Keller v. Electronic Arts Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael E. Davis, Michael Anderson, Samuel Michael Keller, Bryon Bishop, Bobby C. Maze, Ray Ellis, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. and Tate George
Defendant: Collegiate Licensing Company, National Collegiate Athletic Association and Electronic Arts Inc.
Petitioner: Nicholas Kindler
Not Classified By Court: SEC, Non-Party XOS Technologies, Inc., The Big Ten Conference, Inc., National Football League Players Association, ACC, NBA, Non-Party Collegiate Images, LLC and Nathan Harris
Consolidated Plaintiff: Samuel Jacobson, Danny Wimprine, Craig Newsome, Ishmael Thrower, William F Russell, Oscar P. Robertson and Damien Rhodes
Interested Party: Timothy J McIlwain, Pac-12 Conference, James E. Delany, Big 12 Conference, Conference USA, Ryan Hart, BIG TEN NETWORK, LLC, Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP and Larry Scott
Amicus Curiae: A&E Television Networks, LLC, James Brown, First Amendment Coalition, CBS Corporation, National Public Radio, Inc., Fox Broadcasting Company, ABC, Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Big Ten Network, LLC., Discovery Communications, LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC and Herbert Anthony Adderley
Intervenor: Ramzi Yusef, Edward Breivik, James E. Holmes, Christopher Wirth, Jimmy Thule, Christopher Donnelly, Jonathan Rich and Terry Nichols
Case Number: 4:2009cv01967
Filed: May 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 1319 CLERK'S NOTICE of defendant Electronic Arts Inc's exhibits disposed in accordance with Civil Local Rule 79-4(c) (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 1318 Acknowledgment Receipt of exhibits filed by plaintiff Samuel Michael Keller. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1317 NOTICE re Withdrawal of Exhibits Pursuant to Civil L. R. 79-4(b) by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. re #1316 Clerk's Notice (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 2/27/2019) Modified on 2/28/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2019 Filing 1316 CLERK'S NOTICE re withdrawal of exhibits accordance with Local Rule 79-4(b). (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1315 Order by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #1314 Stipulation Releasing Settlement Monies held in Escrow.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1314 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Releasing Settlement Monies Held in Escrow filed by Samuel Michael Keller, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., et al. (Aragon, Leonard) (Filed on 11/14/2018) Modified on 11/15/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1313 Order by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #1312 Motion to Relate Case.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1312 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration of Leonard W. Aragon, #4 Proposed Order)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
May 12, 2017 Filing 1311 MANDATE of USCA as to ( #1303 in 4:09-cv-01967-CW, (494) in 4:09-cv-03329-CW) Notice of Appeal, (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1310 ORDER of USCA: Appeal is dismissed as to ((1303) in 4:09-cv-01967-CW, (494) in 4:09-cv-03329-CW) Notice of Appeal, (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2017)
October 27, 2016 Filing 1309 NOTICE by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. of Withdrawal of Attorney (Reilly, Catherine) (Filed on 10/27/2016)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1308 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF CRONIN'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Re: Dkt. No. #1301 in 4:09-cv-01967 CW ( #458 in 4:09-cv-03329-CW). Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
August 2, 2016 Filing 1307 NOTICE by Collegiate Licensing Company of Withdrawal of Attorney (Hanson, Cindy) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
July 18, 2016 Filing 1306 NOTICE by National Collegiate Athletic Association of Withdrawal of Attorney (Kefalas, Kimberly) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
June 20, 2016 Filing 1305 Transcript Designation Form. Not Designating transcript filed by Kevin B. Cronin, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
May 24, 2016 Filing 1304 USCA Case Number 16-15922 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for #1303 Notice of Appeal. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 18, 2016 Filing 1303 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals. Appeal of Order (1300 in 4:09-cv-01967-CW, 481 in 4:09-cv-03329-CW) filed by Kevin B. Cronin (FEE PAID: Receipt #54611016249.) (Attachments: #1 receipt)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016) Modified on 5/20/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2016 Filing 1302 RESPONSE (re #1301 MOTION to Amend/Correct (481 in 4:09-cv-03329-CW) Order ) filed bySamuel Michael Keller. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Carey, Robert) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
April 29, 2016 Filing 1301 MOTION TO AMEND ORDER TO CORRECT ERRORS OF FACT AND GRANT APPEAL AS TIMELY, and MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE NOTICE OF APPEAL (re 481 in 4:09-cv-03329-CW) filed by Kevin B. Cronin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1300 ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL CLAIM AS UNTIMELY. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/19/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1299 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting (478) Request for Approval of Additional Solicitation of W-9s from Claimants in case 4:09-cv-03329-CW; granting (1298) Request for Approval of Additional Solicitation of W-9s from Claimants in case 4:09-cv-01967-CW. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
April 5, 2016 Filing 1298 Class Counsel's Request for Approval of Additional Solicitation of W-9s from Claimants by Samuel Michael Keller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Carey, Robert) (Filed on 4/5/2016) Modified on 4/6/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/6/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2016 Filing 1297 NOTICE of Change of Address by Celeste H.G. Boyd (Boyd, Celeste) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1296 ORDER RESOLVING CLAIM APPEALS. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/23/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
March 22, 2016 Filing 1295 Class Counsel Findings from Investigation of Claim Appeals and Recommendations for Resolution by Samuel Michael Keller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carey, Robert) (Filed on 3/22/2016) Modified on 3/23/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2016 Filing 1294 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins: Telephone hearing re: settlement claim forms held on 3/16/2016. Plaintiffs' Attorneys: Swathi Bojedla, Celeste Boyd, Leonard Aragon, Arthur Owens. Attorney for Defendant NCAA: Greg Curtner. (FTR: 2:08pm - 2:21pm.) Attachment Minute order. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/16/2016)
March 14, 2016 Filing 1293 Letter from Celeste H.G. Boyd for Class Counsel re Summary of Claim Process. (Boyd, Celeste) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1292 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING RE: SETTLEMENT CLAIM FORMS. Counsel are ordered to attend a telephonic hearing 3/16/2016 02:00 PM to discuss the procedural mechanisms for resolution of the claims forms. Counsel must contact deputy Lili Harrell at 408.535.5343 to provide contact information. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/29/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1291 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS by Judge Claudia Wilken granting (464) Motion for Release of Funds in case 4:09-cv-03329-CW; granting (1288) Motion for Release of Funds in case 4:09-cv-01967-CW. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
January 19, 2016 Filing 1290 Statement of Non-Opposition re #1288 MOTION for Release of Funds filed bySamuel Michael Keller. (Related document(s) #1288 ) (Aragon, Leonard) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
January 8, 2016 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Document #1288 MOTION for Release of Funds filed by Nathan Harris, Darrin Duncan also listed case number 4:09-cv-3329 CW on the document. Please e-file in that case also. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016)
January 8, 2016 Filing 1289 CLERK'S NOTICE. You are hereby notified that the motion hearing previously set for 2/9/16 is vacated. The Court shall decide the Motion for Release of Funds on the papers. Plaintiffs shall respond to the motion or file a statement of non-opposition by 1/19/16, according to the briefing schedule previously set by counsel. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016)
January 4, 2016 Filing 1288 MOTION for Release of Funds filed by Nathan Harris. Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 1/19/2016. Replies due by 1/26/2016. (Kron, Scott) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1287 CORRECTED ORDER FOR ATTORNEYS FEES. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/15/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1286 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF COURTS ORDER FOR ATTORNEYS FEES signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/15/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1285 ORDER FOR ATTORNEYS FEES by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part (365) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 4:09-cv-03329-CW; granting in part (1193) Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part (1194) Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part (1196) Motion for Attorney Fees; granting (1197) Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part (1207) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 4:09-cv-01967-CW. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1284 ORDER APPROVING REVISIONS TO FIRST LETTER TO CLAIMANTS by Judge Claudia Wilken granting (450) Motion in case 4:09-cv-03329-CW (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 24, 2015 Filing 1283 Joint Request for Order Approving Revisions to First Letter to Claimants re #1278 ; (Proposed) Order by Samuel Michael Keller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carey, Robert) (Filed on 11/24/2015) Modified on 11/25/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2015 Filing 1282 REPLY to re [1279 ] Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP's Response to McIlwain's Response to the Court's November 3, 2015 Order Regarding Motions for Attorneys' Fees by Timothy J McIlwain. (Geibelson, Michael) (Filed on 11/23/2015) Modified on 11/24/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2015 Filing 1281 Response re #1277 Order Regarding Motions for Attorneys' Fees; Amended and Supplemental Declaration of Eugene Egdorff byTimothy J McIlwain. (Geibelson, Michael) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
November 23, 2015 Filing 1280 MANDATE of USCA as to #154 Notice of Appeal filed by Electronic Arts Inc. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
November 20, 2015 Filing 1279 RESPONSE to re #1276 Hart's Former Counsel Timothy J. McIlwain's Response to the Court's November 3,2015 Order Regarding Motions for Attorneys' Fees by Samuel Michael Keller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Aragon, Leonard) (Filed on 11/20/2015) Modified on 11/23/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2015 Motion Hearing for Order to Show Cause is Vacated re #1277 . (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
November 16, 2015 Filing 1278 Joint Notice of Revisions to First Letter to Claimants by Samuel Michael Keller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Carey, Robert) (Filed on 11/16/2015) Modified on 11/17/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1277 ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEYS FEES. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/16/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
November 10, 2015 Filing 1276 RESPONSE to re #1269 Order, by Timothy J McIlwain. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William C. Amadeo, #2 Declaration of Joseph C. Cane, Jr., #3 Declaration of Ron Chini, #4 Declaration of Amber Jorgensen, #5 Declaration of Corinne Mullen, #6 Declaration of Kris Nejat, #7 Declaration of Katie Saluzzi, #8 Declaration of Alex Settle, #9 Declaration of Katrina Yu, #10 Declaration of Timothy J. McIlwain, #11 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Geibelson, Michael) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 10, 2015 Filing 1275 Declaration of Dennis J. Drasco in Support of #1207 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses and Incentive Award filed byRyan Hart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #1207 ) (Owens, Arthur) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 10, 2015 Filing 1274 Declaration of Keith McKenna in Support of #1207 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses and Incentive Award filed byRyan Hart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #1207 ) (Owens, Arthur) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 1273 MANDATE of USCA: Granting Stipulated Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Appeals as to (434 in 4:09-cv-03329-CW) Notice of Appeal filed by Darrin Duncan, (1247 in 4:09-cv-01967-CW) Notice of Appeal filed by Nathan Harris (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 1272 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Order to Show Cause why Objector's Counsel Scott A. Kron should not be Sanctioned (Aragon, Leonard) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 1271 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Cross-Petition for Order to Show Cause Why Plaintiffs' Counsel Stuart M. Paynter and Robert B. Carey Should Not be Sanctioned re #1262 by Nathan Harris (Kron, Scott) (Filed on 11/9/2015) Modified on 11/10/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2015 Filing 1270 CLERK'S NOTICE. You are hereby notified that the motion hearing for order to show cause, set for 11/17/2015, is continued to 12/1/2015 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1269 ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEYS FEES re (1193 in 4:09-cv-01967-CW) MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Conditionally to Intervene filed by Timothy J McIlwain, (1207 in 4:09-cv-01967-CW) Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses and Incentive Award filed by Ryan Hart. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/3/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 1268 Declaration of Leonard W. Aragon in Support of #1264 Reply to Opposition/Response to Petition for Order to Show Cause Why Objector's Counsel Scott A. Kron should not be Sanctioned filed bySamuel Michael Keller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #1264 ) (Carey, Robert) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 1267 Declaration of Stuart M. Paynter in Support of #1264 Reply to Opposition/Response to Petition for Order to Show Cause Why Objector's Counsel Scott A. Kron should not be Sanctioned filed bySamuel Michael Keller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Related document(s) #1264 ) (Carey, Robert) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 1266 Declaration of Robert B. Carey in Support of #1264 Reply to Opposition/Response to Petition for Order to Show Cause Why Objector's Counsel Scott A. Kron should not be Sanctioned filed bySamuel Michael Keller. (Related document(s) #1264 ) (Carey, Robert) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 1265 Declaration of Sathya Gosselin in Support of #1257 MOTION for Order to Show Cause why Objector's Counsel Scott A. Kron should not be Sanctioned filed bySamuel Michael Keller. (Related document(s) #1257 ) (Carey, Robert) (Filed on 11/2/2015) Modified on 11/3/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2015 Filing 1264 REPLY (re #1257 MOTION for Order to Show Cause why Objector's Counsel Scott A. Kron should not be Sanctioned ) filed bySamuel Michael Keller. (Carey, Robert) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 1263 Bond Receipt in the amount of $5,000.00 from Kron and Card on behalf of the Objectors/Appellants Nathan Harris and Darrin Duncan. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015) Modified on 11/3/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2015 Filing 1262 RESPONSE (re #1257 MOTION for Order to Show Cause why Objector's Counsel Scott A. Kron should not be Sanctioned ) filed byNathan Harris. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Scott A. Kron in Support of Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Petition for Order to Show Cause Why Objector's Counsel Scott A. Kron Should Not be Sanctioned)(Kron, Scott) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1261 ORDER GRANTING IN PART CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR APPEAL BOND by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part (1250) Motion for Bond in case 4:09-cv-01967-CW and in case 4:09-cv-03329-CW. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
October 20, 2015 Filing 1260 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Related document(s) #1250 ) (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 10/20/2015)
October 15, 2015 Filing 1259 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 07/16/2015 before Judge Hon. Claudia Wilken, re #1249 USCA Case Number 4:09-cv-1967 CW Transcript due by 10/16/2015. (Kron, Scott) (Filed on 10/15/2015)
October 15, 2015 Filing 1258 REPLY (re #1250 MOTION for Imposition of Appeal Bond against Objector Appellants ) filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 10/15/2015)
October 12, 2015 Filing 1257 MOTION for Order to Show Cause why Objector's Counsel Scott A. Kron should not be Sanctioned filed by Samuel Michael Keller. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2015 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 10/26/2015. Replies due by 11/2/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Aragon, Leonard) (Filed on 10/12/2015)
October 9, 2015 Filing 1256 RESPONSE (re #1250 MOTION for Imposition of Appeal Bond against Objector Appellants ) filed byNathan Harris. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Nathan Harris in Support of Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Imposition of Appeal Bond, #2 Declaration Declaration of Darrin Duncan in Support of Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Class Plaintiffs Motion for Imposition of Appeal Bond Against Objector Appellants)(Kron, Scott) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
October 9, 2015 Filing 1255 Statement of Joinder re #1250 MOTION for Imposition of Appeal Bond against Objector Appellants by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 10/9/2015) Modified on 10/13/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2015 Motion Hearing vacated. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
October 6, 2015 Filing 1254 CLERK'S NOTICE. As stated in the Court's order dated October 5, 2015, at Docket No. 1253, Plaintiffs' Motion for Appeal Bond will be decided on the papers. The November 12, 2015 hearing is vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
October 6, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1250 MOTION for Imposition of Appeal Bond against Objector Appellants. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2015 02:30 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1253 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING by Judge Claudia Wilken, in case 4:09-cv-03329-CW; granting (1251) Motion to Expedite in case 4:09-cv-01967-CW. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1252 Re-Notice of Motion re #1250 Motion for Imposition of Appeal Bond Against Objector Appellants filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2015 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 10/5/2015) Modified on 10/6/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2015 Filing 1251 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Motion for Imposition of Appeal Bond filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
October 2, 2015 Filing 1250 MOTION for Imposition of Appeal Bond against Objector Appellants filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 10/16/2015. Replies due by 10/23/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 10/2/2015) Modified on 10/5/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2015 Filing 1249 USCA Case Number 15-16861 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for #1247 Notice of Appeal filed by Nathan Harris. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015)
September 16, 2015 Filing 1248 Representation Statement and Service List by Nathan Harris re #1247 Notice of Appeal (Kron, Scott) (Filed on 9/16/2015) Modified on 9/17/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2015 Filing 1247 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Nathan Harris. Appeal of Order #1243 , Order #1244 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-9840285 paid.) (Kron, Scott) (Filed on 9/16/2015)
September 3, 2015 Filing 1246 Letter from Celeste H.G. Boyd, Class Counsel re Request by Robert Sack for Relief from Claims Deadline. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Aragon, Leonard) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
August 26, 2015 Filing 1245 Letter from Robert C. Sack Requesting Claim Filing Relief. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1243 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/18/15. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1244 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/18/15. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
August 17, 2015 Filing 1242 Letter from C. Tate George re: request from the court on the ruling on the E.A. Sports settlement dollars on July 16, 2015. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2015)
August 10, 2015 Filing 1241 Proposed Order Joint Filing of Proposed Final Approval Orders by Samuel Michael Keller, Electronic Arts Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Carey, Robert) (Filed on 8/10/2015) Modified on 8/11/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2015 Filing 1240 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 16, 2015, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (1232 in 4:09-cv-01967-CW) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/22/2015. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 7/24/2015)
July 22, 2015 Filing 1239 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Timothy J McIlwain for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Geibelson, Michael) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
July 22, 2015 Filing 1238 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Samuel Michael Keller for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Aragon, Leonard) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
July 20, 2015 Filing 1236 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Nathan Harris for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Kron, Scott) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 20, 2015 Filing 1235 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Ryan Hart for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Owens, Arthur) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 20, 2015 Filing 1234 Declaration of Keith A. McKenna in Support of #1207 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses and Incentive Award filed byRyan Hart. (Related document(s) #1207 ) (Owens, Arthur) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 20, 2015 Filing 1233 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by National Collegiate Athletic Association for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 20, 2015 Filing 1232 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 16, 2015 Filing 1237 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Claudia Wilken: Motion Hearing Re: Motion for Attorney Fees (dkt nos. 1193, 1194, 1196, 1197, 1207) and Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (dkt nos. 1222, 1224) in case no. 09-cv-01967-CW held on 7/16/2015. Motion Hearing Re: Motion for Attorney Fees (dkt no. 365) and Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (dkt no. 401) in case no. 09-cv-03329-CW held on 7/16/2015.Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/16/2015)
July 16, 2015 Filing 1231 RIGHT OF PUBLICTY PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF ERRATA re #1226 Declaration in Support of Class Certification - Andrew D. Schwarz by Samuel Michael Keller. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Aragon, Leonard) (Filed on 7/16/2015) Modified on 7/17/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2015 Filing 1230 Proposed Order re #1224 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice by Samuel Michael Keller. (Aragon, Leonard) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
July 15, 2015 Filing 1229 Proposed Order re #1222 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement with Electronic Arts. Inc. by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
July 15, 2015 Filing 1228 Supplemental Declaration of Kenneth Jue in Support of #1222 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement with Electronic Arts. Inc., #1224 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Related document(s) #1222 , #1224 ) (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 7/15/2015) Modified on 7/16/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2015 Filing 1227 RESPONSE to Objections by Samuel Michael Keller. (Carey, Robert) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
July 2, 2015 Filing 1226 Declaration of Andrew D.Schwarz on Class Certification filed by Samuel Michael Keller. (Related document(s) #1224 ) (Carey, Robert) (Filed on 7/2/2015) Modified on 7/6/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2015 Filing 1225 Declaration of Leonard W. Aragon in Support of #1224 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byS amuel Michael Keller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3)(Related document(s) #1224 ) (Carey, Robert) (Filed on 7/2/2015) Modified on 7/6/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2015 Filing 1224 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Samuel Michael Keller. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 7/16/2015. Replies due by 7/23/2015. (Carey, Robert) (Filed on 7/2/2015) Modified on 7/6/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2015 Filing 1223 Declaration of Kenneth Jue on Behalf of Settlement Administrator Regarding Notice and Administration filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
July 2, 2015 Filing 1222 Joint Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement with Electronic Arts. Inc. filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 7/16/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael D. Hausfeld, #2 Declaration Steve W. Berman, #3 Declaration Leonard W. Aragon)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 7/2/2015) Modified on 7/6/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2015 Filing 1221 NOTICE by Electronic Arts Inc. OF COMPLIANCE WITH CAFA NOTICE REQUIREMENTS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Matan Shacham)(Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
July 2, 2015 Filing 1220 NOTICE of CAFA Notices regarding Videogame Settlement by National Collegiate Athletic Association (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jeffrey Dahl, #2 Exhibit 1 to Dahl Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Dahl Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Dahl Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Dahl Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Dahl Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Dahl Declaration)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 7/2/2015) Modified on 7/6/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2015 Filing 1219 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kimberly Ann Kralowec and The Kralowec Law Group (Kralowec, Kimberly) (Filed on 6/8/2015)
May 4, 2015 Filing 1218 REPLY (re #1193 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Conditionally to Intervene Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24 ) filed byTimothy J McIlwain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Declaration McIlwain Reply Decl, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Geibelson, Michael) (Filed on 5/4/2015)
May 4, 2015 Filing 1217 REPLY (re #1207 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses and Incentive Award ) filed byRyan Hart. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Keith McKenna, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Owens, Arthur) (Filed on 5/4/2015)
May 4, 2015 Filing 1216 REPLY (re #1194 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards ) filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 5/4/2015)
May 4, 2015 Filing 1215 OBJECTIONS to Motion for Approval of Class Action Settlement by Nathan Harris. (Kron, Scott) (Filed on 5/4/2015)
April 27, 2015 Filing 1214 Declaration of Robert B. Carey in Support of #1213 Opposition/Response to Motion, for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Plaintiff Hart's Current and Former Attorneys filed bySamuel Michael Keller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-9)(Related document(s) #1213 ) (Carey, Robert) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
April 27, 2015 Filing 1213 RESPONSE (re #1193 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Conditionally to Intervene Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24, #1207 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses and Incentive Award ) filed by Samuel Michael Keller. (Carey, Robert) (Filed on 4/27/2015) Modified on 4/28/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2015 Filing 1212 RESPONSE (re #1194 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards ) filed bySamuel Michael Keller. (Carey, Robert) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
April 27, 2015 Filing 1211 RESPONSE (re #1193 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Conditionally to Intervene Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24, #1196 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Incentive Awards (EA Settlement) ) filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 4/27/2015) Modified on 4/28/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2015 Filing 1210 RESPONSE (re #1207 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses and Incentive Award ) filed byTimothy J McIlwain. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William C. Amadeo, #2 Declaration of Joseph C. Cane, #3 Declaration of Amber Jorgensen, #4 Supplemental Declaration of Timothy J. McIlwain, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Declaration of Kris Nejat, #15 Exhibit A, #16 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Geibelson, Michael) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
April 27, 2015 Filing 1209 RESPONSE (re #1194 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards, #1196 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Incentive Awards (EA Settlement) ) filed byTimothy J McIlwain. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael A. Geibelson, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Geibelson, Michael) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
April 27, 2015 Filing 1208 Memorandum of Law in RESPONSE (re #1193 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Conditionally to Intervene Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24 ) filed by Ryan Hart. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith McKenna, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Owens, Arthur) (Filed on 4/27/2015) Modified on 4/28/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2015 Filing 1207 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses and Incentive Award filed by Ryan Hart. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 4/27/2015. Replies due by 5/4/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dennis J. Drasco, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Declaration Keith A. McKenna, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Proposed Order)(Owens, Arthur) (Filed on 4/20/2015)
April 20, 2015 Filing 1206 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to File Under Seal Time Detail Exhibits #1192 (Owens, Arthur) (Filed on 4/20/2015) Modified on 4/21/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2015 Filing 1205 RESPONSE (re #1192 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Time-Detail Exhibits ) filed bySamuel Michael Keller. (Carey, Robert) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
April 17, 2015 Filing 1204 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Timothy J McIlwain re #1203 Certificate of Service, #1202 Opposition/Response to Motion, Revised Certificate of Service re Timothy J. McIlwain's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Time-Detail Exhibits to the Declarations in Support of Plaintiff's Petition for Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses and [Proposed] Order (Geibelson, Michael) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
April 17, 2015 Filing 1203 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Timothy J McIlwain re #1202 Opposition/Response to Motion, Certificate of Service re Timothy J. McIlwain's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Time-Detail Exhibits to the Declarations In Support of Plaintiff's Petition for Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses (Geibelson, Michael) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
April 17, 2015 Filing 1202 RESPONSE (re #1192 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Time-Detail Exhibits ) Timothy J. McIlwain's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Time-Detail Exhibits to the Declarations In Support of Plaintiff's Petition for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses filed byTimothy J McIlwain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Geibelson, Michael) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
April 15, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1194 #1197 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Responses due by 4/27/2015. Replies due by 5/4/2015. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2015)
April 15, 2015 Filing 1201 CLERK'S NOTICE Clarifying Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule as to All Motions for Attorney Fees filed on 4/13/2015. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 4/27/2015. Replies due by 5/4/2015. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2015)
April 14, 2015 Filing 1200 Proposed Order re #1196 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Incentive Awards (EA Settlement) by Samuel Michael Keller. (Carey, Robert) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
April 14, 2015 Filing 1199 Proposed Order re #1197 MOTION for Attorney Fees, Expenses, and Incentive Awards (NCAA Settlement) by Samuel Michael Keller. (Carey, Robert) (Filed on 4/14/2015) Modified on 4/14/2015 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2015 Filing 1198 Declaration of Kenneth Jue in Support of #1197 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Incentive Awards (NCAA Settlement) filed bySamuel Michael Keller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #1197 ) (Carey, Robert) (Filed on 4/13/2015) Modified on 4/14/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2015 Filing 1197 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Incentive Awards (NCAA Settlement) filed by Right of Publicity Plaintiffs, Samuel Michael Keller. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 4/27/2015. Replies due by 5/4/2015. (Carey, Robert) (Filed on 4/13/2015) Modified on 4/14/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2015 Filing 1196 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Incentive Awards (EA Settlement) filed by Samuel Michael Keller. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 4/27/2015. Replies due by 5/4/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Aragon, Leonard) (Filed on 4/13/2015)
April 13, 2015 Filing 1195 Declaration of Robert B. Carey in Support of Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Incentive Award Payments filed bySamuel Michael Keller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Carey, Robert) (Filed on 4/13/2015)
April 13, 2015 Filing 1194 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards filed by Antitrust Plaintiffs, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 7/2/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael D. Hausfeld, #2 Proposed Order)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 4/13/2015) Modified on 4/14/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2015 Filing 1193 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Conditionally to Intervene Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Timothy J McIlwain. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 4/27/2015. Replies due by 5/4/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Rubin, #2 Declaration of Eugene Egdorf, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Certificate/Proof of Service, #10 Declaration of Timothy J. McIlwain, #11 Exhibit A, #12 Exhibit B, #13 Exhibit C, #14 Exhibit D, #15 Certificate/Proof of Service, #16 Declaration of Michael A. Geibelson, #17 Exhibit A, #18 Exhibit B, #19 Exhibit C, #20 Exhibit D, #21 Exhibit E, #22 Exhibit F, #23 Exhibit G, #24 Exhibit H, #25 Exhibit I, #26 Exhibit J, #27 Certificate/Proof of Service, #28 Proposed Order)(Geibelson, Michael) (Filed on 4/13/2015) Modified on 4/28/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2015 Filing 1192 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Time-Detail Exhibits filed by Ryan Hart. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith McKenna, #2 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Unsealed Exhibit A, #4 Declaration of Dennis J Drasco, #5 Exhibit Seal Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit Unsealed Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit Unsealed Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit C, #10 Exhibit Unsealed Exhibit C, #11 Proposed Order)(Owens, Arthur) (Filed on 4/13/2015)
April 13, 2015 Filing 1191 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Ryan Hart. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 4/27/2015. Replies due by 5/4/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith McKenna, #2 Declaration of Dennis J Drasco, #3 Proposed Order)(Owens, Arthur) (Filed on 4/13/2015)
April 13, 2015 Filing 1190 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Geibelson (Geibelson, Michael) (Filed on 4/13/2015)
January 26, 2015 Filing 1189 NOTICE of Appearance by Bonny E. Sweeney for Plaintiff Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
December 29, 2014 Filing 1188 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Pretrial Conference, previously set for March 11, 2015, and the Jury Trial previously set to begin on March 23, 2015, are vacated. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2014)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1187 ORDER GRANTING #1186 STIPULATION Concerning Extension of Deadlines in Orders Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlements. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2015 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/29/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2014)
December 26, 2014 Filing 1186 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Extension of Deadlines in Orders Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlements filed by Samuel Michael Keller, National Collegiate Athletic Association, Electronic Arts Inc. (Aragon, Leonard) (Filed on 12/26/2014) Modified on 12/29/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2014 Filing 1185 U.S. Supreme Court Order (13-377) Dismissing petition for writ of certiorari as to #154 Notice of Appeal filed by Electronic Arts Inc. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
September 28, 2014 Filing 1184 Transcript of the Proceedings of the Official Electronic Sound Recording held on January 22, 2014, before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Transcriber Carrie McKee-Parks, Telephone number 510-637-9897; mckee-parks65@att.net. FTR 1:22-2:27. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/29/2014. (cmp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 1183 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/07/2011, before Judge Claudia A. Wilken. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415) 722-7045: email: leomank@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #1179 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/9/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2014. (Related documents(s) #1179 ) (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 1182 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by National Collegiate Athletic Association for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Rehn, Thane) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 1181 ** Due to untimely filing, this transcript is unlocked and available for immediately downloading. ** Transcript of Proceedings held on August 29, 2012, before Judge Nathanael Cousins. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #1180 Transcript Order ) (Related documents(s) #1180 ) (djc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 17, 2014 Filing 1180 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by National Collegiate Athletic Association for Court Reporter Sahar Bartlett. (Rehn, Thane) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 17, 2014 Filing 1179 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by National Collegiate Athletic Association for Court Reporter Leo Mankiewicz. (Rehn, Thane) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1178 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING #1138 PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1177 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING (167 in case 4:09-cv-03329-CW and 1108 in case 4:09-cv-01967-CW) PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANT ELECTRONIC ARTS INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
August 29, 2014 Filing 1176 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 24, 2014, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, Telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #1170 Transcript Order, #1172 Transcript Order, #1173 Transcript Order, #1171 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/3/2014. (Related document(s) #1170 , #1172 , #1173 , #1171 ) (rhm) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 27, 2014 Filing 1175 Second Joint Filing of Amended Settlement Exhibits by Samuel Michael Keller, National Collegiate Athletic Association, Eletronic Arts Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, 1a, #2 Exhibit 2, 2a, #3 Exhibit 3, 3a, #4 Exhibit 4, 4a)(Carey, Robert) (Filed on 8/27/2014) Modified on 8/28/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/28/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2014 Filing 1173 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by National Collegiate Athletic Association for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
July 28, 2014 Filing 1172 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Electronic Arts Inc. for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Shacham, Matan) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 28, 2014 Filing 1171 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Samuel Michael Keller for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Aragon, Leonard) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 28, 2014 Filing 1170 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 25, 2014 Filing 1169 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Samuel Michael Keller for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Aragon, Leonard) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
July 25, 2014 Filing 1167 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
July 25, 2014 Filing 1166 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by National Collegiate Athletic Association for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
July 24, 2014 Filing 1174 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/24/2014 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 7/24/2014). (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/24/2014)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1168 ORDER of USCA: Remanded to the district court for the limited purpose of deciding the parties motion for preliminary approval of theSettlement Agreement and any other motions related to the Settlement Agreement as to #154 Notice of Appeal filed by Electronic Arts Inc. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
July 24, 2014 Filing 1165 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kimberly Ann Kralowec and The Kralowec Law Group (Kralowec, Kimberly) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1164 Order granting #1162 Motion to Appear by Telephone entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
July 24, 2014 Filing 1163 NCAA 's Brief Regarding #1158 Amended Class Action Settlement Agreement Notices and O'Bannon v. NCAA filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Related document(s) #1158 ) (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 7/24/2014) Modified on 7/25/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2014 Filing 1162 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
July 23, 2014 Filing 1161 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the hearing on the motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement previously scheduled for July 24, 2014, at 2:00 p.m., will be held telephonically. No in-person hearing will be held tomorrow by the Court. All counsel must contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for their telephonic appearance. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2014)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1160 Order granting #1157 Motion to Appear by Telephone entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
July 23, 2014 Filing 1159 Antitrust Plaintiffs' Additional Statement Regarding the NCAA-ROP Settlement by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 7/23/2014) Modified on 7/24/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2014 Filing 1158 Joint Filing of Amended Settlement Agreements and Exhibits Thereto by Samuel Michael Keller, Electronic Arts Inc, National Collegiate Athletic Association.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Carey, Robert) (Filed on 7/23/2014) Modified on 7/24/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2014 Filing 1157 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the Preliminary Settlement Approval Hearing re Swathi Bojedla and Renae D. Steiner filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 7/23/2014)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1156 Order granting #1155 Motion to Appear by Telephone entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
July 22, 2014 Filing 1155 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Preliminary Settlement Approval Hearing filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Boyle, Peter) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
July 18, 2014 Filing 1154 Letter from Christopher Donnelly informing the court that he did not file a suit and to disregard any and all suits in his name. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 15, 2014 Filing 1153 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Ryan Hart for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Schaberg, Robert) (Filed on 7/15/2014)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1152 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING #1150 Joint MOTION FOR INDICATIVE RULING UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 62.1 AND FEDERAL RULE OF APPELLATE PROCEDURE 12.1 (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
July 11, 2014 Filing 1151 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 3, 2014, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #1147 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2014. (Related documents(s) #1147 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
July 9, 2014 Filing 1150 Joint MOTION FOR INDICATIVE RULING UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 62.1 AND FEDERAL RULE OF APPELLATE PROCEDURE 12.1 filed by Electronic Arts Inc., Samuel Michael Keller. Responses due by 7/23/2014. Replies due by 7/30/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 7/9/2014) Modified on 7/10/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2014 Filing 1149 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Samuel Michael Keller for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Aragon, Leonard) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 1148 Minute Entry: Status Conference (Date Filed: 7/7/2014). (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 1147 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Scherrer, Hilary) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 1146 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by National Collegiate Athletic Association for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 2, 2014 Reset Deadlines as to #1108 , #1138 MOTIONS for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (see docket no. #1145 ): Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2014 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1145 ORDER APPROVING #144 STIPULATION; SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. ( Motions terminated: #1142 , and #1143 MOTIONS to Appear by Telephone. Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/3/2014 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/2/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
July 1, 2014 Filing 1144 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Delaying Consideration of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Samuel Michael Keller, Electronic Arts Inc, National Collegiat Athletic Association, Collegiate Licensing Company, et al. (Carey, Robert) (Filed on 7/1/2014) Modified on 7/2/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2014 Filing 1143 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. (Fahmy, Christina) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
July 1, 2014 Filing 1142 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Samuel Michael Keller. (Aragon, Leonard) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
July 1, 2014 Filing 1141 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Court has approved Gregory Curtner, Keith McKenna, Dennis Drasco, and Arthur Owens request to appear by telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. **See text orders, docket nos. 1139 and 1140 .*** (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1140 Order granting #1130 Motion to Appear by Telephone entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1139 Order granting #1137 Motion to Appear by Telephone entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
June 30, 2014 Filing 1138 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Samuel Michael Keller. Motion Hearing set for 7/3/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 7/14/2014. Replies due by 7/21/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval, #2 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #3 Declaration of Steve W. Berman, #4 Declaration of Stuart M. Paynter)(Carey, Robert) (Filed on 6/30/2014) Modified on 7/1/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2014 Filing 1137 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
June 30, 2014 Filing 1136 ****DISREGARD, SEE DOCKET NO. #1138 **** MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval filed by Samuel Michael Keller. Motion Hearing set for 7/3/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 7/14/2014. Replies due by 7/21/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval, #2 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #3 Declaration of Steve W. Berman, #4 Declaration of Stuart M. Paynter)(Carey, Robert) (Filed on 6/30/2014) Modified on 6/30/2014 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2014 Filing 1135 STATUS REPORT by Samuel Michael Keller. (Carey, Robert) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
June 26, 2014 Filing 1134 STATUS REPORT (Fourth) Regarding Class Action Settlement Agreement by Samuel Michael Keller. (Carey, Robert) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
June 25, 2014 Filing 1131 STATUS REPORT (Third) Regarding Class Action Settlement Agreement by Samuel Michael Keller. (Carey, Robert) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 25, 2014 Filing 1130 MOTION to Appear by Telephone Keith McKenna, Dennis J. Drasco and Arthur M. Owens filed by Ryan Hart. (Schaberg, Robert) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 24, 2014 Filing 1133 Mail sent to Terry Nichols returned as undeliverable re #1116 Order on Motion to Intervene. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
June 24, 2014 Filing 1132 Mail sent to Ramzi Yusef returned as undeliverable re #1116 Order on Motion to Intervene. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
June 24, 2014 Filing 1129 STATUS REPORT (Second) Regarding Class Action Settlement Agreement by Samuel Michael Keller, National Collegiate Athletic Assocation. (Carey, Robert) (Filed on 6/24/2014) Modified on 6/25/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2014 Filing 1128 STATUS REPORT Regarding Class Action Settlement Agreement by Samuel Michael Keller, National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Carey, Robert) (Filed on 6/23/2014) Modified on 6/24/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1127 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/17/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1126 Order granting #1121 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1125 Order granting #1120 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1124 Order granting #1119 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1123 Order granting in part #1117 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. All dates are vacated as requested, except the pretrial and trial dates, which shall remain on calendar until the settlement is preliminarily approved. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
June 12, 2014 Filing 1122 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1116 Order on Motion to Intervene (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
June 12, 2014 Filing 1121 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Keith A. McKenna on behalf of Ryan Hart and the Proposed Class ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8690843.) filed by Samuel Michael Keller. (Schaberg, Robert) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
June 12, 2014 Filing 1120 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Dennis J. Drasco on behalf of Ryan Hart and the Proposed Class ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8690767.) filed by Samuel Michael Keller. (Schaberg, Robert) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
June 12, 2014 Filing 1119 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Arthur M. Owens on behalf of Ryan Hart and Proposed Class ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8690723.) filed by Samuel Michael Keller. (Schaberg, Robert) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
June 12, 2014 Filing 1118 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Schaberg on behalf of Ryan Hart and the Proposed Class (Schaberg, Robert) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
June 12, 2014 Filing 1117 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Vacate Deadlines and Dates filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Samuel Michael Keller, et al. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 6/12/2014) Modified on 6/13/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1116 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying #1113 Motion to Intervene (cwlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
June 9, 2014 Filing 1115 STIPULATION AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Samuel Keller, Bryan Cummings, Lamarr Watkins, Byron Bishop. (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 6/9/2014) Modified on 6/10/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1114 ORDER of USCA denying petition for writ of mandamus (14-71522) (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1112 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #1104 Motion to Relate Case (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 2, 2014 Filing 1113 MOTION to Intervene filed by Christopher Donnelly, Christopher Wirth, Jonathan Rich, Edward Breivik, Jimmy Thule, Terry Nichols, Ramzi Yusef, James E. Holmes. Responses due by 6/16/2014. Replies due by 6/23/2014. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
June 2, 2014 Filing 1111 RESPONSE (re #1104 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Raoul) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
June 2, 2014 Filing 1110 NOTICE of Appearance by Raoul Dion Kennedy on behalf of National Collegiate Athletic Association (Kennedy, Raoul) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1109 Order granting #1107 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 30, 2014 Filing 1108 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 7/3/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 6/13/2014. Replies due by 6/20/2014. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration of Michael D. Hausfeld, #4 Declaration of Steve W. Berman, #5 Declaration of Leonard W. Aragon)(Scherrer, Hilary) (Filed on 5/30/2014) Modified on 6/2/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2014 Filing 1107 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Exceed Page Limitations filed by Samuel Michael Keller, Eletronic Arts Inc, et al. (Aragon, Leonard) (Filed on 5/30/2014) Modified on 6/2/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1105 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken RESOLVING ( #1063 , #1069 ) MOTIONS IN LIMINE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
May 29, 2014 Filing 1106 USCA Case Number 14-71522. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
May 28, 2014 Filing 1104 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Nicholas Kindler. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jon T. King, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(King, Jon) (Filed on 5/28/2014) Modified on 5/29/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1102 Order granting #1099 Motion to Appear by Telephone entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 27, 2014 Filing 1100 Clerk's Notice Regarding Proposed Video Recording (Document #1088) (zml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 1099 MOTION to Appear by Telephone Seth Rosenthal to attend pretrial conference filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosenthal, Seth) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1098 Order granting #1095 Motion to Appear by Telephone entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1097 Order granting #1094 Motion to Appear by Telephone entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1096 Order granting #1093 Motion to Appear by Telephone entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 23, 2014 Set Deadlines/Hearing (see docket no. #1092 ): Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2015 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken; Jury Selection / Jury Trial (10 day)set for 3/23/2015 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
May 23, 2014 Set Deadlines/Hearing (see docket no. #1092 ): Motions due by 10/16/2014; Cross Motions /Responses due by 10/30/2014; Replies due by 11/14/2014; Replies due by 12/3/2014; Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2014 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
May 23, 2014 Set Deadlines/Hearing (see docket no. #1092 ): Motions due by 6/26/2014; Cross Motion/Responses due by 7/10/2014; Replies due by 7/14/2014; Replies due by 7/17/2014; Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2014 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
May 23, 2014 Filing 1095 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fahmy, Christina) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
May 23, 2014 Filing 1094 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for Robert J. Wierenga filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
May 23, 2014 Filing 1093 MOTION to Appear by Telephone For Gregory L. Curtner filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1092 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING (1029 in case 4:09-cv-01967-CW) MOTION TO SEVER TRIAL ISSUES OR CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND SETTING DATES. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1091 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING #1032 MOTION TO CERTIFY INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
May 22, 2014 Filing 1090 MOTION for Leave to File One-Page Reply Regarding Timing and Order of Trial, filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 5/22/2014) Modified on 5/23/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2014 Filing 1089 MOTION for Leave to File a Short Response to Defendant NCAA's Submission Regarding Timing and Order of Trial filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS' SHORT RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT NCAAS SUBMISSION REGARDING TIMING AND ORDER OF TRIAL)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 5/21/2014) Modified on 5/22/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2014 Filing 1088 Clerk's Notification of Request for Video Recording. Note this Notification only applies to parties set to go to trial in June 2014. (Attachments: #1 Party Response to Request for Video Recording) (zml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
May 20, 2014 Filing 1087 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 15, 2014, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/18/2014. (Related documents(s) #1073 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 20, 2014 Filing 1086 Defendant NCAAs Submission Regarding Timing and Order of Trial by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 5/20/2014) Modified on 5/21/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2014 Filing 1085 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Electronic Arts Inc. re #1081 Response (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/20/2014) Modified on 5/21/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2014 Filing 1084 RESPONSE to Parties' Proposed Schedules #1076 , #1077 , #1079 by Collegiate Licensing Company. (Boyle, Peter) (Filed on 5/20/2014) Modified on 5/21/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1083 Order granting #1068 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1082 Order finding as moot #1067 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 20, 2014 Filing 1081 RESPONSE to re #1077 Right of Publicity Plaintiffs' and NCAA's Joint Proposed Schedule by Electronic Arts Inc.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 5/20/2014) Modified on 5/21/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2014 Filing 1080 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Electronic Arts Inc. for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Shacham, Matan) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 20, 2014 Filing 1079 Antitrust Plaintiffs' Proposed Amended Pretrial Schedule by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 5/20/2014) Modified on 5/21/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2014 Filing 1078 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Potepan, James) (Filed on 5/20/2014) Modified on 5/21/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2014 Filing 1077 Right of Publicity Plaintiffs' and NCAA's Joint Proposed Schedule by Samuel Michael Keller, National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Right of Publicity Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Its Proposed Scheduling Order)(Aragon, Leonard) (Filed on 5/19/2014) Modified on 5/20/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2014 Filing 1076 Statement - Antitrust Plaintiffs' Supplemental Submission Regarding Trial by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
May 16, 2014 Filing 1075 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Collegiate Licensing Company for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Henn, R.) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 15, 2014 Filing 1103 Corrected #1101 Minute Entry: Telephonic Status Conference (Date Filed: 5/15/2014). (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/15/2014)
May 15, 2014 Filing 1101 Minute Entry: Status Conference (Date Filed: 5/15/2014). (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/15/2014)
May 15, 2014 Filing 1074 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by National Collegiate Athletic Association for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
May 15, 2014 Filing 1073 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
May 14, 2014 Filing 1072 Proposed Jury Instructions by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr Filed Jointly with Antitrust Plaintiffs. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 5/14/2014) Modified on 5/15/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2014 Filing 1071 Joint Pretrial Conference Statement by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 5/14/2014) Modified on 5/15/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2014 Filing 1070 PRETRIAL MATERIALS of Defendant NCAA by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 5/14/2014) Modified on 5/15/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2014 Filing 1069 MOTION in Limine filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 5/21/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 5/14/2014) Modified on 5/15/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2014 Filing 1068 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Evidentiary Objections filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 5/14/2014) Modified on 5/15/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2014 Filing 1067 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Prohibiting References to Plaintiffs' Entitlement to Treble Damages, Attorneys' Fees, and Costs and Regarding EA Settlement filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 5/14/2014) Modified on 5/15/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2014 Filing 1066 NOTICE by National Collegiate Athletic Association of Lodging Trial Exhibits (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
May 14, 2014 Filing 1065 Joint Proposed Voir Dire by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Hardship Qustionnaire, #2 Exhibit B, Subject Matter Screen)(Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 5/14/2014) Modified on 5/15/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2014 Filing 1064 Antitrust Plaintiffs' Pretrial Materials by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Antitrust Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibit List, #2 Antitrust Plaintiffs' Witness List, #3 Antitrust Plaintiffs' Objections to NCAAs Written Discovery Designations, #4 Antitrust Plaintiffs' Proposed Verdict Form, #5 Antitrust Plaintiffs' Objections to NCAA Exhibit List)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 5/14/2014) Modified on 5/15/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2014 Filing 1063 MOTION in Limine filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 5/28/2014. Replies due by 6/4/2014. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order)(Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 5/14/2014) Modified on 5/15/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2014 Filing 1062 Antitrust Plaintiffs' Supplemental Response to #1042 -1, #1047 -1 Amici Curiae Briefs In Support of Defendant NCAA's Motion to Certify Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) The Court's Order Resolving Cross Motions for Summary Judgment by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 5/14/2014) Modified on 5/15/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1061 ORDER of USCA (No. 14-80060) Granting motion for expedited consideration re petition for permission to appeal; Denying petition for permission to appeal the district court's April 11, 2014 order granting motion to amend class definition. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014) Modified on 5/14/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2014 Filing 1060 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that all Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic conference scheduled for May 15, 2014, at 11:00 a.m. **See text order, docket no. #1055 .*** (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014) Modified on 5/14/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1059 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING #1033 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1058 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING ( #1042 , #1047 ) MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT AMICUS BRIEFS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
May 12, 2014 ***See #1055 Order. Set Hearing Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/15/2014 11:00 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
May 12, 2014 Filing 1057 REPLY (re #1047 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief ) filed byA&E Television Networks, LLC, ABC, Inc., CBS Corporation, Fox Broadcasting Company, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, National Public Radio, Inc., Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Turner Broadcasting System, Inc.. (Phillips, Celeste) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 1056 REPLY (re #1032 MOTION to Certify Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) Court's Order Resolving Cross Motions for Summary Judgment re #1025 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment ) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1055 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE (cwlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 7, 2014 Filing 1054 RESPONSE (re #1032 Defendant NCAA's Motion for Certification of an Interlocutory Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 5/7/2014) Modified on 5/8/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2014 Filing 1053 CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given that the deadlines and hearing set re #1042 , #1047 MOTIONS to File Amicus Curiae Brief are vacated. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 5, 2014 Filing 1052 REPLY (re #1029 MOTION to Sever or Alternatively to Continue Trial ) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 5, 2014 ***See document #1042. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1042 MOTION for Leave to File AN AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT NCAAS 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) MOTION TO CERTIFY THE COURTS APRIL 11, 2014 ORDER RESOLVING CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Responses due by 5/16/2014. Replies due by 5/23/2014. Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2014 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 4, 2014 Filing 1051 RESPONSE (re #1047 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief , #1042 MOTION for Leave to File AN AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT NCAAS 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) MOTION TO CERTIFY THE COURTS APRIL 11, 2014 ORDER RESOLVING CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ) - Antitrust Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motions for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Briefs in Support of Defendant NCAA's Motion to Certify Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(B) the Court's Order Resolving Cross Motions for Summary Judgment filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 5/4/2014)
May 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1050 Order granting #1046 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1049 Order granting #1045 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 2, 2014 Filing 1048 RESPONSE (re #1029 MOTION to Sever or Alternatively to Continue Trial ) filed bySamuel Michael Keller. (Aragon, Leonard) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 1047 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by A&E Television Networks, LLC, ABC, Inc., CBS Corporation, Discovery Communications, LLC, Fox Broadcasting Company, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, National Public Radio, Inc., Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Turner Broadcasting System, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 5/16/2014. Replies due by 5/23/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Phillips, Celeste) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 1046 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Nathan E. Siegel ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8587754.) filed by A&E Television Networks, LLC, ABC, Inc., CBS Corporation, Discovery Communications, LLC, Fox Broadcasting Company, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, National Public Radio, Inc., Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Turner Broadcasting System, Inc.. (Siegel, Nathan) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 1045 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Erwin Chemerinsky ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-858766.) Filing fee previously paid on 5/2/2014 filed by A&E Television Networks, LLC, ABC, Inc., CBS Corporation, Discovery Communications, LLC, Fox Broadcasting Company, National Public Radio, Inc., NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Turner Broadcasting System, Inc.. (Chemerinsky, Erwin) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 1044 RESPONSE (re #1029 MOTION to Sever or Alternatively to Continue Trial ) filed byCollegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Arts Inc.. (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 1043 RESPONSE (re #1029 MOTION to Sever or Alternatively to Continue Trial ) Antitrust Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant NCAA's Motion to Server or, Alternatively, to Continue Trial filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 1042 MOTION for Leave to File AN AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT NCAAS 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) MOTION TO CERTIFY THE COURTS APRIL 11, 2014 ORDER RESOLVING CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by First Amendment Coalition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Raygor, Kent) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1041 Order granting #1039 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1040 Order granting #1038 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
April 30, 2014 ***See order, document #1037. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1032 MOTION to Certify Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) Court's Order Resolving Cross Motions for Summary Judgment re #1025 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 5/7/2014. Replies due by 5/9/2014. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 29, 2014 Filing 1039 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Trial Witness Notification Protocol filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 4/29/2014) Modified on 4/30/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2014 Filing 1038 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Exchange of Pretrial Materials and Deposition Designation Protocol filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., Samuel Michael Keller, et al. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 4/29/2014) Modified on 4/30/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1037 Order granting #1034 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
April 29, 2014 Filing 1036 CLERKS NOTICE RE #1033 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Notice is hereby given that pursuant to l.r. 7-9 (d), unless otherwise ordered by the assigned Judge, no response need be filed and no hearing will be held concerning a motion for leave to file a motion to reconsider. If the judge decides to order the filing of additional papers or that the matter warrants a hearing, the judge will fix an appropriate schedule. All deadlines and hearing previously set are vacated. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014) Modified on 5/6/2014 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2014 Filing 1034 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to shorten time on briefing re #1032 MOTION to Certify Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) Court's Order Resolving Cross Motions for Summary Judgment re #1025 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Samuel Michael Keller, et al. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus)(Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 4/29/2014) Modified on 4/30/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1033 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Summary Judgment Order (Civil L.R. 7-9). Responses due by 5/12/2014. Replies due by 5/19/2014. Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2014 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 28, 2014 Filing 1033 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Summary Judgment Order (Civil L.R. 7-9) filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 28, 2014 Filing 1032 MOTION to Certify Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) Court's Order Resolving Cross Motions for Summary Judgment re #1025 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 5/12/2014. Replies due by 5/19/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 4/28/2014) Modified on 4/29/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1031 ORDER TAKING UNDER SUBMISSION #1029 MOTION FOR SEVERANCE OR CONTINUANCE. Responses due by 5/2/2014; Replies due by 5/5/2014. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/28/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 25, 2014 Filing 1035 USCA Case Number 14-80060. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
April 25, 2014 Filing 1030 Proposed Order re #1029 MOTION to Sever or Alternatively to Continue Trial by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
April 25, 2014 Filing 1029 MOTION to Sever or Alternatively to Continue Trial filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 5/9/2014. Replies due by 5/16/2014. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
April 21, 2014 Filing 1028 NOTICE of Appearance by Lin Yee Chan (Chan, Lin) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 14, 2014 Filing 1027 Statement of Additional Filing In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 4/14/2014) Modified on 4/15/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1026 Order granting #1024 Motion for Leave to File entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1025 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken RESOLVING ( #898 , #933 ) CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; GRANTING #998 MOTION TO AMEND CLASS DEFINITION; DENYING #911 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 11, 2014 Filing 1024 MOTION for Leave to File Statement of Additional Filing filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statement of Additional Filing, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 4/11/2014) Modified on 4/13/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2014 Filing 1023 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d Antitrust Plaintiffs' Statement of Recent Decision In Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1022 Order granting #1020 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1021 Order granting #1019 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
April 4, 2014 Filing 1020 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Swathi Bojedla ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8507743.) filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 3, 2014 Filing 1019 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8504304.) filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Schwalb, Brian) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1018 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #1016 Motion for Leave to File (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 26, 2014 Filing 1016 MOTION for Leave to File Antitrust Plaintiffs' Request for Leave to File Statement of Recent Decision filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statement of Recent Decision, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 1017 Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference held with Judge Cousins on 3/24/2014. NCAA to provide phone update to Judge Cousins on 3/28, 3:00 p.m. Further conference may be scheduled after update. (lhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/24/2014) Modified on 3/28/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2014 Filing 1015 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held with Judge Cousins on 3/17/14. Further Settlement Conference set for 3/24/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 1014 ** DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR ** Modified on 3/18/2014 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1013 ORDER RELATING CASE with member case C-14-1011-CW.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/17/2014. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 17, 2014 Filing 1012 Certain Non-Party Conferences' Response to Rule 3-12(c) Order of Referral to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related re #1010 Order by Big 12 Conference, Pac-12 Conference, The Big Ten Conference, Inc., ACC, SEC. (Rosenman, Andrew) (Filed on 3/17/2014) Modified on 3/18/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2014 Filing 1011 RESPONSE to re #1010 Order, of Referral by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1010 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Alston v. National Collegiate Athletic Association, et al., C 14-1011 MMC, is referred to Judge Claudia Wilken for consideration of whether the case is related to Keller v. Electronic Arts Inc. et al., C 09-1967 CW. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 14, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 1009 JOINT STATEMENT OF ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT NCAA RE: AUTHORSHIP OF EXHIBIT 27 TO THE DECLARATION OF HILARY K. SCHERRER (DKT NO. 898-30) by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 3/7/2014) Modified on 3/10/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1008 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER - Settlement Conference set for 3/17/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/6/14. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 3, 2014 Filing 1007 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 20, 2014, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2014. (Related documents(s) #990 , #991 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
February 28, 2014 Filing 1006 REPLY (re #998 MOTION to Amend Class Definition ) Antitrust Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Amend the Injunctive Class Definition filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Bailey, Arthur) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1005 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cousins for Settlement. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/28/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 1004 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #989 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,, Exhibits 29, 36, 65 and 78 to the Declaration of Carolyn Hoecker Luedtke on Behalf of NCAA In Opposition to Antitrust Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and In Support of NCAA's Motion for Summary Judgment (Refiled Pursuant Under Seal Pursuant to Court Order, Dkt. No. 898) by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 29, #2 Exhibit 36, #3 Exhibit 65, #4 Exhibit 78)(Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 1003 Declaration of Carolyn Hoecker Luedtke in Support of #933 MOTION for Summary Judgment Declaration of Carolyn Hoecker Luedtke on Behalf of NCAA in Opposition to Antitrust Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and In Support of NCAA's Motion for Summary Judgment (Refiled Pursuant to Court Order, Dkt. No. 989) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 39, #2 Exhibit 40 Part 1, #3 Exhibit 40 Part 2, #4 Exhibit 48, #5 Exhibit 83)(Related document(s) #933 ) (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 1002 EXHIBITS re #978 Reply to Opposition/Response, Exhibits 3, 5 and 7 to the Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus In Support of NCAA's Reply Brief In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Refiled Pursuant to Court Order, Dkt. No. 989) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) #978 ) (Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 26, 2014 Filing 1001 RESPONSE (re #998 MOTION to Amend Class Definition ) NCAA OPPOSITION TO ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO AMEND CLASS DEFINITION filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 26, 2014 Filing 1000 Public Filing of Antitrust Plaintiffs' Combined Opposition to NCAA's Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Related Exhibits Complying with Dkt No. #989 filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit 18, #5 Exhibit 25, #6 Exhibit 66, #7 Exhibit 68, #8 Exhibit 69)(Related document(s) #989 ) (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 2/26/2014) Modified on 2/27/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2014 Filing 999 Public Filing of Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Related Exhibits Complying with Dkt No. #989 filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 12, #3 Exhibit 24, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 19, #7 Exhibit 20, #8 Exhibit 22)(Related document(s) #989 ) (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 2/26/2014) Modified on 2/27/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2014 Filing 998 MOTION to Amend Class Definition filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. Responses due by 3/10/2014. Replies due by 3/17/2014. (Scherrer, Hilary) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 997 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Collegiate Licensing Company for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Potepan, James) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 996 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION in support of Antitrust Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to NCAA's Motion for Summary Judgment pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jordan v. Jewel Food Stores, Inc., No. 12-1992, 2014 U.S. App. LEXIS 3030 (7th Cir. February 19, 2014))(Related document(s) #898 , #957 ) (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 2/24/2014) Modified on 2/25/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2014 Filing 995 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Samuel Michael Keller for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Aragon, Leonard) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 993 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Electronic Arts Inc. for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 992 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Collegiate Licensing Company for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Henn, R.) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 991 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by National Collegiate Athletic Association for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Filing 990 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 20, 2014 Filing 994 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/20/2014 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 2/20/2014), Further Case Management Conference held on 2/20/2014 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 2/20/2014). (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/20/2014)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 989 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken RESOLVING( #896 , #932 , #941 , #960 , #984 ) MOTIONS TO SEAL (granting in part and denying in part #896 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting #932 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting #941 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part #960 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting #984 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 13, 2014 Filing 988 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Edward C O'Bannon, Jr., Samuel Michael Keller. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 2/13/2014) Modified on 2/14/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 987 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL DEPOSITIONS #973 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/10/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 986 ORDER RE: ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS RELATED TO RECENT BYLAW CHANGES #917 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
February 7, 2014 Filing 985 Declaration of Christina E. Fahmy in Support of #984 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated As Confidential filed byCollegiate Licensing Company. (Related document(s) #984 ) (Fahmy, Christina) (Filed on 2/7/2014) Modified on 2/10/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2014 Filing 984 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal l Materials Designated As Confidential (Correcting Dkt. No. 979) filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Jeslyn Miller ISO, #3 Exhibit 3 to Miller Decl., #4 Exhibit 5 to Miller Decl. - Public, #5 Exhibit 5 to Miller Decl. - Sealed, #6 Exhibit 7 to Miller Decl.)(Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 2/7/2014) Modified on 2/10/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 983 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING #940 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 982 Order granting #980 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
February 4, 2014 Filing 981 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Daniel E. Jackson (Jackson, Daniel) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 4, 2014 Filing 980 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Melissa Maxman ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8347876.) filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Maxman, Melissa) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 979 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant NCAA's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated as Confidential filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeslyn Miller ISO, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 3 Redacted, #4 Exhibit 3 Sealed, #5 Exhibit 5 Redacted, #6 Exhibit 5 Sealed, #7 Exhibit 7 Redacted, #8 Exhibit 7 Sealed)(Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 Filing 978 REPLY (re #933 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly Klaus ISO, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 2/3/2014) Modified on 2/4/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2014 Filing 977 REPLY (re #940 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support Of Defendant NCAA's Motion For Summary Judgment ) filed byBig Ten Network, LLC., Fox Broadcasting Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stone, Richard) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 29, 2014 Filing 976 Letter from Brendan Glackin In re: NCAA Student-Athlete Name & Likeness Licensing Litigation. (Glackin, Brendan) (Filed on 1/29/2014) Modified on 1/30/2014 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2014 Filing 975 (Plaintiffs'Proposed Order) re #917 Re: Antitrust Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Documents Related to Recent Bylaw Changes by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Glackin, Brendan) (Filed on 1/27/2014) Modified on 1/28/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2014 Filing 974 Proposed Order #917 NCAA RE: ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS RELATED TO RECENT BYLAW CHANGES by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 1/27/2014) Modified on 1/28/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2014 Filing 973 JOINT STATEMENT OF ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT NCAA RE: NCAAS REQUEST FOR FURTHER DEPOSITIONS OF ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Samuel Michael Keller. (Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 1/24/2014) Modified on 1/27/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 972 Order granting #969 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
January 23, 2014 Filing 971 RESPONSE (re #940 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support Of Defendant NCAA's Motion For Summary Judgment ) filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 1/23/2014) Modified on 1/24/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2014 Filing 969 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8318475.) filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rehn, Thane) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 22, 2014 Filing 968 Minute Entry: Hearing held on 1/22/2014 before Nathanael Cousins re Antitrust Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #917 . Parties to submit joint proposed order or separate orders by 1/27/2014 04:00 PM. (FTR: 1:22pm - 2:27pm.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/22/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 967 Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus in Support of #960 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated as Confidential filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #960 ) (Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 966 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE #965 . Counsel shall contact the Courtroom Deputy at 415.522.2039 to provide a direct dial number for this appearance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 965 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 17, 2014 Filing 970 EXHIBITS 71 and 72 (CDs) re #957 -2 Declaration of Hilary K. Scherrer filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Related document(s) #957 ) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014) Modified on 1/24/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2014 Filing 964 ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF re #917 MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS RELATED TO RECENT BYLAW CHANGES filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Renae D. Steiner, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X)(Scherrer, Hilary) (Filed on 1/17/2014) Modified on 1/21/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 963 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATIONS TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY #961 #962 . Counsel must call the Courts courtroom deputy at 415.522.2039 in advance to provide the Court with a direct dial number for this appearance. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
January 17, 2014 Filing 962 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at January 22, 2014 Hearing filed by Samuel Michael Keller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Aragon, Leonard) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
January 16, 2014 Filing 961 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Conference USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Capps, Leane) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 14, 2014 Filing 960 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated as Confidential filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Ex. 1, #4 Redacted Version of Ex. 2, #5 Redacted Version of Ex. 8, #6 Redacted Version of Ex. 18, #7 Redacted Version of Ex. 25, #8 Redacted Version of Ex. 66, #9 Redacted Version of Ex. 68, #10 Redacted Version of Ex. 69, #11 Redacted Version of ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS' COMBINED OPPOSITION TO NCAA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #12 Unredacted Version of Ex. 1, #13 Unredacted Version of Ex. 2, #14 Unredacted Version of Ex. 8, #15 Unredacted Version of Ex. 18, #16 Unredacted Version of Ex. 25, #17 Unredacted Version of Ex. 66, #18 Unredacted Version of Ex. 68, #19 Unredacted Version of Ex. 69, #20 Unredacted Version of ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS' COMBINED OPPOSITION TO NCAA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
January 14, 2014 Filing 959 NOTICE by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF LODGING OF DVDS IN SUPPORT OF COMBINED OPPOSITION TO NCAA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
January 13, 2014 Filing 958 OPPOSITION to re: Antitrust Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Documents Related to Recent Bylaw Changes #954 by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kris Richardson, #2 Declaration of Kimberly K. Kefalas, #3 Exhibit 1 to Kafalas Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Kafalas Declaration, #5 Proposed Order)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 1/13/2014) Modified on 1/14/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2014 Filing 957 REPLY (re #898 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) - ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS' COMBINED OPPOSITION TO NCAA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Response to Evidentiary Objections, #2 Declaration of Hilary K. Scherrer, #3 Ex. 1, #4 Ex. 2, #5 Ex. 3, #6 Ex. 4, #7 Ex. 5, #8 Ex. 6, #9 Ex. 7, #10 Ex. 8, #11 Ex. 9, #12 Ex. 10, #13 Ex. 11, #14 Ex. 12, #15 Ex. 13, #16 Ex. 14, #17 Ex. 15, #18 Ex. 16, #19 Ex. 17, #20 Ex. 18, #21 Ex. 19, #22 Ex. 20, #23 Ex. 21, #24 Ex. 22, #25 Ex. 23, #26 Ex. 24, #27 Ex. 25, #28 Ex. 26, #29 Ex. 27, #30 Ex. 28, #31 Ex. 29, #32 Ex. 30, #33 Ex. 31, #34 Ex. 32, #35 Ex. 33, #36 Ex. 34, #37 Ex. 35, #38 Ex. 36, #39 Ex. 37, #40 Ex. 38, #41 Ex. 39, #42 Ex. 40, #43 Ex. 41, #44 Ex. 42, #45 Ex. 43, #46 Ex. 44, #47 Ex. 45, #48 Ex. 46, #49 Ex. 47, #50 Ex. 48, #51 Ex. 49, #52 Ex. 50, #53 Ex. 51, #54 Ex.. 52, #55 Ex. 53, #56 Ex. 54, #57 Ex. 55, #58 Ex. 56, #59 Ex. 57, #60 Ex. 58, #61 Ex. 59, #62 Ex. 60, #63 Ex. 61, #64 Ex. 62, #65 Ex. 63, #66 Ex. 64, #67 Ex. 65, #68 Ex. 66, #69 Ex. 67, #70 Ex. 68, #71 Ex. 69, #72 Ex. 70, #73 Ex. 71, #74 Ex. 72)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 13, 2014 Filing 956 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated as Confidential filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Ex. 2, #4 Redacted Ex. 8, #5 Redacted Version of ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS' COMBINED OPPOSITION TO NCAA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #6 Sealed Ex. 2, #7 Sealed Ex. 8, #8 Sealed Version of ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS' COMBINED OPPOSITION TO NCAA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 13, 2014 Filing 955 Supreme Court of United States Case Number 13M54; Denying motion for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae; Denying petition for a writ of certiorari. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014) Modified on 1/14/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2014 Filing 954 [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS RELATED TO RECENT BYLAW CHANGES by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 1/9/2014) Modified on 1/9/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 3, 2014 ***See text order, document #951. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #940 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support Of Defendant NCAA's Motion For Summary Judgment. Responses due by 1/23/2014. Replies due by 1/30/2014. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2014 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014) Modified on 1/6/2014 (kk, COURT STAFF).
January 2, 2014 Filing 953 DECLARATION OF TINA K. SHAH IN SUPPORT OF #932 DEFENDANT NCAA'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL MATERIALS DESIGNATED AS CONFIDENTIAL filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Related document(s) #932 ) (Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 1/2/2014) Modified on 1/3/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 2, 2014 Filing 952 DECLARATION OF BURKE MAGNUS IN SUPPORT OF #932 DEFENDANT NCAA'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL MATERIALS DESIGNATED AS CONFIDENTIAL filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Related document(s) #932 ) (Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 1/2/2014) Modified on 1/3/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 951 Order granting #949 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 31, 2013 Filing 950 DECLARATION of Carolyn Hoecker Luedtke CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [941-3] AND DOCKET # [941-6] Declaration of Carolyn Hoecker Luedtke on Behalf of NCAA in Opposition to Antitrust Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and in Support of NCAA's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 83)(Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 12/31/2013)
December 31, 2013 Filing 949 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule re #940 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support Of Defendant NCAA's Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., Big Ten Network LLC, Fox Broadcasting Company. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 12/31/2013) Modified on 1/2/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 26, 2013 Filing 948 NOTICE of Appearance by Leane K Capps (Capps, Leane) (Filed on 12/26/2013)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 947 Order granting #942 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 20, 2013 Filing 946 Exhibit No. 46A to the Declaration of Carolyn Luedtke on Behalf of NCAA In Opposition to Antitrust Plaintiffs' MSJ and ISO NCAA's MSJ filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 46A) (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 12/20/2013) Modified on 12/26/2013 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2013 Filing 945 Corrected Exhibits Nos. 26 and 30 [re Dkt. Nos. 925-1; 925-2, 925-3; 925-4; 925-5; and 925-9] to the Declaration of Carolyn H. Luedkte on Behalf of NCAA In Opposition to Antitrust Plaintiffs' MSJ and ISO NCAA's MSJ filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit No. 26, #2 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit No. 26, Exhibits A-F, #3 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit No. 26, Exhibit G, #4 Exhibit Exhibit No. 26, Exhibits H-M, #5 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 26A, #6 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 30, Part 1, #7 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 30, Part 2)(Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 12/20/2013) Modified on 12/26/2013 (cp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/26/2013 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2013 Filing 944 Corrected Exhibit No. 25 [re Dkt. No. 922-16; 922-17; and 922-18] to the Declaration of Carolyn Hoecker Luedtke on Behalf of NCAA in Opposition to Antitrust Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and in Support of NCAA's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit No. 25, #2 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit No. 25, Exhibit A, Part 1, #3 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit No. 25, Exhibit A, Part 2, #4 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit No. 25, Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit No. 25, Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit No. 25, Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit No. 25A) (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 12/20/2013) Modified on 12/26/2013 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2013 Filing 943 Corrected Exhibit No. 10 re [Dkt. No. 921-11] to the Declaration of Carolyn Hoecker Luedtke on Behalf of NCAA in Opposition to Antitrust Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and in Support of NCAA's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 10 to Luedtke Declaration)(Related document(s) #921 ) (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 12/20/2013) Modified on 12/26/2013 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2013 Filing 942 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document NCAA's Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents and Proposed Order filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 941 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant NCAA's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated as Confidential filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly Klaus ISO Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Carolyn Luedtke on Behalf of NCAA In Oppositon to Antitrust Plaintiffs' MSJ and ISO NCAA MSJ PUBLIC, #4 Declaration of Carolyn Luedtke on Behalf of NCAA In Oppositon to Antitrust Plaintiffs' MSJ and ISO NCAA MSJ SEALED, *** #5 Exhibit 83 - PUBLIC FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED*** , #6 Exhibit 83 - SEALED)(Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 12/20/2013) Modified on 12/20/2013 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/20/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2013 Filing 940 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support Of Defendant NCAA's Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Fox Broadcasting Company, Big Ten Network, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Stone, Richard) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 939 ORDER SETTING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE: #917 . Plaintiffs are to file a proposed order granting the motion to compel by 1/9/2014; NCAA is to file its opposition by 1/13/2014; Plaintiffs are to file their reply brief by 1/17/2014. Hearing set for 1/22/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/18/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 938 Declaration of Hilary K. Scherrer in Support of #932 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated as Confidential filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Related document(s) #932 ) (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 937 Order granting #934 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 16, 2013 Filing 936 Declaration of R. James Slaughter in Support of #932 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal MATERIALS DESIGNATED AS CONFIDENTIAL; DKT. 932 filed byElectronic Arts Inc.. (Related document(s) #932 ) (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 Filing 935 Declaration of Peter M. Boyle in Support of #932 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated as Confidential filed byCollegiate Licensing Company. (Related document(s) #932 ) (Boyle, Peter) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 Filing 934 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadline for Third Parties to File Responses Pursuant to LR 79-5 filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Edward C. O'Obannon, Jr. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 12/16/2013) Modified on 12/17/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/17/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2013 Exhibits e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 13, 2013 Filing 933 MOTION for Summary Judgment Corrected Notice of Motion and Motion by NCAA for Summary Judgment filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 1/13/2014. Replies due by 2/3/2014. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 12/13/2013) Modified on 12/16/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2013 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #923 Notice (Other) filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. The correct event code is: MOTION. Re-posting is required to correct this CM/ECF entry. This correction must be completed no later than 24 hours from receipt of the notification (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 Filing 932 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Jeslyn Miller, #3 Exhibit 29 ISO Luedket Decl. (Dkt. 921), #4 Exhibit 36 ISO Luedket Decl. (Dkt. 921), #5 Exhibit 39 ISO Luedket Decl. (Dkt. 921), #6 Exhibit 40 ISO Luedket Decl. (Dkt. 921), #7 Exhibit 40A ISO Luedket Decl. (Dkt. 921), #8 Exhibit 48 ISO Luedket Decl. (Dkt. 921), #9 Exhibit 65 ISO Luedket Decl. (Dkt. 921), #10 Exhibit 78 ISO Luedket Decl. (Dkt. 921))(Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 Filing 931 EXHIBITS filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 71 to Luedtke Decl., #2 Exhibit 72 to Luedtke Decl., #3 Exhibit 73 to Luedtke Decl., #4 Exhibit 74 to Luedtke Decl., #5 Exhibit 75 to Luedtke Decl., #6 Exhibit 76 to Luedtke Decl., #7 Exhibit 77 to Luedtke Decl., #8 Exhibit 78 to Luedtke Decl., #9 Exhibit 79 to Luedtke Decl., #10 Exhibit 80 to Luedtke Decl., #11 Exhibit 81 to Luedtke Decl., #12 Exhibit 82 to Luedtke Decl., # 13 Exhibit 83 to Luedtke Decl *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT REMOVED PER TEXT ORDER #947 *** , #14 Exhibit 84 to Luedtke Decl., #15 Exhibit 85 to Luedtke Decl., #16 Exhibit 86 to Luedtke Decl., #17 Exhibit 87 to Luedtke Decl.)(Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 12/13/2013) Modified on 12/20/2013 (wv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/20/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/24/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2013 Filing 930 EXHIBITS re #921 Declaration in Opposition,, filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 48 to Luedtke Decl., #2 Exhibit 61 to Luedtke Decl., #3 Exhibit 62 to Luedtke Decl., #4 Exhibit 63 to Luedtke Decl., #5 Exhibit 64 to Luedtke Decl., #6 Exhibit 65 to Luedtke Decl., #7 Exhibit 66 to Luedtke Decl., #8 Exhibit 67 to Luedtke Decl., #9 Exhibit 68 to Luedtke Decl., #10 Exhibit 69 to Luedtke Decl., #11 Exhibit 70 to Luedtke Decl.)(Related document(s) #921 ) (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 Filing 929 EXHIBITS re #921 Declaration in Opposition,, filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 51 to Luedtke Decl., #2 Exhibit 52 to Luedtke Decl., #3 Exhibit 53 to Luedtke Decl., #4 Exhibit 54 to Luedtke Decl., #5 Exhibit 55 to Luedtke Decl., #6 Exhibit 56 to Luedtke Decl., #7 Exhibit 57 to Luedtke Decl., #8 Exhibit 58 to Luedtke Decl., #9 Exhibit 59 to Luedtke Decl., #10 Exhibit 601 to Luedtke Decl.)(Related document(s) #921 ) (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 Filing 927 Proposed Order Granting NCAA's Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying APs' Motion for Summary Judgment by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 12, 2013 Filing 928 EXHIBITS re #921 Declaration in Opposition,, filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 41 to Luedtke Decl., #2 Exhibit 42 to Luedtke Decl., #3 Exhibit 43 to Luedtke Decl., #4 Exhibit 44 to Luedtke Decl., #5 Exhibit 45 to Luedtke Decl., #6 Exhibit 46 to Luedtke Decl., #7 Exhibit 47 to Luedtke Decl., #8 Exhibit 49 to Luedtke Decl., #9 Exhibit 50 to Luedtke Decl.)(Related document(s) #921 ) (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 12, 2013 Filing 926 Memorandum of P&A in support of NCAA's #933 motion for summary judgment and opposition to APs' motion for summary judgment filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Related document(s) #933 ) (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 12/12/2013) Modified on 12/13/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/16/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2013 Filing 925 EXHIBITS re #921 Declaration in Opposition,, Exhibit to Declaration of Carolyn Hoecker Luedkte (Dkt. 921) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 26 to Luedtke Decl., #2 Exhibit 26A to Luedtke Decl., #3 Exhibit 26B to Luedtke Decl., #4 Exhibit 26C to Luedtke Decl., #5 Exhibit 26D to Luedtke Decl., #6 Exhibit 27 to Luedtke Decl., #7 Exhibit 28 to Luedtke Decl., #8 Exhibit 29 to Luedtke Decl., #9 Exhibit 30 to Luedtke Decl., #10 Exhibit 31 to Luedtke Decl., #11 Exhibit 32 to Luedtke Decl., #12 Exhibit 33 to Luedtke Decl., #13 Exhibit 34 to Luedtke Decl., #14 Exhibit 35 to Luedtke Decl., #15 Exhibit 36 to Luedtke Decl., #16 Exhibit 37 to Luedtke Decl., #17 Exhibit 38 to Luedtke Decl., #18 Exhibit 39 to Luedtke Decl., #19 Exhibit 40 to Luedtke Decl., #20 Exhibit 40A to Luedtke Decl., #21 Exhibit 40B to Luedtke Decl.)(Related document(s) #921 ) (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 12, 2013 Filing 924 OBJECTIONS to re #898 MOTION for Summary Judgment to Evidence Submitted by Antitrust Plaintiffs by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 12, 2013 Filing 923 ***INCORRECTE EVENT USED. REFER TO DOCUMENT #933 *** NOTICE by National Collegiate Athletic Association of Motion by NCAA for Summary Judgment (Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 12/12/2013) Modified on 12/16/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2013 Filing 922 EXHIBITS re #921 Declaration in Opposition,, Exhibits 11-25 to the Declarationof Carolyn Luedtke (Dkt. #921) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11 to Luedtke Decl., #2 Exhibit 12 to Luedtke Decl., #3 Exhibit 13 to Luedtke Decl., #4 Exhibit 14 to Luedtke Decl., #5 Exhibit 15 to Luedtke Decl., #6 Exhibit 16 to Luedtke Decl., #7 Exhibit 17 to Luedtke Decl., #8 Exhibit 18 to Luedtke Decl., #9 Exhibit 19 to Luedtke Decl., #10 Exhibit 20 to Luedtke Decl., #11 Exhibit 21 to Luedtke Decl., #12 Exhibit 21A to Luedtke Decl., #13 Exhibit 22 to Luedtke Decl., #14 Exhibit 23 to Luedtke Decl., #15 Exhibit 24 to Luedtke Decl., #16 Exhibit 25 to Luedtke Decl., #17 Exhibit 25A to Luedtke Decl., #18 Exhibit 25B to Luedtke Decl.)(Related document(s) #921 ) (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 12, 2013 Filing 921 ***DECLARATION REMOVED PER TEXT ORDER #947. REFER TO DOCUMENT #941 -3 *** DECLARATION of Carolyn Luedtke Hoecker Luedtke on Behalf of NCAA In Opposition to Antitrust Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and In Support of NCAA'S Motion for Summary Judgment filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table of Exhibits to Luedtke Decl., #2 Exhibit 1 to Luedtke Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 to Luedtke Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 to Luedtke Decl., #5 Exhibit 4 to Luedtke Decl., #6 Exhibit 5 to Luedtke Decl., #7 Exhibit 6 to Luedtke Decl., #8 Exhibit 7 to Luedtke Decl., #9 Exhibit 8 to Luedtke Decl., #10 Exhibit 9 to Luedtke Decl., #11 Exhibit 10 to Luedtke Decl.)(Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 12/12/2013) Modified on 12/16/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/16/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/16/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/23/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/24/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 26, 2013 Filing 920 Declaration of Kelly M. Klaus in Response to Antitrust Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated as Confidential (Dkt. No. 886) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 919 Order granting #916 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
November 26, 2013 Reset Deadlines as to #898 MOTION for Summary Judgment (See Docket No. 912 ): Responses due by 12/12/2013. Replies due by 1/13/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 25, 2013 Filing 918 Declaration of Britton Banowsky in Support of #896 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated as Confidential filed byConference USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #896 ) (Cutler, Michael) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 25, 2013 Filing 917 JOINT STATEMENT OF ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT NCAA RE: ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS RELATED TO RECENT BYLAW CHANGES by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Scherrer, Hilary) (Filed on 11/25/2013) Modified on 11/26/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2013 Filing 916 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Second Stipulation Extending Time For Non-Party Conference USA To File Declaration In Support Of Antitrust Plaintiffs Administrative Motion To Seal filed by Conference USA, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cutler, Michael) (Filed on 11/25/2013) Modified on 11/26/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 915 Order granting #907 Stipulation regarding withdrawal of Tate George as Class Representatie entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Modified on 11/26/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 914 Order granting #906 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 913 Order finding as moot #908 first Motion for Leave to File entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 912 Order granting #910 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
November 25, 2013 Filing 911 CORRECTED MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Class Certification Decision filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Scherrer, Hilary) (Filed on 11/25/2013) Modified on 11/26/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2013 Filing 910 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Adjust Briefing Schedule filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 11/25/2013) Modified on 11/26/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2013 Filing 909 EXHIBITS re #897 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Previously Filed as Exhibit A and Exhibits 1 and 2 to Exhibit B of the Declaration of Glenn Pomerantz ISO Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum Re New Evidence Relevant to Plaitniffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #897 ) (Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 22, 2013 Filing 908 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Class Certification Decision filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scherrer, Hilary) (Filed on 11/22/2013) Modified on 11/25/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2013 Filing 907 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Withdrawal of Tate George as Class Representative filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 21, 2013 Filing 906 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Adjust Discovery Deadline to Permit the Deposition of Taylor Branch After November 22, 2013 Rebuttal Expert Deposition Deadline filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 11/21/2013) Modified on 11/22/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2013 Filing 905 ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO NCAAS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM REGARDING NEW EVIDENCE RELEVANT TO ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION ***(Public Version in compliance with Dkt. No. 897)*** filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hilary K. Scherrer, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #887 ) (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 11/21/2013) Modified on 11/22/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2013 Filing 904 Declaration of Jose R. Allen in Support of #896 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated as Confidential filed byNBA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration William S. Koenig, #2 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #896 ) (Allen, Jose) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 903 Order granting #901 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 902 Order granting #899 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
November 19, 2013 Filing 901 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time For Non-Party Conference USA To File Declaration In Support Of Antitrust Plaintiffs Administrative Motion To Seal filed by Conference USA, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cutler, Michael) (Filed on 11/19/2013) Modified on 11/20/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2013 Filing 900 Declaration of R. James Slaughter in Support of #896 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated as Confidential filed byElectronic Arts Inc.. (Related document(s) #896 ) (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
November 19, 2013 Filing 899 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to JUSTIN P. RAPHAEL, ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8172114.) filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Raphael, Justin) (Filed on 11/19/2013) Modified on 11/20/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2013 Filing 898 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 12/5/2013. Replies due by 1/6/2014. (Attachments: #1 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Hilary K. Scherrer, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28a, #32 Exhibit 28b, #33 Exhibit 29, #34 Exhibit 30, #35 Exhibit 31, #36 Exhibit 32a, #37 Exhibit 32b)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 897 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING DEFENDANTS #880 MOTION TO SEAL; GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS #888 MOTION TO SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 15, 2013 Filing 896 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated as Confidential filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #4 Redacted Version of Ex. 7 to Scherrer Declaration, #5 Redacted Version of Ex. 12 to Scherrer Declaration, #6 Redacted Version of Ex. 19 to Scherrer Declaration, #7 Unredacted Version of MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #8 Unredacted Version of Ex. 1 to Scherrer Declaration, #9 Unredacted Version of Ex. 2 to Scherrer Declaration, #10 Unredacted Version of Ex. 7 to Scherrer Declaration, #11 Unredacted Version of Ex. 12 to Scherrer Declaration, #12 Unredacted Version of Ex. 19 to Scherrer Declaration, #13 Unredacted Version of Ex. 20 to Scherrer Declaration, #14 Unredacted Version of Ex. 22 to Scherrer Declaration, #15 Unredacted Version of Ex. 24 to Scherrer Declaration)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 12, 2013 See Docket No. #893 Order. Reset Deadline as to: Motions due by 11/15/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 11, 2013 Filing 895 Declaration of Jose R. Allen in Support of #888 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated Confidential filed byNBA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration William S. Koenig, #2 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #888 ) (Allen, Jose) (Filed on 11/11/2013)
November 11, 2013 Filing 894 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Rosato Reilly (Reilly, Catherine) (Filed on 11/11/2013)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 893 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING in part and DENYING in part #651 Motion to Certify Class; DENYING #881 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum (cwlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 8, 2013 Filing 892 Response and ANSWER to Third Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 11/8/2013) Modified on 11/12/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2013 Filing 891 REPLY (re #880 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 8, 2013 Filing 890 Declaration of R. James Slaughter in Support of #888 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated Confidential filed byElectronic Arts Inc.. (Related document(s) #888 ) (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 889 ORDER ADJUSTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Motions due by 11/14/2013. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/7/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
November 5, 2013 Filing 888 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated Confidential filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Hilary K. Scherrer (Rascher Report Excerpts), #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Hilary K. Scherrer (Rascher Report Excerpts) with Highlighting)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 4, 2013 Filing 887 RESPONSE (re #881 MOTION for Leave to File A Supplemental Memorandum Regarding New Evidence Relevant to Antitrust Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification ) filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Hilary K. Scherrer (Redacted Rascher Excerpts), #3 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Hilary K. Scherrer (Rubinfeld Microeconomics Excerpt))(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
November 4, 2013 Filing 886 Filed in Error, To be Refiled. See docket #888 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated Confidential filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 11/4/2013) Modified on 11/5/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/6/2013 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2013 Filing 885 RESPONSE (re #880 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT NCAA'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 884 Order granting #882 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
October 29, 2013 Filing 883 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Collegiate Athletic Association re #880 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET #877 (Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
October 29, 2013 Filing 882 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEPOSITIONS OF REBUTTAL EXPERTS AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 10/29/2013) Modified on 10/29/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2013 Filing 881 MOTION for Leave to File [CORRECTION OF DOCKET #878 Defendant NCAA 's Administrative Motion for Leave to File A Supplemental Memorandum Regarding New Evidence Relevant to Antitrust Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Glenn Pomerantz ISO Mtn to File Supp. Memo Re New Evidence, #2 Exhibit A to Pomerantz Decl. ISO Memo Re New Evidence- Redacted Memo Re New Evidence, #3 Exhibit B - Decl. of Glenn Pomerantz ISO Supp. Memo Re New Evidence, #4 Exhibit 1 to Pomerantz Decl ISO Memo Re New Evidence - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 2 to Pomerantz Decl ISO Memo Re New Evidence - Filed Under Seal, #6 Proposed Order)(Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 10/29/2013) Modified on 10/30/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2013 Filing 880 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET #877 filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly Klaus, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted version of Supp. Memo Re New Evidence, #4 Unredacted version of Supp. Memo Re New Evidence, #5 Exhibit 1 to Pomerantz Decl. ISO of Memo Re New Evidence, #6 Exhibit 2 to Pomerantz Decl. ISO of Memo Re New Evidence)(Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 10/29/2013) Modified on 10/30/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 879 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #875 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Seth A. Rosenthal. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
October 28, 2013 Filing 878 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant NCAA'S Administrative Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Memorandum Regarding New Evidence Relevant to Antitrust Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - Redacted Supplemental Memorandum Re New Evidence, #3 Exhibit A - Unredacted Memorandum Re New Evidence, #4 Declaration, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Proposed Order, #8 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 10/28/2013) Modified on 10/29/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). ***DOCUMENT TERMINATED. DOCUMENT RE-FILED. SEE DOCUMENT #881 ***
October 28, 2013 Filing 877 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 10/28/2013) Modified on 10/29/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). ***DOCUMENT TERMINATED. DOCUMENT RE-FILED. SEE DOCUMENT #880 ***
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 876 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING ( #856 , #857 , #858 ) MOTIONS TO DISMISS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 25, 2013 Filing 875 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Seth A. Rosenthal ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8107859.) filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rosenthal, Seth) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 874 Order granting #873 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
October 10, 2013 Filing 873 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request to Adjust Discovery Deadline to Permit the Depositions of Names Plaintiffs Moses Alipate and Daruis Robinson; and [Proposed] Order filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 10/10/2013) Modified on 10/11/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 872 ORDER of USCA DENYING Appellee's Motion to Reconsider Staying the Mandate; Appelle's motion,filed August 29, 2013 is denied as to #154 Notice of Appeal filed by Electronic Arts Inc. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 870 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #861 Stipulation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
September 27, 2013 Filing 869 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Collegiate Athletic Association re #863 Notice of Appearance, #866 Notice of Appearance, #865 Notice of Appearance, #867 Notice of Appearance, #864 Notice of Appearance (Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 27, 2013 Filing 868 REPLY (re #856 MOTION to Dismiss THE THIRD CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT, #858 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Consolidated Amended Complaint ) filed byCollegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Arts Inc.. (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 27, 2013 Filing 867 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Max Klaus of Jeslyn A. Miller (Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 27, 2013 Filing 866 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Max Klaus of Carolyn H. Luedtke (Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 27, 2013 Filing 865 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Max Klaus of Rohit K. Singla (Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 27, 2013 Filing 864 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Max Klaus of Kelly M. Klaus (Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 27, 2013 Filing 863 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Max Klaus of Glenn D. Pomerantz (Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 27, 2013 Filing 862 REPLY (re #857 MOTION to Dismiss Third Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 26, 2013 Filing 861 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Electronic Arts Inc., Collegiate Licensing Company. (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 9/26/2013) Modified on 9/27/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2013 Filing 860 ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE THIRD AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. . (Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 9/26/2013) Modified on 9/27/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2013 Filing 871 US Supreme Court, Writ of Certiorari filed, Case Number 13-377. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 24, 2013 Filing 859 RESPONSE (re #857 MOTION to Dismiss Third Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #856 MOTION to Dismiss THE THIRD CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT, #858 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Consolidated Amended Complaint ) ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE THIRD AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 17, 2013 Filing 858 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. Responses due by 9/24/2013. Replies due by 9/27/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boyle, Peter) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 17, 2013 Filing 857 MOTION to Dismiss Third Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. Responses due by 9/24/2013. Replies due by 9/27/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 10, 2013 Filing 856 MOTION to Dismiss THE THIRD CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Electronic Arts Inc.. Responses due by 9/24/2013. Replies due by 10/1/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 10, 2013 See Docket No. [855) Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Motions due by 11/7/2013; Responses /Cross Motions due by 12/5/2013; Replies due by 1/6/2014; Replies due by 2/3/2014; Further Case Management Conference /Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2014 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 855 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken RESOLVING MISCELLANEOUS ( #833 , #834 , #836 , #838 ) MOTIONS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013) Modified on 9/11/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2013 Filing 854 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Court, on its own motion, shall take the #834 motion for leave and the #840 motion to strike under submission on the papers. The hearings previously scheduled for Thursday, September 5, 2013, are vacated. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 853 ORDER of USCA that motion for stay of issuance of mandate pending application for writ of certiorari is granted. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
August 21, 2013 Filing 852 NOTICE by Electronic Arts Inc. Re: Ninth Circuit Order (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
August 19, 2013 Filing 851 JOINT STATUS STATEMENT Complying with Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part the NCAAs Motion to Expedite and Denying Motion for Case Management Conference (Dkt. No. 845) filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., National Collegiate Athletic Association, Collegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Arts Inc. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 8/19/2013) Modified on 8/20/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2013 Filing 850 REPLY (re #840 MOTION to Strike #832 Amended Complaint, ) filed byCollegiate Licensing Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christina E. Fahmy in Support of It's Motion to Strike, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Christina E. Fahmy)(Boyle, Peter) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
August 19, 2013 Filing 849 REPLY (re #834 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended Consolidated Complaint ) filed byElectronic Arts Inc.. (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
August 19, 2013 Filing 848 REPLY (re #836 MOTION for Additional Briefing and for Evidentiary Hearing on Class Certification ) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
August 19, 2013 Filing 847 REPLY (re #838 MOTION For Leave to File a Motion to Dismiss Antitrust Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint ) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
August 12, 2013 Filing 846 RESPONSE (re #840 MOTION to Strike #832 Amended Complaint, , #838 MOTION For Leave to File a Motion to Dismiss Antitrust Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint , #834 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended Consolidated Complaint, #836 MOTION for Additional Briefing and for Evidentiary Hearing on Class Certification ) filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hilary K. Scherrer, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Hilary K. Scherrer)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 845 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART THE NCAAS #841 MOTION TO EXPEDITE AND DENYING #837 MOTION FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
August 6, 2013 Filing 844 RESPONSE (re #841 MOTION to Expedite Consideration and Briefing Schedule of Three Motions ) filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Scherrer, Hilary) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
August 5, 2013 Filing 843 ANSWER to #832 Third Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by Collegiate Licensing Company. (Boyle, Peter) (Filed on 8/5/2013) Modified on 8/6/2013 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2013 Filing 842 Declaration of Gregory L. Curtner in Support of #841 MOTION to Expedite Consideration and Briefing Schedule of Three Motions filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Related document(s) #841 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
August 2, 2013 Filing 841 MOTION to Expedite Consideration and Briefing Schedule of Three Motions filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
August 1, 2013 Filing 840 MOTION to Strike #832 Amended Complaint, filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 8/15/2013. Replies due by 8/22/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christina E.Fahmy in Support of Collegiate Licensing Company's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Third Consolidated Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to Fahmy Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Fahmy Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Fahmy Declaration, #5 Proposed Order)(Boyle, Peter) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
July 31, 2013 Filing 839 OPINION of USCA as to #154 Notice of Appeal filed by Electronic Arts Inc. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
July 30, 2013 Filing 838 MOTION For Leave to File a Motion to Dismiss Antitrust Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 8/13/2013. Replies due by 8/20/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
July 30, 2013 Filing 837 MOTION for a Case Management Conference filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 8/13/2013. Replies due by 8/20/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 7/30/2013) Modified on 7/31/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2013 Filing 836 MOTION for Additional Briefing and for Evidentiary Hearing on Class Certification filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 8/13/2013. Replies due by 8/20/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 7/30/2013) Modified on 7/31/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2013 Filing 835 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
July 30, 2013 Set Deadlines as to #834 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended Consolidated Complaint. Responses due by 8/12/2013; Replies due by 8/19/2013; Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
July 29, 2013 Filing 834 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended Consolidated Complaint filed by Electronic Arts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Electronic Arts Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss the Third Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
July 19, 2013 Filing 833 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT #831 filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
July 19, 2013 Filing 832 AMENDED COMPLAINT CORRECTION OF DOCKET #831 THIRD CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Redlined Version of Third Amended Complaint, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
July 18, 2013 Filing 831 ***DOCUMENT BLOCKED, TO BE E-FILED LATER*** THIRD CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Redlined Version of Third Amended Complaint, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2013) Modified on 7/19/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/19/2013 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 830 ORDER GRANTING ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO AMEND THEIR COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on July 5, 2013. (cwlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2013)
June 24, 2013 Filing 828 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by National Collegiate Athletic Association for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 24, 2013 Filing 827 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 20, 2013, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, Telephone number 510-451-7530, rayneeh@hotmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2013. (Related documents(s) #823 , #826 ) (rhm) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 21, 2013 Filing 826 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
June 21, 2013 Filing 825 NOTICE by National Collegiate Athletic Association of Filing of Copies in Public Record in Support of NCAAs Sur-Reply on Motion for Class Certification re #818 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 161- Rubinfeld SurReply Report 5-30-13, #2 Exhibit 163-Noll Dep Tr Vol II 5-22-13, #3 Exhibit 164-Gerbrandt Dep Tr Vol III 5-9-13, #4 Exhibit 165-Rascher Dep Tr 5-21-13, #5 Exhibit 166-McCormick Dep Tr 5-15-13, #6 Exhibit 180-Stiroh Reply 5-30-13)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 6/21/2013) Modified on 6/24/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2013 Filing 824 NOTICE by Electronic Arts Inc. of Electronic Filing of Exhibits Filed in Support of Electronic Arts Inc.'s and Collegiate Licensing Company's Surreply to Class Certification) re #816 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit F)(Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 6/21/2013) Modified on 6/24/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2013 Filing 829 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 6/20/2013 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 6/20/2013), Motion Hearing held on 6/20/2013 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 6/20/2013). (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/20/2013)
June 20, 2013 Filing 823 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Electronic Arts Inc. for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 20, 2013 Filing 822 Declaration of Sathya S. Gosselin in Support of #651 MOTION to Certify Class -- SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF SATHYA S. GOSSELIN (Public Filing Complying with Dkt No. 814) filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Related document(s) #651 ) (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 20, 2013 Filing 821 Supplemental Brief re #651 MOTION to Certify Class -- SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF OF ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (Public Filing Complying with Dkt No. 814) filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Related document(s) #651 ) (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 19, 2013 Filing 820 DECLARATION OF SATHYA S. GOSSELIN in Support of #651 MOTION to Certify Class (Public Filing Complying with Dkt No. 817) filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit 73, #74 Exhibit 74, #75 Exhibit 75, #76 Exhibit 76, #77 Exhibit 77, #78 Exhibit 78, #79 Exhibit 79, #80 Exhibit 80, #81 Exhibit 81, #82 Exhibit 82, #83 Exhibit 83, #84 Exhibit 84, #85 Exhibit 85, #86 Exhibit 86, #87 Exhibit 87, #88 Exhibit 88, #89 Exhibit 89, #90 Exhibit 90, #91 Exhibit 91, #92 Exhibit 92, #93 Exhibit 93, #94 Exhibit 94, #95 Exhibit 95, #96 Exhibit 96, #97 Exhibit 97, #98 Exhibit 98, #99 Exhibit 99, #100 Exhibit 100, #101 Exhibit 101, #102 Exhibit 102, #103 Exhibit 103, #104 Exhibit 104, #105 Exhibit 105, #106 Exhibit 106, #107 Exhibit 107, #108 Exhibit 108)(Related document(s) #651 ) (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 6/19/2013) Modified on 6/20/2013 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2013 Filing 819 REPLY (re #651 MOTION to Certify Class ) OF ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (Public Filing Complying with Dkt No. 817) filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit REPLY REPORT ON CLASS CERTIFICATION OF ROGER G. NOLL, #2 Exhibit REPLY REPORT ON CLASS CERTIFICATION OF LARRY GERBRANDT, #3 Exhibit REBUTTAL REPORT OF DR. ROBERT McCORMICK IN SUPPORT OF ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, #4 Exhibit DECLARATION OF DANIEL A. RASCHER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 818 Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting in part and denying in part #792 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 817 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #747 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #782 Supplemental Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated as Confidential filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 06/17/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 816 Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins denying #791 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 815 Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting #798 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 814 Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting in part and denying in part #801 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 13, 2013 Filing 813 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., Collegiate Licensing Company. (Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 6/13/2013) Modified on 6/14/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2013 Filing 812 Declaration of Andrews S. Rosenman in Support of #801 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -- ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL MATERIALS DESIGNATED AS CONFIDENTIAL filed by The Big Ten Conference, James E. Delany. (Related document(s) #801 ) (Rosenman, Andrew) (Filed on 6/13/2013) Modified on 6/14/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2013 Filing 811 EXHIBITS re #804 NCAA Notice of Filing of Copies in Public Record in Support of NCAA"s Opposition on Motion for Class Certification re #796 filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 72-Northern Arizona Univ/Big Sky document, #2 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 73-ESPN/Fox/ CEO Group document, #3 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 74- ESPN/Fox/CEO Group document, #4 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 75-excerpt Conf USA/CSTV Network document, #5 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 76-excerpt ESPN/Conf USA document, #6 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 77-excerpt Conf USA/ESPN document, #7 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 78-Council of Ivy League Group Presidents/Yankees Entertainment Sports Network doc, #8 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 79-excerpt Mid-Eastern Atlantic Conf/ESPN document, #9 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 80-excerpt Fox/Missouri Valley document, #10 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 81-excerpt Ohio Valley/ESPN document, #11 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 86-excerpt CBS/SEC document, #12 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 87-SEC/ESPN document, #13 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 88-excerpt ESPN/SWAC document, #14 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 89-excerpt Summit League/Midcontinent Communications document, #15 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 90-excerpt Comcast/Sun Belt Conf document, #16 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 91-excerpt Raycom/Jefferson Pilot /ACC document)(Related document(s) #796 , #804 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 6/6/2013) Modified on 6/7/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2013 Filing 810 EXHIBITS re #804 NCAA Notice of Filing of Copies in Public Record in Support of NCAA's Opposition on Motion for Class Certification re #796 filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 57-Excerpt Univ of Wisconsin-Madison/Dorna document, #2 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 58-excerpt SEC/Jefferson Pilot Sports document, #3 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 59-excerpt DC Bowl Committee/Conf USA document, #4 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 60-excerpt ESPN/Conf USA document, #5 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 61-excerpt ESPN/Conf USA document, #6 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 62-excerpt ESPN/Conf USA document, #7 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 63-excerpt SWAC/ESPN document, #8 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 64-excerpt NFL/Bd of Regents of Univ of Nebraska document, #9 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 65-excerpt ESPN/ESPN Enterprise/ACC document Association, #10 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 66-excerpt ABC/Big 12 Conf document, #11 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 67-Big Ten/Pac10/Pasadena Tournament of Roses document, #12 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 68-excerpt CSTV Network/Atlantic 10 document, #13 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 69-ESPN/Atlantic 10 document, #14 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 70-excerpt National Sports Partners/Fox/Big 12 document)(Related document(s) #796 , #804 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 6/6/2013) Modified on 6/7/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2013 Filing 809 EXHIBITS re #804 NCAA Notice of Filing of Copies in Public Record in Support of NCAA's Opposition on Motion for Class Certification re #796 filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 37-excerpt Mid East AC/ESPN document, #2 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 38-excerpt Med East AC/ ESPN document, #3 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 39-excerpt ESPN/Missouri Valley document, #4 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 40-excerpt Ohio Valley/ESPN document, #5 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 41-excerpt Ohio Valley/ESPN document, #6 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 42-excerpt Patriot League/ESPN document, #7 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 43-excerpt SEC/ESPN document, #8 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 44-excerpt Jefferson Pilot Sports/SEC document, #9 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 45-excerpt Summit League/Midcontinent Communications document, #10 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 46-excerpt Cable Sports Southeast/Clemson document, #11 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 47-excerpt US-Berkeley/Comcast document, #12 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 48-excerpt Univ of Texas at Austin/USA Collegiate document, #13 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 49-excerpt Cable Sports Southeast/International Sports Properties document, #14 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 50-excerpt Washington State Univ/Fox document, #15 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 51-excerpt Cable Southeast Sports Channel/International Sports Properties document, #16 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 52-excerpt cable Southeast Sports Channel/Alabama Sports Marketing document, #17 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 53-excerpt Big Ten/BTN document, #18 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 54-excerpt Florida Atlantic Univ/WTCN document, #19 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 55-Princeton/Dorna document)(Related document(s) #796 , #804 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 6/6/2013) Modified on 6/7/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2013 Filing 808 EXHIBITS re #804 NCAA Notice of Filing of Copies in Public Record in Support of NCAA's Opposition on Motion for Class Certification re #796 filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 18-excerpt Collegiate Sports/TEM document, #2 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 19- excerpt Collegiate Sports/Tem document, #3 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 20-excerpt Collegiate Sports/TEM/BTN document, #4 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 21-excerpt Collegiate Sports/TEM/BTN document, #5 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 22-excerpt Collegiate Sports/TEM/BTN document, #6 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 23-excerpt Collegiate Sports/TEM/BTN document, #7 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 24-excerpt Collegiate Sports/TEM/BTN document, #8 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 25-excerpt International Sports Properties/Northern Illinois Univ/Comcast doc, #9 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 26-excerpt San Diego State Univ/Cox Communications document, #10 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 27-excerpt Univer of South Florida Foundation/Creative Sports document, #11 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 28-excerpt Pac12/ESPN/Fox document, #12 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 29-excerpt Jefferson Pilot Sports/ACC document, #13 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 31-Amendment to Agreement Raycom Sports/Jefferson-Pilot Sports Network/Atlantic Coast Conf, #14 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 32-except of ESPN Atlantic 10 document, #15 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 33-excerpt ABC/ESPN/Big 12 document, #16 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 34-excerpt ESPN/Conf USA document, #17 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 35-excerpt ESPN/Horizon League document)(Related document(s) #796 , #804 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 6/6/2013) Modified on 6/7/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2013 Filing 807 EXHIBITS re #804 NCAA Notice of Filing of Copies In Public Record in Support of NCAA's Opposition on Motion for Class Certification re #796 filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wierenga Exhibit 142-Petr Declaration, #2 Declaration of Suzanne Wahl, #3 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 2-Univ of Georgia document, #4 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 3- Excerpt of CBS/SMU document, #5 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 4-excerpts of Conf USA/WHNO document, #6 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 5-excerpt of CBS/TCR document, #7 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 6-excerpt of Cable Sport Southeast/CSTV document, #8 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 7-excerpt of Collegiate Images/Comcast document, #9 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 8-excerpt of Collegiate Images/Comcast document, #10 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 9-excerpt of Collegiate Sports/TEM/Comcast document, #11 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 10-excerpt of Collegiate Sports/TEM/Comcast document, #12 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 11-excerpt of Collegiate Images/Comcast document, #13 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 12-excerpt of Collegiate Images/Comcast document, #14 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 13-excerpt of Collegiate Images/Comcast document, #15 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 14-excerpt of Collegiate Sports/TEM/Sportschannel document, #16 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 15-excerpt of Collegiate Sports/TEM/Comcast document, #17 Exhibit Wahl Exhibit 16-excerpt Big Ten/BTN/TEM document)(Related document(s) #796 , #804 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 6/6/2013) Modified on 6/7/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2013 Filing 806 EXHIBITS re #804 NCAA Notice of Filing of Copies in Public Record in Support of NCAA's Opposition on Motion for Class Certification re #796 filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 2 of 14 Wierenga Exhibit 94-T3Media document, #2 Exhibit Part 3 of 14 Wierenga Exhibit 94-T3Media document, #3 Exhibit Part 4 of 14 Wierenga Exhibit 94-T3Media document, #4 Exhibit Part 5 of 14 Wierenga Exhibit 94-T3Media document, #5 Exhibit Part 6 of 14 Wierenga Exhibit 94-T3Media document, #6 Exhibit Part 7 of 14 Wierenga Exhibit 94-T3Media document, #7 Exhibit Part 8 of 14 Wierenga Exhibit 94-T3Media document, #8 Exhibit Part 9 of 14 Wierenga Exhibit 94-T3Media document, #9 Exhibit Part 10 of 14 Wierenga Exhibit 94-T3Media document, #10 Exhibit Part 11 of 14 Wierenga Exhibit 94-T3Media document, #11 Exhibit Part 12 of 14 Wierenga Exhibit 94-T3Media document, #12 Exhibit Part 13 of 14 Wierenga Exhibit 94-T3Media document, #13 Exhibit Part 14 of 14 Wierenga Exhibit 94-T3Media document)(Related document(s) #796 , #804 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 6/6/2013) Modified on 6/7/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2013 Filing 805 EXHIBITS re #804 NCAA Notice of Filing of Copies in Public Record in Support of NCAA's Opposition on Motion for Class Certification re #796 filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wierenga Exhibit 81-NCAA/NSP/FOX Document, #2 Exhibit Wierenga Exhibit 82-NCAA/WGCl document, #3 Exhibit Wierenga Exhibit 83-NCAA/BET document, #4 Exhibit Wierenga Exhibit 84 NCAA/ESPN document filed by NCAA, #5 Exhibit Wierenga Exhibit 85-NCAA/Ethan Production document, #6 Exhibit Wierenga Exhibit 90-Disney/Texas Western document, #7 Exhibit Wierenga Exhibit 91-Flournoy/Warner Bros document, #8 Exhibit Wierenga Exhibit 92-Disney/Lattin document)(Related document(s) #796 , #804 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 6/6/2013) Modified on 6/7/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/7/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/7/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2013 Filing 804 NOTICE of Filing of Copies in Public Record in Support of NCAA's Opposition on Motion for Class Certification re #796 by National Collegiate Athletic Association (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Wierenga, #2 Exhibit Wierenga Exhibit 2-Expert Report of Daniel Rubinfeld, #3 Exhibit Wierenga Exhibit 8-Dep excerpt of Harry Flournoy Jr, #4 Exhibit Wierenga Exhibit 16-Dep excerpt of Tyrone Prothro, #5 Exhibit Wierenga Exhibit 18-Dep excerpt of Eric Riley, #6 Exhibit Wierenga Exhibit 23-Big 10 Release, #7 Exhibit Wierenga Exhibit 24-CUSA document, #8 Exhibit Wierenga Exhibit 25-Big Ten document, #9 Exhibit Wierenga Exhibit 26-Notre Dame document)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 6/6/2013) Modified on 6/7/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2013 Filing 803 Declaration of David L. Greenspan in Support of #792 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byNational Football League Players Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #792 ) (Greenspan, David) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 6, 2013 Filing 802 RESPONSE (re #792 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #791 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to EA and CLC's Surreply ) ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO ELECTRONIC ARTS INC., COLLEGIATE LICENSING COMPANY, AND NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHELETIC ASSOCIATION'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF THE SUPPORTING EXHIBITS TO THEIR SUR-REPLIES TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 6, 2013 Filing 801 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -- ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL MATERIALS DESIGNATED AS CONFIDENTIAL filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Scherrer, Hilary) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 6, 2013 Filing 800 Supplemental Declaration of Sathya S. Gosselin in Support of #651 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Related document(s) #651 ) (Scherrer, Hilary) (Filed on 6/6/2013) Modified on 6/7/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2013 Filing 799 Supplemental Brief re #651 MOTION to Certify Class -- SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF OF ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Related document(s) #651 ) (Scherrer, Hilary) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 4, 2013 Filing 798 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Masherah Declaration filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Fahmy, Christina) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
June 3, 2013 Filing 797 NOTICE by Big 12 Conference re #796 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Rosenman, Andrew) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 796 Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting in part and denying in part #702 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 30, 2013 Filing 795 Declaration of Cory Moss in Support of #794 Sur-Reply, filed byCollegiate Licensing Company. (Related document(s) #794 ) (Boyle, Peter) (Filed on 5/30/2013) Modified on 5/31/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2013 Filing 794 Sur-Reply re #651 MOTION to Certify Class byCollegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Arts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration R. James Slaughter, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 5/30/2013) Modified on 5/31/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2013 Filing 793 Declaration of Kimberly Kefalas in Support of #792 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Related document(s) #792 ) (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 30, 2013 Filing 792 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 30, 2013 Filing 791 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to EA and CLC's Surreply filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boyle, Peter) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 30, 2013 Filing 790 Declaration of Robert Wierenga in Support of #789 Sur-Reply filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 161 Expert Sur-Reply Report of Daniel L. Rubinfeld REDACTED VERSION-UNDER SEAL, #2 Exhibit 162 Reply Declaration of Lauren Stiroh and Dirk van Leeuwen, #3 Exhibit 163 Deposition of Roger Noll, Vol II- UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit 164 Deposition of Larry Gerbrandt, Vol III UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit 165 Deposition of Daniel Rascher UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit 166 Deposition of Robert McCormick UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit 167 excerpt of the Deposition of Edward OBannon, #8 Exhibit 168 excerpt of the Deposition of Tate George, #9 Exhibit 169 webpage Player Bio: Pat Maynor - Stanford University's Official Athletic Site, #10 Exhibit 170 webpage Andrew Luck Bio - Stanford University's Official Athletic Site, #11 Exhibit 171 webpage Mid-Major Basketball Transfer List: May Edition - Mid-Major Madness, #12 Exhibit 172 webpage 2013 Football Top Junior College Recruits, #13 Exhibit 173 webpage 2013 Transfer List: Updated Edition -- Nearly 425 players CBSSports.com, #14 Exhibit 174 webpage 2012-2013 College Football Transfer List | CollegeFootballSaturday, #15 Exhibit 175 article titled The Economics of Licensing an Athletes Image, #16 Exhibit 176 excerpt of the Deposition of Tyrone Prothro, #17 Exhibit 177 article titled A Better Look at Sports Budgets, #18 Exhibit 178 article titled Intercollegiate Athletics Survey Opens September 13, #19 Exhibit 179 excerpt of the Deposition of Greg Shaheen, #20 Exhibit 180 Expert Reply Report of Lauren Stiroh- REDACTED VERSION-UNDER SEAL, #21 Exhibit 181 excerpt of Deposition of Larry Gerbrandt, Vol II)(Related document(s) #789 ) (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 5/30/2013) Modified on 5/31/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2013 Filing 789 SUR-REPLY (re #651 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 5/30/2013) Modified on 5/31/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2013 Filing 788 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Samuel Michael Keller for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Aragon, Leonard) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 22, 2013 Filing 787 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/08/2013, before Judge Nathanael Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2013. (Related documents(s) #785 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
May 22, 2013 Filing 786 Declaration of David L. Greenspan in Support of #782 Supplemental Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated as Confidential filed byNational Football League Players Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #782 ) (Greenspan, David) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
May 22, 2013 Filing 785 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Collegiate Licensing Company for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Henn, R.) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
May 20, 2013 Filing 784 Notice of Electronic Filing of Unredacted Copies of Exhibit 12 to Drucker Declaration and Exhibits 2 and 3 to Masherah Declaration pursuant to re re #778 Order, #780 Order by Collegiate Licensing Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Michael S. Drucker (unredacted), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Jason Masherah (unredacted), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Jason Masherah (unredacted))(Fahmy, Christina) (Filed on 5/20/2013) Modified on 5/21/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2013 Filing 783 NOTICE by Collegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Arts Inc. Notice of Electronic Filing of CLC and EA Pursuant to Orders Dkts. 778 and 780 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Slaughter Declaration, #2 Redacted Declaration of Alan J. Cox, #3 Exhibit C to Fahmy Declaration (redacted Stiroh Report))(Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 20, 2013 Filing 782 Supplemental Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated as Confidential filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bailey, Arthur) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 17, 2013 Filing 781 NOTICE by Collegiate Licensing Company re #778 Order, Notice of Manual Filing of Proposed Redactions (Fahmy, Christina) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 780 Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting #779 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
May 15, 2013 Filing 779 Supplemental Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Dkts. 682 & 778 filed by Electronic Arts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Suppl Admin Motion re Dkts. 682 & 778)(Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 778 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #682 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Selected Portions of Declarations, Reports, and Exhibits to EA and CLC's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Electronic Arts Inc., Collegiate Licensing Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 05/13/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 10, 2013 Filing 777 Declaration of Peter M. Boyle in Support of #747 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated as Confidential CORRECTION OF DOCKET #776 filed byCollegiate Licensing Company. (Related document(s) #747 ) (Boyle, Peter) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
May 10, 2013 Filing 776 ***FILED IN ERROR, SEE DOCUMENT #777 *** Declaration in Support of #747 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated as Confidential SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF PETER M. BOYLE IN SUPPORT OF ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL MATERIALS DESIGNATED AS CONFIDENTIAL filed byCollegiate Licensing Company. (Related document(s) #747 ) (Fahmy, Christina) (Filed on 5/10/2013) Modified on 5/10/2013 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2013 Filing 775 Declaration of Jacob Schatz in Support of #747 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated as Confidential filed byElectronic Arts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Signature Attestation)(Related document(s) #747 ) (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 773 ORDER granting in part denying in part Antitrust Plaintiffs' motions #724 , #745 , #746 to compel discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 05/09/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
May 8, 2013 Filing 774 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held re #724 #745 #746 on 5/8/2013 before Nathanael Cousins. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/8/2013)
May 8, 2013 Filing 772 ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO ELECTRONIC ARTS INC., COLLEGIATE LICENSING COMPANY, NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHELETIC ASSOCIATION, XOS TECHNOLOGIES, INC., THE BIG 12 CONFERENCE, AND T3 MEDIA'S DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF re #747 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 5/8/2013) Modified on 5/9/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 771 Order granting #770 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 6, 2013 Filing 770 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7678589.) filed by Big 12 Conference. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Medford, Leane) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
May 6, 2013 Filing 769 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott P. Cooper for Non-Parties Pac-12 Conference and Larry Scott (Cooper, Scott) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 768 Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting #765 Motion to Appear by Telephone. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this entry. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 767 Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting #766 Motion to Appear by Telephone. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this entry. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
May 3, 2013 Filing 766 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Samuel Michael Keller. (Aragon, Leonard) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
May 3, 2013 Filing 765 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at May 8, 2013 Discovery Hearing filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. (Boyle, Peter) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
May 2, 2013 Filing 764 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew S. Rosenman o/b/o Non-parties The Big Ten Conference, Inc. and James E. Delany (Rosenman, Andrew) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 2, 2013 Filing 763 Declaration of Peter M. Boyle in Support of #747 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated as Confidential filed byCollegiate Licensing Company. (Related document(s) #747 ) (Boyle, Peter) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 2, 2013 Filing 762 NOTICE by Big 12 Conference NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR AND BE HEARD AT HEARING (Winter, Milton) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 2, 2013 Filing 761 Declaration of Gregg G. Brandon in Support of #747 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated as Confidential filed byXOS Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) #747 ) (Hamilton, Cindy) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 2, 2013 Filing 760 Declaration of R. JAMES SLAUGHTER in Support of #747 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated as Confidential filed byElectronic Arts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted 26, #2 Exhibit Redacted 58, #3 Exhibit Redacted 73, #4 Exhibit Redacted 79, #5 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #747 ) (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 2, 2013 Filing 759 Declaration of Kimberly K. Kefalas in Support of #747 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated as Confidential filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #747 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 2, 2013 Filing 758 Declaration of Victoria Donovan - General Counsel for T3 Media formerly Through Equity Motion ("T3M") in Support of #747 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated as Confidential filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #747 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 757 ORDER SETTING HEARING re #724 , #745 , #746 . Discovery Hearing set for 5/8/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 05/01/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 756 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING #750 MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORTS, GRANTING IN PART #752 REQUEST TO MODIFY THE CASE SCHEDULE AND DENYING AS MOOT #752 MOTION FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013) Modified on 5/2/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2013 Filing 755 Declaration of Jessica A. Sprovtsoff in Support of #752 MOTION to Expedite Consideration and Briefing Schedule (Correction of Docket # 753) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Related document(s) #752 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 5/1/2013) Modified on 5/2/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2013 Filing 754 Declaration of Tim Weiser - Big 12 Deputy Commissioner in Support of #747 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated as Confidential filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #747 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
April 30, 2013 Filing 753 Declaration of Jessica A. Sprovtsoff in Support of #752 MOTION to Expedite Consideration and Briefing Schedule Regarding Motion to Strike Untimely Expert Reports & Objection to Reply Evidence Pursuant to Local Rule 7-3(D) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Related document(s) #752 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
April 30, 2013 Filing 752 MOTION to Expedite Consideration and Briefing Schedule filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
April 30, 2013 Filing 751 Declaration of Robert Wierenga in Support of #750 MOTION to Strike Untimely Expert Reports and Objection to Reply Evidence Pursuant to Local Rule 7-3(D) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - June 11, 2012 Wierenga letter to Steiner, #2 Exhibit 2 - December 21, 2012 Curtner letter to Steiner)(Related document(s) #750 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
April 30, 2013 Filing 750 MOTION to Strike Untimely Expert Reports and Objection to Reply Evidence Pursuant to Local Rule 7-3(D) filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2015 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 5/14/2013. Replies due by 5/21/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
April 25, 2013 Filing 749 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF SATHYA S. GOSSELIN IN SUPPORT OF #651 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 13, #12 Exhibit 14, #13 Exhibit 19, #14 Exhibit 20, #15 Exhibit 21, #16 Exhibit 22, #17 Exhibit 23, #18 Exhibit 24, #19 Exhibit 25, #20 Exhibit 27, #21 Exhibit 28, #22 Exhibit 29, #23 Exhibit 30, #24 Exhibit 31, #25 Exhibit 32, #26 Exhibit 33, #27 Exhibit 34, #28 Exhibit 35, #29 Exhibit 36, #30 Exhibit 37, #31 Exhibit 38, #32 Exhibit 40, #33 Exhibit 42, #34 Exhibit 43, #35 Exhibit 47, #36 Exhibit 50, #37 Exhibit 51, #38 Exhibit 54, #39 Exhibit 55, #40 Exhibit 56, #41 Exhibit 66, #42 Exhibit 75, #43 Exhibit 80, #44 Exhibit 87, #45 Exhibit 89, #46 Exhibit 90, #47 Exhibit 91, #48 Exhibit 92, #49 Exhibit 93, #50 Exhibit 94, #51 Exhibit 95, #52 Exhibit 96, #53 Exhibit 100, #54 Exhibit 102, #55 Exhibit 107, #56 Exhibit 108)(Related document(s) #748 ) (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 4/25/2013) Modified on 4/26/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2013 Filing 748 REPLY (re #651 MOTION to Certify Class ) OF ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 REPLY REPORT ON CLASS CERTIFICATION OF ROGER G. NOLL, #2 REPLY REPORT ON CLASS CERTIFICATION OF LARRY GERBRANDT, #3 REBUTTAL REPORT OF DR. ROBERT McCORMICK IN SUPPORT OF ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, #4 DECLARATION OF DANIEL A. RASCHER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
April 25, 2013 Filing 747 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated as Confidential filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
April 12, 2013 Filing 746 JOINT STATEMENT OF ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS RE: ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS RELATED TO RECENT AMATEURISM BYLAW CHANGES by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.< National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Bailey, Arthur) (Filed on 4/12/2013) Modified on 4/15/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2013 Filing 745 JOINT STATEMENT OF ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS RE: ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF PETR DATA, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STRIKE PETR DECLARATION AND EXPERT REPORTS by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Bailey, Arthur) (Filed on 4/12/2013) Modified on 4/15/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2013 Filing 744 NOTICE by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. of Change of Firm Name and E-Mail Addresses (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 4/9/2013)
April 5, 2013 Filing 743 Supplemental Declaration of Jessica Sprovtsoff in Support of #702 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - University of Florida Letter)(Related document(s) #702 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 4/5/2013) Modified on 4/8/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2013 Filing 742 NOTICE by Non-Party Southwestern Athletic Conference re #702 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal NON-PARTY SWAC NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENTS PROVISIONALLY FILED UNDER SEAL (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 4/5/2013) Modified on 4/5/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2013 Filing 741 Supplemental Declaration of Peter M. Boyle in Support of #682 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Selected Portions of Declarations, Reports, and Exhibits to EA and CLC's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byCollegiate Licensing Company. (Related document(s) #682 ) (Boyle, Peter) (Filed on 4/5/2013) Modified on 4/5/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2013 Filing 740 Declaration of Erik Albright-ACC in Support of #702 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #702 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
April 5, 2013 Filing 739 Declaration of Jason Masherah in Support of #682 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Selected Portions of Declarations, Reports, and Exhibits to EA and CLC's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byCollegiate Licensing Company. (Related document(s) #682 ) (Boyle, Peter) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
April 5, 2013 Filing 738 Declaration of Dennis Thomas-Mid-Eastern Athletic Conference in Support of #702 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #702 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
April 5, 2013 Filing 737 Declaration of Victoria Donovan-T3Media in Support of #702 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #702 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
April 5, 2013 Filing 736 Declaration of Tim Weiser-Big 12 Conference in Support of #702 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #702 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
April 5, 2013 Filing 735 Declaration of Britton Banowsky/Conference USA in Support of #702 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #702 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
April 4, 2013 Filing 734 Declaration of Elizabeth Debauche-Ohio Valley Conference in Support of #702 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #702 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
April 3, 2013 Filing 733 Non-Party The Atlantic 10 Conference's Notice Regarding Documents Provisionally filed under Seal re #702 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 4/3/2013) Modified on 4/3/2013 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2013 Filing 732 Declaration of Carolyn Schlie Femovich-Patriot League in Support of #702 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #702 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
April 3, 2013 Filing 731 Declaration of Kenneth Haines-Raycom Sports Network in Support of #702 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Related document(s) #702 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 730 Order granting #729 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
April 2, 2013 Filing 729 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Adjust the Case Schedule filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., Electronic Arts Inc, Collegiate Licensing Company, National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Hilary K. Scherrer, #2 Proposed Order)(Ratway, Hilary) (Filed on 4/2/2013) Modified on 4/2/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2013 Filing 728 NOTICE RE DOCUMENTS TENTATIVELY FILED UNDER SEAL re #719 by BIG TEN NETWORK, LLC (Singer, David) (Filed on 4/2/2013) Modified on 4/2/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2013 Filing 727 NOTICE Regarding Documents Tentatively Filed Under Seal re #719 by The Big Ten Conference, Inc. (Rosenman, Andrew) (Filed on 4/2/2013) Modified on 4/2/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2013 Filing 726 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Electronic Arts Inc. re #725 Declaration in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Amended Declaration) (Lauridsen, Robert) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
March 29, 2013 Filing 725 Declaration of Guy Ben-Ishai, Ph.D. in Support of #680 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Amended Declaration) filed byElectronic Arts Inc.. (Related document(s) #680 ) (Lauridsen, Robert) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
March 28, 2013 Filing 724 Joint Statement of Antitrust Plaintiffs and Defendants re Motion to Compel Depositions or in the alternative to strike declarations filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., National Collegiate Athletic Association. Responses due by 4/11/2013. Replies due by 4/18/2013. (Ratway, Hilary) (Filed on 3/28/2013) Modified on 3/29/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 723 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS ( #507 in case 4:09-cv-01967-CW; #78 in case 4:11-mc-80300-CW) MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDERS OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 26, 2013 Filing 722 NOTICE by National Collegiate Athletic Association re #721 Order NCAA Notice of Documents Lodged With The Court (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 721 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION TO RE SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/22/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
March 21, 2013 Filing 720 Declaration in Support of #702 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #682 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Selected Portions of Declarations, Reports, and Exhibits to EA and CLC's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #702 , #682 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 719 Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting #712 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #702 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #682 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Selected Portions of Declarations, Reports, and Exhibits to EA and CLC's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 19, 2013 Filing 718 Declaration in Support of #702 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byElectronic Arts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #702 ) (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
March 19, 2013 Filing 717 Declaration of R. James Slaughter in Further Support of #682 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Selected Portions of Declarations, Reports, and Exhibits to EA and CLC's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byElectronic Arts Inc.. (Related document(s) #682 ) (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 3/19/2013) Modified on 3/20/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2013 Filing 716 RESPONSE (re #702 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) OPPOSITION filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Table), #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zeldin, Gabriel) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
March 18, 2013 Filing 715 RESPONSE (re #682 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Selected Portions of Declarations, Reports, and Exhibits to EA and CLC's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification ) OPPOSITION filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Table), #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zeldin, Gabriel) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
March 18, 2013 Filing 714 NOTICE by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. Withdrawal of Appearance [Lucas E. Gilmore] (Zeldin, Gabriel) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
March 18, 2013 Filing 713 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel Dash Zeldin (Zeldin, Gabriel) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
March 18, 2013 Filing 712 STIPULATED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR THIRD PARTIES TO FILE RESPONSES PURSUANT TO LR 79-5(d) filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Electronic Arts. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 3/18/2013) Modified on 3/19/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 15, 2013 Filing 711 Declaration of Ahmad Nassar in Support of #682 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Selected Portions of Declarations, Reports, and Exhibits to EA and CLC's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byNational Football League Players Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #682 ) (Papendick, Ian) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
March 15, 2013 Filing 710 NOTICE by National Collegiate Athletic Association of Documents Lodged with the Court (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 709 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Collegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Arts Inc. re #680 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 708 EXHIBITS re #703 Declaration in Support, (Exhibits 75-81 to R. James Declaration in support of Electronic Arts Inc.'s and Collegiate Licensing Co.'s Motion for Class Certification) filed byCollegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Arts Inc.. (Related document(s) #703 ) (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 707 EXHIBITS re #703 Declaration in Support, (Exhibit 64-74 of R. James Slaughter Declaration in support of Electronic Arts Inc.'s and Collegiate Licensing Co.'s Opposiiton to Motion for Class Certification) filed byCollegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Arts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 72-73, #2 Exhibit 74)(Related document(s) #703 ) (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 706 EXHIBITS re #703 Declaration in Support, (Exhibit 44-63 of R. James Slaughter Declaration in support of (Electronic Arts Inc.'s and Collegiate Licensing Co.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification) filed byCollegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Arts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 59, #2 Exhibit 60-63)(Related document(s) #703 ) (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 705 EXHIBITS re #703 Declaration in Support, (Exhibits 20-43 of R. James Slaughter Declaration in support of (Electronic Arts Inc.'s and Collegiate Licensing Co.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification) filed byCollegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Arts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21, #2 Exhibit 22-29, #3 Exhibit 30-43)(Related document(s) #703 ) (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 704 EXHIBITS re #703 Declaration in Support, (Exhibits 15-19 of Decl. of R. James Slaughter in support of (Electronic Arts Inc.'s and Collegiate Licensing Co.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification) filed byCollegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Arts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17-19)(Related document(s) #703 ) (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 703 Declaration of R. James Slaughter in Support of #680 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Electronic Arts Inc.'s and Collegiate Licensing Co.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification) filed byCollegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Arts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Exhibit 5-10, #3 Exhibit 11-14)(Related document(s) #680 ) (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 702 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 701 EXHIBITS re #696 Declaration in Opposition Exhibit 65-91 excerpt ESPN/ESPN Enterprise/ACC document filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 66-excerpt ABC/Big 12 Conf document, #2 Exhibit 67-Big Ten/Pac10/Pasadena Tournament of Roses document, #3 Exhibit 68-excerpt CSTV Network/Atlantic 10 document, #4 Exhibit 69-ESPN/Atlantic 10 document, #5 Exhibit 70-excerpt National Sports Partners/Fox/Big 12 document, #6 Exhibit 71-excerpt KPAX/Big Sky document, #7 Exhibit 72-Northern Arizona Univ/Big sky document, #8 Exhibit 73-ESPN/Fox/ CEO Group document, #9 Exhibit 74- ESPN/Fox/CEO Group document, #10 Exhibit 75-excerpt Conf USA/CSTV Network document, #11 Exhibit 76-excerpt ESPN/Conf USA document, #12 Exhibit 77-excerpt Conf USA/ESPN document, #13 Exhibit 78-Council of Ivy League Group Presidents/Yankees Entertainment Sports Network document, #14 Exhibit 79-excerpt Mid-Eastern Atlantic Conf/ESPN document, #15 Exhibit 80-excerpt Fox/Missouri Valley document, #16 Exhibit 81-excerpt Ohio Valley/ESPN document, #17 Exhibit 82-excerpt CBS/Patriot League document, #18 Exhibit 83-excerpt CSTV/Patriot League document, #19 Exhibit 84-excerpt Patriot League/ESPN document, #20 Exhibit 85-excerpt Patriot League/ESPN document, #21 Exhibit 86-excerpt CBS/SEC document, #22 Exhibit 87-SEC/ESPN document, #23 Exhibit 88-excerpt ESPN/SWAC document, #24 Exhibit 89-excerpt Summit League/Midcontinent Communications document, #25 Exhibit 90-excerpt Comcast/Sun Belt Conf document, #26 Exhibit 91-excerpt raycom/Jefferson Pilot /ACC document)(Related document(s) #696 ) (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 3/14/2013) Modified on 3/15/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2013 Filing 700 EXHIBITS re #698 Declaration in Support, (Exhibits 31-65 to Declaration of Jacob Schatz in support of Electronic Arts Inc.'s and Collegiate Licensing Co.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Class Certification) filed byCollegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Arts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 47-60, #2 Exhibit 61-65)(Related document(s) #698 ) (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 699 EXHIBITS re #696 Declaration in Opposition Exhibit 31-64 Raycom/Jefferson Pilot Sports Network/ACC document filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 32-except of ESPNAtlantic 10 document, #2 Exhibit 33-excerpt ABC/ESPN/Big 12 document, #3 Exhibit 34-excerpt ESPN/Conf USA document, #4 Exhibit 35-excerpt ESPN/Horizon League document, #5 Exhibit 36-excerpt Council Ivy Group Presidents/Versus document, #6 Exhibit 37-excerpt Mid East AC/ESPN document, #7 Exhibit 38-excerpt Med East AC/ ESPN document, #8 Exhibit 39-excerpt ESPN/Missouri Valley document, #9 Exhibit 40-excerpt Ohio Valley/ESPN document, #10 Exhibit 41-excerpt Ohio Valley/ESPN document, #11 Exhibit 42-excerpt Patriot League/ESPN document, #12 Exhibit 43-excerpt SEC/ESPN document, #13 Exhibit 44-excerpt Jefferson Pilot Sports/SEC document, #14 Exhibit 45-excerpt Summit League/Midcontinent Communications document, #15 Exhibit 46-excerpt Cable Sports Southeast/Clemson document, #16 Exhibit 47-excerpt US-Berkeley/Comcast document, #17 Exhibit 48-excerpt Univ of Texas at Austin/USA Collegiate document, #18 Exhibit 49-excerpt Cable Sports southeast/International Sports Properties document, #19 Exhibit 50-excerpt Washington State Univ/Fox document, #20 Exhibit 51-excerpt Cable Southeast Sports Channel/International Sports Properties document, #21 Exhibit 52-excerpt cable Southeast Sports Channel/Alabama Sports Marketing document, #22 Exhibit 53-excerpt Big Ten./BTN document, #23 Exhibit 54-excerpt Florida Atlantic Univ/WTCN document, #24 Exhibit 55-Princeton/Dorna document, #25 Exhibit 56- Univ of Missouri/Dorna document, #26 Exhibit 57-Excerpt Univ of Wisconsin-Madison/Dorna document, #27 Exhibit 58-excerpt SEC/Jefferson Pilot Sports document, #28 Exhibit 59-excerpt DC Bowl Committee/Conf USA document, #29 Exhibit 60-excerpt ESPN/Conf USA document, #30 Exhibit 61-excerpt ESPN/Conf USA document, #31 Exhibit 62-excerpt ESPN/Conf USA document, #32 Exhibit 63-excerpt SWAC/ESPN document, #33 Exhibit 64-excerpt NFL/Bd of Regents of Univ of Nebraska document)(Related document(s) #696 ) (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 3/14/2013) Modified on 3/15/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2013 Filing 698 Declaration of Jacob Schatz in Support of #680 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Electronic Arts Inc.'s and Collegiate Licensing Co.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification) filed byCollegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Arts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10, #2 Exhibit 11-17, #3 Exhibit 18-21, #4 Exhibit 22-24, #5 Exhibit 25-30)(Related document(s) #680 ) (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 697 EXHIBITS re #696 Declaration in Opposition Exhibit 1-30 TBS/CBS/NCAA document filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2-Univ of Georgia document, #2 Exhibit 3- Excerpt of CBS/SMU document, #3 Exhibit 4-excerpts of Conf USA/WHNO document, #4 Exhibit 5-excerpt of CBS/TCR document, #5 Exhibit 6-excerpt of Cable Sport Southeast/CSTV document, #6 Exhibit 7-excerpt of Collegiate Images/Comcast document, #7 Exhibit 8-excerpts of Collegiate Images/Comcast document, #8 Exhibit 9-excerpt of Collegiate Sports/TEM/Comcast document, #9 Exhibit 10-excerpts of Collegiate Sports/TEM/Comcast document, #10 Exhibit 11-excerpt of Collegiate Images/Comcast document, #11 Exhibit 12-excerpts of Collegiate Images/Comcast document, #12 Exhibit 13-excerpt of Collegiate Images/Comcast document, #13 Exhibit 14-excerpt of Collegiate Sports/TEM/Sportschannel document, #14 Exhibit 15-excerpte of Collegiate Sports/TEM/Comcast document, #15 Exhibit 16-excerpt Big Ten/BTN/TEM document, #16 Exhibit 17-excerpt Coolegiate Sports/TEM document, #17 Exhibit 18-excerpt Collegiate Sports/TEM document, #18 Exhibit 20-excerpt Collegiate Sports/TEM/BTN document, #19 Exhibit 21-excerpt Colegiate Sports/TEM/BTN document, #20 Exhibit 22-excerpt Collegiate Sports/TEM/BTN document, #21 Exhibit 23-excerpt Colegiate Sports/TEM/BTN document, #22 Exhibit 24-excerpt Collegiate Sports/TEM/BTN document, #23 Exhibit 25-excerpt Internations Sports Properties/Northern Illinois Univ/comcast document, #24 Exhibit 26-ecerpts San Diego State Univ/cox Communications document, #25 Exhibit 27-excerpt Univer of South Florida FOundation/Creative Sports document, #26 Exhibit 28-excerpt Pac12/ESPN/Fox document, #27 Exhibit 29-excerpt Jefferson Pilot Sports/ACC document, #28 Exhibit 30- intentionally omitted)(Related document(s) #696 ) (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 3/14/2013) Modified on 3/15/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2013 Filing 696 DECLARATION of Suzanne Wahl in support of #677 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Related document(s) #677 ) (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 3/14/2013) Modified on 3/15/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2013 Filing 695 EXHIBITS re #679 Declaration in Opposition Exhibit 141-160 filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Todd Petr, #2 Exhibit 143-Declaration of J. Douglas Elgin, #3 Exhibit 144- Declaration of Stan L. Albrecht, #4 Exhibit 145-Declaration of John Welty, #5 Exhibit 146-Declaration of Patrick T. Harker, #6 Exhibit 147-Declaration of Mark Womack, #7 Exhibit 148-Declaration of Univ of Texas, #8 Exhibit 149-Declaration of of Timothy White, #9 Exhibit 150-Declaration of Larry Scott, #10 Exhibit 151-Declaration of Bob Bowlsby, #11 Exhibit 152-Declaration of Jonathan LeCrone, #12 Exhibit 153-Declaration of Mark Lewis, #13 Exhibit 154-Declaration of Kevin Lennon, #14 Exhibit 155- Declaration of Nathan Hatch, #15 Exhibit 156- Expert Declaration of Lauren Stiroh & Dirk Van Leeuwen, #16 Exhibit 157- Declaration of Christopher Massaro, #17 Exhibit 158-Declaration of Derke Van der Meerwe, #18 Exhibit 159- Declaration of Herbert Carter, #19 Exhibit 160-Declaration of John Swofford)(Related document(s) #679 ) (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 3/14/2013) Modified on 3/15/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2013 Filing 694 Declaration of Ronald Klempner in Support of #680 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Electronic Arts Inc.'s and Collegiate Licensing Co.'s Opposition to Plaitiffs' Motion for Class Certification) filed byCollegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Arts Inc.. (Related document(s) #680 ) (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 693 Declaration of Guy Ben-Ishai in Support of #680 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Electronic Arts Inc.'s and Collegiate Licensing Co.'s Opposition to Plaitiffs' Motion for Class Certification) filed byCollegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Arts Inc.. (Related document(s) #680 ) (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 692 Declaration of Keith Gordon in Support of #680 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Electronic Arts Inc.'s and Collegiate Licensing Co.'s Opposition to Plaitiffs' Motion for Class Certification) filed byCollegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Arts Inc.. (Related document(s) #680 ) (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 691 ***FILED IN ERROR Declaration of Jason Masherah in Support of #680 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Electronic Arts Inc.'s and Collegiate Licensing Co.'s Opposition to Plaitiffs' Motion for Class Certification) filed byCollegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Arts Inc.. (Related document(s) #680 ) (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 3/14/2013) Modified on 3/18/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2013 Filing 690 Declaration of Alan J. Cox in Support of #680 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Electronic Arts Inc.'s and Collegiate Licensing Co.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification) filed byCollegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Arts Inc.. (Related document(s) #680 ) (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 689 EXHIBITS re #679 Declaration in Opposition Exhibit 121-140 webpage "Andre Ware/IMG Speakers" filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 122-webpage "Bill Walton/IMG Speakers", #2 Exhibit 123-webpage "kik Herstreit/IMG Speakers", #3 Exhibit 124-webpage "Archie Manning/IMG Speakers", #4 Exhibit 125-webpage "Peyton Manning/IMG Speakers", #5 Exhibit 126-webpage/WME speaker Tim Tebow", #6 Exhibit 127-Webpage "Carmelo Anthony/Overview/CAA Speakers", #7 Exhibit 128-webpage "Jalen Rose/Overview/CAA Speakers", #8 Exhibit 129-webpage "Kenny Smithi/Overview/CAA Speakers, #9 Exhibit 130-webpage "Warrick Dunn/Overview/CAA Speakers, #10 Exhibit 131-webpage "Robert Griffin III/Overview/CAA Speakers, #11 Exhibit 132-webpage "Mark Herzlich/Overivew/CAA Speakers, #12 Exhibit 133-webpage "Desmond Howard/Overview/CAA Speakers, #13 Exhibit 134-webpage "Warren Sapp/Overview/CAA Speakers, #14 Exhibit 135-selected webpages - Octagon, #15 Exhibit 136-selected webpages - Octagon, #16 Exhibit 137-selected webpages - Octagon, #17 Exhibit 138-selected webpages - Wasserman Media Group, #18 Exhibit 139-selected webpages-XAM Sports, #19 Exhibit 140-selected webpages-SMW Agency)(Related document(s) #679 ) (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 3/14/2013) Modified on 3/15/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2013 Filing 688 EXHIBITS re #679 Declaration in Opposition Exhibit 84-120 NCAA/ESPN document filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 85-NCAA/ethan Production document, #2 Exhibit 86-Singer Ltr to Clobes, #3 Exhibit 87-Singer ltr to Meriwether, #4 Exhibit 88-Rosenman ltr to Meriwether, #5 Exhibit 89-hausfeld ltrs to BTN, CBS, Comcast, ESPN, Fox, TBS, #6 Exhibit 90-Disney/Texas Western document, #7 Exhibit 91-Flournoy/warner Bros document, #8 Exhibit 92-Disney/Lattin document, #9 Exhibit 93-NFL/Rhodes document, #10 Exhibit 94-T3Media document, #11 Exhibit 95-T3Media document, #12 Exhibit 96-Dep excerpt of David Berst, #13 Exhibit 97-Dep excerpt of Peter Davis, #14 Exhibit 98-Dep excerpt of Mark Emmert, #15 Exhibit 99-Dep excerpt of David Knopp, #16 Exhibit 100-Dep excerpt of Kevin Lennon, #17 Exhibit 101-Dep excerpt of Greg Weitekamp, #18 Exhibit 102-Declaration of Burke Magnus, #19 Exhibit 103-Declaration of Brad Traviolia, #20 Exhibit 104-selected webpages from Oscar Robertson's website, #21 Exhibit 105-Ray Ellis personal Twitter website, #22 Exhibit 106-webpage of "Ray Ellis Sports", #23 Exhibit 107-selected webpages "Champ 66", #24 Exhibit 108-selected webpages "Jay Bilas, #25 Exhibit 109-selected webpages "The Official Website of Jeremy Lin", #26 Exhibit 110-selected webpages "The Official Website of Desmond Howard", #27 Exhibit 111-website "The Official Website of Tim Tebow", #28 Exhibit 112-selected webpages "Dwayne Wade", #29 Exhibit 113-selected webpages "Rudy International", #30 Exhibit 114-selected webpages "Nissan Heisman House", #31 Exhibit 115-webpage "Jeremy Lin & Volvo", #32 Exhibit 116-webpage "Bill Russell/IMG Speakers", #33 Exhibit 117-webpage "Greg Anthony/IMG Speakers", #34 Exhibit 118-webpage "Jay Bilas/IMG Speakers", #35 Exhibit 119-webpage "Drew Brees/IMG Speakers", #36 Exhibit 120-webpage "Lynn Swan/IMG Speakers")(Related document(s) #679 ) (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 3/14/2013) Modified on 3/15/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2013 Filing 687 EXHIBITS re #679 Declaration in Opposition Exhibit 61-83 filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 62-Univ of Arizona FB team roster, #2 Exhibit 63-Univ of California FB team roster, #3 Exhibit 64-Univ of Oregon FB team roster, #4 Exhibit 65-Oregon State FB team roster, #5 Exhibit 66-Stanford FB team roster, #6 Exhibit 67-UCLA FB team roster, #7 Exhibit 68-USC FB team roster, #8 Exhibit 69-Univ of Washington FB team roster, #9 Exhibit 70-Washington State FB team roster, #10 Exhibit 71-Univ of Arkansas FB team roster, #11 Exhibit 72- Auburn Univ FB team roster, #12 Exhibit 73-Univer of Florida FB team roster, #13 Exhibit 74-Univ of Georgia FB team roster, #14 Exhibit 75-Univ of Kentucky FB team roster, #15 Exhibit 76-Louisiana State Univ FB team roster, #16 Exhibit 77-Univ of Mississippi FB team roster, #17 Exhibit 78-Univ of Southn Carolina FB team roster, #18 Exhibit 79-Univ of Tennessee FB team roster, #19 Exhibit 80-Vanderbilt Univ FB team roster, #20 Exhibit 81-NCAA/NSP/FOX Document, #21 Exhibit 82-NCAA/WGCl document, #22 Exhibit 83-NCAA/BET document)(Related document(s) #679 ) (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 3/14/2013) Modified on 3/15/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2013 Filing 686 EXHIBITS re #679 Declaration in Opposition Exhibits 31-60 filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 32-Duke document, #2 Exhibit 33-Univ of Richmond document, #3 Exhibit 34-San Diego State document, #4 Exhibit 35-NCAA/CBS Sports Letter, #5 Exhibit 36-Myles Brand essay, #6 Exhibit 37-Excerpt of AP Resp & Obj to NCAA First Set of Rogs, #7 Exhibit 38-Appendix C-A13 to Noll's expert report, #8 Exhibit 39-Appendix C-A21 to Noll's expert report, #9 Exhibit 40-Appendix D-A10 to Noll's expert report, #10 Exhibit 41-Appendix D-A19 to Noll's expert report, #11 Exhibit 42-Univ of Florida BB team roster, #12 Exhibit 43-Mississippi State Univ BB team roster, #13 Exhibit 44-USC BB team roster, #14 Exhibit 45-Mississippi State FB team roster, #15 Exhibit 46-Univ of Alabama FB team roster, #16 Exhibit 47-Arizona State FB team roster, #17 Exhibit 48-Univ of Arizona BB team roster, #18 Exhibit 49-Univ of California BB team roster, #19 Exhibit 50-Oregon State Univ BB team roster, #20 Exhibit 51-Stanford BB team roster, #21 Exhibit 52-UCLA BB team roster, #22 Exhibit 53-Univ of Washington BB team roster, #23 Exhibit 54-Univ of Alabama BB team roster, #24 Exhibit 55-Univ of Arkansas BB team roster, #25 Exhibit 56-Auburn Univ BB team roster, #26 Exhibit 57-Univ of Georgia BB team roster, #27 Exhibit 58-Louisiana State Univ BB team roster, #28 Exhibit 59-south carolina BB team roster, #29 Exhibit 60-Univ of Tennessee BB team roster)(Related document(s) #679 ) (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 3/14/2013) Modified on 3/15/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2013 Filing 685 Declaration of Michael S. Drucker in Support of #680 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byCollegiate Licensing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 (public version), #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 (public version), #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6 (public version), #7 Exhibit 7 (public version), #8 Exhibit 8 (public version), #9 Exhibit 9 (public version), #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12 (public version), #13 Exhibit 13 (filed under seal))(Related document(s) #680 ) (Boyle, Peter) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 684 Declaration of Christina E. Fahmy in Support of #680 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byCollegiate Licensing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Chart), #2 Exhibit B (Chart), #3 Exhibit C (Expert Report of Lauren J. Stiroh))(Related document(s) #680 ) (Boyle, Peter) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 683 EXHIBITS re #679 Declaration in Opposition Exhibit 4-30 filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5-Dep excerpt of Larry Gerbrandt Vol II, #2 Exhibit 6-Dep excerpt of Roger Noll in Parrish case, #3 Exhibit 7-Dep excerpt of Kerwin Ray Ellis, #4 Exhibit 8-Dep excerpt of Harry Flournoy Jr, #5 Exhibit 9-Dep excerpt of Tate George, #6 Exhibit 10-Dep excerpt of Alex Gilbert, #7 Exhibit 11-Dep excerpt of Sam Jacobson, #8 Exhibit 12-Dep excerpt of Thad Jaracz, #9 Exhibit 13-Dep excerpt of David Lattin, #10 Exhibit 14-Dep excerpt of Patrick Maynor, #11 Exhibit 15-Dep excerpt of Edward O'Bannon, #12 Exhibit 16-Dep excerpt of Tyrone Prothro, #13 Exhibit 17-Dep excerpt of Damien Rhodes, #14 Exhibit 18-Dep excerpt of Eric Riley, #15 Exhibit 19-Dep excerpt of Oscar Robertson, #16 Exhibit 20-Dep excerpt of William Russell, #17 Exhibit 21-Dep excerpt of Robert Tallent, #18 Exhibit 22-Dep excerpt of Danny Wimprine, #19 Exhibit 23-Big Ten document, #20 Exhibit 24-CUSA document, #21 Exhibit 25-Big Ten document, #22 Exhibit 26-Notre Dame document, #23 Exhibit 27-Univ of Florida document, #24 Exhibit 28-Georgia Tech document, #25 Exhibit 29-Univ of Illinois document, #26 Exhibit 30-Univ of Michigan document)(Related document(s) #679 ) (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 3/14/2013) Modified on 3/15/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2013 Filing 682 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Selected Portions of Declarations, Reports, and Exhibits to EA and CLC's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Collegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Artis Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Chart, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Peter M. Boyle ISO Motion to Seal, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Asim Bhansali, #4 Proposed Order)(Boyle, Peter) (Filed on 3/14/2013) Modified on 3/15/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2013 Filing 681 EXHIBITS re #679 Declaration in Opposition Exhibit 1-Expert Report of James Heckman filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2-Expert Report of Daniel Rubinfeld, #2 Exhibit 3-Declaration of James Delany)(Related document(s) #679 ) (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 3/14/2013) Modified on 3/15/2013 (wv, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2013 Filing 680 RESPONSE (re #651 MOTION to Certify Class ) (Electronic Arts Inc.'s and Collegiate Licensing Company's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Claass Certification) filed byCollegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Arts Inc.. (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 679 DECLARATION of Robert Wierenga in Opposition to #677 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Related document(s) #677 ) (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 678 DECLARATION of Kimberly Kefalas in Opposition to #677 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Related document(s) #677 ) (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 677 RESPONSE (re #651 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 676 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING DEFENDANT ELECTRONIC ARTS INC.S AND COLLEGIATE LICENSING COMPANYS ADMINISTRATIVE #674 MOTION TO FILE SEPARATE OPPOSITION TO ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
February 8, 2013 Filing 675 RESPONSE (re #674 MOTION To File Separate Opposition to Antitrust Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification ) ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS COLLEGIATE LICENSING COMPANY'S AND ELECTRONIC ARTS, INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION SEEKING ADDITIONAL PAGES FOR THE BRIEFING OF CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
February 7, 2013 Filing 674 MOTION To File Separate Opposition to Antitrust Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification filed by Electronic Arts Inc.. Responses due by 2/21/2013. Replies due by 2/28/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration or R. James Slaughter, #2 Proposed Order)(Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 2/7/2013) Modified on 2/8/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2013 Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Motions due by 9/26/2013. Responses due by 10/31/2013. Replies due by 12/5/2013. Replies due by 1/2/2014. Case Management Statement due by 1/16/2014. Further Case Management Conference / Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2014 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. See Docket No. 673. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 673 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ON DEFENDANTS #639 MOTION TO STRIKE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
January 28, 2013 Filing 672 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 17, 2012, before Judge Nathanael Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, Telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/29/2013. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
January 28, 2013 Filing 671 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Jon T. King Notice of Change in Counsel for Plaintiff Tate George and Withdrawal of Attorney Jon T. King (King, Jon) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 670 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS #665 MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
December 27, 2012 Filing 669 NOTICE of Change of Address by Courtney Elizabeth Curtis (Curtis, Courtney) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
December 27, 2012 Filing 668 NOTICE of Change of Address by James C. Potepan (Potepan, James) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
December 26, 2012 Filing 667 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon T. King Notice of Appearance of Jon T. King (King, Jon) (Filed on 12/26/2012)
December 21, 2012 Filing 666 RESPONSE (re #665 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Class Certification ) ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' SECOND MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael P. Lehmann, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 21, 2012 Filing 665 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Class Certification filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 664 Order granting #662 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 6, 2012 Filing 663 Declaration of Jessica S. Sprovtsoff in Support of #662 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Granting Request to Adjust the Case Schedule filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Related document(s) #662 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 12/6/2012) Modified on 12/7/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2012 Filing 662 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Granting Request to Adjust the Case Schedule filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Samuel Michael Keller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 12/6/2012) Modified on 12/7/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2012 Filing 661 Minute Entry: Telephonic conference held 12/4/2012 before Nathanael Cousins amid deposition of Vacarro; parties ordered to meet and confer further re deposition objections, and if unable to resolve dispute, to file motion to compel and/or for protective order. This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/4/2012)
November 30, 2012 Filing 660 NOTICE of Change of Address by Collegiate Licensing Company (Curtis, Courtney) (Filed on 11/30/2012)
November 28, 2012 Filing 659 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #507 ) (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
November 27, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE Notice is hereby given that the Court, on its own motion, shall take #639 Defendants' motion to strike Antitrust Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification under submission on the papers. The hearing previously scheduled for Thursday, November 29, 2012, is vacated. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012) Modified on 11/28/2012 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 658 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #657 Stipulation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
November 26, 2012 Filing 657 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #656 Order on Motion for Sanctions, Order on Motion to Strike,, filed by Collegiate Licensing Company, Ishmael Thrower. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henn, R.) (Filed on 11/26/2012) Modified on 11/27/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 656 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ADOPTING #641 INTENDED RULING,GRANTING #548 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS, DENYING AS MOOT #595 MOTION TO STRIKE AMENDED DECLARATION, AND IMPOSING MONETARY SANCTIONS UPON ATTORNEY REGINALD TERRELL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
November 13, 2012 Filing 655 Public Filing of Redacted Exhibit 76 by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 76)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 11/13/2012) Modified on 11/14/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2012 Filing 654 Renotice motion hearing re #651 MOTION to Certify Class, #554 MOTION to Certify Class filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Related document(s) #651 ) (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 12, 2012 Filing 653 Submission of Document by National Collegiate Athletic Association re #645 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 51 (partially redacted))(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 11/12/2012) Modified on 11/13/2012 (kcS, ).
November 12, 2012 Filing 652 DISREGARD, NOT FILED IN COMPLIANCE WITH LR 3-4(a), DOCUMENT TO BE RESUBMITTEDEXHIBITS re #651 MOTION to Certify Class - Exhibit 76 (partially redacted) filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Related document(s) #651 ) (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 11/12/2012) Modified on 11/13/2012 (kcS, ).
November 12, 2012 Filing 651 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 1/31/2013. Replies due by 3/15/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A - Expert Report on Class Certification of Roger G. Noll (partially redacted), #4 Exhibit A - Noll Exhibits (partially redacted), #5 Exhibit A - Noll Appendices (1 of 3) (partially redacted), #6 Exhibit A - Noll Appendices (2 of 3) (partially redacted), #7 Exhibit A - Noll Appendices (3 of 3) (partially redacted), #8 Exhibit B - Expert Report of Larry Gerbrandt & Exhibits, #9 Exhibit 1, #10 Exhibit 2, #11 Exhibit 3, #12 Exhibit 4, #13 Exhibit 5, #14 Exhibit 6, #15 Exhibit 7, #16 Exhibit 8, #17 Exhibit 9, #18 Exhibit 10, #19 Exhibit 11, #20 Exhibit 12, #21 Exhibit 13, #22 Exhibit 14, #23 Exhibit 15, #24 Exhibit 16, #25 Exhibit 17, #26 Exhibit 18, #27 Exhibit 19, #28 Exhibit 20, #29 Exhibit 21, #30 Exhibit 22, #31 Exhibit 23, #32 Exhibit 24, #33 Exhibit 25, #34 Exhibit 26, #35 Exhibit 27, #36 Exhibit 28, #37 Exhibit 29, #38 Exhibit 30, #39 Exhibit 31, #40 Exhibit 32, #41 Exhibit 33, #42 Exhibit 34, #43 Exhibit 35, #44 Exhibit 36, #45 Exhibit 37, #46 Exhibit 38, #47 Exhibit 39, #48 Exhibit 40, #49 Exhibit 41, #50 Exhibit 42, #51 Exhibit 43, #52 Exhibit 44, #53 Exhibit 45, #54 Exhibit 46, #55 Exhibit 47, #56 Exhibit 48, #57 Exhibit 49, #58 Exhibit 50, #59 Exhibit 52, #60 Exhibit 53, #61 Exhibit 54, #62 Exhibit 55, #63 Exhibit 56, #64 Exhibit 57, #65 Exhibit 58, #66 Exhibit 59, #67 Exhibit 60, #68 Exhibit 61, #69 Exhibit 62, #70 Exhibit 63, #71 Exhibit 64, #72 Exhibit 65, #73 Exhibit 66, #74 Exhibit 67, #75 Exhibit 68, #76 Exhibit 69, #77 Exhibit 70, #78 Exhibit 71, #79 Exhibit 72, #80 Exhibit 73, #81 Exhibit 74, #82 Exhibit 75, #83 Exhibit 77, #84 Exhibit 78, #85 Exhibit 79, #86 Exhibit 80, #87 Exhibit 81)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 11/12/2012) Modified on 11/13/2012 (kcS, ).
November 8, 2012 Filing 650 Declaration of Peter M. Boyle in Support of #648 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byCollegiate Licensing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #648 ) (Boyle, Peter) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
November 8, 2012 Filing 649 Supplemental Declaration of Robert Wierenga in Support of #639 MOTION to Strike filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 20 - Excerpts from 2CAC, #2 Exhibit 21 - Excerpts from MTD Hearing Transcript, #3 Exhibit 22 - Excerpts from NCAA Responses to Nos. 6, 10 & 11 to AP 1st Set of Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit 23 - Excerpts from CMC Hearing Transcript, #5 Exhibit 24 - Excerpts from O'Bannon dep transcript, #6 Exhibit 25 - Excerpts from Ellis dep transcript, #7 Exhibit 26 - Excerpts from Gilbert dep transcript, #8 Exhibit 27 - Excerpts from Jacobson dep transcript, #9 Exhibit 28 - Excerpts from Flournoy dep transcript, #10 Exhibit 29 - Excerpts from Jaracz dep transcript, #11 Exhibit 30 - Excerpts from lattin dep transcript, #12 Exhibit 31 - Excerpts from tallent dep transcript)(Related document(s) #648 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 11/8/2012) Modified on 11/9/2012 (kcS, ).
November 8, 2012 Filing 648 REPLY (re #639 Joint MOTION to Strike #625 Declaration in Support,, #628 Declaration in Support, ) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
November 6, 2012 Filing 647 Submission of Evidence by Collegiate Licensing Company re #641 Notice of Intended Granting of CLC's Motion for Sanctions. (Attachments: #1 Declaration R. Charles Henn, Jr. in Support of CLC's Submission of Evidence regarding Court's Notice of Intended Granting of CLC's Motion for Sanctions, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Henn, R.) (Filed on 11/6/2012) Modified on 11/7/2012 (kcS, ).
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 646 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO COMPEL re #594 Statement filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 11/5/2012. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 645 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO SEAL re #635 Notice (Other) filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 11/5/2012. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
November 1, 2012 Filing 644 Proposed Order DENYING #639 MOTION TO STRIKE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND SUPPORTING PAPERS by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 11/1/2012) Modified on 11/2/2012 (kcS, ).
November 1, 2012 Filing 643 RESPONSE (re #639 Joint MOTION to Strike #625 Declaration in Support,, #628 Declaration in Support, ) ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND SUPPORTING PAPERS filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
November 1, 2012 Filing 642 Declaration of Michael P. Lehmann in Support of #643 OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND SUPPORTING PAPERS filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 11/1/2012) Modified on 11/2/2012 (kcS, ).
October 30, 2012 Filing 641 NOTICE OF INTENDED RULING GRANTING #548 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND DENYING AS MOOT #595 MOTION TO STRIKE AMENDED DECLARATION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/30/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 640 Order granting #582 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
October 24, 2012 Filing 639 Joint MOTION to Strike #554 Antitrust Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 11/1/2012. Replies due by 11/8/2012. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 10/24/2012) Modified on 10/25/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2012 Filing 638 Declaration of John Cooper in Support of #637 Letter Brief of Turner Broadcasting System filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Related document(s) #637 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 10/24/2012)
October 24, 2012 Filing 637 Letter Brief re #626 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal an Exhibit of Turner Broadcasting System filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Related document(s) #626 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 10/24/2012)
October 24, 2012 Filing 636 Declaration of Kimberly K. Kefalas in Support of #635 Notice (Other) of Lodging Documents Pursuant to Court's October 17, 2012 Order filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Related document(s) #635 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 10/24/2012)
October 24, 2012 Filing 635 NOTICE by National Collegiate Athletic Association of Lodging documents pursuant to re #626 Order (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 10/24/2012) Modified on 10/24/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2012 Filing 634 Expert Report of Larry Gerbrandt filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Related document(s) #554 ) (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 10/22/2012) Modified on 10/23/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2012 Filing 633 Expert Report on Class Certification of Roger G. Noll (Partially Redacted) filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Partially Redacted, Volume I of I), #2 Appendix (Partially Redacted, Volume I of III), #3 Appendix (Partially Redacted, Volume II of III), #4 Appendix (Partially Redacted, Volume III of III))(Related document(s) #554 ) (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 10/22/2012) Modified on 10/23/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2012 Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Motions due by 8/12/2013. Responses due by 9/16/2013. Replies due by 10/21/2013. Replies due by 11/19/2013. Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2014 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. **See Docket No. 632.** (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
October 22, 2012 Reset Deadlines/Hearings Responses due by 1/31/2013. Replies due by 3/15/2013. Replies due by 3/29/2013. Replies due by 4/15/2013. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. **See Docket No. 632.** (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012) Modified on 10/23/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2012 Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Joint Motion due by 10/24/2012. Responses due by 11/1/2012. Replies due by 11/8/2012. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. ** See Docket No. 632** (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 632 ORDER by Judge Claudia WilkenSTRIKING DEFENDANTS SEPARATE ( #624 , #627 , #629 )MOTIONS TO STRIKE, GRANTING DEFENDANTS LEAVE TO REFILE A JOINT MOTION TO STRIKE, DECLINING #631 STIPULATION REGARDING ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION AND GRANTING #622 STIPULATION TO MODIFY THE CASE SCHEDULE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
October 22, 2012 Filing 631 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Adjusting Page Limitations for Single Consolidated Opposition Brief filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., National Collegiate Athletic Association, Collegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Arts Inc. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 10/22/2012) Modified on 10/23/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2012 Filing 630 Proposed Order re #622 MOTION to Adjust Case Schedule by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 10/18/2012)
October 18, 2012 Reset Deadlines as to #627 MOTION to Strike Antitrust Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and supporting papers. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2012)
October 17, 2012 Filing 629 MOTION to Strike Electronic Arts Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion To Strike Antitrust Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Electronic Arts Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 10/31/2012. Replies due by 11/7/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration or R. James Slaughter)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 17, 2012 Filing 628 Declaration of Peter M. Boyle in Support of #627 MOTION to Strike Antitrust Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and supporting papers filed byCollegiate Licensing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Peter M. Boyle, #2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Peter M. Boyle, #3 Exhibit C to Declaration of Peter M. Boyle)(Related document(s) #627 ) (Boyle, Peter) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 17, 2012 Filing 627 MOTION to Strike Antitrust Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and supporting papers filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 10/31/2012. Replies due by 11/7/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boyle, Peter) (Filed on 10/17/2012) Modified on 10/18/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 626 Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting in part and denying in part #598 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 17, 2012 Filing 625 Declaration of Robert Wierenga in Support of #624 MOTION to Strike Antitrust Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19)(Related document(s) #624 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 17, 2012 Filing 624 MOTION to Strike Antitrust Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 10/31/2012. Replies due by 11/7/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 623 Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting #601 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 17, 2012 Filing 622 STIPULATION to Adjust Case Schedule #600 Order filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Electornic Arts Inc, Collegiate Licensing Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 10/17/2012) Modified on 10/18/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 16, 2012 Filing 621 NOTICE of Change of Address by James C. Potepan (Potepan, James) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 620 ORDER RE #619 entered by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/16/12. The Court will address this Letter Brief at the hearing scheduled for 10/17/2012 1:00 PM. No further briefing is required. This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
October 16, 2012 Filing 619 Letter Brief Regarding Defendants And Antitrust Plaintiffs Joint Statement On Scheduling Of Antitrust Plaintiffs Experts Depositions filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
October 16, 2012 Filing 618 RESPONSE (re #598 Supplemental Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CERTAIN EXPERT MATERIALS DESIGNATED CONFIDENTIAL BY OTHER PARTIES IN CONNECTION WITH MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION ) SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT BY ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS CONCERNING SUPPLEMENTAL ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 617 Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting #616 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (text only entry)(nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
October 16, 2012 Filing 616 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. (Henn, R.) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 615 ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS BROUGHT BY PLAINTIFF ISHMAEL THROWER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/16/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 614 Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting #612 Motion to Appear by Telephone.(nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
October 16, 2012 Filing 613 NOTICE by National Collegiate Athletic Association re #611 Order to ECF file redacted Exhibits 51 and 76 to the Gosselin Declaration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 51 Redacted, #2 Exhibit 76 Redacted)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
October 16, 2012 Filing 612 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 611 ORDER to submit redacted documents re #596 Notice (Other) filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 10/15/2012. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
October 15, 2012 Filing 610 Declaration of Jose R. Allen in Support of Antitrust Plaintiffs' Supplemental Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Expert Materials Designated Confidential by Other Parties in Connection With Motion For Class Certification filed byNBA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - B)(Allen, Jose) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
October 15, 2012 Filing 609 Declaration of Peter M. Boyle in Support of #598 Supplemental Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CERTAIN EXPERT MATERIALS DESIGNATED CONFIDENTIAL BY OTHER PARTIES IN CONNECTION WITH MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byCollegiate Licensing Company. (Related document(s) #598 ) (Henn, R.) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
October 15, 2012 Filing 608 Declaration of R. James Slaughter in Support of #598 Supplemental Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CERTAIN EXPERT MATERIALS DESIGNATED CONFIDENTIAL BY OTHER PARTIES IN CONNECTION WITH MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byElectronic Arts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #598 ) (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 607 Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting #603 Motion to Appear by Telephone.(nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
October 15, 2012 Filing 606 Declaration of Gregg G. Brandon in Support of #598 Supplemental Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CERTAIN EXPERT MATERIALS DESIGNATED CONFIDENTIAL BY OTHER PARTIES IN CONNECTION WITH MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byXOS Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) #598 ) (Hamilton, Cindy) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
October 15, 2012 Filing 605 Declaration of Robert Wierenga in Support of #598 Supplemental Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CERTAIN EXPERT MATERIALS DESIGNATED CONFIDENTIAL BY OTHER PARTIES IN CONNECTION WITH MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Related document(s) #598 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
October 15, 2012 Filing 604 Declaration of Victoria Donovan in Support of #598 Supplemental Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CERTAIN EXPERT MATERIALS DESIGNATED CONFIDENTIAL BY OTHER PARTIES IN CONNECTION WITH MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Related document(s) #598 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
October 15, 2012 Filing 603 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Samuel Michael Keller. (Aragon, Leonard) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
October 12, 2012 Filing 602 SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE IN COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURTS OCTOBER 10, 2012 #599 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Henn, R.) (Filed on 10/12/2012) Modified on 10/15/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2012 Filing 601 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Fahmy Declaration, #2 Exhibit A-E, #3 Proposed Order)(Henn, R.) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 600 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGES RECOMMENDATION, MODIFYING CASE SCHEDULE AND SETTING HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANTS ANTICIPATED MOTION TO STRIKE. Set Deadlines: Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to #554 MOTION to Certify Class: Responses due by 12/31/2012; Replies due by 2/11/2013; Replies due by 3/18/2013; Replies due by 4/2/2013; Motion Hearing/Further Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2013 02:00 PM. Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motions due by 8/12/2013; Responses due by 9/16/2013; Replies due by 10/21/2013; Replies due by 11/19/2013; Motion Hearing/ Further Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2014 02:00 PM; Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/28/2014 02:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 6/9/2014 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken; and Jury Trial (15 day) set for 6/9/2014 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/11/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 599 ORDER requesting documents re #594 Statement filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 10/10/2012. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
October 10, 2012 Filing 598 SUPPLEMENTAL ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL CERTAIN EXPERT MATERIALS DESIGNATED CONFIDENTIAL BY OTHER PARTIES IN CONNECTION WITH MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael P. Lehmann, #2 Proposed Order)(Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 10/10/2012) Modified on 10/11/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2012 Filing 597 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 3, 2012, before Judge Nathanael Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2013. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 5, 2012 Filing 596 NOTICE by National Collegiate Athletic Association of Documents Lodged With the Court Pursuant to the Court's September 28, 2012 Order Denying Motion to Seal (DKT 576) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 5, 2012 Filing 595 MOTION to Strike #590 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 10/19/2012. Replies due by 10/26/2012. (Henn, R.) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 5, 2012 Filing 594 Joint Statement of Collegiate Licensing Company and Antitrust Plaintiffs Re: Plaintiffs' Responses to CLC's First Set of Interrogatories by Collegiate Licensing Company. (Henn, R.) (Filed on 10/5/2012) Modified on 10/9/2012 (kcS, ).
October 4, 2012 Filing 593 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL JON T. KING by Christopher L. Lebsock (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 10/4/2012) Modified on 10/5/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2012 Filing 592 REPLY (re #548 MOTION for Sanctions ) in Support of Its Motion for Sanctions filed byCollegiate Licensing Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alicia Grahn Jones ISO of CLC's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Sanctions, #2 Declaration of R. Charles Henn Jr. ISO of CLC's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Sanctions, #3 Declaration of Gregory S. Gilchrist ISO of CLC's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Sanctions)(Henn, R.) (Filed on 10/4/2012)
October 3, 2012 Set Hearing re #591 . Discovery Hearing set for 10/17/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
October 3, 2012 Filing 591 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 10/3/2012 before Nathanael Cousins, re Dkt. Nos. #545 #549 . (Court Reporter Belle Ball) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/3/2012)
October 3, 2012 Filing 590 AMENDED Declaration of Reginald V. Terrell in Opposition to Sanctions Motion filed byIshmael Thrower. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Terrell, Reginald) (Filed on 10/3/2012) Modified on 10/4/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 589 ORDER re #565 GRANTING EAS REQUEST FOR PLAINTIFFS TO RESPOND TO RFAS 2-4 AND 37.. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 10/03/2012. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
October 2, 2012 Filing 588 Letter from Jose R. Allen regarding certain confidential and competitively sensitive information of the NBA. (Allen, Jose) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
October 2, 2012 Filing 587 RESPONSE (re #580 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Noll Expert Report and Certain Exhibits and Appendices to that Report ) (and re #579 Declaration of R. James Slaughter iso Antitrust Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Dkt. No. 529)) ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO COLLEGIATE LICENSING CORPORATION'S AND ELECTRONIC ARTS, INC.'S MOTIONS TO SEAL PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORT OF DR. ROGER NOLL filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (King, Jon) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Appear by Telephone #584 entered by Judge Nathanael Cousins. Counsel shall contact the Courtroom Deputy at 415.522.2039 to provide a number for this appearance. This is a text-only entry generated by the Court. There is no document associated with this notice.< (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
October 2, 2012 Filing 585 NOTICE by Electronic Arts Inc. re #578 Order Notice of Documents Lodged With the Court Regarding Discovery Dispute Pursuant to Docket 578 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3)(Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
October 2, 2012 Filing 584 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the Case Management Conference on October 3, 2012 filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
October 2, 2012 Filing 583 Statement in support of re #580 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Noll Expert Report and Certain Exhibits and Appendices to that Report filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Related document(s) #580 ) (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 10/2/2012) Modified on 10/3/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2012 Filing 582 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7167629.) filed by Oscar P. Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coates, Terence) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
October 2, 2012 Filing 581 RESPONSE (re #580 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Noll Expert Report and Certain Exhibits and Appendices to that Report ) and re #579 Declaration of R. James Slaughter iso Antitrust Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Dkt. No. 529) filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
October 1, 2012 Filing 580 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Noll Expert Report and Certain Exhibits and Appendices to that Report filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Declaration of Peter M. Boyle ISO CLC's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Selected Exhibits and Appendices to the Expert Report of Roger M. Noll, #3 Exhibit Exhibits to Peter M. Boyle's Declaration)(Henn, R.) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
October 1, 2012 Filing 579 Declaration of R. JAMES SLAUGHTER iso Antitrust Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Dkt. 529) filed byElectronic Arts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (Proposed Order))(Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 578 ORDER REQUESTING DOCUMENTS re #565 Statement, filed by Electronic Arts Inc.. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 10/01/2012. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
October 1, 2012 Filing 577 ***DISREGARD, DOCUMENT RE-FILED, SEE DOCUMENT #582*** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 305.) filed by Oscar P. Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Coates, Terence) (Filed on 10/1/2012) Modified on 10/2/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 576 Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins denying #529 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2012)
September 27, 2012 Filing 575 ***INCORRECT CASE NUMBER*** RESPONSE (re #548 MOTION for Sanctions ) filed byIshmael Thrower. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Terrell, Reginald) (Filed on 9/27/2012) Modified on 9/28/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER entered by Judge Nathanael Cousins. Upon joint request, the Court continues the Case Management Conference to 10/3/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Court will also consider Dkt. No. 565, discovery dispute regarding plaintiffs' responses to admissions, at the conference. This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 573 Order denying #561 Motion for Leave to File Reply entered by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins, in that parties have addressed class certification deadlines in their case management statements filed today. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
September 25, 2012 Filing 572 Declaration of Jessica A. Sprovtsoff in Support of #570 Case Management Statement filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-NCAA email, #2 Exhibit 2-NCAA email, #3 Exhibit 3-NCAA email, #4 Exhibit 4-Deposition Excerpt from Peter Davis, #5 Exhibit 5-Deposition Excerpt from Tyrone Prothro, #6 Exhibit 6-Deposition Excerpt from Ray Ellis, #7 Exhibit 7-Deposition Excerpt from Robert Tallent, #8 Exhibit 8-Deposition Excerpt from Eric Riley, #9 Exhibit 9-Deposition Excerpt from Henry Flournoy, #10 Exhibit 10-Deposition Excerpt from David Lattin, #11 Exhibit 11-Wierenga letter to Steiner, #12 Exhibit 12-Steiner letter to Wierenga)(Related document(s) #570 ) (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
September 25, 2012 Filing 571 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. (Henn, R.) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
September 25, 2012 Filing 570 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
September 25, 2012 Filing 569 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Electronic Arts Inc.. (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
September 25, 2012 Filing 568 RESPONSE to Order (Dkt. No. 564) (Sept. 21, 2012) - Antitrust Plaintiffs Submission Regarding Proposed Changes to Case Schedule by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Appear by Telephone #566 entered by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel shall contact the Court at 415.522.2039 to provide a telephone number for this appearance. This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 24, 2012 Filing 566 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. (Henn, R.) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 24, 2012 Filing 565 Joint Statement of Electronic Arts Inc. and Antitrust Plaintiffs Re: Plaintiffs' Responses to Request for Admission Nos. 2-4 and 37 by Electronic Arts Inc.. (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 9/24/2012) Modified on 9/25/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2012 Filing 564 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING Case Management Conference for 9/26/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco with Magistrate Judge Cousins. Parties to file any proposed changes to case schedule by 12:00 noon on 9/25/2012. This is a text-only entry generated by the Court. There is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ORDER REFERRING CASE MANAGEMENT ISSUES TO THE DISCOVERY MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #545 Stipulation, #561 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support of Motion to Change Time to File Responses to Antitrust Plaintiffs' Class Certification Motion, and #549 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 530 MOTION to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/20/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
September 20, 2012 Filing 562 RESPONSE (re #561 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support of Motion to Change Time to File Responses to Antitrust Plaintiffs' Class Certification Motion ) Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Reply filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (King, Jon) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
September 20, 2012 Filing 561 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support of Motion to Change Time to File Responses to Antitrust Plaintiffs' Class Certification Motion filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Electronic Arts Inc. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 9/20/2012) Modified on 9/21/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2012 Filing 560 Declaration of Jon T. King re #559 Opposition/Response to Motion, by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (King, Jon) (Filed on 9/18/2012) Modified on 9/19/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2012 Filing 559 RESPONSE (re #549 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 530 MOTION to Certify Class ) ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION OF DEFENDANTS TO CHANGE TIME TO FILE RESPONSES TO ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (King, Jon) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
September 18, 2012 Filing 558 NOTICE by National Collegiate Athletic Association re #553 Order Regarding NCAA's Submission of Documents (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
September 18, 2012 Filing 557 NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS LODGING OF DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER TO SUBMIT DOCUMENTS RELATED TO MOTION TO SEAL re #553 Order by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (King, Jon) (Filed on 9/18/2012) Modified on 9/19/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 556 Order finding as moot #538 Discovery Letter Brief entered by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins, in that parties have agreed #546 to Sept. 30, 2012, deadline for plaintiffs to respond to NCAA interrogatory requests. The Court GRANTS stipulation to extend Roger Noll deposition to October 5. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 555 Order granting #510 Discovery Letter Brief re EA's motion to compel responses to interrogatories, entered by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins.
September 17, 2012 Filing 554 MOTION to Certify Class PUBLIC VERSION filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 10/31/2012. Replies due by 12/13/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 14, #3 Exhibit 20, #4 Exhibit 21, #5 Exhibit 40, #6 Exhibit 42, #7 Exhibit 46, #8 Exhibit 49, #9 Exhibit 50, #10 Exhibit 52, #11 Exhibit 53, #12 Exhibit 72, #13 Exhibit 73, #14 Exhibit 74, #15 Exhibit 80, #16 Exhibit 81)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 9/17/2012) Modified on 9/18/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 553 ORDER TO SUBMIT DOCUMENTS re #550 Order on Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 9/14/2012. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 552 ORDER STRIKING IMPROPERLY FILED 530 DOCUMENT AND DIRECTING ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS TO RE FILE THE DOCUMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/14/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER re #547 Statement filed by Electronic Arts Inc.. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 9/14/2012. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 550 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING IN PART, AND REFERRING IN PART, #529 MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL, DENYING #543 MOTION TO STRIKE, AND REFERRING FUTURE MOTIONS TO SEAL TO THE DISCOVERY MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
September 13, 2012 Filing 549 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 530 MOTION to Certify Class filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Electronic Arts Inc, Collegiate Licensing Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 9/13/2012) Modified on 9/14/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2012 Filing 548 MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 9/27/2012. Replies due by 10/4/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Henn, R.) (Filed on 9/13/2012) Modified on 9/14/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2012 Filing 547 Joint Statement of Electronic Arts Inc. And Antitrust Plaintiffs Re: Plaintiffs' Responses to Requests for Admission by Electronic Arts Inc.. (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 9/13/2012) Modified on 9/14/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2012 Filing 546 NCAA & Antitrust Plaintiffs' Joint Supplemental Brief filed pursuant to re #541 Order filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association, Samuel Michael Keller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-NCAA's 2nd Set of Interrogatories to Antitrust Plaintiffs)(Related document(s) #541 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 9/13/2012) Modified on 9/14/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2012 Filing 545 STIPULATION Request for Case Management Conference filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Collegiate Licensing Company, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 9/13/2012) Modified on 9/14/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2012 Filing 544 RESPONSE (re #543 MOTION to Strike #542 Response ) ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO THE NCAAS REQUEST TO STRIKE THE ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO THE WIERENGA DECLARATION filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (King, Jon) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
September 11, 2012 Filing 543 MOTION to Strike #542 RESPONSE TO THE DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. WIERENGA IN SUPPORT OF ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS AUGUST 31, 2012 MOTION TO SEAL filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. Responses due by 9/25/2012. Replies due by 10/2/2012. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 9/11/2012) Modified on 9/12/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2012 Filing 542 RESPONSE to re #539 WIERENGA DECLARATION by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (King, Jon) (Filed on 9/11/2012) Modified on 9/12/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ORDER REQUESTING ADDITIONAL INFORMATION re #538 Joint Discovery Letter BriefON SHORTENING THE RESPONSE TIME TO THE NCAAS SECOND SET OF INTERROGATORIES filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 9/7/2012. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
September 7, 2012 Filing 540 NOTICE by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. re Clerks Notice, Notice of Receipt of Letter from The Big Twelve Conference (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jon T. King, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(King, Jon) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
September 7, 2012 Filing 539 Declaration of Robert J. Wierenga in Support of #529 Administrative Motion to File PROVISIONALLY UNDER SEAL CERTAIN MATERIALS DESIGNATED CONFIDENTIAL BY OTHER PARTIES AND NON-PARTIES IN CONNECTION WITH MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #529 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
September 7, 2012 Filing 538 Joint Discovery Letter Brief ON SHORTENING THE RESPONSE TIME TO THE NCAAS SECOND SET OF INTERROGATORIES filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 9/7/2012) Modified on 9/10/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2012 Filing 537 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON BIG TWELVE CONFERENCE (King, Jon) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
September 6, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that Plaintiffs shall serve Big 12 Conference with the #529 motion to seal and relevant documents, if they have not already done so, and file a certificate of service. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 536 Order granting #535 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
September 5, 2012 Filing 535 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Third Addendum to Protective Order filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Collegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Arts Inc. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 9/5/2012) Modified on 9/6/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2012 Filing 534 REPLY (re #507 MOTION RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE IMPOSING SANCTIONS ) Reply re Opposition of Big Ten Network and Fox Broadcasting filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (King, Jon) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
September 4, 2012 Filing 533 REPLY (re #507 MOTION RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE IMPOSING SANCTIONS ) Reply Brief filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (King, Jon) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
August 31, 2012 Filing 532 Certificate of Service by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (King, Jon) (Filed on 8/31/2012) Modified on 9/4/2012 (kc, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 531 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE ON PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES #510 #528 . The matter is under submission. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 8/31/12. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2012) Modified on 9/4/2012 (kc, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2012 Filing 530 ***DOCUMENT DELETED PURSUANT TO ORDER, DOCUMENT #552 *** MOTION to Certify Class ***PUBLIC VERSION*** filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 10/31/2012. Replies due by 12/13/2012. (King, Jon) (Filed on 8/31/2012) Modified on 9/4/2012 (kc, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/17/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2012 Filing 529 Administrative Motion to File PROVISIONALLY UNDER SEAL CERTAIN MATERIALS DESIGNATED CONFIDENTIAL BY OTHER PARTIES AND NON-PARTIES IN CONNECTION WITH MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jon T. King, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(King, Jon) (Filed on 8/31/2012) Modified on 9/4/2012 (kc, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2012 Filing 528 Joint Statement on Discovery Brief Requesting Complete Interrogatory Responses from Antitrust Plaintiffs filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 8/30/2012) Modified on 8/31/2012 (kc, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER RECOMMENDING DISMISSAL OF ISHMAEL THROWER'S CLAIMS #504 #516 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
August 30, 2012 Filing 526 Minute Entry: Hearing held on 8/29/2012 before Judge Nathanael Cousins re Joint Discovery Letter Brief #504 . Court takes under submission. (Court Reporter Sahar Bartlett.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/30/2012)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER RE: CONFIDENTIALITY DESIGNATIONS OF DOCUMENTS PRODUCED BY COLLEGIATE LICENSING #515 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Appear By Telephone #523 entered by Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins. Counsel shall contact the courtroom deputy at 415.522.2039 to provide a telephone number for this appearance. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
August 29, 2012 Filing 523 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 522 ORDER clarifying docket entry 518. The joint statement at issue in docket entry 518 refers to a statement from the NCAA and CLC only. (This is a text-only docket entry) (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
August 29, 2012 Filing 521 Joint Discovery Letter Brief sent on behalf of NCAA, CLC and Antitrust Plaintiffs filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 8/29/2012) Modified on 8/30/2012 (kc, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2012 Filing 520 NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS LODGING OF DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER REQUESTING DOCUMENTS RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE by Samuel Michael Keller, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (King, Jon) (Filed on 8/24/2012) Modified on 8/27/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR ANTITRUST #507 PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDERS OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Responses due by 8/29/2012. Replies due by 9/2/2012. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/24/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 518 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST BY NCAA AND CLC TO SUBMIT BRIEFING RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE ON INTERROGATORIES #510 #517 . The NCAA and CLC may file a joint statement of no more than five pages by 8/30/12. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only docket entry)(nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 23, 2012 Filing 517 Joint Discovery Letter BriefNCAA And CLCs Request To File A Supplemental Brief Supporting EAs Motion To Compel Complete Interrogatory Responses From Antitrust Plaintiffs filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 23, 2012 Filing 516 Discovery Letter Brief CLC's First Set of Requests for Production of Docs to Thrower Submitted in Compliance with Court 8.21.2012 Order filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. (Attachments: #1 CLC's First Set of Requests for Prod of Docs to Thrower)(Henn, R.) (Filed on 8/23/2012) Modified on 8/23/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2012 Filing 515 Discovery Letter Brief Joint Statement re CLC's Confidentiality Designations filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. (Henn, R.) (Filed on 8/23/2012) Modified on 8/23/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2012 Filing 514 Discovery Letter Brief Submitting Interrogatories and Responses Pursuant to Court's August 22, 2012 Order filed by Electronic Arts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 8/22/2012) Modified on 8/23/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL #505 . See Civil Local Rule 79-5(e) for more information. (This is a text-only docket entry)(nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER REQUESTING DOCUMENTS RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE ON INTERROGATORIES #510 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 8/22/12. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER REQUESTING DOCUMENTS RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE ON CONFIDENTIALITY DESIGNATIONS #505 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 8/22/12. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
August 22, 2012 Filing 510 Joint Discovery Letter Brief RE: PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES filed by Electronic Arts Inc.. (Lauridsen, Robert) (Filed on 8/22/2012) Modified on 8/23/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2012 Filing 509 Additional EXHIBITS re #508 Supplemental Declaration of Ellen Meriwether re #507 MOTION RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE IMPOSING SANCTIONS filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 15)(Related document(s) #507 ) (King, Jon) (Filed on 8/21/2012) Modified on 8/22/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2012 Filing 508 Supplemental Declaration of Ellen Meriwether re #507 MOTION RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE IMPOSING SANCTIONS by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(King, Jon) (Filed on 8/21/2012) Modified on 8/22/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2012 Filing 507 MOTION RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE IMPOSING SANCTIONS filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. Responses due by 9/4/2012. Replies due by 9/11/2012. (King, Jon) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER REQUESTING DOCUMENTS RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE #504 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 8/21/12. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER SETTING HEARING RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE #504 . Hearing set for 8/29/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 8/21/12. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
August 21, 2012 Filing 505 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Statement re CLC's Confidentiality Designations filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Henn, R.) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
August 21, 2012 Filing 504 Discovery Letter Brief Joint Statement re: Proposed Motion to Compel Documents and Deposition of Plaintiff Thrower filed by Collegiate Licensing Company, Ishmale Thrower. (Henn, R.) (Filed on 8/21/2012) Modified on 8/22/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2012 Filing 503 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #502 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Robert Wierenga by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit G)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 502 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL #494 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins.(nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
August 8, 2012 Filing 501 Declaration of Gregg G. Brandon in response to #495 Order to Serve Motion to File Under Seal on Designating Parties filed byCollegiate Images, LLC, XOS Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) #495 ) (Hamilton, Cindy) (Filed on 8/8/2012) Modified on 8/9/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS FOR SANCTIONS RE #21 Case No. 12-mc-80020 and #66 , #67 Case No. 11-mc-80300. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 08/07/2012. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
August 7, 2012 Filing 499 Declaration of Elizabeth DeBauche in Support of #494 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #494 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL #485 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
August 6, 2012 Filing 497 Declaration of Judy MacLeod in Support of #494 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Documents Produced by non-party, Conference USA filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Related document(s) #494 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
August 3, 2012 Filing 496 Reply Brief in Support of Antitrust Plaintiffs' #485 MOTION to Compel NCAA Financial Data filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jon T. King)(Related document(s) #485 ) (King, Jon) (Filed on 8/3/2012) Modified on 8/6/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER TO SERVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL #494 ON DESIGNATING PARTIES. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 7/31/12. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 31, 2012 Filing 494 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Robert Wierenga, #2 Proposed Order)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 31, 2012 Filing 493 Declaration of Robert J. Wierenga in support of NCAA's Opposition to Antitrust Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel NCAA Financial Data filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Filed under Seal, #2 Exhibit B-Filed under Seal, #3 Exhibit C-Filed under Seal, #4 Exhibit D-Agreement Between ESPn & Ohio Valley Conf, #5 Exhibit E-Filed under Seal, #6 Exhibit F-Television Rights Term Sheet, #7 Exhibit G-Filed under Seal, #8 Exhibit H-Telecast Agreement, #9 Exhibit I-Telecast Rights Agreement)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 7/31/2012) Modified on 8/1/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2012 Filing 492 Declaration of Keith Martin in Support of #491 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-NCAA's Agreed Upon Procedures, #2 Exhibit 2-2004-2010 Revenue & Expenses of NCAA D1, #3 Exhibit 3-Excerpt of 2011-12 NCAA DI Manual)(Related document(s) #491 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 31, 2012 Filing 491 RESPONSE (re #485 MOTION to Compel NCAA Financial Data ) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL #484 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins.(nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 30, 2012 Filing 489 Declaration of Robert J. Wierenga in response to July 27, 2012 #487 Order filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B-Redacted document, #3 Exhibit C-Redacted document)(Related document(s) #487 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 7/30/2012) Modified on 7/31/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2012 Filing 488 NOTICE by BIG TEN NETWORK, LLC re #487 Order Re Unsealing of Document BTN013-016 (Singer, David) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSE FROM NCAA AND THE BIG TEN NETWORK RE: #484 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 7/27/12. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
July 17, 2012 Filing 486 Declaration of Renae D. Steiner in support of re #485 MOTION to Compel Redacted Public Version: Antitrust Plaintiffs Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel NCAA Financial Data by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 and 2 Redacted Cover Sheets, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 5 and 6 Redacted Cover Sheets, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 10 Redacted Cover Sheet)(King, Jon) (Filed on 7/17/2012) Modified on 7/18/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2012 Filing 485 MOTION to Compel (Redacted Public Version) Antitrust Plaintiffs Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel NCAA Financial Data filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 7/31/2012. Replies due by 8/3/2012. (King, Jon) (Filed on 7/17/2012) Modified on 7/18/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/18/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2012 Filing 484 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CONFIDENTIAL MATERIALS PRODUCED BY DEFENDANT NCAA AND NON-PARTY BIG TEN NETWORK filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jon T. King, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(King, Jon) (Filed on 7/17/2012) Modified on 7/18/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER REQUESTING BRIEFING RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE #482 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 7/11/12. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 10, 2012 Filing 482 JOINT STATEMENT OF PLAINTIFFS AND NCAA RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FINANCIAL DATA by Samuel Michael Keller, National Collegiate Athletic Association, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (King, Jon) (Filed on 7/10/2012) Modified on 7/11/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2012 Filing 481 NOTICE by National Collegiate Athletic Association Notice of Withdrawal of Kimberly L. Scott and Certificate of Service (Scott, Kimberly) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER VACATING HEARING RE: #479 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 26, 2012 Filing 479 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Statement Of Resolution By NCAA And Plaintiffs Re: NCAAs Subpoenas To Third Parties Sonny Vaccaro, Pam Vaccaro And Hoops That Help, Inc. filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Juckniess, Frederick) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 20, 2012 Filing 478 AMENDED ANSWER to AND AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FILED BY WILLIAM F. RUSSELL byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 18, 2012 Filing 477 RESPONSE TO JUNE 13, 2012 ORDER RE: PRIVILEGE LOGS filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 6/18/2012) Modified on 6/19/2012 (kc, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2012 Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2012 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (kc, ) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION #475 regarding scheduling of NCAA's motion to compel re: subpoenas to third parties Sony Vaccaro, Pam Vaccaro and Hoops that Help, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
June 15, 2012 Filing 475 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULING FOR NCAAS MOTION TO COMPEL RE: SUBPOENAS TO THIRD PARTIES SONNY VACCARO, PAM VACCARO AND HOOPS THAT HELP, INC. filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER REQUESTING ADDITIONAL INFORMATION RE: #472 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 6/13/12. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER REQUESTING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING RE: #471 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins.(nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
June 12, 2012 Filing 472 Joint Statement of Plaintiffs and NCAA re Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Document and Privilege-Log Production by a Date Certain filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 6/12/2012) Modified on 6/13/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2012 Filing 471 JOINT STATEMENT OF NCAA AND PLAINTIFFS RE: NCAA'S SUBPOENAS TO THIRD PARTIES SONNY VACCARO, PAM VACCARO AND HOOPS THAT HELP, INC. filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Juckniess, Frederick) (Filed on 6/12/2012) Modified on 6/13/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 470 Order granting #469 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Timothy L. O'Mara and Daniel Murray Wall terminated as counsel, entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
June 8, 2012 Filing 469 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Electronic Arts Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 6/22/2012. Replies due by 6/29/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel)(O'Mara, Timothy) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 1, 2012 Filing 468 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 16, 2012, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/22/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/2/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/30/2012. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
May 31, 2012 Filing 467 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Saveri (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
May 30, 2012 Filing 466 ANSWER to Complaint filed by William Russell byCollegiate Licensing Company. (Boyle, Peter) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
May 30, 2012 Filing 465 DEFENDANT NCAAS ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FILED BY WILLIAM F. RUSSELL byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
May 29, 2012 Filing 464 NOTICE by Electronic Arts Inc. of Estimated Length of Antitrust Trial (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 29, 2012 Filing 463 Statement Regarding Estimated Length of Trial by Collegiate Licensing Company re #458 Order. (Fahmy, Christina) (Filed on 5/29/2012) Modified on 5/30/2012 (kc, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2012 Filing 462 RESPONSE to #458 Order to Advise the Court of a Proposed Trial Length for the Claims in the Antitrust Case Only by Samuel Michael Keller, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (King, Jon) (Filed on 5/29/2012) Modified on 5/30/2012 (kc, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2012 Filing 461 Trial Time Estimate by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Unruh, Rocky) (Filed on 5/29/2012) Modified on 5/30/2012 (kc, COURT STAFF).
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 460 Order granting #459 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 24, 2012 Filing 459 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Second Addendum to Stipulated Protective Order filed by Collegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Arts Inc., Samuel Michael Keller, National Collegiate Athletic Association, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (King, Jon) (Filed on 5/24/2012) Modified on 5/25/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES (C-10-632, C-11-388, C-11-4938), ADDRESSING DISCOVERY MATTERS, MODIFYING CASE SCHEDULE, AND REQUIRING PARTIES TO PROVIDE AN ESTIMATE OF THE LENGTH OF TRIAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/21/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2012) Modified on 5/22/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES, ADDRESSING DISCOVERY MATTERS, MODIFYING CASE SCHEDULE, AND REQUIRING PARTIES TO PROVIDE AN ESTIMATE OF THE LENGTH OF TRIAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/21/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2012) Modified on 5/21/2012 (ndr, COURT STAFF).***DISREGARD, INCORRECT DOCUMENT ATTACHED***
May 16, 2012 Filing 456 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/16/2012 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 5/16/2012). (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/16/2012)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING ELECTRONIC ARTS INC.S #366 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 454 Order granting #451 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 9, 2012 Filing 453 Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed by Collegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Arts Inc., Samuel Michael Keller, National Collegiate Athletic Association, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (King, Jon) (Filed on 5/9/2012) Modified on 5/10/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2012 Filing 452 NOTICE by Collegiate Licensing Company for Association of Counsel (Potepan, James) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
May 9, 2012 Filing 451 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6807324.) filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Steiner, Renae) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
May 9, 2012 Filing 450 NOTICE REGARDING REQUEST FOR VIDEO RECORDING. At least one party has not consented to the video recording of the May 16, 2012 case management conference; the proceeding will not be recorded.(cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
May 4, 2012 Filing 449 NOTICE OF REQUEST TO VIDEO RECORD May 16, 2012 case management conference in 09-1967, 10-632, 11-388 and 11-4938, pursuant to Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. NO LATER THAN MAY 9, 2012, ALL PARTIES MUST COMPLETE THE ATTACHED PARTY RESPONSE FORM AND EMAIL IT TO CAMERAS@CAND.USCOURTS.GOV. (Attachments: Party Response to Request for Video Recording) (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
April 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 448 Order granting #447 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER GRANTING PARTIES (445 in 4:09-cv-01967-CW)STIPULATION AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2012. Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/17/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 16, 2012 Filing 447 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Robert J. Wozniak ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611073037.) Filing fee previously paid on 4/17/2012 filed by Samuel Michael Keller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
April 13, 2012 Filing 445 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Rescheduling of Case Management Conference filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 10, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for Wednesday, May 9, 2012, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. Case Management Statement due by May 2, 2012. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ON ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS' #433 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
April 6, 2012 Filing 443 OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Collegiat LIcensing Company. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 4/6/2012) Modified on 4/9/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2012 Filing 442 Plaintiffs Request for Setting of Case Management Conference by Samuel Michael Keller, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (King, Jon) (Filed on 4/5/2012) Modified on 4/6/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Jury Selection set for 2/24/2014 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Jury Trial set for 2/24/2014 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. **See Order, Docket No. 439** (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 29, 2012 Filing 441 REPLY (re #433 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE IMPOSING SANCTIONS ON PLAINTIFFS AND DENYING MOTIONS TO COMPEL ) Antitrust Plaintiffs Reply re Big Ten Network filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (King, Jon) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 29, 2012 Filing 440 REPLY (re #433 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE IMPOSING SANCTIONS ON PLAINTIFFS AND DENYING MOTIONS TO COMPEL ) Antitrust Plaintiffs' Reply re Big Ten Conference filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (King, Jon) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 29, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 10/31/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2013 02:00 PM. Motions due by 6/12/2013. Responses due by 7/17/2013. Replies due by 8/21/2013. Replies due by 9/20/2013. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. **See Order, Docket No. 439** (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PARTIES #438 STIPULATION AND MODIFYING THE CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE. Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2013 02:00 PM. Motions due by 8/31/2012. Responses due by 10/31/2012. Replies due by 12/13/2012. Replies due by 1/17/2013. Replies due by 2/1/2013 Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2014 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Jury Selection set for 2/24/2014 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Jury Trial set for 2/24/2014 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/29/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012) Modified on 3/30/2012 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2012 Filing 438 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Revised Case Schedule by Collegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Arts Inc., Samuel Michael Keller, National Collegiate Athletic Association, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (King, Jon) (Filed on 3/23/2012) Modified on 3/26/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2012 Filing 437 Antitrust Plaintiffs' Opposition to Big Ten Network and Fox Broadcasting's Motion for Sanctions #430 by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (King, Jon) (Filed on 3/21/2012) Modified on 3/22/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2012 Filing 436 Antitrust Plaintiffs' Opposition to Big Ten Conference's Motion for Sanctions #430 by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (King, Jon) (Filed on 3/21/2012) Modified on 3/22/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/22/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS #433 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Responses due by 3/24/2012. Replies due by 3/27/2012. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/19/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
March 15, 2012 Filing 434 REPLY (re #433 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE IMPOSING SANCTIONS ON PLAINTIFFS AND DENYING MOTIONS TO COMPEL ) Antitrust Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion for Relief filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (King, Jon) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 8, 2012 Filing 433 ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE IMPOSING SANCTIONS ON PLAINTIFFS AND DENYING MOTIONS TO COMPEL filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 3/22/2012. Replies due by 3/29/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ellen Meriwether, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14)(King, Jon) (Filed on 3/8/2012) Modified on 3/9/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).