Gurrola v. Apple Inc et al
Plaintiff: Javier Gurrola
Defendant: ESRI Corporation, Google Inc., Isabel Dias, Miles & Westbrook, Omar Hernandez, Assurant Inc, Paul A. Burgess, Maria J. Gurrola, David LaClair, Great American Insurance Company, Eulalio Diaz Insurance Agency, Peter Miller Racing Stable, TLC Contents Restoration Inc, Elizabeth Gonzalez, Rosalina Gurrola, Zone 4 Power, Raquel Gurrola, Rocio Ochoa, Colt Musee, Hector Palma, U.S. Bancorp, Patricio Rojas, Chase T. Miller, Facebook Inc., Jesus Gurrola, Los Alamitos Race Track, First American Title Insurance Company, Christina Hernandez, Javier Martinez, Raquel Rios, T-Mobile USA Inc, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Sung Kim, III, Perla R. Rios, Jose M. Villa, Silvia Barraza, Arrowhead Regional Medical Center, Citigroup Inc., Melisa G. Rios, Shawn Gurganious, Apple Inc, Farmers Insurance Group, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Pinery Christmas Trees, Brandi Swan, Cheryl Roelle and Cody Musee
Case Number: 4:2019cv02389
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Referring Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying #26 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #27 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing; and Dismissing Complaint with Leave to Amend. Amended Pleadings due by 7/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Javier Gurrola. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Javier Gurrola. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 25 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byJavier Gurrola. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 24 Mail sent to Javier Gurrola returned as undeliverable re #21 Order. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 23 Mail sent to Javier Gurrola returned as undeliverable re #22 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, DENYING MOTION FOR PACER ACCESS, AND MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL ANDDISMISSING ACTION WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White Amended Pleadings due by 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/28/19. Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2019 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor.(Certificate of Service Attached) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 20 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to Case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 19 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Javier Gurrola. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Pacer Access Without Fees filed by Javier Gurrola. Responses due by 6/6/2019. Replies due by 6/13/2019. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Address by Javier Gurrola (docket updated) (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Javier Gurrola. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi denying without prejudice #8 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing; denying #12 Motion for Mail Handling. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/20/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (pmcS, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Mail Handling filed by Javier Gurrola. Responses due by 5/30/2019. Replies due by 6/6/2019. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 11 Response to Disclosure Order re #6 Order by Javier Gurrola. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order re #7 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed by Javier Gurrola. Completed consent/declination form due by 6/5/2019. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 5/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Magistrate Judge Consent/Declination Form) (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2019: #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (pmcS, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 First Amended Complaint Rule 156 (a) (1); jury demand; Summary Judgment and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filed by Javier Gurrola. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Javier Gurrola. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Order Granting Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Javier Gurrola (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Disclosure Order. Response due by 6/5/2019. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 5/8/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lmh, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi for all further proceedings re #4 Order of Recusal. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk of Court to reassign this case to another judge. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/3/19. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Javier Gurrola. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/23/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order Regarding Case Management in Civil Cases, #2 Standing Order for All Judges)(rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc, Arrowhead Regional Medical Center, Assurant Inc, Silvia Barraza, Paul A. Burgess, Citigroup Inc., Isabel Dias, ESRI Corporation, Eulalio Diaz Insurance Agency, Facebook Inc., Farmers Insurance Group, First American Title Insurance Company, Elizabeth Gonzalez, Google Inc., Great American Insurance Company, Shawn Gurganious, Jesus Gurrola, Maria J. Gurrola, Raquel Gurrola, Rosalina Gurrola, Christina Hernandez, Omar Hernandez, Sung Kim, III, David LaClair, Los Alamitos Race Track, Javier Martinez, Miles & Westbrook, Chase T. Miller, Cody Musee, Colt Musee, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Rocio Ochoa, Hector Palma, Peter Miller Racing Stable, Pinery Christmas Trees, Melisa G. Rios, Perla R. Rios, Raquel Rios, Cheryl Roelle, Patricio Rojas, Brandi Swan, T-Mobile USA Inc, TLC Contents Restoration Inc, U.S. Bancorp, Jose M. Villa, Zone 4 Power. Filed by Javier Gurrola. Consent/Declination due by 5/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gurrola v. Apple Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESRI Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isabel Dias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miles & Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assurant Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul A. Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria J. Gurrola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David LaClair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eulalio Diaz Insurance Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Miller Racing Stable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TLC Contents Restoration Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosalina Gurrola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zone 4 Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raquel Gurrola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocio Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colt Musee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Palma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bancorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricio Rojas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase T. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Gurrola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Alamitos Race Track
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raquel Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sung Kim, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perla R. Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose M. Villa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silvia Barraza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrowhead Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melisa G. Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Gurganious
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinery Christmas Trees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandi Swan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Roelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Musee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Gurrola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?