Aaron Iskenderian et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: David Miller, Douglas Keeling, Claudio Vasquez, Andrew Riordan, Charles Huddleston, Melissa Farris, Jessica Holdbrooks, Murel Ann Corbett, Chad Brummell, Susan Corwin, Christi Marie Polhert, Jeri Cryer, Norma Ruelas, Amy Holberg, Douglas Seymour, Eleanor M. Anderson, Cheryl Stanley, Christopher Edgar, Christopher Leo Farris, Adrianna Arana, Chad Elam, Brian Perry, Bill Largey, Christopher Stanley, Pat Hurt, Delia Torres, Andrew Whynaught, Lisa Keeling, Charles McCartney, Alaina Bigger, Benjamin G. Morana, David Szymusiak, Daniel Foster, Andrew Barbosa, Daniel Smith, Antonio Vega, Shara Gonzalez, Austin Petty, Karen McMichael, Brandon Reitz, Christopher Allen Polhert, Bobby McMichael, Amina Westberg, Carlos Lugo, Corey Ringer, Carol Brummel, Christopher Denovellis, Maria Lugo, David J. Colello, Jr., David Hall, Conrad Gonzalez, Andrew Holdbrooks, Dave Ballard, Lisa Johnson, Anthony Elias, Jr., David C. Anderson, Ammon Rjordan, Terry Ballard, Dale Gillette, Charles Wedel, David W. Thomas, Cindy Long, Brian Carrillo, Rebekah Dawn Lawrence, Carlos Rojo Lopez, David Sturrock, Don Digby, Cornan John Johnson, Daniel Rodeback, Brian Corwin, Dennis White, Darrell Johnson, Dennis Long, Charley Evans, Brian Corbett, Douglas Cryer, Daniel Rockett, Brandon Tamura, Rosanne Colello, Chris Campion, Candice Kopcak, Aaron Iskenderian, Mickie Wedel, Don Nelson and Brent Leblanc
Defendant: FCA U.S., LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 3:2019cv03024
Filed: May 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of filing of new MDL related act5ion. Please refer to case no. 3:17-md-2777 for all previously filed Pretrial Orders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 6, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Central District of California, 2:19-cv-4233, Aaron Iskenderian et al v. FCA US LLC et al, Opened in California Northern District as CV 19-3024 EMC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order #7 cc: JPMDL (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-04233. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 Conditional Transfer Order - 19 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2777, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of California and assigned to Honorable Edward M. Chen. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (gk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant FCA US LLC, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #5 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 served on 05/20/2019. (Steinberg, Michael)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap)
May 15, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Norma Ruelas, Carlos Rojo Lopez, Brandon Tamura, Lisa Johnson, David Miller, Andrew Riordan, Don Digby, Brian Corwin, Bobby McMichael, David Sturrock, Benjamin G. Morana, Christopher Allen Polhert, Corey Ringer, David W. Thomas, Douglas Keeling, Susan Corwin, Dale Gillette, Daniel Smith, Brandon Reitz, Andrew Holdbrooks, Maria Lugo, Carol Brummel, Jessica Holdbrooks, Dennis White, Christopher Leo Farris, Cindy Long, Candice Kopcak, Terry Ballard, Christopher Stanley, Charles McCartney, Dave Ballard, Mickie Wedel, Daniel Foster, Austin Petty, Claudio Vasquez, Don Nelson, Daniel Rodeback, Cornan John Johnson, David Szymusiak, Christi Marie Polhert, David C. Anderson, Douglas Seymour, Karen McMichael, Dennis Long, Darrell Johnson, Shara Gonzalez, Eleanor M. Anderson, Rosanne Colello, David Hall, Pat Hurt, Bill Largey, Aaron Iskenderian, Carlos Lugo, Douglas Cryer, Murel Ann Corbett, Brian Perry, Charles Wedel, Delia Torres, Jeri Cryer, Antonio Vega, Daniel Rockett, David J. Colello, Jr., Melissa Farris, Brian Corbett, Conrad Gonzalez, Rebekah Dawn Lawrence, Charley Evans, Brent Leblanc, Christopher Denovellis, Anthony Elias, Jr., Brian Carrillo, Ammon Rjordan, Lisa Keeling, Chad Elam, Adrianna Arana, Cheryl Stanley, Andrew Barbosa, Christopher Edgar, Amy Holberg, Charles Huddleston(2), Alaina Bigger, Chad Brummell, Charles Huddleston(1), Chris Campion, Amina Westberg, upon Defendant FCA US LLC served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez-CT-Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/9/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C) (ghap)
May 15, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, FCA US LLC.(Filing fee $ 400) Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Norma Ruelas, Carlos Rojo Lopez, Brandon Tamura, Lisa Johnson, David Miller, Andrew Riordan, Don Digby, Brian Corwin, Bobby McMichael, David Sturrock, Benjamin G. Morana, Christopher Allen Polhert, Corey Ringer, David W. Thomas, Douglas Keeling, Susan Corwin, Dale Gillette, Daniel Smith, Brandon Reitz, Andrew Holdbrooks, Maria Lugo, Carol Brummel, Jessica Holdbrooks, Dennis White, Christopher Leo Farris, Cindy Long, Candice Kopcak, Terry Ballard, Christopher Stanley, Charles McCartney, Dave Ballard, Andrew Whynaught, Mickie Wedel, Daniel Foster, Austin Petty, Claudio Vasquez, Don Nelson, Daniel Rodeback, Cornan John Johnson, David Szymusiak, Christi Marie Polhert, David C. Anderson, Douglas Seymour, Karen McMichael, Dennis Long, Darrell Johnson, Shara Gonzalez, Eleanor M. Anderson, Rosanne Colello, David Hall, Pat Hurt, Bill Largey, Aaron Iskenderian, Carlos Lugo, Douglas Cryer, Murel Ann Corbett, Brian Perry, Charles Wedel, Delia Torres, Jeri Cryer, Antonio Vega, Daniel Rockett, David J. Colello, Jr., Melissa Farris, Brian Corbett, Conrad Gonzalez, Rebekah Dawn Lawrence, Charley Evans, Brent Leblanc, Christopher Denovellis, Anthony Elias, Jr., Brian Carrillo, Ammon Rjordan, Lisa Keeling, Chad Elam, Adrianna Arana, Cheryl Stanley, Andrew Barbosa, Christopher Edgar, Amy Holberg, Charles Huddleston(2), Alaina Bigger, Chad Brummell, Charles Huddleston(1), Chris Campion, Amina Westberg. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/3/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B) (ghap)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA North America Holdings LLC and Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.. (Steinberg, Michael)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Steinberg, Michael)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STCV15506 Receipt No: 0973-23747928 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Attorney Michael H Steinberg added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Steinberg, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aaron Iskenderian et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Miller
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Keeling
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudio Vasquez
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Riordan
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Huddleston
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Farris
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Holdbrooks
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murel Ann Corbett
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Brummell
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Corwin
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christi Marie Polhert
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeri Cryer
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Ruelas
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Holberg
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Seymour
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleanor M. Anderson
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Stanley
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Edgar
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Leo Farris
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrianna Arana
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Elam
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Perry
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Largey
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Stanley
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pat Hurt
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delia Torres
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Whynaught
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Keeling
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles McCartney
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaina Bigger
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin G. Morana
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Szymusiak
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Foster
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Barbosa
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Smith
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Vega
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shara Gonzalez
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Petty
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen McMichael
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Reitz
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Allen Polhert
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby McMichael
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amina Westberg
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Lugo
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Ringer
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Brummel
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Denovellis
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Lugo
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J. Colello, Jr.
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hall
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conrad Gonzalez
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Holdbrooks
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Ballard
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Johnson
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Elias, Jr.
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David C. Anderson
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ammon Rjordan
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Ballard
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Gillette
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Wedel
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W. Thomas
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Long
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Carrillo
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebekah Dawn Lawrence
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Rojo Lopez
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Sturrock
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Digby
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornan John Johnson
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Rodeback
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Corwin
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis White
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Johnson
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Long
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charley Evans
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Corbett
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Cryer
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Rockett
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Tamura
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosanne Colello
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Campion
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candice Kopcak
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Iskenderian
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mickie Wedel
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Nelson
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Leblanc
Represented By: Allen-Michel D Resnick
Represented By: John Neil Gieleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA U.S., LLC
Represented By: Michael H. Steinberg
Represented By: Sverker K. Hogberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?