542 REPLY (re #520 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(1); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(1); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byContinental Airlines, Inc.. (Yde, Paul) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 9, 2011 Filing 541 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** REPLY (re #520 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(1); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(1); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byContinental Airlines, Inc. (Yde, Paul) (Filed on 9/9/2011) Modified on 9/12/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2011 Filing 540 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Singapore Airlines re #539 Reply to Opposition/Response (Sherman, William) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 9, 2011 Filing 539 REPLY (re #516 MOTION to Dismiss Portions of Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) filed bySingapore Airlines. (Sherman, William) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 538 ORDER re #536 Stipulation, filed by Eva Airways,et al., Set/Reset Deadlines as to #519 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Portions of Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #518 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Re Fraudulent Concealment In Plaintiffs First Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant To F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6) By Certain Defendants; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof MOTION to Dismiss Claims Re Fraudulent Concealment In Plaintiffs First Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant To F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6) By Certain Defendants; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof, #516 MOTION to Dismiss Portions of Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, #520 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(1); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(1); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. Replies due by 9/9/2011.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/2/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 2, 2011 Filing 537 Declaration of WILLIAM R. SHERMAN in Support of #536 Stipulation,,,,, filed bySingapore Airlines. (Related document(s) #536 ) (Sherman, William) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 2, 2011 Filing 536 STIPULATION (JOINT) AND [PROPOSED] ORDER ON TIMING FOR FILING OF REPLY MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Micah Abrams, William Adams, Meor Adlin, Air France, Air New Zealand, Franklyn Ajaye, All Nippon Airways, All Plaintiffs, Lori Barrett, Andrew Barton, Michael Benson, Brenden G. Maloof, British Airways, Rufus Browning, Clyde H. Campbell, Robert Casteel, III, Cathay Pacific Airways, Larry Chen, China Airlines, Woodrow Clark, II, Continental Airlines, Inc., Deutsche Lufthansa AG, Rachel Diller, Christian Duke, Eva Airways, James Evans, Matthew Evans, Judah M. Feigenbaum, Mark Foy, Scott Frederick, Stephen Gaffigan, Margaret Garcia, Reiko Hirai, Bruce Hut, Japan Airlines International, Caroline Joy, KLM Royal Dutch Airline, Martin Kaufman, Tori Kitagawa, Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V., David Kuo, Justin LaBarge, Dickson Leung, Malaysia Airlines, Malaysian Airline System Berhad, Ireatha Diane Mitchell, Kevin Moy, David Murphy, Trong Nguyen, Northwest Airlines, Philippine Airlines, Inc., Qantas Airways, Ltd., Lolly Randall, SAS AB, Thomas Schelly, Singapore Airlines, Tracey Wadmore Smith, Swiss International AG, Thai Airways, Titi Tran, Jason Gregory Turner, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, United Airlines, Vietnam Airlines, Donald Wortman. (Sherman, William) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 535 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying #526 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
August 29, 2011 Filing 534 RESPONSE (re #520 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(1); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(1); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Continental Airlines, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss The First Amended Consolidated Complaint filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Denying Continental Airlines, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss The First Amended Consolidated Complaint)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 29, 2011 Filing 533 RESPONSE (re #519 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Portions of Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To European Carriers' Motion To Dismiss Certain Portions Of Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Denying European Carriers' Motion to Dismiss Certain Portions of Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 29, 2011 Filing 532 RESPONSE (re #518 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Re Fraudulent Concealment In Plaintiffs First Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant To F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6) By Certain Defendants; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof MOTION to Dismiss Claims Re Fraudulent Concealment In Plaintiffs First Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant To F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6) By Certain Defendants; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof ) Memorandum of Points And Authorities In Opposition To Motion To Dismiss Claims Re Fraudulent Concealment filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Claims re Fraudulent Concealment in Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) By Certain Defendants)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 29, 2011 Filing 531 RESPONSE (re #516 MOTION to Dismiss Portions of Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Portions of the First Amended Consolidated Complaint Based On The Foreign Trade Antitrust Improvements Act filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Portions of the First Amended Consolidated Complaint Based On The Foreign Trade Antitrust Improvements Act)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER Setting Hearing on #527 MOTION to Compel Defendants All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd. and China Airlines, Ltd. to Provide Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2011 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/26/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2011)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/25/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 23, 2011 Filing 528 Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of #527 MOTION to Compel Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Defendants All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd. and China Airlines, Ltd. to Provide Discovery Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Defendants All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd. and China Airlines Ltd. to Provide Discovery filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Related document(s) #527 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 8/23/2011)
August 23, 2011 Filing 527 MOTION to Compel Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Defendants All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd. and China Airlines, Ltd. to Provide Discovery filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 9/6/2011. Replies due by 9/13/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Compel)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 8/23/2011)
August 23, 2011 Filing 526 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) and General Order No. 62 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) and General Order No. 62, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) and General Order No. 62)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 8/23/2011)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER of USCA as to #479 Notice of Appeal filed by Thai Airways. The appeal is dismissed. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORDER of USCA as to #484 Notice of Appeal filed by Vietnam Airlines. The appeal is dismissed. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
August 19, 2011 Filing 523 Supplemental Declaration of Paul L. Yde in Support of #520 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(1); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(1); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #521 Declaration in Support,, filed byContinental Airlines, Inc.. (Related document(s) #520 , #521 ) (Yde, Paul) (Filed on 8/19/2011) Modified on 8/22/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2011 Filing 522 CLERKS NOTICE, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #519 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Portions of Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #518 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Re Fraudulent Concealment In Plaintiffs First Amended Class Action Complaint, #520 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #516 MOTION to Dismiss Portions of Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 521 Declaration of Paul L. Yde in Support of #520 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(1); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(1); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byContinental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #520 ) (Yde, Paul) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 520 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(1); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. Responses due by 8/29/2011. Replies due by 9/6/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yde, Paul) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 519 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Portions of Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Air France, KLM Royal Dutch Airline, Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V., SAS AB. Responses due by 8/29/2011. Replies due by 9/6/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Warnot, James) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 518 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Re Fraudulent Concealment In Plaintiffs First Amended Class Action Complaint Pursuant To F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6) By Certain Defendants; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Malaysian Airline System Berhad. Responses due by 8/29/2011. Replies due by 9/6/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Senior, David) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 517 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Singapore Airlines re #516 MOTION to Dismiss Portions of Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support (Sherman, William) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 516 MOTION to Dismiss Portions of Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Singapore Airlines. Responses due by 8/29/2011. Replies due by 9/6/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sherman, William) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 12, 2011 Filing 515 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Marie Bauer (Bauer, Ashley) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 11, 2011 Filing 514 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy Eila Reichmuth (Reichmuth, Tracy) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
August 10, 2011 Filing 513 NOTICE by Donald Wortman Notice of Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 8/10/2011)
August 9, 2011 Filing 512 NOTICE by Donald Wortman Notice of Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 3, 2011 Filing 511 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Marie Andreoli (Andreoli, Dana) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer finding as moot #496 Motion for Certificate of Appealability of Interlocutory Appeal. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 26, 2011 Filing 509 Proposed Order re #496 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability EUROPEAN CARRIERS' MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) MOTION for Certificate of Appealability EUROPEAN CARRIERS' MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) by Air France, KLM Royal Dutch Airline, Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V., SAS AB. (Warnot, James) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
July 26, 2011 Filing 508 REPLY (re #496 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability EUROPEAN CARRIERS' MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) MOTION for Certificate of Appealability EUROPEAN CARRIERS' MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) ) filed byAir France, KLM Royal Dutch Airline, Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V., SAS AB. (Warnot, James) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
July 25, 2011 Filing 507 NOTICE of Appearance by Jayne Ann Peeters (Peeters, Jayne) (Filed on 7/25/2011)
July 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting (501) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 3:07-cv-05634-CRB (Anjali B. Patel) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2011)
July 25, 2011 Filing 504 NOTICE of Appearance by Niall Padraic McCarthy Notice of Appearance of Niall P. McCarthy (McCarthy, Niall) (Filed on 7/25/2011)
July 25, 2011 Filing 503 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric James Buescher Notice of Appearance of Eric J. Buescher (Buescher, Eric) (Filed on 7/25/2011)
July 25, 2011 Filing 502 NOTICE of Appearance by Niki B. Okcu Notice of Appearance of Niki B. Okcu (Okcu, Niki) (Filed on 7/25/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 505 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 7/22/2011 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 7/22/2011). Motions due by 8/15/2011. Responses due by 8/29/2011. Replies due by 9/6/2011, matter deemed submitted without hearing.(Court Reporter - Not Reported.) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 501 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Anjali B. Patel) ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611062482.) filed by Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 500 RESPONSE (re #496 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability EUROPEAN CARRIERS' MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) MOTION for Certificate of Appealability EUROPEAN CARRIERS' MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) ) Opposition filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 21, 2011 Filing 499 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Kay Boardman (Boardman, Thomas) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #494 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
July 19, 2011 Filing 497 NOTICE by Donald Wortman re #495 Joint Case Management Statement, #494 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) and General Order No. 62 Notice Regarding Document Submitted Under Seal (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 7/19/2011) Modified on 7/20/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #496 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability EUROPEAN CARRIERS' MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) MOTION for Certificate of Appealability EUROPEAN CARRIERS' MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). Responses due by 7/29/2011. Replies due by 8/5/2011. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 15, 2011 Filing 496 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability EUROPEAN CARRIERS' MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) filed by Air France, KLM Royal Dutch Airline, Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V., SAS AB. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/11 at 10:00 am. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(MacDonald, Gary) (Filed on 7/15/2011) Modified on 7/19/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2011 Filing 495 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed by Donald Wortman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 15, 2011 Filing 494 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) and General Order No. 62 filed by Donald Wortman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 14, 2011 Filing 493 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint against Air France, Air New Zealand, All Nippon Airways, Cathay Pacific Airways, China Airlines, Continental Airlines, Inc., Eva Airways, Japan Airlines International, KLM Royal Dutch Airline, Malaysian Airline System Berhad, Philippine Airlines, Inc., Qantas Airways, Ltd., SAS AB, Singapore Airlines, Thai Airways, Vietnam Airlines. Filed byAndrew Barton, Dickson Leung, Brenden G. Maloof, Franklyn Ajaye, David Murphy, Titi Tran, David Kuo, Donald Wortman, Meor Adlin, Rachel Diller, Scott Frederick, Larry Chen. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 492 NOTICE of Change of Address by Patrick David Robbins (Robbins, Patrick) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
June 14, 2011 Filing 491 AMENDED CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference reset for 7/22/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco to (142 in 3:08-md-01913-CRB, 490 in 3:07-cv-05634-CRB) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 14, 2011 Filing 490 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. SEE #491 *** CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference reset for 7/22/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011) Modified on 6/15/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2011 Filing 489 USCA Case Number 11-16425 USCA for #484 Notice of Appeal filed by Vietnam Airlines. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #477 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 2, 2011 Filing 487 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (mcl, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2011 Filing 486 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re (138 in 3:08-md-01913-CRB, 484 in 3:07-cv-05634-CRB) Notice of Appeal. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
June 2, 2011 Filing 485 Representation Statement re (484 in 3:07-cv-05634-CRB) Notice of Appeal by Vietnam Airlines. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
June 2, 2011 Filing 484 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #467 in 3:07-cv-05634-CRB, Order on Motion to Dismiss, by Vietnam Airlines. Filing fee $ 455, Receipt # 34611060502. (USCA # 11-16425) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #472 Motion for Leave to File. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 26, 2011 Filing 482 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel re appeal #479 . (mcl, COURT STAFF) (mcl, COURT STAFF).
May 26, 2011 Filing 481 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #479 Notice of Appeal. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
May 25, 2011 Filing 480 Representation Statement re #479 Notice of Appeal by Thai Airways. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 25, 2011 Filing 479 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #467 Order on Motion to Dismiss, by Thai Airways. Filing fee $ 455, Receipt # 34611060264. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 25, 2011 Filing 478 RESPONSE (re #472 MOTION for Leave to File the European Carriers' Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's May 9, 2011 Order ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to European Carriers' Motion for Leave to File a Motion For Reconsideration filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 25, 2011 Filing 477 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Defendants Joint Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) filed by All Nippon Airways, China Airlines. Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (Mooney, Richard) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 25, 2011 Filing 476 ERRATA NOTICE OF ERRATA RE DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) by All Nippon Airways, China Airlines. (Mooney, Richard) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 24, 2011 Filing 475 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Re Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Defendants All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd. and China Airlines, Ltd.'s Joint Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) by All Nippon Airways, China Airlines. (Mooney, Richard) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 24, 2011 Filing 474 Proposed Order re #473 Joint MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Defendants' Joint Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b)Joint MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Defendants' Joint Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) by All Nippon Airways, China Airlines. (Mooney, Richard) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 24, 2011 Filing 473 Joint MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Defendants' Joint Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) filed by All Nippon Airways, China Airlines. Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (Mooney, Richard) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 23, 2011 Filing 472 MOTION for Leave to File the European Carriers' Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's May 9, 2011 Order filed by Air France. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Motion for Reconsideration, #2 Proposed Order)(McGrath, Thomas) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
May 20, 2011 Filing 471 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Lufthansa AG and Swiss International Airlines Ltd. without prejudice by All Plaintiffs (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
May 19, 2011 Filing 470 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 6/24/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 14, 2011 Filing 469 JOINDER (re #468 MOTION to Schedule Case Management Conference ) Plaintiffs' Joinder in Defendant's Request for Case Management Conference filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Williams, Steven) (Filed on 5/14/2011) Modified on 5/16/2011 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2011 Filing 468 MOTION to Schedule Case Management Conference filed by Singapore Airlines. (Sherman, William) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #287 Motion to Dismiss; denying #288 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #290 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #293 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #294 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #295 Motion to Dismiss; denying #299 Motion to Dismiss; denying #300 Motion to Dismiss; denying #303 Motion to Dismiss; denying #304 Motion to Dismiss; denying #310 Motion to Dismiss; granting #311 Motion to Dismiss; denying #312 Motion to Dismiss; denying #344 Motion to Stay. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
April 6, 2011 Filing 466 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Jesse William Markham (Markham, Jesse) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
April 4, 2011 Filing 465 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher T. Heffelfinger (Heffelfinger, Christopher) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
April 4, 2011 Filing 464 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Allan Steyer (Steyer, Allan) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
March 10, 2011 Filing 463 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth R. Gassman (Gassman, Seth) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
February 24, 2011 Filing 462 NOTICE by William Adams, Margaret Garcia, Donald Wortman NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
January 21, 2011 Filing 461 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA -- Statement of Interest (Smith, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 7, 2011 Filing 460 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #339 ) (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting (456) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Morissa R. Falk terminated in case 3:07-cv-05634-CRB (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
January 5, 2011 Filing 458 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Allan Steyer (Steyer, Allan) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
January 4, 2011 Filing 457 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Ronald S Rolfe (Rolfe, Ronald) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
January 4, 2011 Filing 456 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re: Morissa R. Falk filed by Rachel Diller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Himes, Jay) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
December 14, 2010 Filing 455 Letter from the Court to Mr. Harold Hongju Koh. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2010)
December 14, 2010 Filing 454 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byCathay Pacific Airways. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cairo, Deana) (Filed on 12/14/2010)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER Regarding Waiver of Service of Summons re (450 in 3:07-cv-05634-CRB) Stipulation filed by Caroline Joy, (11 in 3:10-cv-04137-CRB) Stipulation filed by Caroline Joy. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/7/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
December 7, 2010 Filing 452 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Sutton Snyder Co-Counsel for Defendant Continental Airlines, Inc. (Snyder, Richard) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
December 6, 2010 Filing 451 Letter from Robert Hawk. (Attachments: #1 Draft Letter from J. Breyer to Dept. of State, #2 Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #3 Motion to Dismiss re Act of State, #4 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss re Act of State, #5 Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss re Act of State, #6 Vietnam Airlines' Act of State Exhibits, #7 Plaintiffs' Act of State Exhibits - Part 1, #8 Plaintiffs' Act of State Exhibits - Part 2, #9 Thai Airways' Act of State Exhibits - Part 1, #10 Thai Airways' Act of State Exhibits - Part 2, #11 Thai Airways' Act of State Exhibits - Part 3, #12 Thai Airways' Act of State Exhibits - Part 4, #13 Thai Airways' Act of State Exhibits - Part 5, #14 Thai Airways' Act of State Exhibits - Part 6, #15 Statement of Recent Decision, #16 Hearing Transcript)(Hawk, Robert) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
December 6, 2010 Filing 450 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Waiver of Service of Summons by Caroline Joy. (Sokol, Sylvia) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
December 6, 2010 Filing 449 NOTICE by All Nippon Airways Defendant All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd.'s Submission of Plea Agreement (Markham, Jesse) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
December 2, 2010 Filing 448 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-1-10, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
November 29, 2010 Filing 447 NOTICE by Rachel Diller of Association of Robert G. Eisler as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff Rachel Diller (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 24, 2010 Filing 446 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-02-2010, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Connie McCarthy Kuhl, Telephone number 415-431-2020. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/22/2011. (ck, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER REGARDING SOLICITATION OF STATE DEPARTMENT OPINION. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/22/2010. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 4, 2010 Filing 444 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Air France, Air New Zealand, All Nippon Airways, Cathay Pacific Airways, China Airlines, Continental Airlines, Inc., Eva Airways, KLM Royal Dutch Airline, Malaysia Airlines, Philippine Airlines, Inc., Qantas Airways, Ltd., SAS AB, Singapore Airlines, Thai Airways, Vietnam Airlines re #439 Memorandum in Opposition,, (Markham, Jesse) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
November 2, 2010 Filing 443 Request for Judicial Notice Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
November 2, 2010 Filing 442 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference not held, Motion Hearing held on 11/2/2010 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 11/2/2010). (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/2/2010)
November 1, 2010 Filing 441 AMENDED MINUTES TO #440 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/1/2010 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 11/1/2010). Motion Hearing/Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
November 1, 2010 Filing 440 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/1/2010 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 11/1/2010). Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/1/2010)
November 1, 2010 Filing 439 Memorandum in Opposition Defendants' Opposition to #437 Plaintiffs' Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice With Respect to the Motions to Dismiss Set for Hearing on November 1, 2010 filed byAir France, Air New Zealand, All Nippon Airways, Cathay Pacific Airways, China Airlines, Continental Airlines, Inc., Eva Airways, KLM Royal Dutch Airline, Malaysia Airlines, Philippine Airlines, Inc., Qantas Airways, Ltd., SAS AB, Singapore Airlines, Thai Airways, Vietnam Airlines. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice with Respect to the Motions Set for Hearing on November 1, 2010)(Markham, Jesse) (Filed on 11/1/2010) Modified on 11/2/2010 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2010 Filing 438 Letter from Defendants to Judge Breyer with Proposed Agenda for Hearing Scheduled for November 1, 2010 and November 2, 2010. (Price, Charles) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 29, 2010 Filing 437 Request for Judicial Notice re #328 Memorandum in Opposition, #336 Memorandum in Opposition,, #339 Memorandum in Opposition, (Supplemental Request) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #328 , #336 , #339 ) (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 436 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Singapore Airlines. (Sherman, William) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 435 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAS AB re #433 Notice of Appearance, #434 Certificate of Interested Entities (Ruttinger, George) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 434 Certificate of Interested Entities by SAS AB (Ruttinger, George) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 433 NOTICE of Appearance by George David Ruttinger (Ruttinger, George) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 432 Notice of Errata re #339 Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 10/22/2010) Modified on 10/25/2010 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2010 Filing 431 Certificate of Interested Entities by Qantas Airways, Ltd. (McNaughton, Michael) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 21, 2010 Filing 430 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott David Cunningham Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Cunningham, Scott) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 21, 2010 Filing 429 NOTICE of Appearance by Roderick David Margo Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Margo, Roderick) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 21, 2010 Filing 428 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Michael Bertram McNaughton (McNaughton, Michael) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 21, 2010 Filing 427 Certificate of Interested Entities by Singapore Airlines (Price, Charles) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 21, 2010 Filing 426 Certificate of Interested Entities by Thai Airways ("Defendant Thai Airways International Public Company Ltd.'s Certification Of Interested Entities Or Persons') (Rolfe, Ronald) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 21, 2010 Filing 425 Certificate of Interested Entities by Air New Zealand (Holland, Michael) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 21, 2010 Filing 424 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Holland (Holland, Michael) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 21, 2010 Filing 423 Certificate of Interested Entities by All Nippon Airways Defendant All Nippon Airways Co., Ltd's Disclosure of Non-Party Interested Entities (Brezine, Adam) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #418 Motion to Relate Case. Case 10-4137 related to 07-5634. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
September 22, 2010 Filing 421 Statement of Recent Decision filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
September 20, 2010 Filing 420 Declaration of Sylvia M. Sokol in support of Plaintiff Caroline Joy's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed byCaroline Joy. (Sokol, Sylvia) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 20, 2010 Filing 419 Proposed Order Granting Caroline Joy's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related by Caroline Joy. (Sokol, Sylvia) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 20, 2010 Filing 418 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Caroline Joy. (Sokol, Sylvia) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 10, 2010 Filing 417 NOTICE by Continental Airlines, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Andrea Agathoklis as Counsel for Defendant Continental Airlines, Inc. (Abye, Mikael) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 2, 2010 Filing 416 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #392 MOTION to Compel Airline Tariff Publishing Company to produce data and document pursuant to the January 21, 2010 subpoena (Notice of Withdrawal of Motion) (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 415 AMENDMENT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/1/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 414 STIPULATION re #404 Protective Order Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Amendment to Protective Order filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER setting hearing dates, Set/Reset Deadlines as to Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion to Stay, Motions to Dismiss Hearing set for 11/1/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/26/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER extending hearing date as to #392 MOTION to Compel Airline Tariff Publishing Company to produce data and document pursuant to the January 21, 2010 subpoena. Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/26/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 25, 2010 Filing 411 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d Concerning Defendants' Pending Motions to Dismiss filed bySingapore Airlines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Price, Charles) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 410 STIPULATION on Available Dates For Hearings by Singapore Airlines. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Setting Hearing Dates)(Price, Charles) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 19, 2010 Filing 409 STIPULATION re #392 MOTION to Compel Airline Tariff Publishing Company to produce data and document pursuant to the January 21, 2010 subpoena (Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Hearing Date) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jessica N. Servais in Support of Joint Stipulation)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 13, 2010 Filing 408 NOTICE of Appearance by Roderick David Margo (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Margo, Roderick) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 9, 2010 Filing 407 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference reset for 9/10/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion(s) Hearing reset for 9/10/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
August 6, 2010 Filing 406 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lori Sambol Brody (Brody, Lori) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
July 29, 2010 Filing 405 STIPULATION Of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Trong Nguyen. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 404 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/20/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 403 EXPERT STIPULATION AND ORDER re #400 Stipulation filed by All Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/20/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
July 20, 2010 Filing 402 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT JAPAN AIRLINES INTERNATIONAL, LTD. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
July 16, 2010 Filing 401 STIPULATION And [Proposed] Protective Order filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
July 16, 2010 Filing 400 STIPULATION Expert Stipulation And [Proposed] Order filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
July 15, 2010 Filing 399 NOTICE of Change of Address by Gilmur Roderick Murray (Murray, Gilmur) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
July 12, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings:, Set/Reset Deadlines as to Case Management Conference set for 8/27/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #394 Motion to Continue hearing on motions and CMC (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER extending hearing date on motion to compel re #396 Stipulation, filed by All Plaintiffs, #392 MOTION to Compel Airline Tariff Publishing Company to produce data and document pursuant to the January 21, 2010 subpoena. Responses due by 8/20/2010. Replies due by 8/27/2010. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/9/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 9, 2010 Filing 396 STIPULATION re #392 MOTION to Compel Airline Tariff Publishing Company to produce data and document pursuant to the January 21, 2010 subpoena (Joint Stipulation To Continue Hearing) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jessica Servais In Support Of Joint Motion To Continue Hearing Date On Motion To Compel Records From ATPCO)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 8, 2010 Filing 395 Declaration of Steven N. Williams in Support of #394 MOTION to Continue JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION AND STIPULATION TO REQUEST CONTINUED HEARING DATE filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #394 ) (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
July 8, 2010 Filing 394 MOTION to Continue JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION AND STIPULATION TO REQUEST CONTINUED HEARING DATE filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
July 6, 2010 Filing 393 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 392 MOTION to Compel Airline Tariff Publishing Company to produce data and document pursuant to the January 21, 2010 subpoena filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Jessica Servais, #3 Declaration of Robert Taylor, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 6/14/2010)