Easley v. City of Morgan Hill et al
Plaintiff: Gary D. Easley
Defendant: City of Morgan Hill, City of San Jose, County of Santa Clara, Morgan Hill Police Dept., Santa Clara Sheriff Dept., David Ray, John Ray, Cruz, Stenderup, Persiani, Laurie Smith and Director of Police Dept.
Case Number: 3:2010cv02640
Filed: June 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 230 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 229 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Action Against Morgan Hill and David Ray with Prejudice. City of Morgan Hill and David Ray terminated. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 06/10/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/6/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 206 Motion excusing individual County Defendants from attending settlement conference. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/12/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER REFERRING LITIGANT TO FEDERAL PRO BONO PROJECT AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborf on 3/9/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/9/2012: # 1 Appendix Certificate of Service) (cl, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER RE 161 PERMITTING WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/12/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES FOR EXPERT DISCLOSURES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/9/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 134 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION TO FILE OPPOSITION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/7/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER RE SCHEDULING ISSUES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/12/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER RE DISCOVERY RESPONSE DEADLINE AND HEARING DATE.. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/29/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RE: 6 DEEMING AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/22/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Easley v. City of Morgan Hill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary D. Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Morgan Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Jose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Santa Clara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Hill Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Clara Sheriff Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stenderup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Persiani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?