Monteville Sloan, Jr. v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff: Monteville Sloan, Jr., Raul Siqueiros, Joseph Brannan, Donald Ludington, Thomas Shorter, Gabriel Del Valle, Gail Lannom, Bradley K. Zierke, Ross Dahl, Drew Peterson, Barbara Molina, Steven Ehrke, Bill Mauch, Thomas Gulling, Ronald Jones and John Graziano
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv07244
Filed: December 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part the Parties' Daubert Motions 363 365 366 . (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2022)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 325 347 Defendant's Motions for Decertification. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2021)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 324 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/2/2021. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 291 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Granting in Part 287 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification; and Granting 289 Plaintiffs' Motion for a Determination of Manuel Fernandez's Adequacy to Serve as California's Class Representative. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part 255 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count 1; Denying 247 Defendant's Motion to Decertify the California Class; and Granting 246 259 Plaintiffs' Motion to Intervene. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 184 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Granting in Part 175 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification; and Denying 201 Defendant's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2020)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 221 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration and Dismissing the Claims of Additional Plaintiffs. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 158 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Szep's Claims in the Fifth Amended Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 162 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Class Certification Motion and Exhibits. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 141 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint. Motion hearing set for 7/11/2019 01:30 PM is VACATED. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 115 for Modification of Case Schedule filed by Dennis Vita,, etc. Amended Pleadings due by 3/16/2019. Discovery due by 3/16/2019. Motion Hearing re: class certification set for 9/19/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/13/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 105 Protective order. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/14/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2018)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 103 Timing of Filing Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/9/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2018)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 101 Motion for Leave to File Partial Motion for Reconsideration; no further filing is necessary. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 70 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 91 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION filed by Dennis Vita, Derick Bradford, Edwin Doepel, Joseph Olivier, Katelyn Doepel, Marc Perkins, Rudy Sanchez, Bradley K. Zierke , Ted Edgecomb, Gabriel Del Valle, Dan Madson, James Robertson, Drew Peterson, Christopher Thacker, Mike Warpinski, James Faulkner, Joshua Byrge, Steve Kitchen, Joseph Brannan, Todd Cralley, Thomas Shorter, Steven Ehrke, Larry Goodwin, Jill Cralley, John Neubauer, Michael Ware, Kevin Hanneken, Donald Ludington, Ross Dahl, Jonas Bednarek, Barbara Molina, William Martell, Kelly Harris, Bill Mauch, Raul Siqueiros, John Graziano, Scott Smith, Gail Lannom, Monteville Sloan, Jr., Ronald Jones, Doepel Katelyn, Randy Clausen, Thomas Gulling. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/9/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 AMENDED ORDER RE: SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. BRIEFS DUE BY THURS DEC 28, 2017. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on December 20, 2017. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 75 RE HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Motion and CMC set for 1/10/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/5/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 68 Stipulation and Proposed Order Re Briefing Of Motion To Dismiss Second Amended Complaint And Case Management Conference filed by General Motors LLC Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2017. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 12/14/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion to Dismiss due 10/10/2017. Motion to Dismiss hearing set for 12/14/17 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/14/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 47 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 35 Re Briefing Of Motion To Dismiss And Rescheduling Of Case Management Conference filed by General Motors LLC Case Management Statement due by 8/10/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/17/2017 0 9:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 7/6/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/9/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monteville Sloan, Jr. v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monteville Sloan, Jr.
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Lori Erin Andrus
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Andrew England Brashier
Represented By: Mark A DiCello
Represented By: Daniel Richard Ferri
Represented By: Archibald Irwin Grubb, II
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: John Ernst Tangren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Siqueiros
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Lori Erin Andrus
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Andrew England Brashier
Represented By: Mark A DiCello
Represented By: Daniel Richard Ferri
Represented By: Archibald Irwin Grubb, II
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: John Ernst Tangren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Brannan
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Lori Erin Andrus
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Andrew England Brashier
Represented By: Mark A DiCello
Represented By: Daniel Richard Ferri
Represented By: Archibald Irwin Grubb, II
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: John Ernst Tangren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Ludington
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Lori Erin Andrus
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Andrew England Brashier
Represented By: Mark A DiCello
Represented By: Daniel Richard Ferri
Represented By: Archibald Irwin Grubb, II
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: John Ernst Tangren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Shorter
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Lori Erin Andrus
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Andrew England Brashier
Represented By: Mark A DiCello
Represented By: Daniel Richard Ferri
Represented By: Archibald Irwin Grubb, II
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: John Ernst Tangren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Del Valle
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Lori Erin Andrus
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Andrew England Brashier
Represented By: Mark A DiCello
Represented By: Daniel Richard Ferri
Represented By: Archibald Irwin Grubb, II
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: John Ernst Tangren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Lannom
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Lori Erin Andrus
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Andrew England Brashier
Represented By: Mark A DiCello
Represented By: Daniel Richard Ferri
Represented By: Archibald Irwin Grubb, II
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: John Ernst Tangren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley K. Zierke
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Lori Erin Andrus
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Andrew England Brashier
Represented By: Mark A DiCello
Represented By: Daniel Richard Ferri
Represented By: Archibald Irwin Grubb, II
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: John Ernst Tangren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Dahl
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Lori Erin Andrus
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Andrew England Brashier
Represented By: Mark A DiCello
Represented By: Daniel Richard Ferri
Represented By: Archibald Irwin Grubb, II
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: John Ernst Tangren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drew Peterson
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Lori Erin Andrus
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Andrew England Brashier
Represented By: Mark A DiCello
Represented By: Daniel Richard Ferri
Represented By: Archibald Irwin Grubb, II
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: John Ernst Tangren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Molina
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Lori Erin Andrus
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Andrew England Brashier
Represented By: Mark A DiCello
Represented By: Daniel Richard Ferri
Represented By: Archibald Irwin Grubb, II
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: John Ernst Tangren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Ehrke
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Lori Erin Andrus
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Andrew England Brashier
Represented By: Mark A DiCello
Represented By: Daniel Richard Ferri
Represented By: Archibald Irwin Grubb, II
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: John Ernst Tangren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Mauch
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Lori Erin Andrus
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Andrew England Brashier
Represented By: Mark A DiCello
Represented By: Daniel Richard Ferri
Represented By: Archibald Irwin Grubb, II
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: John Ernst Tangren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Gulling
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Lori Erin Andrus
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Andrew England Brashier
Represented By: Mark A DiCello
Represented By: Daniel Richard Ferri
Represented By: Archibald Irwin Grubb, II
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: John Ernst Tangren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Jones
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Lori Erin Andrus
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Andrew England Brashier
Represented By: Mark A DiCello
Represented By: Daniel Richard Ferri
Represented By: Archibald Irwin Grubb, II
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: John Ernst Tangren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Graziano
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Andrew England Brashier
Represented By: Mark A DiCello
Represented By: Daniel Richard Ferri
Represented By: Archibald Irwin Grubb, II
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: John Ernst Tangren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?