Yurok Tribe et al v. United States Bureau of Reclamation

Plaintiff: Yurok Tribe, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Institute for Fisheries Resources and Klamath Riverkeeper
Defendant: United States Bureau of Reclamation and National Marine Fisheries Service
Intervenor_dft: Klamath Water Users Association, Sunnyside Irrigation District, Ben DuVal, Klamath Drainage District, Klamath Irrigation District and Pine Grove Irrigation District
Case Number: 3:2016cv06863
Filed: November 29, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2017 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 87 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/03/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
April 7, 2017 74 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FEDERAL DEFENDANTS' RESPONSIVE PLEADING AND CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES granting 73 STIPULATION. Case Management Conference continued to 5/16/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/07/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
March 31, 2017 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 71 STIPULATION to Extend Responsive Pleading and Case Management Deadlines. Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/31/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2017)
March 24, 2017 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MODIFYING 62 FEBRUARY 8, 2017 INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/24/2017. The Parties shall meet and confer in a good faith attempt to resolve any disputes that may arise relating to the Bureaus implementation of the surface flushing flows, deep flushing flows, and emergency dilution flows ordered herein, and/or the adaptive management process in paragraph 16, prior to seeking further intervention from this Court. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
February 8, 2017 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, MOTIONS TO STRIKE, AND MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William H. Orrick re: 42 Motion to Strike, 43 Motion for Joinder, 55 Motion for Leave to File, and 8 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court enters preliminary injunction. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
February 3, 2017 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 STIPULATION re To Extend Case Management Deadlines. Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2017. Case Management Conference continued to 5/2/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/03/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yurok Tribe et al v. United States Bureau of Reclamation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yurok Tribe
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Cheyenne Amanda Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Patti A. Goldman
Represented By: Trent William Orr
Represented By: Stephanie Kathleen Tsosie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Institute for Fisheries Resources
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Patti A. Goldman
Represented By: Trent William Orr
Represented By: Stephanie Kathleen Tsosie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Klamath Riverkeeper
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Represented By: Patti A. Goldman
Represented By: Trent William Orr
Represented By: Stephanie Kathleen Tsosie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Reclamation
Represented By: Coby Healy Howell
Represented By: Kaitlyn Poirier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Represented By: Coby Healy Howell
Represented By: Kaitlyn Poirier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Klamath Water Users Association
Represented By: Kristian Chenoweth Corby
Represented By: Richard Sterling Deitchman
Represented By: John Patrick Kinsey
Represented By: Paul Scott Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Sunnyside Irrigation District
Represented By: Kristian Chenoweth Corby
Represented By: Richard Sterling Deitchman
Represented By: John Patrick Kinsey
Represented By: Paul Scott Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Ben DuVal
Represented By: Kristian Chenoweth Corby
Represented By: Richard Sterling Deitchman
Represented By: John Patrick Kinsey
Represented By: Paul Scott Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Klamath Drainage District
Represented By: Kristian Chenoweth Corby
Represented By: Richard Sterling Deitchman
Represented By: Reagan Lee Desmond
Represented By: John Patrick Kinsey
Represented By: Aaron Lebenta
Represented By: Paul Scott Simmons
Represented By: Shannon Zollinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Klamath Irrigation District
Represented By: Kristian Chenoweth Corby
Represented By: Richard Sterling Deitchman
Represented By: Timothy Jones, Esq.
Represented By: John Patrick Kinsey
Represented By: Paul Scott Simmons
Represented By: Steven Kurt Vote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Pine Grove Irrigation District
Represented By: Kristian Chenoweth Corby
Represented By: Richard Sterling Deitchman
Represented By: Timothy Jones, Esq.
Represented By: John Patrick Kinsey
Represented By: Paul Scott Simmons
Represented By: Steven Kurt Vote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?