Center For Biological Diversity et al v. United States Bureau of Land Management et al
Plaintiff: Center For Biological Diversity, Sierra Club, Desert Survivors, California Native Plant Society, Defenders of Wildlife and Desert Tortoise Council
Defendant: Deputy Director Nada Wolff Culver, United States Bureau of Land Management, State Director Karen Mouritsen, Secretary Deb Haaland, U.S. Department of the Interior and United States Fish & Wildlife Service
Case Number: 3:2021cv07171
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Rickey Doyle Turner, Jr (Turner, Rickey) (Filed on 11/10/2021)
November 4, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Native Plant Society, Center For Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Desert Survivors, Desert Tortoise Council, Sierra Club (Sanders, Matthew) (Filed on 11/4/2021)
October 25, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaintby California Native Plant Society, Center For Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Desert Survivors, Desert Tortoise Council, Sierra Club (Sanders, Matthew) (Filed on 10/25/2021) Modified on 10/26/2021 (jml, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Native Plant Society, Center For Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Desert Survivors, Desert Tortoise Council re #11 Clerk's Notice,,,,,, Util - Teleconference Zoom,,,,, (Sanders, Matthew) (Filed on 10/7/2021)
October 6, 2021 Filing 11 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT GUIDELINE AND CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT: Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2021 at 02:30 PM - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 12/9/21 at 2 pm Pacific. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/si General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings , including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2021 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2021)
October 6, 2021 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Judge Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2021)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting (444) Administrative Motion Relating Cases in case 3:06-cv-04884-SI.Associated Cases: 3:06-cv-04884-SI, 4:21-cv-07171-DMR(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2021)
September 29, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Native Plant Society, Center For Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Desert Survivors, Desert Tortoise Council, Sierra Club.. (Sanders, Matthew) (Filed on 9/29/2021)
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Nada Wolff Culver, Deb Haaland, Karen Mouritsen, U.S. Department of the Interior, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
September 17, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Sanders, Matthew) (Filed on 9/17/2021)
September 17, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2021)
September 16, 2021 #Electronic filing error. A maximum of THREE summons will be issued. Please list all defendants on ONE summons or multiple defendants on THREE summons and re-file in its entirety. Re: #2 Proposed Summons,, filed by California Native Plant Society, Center For Biological Diversity, Desert Tortoise Council, Defenders of Wildlife, Sierra Club (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/30/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
September 16, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by California Native Plant Society, Center For Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Desert Survivors, Desert Tortoise Council, Sierra Club (Sanders, Matthew) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons UNITED STATES FISH & WILDLIFE SERVICE, #2 Summons U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, #3 Summons DEB HAALAND, acting in her official capacity as Secretary of the Department of the Interior, #4 Summons NADA WOLFF CULVER, acting in her official capacity as Deputy Director for Policy and Programs and exercising the authority of Director, U.S. Bureau of Land Management, #5 Summons KAREN MOURITSEN, acting in her official capacity as State Director, U.S. Bureau of Land Management - California)(Sanders, Matthew) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16398023.). Filed byDefenders of Wildlife, Center For Biological Diversity, Desert Survivors, Desert Tortoise Council, Sierra Club, California Native Plant Society. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanders, Matthew) (Filed on 9/16/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center For Biological Diversity et al v. United States Bureau of Land Management et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center For Biological Diversity
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Sanders
Represented By: Deborah Ann Sivas
Represented By: Justin Augustine
Represented By: Lisa T. Belenky
Represented By: Stephanie L Safdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Sanders
Represented By: Deborah Ann Sivas
Represented By: Justin Augustine
Represented By: Lisa T. Belenky
Represented By: Stephanie L Safdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desert Survivors
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Sanders
Represented By: Deborah Ann Sivas
Represented By: Justin Augustine
Represented By: Lisa T. Belenky
Represented By: Stephanie L Safdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Native Plant Society
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Sanders
Represented By: Deborah Ann Sivas
Represented By: Justin Augustine
Represented By: Lisa T. Belenky
Represented By: Stephanie L Safdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Sanders
Represented By: Deborah Ann Sivas
Represented By: Justin Augustine
Represented By: Lisa T. Belenky
Represented By: Stephanie L Safdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desert Tortoise Council
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Sanders
Represented By: Deborah Ann Sivas
Represented By: Justin Augustine
Represented By: Lisa T. Belenky
Represented By: Stephanie L Safdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Director Nada Wolff Culver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Rickey Doyle Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Director Karen Mouritsen
Represented By: Rickey Doyle Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Deb Haaland
Represented By: Rickey Doyle Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Interior
Represented By: Rickey Doyle Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish & Wildlife Service
Represented By: Rickey Doyle Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?