In re CIM-SQ Transfer Cases
Plaintiff: Charles Carter, Sr., Robert Lee Cole, Lovell Colvin, Ken Cooper, Steve Crittenden, Alejandro Delgadillo Lopez, Kevin Demings, Hilda Diaz, Yadira Menchu, Estate of Joaquin Diaz, Blanca Diaz Houle, Eugene Samuel Hall, Thaddeus D Hamilton, Jerry Hamiltonhausey, Raul A. Edwards, Ellis Clay Hollis, Toriano Germaine Hudson, Sr., LaCedric W. Johnson, Raymond E. Jones, Wilbert H Lee, Karen Legg, Michelle Legg, Alex Lopez, Tyrone Love, Michael Edward Mackey, Michael Vaughn Nickerson, Vincent E. O'Bannon, Matthew K. Quale, Jr., Kenneth D. Rhodes, Daniel Ruiz, Santos Ruiz, Fernando Vera, Vanessa Robinson, Daniel Ruiz, Jr., Angelina Chavez, Kevin R. Schrubb, Reginald Thorpe, Falao Toalepai, Paris Donte Vines, Vinh Thanh Vo, Eric Warner, Henry Warner, Van Otis Wilson, Alex Ulep, Gregory J. Dixon, Carlos S. Smith, Willie Bolden, Paul David Johnson and Wayne Johnson
Defendant: Kathleen Allison, Ron Broomfield, State of California, Ralph Diaz, Ron Davis, Clark Kelso, A. Pachynski, L. Escobell, Clarence Cryer, Dean Borders, Joseph Bick, R. Steven Tharratt, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR), Shannon Garrigan, Muhammad Farooq, Kirk Torres, San Quentin State Prison, Mona Houston, California Correctional Health Care Services, California Institution for Men State Prison, Estate of Robert Steven Tharratt, M.D., Governor Gavin Newsom, N. Podosky, Troy Allen, B Haub, B. Dutton, K. France, T. R. Teixeira, Matt Verdier, Jackie Clark and M Bloise
Case Number: 3:2022mc80066
Filed: March 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Kathleen Allison, Joseph Bick, Dean Borders, Ron Broomfield, California Correctional Health Care Services, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR), California Institution for Men State Prison, Clarence Cryer, Ron Davis, Ralph Diaz, L. Escobell, Estate of Robert Steven Tharratt, M.D., Muhammad Farooq, Shannon Garrigan, Mona Houston, A. Pachynski, San Quentin State Prison, State of California, Kirk Torres. Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2022 02:00 PM before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 8/10/2022. Replies due by 8/17/2022. (Shryock, Cassandra) (Filed on 7/27/2022)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL by Kathleen Allison, Joseph Bick, Dean Borders, Ron Broomfield, California Correctional Health Care Services, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR), California Institution for Men State Prison, Clarence Cryer, Ron Davis, Ralph Diaz, L. Escobell, Estate of Robert Steven Tharratt, M.D., Muhammad Farooq, Shannon Garrigan, Mona Houston, A. Pachynski, San Quentin State Prison, State of California, Kirk Torres . Appeal Record due by 8/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order (ECF No. 59), #2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Representation Statement)(Shryock, Cassandra) (Filed on 7/27/2022)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 USCA Case Number 22-16088 U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit for #64 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2022)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #58 MOTION to add supplemental exhibits ) SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION filed byWayne Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shields, Audrey) (Filed on 7/25/2022)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Kathleen Allison, Joseph Bick, Dean Borders, Ron Broomfield, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR), California Institution for Men State Prison, Clarence Cryer, Ron Davis, L. Escobell, Estate of Robert Steven Tharratt, M.D., Muhammad Farooq, Shannon Garrigan, Mona Houston, A. Pachynski, San Quentin State Prison, State of California, R. Steven Tharratt, Kirk Torres. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss, #59 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number ACANDC-17370915 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order (ECF 59), #2 Exhibit 2 - Representation Statement)(Shryock, Cassandra) (Filed on 7/21/2022) Modified on 7/22/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF). No. 21-16088 Modified on 7/25/2022 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN PRO SE CASES; FINDING DEFENDANT KELSO IS ENTITLED TO QUASI-JUDICIAL IMMUNITY AND THAT FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ARGUMENTS LACK MERIT. Show Cause Response due by 8/5/2022. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/21/2022. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2022)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN ADDITIONAL REPRESENTED CASES - Show Cause Response due by 8/5/2022. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/19/2022. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2022) Modified on 7/19/2022 to correct OSC Response date (jmd, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER OF LIMITED ASSIGNMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/19/2022. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2022)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS REPRESENTED PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINTS in Case No. 22-mc-80066-WHO. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/15/2022. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2022)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS REPRESENTED PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINTS by Judge William H. Orrick re: #9 Motion to Dismiss, #13 Motion to Dismiss, #15 Motion to Dismiss, #17 Motion to Dismiss, #18 Motion to Dismiss, #19 Motion to Dismiss, #20 Motion to Dismiss, and #21 Motion to Dismiss. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2022)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION to add supplemental exhibits filed by Paul David Johnson. Responses due by 7/15/2022. Replies due by 7/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2022)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/29/22 before Judge William H. Orrick by Tyrone Love, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Ford, Brian) (Filed on 6/15/2022)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE by Angelina Chavez, Vanessa Robinson, Daniel Ruiz, Jr, Daniel Ruiz, Santos Ruiz, Fernando Vera re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Ruiz v. State of California, No. 3:21-CV-01832-JD OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (Hawkinson, Brian) (Filed on 5/24/2022)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 LETTER dated 5/15/22 from Eric Phillips. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2022)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on April 29, 2022 before Judge William H. Orrick by Angelina Chavez, Vanessa Robinson, Daniel Ruiz, Jr, Daniel Ruiz, Santos Ruiz, Fernando Vera, Eric Warner, Henry Warner, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Haddad, Michael) (Filed on 5/16/2022)
May 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/29/22, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #52 Transcript Order, #49 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 6/6/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/15/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/15/2022. (Related documents(s) #52 , #49 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 5/15/2022)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/29/2022 before Judge William H. Orrick by California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR), Clarence Cryer, Ron Davis, Estate of Robert Steven Tharratt, M.D., Muhammad Farooq, A. Pachynski, San Quentin State Prison, State of California, Kirk Torres, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Perkins, Robert) (Filed on 5/13/2022)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER OF LIMITED ASSIGNMENT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/11/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Clark Kelso. (Touchstone, Jaime) (Filed on 5/6/2022)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/29/2022 before Judge William H. Orrick by Clark Kelso, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Touchstone, Jaime) (Filed on 5/2/2022)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 4/29/2022. Motions to dismiss taken under submission; written order to follow. Total Time in Court: 1 hour, 18 minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/29/2022)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 GUIDANCE FOR APRIL 29, 2022 HEARING. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/28/2022. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2022)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE by Van Otis Wilson re #43 Response (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2022)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. The Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2022 10:00 AM will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadc asting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2022)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byKathleen Allison, Joseph Bick, Dean Borders, Ron Broomfield, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR), California Institution for Men State Prison, Clarence Cryer, Ron Davis, Ralph Diaz, L. Escobell, Estate of Robert Steven Tharratt, M.D., Muhammad Farooq, Shannon Garrigan, Mona Houston, A. Pachynski, San Quentin State Prison, State of California, Kirk Torres. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Defs' Statement of Recent Decision)(Shryock, Cassandra) (Filed on 4/26/2022)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 RESPONSE by Van Otis Wilson. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2022)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REPLY (re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss COOPER v. ALLISON, ET Al., NO. 5:20-cv-09415-BLF ) Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Cooper v. Allison, Et Al., No. 5:20-cv-09415-BLF filed byKathleen Allison, Joseph Bick, Dean Borders, Ron Broomfield, Clarence Cryer, Ron Davis, Ralph Diaz, L. Escobell, A. Pachynski. (Gille, Ryan) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPLY (re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Quale v. Allison, Et Al., Case No. 5:21-cv-00708-WHO ) filed byKathleen Allison, Joseph Bick, Dean Borders, Ron Broomfield, Clarence Cryer, Ron Davis, Ralph Diaz, L. Escobell, A. Pachynski. (Skebe, Howard) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE by Ron Broomfield, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR), Clarence Cryer, Ron Davis, Ralph Diaz, L. Escobell, Estate of Robert Steven Tharratt, M.D., Muhammad Farooq, Shannon Garrigan, A. Pachynski re #3 Notice (Other), (Perkins, Robert) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ron Broomfield, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR), Clarence Cryer, Ron Davis, Ralph Diaz, L. Escobell, Estate of Robert Steven Tharratt, M.D., Muhammad Farooq, Shannon Garrigan, Kirk Torres re #35 Notice (Other), (Perkins, Robert) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPLY (re #15 MOTION to Dismiss THORPE V. DIAZ, ET AL., CASE NO. 3:21-CV-06960-WHO ) Thorpe Defendants' Revised Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed byRon Broomfield, Ralph Diaz, Mona Houston. (Shryock, Cassandra) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REPLY (re #13 MOTION to Dismiss LOVE V. STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ET AL., NO. 3:21-CV- 04095-JD ) in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed byRon Broomfield, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR), Ron Davis, Ralph Diaz, L. Escobell, Muhammad Farooq, Shannon Garrigan, A. Pachynski, San Quentin State Prison, State of California, Kirk Torres. (Padua, Alexander) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPLY (re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Legg Defendants' Notice of Motion; Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byRon Broomfield, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR), Ron Davis, Ralph Diaz, Estate of Robert Steven Tharratt, M.D.. (Nygaard, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE by Ron Broomfield, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR), Clarence Cryer, Ron Davis, Ralph Diaz, L. Escobell, Estate of Robert Steven Tharratt, M.D., Muhammad Farooq, Shannon Garrigan, A. Pachynski, San Quentin State Prison, Kirk Torres re #4 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #3 Notice (Other), Notice That Ruiz Defendants Will Rest On Prior-Filed Reply (Perkins, Robert) (Filed on 4/13/2022)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ron Broomfield, California Correctional Health Care Services, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR), California Institution for Men State Prison, Clarence Cryer, Ron Davis, Ralph Diaz, L. Escobell, Estate of Robert Steven Tharratt, M.D., Muhammad Farooq, Shannon Garrigan, Mona Houston, A. Pachynski, San Quentin State Prison, State of California, Kirk Torres re #33 Reply to Opposition/Response,, (Mark, Arthur) (Filed on 4/13/2022)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REPLY (re #9 MOTION to Dismiss ESTATE OF JOAQUIN DIAZ, ET AL. V. STATE OF CALIFORNIA ET AL. NO. 3:21-CV-4604-JD ) filed byRon Broomfield, California Correctional Health Care Services, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR), California Institution for Men State Prison, Clarence Cryer, Ron Davis, L. Escobell, Estate of Robert Steven Tharratt, M.D., Muhammad Farooq, Shannon Garrigan, Mona Houston, A. Pachynski, San Quentin State Prison, State of California, R. Steven Tharratt, Kirk Torres. (Attachments: #1 DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mark, Arthur) (Filed on 4/13/2022)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Quale v. Allison, Et Al., Case No. 5:21-cv-00708-WHO ) filed byMatthew K. Quale, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Apps, Stanley) (Filed on 4/8/2022)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #13 MOTION to Dismiss LOVE V. STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ET AL., NO. 3:21-CV- 04095-JD ) filed byTyrone Love. (Ford, Brian) (Filed on 4/8/2022)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss COOPER v. ALLISON, ET Al., NO. 5:20-cv-09415-BLF ) filed byKen Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Apps, Stanley) (Filed on 4/8/2022)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #9 MOTION to Dismiss ESTATE OF JOAQUIN DIAZ, ET AL. V. STATE OF CALIFORNIA ET AL. NO. 3:21-CV-4604-JD ) filed byEstate of Joaquin Diaz. (Attachments: #1 Pltfs Objections to Defts RJN iso Their MTD Pltfs FAC)(Olney, Brian) (Filed on 4/8/2022)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Legg Defendants' Notice of Motion; Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byKaren Legg, Michelle Legg. (Cajina, Fulvio) (Filed on 4/8/2022)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #15 MOTION to Dismiss THORPE V. DIAZ, ET AL., CASE NO. 3:21-CV-06960-WHO ) (Revised Opposition) filed byReginald Thorpe. (Attachments: #1 Renewed Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Renewed Partial Opposition to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice)(Carlson, Matthew) (Filed on 4/8/2022)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE by Eric Warner, Henry Warner re #19 MOTION to Dismiss re. Warner v. State of California, No.: 3:21-CV-8154-JD OF PLAINTIFF HENRY WARNER'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS BASED ON PRIOR FILED DOCUMENTS, AND NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Haddad, Michael) (Filed on 4/7/2022)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE by Angelina Chavez, Vanessa Robinson, Daniel Ruiz, Jr, Daniel Ruiz, Santos Ruiz, Fernando Vera re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Ruiz v. State of California, No. 3:21-CV-01832-JD OF RUIZ PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS BASED ON PRIOR FILED DOCUMENTS, AND NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Haddad, Michael) (Filed on 4/7/2022)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Document should also be filed in case 4:21-cv-05351-HSG. Re: #22 NOTICE by Clark Kelso OF STIPULATED DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT J. CL ARK KELSO FROM CARTER V. ALLISON, ET. AL. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2022)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE by Michael Edward Mackey of Representation by Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Apps, Stanley) (Filed on 3/28/2022)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE by Michael Vaughn Nickerson of Representation by Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Apps, Stanley) (Filed on 3/28/2022)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE by Clark Kelso OF STIPULATED DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT J. CLARK KELSO FROM CARTER V. ALLISON, ET. AL. (Touchstone, Jaime) (Filed on 3/28/2022)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Legg Defendants' Notice of Motion; Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Ron Broomfield, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR), Ron Davis, Ralph Diaz, Estate of Robert Steven Tharratt, M.D.. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 4/8/2022. Replies due by 4/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit A to RJN, #4 Exhibit B to RJN, #5 Exhibit C to RJN, #6 Exhibit D to RJN, #7 Exhibit E to RJN, #8 Exhibit F to RJN, #9 Exhibit G to RJN, #10 Exhibit H to RJN, #11 Exhibit I to RJN, #12 Exhibit J to RJN, #13 Proposed Order)(Nygaard, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/25/2022)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS Quale v. Allison, Et Al., Case No. 5:21-cv-00708-WHO filed by Kathleen Allison, Joseph Bick, Dean Borders, Ron Broomfield, Clarence Cryer, Ron Davis, Ralph Diaz, L. Escobell, A. Pachynski. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 4/8/2022. Replies due by 4/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Skebe, Howard) (Filed on 3/25/2022) Modified on 3/25/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS re. Warner v. State of California, No.: 3:21-CV-8154-JD filed by Ron Broomfield, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR), Clarence Cryer, Ron Davis, L. Escobell, Estate of Robert Steven Tharratt, M.D., Shannon Garrigan, A. Pachynski, San Quentin State Prison. Responses due by 4/8/2022. Replies due by 4/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Perkins, Robert) (Filed on 3/25/2022) Modified on 3/25/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS Ruiz v. State of California, No. 3:21-CV-01832-JD filed by Ron Broomfield, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR), Clarence Cryer, Ron Davis, Ralph Diaz, L. Escobell, Estate of Robert Steven Tharratt, M.D., Muhammad Farooq, Shannon Garrigan, A. Pachynski, San Quentin State Prison, Kirk Torres. Responses due by 4/8/2022. Replies due by 4/15/2022. (Perkins, Robert) (Filed on 3/25/2022) Modified on 3/25/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS COOPER v. ALLISON, ET Al., NO. 5:20-cv-09415-BLF filed by Kathleen Allison, Joseph Bick, Dean Borders, Ron Broomfield, Clarence Cryer, Ron Davis, Ralph Diaz, L. Escobell, A. Pachynski. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 4/8/2022. Replies due by 4/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gille, Ryan) (Filed on 3/25/2022) Modified on 3/25/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE by Clark Kelso re #4 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (Touchstone, Jaime) (Filed on 3/25/2022) Modified on 3/25/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss THORPE V. DIAZ, ET AL., CASE NO. 3:21-CV-06960-WHO filed by Ron Broomfield, Ralph Diaz, Mona Houston. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 4/8/2022. Replies due by 4/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Defs' Ntc of Motion and MTD Pl's Complaint; Memo of P's and A's, #2 Exhibit 2-Defs' RJN in Support)(Shryock, Cassandra) (Filed on 3/25/2022)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ron Broomfield, California Correctional Health Care Services, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR), California Institution for Men State Prison, Clarence Cryer, Ralph Diaz, L. Escobell, Estate of Robert Steven Tharratt, M.D., Muhammad Farooq, Shannon Garrigan, Mona Houston, A. Pachynski, San Quentin State Prison, Kirk Torres re #9 MOTION to Dismiss ESTATE OF JOAQUIN DIAZ, ET AL. V. STATE OF CALIFORNIA ET AL. NO. 3:21-CV-4604-JD (Mark, Arthur) (Filed on 3/24/2022)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss LOVE V. STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ET AL., NO. 3:21-CV- 04095-JD filed by Ron Broomfield, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR), Ron Davis, Ralph Diaz, L. Escobell, Muhammad Farooq, Shannon Garrigan, A. Pachynski, San Quentin State Prison, State of California, Kirk Torres. Responses due by 4/21/2022. Replies due by 5/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- DEFENDANTS RE-NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS, #2 Exhibit B- MEMORANDUM OF POINT AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT, #3 Exhibit C- DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS, #4 Exhibit D- DECLARATION OF ASHA M. JAMESON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS, #5 Exhibit E- DEFENDANTS APPENDIX OF THE PUBLIC READINESS EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS ACT DECLARATION, AMENDMENTS, AND ADVISORY OPINIONS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS, #6 Exhibit F- [PROPOSED] ORDER)(Padua, Alexander) (Filed on 3/24/2022)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE by Jerry Hamiltonhausey of Representation by Counsel, pursuant to executed Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Apps, Stanley) (Filed on 3/24/2022)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE by Thaddeus D Hamilton of Representation by Counsel, pursuant to executed Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Apps, Stanley) (Filed on 3/24/2022)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE by Charles Carter, Sr of Representation by Counsel, pursuant to executed Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Apps, Stanley) (Filed on 3/24/2022)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss ESTATE OF JOAQUIN DIAZ, ET AL. V. STATE OF CALIFORNIA ET AL. NO. 3:21-CV-4604-JD filed by Ron Broomfield, California Correctional Health Care Services, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR), California Institution for Men State Prison, Clarence Cryer, Ron Davis, Ralph Diaz, L. Escobell, Estate of Robert Steven Tharratt, M.D., Muhammad Farooq, Shannon Garrigan, Mona Houston, A. Pachynski, San Quentin State Prison, State of California, Kirk Torres. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 4/6/2022. Replies due by 4/13/2022. (Mark, Arthur) (Filed on 3/23/2022)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING #6 NOTICE OF POTENTIALLY RELATED CASES. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/21/2022. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2022)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF LIMITED ASSIGNMENT. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/16/2022. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE by Kathleen Allison, Joseph Bick, Dean Borders, Ron Broomfield, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR), Jackie Clark, Clarence Cryer, Ron Davis, Ralph Diaz, L. Escobell, Mona Houston, A. Pachynski, R. Steven Tharratt of Potientially Related Cases (Fisher, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/15/2022)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Thomas Fisher (Fisher, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/14/2022)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING IN REPRESENTED CASES. Motions to dismiss due by 3/25/2022. Responses due by 4/8/2022. Replies due by 4/15/2022. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2022 10:00 AM via Videoconference before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/10/2022. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2022)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE by Ron Broomfield, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR), Clarence Cryer, Ron Davis, Ralph Diaz, L. Escobell, Estate of Robert Steven Tharratt, M.D., Muhammad Farooq, Shannon Garrigan, A. Pachynski, San Quentin State Prison, State of California, Kirk Torres of Briefing in Ruiz v. State of California, et al., 3:21-cv-01832-JD, Regarding Referred Issues (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to M to Notice of Briefing)(Perkins, Robert) (Filed on 3/10/2022)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE by Ken Cooper and Matthew K. Quale, Jr. of Filing of Persuasive and/or Precedential Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Apps, Stanley) (Filed on 3/9/2022)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER OF LIMITED ASSIGNMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/7/2022. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re CIM-SQ Transfer Cases
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Carter, Sr.
Represented By: Stanley R Apps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lovell Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Cooper
Represented By: Stanley R Apps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Crittenden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Delgadillo Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Demings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilda Diaz
Represented By: Dan Lewis Stormer
Represented By: Brian D Olney
Represented By: David Clay Washington
Represented By: James Do Kim
Represented By: Salomon Zavala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yadira Menchu
Represented By: Dan Lewis Stormer
Represented By: Brian D Olney
Represented By: David Clay Washington
Represented By: James Do Kim
Represented By: Salomon Zavala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Joaquin Diaz
Represented By: Brian D Olney
Represented By: David Clay Washington
Represented By: James Do Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanca Diaz Houle
Represented By: Brian D Olney
Represented By: David Clay Washington
Represented By: James Do Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Samuel Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaddeus D Hamilton
Represented By: Stanley R Apps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Hamiltonhausey
Represented By: Stanley R Apps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul A. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellis Clay Hollis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toriano Germaine Hudson, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaCedric W. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbert H Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Legg
Represented By: Fulvio Francisco Cajina
Represented By: Andrew Ryan Neilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Legg
Represented By: Fulvio Francisco Cajina
Represented By: Andrew Ryan Neilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Love
Represented By: Maria Belyi
Represented By: Brian Allen Christoph Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Edward Mackey
Represented By: Stanley R Apps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Vaughn Nickerson
Represented By: Stanley R Apps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent E. O'Bannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew K. Quale, Jr.
Represented By: Stanley R Apps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth D. Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ruiz
Represented By: Michael J. Haddad
Represented By: Brian Hawkinson
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Represented By: Teresa Denise Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santos Ruiz
Represented By: Michael J. Haddad
Represented By: Brian Hawkinson
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Represented By: Teresa Denise Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Vera
Represented By: Michael J. Haddad
Represented By: Brian Hawkinson
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Represented By: Teresa Denise Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Robinson
Represented By: Michael J. Haddad
Represented By: Brian Hawkinson
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Represented By: Teresa Denise Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ruiz, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Haddad
Represented By: Brian Hawkinson
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Represented By: Teresa Denise Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelina Chavez
Represented By: Michael J. Haddad
Represented By: Brian Hawkinson
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Represented By: Teresa Denise Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin R. Schrubb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Thorpe
Represented By: Nancy Hersh
Represented By: Ben T Rosenfeld
Represented By: Charles Carroll Kelly, II
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew D. Carlson
Represented By: Tyler Rogers Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Falao Toalepai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paris Donte Vines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vinh Thanh Vo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Warner
Represented By: Michael J. Haddad
Represented By: Brian Hawkinson
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Represented By: Teresa Denise Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Warner
Represented By: Michael J. Haddad
Represented By: Brian Hawkinson
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Represented By: Teresa Denise Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van Otis Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Ulep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory J. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Bolden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul David Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Johnson
Represented By: Audrey Shields
Represented By: Kojo Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Allison
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Lewis
Represented By: Alexander James Padua
Represented By: Arthur Bernard Mark, III
Represented By: Howard Phillip Skebe
Represented By: Jean Margaret Trenbeath
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Gille
Represented By: Shiran Zohar
Represented By: Tessa R. Lessner, Quall
Represented By: Zewugeberhan Zegeye Desta
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Fisher
Represented By: Cassandra Jean Shryock
Represented By: Tessa R. Lessner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Broomfield
Represented By: Alexander James Padua
Represented By: Cassandra Jean Shryock
Represented By: Robert Mitchell Perkins, III
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Gille
Represented By: Arthur Bernard Mark, III
Represented By: Howard Phillip Skebe
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Fisher
Represented By: Jennifer J. Nygaard
Represented By: Lucia Q Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Represented By: Arthur Bernard Mark, III
Represented By: Asha Jameson
Represented By: Cassandra Jean Shryock
Represented By: Robert Mitchell Perkins, III
Represented By: Alexander James Padua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Diaz
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Lewis
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Gille
Represented By: Alexander James Padua
Represented By: Cassandra Jean Shryock
Represented By: Robert Mitchell Perkins, III
Represented By: Arthur Bernard Mark, III
Represented By: Howard Phillip Skebe
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Fisher
Represented By: Jennifer J. Nygaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Davis
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Lewis
Represented By: Alexander James Padua
Represented By: Robert Mitchell Perkins, III
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Gille
Represented By: Arthur Bernard Mark, III
Represented By: Howard Phillip Skebe
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Fisher
Represented By: Jennifer J. Nygaard
Represented By: Cassandra Jean Shryock
Represented By: Anthony James Tartaglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Kelso
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Lewis
Represented By: Jaime G. Touchstone
Represented By: Shiran Zohar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Pachynski
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Lewis
Represented By: Alexander James Padua
Represented By: Robert Mitchell Perkins, III
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Gille
Represented By: Arthur Bernard Mark, III
Represented By: Howard Phillip Skebe
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Fisher
Represented By: Cassandra Jean Shryock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Escobell
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Lewis
Represented By: Alexander James Padua
Represented By: Robert Mitchell Perkins, III
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Gille
Represented By: Arthur Bernard Mark, III
Represented By: Howard Phillip Skebe
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Fisher
Represented By: Cassandra Jean Shryock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence Cryer
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Lewis
Represented By: Robert Mitchell Perkins, III
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Gille
Represented By: Arthur Bernard Mark, III
Represented By: Howard Phillip Skebe
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Fisher
Represented By: Cassandra Jean Shryock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Borders
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Lewis
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Gille
Represented By: Howard Phillip Skebe
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Fisher
Represented By: Cassandra Jean Shryock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Bick
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Lewis
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Gille
Represented By: Howard Phillip Skebe
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Fisher
Represented By: Cassandra Jean Shryock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Steven Tharratt
Represented By: Arthur Bernard Mark, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Fisher
Represented By: Anthony James Tartaglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR)
Represented By: Arthur Bernard Mark, III
Represented By: Alexander James Padua
Represented By: Robert Mitchell Perkins, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Fisher
Represented By: Jennifer J. Nygaard
Represented By: Cassandra Jean Shryock
Represented By: Anthony James Tartaglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Garrigan
Represented By: Alexander James Padua
Represented By: Robert Mitchell Perkins, III
Represented By: Arthur Bernard Mark, III
Represented By: Cassandra Jean Shryock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muhammad Farooq
Represented By: Alexander James Padua
Represented By: Robert Mitchell Perkins, III
Represented By: Arthur Bernard Mark, III
Represented By: Cassandra Jean Shryock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Torres
Represented By: Alexander James Padua
Represented By: Robert Mitchell Perkins, III
Represented By: Arthur Bernard Mark, III
Represented By: Cassandra Jean Shryock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Quentin State Prison
Represented By: Arthur Bernard Mark, III
Represented By: Alexander James Padua
Represented By: Robert Mitchell Perkins, III
Represented By: Cassandra Jean Shryock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mona Houston
Represented By: Arthur Bernard Mark, III
Represented By: Cassandra Jean Shryock
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Correctional Health Care Services
Represented By: Arthur Bernard Mark, III
Represented By: Cassandra Jean Shryock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Institution for Men State Prison
Represented By: Arthur Bernard Mark, III
Represented By: Cassandra Jean Shryock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Robert Steven Tharratt, M.D.
Represented By: Arthur Bernard Mark, III
Represented By: Robert Mitchell Perkins, III
Represented By: Jennifer J. Nygaard
Represented By: Cassandra Jean Shryock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Gavin Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Podosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Allen
Represented By: Zewugeberhan Zegeye Desta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Haub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Dutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. France
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. R. Teixeira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Verdier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Clark
Represented By: Zewugeberhan Zegeye Desta
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Bloise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?