Thomas et al v. Howrey LLP
Plaintiff: Virginia Thomas, Gail Adams, Roderick Casey, Sandra Dean, Marcus Hill, Kimya Hogarth, Derek Hover, Linda Jackson, Michael K. Jackson, Alicia Lewis, London McCloud, Nicole Milne, Shelly Parker, Machelle Procter, Dean Sauder, Matthew Stephan and Desmond Strasser-King
Defendant: Howrey LLP
Case Number: 3:2011cv01729
Filed: April 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER RESETTING CMC. Case Management Statement due by 8/18/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/25/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/19/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Case resetting CMC. Case Management Statement due by 3/17/2016. Further Case Management Conference reset for 3/24/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/15/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER resetting CMC. Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2015. Further Case Management Conference reset for 12/17/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/26/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER RESETTING CMC re 40 Case Management Statement filed by Virginia Thomas Case Management Statement due by 8/20/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/27/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/20/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER RESETTING CMC FROM 2/19/15 TO 5/21/15 AT 10:30 A.M. Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/17/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER resetting CMC from 9/4/14 to 11/20/14 at 10:30 a.m. Case Management Statement due by 11/13/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/2/14. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RESETTING CMC TO 9/4/14 at 10:30 A.M. re 31 Case Management Statement, filed by Matthew Stephan, Roderick Casey, London McCloud, Gail Adams, Alicia Lewis, Shelly Parker, Desmond Strasser-King, Virginia Thomas, Machelle Procter, Sandra Dean, Kimya Hogarth, Linda Jackson, Marcus Hill, Nicole Milne, Michael K. Jackson, Derek Hover, Dean Sauder Case Management Statement due by 8/28/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/14/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Case Management Statement due by 4/3/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/10/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/7/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO APPEAR AT 3/21/13 CMC BY TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge Edward M.Chen on 3/19/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC re 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 13 Clerks Notice, filed by Allan Diamond Case Management Statement due by 3/1/2013. Case Management Conference set for 3/8/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/13/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC FROM 6/12/12 to 9/14/12. Case Management Statement due by 9/7/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/1/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC re 8 Stipulation filed by Howrey LLP Case Management Statement due by 6/1/2012. Case Management Conference set for 6/8/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/4/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDERS (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas et al v. Howrey LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Thomas
Represented By: Steven Aaron Blum
Represented By: Craig Michael Collins
Represented By: Gary Ho
Represented By: Douglas Lee Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Adams
Represented By: Steven Aaron Blum
Represented By: Craig Michael Collins
Represented By: Gary Ho
Represented By: Douglas Lee Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick Casey
Represented By: Steven Aaron Blum
Represented By: Craig Michael Collins
Represented By: Gary Ho
Represented By: Douglas Lee Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Dean
Represented By: Steven Aaron Blum
Represented By: Craig Michael Collins
Represented By: Gary Ho
Represented By: Douglas Lee Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Hill
Represented By: Steven Aaron Blum
Represented By: Craig Michael Collins
Represented By: Gary Ho
Represented By: Douglas Lee Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimya Hogarth
Represented By: Steven Aaron Blum
Represented By: Craig Michael Collins
Represented By: Gary Ho
Represented By: Douglas Lee Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Hover
Represented By: Steven Aaron Blum
Represented By: Craig Michael Collins
Represented By: Gary Ho
Represented By: Douglas Lee Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Jackson
Represented By: Steven Aaron Blum
Represented By: Craig Michael Collins
Represented By: Gary Ho
Represented By: Douglas Lee Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael K. Jackson
Represented By: Steven Aaron Blum
Represented By: Craig Michael Collins
Represented By: Gary Ho
Represented By: Douglas Lee Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Lewis
Represented By: Steven Aaron Blum
Represented By: Craig Michael Collins
Represented By: Gary Ho
Represented By: Douglas Lee Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: London McCloud
Represented By: Steven Aaron Blum
Represented By: Craig Michael Collins
Represented By: Gary Ho
Represented By: Douglas Lee Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Milne
Represented By: Steven Aaron Blum
Represented By: Craig Michael Collins
Represented By: Gary Ho
Represented By: Douglas Lee Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelly Parker
Represented By: Steven Aaron Blum
Represented By: Craig Michael Collins
Represented By: Gary Ho
Represented By: Douglas Lee Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Machelle Procter
Represented By: Steven Aaron Blum
Represented By: Craig Michael Collins
Represented By: Gary Ho
Represented By: Douglas Lee Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Sauder
Represented By: Steven Aaron Blum
Represented By: Craig Michael Collins
Represented By: Gary Ho
Represented By: Douglas Lee Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Stephan
Represented By: Steven Aaron Blum
Represented By: Craig Michael Collins
Represented By: Gary Ho
Represented By: Douglas Lee Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desmond Strasser-King
Represented By: Steven Aaron Blum
Represented By: Craig Michael Collins
Represented By: Gary Ho
Represented By: Douglas Lee Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howrey LLP
Represented By: Lorraine Page Ocheltree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?