Regents of University of California et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Regents of University of California, Janet Napolitano and UC Regents
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, Elaine Duke, Former Federal Immigration and Homeland Security Officials, Association of California School Administrators, San Diego Unified School District and Kirstjen Nielson
Petitioner: City of Seattle, U.S. Conference of Mayors, City of West Hollywood, Jirayut Latthivongskorn, County of Santa Clara, Viridiana Chabolla Mendoza, State of California, City of Minneapolis, City and County of Denver, City of Philadelphia, City of Somerville, Cook County, City Of San Jose, State of Maine, Dulce Garcia, City of Cambridge, District of Columbia, City of los Angeles, City of Houston, City of Boston, City of Tucson, City of Rochester, City of Portland, Saul Jimenez Suarez, City of New York, State of Maryland, City of Chelsea, City of Chicago, City of Sacramento, City and County of San Francisco, City of Providence, King County, Norma Ramirez, City of Santa Monica, City of Austin, City and County of Honolulu, City of Oakland, Miriam Gonzalez Avila, SEIU Local 521 and State of Minnesota
Amicus Curiae: Services, Immigrant Rights, and Education Network, West Contra Costa Unified School District, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, State Center Community College District, Hampshire College, National Education Association Of The United States, Vassar College, Capital Community College, University of Connecticut, Harvard University, Quinebaug Valley Community College, Yelp Inc., Duke University, Cornell University, Bucknell University, Dolores Street Community Services, Princeton University, Emerson College, LatinoJustice PRLDEF, University of Maryland, Pace University, Housatonic Community College, Manchester Community College, Charter Oak State College, Northwestern Community College, Lawrence University, Vanderbilt University, Naugatuck Valley Community College, Centro Legal de la Raza, Bowdoin College, Heartland Alliance's National Immigrant Justice Center, Immigrant Legal Resource Center, California School Boards Association, Moreno Valley Unified School District, Georgetown University, Amherst College, Yale University, University of Michigan, Los Angeles Community College District, Canal Alliance, Southern Connecticut State University, Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, Northeastern University, Barnard College, Immigration Reform Law Institute, Colgate University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Riverside Community College District, California Institute of Technology, Asian Law Alliance, Boston University, Gateway Community College, Los Angeles Unified School District, Airbnb, Inc., Central Connecticut State University, Western Connecticut State University, Tunxis Community College, San Mateo Community College District, 108 Companies, Smith College, Stanford University, Northwestern University, Middlesex Community College, Tufts University, Washington University in St. Louis, Square, Inc., University of Chicago, Columbia University, Emory University, Los Angeles County Superintendent of Schools, Dartmouth College, County of Los Angeles, University of Pennsylvania, Los Angeles County Board of Education, Brandeis University, OneJustice, Three Rivers Community College, California Teachers Association, George Washington University, Current and Former Law Enforcement Leaders, Middlebury College, Asnuntuck Community College, Williams College, Colby College, Rice University, Berkeley Unified School District, Brown University, Los Rios Community College District, Oakland Unified School District, Wellesley College, Norwalk Community College, Eastern Connecticut State University, Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto, Twitter, Inc., Sacramento City Unified School District, Case Western Reserve University, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, California Faculty Association, Mount Holyoke College, San Francisco Community College District, Legal Services for Children, Carnegie Mellon University and The Bar Association of San Francisco
Case Number: 3:2017cv05211
Filed: September 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
2 Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 308 CLERK'S NOTICE. The Further Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2020 is continued to 10/22/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER of USCA No. 18-80037.Petitioners' unopposed motion to withdraw this petition is granted. The petition is withdrawn. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 306 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Ivano Michael Ventresca (Ventresca, Ivano) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 305 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2020 at 12:00 PM. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)11(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020) Modified on 9/1/2020 (amd2S, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/1/2020 (amd2S, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2020 Filing 304 Letter from State of California Request for Status Conference. (Zahradka, James) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 303 MANDATE of USCA. Nos. 18-15068, 15-15069, 18-15070, 18-15071, 18-15072, 18-15128, 18-15133, 18-15134.The judgment of this Court, entered August 04, 2020, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER of USCA re 18-15065 in 17-cv-05211-WHA; 18-15069 in 17-cv-05235-WHA; 18-15070 in 17-cv-05329-WHA; 18-15071 in 17-cv-05380-WHA; 18-15072 in 17-cv-05813-WHA. In light of the Supreme Court's decision in Department of Homeland Security v. Regents of the University of California, 140 S. Ct. 1891 (2020), we remand these cases to the district court for further proceedings consistent with the Supreme Courts opinion, which held that the Department of Homeland Securitys rescission of the Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals program "was arbitrary and capricious in violation of the [Administrative Procedure Act]," id. at 1915. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 301 NOTICE by Kirstjen Nielson, United States Department of Homeland Security (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Wolf Memorandum)(Pezzi, Stephen) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 300 U.S. Supreme Court JUDGMENT as to (89 in 3:17-cv-05235-WHA) Notice of Appeal, filed by Kirstjen Nielson, United States of America, United States Department of Homeland Security, (241 in 3:17-cv-05211-WHA) Notice of Appeal, filed by Kirstjen Nielson, United States Department of Homeland Security, (72 in 3:17-cv-05329-WHA) Notice of Appeal, filed by Kirstjen Nielson, United States of America, Donald J. Trump, (66 in 3:17-cv-05380-WHA) Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kirstjen Nielson, United States of America, Donald J. Trump, (54 in 3:17-cv-05813-WHA) Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kirstjen Nielson, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, Donald J. Trump. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 299 NOTICE by Kirstjen Nielson, United States Department of Homeland Security of Filing of Quarterly Summary Reports (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Quarterly Report, #2 Ex. B - Demographics Report)(Pezzi, Stephen) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER of U.S. Supreme Court (USCA case no. 18-80008). (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 297 NOTICE by Kirstjen Nielson, United States Department of Homeland Security of Filing of Quarterly Summary Reports (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Quarterly Report, #2 Ex. B - Demographics Report)(Pezzi, Stephen) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 296 NOTICE by Brown University, California Institute of Technology, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Emory University, George Washington University, Georgetown University, Harvard University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Northwestern University, Princeton University, Stanford University, University of Chicago, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Washington University in St. Louis, Yale University (Notice of Withdrawal of Certain Counsel re: Jennifer B. Sokoler) (Chopra, Apalla) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 27, 2020 Filing 295 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Karen Lin (Lin, Karen) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 294 NOTICE by Kirstjen Nielson, United States Department of Homeland Security of Filing of Quarterly Summary Reports (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Quarterly Report, #2 Ex. B - Demographics Report)(Pezzi, Stephen) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
October 11, 2019 Filing 293 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Kate Bailey (Bailey, Kate) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 292 NOTICE by Kirstjen Nielson, United States Department of Homeland Security of Filing of Quarterly Summary Reports (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Quarterly Report, #2 Ex. B - Demographics Report)(Pezzi, Stephen) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 291 Supreme Court of the United States Case Number 18-587 re #283 Appeal Remark. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 290 NOTICE by Kirstjen Nielson, United States Department of Homeland Security (Attachments: #1 Ex. A: Quarterly Report, #2 Ex. B: Demographics Report)(Pezzi, Stephen) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 289 NOTICE by Janet Napolitano, UC Regents of Withdrawal of Counsel - Monica Ramirez Almadani (Almadani, Monica) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
April 24, 2019 Filing 288 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeffrey Michael Davidson (Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/24/2019)
April 19, 2019 Filing 287 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Ronald Hak King Lee FOR PLAINTIFF STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Lee, Ronald) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 286 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Brett A. Shumate filed by United States Department of Homeland Security. Responses due by 4/25/2019. Replies due by 5/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shumate, Brett) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 1, 2019 Filing 285 NOTICE by Kirstjen Nielson, United States Department of Homeland Security of Filing of Quarterly Summary Reports (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Quarterly Report, #2 Exhibit B: Demographics Report)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 284 MANDATE of USCA as to (89 in 3:17-cv-05235-WHA) Notice of Appeal, filed by Kirstjen Nielson, United States of America, United States Department of Homeland Security, (241 in 3:17-cv-05211-WHA) Notice of Appeal, filed by Kirstjen Nielson, United States Department of Homeland Security, (72 in 3:17-cv-05329-WHA) Notice of Appeal, filed by Kirstjen Nielson, United States of America, Donald J. Trump, (66 in 3:17-cv-05380-WHA) Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kirstjen Nielson, United States of America, Donald J. Trump, (54 in 3:17-cv-05813-WHA) Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kirstjen Nielson, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, Donald J. Trump (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 283 Appeal Remark Letter from US Supreme Court (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 282 NOTICE by Janet Napolitano, UC Regents -- Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Mincer, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 2, 2019 Filing 281 NOTICE by Kirstjen Nielson, United States Department of Homeland Security of Filing of Quarterly Summary Reports (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Quarterly Report, #2 Exhibit B: Demographics Report)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
November 8, 2018 Filing 280 USCA JUDGMENT as to (89 in 3:17-cv-05235-WHA) Notice of Appeal, filed by Kirstjen Nielson, United States of America, United States Department of Homeland Security, (241 in 3:17-cv-05211-WHA) Notice of Appeal, filed by Kirstjen Nielson, United States Department of Homeland Security, (72 in 3:17-cv-05329-WHA) Notice of Appeal, filed by Kirstjen Nielson, United States of America, Donald J. Trump, (66 in 3:17-cv-05380-WHA) Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kirstjen Nielson, United States of America, Donald J. Trump, (54 in 3:17-cv-05813-WHA) Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kirstjen Nielson, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, Donald J. Trump (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
October 1, 2018 Filing 279 NOTICE by Kirstjen Nielson, United States Department of Homeland Security of Filing of Quarterly Summary Reports (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Quarterly Report, #2 Exhibit B: Demographics Report)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER RE #97 PENDING DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 277 NOTICE by Kirstjen Nielson, United States Department of Homeland Security - Filing of Quarterly Summary Reports (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Quarterly Report, #2 Exhibit B: Demographics Report)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SALLIE KIM FOR DISCOVERY PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/26/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2018)
May 29, 2018 Filing 275 NOTICE by Kirstjen Nielson, United States Department of Homeland Security (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Feb. 26, 2018 PI in Inland Empire, #2 Exhibit 2: March 20, 2018 Modified Order in Inland Empire)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
April 7, 2018 Filing 274 NOTICE by Kirstjen Nielson, United States Department of Homeland Security re #234 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #272 Notice (Other), - Filing of Corrected Quarterly Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Corrected Quarterly Report)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 4/7/2018)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 4/4/2018. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 2, 2018 Filing 272 NOTICE by Kirstjen Nielson, United States Department of Homeland Security re #234 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Filing of Quarterly Summary Reports (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Quarterly Report, #2 Exhibit B: Demographics Report)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
March 30, 2018 Filing 271 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Janine Marie Lopez (Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lopez, Janine) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 22, 2018 Filing 270 USCA Acknowledgment of Receipt for Permission to Appeal: Case Number 18-80037 USCA 9th Circuit (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 269 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Danielle C Gray (Gray, Danielle) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER of USCA re motion and panel of Ninth Circuit Judges. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER RE DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS TO MOVE FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/8/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 266 RENEWED ORDER TO COMPLETE THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/8/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
February 28, 2018 Filing 265 US Supreme Court Order denying petition for a writ of certiorari re appeal no. 18-15068 (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER of US SUPREME COURT The petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment is denied without prejudice. It is assumed that the Court of Appeals will proceed expeditiously to decide this case; as to #241 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kirstjen Nielson, United States Department of Homeland Security (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018)
February 26, 2018 Filing 263 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 9/21/2017; 10/03/2017; 10/16/2017; 12/20/2017 before Judge Hon. William H. Alsup, re #256 USCA Order, #255 USCA Order, #257 USCA Order, #241 Notice of Appeal, Transcript due by 3/26/2018. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
February 22, 2018 Filing 262 U.S. Supreme Court Receipt acknowledging Petition for Writ of Certiorari filed on 1/18/18 as No. 17-1003. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2018)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER of Supreme Court of U.S. Washington DC re filing of petition for writ of certiorari as to (92 in 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 251 in 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 75 in 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 69 in 3:17-cv-05380-WHA, 57 in 3:17-cv-05813-WHA) USCA Case Number,,, (62 in 3:17-cv-05813-WHA, 97 in 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 75 in 3:17-cv-05380-WHA, 255 in 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 80 in 3:17-cv-05329-WHA) USCA Order, (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
February 1, 2018 Filing 260 USCA Case Number 18-15134 USCA 9th Circuit and Time Schedule Order (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
February 1, 2018 Filing 259 USCA Case Number 18-15133 USCA 9th Circuit and Time Schedule Order (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
February 1, 2018 Filing 258 USCA Case Number 18-15128 USCA 9th Circuit and Time Schedule Order (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER of USCA granting petition for permission to appeal as to (79 in 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 96 in 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 61 in 3:17-cv-05813-WHA, 74 in 3:17-cv-05380-WHA, 254 in 3:17-cv-05211-WHA) USCA Case Number 18-80008 (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER of USCA granting petition for permission to appeal as to (253 in 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 73 in 3:17-cv-05380-WHA, 60 in 3:17-cv-05813-WHA, 95 in 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 78 in 3:17-cv-05329-WHA) USCA Case Number 18-80007 (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER of USCA granting petition for permission to appeal as to (92 in 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 251 in 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 75 in 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 69 in 3:17-cv-05380-WHA, 57 in 3:17-cv-05813-WHA) USCA Case Number 18-80004 (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
January 31, 2018 Filing 254 USCA Case Number 18-80008 USCA 9th Circuit acknowledgment receipt of Petition for Permission to Appeal. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
January 31, 2018 Filing 253 USCA Case Number 18-80007 USCA 9th Circuit for Acknowledgment of Receipt for Permission to Appeal. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
January 31, 2018 Filing 252 Judgment of Supreme Court of United States Washington DC re Writ of Mandamus (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
January 26, 2018 Filing 251 USCA Acknowledgment of Receipt of Permission to Appeal 18-80004 USCA 9th Circuit for (89 in 3:17-cv-05235-WHA) Notice of Appeal, filed by Kirstjen Nielson, United States of America, United States Department of Homeland Security, (241 in 3:17-cv-05211-WHA) Notice of Appeal, filed by Kirstjen Nielson, United States Department of Homeland Security, (72 in 3:17-cv-05329-WHA) Notice of Appeal, filed by Kirstjen Nielson, United States of America, Donald J. Trump, (66 in 3:17-cv-05380-WHA) Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kirstjen Nielson, United States of America, Donald J. Trump, (54 in 3:17-cv-05813-WHA) Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kirstjen Nielson, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, Donald J. Trump. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 26, 2018 Filing 250 USCA Case Number 18-15068 USCA 9th Circuit for #241 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kirstjen Nielson, United States Department of Homeland Security. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 26, 2018 Filing 249 STATUS REPORT JOINT REPORT RE DISCUSSIONS RE SCOPE OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by State of California, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota. (Zahradka, James) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 25, 2018 Filing 248 Notice of Appeal FEE PAID (Filing fee$505,receipt number 0971-12056328). (Ventresca, Ivano) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER GRANTING (246) STIPULATION RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINTS AND TO SEEK LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINTS by Judge William Alsup.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 23, 2018 Filing 246 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #234 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #239 Order on Motion to Dismiss RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINTS AND TO SEEK LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINTS filed by State of California, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota. (Zahradka, James) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 22, 2018 Filing 245 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Discovery Hearing currently set for 1/30/2018 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim is vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER RE SCOPE OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD AND DISCOVERY STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/22/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 19, 2018 Filing 243 RESPONSE to re #240 Order (Foloow-Up Request re Completion of the Administrative Record and Discovery) by Kirstjen Nielson, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 Filing 242 RESPONSE to re #240 Order -- Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Response to Follow-Up Request re Completion of Administrative Record and Discovery, by Janet Napolitano, UC Regents. (Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 16, 2018 Filing 241 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals (case# 18-15068 ) filed by Kirstjen Nielson, United States Department of Homeland Security. Appeal of Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction #234 , Order on Motion to Dismiss #239 (Appeal fee FEE WAIVED.) (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 1/16/2018) Modified on 1/26/2018 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2018 Filing 240 FOLLOW-UP REQUEST RE COMPLETION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD AND DISCOVERY, AND VACATING CERTAIN DATES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/12/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #114 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FRCP 12(b)(6) by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 11, 2018 Filing 238 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Discovery Hearing held on 1/11/2018. The Court and parties discuss the status of discovery. Further Discovery Hearing set for 1/30/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Defense counsel may appear by telephone. (FTR Time: 10:32-10:41.) Plaintiff Attorney: Jeffrey Davidson; James Zahradka; Eric Brown; Justin Berger; Kelsey Helland. Defendant Attorney: Brad Rosenberg (by telephone). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/11/2018)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY HEARING ON 1/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 1/10/2018. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 10, 2018 Filing 236 CLERK'S NOTICE Correcting Date/Time of Discovery Hearing: Discovery Hearing set for 1/11/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2018) Modified on 1/10/2018 (mklS, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2018 Filing 235 CLERK'S NOTICE: Discovery Hearing set for 1/10/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Personal appearances are preferred, but given the short notice counsel may appear by telephone. Only one attorney per party to speak if appearing by telephone, although other attorneys for the same party may listen to the hearing. Attorneys wishing to participate by telephone shall contact the Court by email to SKCRD@cand.uscourts.gov to request the dial-in information. In the email, counsel shall identify which party they represent and the name(s) of the attorney(s) that will be appearing. The Court will issue a follow up order with specific topics to be addressed during the hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER DENYING #114 FRCP 12(b)(1) DISMISSAL AND GRANTING #111 PROVISIONAL RELIEF (granting #227 ) by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
January 8, 2018 Filing 233 Supplemental Brief Re Hawaii v. Trump filed byState of California, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota. (Zahradka, James) (Filed on 1/8/2018)
January 8, 2018 Filing 232 Supplemental Brief re #229 Order Regarding the Ninth Circuit's Decision in Hawaii v. Trump filed byKirstjen Nielson, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Related document(s) #229 ) (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 1/8/2018)
January 8, 2018 Filing 231 DISREGARD PER FILER RQST. Supplemental Brief Re Hawaii v. Trump filed byState of California, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota. (Zahradka, James) (Filed on 1/8/2018) Modified on 1/8/2018 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2018 Filing 230 RESPONSE to re #227 Request for Judicial Notice, #228 Order by Kirstjen Nielson, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brad P. Rosenberg (attaching exhibit), #2 Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
January 3, 2018 Filing 229 REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/3/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
January 3, 2018 Filing 228 REQUEST FOR GOVERNMENT TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/3/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
January 2, 2018 Filing 227 Request for Judicial Notice re #205 Opposition/Response to Motion, #111 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction -- Plaintiffs' Motion for Provisional Relie filed byJanet Napolitano, UC Regents. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Davidson, #2 Exhibit A to Davidson Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #205 , #111 ) (Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/2/2018)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER of USCA regarding Government's threshold arguments and certification for appeal (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2017)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 225 STAY OF NOVEMBER 20 ORDER #197 . Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/21/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 Filing 224 PER CURIAM of Supreme Court of the United States on Petition for Writ of Mandamus vacating judgment of USCA and remanding case. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 Filing 223 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/20/2017, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (222 in 3:17-cv-05211-WHA) Transcript Order, (220 in 3:17-cv-05211-WHA) Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2018. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 20, 2017 Filing 222 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/20/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Janet Napolitano, UC Regents, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 20, 2017 Filing 221 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 12/20/2017 re #114 MOTION to Dismiss All N.D. Cal. DACA Cases and Memorandum in Support filed by Elaine Duke, United States Department of Homeland Security; #111 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction -- Plaintiffs' Motion for Provisional Relie filed by UC Regents, Janet Napolitano. Motions are submitted. Total Time in Court: 3 Hours; 40 Minutes. Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn. Plaintiff Attorneys: Jeffrey Davidson, Megan Crowley, Alexander Berengaut, Mark Lynch, Lanny Breuer, James Zahradka, Brian Danitz, Mark Rosenbaum, Ethan Dettmer, Eric Brown. Defendant Attorneys: Brad Rosenberg, Kate Bailey, Brett Shumate. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/20/2017)
December 20, 2017 Filing 220 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/20/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Elaine Duke, United States Department of Homeland Security, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 8, 2017 Filing 219 REPLY (re #111 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction -- Plaintiffs' Motion for Provisional Relie ) filed byJanet Napolitano, UC Regents. (Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/8/2017) Modified on 12/8/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2017 Filing 218 REPLY (re #114 MOTION to Dismiss All N.D. Cal. DACA Cases and Memorandum in Support ) filed byElaine Duke, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 6, 2017 Filing 217 NOTICE OF FILING OF STATEMENT OF DISTRICT COURT IN RESPONSE TO APPLICATION FOR A STAY Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/6/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 5, 2017 Filing 216 RESPONSE to the Court's Request to Counsel by Janet Napolitano, UC Regents. (Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
December 4, 2017 Filing 215 REQUEST TO COUNSEL re #214 Notice (Other), filed by Elaine Duke, United States Department of Homeland Security Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/4/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 1, 2017 Filing 214 NOTICE by Elaine Duke, United States Department of Homeland Security of Filing of Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Application for a Stay in the United States Supreme Court (Attachments: #1 Petition for a Writ of Mandamus, #2 Application for a Stay)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MATTHEW PIERS PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup granting #203 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2017)
November 29, 2017 Filing 212 NOTICE by City Of San Jose of Withdrawal of Counsel (Berger, Justin) (Filed on 11/29/2017)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER of USCA denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Order by Judge William Alsup granting #159 Administrative Motion Leave to File Amicus Brief.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Order by Judge William Alsup granting #158 Administrative Motion Leave to File Amicus Brief.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Order by Judge William Alsup granting #157 Administrative Motion Leave to File Brief Amicus Brief.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Order by Judge William Alsup granting #156 Administrative Motion Leave to File Amicus Brief.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Order by Judge William Alsup granting #116 Administrative Motion Leave to File Amicus Brief.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 22, 2017 Filing 205 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #114 MOTION to Dismiss All N.D. Cal. DACA Cases and Memorandum in Support ) filed byJanet Napolitano, UC Regents. (Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 22, 2017 Filing 204 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #111 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction -- Plaintiffs' Motion for Provisional Relie ) filed byElaine Duke, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bailey, Kate) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 22, 2017 Filing 203 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11898021.) filed by Current and Former Law Enforcement Leaders. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attachment to Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, #2 Supplement Certificate of Admission To the Bar of Illinois)(Piers, Matthew) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 21, 2017 Filing 202 Memorandum of USCA regarding Administrative Record. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER of USCA regarding Motion for Stay. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER of USCA Dismissing Motion for Stay filed by government. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER of USCA denying petition (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 20, 2017 Filing 198 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Telephonic Discovery Hearing Re: #97 Discovery Letter Brief set for 11/21/2017 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim is vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 20, 2017 Filing 197 ONE-MONTH CONTINUANCE OF DUE DATE FOR AUGMENTED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD AND TEMPORARY STAY OF DISCOVERY by Judge Alsup re (190) Motion to Stay; re (191) Motion to Stay; re (192) Stipulation in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 20, 2017 Filing 196 RESPONSE to re #193 Order -- Plaintiffs' Response to Tentative Order by Janet Napolitano, UC Regents. (Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 20, 2017 Filing 195 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #190 MOTION to Stay re #79 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #188 Order ) and Regarding Court's Tentative Order (ECF No. 193) filed byElaine Duke, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 20, 2017 Filing 194 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Theodore Berger (Berger, Justin) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 TENTATIVE ORDER RE MOTIONS TO STAY DISCOVERY AND COMPLETION OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/20/2017. (Attachments: #1 Tentative Order)(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 19, 2017 Filing 192 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #190 MOTION to Stay re #79 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #188 Order , #191 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #80 Order, #79 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #49 Case Management Scheduling Order, #188 Order (Shortened Schedule) to Shorten Briefing Schedule filed by Elaine Duke, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 11/19/2017)
November 19, 2017 Filing 191 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #80 Order, #79 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #49 Case Management Scheduling Order, #188 Order (Shortened Schedule) filed by Elaine Duke, United States Department of Homeland Security. Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 11/20/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: 9th Cir. Stay Motion, #2 Exhibit B: 9th Cir. Order, #3 Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 11/19/2017)
November 19, 2017 Filing 190 MOTION to Stay re #79 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #188 Order filed by Janet Napolitano, UC Regents. Motion Hearing set for 12/28/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 12/4/2017. Replies due by 12/11/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Rodgers, Megan) (Filed on 11/19/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 189 CLERK'S NOTICE: Telephonic Discovery Hearing Re: #97 Discovery Letter Brief set for 11/21/2017 10:30 AM in Chambers-SF before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. The Court will circulate dial-in information to counsel by separate email. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER TO FILE COMPLETED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD AND PROPOSE SCHEDULE Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/16/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
November 14, 2017 Filing 187 NOTICE by Janet Napolitano, UC Regents -- Plaintiffs' Notice of Withdrawal of Doe 1's Declaration (Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER GRANTING #141 LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. SIGNED BY JUDGE WILLIAM ALSUP ON 11/8/2017.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE by Judge William Alsup granting #137 Administrative Motion leave to file amicus curiae brief.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE by Judge William Alsup granting #131 Administrative Motion leave to file amicus curiae brief.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Judge William Alsup granting #122 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JAMES HARRELL PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup granting #180 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER RE MOTION TO MAINTAIN ANONYMITY by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part (125) Administrative Motion maintain anonymity; granting in part and denying in part (126) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
November 7, 2017 Filing 180 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11860146.) filed by Former Federal Immigration and Homeland Security Officials. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment (Parties), #2 Exhibit District of Columbia- Certificate of Good Standing)(Harrell, James) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 7, 2017 Filing 179 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert Quoc Giang (Giang, Albert) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER GRANTING #163 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR ATTORNEY JANINE M. LOPEZ. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/7/2017.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER GRANTING #155 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR ATTORNEY ARI BENJAMIN ASHER HOLTZBLATT. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/7/2017.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER GRANTING #151 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY PATRICK J. CAROME. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/7/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER GRANTING #144 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY LINDSAY C. HARRISON. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/7/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY THOMAS PERRELLI PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup granting #143 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ISHAN BHABHA PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup granting #149 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY SETH WAXMAN PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup granting #146 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ANDREW PINCUS PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup granting #139 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY FERNANDO BOHORQUEZ, JR. PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup granting #127 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER GRANTING #142 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY KAREN LINN by Judge William Alsup.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER GRANTING #140 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY LAUREN GOLDMAN by Judge William Alsup.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 3, 2017 Filing 165 NOTICE of Appearance by James Landon McGinnis (McGinnis, James) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 3, 2017 Filing 164 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil A. Friedman Popovic (Popovic, Neil) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 3, 2017 Filing 163 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11849350.) filed by Airbnb, Inc., Square, Inc., Twitter, Inc., Yelp Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment (Parties), #2 Massachusetts - Certificate of Good Standing)(Lopez, Janine) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 162 NOTICE of Appearance by Kara Corinne Wilson (Wilson, Kara) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 161 NOTICE of Appearance by Joan Renxin Li (Li, Joan) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 160 NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen P. Alger (lead counsel) (Alger, Maureen) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 159 Administrative MOTION for leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief ISO Plaintiffs' Motion for Provisional Relief filed by Former Federal Immigration and Homeland Security Officials. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 11/15/2017. Replies due by 11/22/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brief of Former Federal Immigration and Homeland Security Officials as Amici Curiae ISO Plaintiffs' Motion for Provisional Relief, #2 Proposed Order)(Giang, Albert) (Filed on 11/1/2017) Modified on 11/2/2017 (wv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/2/2017 (wv, COURT STAFF
November 1, 2017 Filing 158 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A BRIEF AS AMICUS CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PROVISIONAL RELIEF filed by The Bar Association of San Francisco. Responses due by 11/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Deol, John-Paul) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 157 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Leave to File Amicus Brief Of 9 Counties And Ramsey County Attorney In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion For Provisional Relief filed by County of Los Angeles. Responses due by 11/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Brief of Amici Curiae, #2 Proposed Order)(Carter, Margaret) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 156 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Leave to File Amicus Brief Of Nineteen Universities In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion For Provisional Relief filed by Brown University, California Institute of Technology, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, George Washington University, Georgetown University, Harvard University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Northwestern University, Princeton University, Stanford University, University of Chicago, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Washington University in St. Louis, Yale University. Responses due by 11/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Brief of Amici Curiae, #2 Proposed Order)(Gray, Danielle) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 155 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11845105.) filed by Airbnb, Inc., Square, Inc., Twitter, Inc., Yelp Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment (Parties), #2 DC Court of Appeals - Certificate of Good Standing)(Holtzblatt, Ari) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 154 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer B Sokoler on behalf of Amici Curiae George Washington University and Washington University in St. Louis (Sokoler, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 153 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle C Gray on behalf of Amici Curiae George Washington University and Washington University in St. Louis (Gray, Danielle) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 152 NOTICE of Appearance by Apalla U. Chopra on behalf of Amici Curiae George Washington University and Washington University in St. Louis (Chopra, Apalla) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 151 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11845024.) filed by Airbnb, Inc., Square, Inc., Twitter, Inc., Yelp Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment (Parties), #2 District of Columbia: Certificate of Good Standing)(Carome, Patrick) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R. Suvor on behalf of Amicus Curiae County of Los Angeles (Suvor, Daniel) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 149 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11844870.) filed by Amherst College, Asnuntuck Community College, Barnard College, Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, Boston University, Bowdoin College, Brandeis University, Bucknell University, Capital Community College, Carnegie Mellon University, Case Western Reserve University, Central Connecticut State University, Charter Oak State College, Colby College, Colgate University, Eastern Connecticut State University, Emerson College, Gateway Community College, Hampshire College, Housatonic Community College, Lawrence University, Los Angeles Community College District, Los Rios Community College District, Manchester Community College, Middlebury College, Middlesex Community College, Mount Holyoke College, Naugatuck Valley Community College, Northeastern University, Northwestern Community College, Norwalk Community College, Pace University, Quinebaug Valley Community College, Rice University, Riverside Community College District, San Francisco Community College District, San Mateo Community College District, Smith College, Southern Connecticut State University, State Center Community College District, Three Rivers Community College, Tufts University, Tunxis Community College, University of Connecticut, University of Maryland, University of Michigan, Vassar College, Wellesley College, Western Connecticut State University, Williams College. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bhabha, Ishan) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by James Wesley Crooks on behalf of Amicus Curiae County of Los Angeles (Crooks, James) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Louise Carter on behalf of Amicus Curiae County of Los Angeles (Carter, Margaret) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 146 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11844801.) filed by Airbnb, Inc., Square, Inc., Twitter, Inc., Yelp Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment (Parties), #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Waxman, Seth) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 145 Proposed Order re #122 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae LatinoJustice PRLDEF, et al. in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief by LatinoJustice PRLDEF. (Kochsiek, Blythe) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 144 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11844811.) filed by Amherst College, Asnuntuck Community College, Barnard College, Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, Boston University, Bowdoin College, Brandeis University, Bucknell University, Capital Community College, Carnegie Mellon University, Case Western Reserve University, Central Connecticut State University, Charter Oak State College, Colby College, Colgate University, Eastern Connecticut State University, Emerson College, Gateway Community College, Hampshire College, Housatonic Community College, Lawrence University, Los Angeles Community College District, Los Rios Community College District, Manchester Community College, Middlebury College, Middlesex Community College, Mount Holyoke College, Naugatuck Valley Community College, Northeastern University, Northwestern Community College, Norwalk Community College, Pace University, Quinebaug Valley Community College, Rice University, Riverside Community College District, San Francisco Community College District, San Mateo Community College District, Smith College, Southern Connecticut State University, State Center Community College District, Three Rivers Community College, Tufts University, Tunxis Community College, University of Connecticut, University of Maryland, University of Michigan, Vassar College, Wellesley College, Western Connecticut State University, Williams College. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Harrison, Lindsay) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 143 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11844703.) filed by Amherst College, Asnuntuck Community College, Barnard College, Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, Boston University, Bowdoin College, Brandeis University, Bucknell University, Capital Community College, Carnegie Mellon University, Case Western Reserve University, Central Connecticut State University, Charter Oak State College, Colby College, Colgate University, Eastern Connecticut State University, Emerson College, Gateway Community College, Hampshire College, Housatonic Community College, Lawrence University, Los Angeles Community College District, Los Rios Community College District, Manchester Community College, Middlebury College, Middlesex Community College, Mount Holyoke College, Naugatuck Valley Community College, Northeastern University, Northwestern Community College, Norwalk Community College, Pace University, Quinebaug Valley Community College, Rice University, Riverside Community College District, San Francisco Community College District, San Mateo Community College District, Smith College, Southern Connecticut State University, State Center Community College District, Three Rivers Community College, Tufts University, Tunxis Community College, University of Connecticut, University of Maryland, University of Michigan, Vassar College, Wellesley College, Western Connecticut State University, Williams College. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Perrelli, Thomas) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 142 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11844608.) filed by 108 Companies. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lin, Karen) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 141 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae of Institutions of Higher Education in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Relief filed by Amherst College, Asnuntuck Community College, Barnard College, Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, Boston University, Bowdoin College, Brandeis University, Bucknell University, Capital Community College, Carnegie Mellon University, Case Western Reserve University, Central Connecticut State University, Charter Oak State College, Colby College, Colgate University, University of Connecticut, Eastern Connecticut State University, Emerson College, Gateway Community College, Hampshire College, Housatonic Community College, Lawrence University, Los Angeles Community College District, Los Rios Community College District, Manchester Community College, University of Maryland, University of Michigan, Middlebury College, Middlesex Community College, Mount Holyoke College, Naugatuck Valley Community College, Northeastern University, Northwestern Community College, Norwalk Community College, Pace University, Quinebaug Valley Community College, Rice University, Riverside Community College District, San Francisco Community College District, San Mateo Community College District, Smith College, Southern Connecticut State University, State Center Community College District, Three Rivers Community College, Tufts University, Tunxis Community College, Vassar College, Wellesley College, Western Connecticut State University, Williams College. Responses due by 11/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Brief Amici Curiae of Institutions of Higher Education in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Relief, #2 Proposed Order)(Hauck, Brian) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 140 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11844589.) filed by 108 Companies. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 139 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11844543.) filed by 108 Companies. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Pincus, Andrew) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance by John Nadolenco (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 137 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File an Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Provisional Relief filed by 108 Companies. Responses due by 11/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Pincus in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Amicus Brief of 108 Companies)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Judge William Alsup granting #112 Administrative Motion leave to file amicus curiae brief.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER GRANTING LEGAL SERVICES ORGANIZATIONS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Judge William Alsup granting #120 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY JOSE LUIS PEREZ by Judge William Alsup granting #132 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Nelson Feuer (Feuer, Michael) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 132 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jose Luis Perez ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11844259.) filed by LatinoJustice PRLDEF. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Golay, Blythe) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 131 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION filed by City and County of Denver, City and County of Honolulu, City and County of San Francisco, City of Boston, City of Cambridge, City of Chelsea, City of Chicago, City of Houston, City of Minneapolis, City of New York, City of Oakland, City of Philadelphia, City of Portland, City of Providence, City of Rochester, City of Sacramento, City of Santa Monica, City of Seattle, City of Somerville, City of Tucson, City of West Hollywood, City of los Angeles, Cook County, District of Columbia, King County, U.S. Conference of Mayors, City of Austin. Responses due by 12/20/2017. (Attachments: #1 BRIEF OF AMICI CURAE THE CITY OF LOS ANGELES, 25 ADDITIONAL CITIES AND COUNTIES AND THE UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF MAYORS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' JOINT MOTION FOR PROVISIONAL RELIEF IN ALL RELATED DACA PROCEEDINGS, #2 Proposed Order)(Dundas, Michael) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS by Judge William Alsup granting (110) Administrative Motion leave to file amicus curiae brief in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 3:17-cv-05380-WHA, 3:17-cv-05813-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting (115) Motion for Protective Order in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 3:17-cv-05380-WHA, 3:17-cv-05813-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Dundas (Dundas, Michael) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 127 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Fernando A. Bohorquez, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11843981.) filed by LatinoJustice PRLDEF. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Golay, Blythe) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 126 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Janet Napolitano, UC Regents. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Davidson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Exhibit SEALED Declaration of Doe 1, #3 Exhibit REDACTED Declaration of Doe 1, #4 Proposed Order)(Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 125 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to maintain the anonymity of Declarant Doe 1, filed by Janet Napolitano, UC Regents. Responses due by 11/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Davidson, #2 Proposed Order)(Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 124 Appendix Part 6 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Provisional Relief filed byJanet Napolitano, UC Regents. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Part 6 -- Exhibits VV-EEE, #2 Topical Index to Appendix)(Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 123 Certificate of Interested Entities by LatinoJustice PRLDEF re #122 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae LatinoJustice PRLDEF, et al. (Golay, Blythe) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 122 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae LatinoJustice PRLDEF, et al. filed by LatinoJustice PRLDEF. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 of Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae, #2 Exhibit 2 of Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae)(Golay, Blythe) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 121 Appendix Part 5 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Provisional Relief -- Attachment -- Declaration of Jesse Gabriel -- filed byJanet Napolitano, UC Regents. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Part 5 -- Gabriel Declaration Exs. A-Z, #2 Appendix Part 5 -- Gabriel Declaration Exhibits AA-JJ)(Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 120 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Provisional Relief filed by Canal Alliance, Centro Legal de la Raza, Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto, Dolores Street Community Services, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Heartland Alliance's National Immigrant Justice Center, Immigrant Legal Resource Center, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Legal Services for Children, OneJustice, Services, Immigrant Rights, and Education Network, Asian Law Alliance. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 11/15/2017. Replies due by 11/22/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Alger, Maureen) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 119 Appendix Part 4 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Provisional Relief filed byJanet Napolitano, UC Regents. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Part 4 -- Exhibits 79-98, #2 Appendix Part 4 -- Exhibits 99-108)(Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 118 Appendix Part 3 in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Provisional Relief filed byJanet Napolitano, UC Regents. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Part 3 -- Exhibits 44-59)(Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 117 Appendix Part 2 in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Provisional Relief filed byJanet Napolitano, UC Regents. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Part 2 -- Exhibit 25 part 2, #2 Appendix Part 2 -- Exhibit 25 part 3)(Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 116 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae filed by Current and Former Law Enforcement Leaders. Responses due by 11/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brief Amici Curiae, #2 Proposed Order)(Piers, Matthew) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 115 MOTION for Protective Order (Unopposed) filed by Viridiana Chabolla Mendoza, Dulce Garcia, Miriam Gonzalez Avila, Saul Jimenez Suarez, Jirayut Latthivongskorn, Norma Ramirez. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 11/15/2017. Replies due by 11/22/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 114 MOTION to Dismiss All N.D. Cal. DACA Cases and Memorandum in Support filed by Elaine Duke, United States Department of Homeland Security. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 11/22/2017. Replies due by 12/8/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 113 Appendix re #111 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction -- Plaintiffs' Motion for Provisional Relie filed byJanet Napolitano, UC Regents. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Part 1 -- Exhibits 1-14, #2 Appendix Part 1 -- Exhibit 15, #3 Appendix Part 1 -- Exhibits 16-24)(Related document(s) #111 ) (Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 112 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by National Education Association Of The United States, Association of California School Administrators, Berkeley Unified School District, Moreno Valley Unified School District, Association of California School Administrators, San Diego Unified School District, San Diego Unified School District, West Contra Costa Unified School District, California Faculty Association, California School Boards Association, California Teachers Association, Los Angeles County Superintendent of Schools, Los Angeles County Board of Education, Los Angeles Unified School District, Oakland Unified School District, Sacramento City Unified School District. Responses due by 11/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amicus Curiae Brief)(Leheny, Emma) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 111 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction -- Plaintiffs' Motion for Provisional Relie filed by Janet Napolitano, UC Regents. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 11/22/2017. Replies due by 12/8/2017. (Attachments: #1 Addendum A -- History of Deferred Action, #2 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Provisional Relief, #3 Proposed Order)(Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 110 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to file Amicus Brief filed by Immigration Reform Law Institute. Responses due by 11/22/2017. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Axelrod, Julie) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER of USCA regarding amicus briefs as to (21 in 3:17-cv-05813-WHA, 38 in 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 95 in 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 47 in 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 34 in 3:17-cv-05380-WHA) (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY JENNIFER SOKOLER by Judge William Alsup granting #107 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY DANIELLE GRAY by Judge William Alsup granting #106 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 31, 2017 Filing 107 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11838853.) filed by Brown University, California Institute of Technology, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, Georgetown University, Harvard University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Northwestern University, Princeton University, Stanford University, University of Chicago, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Yale University. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Sokoler, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 31, 2017 Filing 106 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11838814.) filed by Brown University, California Institute of Technology, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, Georgetown University, Harvard University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Northwestern University, Princeton University, Stanford University, University of Chicago, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Yale University. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gray, Danielle) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 30, 2017 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Apalla U. Chopra for Brown University, California Institute of Technology, University of Chicago, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, Georgetown University, Harvard University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Northwestern University, University of Pennsylvania, Princeton University, Stanford University, Vanderbilt University, and Yale University (Chopra, Apalla) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO AMEND PAGE LIMITS IN CONNECTION WITH MOTION FOR PROVISIONAL RELIEF by Judge William Alsup granting (103) Administrative Motion to alter page limits in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 3:17-cv-05380-WHA, 3:17-cv-05813-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 27, 2017 Filing 103 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Amend Page Limits in Connection with Forthcoming Motion for Provisional Relief re #49 Case Management Scheduling Order, #52 Transcript,,, filed by Janet Napolitano, UC Regents. Responses due by 10/31/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER of USCA regarding oral arguments and amicus briefs as to (21 in 3:17-cv-05813-WHA, 38 in 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 95 in 317-cv-05211-WHA, 47 in 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 34 in 3:17-cv-05380-WHA) (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING AMICUS BRIEFING AS MODIFIED by Judge William Alsup granting as modified (101) Stipulation in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 3:17-cv-05380-WHA, 3:17-cv-05813-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 Filing 101 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING AMICUS BRIEFING filed by City Of San Jose. (Fineman, Nancy) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE MOTION SCHEDULE Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/25/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 Filing 99 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 10/25/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim is vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 24, 2017 Filing 98 EXHIBITS re #97 Discovery Letter BriefJOINT LETTER BRIEF REGARDING APPLICATION OF THE ATTORNEY-CLIENT, DELIBERATIVE PROCESS AND EXECUTIVE PRIVILEGES TO DEPOSITION TESTIMONY EXHIBITS TO JOINT LETTER BRIEF REGARDING APPLICATION OF THE ATTORNEY-CLIENT, DELIBERATIVE PROCESS AND EXECUTIVE PRIVILEGES TO DEPOSITION TESTIMONY filed byState of California, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #97 ) (Zahradka, James) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 Filing 97 Discovery Letter BriefJOINT LETTER BRIEF REGARDING APPLICATION OF THE ATTORNEY-CLIENT, DELIBERATIVE PROCESS AND EXECUTIVE PRIVILEGES TO DEPOSITION TESTIMONY filed by State of California, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota. (Zahradka, James) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER RE: DEPOSITION OF ACTING SECRETARY OF HOMELAND SECURITY DUKE by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim (Re: (88) Discovery Letter Brief in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA). (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 Filing 93 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 10/24/2017. The Court and counsel discussed the issue regarding the deposition of Michael Dougherty. The Court rejected Plaintiffs' position. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 10/25/2017 at 10:00 AM (Pacific)/1:00 PM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. (Total Time in Court: 20 minutes.) (Not reported.) Attorney for Plaintiffs: Megan Crowley. Attorney for Defendants: Brad Rosenberg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting (91) Unopposed Administrative Motion for Additional Pages for Joint Discovery Letter Brief in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 23, 2017 Filing 91 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages NOTICE OF UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION AND MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL PAGES FOR JOINT LETTER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE filed by State of California, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Proposed Joint Letter, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Zahradka, James) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 Filing 90 EXHIBITS re #88 Discovery Letter BriefJOINT LETTER BRIEF REGARDING DEPOSITION OF ACTING SECRETARY OF HOMELAND SECURITY DUKE filed byState of California, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #88 ) (Zahradka, James) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 Filing 89 EXHIBITS re #88 Discovery Letter BriefJOINT LETTER BRIEF REGARDING DEPOSITION OF ACTING SECRETARY OF HOMELAND SECURITY DUKE EXHIBIT A filed byState of California, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #88 ) (Zahradka, James) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 Filing 88 Discovery Letter BriefJOINT LETTER BRIEF REGARDING DEPOSITION OF ACTING SECRETARY OF HOMELAND SECURITY DUKE filed by State of California, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota. (Zahradka, James) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 Filing 87 ANSWER BY DISTRICT COURT TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/23/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER of USCA re Petition for Writ of Mandamus (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 Filing 95 USCA Case Number 17-72917 USCA 9th Circuit re Petition for Writ of Mandamus (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 Filing 86 NOTICE by Elaine Duke, United States Department of Homeland Security of Filing of Petition for Writ of Mandamus (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER RE MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS by Judge William Alsup denying (81) Motion to Stay in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 3:17-cv-05380-WHA, 3:17-cv-05813-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
October 19, 2017 Filing 84 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #81 MOTION to Stay re #79 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Stay All Proceedings Pending Resolution of Petition for Writ of Mandamus ) filed byJanet Napolitano, UC Regents. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jesse S. Gabriel, #2 Exhibit A)(Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
October 19, 2017 Terminate Hearing re (15 in 3:17-cv-05813-WHA) Order on Stipulation, (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS by Judge William Alsup granting (82) Stipulation in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 3:17-cv-05380-WHA, 3:17-cv-05813-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
October 18, 2017 Filing 82 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #81 MOTION to Stay re #79 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Stay All Proceedings Pending Resolution of Petition for Writ of Mandamus re: Shortened Briefing Schedule filed by Elaine Duke, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 18, 2017 Filing 81 MOTION to Stay re #79 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Stay All Proceedings Pending Resolution of Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Elaine Duke, United States Department of Homeland Security. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 10/19/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER TO COMPILE SUPPLEMENT FORTHWITH re (12 in 3:17-cv-05813-WHA) Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/18/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER RE MOTION TO COMPLETE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Judge William Alsup granting in part and denying in part (65) Motion Complete Administrative Record in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 3:17-cv-05380-WHA, 3:17-cv-05813-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 17, 2017 Filing 78 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/16/17, before Judge Alsup. Court Reporter Pamela A. Batalo, telephone number pamela_batalo@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (74 in 3:17-cv-05211-WHA) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 11/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/16/2018. (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 16, 2017 Filing 77 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/16/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Janet Napolitano, UC Regents, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER RELATING CASE by Judge William Alsup granting (69) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 3:17-cv-05380-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 16, 2017 Filing 75 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 10/16/2017 re (65 in 3:17-cv-05211-WHA) MOTION for an Order Directing Defendants to Complete the Administrative Record filed by UC Regents, Janet Napolitano. Written Order to issue. Total Time in Court: 1:15. Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo. Plaintiff Attorney: Jeffery Davidson (Regents)Plaintiff Attorney: James Zahradka (State of CA)Plaintiff Attorney: Nancy Fineman (City of San Jose)Plaintiff Attorney: Kevin Yea (Garcia) Defendant Attorney: Brad Rosenberg (all defendants). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/16/2017)
October 16, 2017 Filing 74 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/16/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Elaine Duke, United States Department of Homeland Security, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 16, 2017 Filing 73 Clerk's Notice CONSENTING TO Video Recording re: #70 Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. (Related documents(s) #70 )(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 13, 2017 Filing 72 REPLY (re #65 MOTION for an Order Directing Defendants to Complete the Administrative Record ) filed byJanet Napolitano, UC Regents. (Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
October 12, 2017 Filing 71 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #65 MOTION for an Order Directing Defendants to Complete the Administrative Record ) filed byElaine Duke, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Privilege Log, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration, #6 Declaration)(Bailey, Kate) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
October 11, 2017 Filing 70 Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. Video Camera hearing set for 10/16/2017 11:00 AM. Objections to Video Recording due 10/13/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2017)
October 10, 2017 Filing 69 MOTION to Relate Case filed by County of Santa Clara, SEIU Local 521. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric P. Brown, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brown, Eric) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
October 10, 2017 Filing 68 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING: #65 MOTION for an Order Directing Defendants to Complete the Administrative Record rescheduled to 10/16/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR BRIEFING ON MOTION TO COMPLETE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Judge William Alsup re #66 Motion to Shorten Time in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA. Motion Hearing set for 10/16/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 3:17-cv-05380-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2017) Modified on 10/10/2017 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2017 Filing 66 Emergency MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Janet Napolitano, UC Regents. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Davidson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Order)(Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/9/2017)
October 9, 2017 Filing 65 MOTION for an Order Directing Defendants to Complete the Administrative Record filed by Janet Napolitano, UC Regents. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 10/10/2017. Replies due by 10/11/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Davidson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/9/2017)
October 6, 2017 Filing 64 NOTICE by Elaine Duke, United States Department of Homeland Security of Filing of Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Administrative Record)(Pezzi, Stephen) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 5, 2017 Filing 63 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 3, 2017, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (62 in 3:17-cv-05211-WHA) Transcript Order, (24 in 3:17-cv-05329-WHA) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2018. (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
October 4, 2017 Filing 62 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/3/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Janet Napolitano, UC Regents, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
October 4, 2017 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Kate Bailey (Bailey, Kate) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
October 3, 2017 Filing 60 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Tutorial Hearing held on 10/3/2017.Total Time in Court: 2 Hours, 15 Minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiffs' Attorneys: Regents: Jeffrey Davidson, Mark Lynch, Monica Almadani; Garcia: Mark Rosenbaum, Kelsey Helland, Ethan Dettmer, Luis Romero; City of San Jose: Nancy Fineman; State of CA: James Zahradka, Ronald Lee. Defendant's Attorneys: Brad Rosenberg, Jeffrey Robins.Also Present via Videoconference: District Judge Nicholas Garaufis (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/3/2017)
October 2, 2017 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Robins (Robins, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting (57) Stipulation in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 3:17-cv-05235-WHA, 3:17-cv-05329-WHA, 3:17-cv-05380-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 Filing 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #49 Case Management Scheduling Order, filed by Elaine Duke, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 27, 2017 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Yakov Mincer on behalf of Plaintiffs (Mincer, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 26, 2017 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 25, 2017 Filing 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before William Alsup: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/21/2017. Motion(s) hearing set for 12/20/2017 at 8:00 AM. Tutorial set for 10/3/2017 at 8:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2018 at 2:00 PM. Bench Trial set for 2/5/2018 at 7:30 AM. Case referred to Magistrate Sallie Kim for Discovery.Total Time in Court: 1:22. Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce. Plaintiff Attorney: Jeffrey Davidson; Alexander Berengaut; Alex Covington; Mark Lynch; James Zahradka; Nancy Fineman; Mark Rosenbaum; Ethan Dettmer. Defendant Attorney: Brad Rosenberg; Sara Winslow; Brett Shumate. Attachment: Civil Minutes. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 Filing 54 NOTICE OF REFERRAL FOR DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 9/25/2017. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Kim's Standing Order)(mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 FURTHER NOTICE RE TUTORIAL re (12 in 3:17-cv-05380-WHA) Case Management Scheduling Order, Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/25/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 22, 2017 Filing 52 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/21/17, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (45 in 3:17-cv-05211-WHA) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2017. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Filing 51 Letter from STATE OF CALIFORNIA, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL RE EQUITABLE ESTOPPEL. (Zahradka, James) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Set/Reset Hearing Tutorial Hearing set for 10/3/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Viridiana Chabolla Mendoza, Dulce Garcia, Miriam Gonzalez Avila, Saul Jimenez Suarez, Jirayut Latthivongskorn, Norma Ramirez re #49 Case Management Scheduling Order, (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR ALL DACA ACTIONS IN THIS DISTRICT: Bench Trial set for 2/5/2018 07:30 AM before Hon. William Alsup. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/22/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 21, 2017 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Erika M. Douglas on behalf of plaintiffs (Douglas, Erika) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 Filing 47 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/21/2017 before Hon. William Alsup by UC Regents, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Ventresca, Ivano) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 Filing 46 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on September 21, 2017 before Hon. William Alsup by City Of San Jose, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Fineman, Nancy) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 Filing 45 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/21/2017 before Hon. William Alsup by Elaine Duke, United States Department of Homeland Security, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 Filing 44 Clerk's Notice CONSENTING TO Video Recording re: #25 Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. (Related documents(s) #25 ) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2017) (tlS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/22/2017 (tlS, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER RELATING CASES by Judge Alsup granting (38) Motion to Relate Case; granting (42) Stipulation in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 Filing 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #38 MOTION to Relate Case filed by City Of San Jose. (Fineman, Nancy) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER RELATING CASES by Hon. William Alsup granting (39) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:17-cv-05211-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-05211-WHA, 3:17-cv-05235-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett A. Shumate (Shumate, Brett) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 19, 2017 Filing 39 MOTION to Relate Case and Stipulation and [Proposed] Order filed by Dulce Garcia, Viridiana Chabolla Mendoza, Miriam Gonzalez Avila, Norma Ramirez, Saul Jimenez Suarez, Jirayut Latthivongskorn. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ethan D. Dettmer, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Ethan D. Dettmer, #3 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 18, 2017 Filing 38 MOTION to Relate Case filed by City Of San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nancy L. Fineman in support of Administrative Motion of City of San Jose to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Nancy L. Fineman in support of Administrative Motion of City of San Jose to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Nancy L. Fineman in support of Administrative Motion of City of San Jose to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Nancy L. Fineman in support of Administrative Motion of City of San Jose to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related, #5 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion of City of San Jose to Consider Whether Cases should be Related)(Fineman, Nancy) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
September 18, 2017 Filing 37 NOTICE RE SEPTEMBER 21 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/18/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER RELATING CASES by Judge Alsup granting #33 Motion to Relate Case; granting #34 Stipulation (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
September 15, 2017 Filing 35 Declaration of James F. Zahradka II in Support of #33 MOTION to Relate Case filed byState of California, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #33 ) (Zahradka, James) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 15, 2017 Filing 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #33 MOTION to Relate Case filed by State of California, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota. (Zahradka, James) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 15, 2017 Filing 33 MOTION to Relate Case filed by State of California, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota. (Zahradka, James) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 15, 2017 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Janet Napolitano, Regents of University of California re #1 Complaint, (Ventresca, Ivano) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 15, 2017 Electronic filing error. Re: #27 Certificate of Service filed by Regents of University of California, Janet Napolitano. Please re-file in its entirety; Page 5 appears to be "corrupted". (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 15, 2017 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Brad Prescott Rosenberg (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. William Alsup finding as moot #29 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 14, 2017 Filing 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Elaine Duke, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Pezzi, Stephen) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 14, 2017 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Pezzi (Pezzi, Stephen) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 14, 2017 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Janet Napolitano, Regents of University of California re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #22 Order, Set Hearings, #23 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, #21 Notice of Appearance, #17 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #10 Notice of Appearance, #14 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #15 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #1 Complaint, #18 Summons Issued, #16 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, #20 Order Reassigning Case,, Case Assigned/Reassigned, #25 Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request, #12 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #11 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #13 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Ventresca, Ivano) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MEGAN CROWLEY PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2017)
September 13, 2017 Set/Reset Hearing Video Camera hearing set for 9/21/2017 10:30 AM. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2017)
September 13, 2017 Filing 25 Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. Video Camera hearing set for 9/21/2017 10:30 AM. Objections to Video Recording due 9/20/2017. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2017) Modified on 9/13/2017 (dl, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2017 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11711574.) filed by Janet Napolitano, Regents of University of California. (Crowley, Megan) (Filed on 9/13/2017)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #22 Order, Set Hearings. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/1/17. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2017)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/12/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2017)
September 12, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Douglas Bersin on behalf of Plaintiffs (Bersin, Alan) (Filed on 9/12/2017)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 9/12/17. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2017)
September 12, 2017 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Elaine Duke, United States Department of Homeland Security. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 17 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/30/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Janet Napolitano, Regents of University of California.. (Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Mark Lynch. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Alexander Berengaut (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lanny Breuer. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Ivano Ventresca.(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Ashley Nyquist. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 8, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica Marie-Ramirez Almadani on behalf of Plaintiffs (Almadani, Monica) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
September 8, 2017 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11701967.) filed by Janet Napolitano, Regents of University of California. (Lynch, Mark) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
September 8, 2017 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11701891.) filed by Janet Napolitano, Regents of University of California. (Berengaut, Alexander) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
September 8, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11701680.) filed by Janet Napolitano, Regents of University of California. (Breuer, Lanny) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
September 8, 2017 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11701332.) filed by Janet Napolitano, Regents of University of California. (Ventresca, Ivano) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
September 8, 2017 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/22/2017. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
September 8, 2017 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11700312.) filed by Janet Napolitano, Regents of University of California. (Anguas Nyquist, Ashley) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
September 8, 2017 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
September 8, 2017 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Janet Napolitano, Regents of University of California -- Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Local Rule 3-15 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
September 8, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Elaine Duke, United States Department of Homeland Security ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11699295). Filed by Regents of University of California, Janet Napolitano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/8/2017) Modified on 9/11/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regents of University of California et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Robins
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Represented By: Kate Bailey
Represented By: Brett A. Shumate
Represented By: Stephen M. Pezzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Former Federal Immigration and Homeland Security Officials
Represented By: James Wells Harrell
Represented By: Albert Quoc Giang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association of California School Administrators
Represented By: Emma Leheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Unified School District
Represented By: Emma Leheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielson
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Robins
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Represented By: Kate Bailey
Represented By: Brett A. Shumate
Represented By: Stephen M. Pezzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regents of University of California
Represented By: Monica Marie-Ramirez Almadani
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Davidson
Represented By: Ivano Michael Ventresca
Represented By: Lanny A Breuer
Represented By: Ashley Ciara Anguas Nyquist
Represented By: Mark H Lynch
Represented By: Alexander Berengaut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Napolitano
Represented By: Monica Marie-Ramirez Almadani
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Davidson
Represented By: Ivano Michael Ventresca
Represented By: Lanny A Breuer
Represented By: Ashley Ciara Anguas Nyquist
Represented By: Mark H Lynch
Represented By: Alexander Berengaut
Represented By: Norman J. Hamill
Represented By: Megan Louise Rodgers
Represented By: Megan A Crowley
Represented By: Margaret Louisa Wu
Represented By: Alan Douglas Bersin
Represented By: Jonathan Yakov Mincer
Represented By: Harpreet Kaur Chahal,
Represented By: Julia M.C. Friedlander
Represented By: Monica Ramirez Almadani
Represented By: Michael A. Troncoso
Represented By: Erika M. Douglas
Represented By: Charles Furlonge Robinson,
Represented By: Sonya Una Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UC Regents
Represented By: Norman J. Hamill
Represented By: Megan Louise Rodgers
Represented By: Megan A Crowley
Represented By: Mark H Lynch
Represented By: Margaret Louisa Wu
Represented By: Lanny A Breuer
Represented By: Alan Douglas Bersin
Represented By: Ivano Michael Ventresca
Represented By: Jonathan Yakov Mincer
Represented By: Harpreet Kaur Chahal,
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Davidson
Represented By: Ashley Ciara Anguas Nyquist
Represented By: Julia M.C. Friedlander
Represented By: Monica Ramirez Almadani
Represented By: Michael A. Troncoso
Represented By: Erika M. Douglas
Represented By: Charles Furlonge Robinson,
Represented By: Sonya Una Sanchez
Represented By: Alexander Berengaut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Seattle
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: U.S. Conference of Mayors
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of West Hollywood
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jirayut Latthivongskorn
Represented By: Ethan D. Dettmer
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: County of Santa Clara
Represented By: Eric Prince Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Viridiana Chabolla Mendoza
Represented By: Ethan D. Dettmer
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of California
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Davidson
Represented By: Nancy L. Fineman
Represented By: Eric Prince Brown
Represented By: Alan Douglas Bersin
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: James F. Zahradka, II
Represented By: Ronald Hak King Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Minneapolis
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City and County of Denver
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Philadelphia
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Somerville
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cook County
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City Of San Jose
Represented By: Nancy L. Fineman
Represented By: Justin Theodore Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Maine
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Davidson
Represented By: Nancy L. Fineman
Represented By: Eric Prince Brown
Represented By: Alan Douglas Bersin
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: James F. Zahradka, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dulce Garcia
Represented By: Ethan D. Dettmer
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Cambridge
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: District of Columbia
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of los Angeles
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Houston
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Boston
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Tucson
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Rochester
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Portland
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Saul Jimenez Suarez
Represented By: Ethan D. Dettmer
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of New York
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Maryland
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Davidson
Represented By: Nancy L. Fineman
Represented By: Eric Prince Brown
Represented By: Alan Douglas Bersin
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: James F. Zahradka, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Chelsea
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Chicago
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Sacramento
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Providence
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: King County
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Norma Ramirez
Represented By: Ethan D. Dettmer
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Santa Monica
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Austin
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City and County of Honolulu
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Oakland
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Miriam Gonzalez Avila
Represented By: Ethan D. Dettmer
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SEIU Local 521
Represented By: Eric Prince Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Davidson
Represented By: Nancy L. Fineman
Represented By: Eric Prince Brown
Represented By: Alan Douglas Bersin
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: James F. Zahradka, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Services, Immigrant Rights, and Education Network
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Represented By: Joan Renxin Li
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: West Contra Costa Unified School District
Represented By: Emma Leheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Represented By: Joan Renxin Li
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State Center Community College District
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Hampshire College
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Education Association Of The United States
Represented By: Emma Leheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Vassar College
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Capital Community College
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: University of Connecticut
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Harvard University
Represented By: Danielle C Gray
Represented By: Apalla U. Chopra
Represented By: Jennifer B Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Quinebaug Valley Community College
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Yelp Inc.
Represented By: Ari Holtzblatt
Represented By: Janine Marie Lopez
Represented By: Seth P. Waxman
Represented By: Patrick J. Carome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Duke University
Represented By: Danielle C Gray
Represented By: Apalla U. Chopra
Represented By: Jennifer B Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Cornell University
Represented By: Danielle C Gray
Represented By: Apalla U. Chopra
Represented By: Jennifer B Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Bucknell University
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Dolores Street Community Services
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Represented By: Joan Renxin Li
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Princeton University
Represented By: Danielle C Gray
Represented By: Apalla U. Chopra
Represented By: Jennifer B Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Emerson College
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LatinoJustice PRLDEF
Represented By: Blythe Golay Kochsiek
Represented By: Jose Luis Perez
Represented By: Fernando A Bohorquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: University of Maryland
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Pace University
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Housatonic Community College
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Manchester Community College
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Charter Oak State College
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Northwestern Community College
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lawrence University
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Vanderbilt University
Represented By: Danielle C Gray
Represented By: Apalla U. Chopra
Represented By: Jennifer B Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Naugatuck Valley Community College
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Centro Legal de la Raza
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Represented By: Joan Renxin Li
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Bowdoin College
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Heartland Alliance's National Immigrant Justice Center
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Represented By: Joan Renxin Li
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Immigrant Legal Resource Center
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Represented By: Joan Renxin Li
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California School Boards Association
Represented By: Emma Leheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Moreno Valley Unified School District
Represented By: Emma Leheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Georgetown University
Represented By: Danielle C Gray
Represented By: Apalla U. Chopra
Represented By: Jennifer B Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Amherst College
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Yale University
Represented By: Danielle C Gray
Represented By: Apalla U. Chopra
Represented By: Jennifer B Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: University of Michigan
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Los Angeles Community College District
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Canal Alliance
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Represented By: Joan Renxin Li
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Southern Connecticut State University
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Northeastern University
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Barnard College
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Represented By: Julie Beth Axelrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Colgate University
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Massachusetts Institute of Technology
Represented By: Danielle C Gray
Represented By: Apalla U. Chopra
Represented By: Jennifer B Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Riverside Community College District
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California Institute of Technology
Represented By: Danielle C Gray
Represented By: Apalla U. Chopra
Represented By: Jennifer B Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian Law Alliance
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Represented By: Joan Renxin Li
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Boston University
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gateway Community College
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Los Angeles Unified School District
Represented By: Emma Leheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Airbnb, Inc.
Represented By: Ari Holtzblatt
Represented By: Janine Marie Lopez
Represented By: Seth P. Waxman
Represented By: Patrick J. Carome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Central Connecticut State University
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Western Connecticut State University
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tunxis Community College
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: San Mateo Community College District
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: 108 Companies
Represented By: John Nadolenco
Represented By: Karen Lin
Represented By: Lauren R Goldman
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Smith College
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Stanford University
Represented By: Danielle C Gray
Represented By: Apalla U. Chopra
Represented By: Jennifer B Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Northwestern University
Represented By: Danielle C Gray
Represented By: Apalla U. Chopra
Represented By: Jennifer B Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Middlesex Community College
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tufts University
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Washington University in St. Louis
Represented By: Danielle C Gray
Represented By: Apalla U. Chopra
Represented By: Jennifer B Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Square, Inc.
Represented By: Ari Holtzblatt
Represented By: Janine Marie Lopez
Represented By: Seth P. Waxman
Represented By: Patrick J. Carome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: University of Chicago
Represented By: Danielle C Gray
Represented By: Apalla U. Chopra
Represented By: Jennifer B Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Columbia University
Represented By: Danielle C Gray
Represented By: Apalla U. Chopra
Represented By: Jennifer B Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Emory University
Represented By: Danielle C Gray
Represented By: Apalla U. Chopra
Represented By: Jennifer B Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Los Angeles County Superintendent of Schools
Represented By: Emma Leheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Dartmouth College
Represented By: Danielle C Gray
Represented By: Apalla U. Chopra
Represented By: Jennifer B Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: County of Los Angeles
Represented By: Daniel R. Suvor
Represented By: James Wesley Crooks
Represented By: Margaret Louise Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: University of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Danielle C Gray
Represented By: Apalla U. Chopra
Represented By: Jennifer B Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Los Angeles County Board of Education
Represented By: Emma Leheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Brandeis University
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: OneJustice
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Represented By: Joan Renxin Li
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Three Rivers Community College
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California Teachers Association
Represented By: Emma Leheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: George Washington University
Represented By: Danielle C Gray
Represented By: Apalla U. Chopra
Represented By: Jennifer B Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Current and Former Law Enforcement Leaders
Represented By: Matthew J. Piers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Middlebury College
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asnuntuck Community College
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Williams College
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Colby College
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rice University
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Berkeley Unified School District
Represented By: Emma Leheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Brown University
Represented By: Danielle C Gray
Represented By: Apalla U. Chopra
Represented By: Jennifer B Sokoler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Los Rios Community College District
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Oakland Unified School District
Represented By: Emma Leheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Wellesley College
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Norwalk Community College
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Eastern Connecticut State University
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Represented By: Joan Renxin Li
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Twitter, Inc.
Represented By: Ari Holtzblatt
Represented By: Janine Marie Lopez
Represented By: Seth P. Waxman
Represented By: Patrick J. Carome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sacramento City Unified School District
Represented By: Emma Leheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Case Western Reserve University
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: East Bay Sanctuary Covenant
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Represented By: Joan Renxin Li
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California Faculty Association
Represented By: Emma Leheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mount Holyoke College
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: San Francisco Community College District
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Legal Services for Children
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Represented By: Joan Renxin Li
Represented By: Kara Corinne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Carnegie Mellon University
Represented By: Ishan K Bhabha
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Bar Association of San Francisco
Represented By: John-Paul Singh Deol
Represented By: Neil A. Friedman Popovic
Represented By: James Landon McGinnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?