Anderson et al v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Elaine Anderson, Erik Villagran, Scott Burst, Jacqueline Demeritte, Colea Childs, Beth Chavez, Euihwan Cho, Donald Dahl, Alison Coleman, Victoria Cornwell, Scott Sapkosky, Diana Atkins, Candace Martino, Simone Cox, Beth Tomson, Deborah Morgan, Denice Ryan, Travis Rea, James Hines, James Matos, Pamela Vohringer, Sheila Claxton, Christopher Adams, Mercedes Espinoza, Robert Altmann, Julie Rambousek, Kyle Kristoff, Rhonda Mason, Michael Miller, Kimberly Walker, Melissa Lynn Brevig, Jabre Wise, Merlyn Johnson, Wendy Sorrells, Matt Taylor, Jennifer Pratt, Veronica Stovall, Cuneyit Adiguzel, Rodney Weber, Zachary Schwartz, Melanie Cobb, Daniel Aviles, Lesley Villa, Regina Ellison, Marlena Harrison, Chasidy Dawson, Bryan Riviello, Bernadette Lionetta, David Kreamer, Pamela Paine, Yvette Knox, Taylor Chanek, Nicole Prichard, Cherie Brown, Oskar Villagomez, Jeffrey Messina, Melissa Arellano, Randall Knight, Nancy Prater, Nina Parker, Timothy Downs, Crystal Miller, Christian Hunt, Andrew Bewick, Raven Shaw and Latecia Cushion Knight
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv02328
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Filing 29 Declaration of Zachary Ethan Schwarz in Support of #23 Amended Complaint,,,, (DECLARATION RE CLRA VENUE) filed byZachary Schwartz. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 28 Declaration of Sheila Claxton in Support of #23 Amended Complaint,,,, (DECLARATION RE CLRA VENUE) filed bySheila Claxton. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 27 Declaration of Oskar Villagomez in Support of #23 Amended Complaint,,,, (DECLARATION RE CLRA VENUE) filed byOskar Villagomez. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 26 Declaration of Kyle Kristoff in Support of #23 Amended Complaint,,,, (DECLARATION RE CLRA VENUE) filed byKyle Kristoff. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 25 Declaration of Euihwan Cho in Support of #23 Amended Complaint,,,, (DECLARATION RE CLRA VENUE) filed byEuihwan Cho. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 24 Declaration of Diana Atkins in Support of #23 Amended Complaint,,,, (DECLARATION RE CLRA VENUE) filed byDiana Atkins. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc.. Filed byAlison Coleman, Jacqueline Demeritte, Candace Martino, Scott Sapkosky, Diana Atkins, Elaine Anderson, Erik Villagran, Euihwan Cho, Scott Burst, Donald Dahl, Victoria Cornwell, Beth Chavez, Colea Childs, Rhonda Mason, Daniel Aviles, Crystal Miller, Taylor Chanek, Matt Taylor, Bernadette Lionetta, Melissa Arellano, Kyle Kristoff, Pamela Vohringer, Michael Miller, Randall Knight, Christopher Adams, Kimberly Walker, Zachary Schwartz, Latecia Cushion Knight, Cuneyit Adiguzel, Jeffrey Messina, Bryan Riviello, Jabre Wise, Veronica Stovall, Rodney Weber, Christian Hunt, Simone Cox, Melanie Cobb, Nancy Prater, Sheila Claxton, Chasidy Dawson, David Kreamer, Beth Tomson, Melissa Lynn Brevig, Marlena Harrison, Wendy Sorrells, Timothy Downs, Deborah Morgan, Yvette Knox, Julie Rambousek, Denice Ryan, James Hines, Raven Shaw, Nicole Prichard, James Matos, Travis Rea, Oskar Villagomez, Mercedes Espinoza, Jennifer Pratt, Merlyn Johnson, Regina Ellison, Andrew Bewick, Robert Altmann, Lesley Villa, Cherie Brown, Pamela Paine, Nina Parker. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #21 Administrative Motion Consider Whether Cases Should be Related. Case No. 5:20-cv-3102-NC is found to be related to this matter. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 14, 2020 Filing 21 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Elaine Anderson, Diana Atkins, Scott Burst, Beth Chavez, Colea Childs, Euihwan Cho, Alison Coleman, Victoria Cornwell, Donald Dahl, Jacqueline Demeritte, Candace Martino, Scott Sapkosky, Erik Villagran. Responses due by 5/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation in Support of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related, #2 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #19 Stipulation. Case Management Conference continued to 9/15/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 9/8/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT AND CONTINUE THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of T. Cheung ISO)(Cheung, Tiffany) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple Inc. (Cheung, Tiffany) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Sabrina Larson (Larson, Sabrina) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany Cheung (Cheung, Tiffany) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Arturo J. Gonzalez (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Ben Michael Harrington (Harrington, Ben) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Eric Loeser (Loeser, Thomas) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Steve W. Berman. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 7/7/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 6/30/2020. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/14/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings., Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 04/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 This case will be randomly assigned/reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2020)
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14357826.) filed by Elaine Anderson, Diana Atkins, Scott Burst, Beth Chavez, Colea Childs, Euihwan Cho, Alison Coleman, Victoria Cornwell, Donald Dahl, Jacqueline Demeritte, Candace Martino, Scott Sapkosky, Erik Villagran. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/9/2020)
April 9, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Elaine Anderson, Diana Atkins, Scott Burst, Beth Chavez, Colea Childs, Euihwan Cho, Alison Coleman, Victoria Cornwell, Donald Dahl, Jacqueline Demeritte, Candace Martino, Scott Sapkosky, Erik Villagran.. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 4/9/2020)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/1/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/8/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/21/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14346872.). Filed byEuihwan Cho, Candace Martino, Scott Burst, Alison Coleman, Donald Dahl, Scott Sapkosky, Diana Atkins, Victoria Cornwell, Elaine Anderson, Beth Chavez, Erik Villagran, Jacqueline Demeritte, Colea Childs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 4/6/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Anderson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Ben Michael Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Villagran
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Ben Michael Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Burst
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Ben Michael Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Demeritte
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Ben Michael Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colea Childs
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Ben Michael Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Chavez
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Ben Michael Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Euihwan Cho
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Ben Michael Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Dahl
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Ben Michael Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alison Coleman
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Ben Michael Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Cornwell
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Ben Michael Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Sapkosky
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Ben Michael Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Atkins
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Ben Michael Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Martino
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Ben Michael Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simone Cox
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Tomson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Morgan
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denice Ryan
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Rea
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hines
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Matos
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Vohringer
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Claxton
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Adams
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedes Espinoza
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Altmann
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Rambousek
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Kristoff
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Mason
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Miller
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Walker
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Lynn Brevig
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jabre Wise
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merlyn Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Sorrells
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Taylor
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Pratt
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Stovall
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cuneyit Adiguzel
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Weber
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Schwartz
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Cobb
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Aviles
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesley Villa
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Ellison
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlena Harrison
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chasidy Dawson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Riviello
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadette Lionetta
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kreamer
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Paine
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Knox
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Chanek
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Prichard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherie Brown
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oskar Villagomez
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Messina
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Arellano
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Knight
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Prater
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Parker
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Downs
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Miller
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Hunt
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Bewick
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raven Shaw
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latecia Cushion Knight
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Arturo J. Gonzalez
Represented By: Tiffany Cheung
Represented By: Sabrina Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?