Aliser et al v. SEIU California et al
Plaintiff: James White, Javier Palmerin, Teresa Boyle, Erin Thompson, Renee Browne, peter finn, Stephanie Caudel, Tom McCavitt, Maureen O'Brien, Ruth Aliser, Samira Golbad, Miriam E. Noujaim, Barbara Park, Kenton Miller and Lorenzo Nolan
Defendant: Secretary Alex M. Azar, II, SEIU California, Rob Feckner, California State Retirees, Henry Jones, Priya Mathur, Theresa Taylor, SEIU Local 521, United States of America, Xavier Becerra, Adria Jenkins-Jones, Edmund G. Brown, Seema Verma, Erich Shiners, SEIU Local 721, Betty Yee, Betty T. Yee, California State Employees' Association, John Chiang, SEIU Local 1021, Margaret Brown, SEIU Local 2015, Priscilla Winslow, California State University Employees Union, Dana Hollinger, Bill Slaton, Eric Banks, Arthur A. Krantz, David Miller, Board of Trustees of the California State University, Ramon Rubalcava, Richard Costigan and SEIU Local 1000
Petitioner: William D. Brice
Respondent: Delores Polk
Case Number: 4:2019cv00426
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Consent/Declination due by 2/11/2019. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 69 CLERK'S NOTICE Acknowledging Receipt of Case Transfer in from the Eastern District of California, Case No. 2:18-cv-2574-MCE-CKD. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 68 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 67 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-02574. Case file, copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 1/28/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/22/19 ORDERING that this action is hereby transferred to the Northern District of California. (Kaminski, H)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/16/19 GRANTING plaintiffs until 1/17/19 to file their response to #33 Motion to Sever and Transfer and GRANTING the union defendants until 1/31/19 to file their reply. (Coll, A)
January 17, 2019 Filing 64 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Transferring Venue and Withdrawing #31 Motion to Sever and Transfer by Ruth Aliser, et al., . (Mitchell, Jonathan) Modified on 1/18/2019 (Benson, A.).
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/14/19 DECLINING to relate cases. (Coll, A)
January 11, 2019 Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court received the Stipulation and Proposed Order for Extension of Time (ECF No. 61). Pursuant to Local Rule 137(b), regarding the requirements for proper filing of a proposed order, you are required to email the proposed order (in Microsoft Word) to chambers in addition to filing the pdf version via the CM/ECF system. Pursuant to Local Rules 101 and 131(c), the definition for "signature", you may enter /s/ for signatures for all counsel. Please submit your proposed order today, in Microsoft Word format to: mceorders@caed.uscourts.gov. (Deutsch, S)
January 10, 2019 Filing 61 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to File Their Response to Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue, and for the Union Defendants to File Their Reply Brief by Ruth Aliser, et al., . (Mitchell, Jonathan) Modified on 1/11/2019 (Benson, A.).
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 12/30/18 ORDERING that Exhibit A [32-2] to the Declaration of Ashley R. Kerner and Exhibit E [32-19] to the Declaration of Dereck Smithin in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction are permanently SEALED. (Kastilahn, A)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/30/18 GRANTING plaintiffs until 1/10/19 to file their opposition to #33 Motion to Sever and Transfer and GRANTING the Union Defendants until 1/24/19 to file their reply in support of the Motion. (Coll, A)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/30/18 GRANTING plaintiffs until 12/14/18 to file their replies in Support of #21 Motion for Expedited Discovery and #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Coll, A)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/29/18 EXTENDING the deadline for completion of the initial disclosures as required under Rule 26(a)(1)(C) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by 30 days and EXTENDING the deadline for completion of the parties' meet and confer requirements under Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to 15 days after issuance of the latest Court decision on #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #21 Motion for Expedited Discovery, and #33 Motion to Sever and Transfer. (Coll, A)
December 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/29/2018. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation (ECF No. 44), Defendants shall have until 30-days after the Court rules on the pending Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue (ECF No. 33) to file responses to the Complaint.(Deutsch, S)
December 19, 2018 Filing 55 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Alex M. Azar, II, United States of America, Seema Verma to #33 Motion to Sever and Transfer. (Knapp, Michael)
December 14, 2018 Filing 54 REPLY BRIEF by Teresa Boyle, Renee Browne, Stephanie Caudel, Samira Golbad, Kenton Miller, Erin Thompson in Support of #21 Motion for Expedited Discovery. (Mitchell, Jonathan) Modified on 12/17/2018 (Reader, L).
December 14, 2018 Filing 53 REPLY BRIEF by Teresa Boyle, Renee Browne, Stephanie Caudel, Samira Golbad, Kenton Miller, Erin Thompson in Support of #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Mitchell, Jonathan) Modified on 12/17/2018 (Reader, L).
December 14, 2018 Filing 52 REPLY BRIEF by Teresa Boyle, Renee Browne, Stephanie Caudel, Samira Golbad, Kenton Miller, Erin Thompson in Support of #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Mitchell, Jonathan) Modified on 12/17/2018 (Reader, L).
December 13, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:18-cv-2900 by Delores Polk. Attorney Messenger, William L. added. (Messenger, William)
December 11, 2018 Filing 50 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for extension of time to file opposition and reply re #33 Motion to Sever and Transfer by Defendants. (Kronland, Scott) Modified on 12/12/2018 (Kaminski, H).
December 11, 2018 Filing 49 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to File Their Replies in Support of Motions for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery by Plaintiffs . (Mitchell, Jonathan) Modified on 12/11/2018 (Kaminski, H)
December 7, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:18-cv-03106, 2:18-cv-02419, 2:18-cv-02961, 2:18-cv-02230 by William D. Brice. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Cooley v CSLEA)(Burlingham, Steven)
December 6, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Edmund G. Brown by Ruth Aliser, Teresa Boyle, Renee Browne, Stephanie Caudel, Peter Finn, Samira Golbad, Tom McCavitt, Kenton Miller, Lorenzo Nolan, Miriam E. Noujaim, Maureen O'Brien, Javier Palmerin, Barbara Park, Erin Thompson, James White. (Mitchell, Jonathan) Modified on 12/6/2018 (Washington, S).
December 4, 2018 Filing 46 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Eric Banks, Xavier Becerra, Board of Trustees of the California State University, Edmund G. Brown, Margaret Brown, John Chiang, Richard Costigan, Rob Feckner, Dana Hollinger, Adria Jenkins-Jones, Henry Jones, Arthur A. Krantz, Priya Mathur, David Miller, Ramon Rubalcava, Erich Shiners, Bill Slaton, Theresa Taylor, Priscilla Winslow, Betty T. Yee, Betty Yee re #33 Motion to Sever and Transfer. (O'Brien, Anthony)
November 30, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by California State University Employees Union, SEIU California, SEIU Local 1000, SEIU Local 1021, SEIU Local 2015, SEIU Local 521, SEIU Local 721. (Kronland, Scott)
November 29, 2018 Filing 44 CORRECTED #43 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for extension of time to respond to Complaint by California State University Employees Union, et al., (Kronland, Scott) Modified on 11/30/2018 (Benson, A.).
November 29, 2018 Filing 43 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for extension of time to respond to complaint by California State University Employees Union, et al., (Kronland, Scott) Modified on 11/30/2018 (Benson, A.).
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/28/2018 ORDERING plaintiff shall have up to and including 12/11/2018 to file their Reply in Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery. (Zignago, K.)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/28/2018 ORDERING attorney Talcott J. Franklin added for Ruth Aliser, Teresa Boyle, Renee Browne, Stephanie Caudel, Peter Finn, Samira Golbad, Tom McCavitt, Kenton Miller, Lorenzo Nolan, Miriam E. Noujaim, Maureen O'Brien, Javier Palmerin, Barbara Park and Erin Thompson. (Zignago, K.)
November 29, 2018 Filing 40 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Extend the Deadline for Completion of Initial Disclosures by Eric Banks, et al., (O'Brien, Anthony) Modified on 11/30/2018 (Benson, A.).
November 27, 2018 Filing 39 AMENDED #38 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER by Ruth Aliser, et al., . (Mitchell, Jonathan) Modified on 11/28/2018 (Benson, A.).
November 27, 2018 Filing 38 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for EXTENSION of TIME for Plaintiffs to File Their Reply by Ruth Aliser, et al., Teresa Boyle, Renee Browne, Stephanie Caudel, Peter Finn, Samira. (Benbrook, Bradley) Modified on 11/28/2018 (Benson, A.).
November 26, 2018 Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the January 10, 2019, hearing on the Motion to Sever and Transfer #33 is VACATED and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition, and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is DENIED AS MOOT. (Deutsch, S)
November 26, 2018 Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court received the Pro Hac Vice Application and Proposed Order (ECF No. 35). Pursuant to Local Rule 137(b), regarding the requirements for proper filing of a proposed order, you are required to email the proposed order (in Microsoft Word) to chambers in addition to filing the pdf version via the CM/ECF system. Pursuant to Local Rules 101 and 131(c), the definition for "signature", you may enter /s/ for signatures for all counsel. Please submit your proposed order today, in Microsoft Word format to: mceorders@caed.uscourts.gov. (Deutsch, S)
November 26, 2018 Filing 35 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Ruth Aliser, et al., to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7984304) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Benbrook, Bradley)
November 20, 2018 Filing 34 OPPOSITION by California State University Employees Union, et al., to #21 Motion for Expedited Discovery. (Kronland, Scott) Modified on 11/26/2018 (Kastilahn, A).
November 20, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION TO SEVER AND TRANSFER by California State University Employees Union, et al. Motion Hearing SET for 1/10/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Appendix to Memorandum, #3 Declaration of Scott A. Kronland, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B , #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D , #8 Exhibit E, #9 Proposed Order)(Kronland, Scott) Modified on 11/26/2018 (Kastilahn, A).
November 20, 2018 Filing 32 OPPOSITION by California State University Employees Union, et al., to #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley R. Kerner, #2 Exhibit A , #3 Exhibit B , #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Declaration of Scott A. Kronland, #7 Exhibit A, #8 Declaration of Wendy Montero, #9 Exhibit A, #10 Exhibit B, #11 Declaration of Dayna Ramos, #12 Exhibit A, #13 Exhibit B, #14 Declaration of Dereck Smith, #15 Exhibit A, #16 Exhibit B, #17 Exhibit C, #18 Exhibit D, #19 Exhibit E, #20 Exhibit F)(Kronland, Scott) Modified on 11/26/2018 (Kastilahn, A).
November 20, 2018 Filing 31 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Alex M. Azar, II, United States of America, Seema Verma to #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Knapp, Michael)
November 20, 2018 Filing 30 OPPOSITION by Eric Banks, et al., to #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Attorney O'Brien, Anthony Paul added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(O'Brien, Anthony) Modified on 11/26/2018 (Kastilahn, A).
November 15, 2018 Filing 29 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Alex M. Azar, II, United States of America, Seema Verma to #21 Motion for Expedited Discovery. (Knapp, Michael)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/14/18 GRANTING #25 unopposed Motion to exceed the page limitation applicable to its opposition to Plaintiffs' Preliminary injunction Motion. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 15, 2018 Filing 27 STATEMENT of NO POSITION by Defendants re Plaintiffs' #21 Motion for Expedited Discovery. Attorney O'Brien, Anthony Paul added. (O'Brien, Anthony) Modified on 11/16/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/13/18 GRANTING Defendants California State University Employees Union, SEIU Local 721, and SEIU Local 2015 until 11/20/18 to respond to #21 Motion for Expedited Discovery and GRANTING Plaintiffs until 11/27/18 to file a reply in support of the motion. (Coll, A)
November 13, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION re #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kronland, Scott) Modified on 11/15/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
November 9, 2018 Filing 24 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to #21 Motion for Expedited Discovery by California State University Employees Union, SEIU California, SEIU Local 1000, SEIU Local 1021, SEIU Local 2015, SEIU Local 521, SEIU Local 721. Attorney Lee, Rebecca Moryl added. (Lee, Rebecca) Modified on 11/13/2018 (Kaminski, H).
November 6, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of PARTIAL WITHDRAWAL of #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Teresa Boyle, Renee Browne, Stephanie Caudel, Samira Golbad, Kenton Miller, Erin Thompson. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
November 5, 2018 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the November 29, 2018 hearing on the #21 Motion for Discovery is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition, and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. Additionally, pursuant to Local Rule 137(b), regarding the requirements for proper filing of a proposed order, you are required to email the proposed order (in Microsoft Word) to chambers in addition to filing the pdf version via the CM/ECF system. Pursuant to Local Rules 101 and 131(c), the definition for "signature", you may enter /s/ for signatures for all counsel. Please submit your proposed order today, in Microsoft Word format to: mceorders@caed.uscourts.gov. (Fabillaran, J)
November 1, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for EXPEDITED DISCOVERY by Ruth Aliser, et al., Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan) Modified on 11/2/2018 (Washington, S).
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/25/18 ORDERING that Defendants shall have until November 20, 2018 to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. (Kaminski, H)
October 24, 2018 Filing 19 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for extension of time to respond to #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by California State University Employees Union, SEIU California, SEIU Local 1000, SEIU Local 1021, SEIU Local 2015, SEIU Local 521, SEIU Local 721. (Kronland, Scott) Modified on 10/25/2018 (Kastilahn, A).
October 17, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Michael Fraser Knapp on behalf of Alex M. Azar, II, United States of America, Seema Verma. Attorney Knapp, Michael Fraser added. (Knapp, Michael)
October 17, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Scott A. Kronland on behalf of California State University Employees Union, SEIU California, SEIU Local 1000, SEIU Local 1021, SEIU Local 2015, SEIU Local 521, SEIU Local 721. Attorney Kronland, Scott A. added. (Kronland, Scott)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/15/2018 GRANTING #15 the parties joint ex parte application for extension of time; Defendants shall respond to plaintiffs complaint by 12/7/2018. (Reader, L)
October 10, 2018 Filing 15 JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION to EXTEND TIME by Xavier Becerra, et al., . Attorney O'Brien, Anthony Paul added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anthony O'Brien, #2 Declaration of Scott Kronlund, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service)(O'Brien, Anthony) Modified on 10/15/2018 (Zignago, K.).
October 9, 2018 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the November 15, 2018 hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction #12 is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition, and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
October 8, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM by Teresa Boyle, et al., in support of #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
October 8, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Teresa Boyle, Renee Browne, Stephanie Caudel, Samira Golbad, Kenton Miller, Erin Thompson. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
October 3, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Alex M. Azar and Seema Verma served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018. (Benbrook, Bradley) Modified on 10/4/2018 (Benson, A.).
October 3, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Board of Trustees of the California State University, SEIU Local 1021, SEIU Local 2015, SEIU Local 521, and SEIU Local 721 served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Benbrook, Bradley) Modified on 10/4/2018 (Benson, A.).
October 3, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: California State Employees Association, California State Retirees, California State University Employees Union and SEIU Local 1000 served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Benbrook, Bradley) Modified on 10/4/2018 (Benson, A.).
October 3, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Eric Banks, Xavier Becerra, Edmund G. Brown, Margaret Brown, John Chiang, Richard Costigan, Rob Feckner, Dana Hollinger, Adria Jenkins-Jones, Henry Jones, Arthur A. Krantz, Priya Mathur, David Miller, Ramon Rubalcava, SEIU California, Erich Shiners, Bill Slaton, Theresa Taylor, Priscilla Winslow, Betty T. Yee and Betty Yee served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Benbrook, Bradley) Modified on 10/4/2018 (Benson, A.).
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 9/27/18 ADDING Attorney Jonathan F. Michell, PHV for all plaintiffs. (Kastilahn, A)
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Reader, L)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Alex M. Azar, II, Eric Banks, Xavier Becerra, Board of Trustees of the California State University, Edmund G. Brown, Margaret Brown, California State Employees Association, California State Retirees, California State University Employees Union, John Chiang, Richard Costigan, Rob Feckner, Dana Hollinger, Adria Jenkins-Jones, Henry Jones, Arthur A. Krantz, Priya Mathur, David Miller, Ramon Rubalcava, SEIU California, SEIU Local 1000, SEIU Local 1021, SEIU Local 2015, SEIU Local 521, SEIU Local 721, Erich Shiners, Bill Slaton, Theresa Taylor, United States of America, Seema Verma, Priscilla Winslow, Betty T. Yee, Betty Yee* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Bradley Benbrook* *Benbrook Law Group, PC* *400 Capitol Mall, Suite 2530* *Sacramento, California 95814*. (Reader, L)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Stephen M. Duvernay on behalf of all plaintiffs. (Benbrook, Bradley)
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Bradley A. Benbrook on behalf of all plaintiffs. (Benbrook, Bradley)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by all plaintiffs for attorney Jonathan F. Mitchell to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7873594) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (Texas))(Mitchell, Jonathan)
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by all plaintiffs. Attorney Mitchell, Jonathan F. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7873591) (Attachments: #1 Cal. Gov't Code 1152.12, #2 42 U.S.C. 1396a(a)(32), #3 42 C.F.R. 447.10, #4 Proposed Rule, #5 42 U.S.C. 1396c, #6 Renee Browne e-mails, #7 Kenton Miller e-mails, #8 Peter Finn letters and e-mails, #9 Stephanie Caudel letters, #10 Samira Golbad letters, #11 Teresa Boyle letters, #12 Erin Thompson documents, #13 Mariam Noujaim documents, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mitchell, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aliser et al v. SEIU California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Michael Fraser Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEIU California
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Represented By: Rebecca Moryl Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Feckner
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Retirees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Jones
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priya Mathur
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Taylor
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEIU Local 521
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Represented By: Rebecca Moryl Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Michael Fraser Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adria Jenkins-Jones
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seema Verma
Represented By: Michael Fraser Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erich Shiners
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEIU Local 721
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Represented By: Rebecca Moryl Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Yee
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty T. Yee
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Employees' Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Chiang
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEIU Local 1021
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Represented By: Rebecca Moryl Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Brown
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEIU Local 2015
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Represented By: Rebecca Moryl Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priscilla Winslow
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State University Employees Union
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Represented By: Rebecca Moryl Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Hollinger
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Slaton
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Banks
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur A. Krantz
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Miller
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the California State University
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon Rubalcava
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Costigan
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEIU Local 1000
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Represented By: Rebecca Moryl Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James White
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Palmerin
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin, PHV
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Boyle
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin, PHV
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Thompson
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin, PHV
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Browne
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin, PHV
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: peter finn
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin, PHV
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Caudel
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin, PHV
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom McCavitt
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin, PHV
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen O'Brien
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin, PHV
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Aliser
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin, PHV
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samira Golbad
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin, PHV
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam E. Noujaim
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin, PHV
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Park
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin, PHV
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenton Miller
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin, PHV
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Nolan
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin, PHV
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Stephen Duvernay
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Delores Polk
Represented By: William L. Messenger, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William D. Brice
Represented By: Steven R. Burlingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?