La Clinica De La Raza et al v. Trump et al
Plaintiff: Maternal and Child Health Access, Central American Resource Center, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Council on American Islamic Relations-California, California Primary Care Association, AFRICAN COMMUNITIES TOGETHER, Farmworker Justice, La Clinica De La Raza and Korean Resource Center
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan and Donald J. Trump
Petitioner: Community Healthcare Network, Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, America's Essential Hospitals, National Center for Law and Economic Justice, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, NHLP; FRAC; CLASP, et al., Asian Pacific Institute on Gender-Based Violence, Fiscal Policy Institute, Public Health Law Watch, Families USA, Boundless Immigration, Association of American Medical Colleges, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, American Academy of Pediatrics, California, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, American Hospital Association, Florida Health Justice Project, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, Morton Rosenberg, Economic Progress Institute, Oasis Legal Services, Child Care Law Center, Health Law Advocates, Inc., Kids Forward, The Federation of American Hospitals, Community Catalyst, American College of Physicians, Northeastern University Center for Health Policy and Law, Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy, The Children's Hospital Association, Treatment Action Group, California Immigrant Policy Center, Community Action Marin, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., American Academy of Pediatrics, Health Care For All, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Catholic Health Association of the United States, Health in Justice Action Lab, Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, American Medical Association, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, New York Immigration Coalition and Welcome Project
Amicus Curiae: GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders (GLAD), Japanese American Citizens League (JACL), MinKwon Center for Community Action, Women's Bar Association of the District of Columbia, Members of the Congressional Hispanic Caucus, Population Connection, Anti-Defamation League, Union for Reform Judaism, Central Conference of American Rabbis, Women of Reform Judaism, and Men of Reform Judaism, National Immigration Justice Center, Asian & Latino Solidarity Alliance of Central Virginia, Chinese American Planning Council, Chinese for Affirmative Action, PHI, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center (SEARAC), Colorado Organization for Latina Opportunity and Reproductive Rights (COLOR), Apna Ghar, Inc., Women Lawyers on Guard Inc., American Society on Aging, Services, Immigrant Rights & Education Network (SIREN), In Our Own Voice: National Black Women's Reproductive Justice Agenda, Association of Asian Pacific Community Health Organizations, Oklahoma Call for Reproductive Justice, Asian Pacific Development Center, Members of the Congressional Asian Pacific American Caucus, OneAmerica, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging, Sikh American Legal Defense and Education Fund (SALDEF, In the Public Interest, National Council on Aging, KWH Law Center for Social Justice and Change, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, National Asian Pacific American Women's Forum (NAPAWF), EMBARC, Center on Reproductive Rights and Justice at Berkeley School of Law, National Advocates for Pregnant Women, The Women's Law Center of Maryland, MAZON, End Rape on Campus, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Asian American Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Asian Law Alliance, Equal Rights Advocates, National Hispanic Council on Aging, LatinoJustice PRLDEF, California Asian Pacific Islander Legislative Caucus, Women's Law Project, National Immigrant Women's Advocacy Project, OCA - Asian Pacific American Advocates, Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Coalition on Human Needs, If When How: Lawyering for Reproductive Justice, Caring Across Generations, Sexuality Information and Education Council of the United States (SIECUS), National Partnership for Women & Families, Members of the Congressional Black Caucus, South Asian Americans Leading Together (SAALT), Asian Americans Advancing Justice | AAJC, Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, and National Womens Law Center, and 60 other amici curiae, Asian Pacific American Legal Resource Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Justice in Aging, Women's Bar Association of the State of New York, Asian Pacific Community in Action, National Crittenton, National Coalition for Asian Pacific American Community Development (National CAPACD), National Korean American Service & Education Consortium (NAKASEC), Deans, Chairs, and Scholars, Reproductive Health Access Project, 9to5, National Association of Working Women, Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Transgender Law Center, Connecticut Women's Education and Legal Fund, Girls Inc. and Washington Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights and Urban Affairs
Case Number: 4:2019cv04980
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 131 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIONAssociated Cases: 4:19-cv-04717-PJH, 4:19-cv-04975-PJH, 4:19-cv-04980-PJH(pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 130 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, Deans, Chairs, and Scholars (Frisina, Christopher) (Filed on 10/10/2019) Modified on 10/11/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2019 Filing 129 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by African Communities Together, California Primary Care Association, Central American Resource Center, Council on American Islamic Relations-California, Farmworker Justice, Korean Resource Center, La Clinica De La Raza, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Maternal and Child Health Access (Cho, Michelle) (Filed on 10/8/2019) Modified on 10/9/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used re: Re: #126 Notice (Other). [err101]. Correct event is: Civil Events > Motions and Related Filings > Other Supporting Documents > Supplemental Brief. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 128 NOTICE of Draft Injunction by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, Donald J. Trump, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security (Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 10/7/2019) Modified on 10/8/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2019 Filing 127 Letter Brief re #123 Preliminary Injunction Hearing - Non-evidentiary from all Plaintiffs and [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motions for Preliminary Injunction filed byAfrican Communities Together, California Primary Care Association, Central American Resource Center, Council on American Islamic Relations-California, Farmworker Justice, Korean Resource Center, La Clinica De La Raza, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Maternal and Child Health Access. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #123 ) (Espiritu, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 126 PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING HARMS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION by African Communities Together, California Primary Care Association, Central American Resource Center, Council on American Islamic Relations-California, Farmworker Justice, Korean Resource Center, La Clinica De La Raza, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Maternal and Child Health Access re #123 Preliminary Injunction Hearing - Non-evidentiary of Record Evidence of Harms (Espiritu, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/4/2019) Modified on 10/7/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2019 Filing 125 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/02/19, before Judge Hamilton. Court Reporter Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (111 in 4:19-cv-04975-PJH, 124 in 4:19-cv-04980-PJH, 108 in 4:19-cv-04717-PJH) Transcript Order, (110 in 4:19-cv-04975-PJH) Transcript Order, (109 in 4:19-cv-04717-PJH) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2020. (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 124 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/2/2019 before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 123 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 10/2/2019. Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo Hebel. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/2/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 122 NOTICE by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Correction))(Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 121 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Certified Mailing, filed by African Communities Together, California Primary Care Association, Central American Resource Center, Council on American Islamic Relations-California, Farmworker Justice, Korean Resource Center, La Clinica De La Raza, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Maternal and Child Health Access. (Espiritu, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 28, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Price Davis (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Davis, Ethan) (Filed on 9/28/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 119 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d (2) filed byAfrican Communities Together, California Primary Care Association, Central American Resource Center, Council on American Islamic Relations-California, Farmworker Justice, Korean Resource Center, La Clinica De La Raza, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Maternal and Child Health Access. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Herrera, Kevin) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 118 REPLY (re #35 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byAfrican Communities Together, Central American Resource Center, Council on American Islamic Relations-California, Farmworker Justice, Korean Resource Center, La Clinica De La Raza, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Maternal and Child Health Access. (Espiritu, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 117 Declaration of Joshua Kolsky in Support of #116 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byKenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, Donald J. Trump, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Regulatory Impact Analysis)(Related document(s) #116 ) (Soskin, Eric) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 116 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #35 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byKenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, Donald J. Trump, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Soskin, Eric) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Local Co-Counsel listed in the motion, Michael T. Richer, is not registered with our Court nor can he be located in the State Bar. This filing will not b e processed by the clerks office. Please correct and re-file in its entirety. Re: #114 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice filed by Morton Rosenberg. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Joseph Soskin (Soskin, Eric) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 114 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Joseph Carl Cecere, Jr. (Filing fee $ 310.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/11/2019 filed by Morton Rosenberg. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Cecere, Joseph) (Filed on 9/16/2019) Modified on 9/16/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICI BRIEFS (pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER EXTENDING PAGE LIMITATION APPLICABLE TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #108 Stipulation. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 14, 2019 Filing 111 Appendix to #110 Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae the Fiscal Policy Institute, Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education, et al. in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Boundless Immigration, California Immigrant Policy Center, Child Care Law Center, Community Action Marin, Economic Progress Institute, Fiscal Policy Institute, Kids Forward, National Center for Law and Economic Justice, Oasis Legal Services, Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/14/2019) Modified on 9/16/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2019 Filing 110 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by California Immigrant Policy Center, Oasis Legal Services, Fiscal Policy Institute, Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Economic Progress Institute, Community Action Marin, Child Care Law Center, Boundless Immigration, National Center for Law and Economic Justice, Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy, Kids Forward. Responses due by 9/27/2019. Replies due by 10/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brittany N. Lovejoy, #2 [Proposed] Brief of Amici Curiae, #3 Proposed Order)(Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 109 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Medical Association, American College of Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief)(Krumplitsch, Susan) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 108 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulation Re Extension of Page Limits) filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, Donald J. Trump, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security and All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 9/13/2019) Modified on 9/16/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2019 Filing 107 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae Nonprofit Anti-Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Organizations in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Asian Pacific Institute on Gender-Based Violence. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Potente, Alexander) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #97 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kevin Herrera. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #89 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Wendy Parmet. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #88 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Emily Nash. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #87 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew London. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 102 ORDE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #84 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Katheryn DeFilipp. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #83 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christian Springer. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #79 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew Cohen. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ***DISREGARD, ENTERED IN ERROR. SEE DOCKET #105 FOR CORRECTED ENTRY***ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #78 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Wendy Parmet. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019) Modified on 9/13/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #77 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Sean Marotta. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 97 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Kevin Herrera ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13701800.) filed by African Communities Together, California Primary Care Association, Central American Resource Center, Council on American Islamic Relations-California, Farmworker Justice, Korean Resource Center, La Clinica De La Raza, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Maternal and Child Health Access. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Herrera, Kevin) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 96 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by NHLP; FRAC; CLASP, California Food Policy Advocates, California League of United Latin American Citizens, Center for the Study of Social Policy, Childrens Defense Fund-New York, Childrens HealthWatch, The Childrens Partnership, Citizens Committee for Children of New York, Comunidades Unidas, First Focus on Children, Kansas Appleseed Center for Law and Justice, Inc., Los Angeles Regional Food Bank, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, Mississippi Center for Justice National Law Center on Homelessness & Poverty, National Low Income Housing Coalition, National WIC Association, Oregon Food Bank, Prevention Institute, Sant La, Haitian Neighborhood Center, Inc., South Carolina Appleseed Legal Justice Center, Utahns Against Hunger, Virginia Poverty Law Center. Responses due by 9/26/2019. Replies due by 10/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Thacher, Frances Cheston) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/26/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/26/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 95 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #70 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae and have been added to this case: National Immigrant Women's Advocacy Project and Center on Reproductive Rights and Justice at Berkeley School of Law. (This is a text-only entry.) (Kuwahara, Emily) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/13/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 94 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #70 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae and have been added to this case: OneAmerica, Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Population Connection, Reproductive Health Access Project, Services, Immigrant Rights & Education Network (SIREN), Sexuality Information and Education Council of the United States (SIECUS), Sikh American Legal Defense and Education Fund (SALDEF, South Asian Americans Leading Together (SAALT), Southeast Asia Resource Action Center (SEARAC) and Transgender Law Center, Reproductive Health Access Project, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center (SEARAC), Services, Immigrant Rights & Education Network (SIREN), OneAmerica, Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Transgender Law Center, Sikh American Legal Defense and Education Fund (SALDEF, Population Connection, Sexuality Information and Education Council of the United States (SIECUS), South Asian Americans Leading Together (SAALT), Union for Reform Judaism, Central Conference of American Rabbis, Women of Reform Judaism, and Men of Reform Judaism, Washington Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights and Urban Affairs, Women's Bar Association of the District of Columbia, Women's Bar Association of the State of New York, The Women's Law Center of Maryland, Women Lawyers on Guard Inc. and Women's Law Project. (This is a text-only entry.) (Kuwahara, Emily) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/13/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 93 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #70 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae and have been added to this case: National Asian Pacific American Women's Forum (NAPAWF), National Coalition for Asian Pacific American Community Development (National CAPACD), National Crittenton, National Immigration Justice Center, National Korean American Service & Education Consortium (NAKASEC), National Partnership for Women & Families, Oasis Legal Services, OCA - Asian Pacific American Advocates and Oklahoma Call for Reproductive Justice, National Immigration Justice Center, Oklahoma Call for Reproductive Justice, National Korean American Service & Education Consortium (NAKASEC), National Asian Pacific American Women's Forum (NAPAWF), National Coalition for Asian Pacific American Community Development (National CAPACD), Oasis Legal Services, National Crittenton, National Partnership for Women & Families and OCA - Asian Pacific American Advocates. (This is a text-only entry.) (Kuwahara, Emily) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/13/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 92 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #70 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae and have been added to this case: Equal Rights Advocates, Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Girls Inc., GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders (GLAD), If When How: Lawyering for Reproductive Justice, In Our Own Voice: National Black Women's Reproductive Justice Agenda, In the Public Interest, Japanese American Citizens League (JACL), KWH Law Center for Social Justice and Change, LatinoJustice PRLDEF and MinKwon Center for Community Action, GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders (GLAD), KWH Law Center for Social Justice and Change, If When How: Lawyering for Reproductive Justice, Equal Rights Advocates, Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, MinKwon Center for Community Action, LatinoJustice PRLDEF, In the Public Interest, Girls Inc., In Our Own Voice: National Black Women's Reproductive Justice Agenda, Japanese American Citizens League (JACL) and National Advocates for Pregnant Women. (This is a text-only entry.) (Kuwahara, Emily) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/13/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 91 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #70 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae and have been added to this case: Association of Asian Pacific Community Health Organizations, Association of Asian Pacific Community Health Organizations, California Asian Pacific Islander Legislative Caucus, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Chinese American Planning Council, Chinese for Affirmative Action, Coalition on Human Needs, Colorado Organization for Latina Opportunity and Reproductive Rights (COLOR), Connecticut Women's Education and Legal Fund, EMBARC and End Rape on Campus. (This is a text-only entry.) (Kuwahara, Emily) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/13/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 90 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #70 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae and have been added to this case: 9to5, National Association of Working Women, Anti-Defamation League, Apna Ghar, Inc., Asian & Latino Solidarity Alliance of Central Virginia, Asian American Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Asian Law Alliance, Asian Pacific American Legal Resource Center, Asian Pacific Community in Action and Asian Pacific Development Center. (This is a text-only entry.) (Kuwahara, Emily) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/13/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 89 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Wendy Parmet ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13695187.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/11/2019 filed by Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, California Immigrant Policy Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Community Catalyst, Community Healthcare Network, Families USA, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Care For All, Health Law Advocates, Inc., Health in Justice Action Lab, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, New York Immigration Coalition, Northeastern University Center for Health Policy and Law, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Public Health Law Watch, Treatment Action Group, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., Welcome Project. (Lowe, Justin) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Case number on document is incorrect Re: #78 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Wendy Parmet.This filing will not be processed b y the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 88 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Emily Nash ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13696643.) filed by Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, California Immigrant Policy Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Community Catalyst, Community Healthcare Network, Families USA, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Care For All, Health Law Advocates, Inc., Health in Justice Action Lab, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, New York Immigration Coalition, Northeastern University Center for Health Policy and Law, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Public Health Law Watch, Treatment Action Group, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., Welcome Project. (Nash, Emily) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/13/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Filing 87 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Andrew London ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13696642.) filed by Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, California Immigrant Policy Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Community Catalyst, Community Healthcare Network, Families USA, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Care For All, Health Law Advocates, Inc., Health in Justice Action Lab, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, New York Immigration Coalition, Northeastern University Center for Health Policy and Law, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Public Health Law Watch, Treatment Action Group, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., Welcome Project. (London, Andrew) (Filed on 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/13/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief of Health Law Advocates, Inc. and 23 Other Organizations Interested in Public Health in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, California Immigrant Policy Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Community Catalyst, Community Healthcare Network, Families USA, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Care For All, Health Law Advocates, Inc., Health in Justice Action Lab, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, New York Immigration Coalition, Northeastern University Center for Health Policy and Law, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Public Health Law Watch, Treatment Action Group, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., Welcome Project. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Lowe, Justin) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae filed by Morton Rosenberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Cecere, Joseph) (Filed on 9/11/2019) Modified on 9/12/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2019 Filing 84 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Kristyn DeFilipp ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13696242.) filed by Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, California Immigrant Policy Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Community Catalyst, Community Healthcare Network, Families USA, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Care For All, Health Law Advocates, Inc., Health in Justice Action Lab, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, New York Immigration Coalition, Northeastern University Center for Health Policy and Law, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Public Health Law Watch, Treatment Action Group, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., Welcome Project. (DeFilipp, Kristyn) (Filed on 9/11/2019) Modified on 9/12/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2019 Filing 83 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Christian Springer ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13696194.) filed by Health Law Advocates, Inc.. (Springer, Christian) (Filed on 9/11/2019) Modified on 9/12/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Temple Risher (Risher, Michael) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Carl Cecere, Jr (Cecere, Joseph) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 80 ***DISREGARD, INCORRECT ATTACHMENT. CORRECTED MOTION TO BE FILED***MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: J. Carl Cecere ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13695959.) filed by Morton Rosenberg. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Cecere, Joseph) (Filed on 9/11/2019) Modified on 9/12/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/13/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2019 Filing 79 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Cohen ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 26K4N402.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/11/2019 filed by Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, California Immigrant Policy Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Community Catalyst, Community Healthcare Network, Families USA, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Care For All, Health Law Advocates, Inc., Health in Justice Action Lab, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, New York Immigration Coalition, Northeastern University Center for Health Policy and Law, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Public Health Law Watch, Treatment Action Group, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., Welcome Project. (Lowe, Justin) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 78 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Wendy Parmet ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13695187.) filed by Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, California Immigrant Policy Center, California Pan-Ethnic Health Network, Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy, Community Catalyst, Community Healthcare Network, Families USA, Florida Health Justice Project, Health Care For All, Health Law Advocates, Inc., Health in Justice Action Lab, Kentucky Equal Justice Center, Korean Community Center of the East Bay, Latino Coalition for a Healthy California, Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, New York Immigration Coalition, Northeastern University Center for Health Policy and Law, Northwest Health Law Advocates, Public Health Law Watch, Treatment Action Group, UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc., Welcome Project. (Lowe, Justin) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Sean Marotta ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13695062.) filed by America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, Association of American Medical Colleges, Catholic Health Association of the United States, The Children's Hospital Association, The Federation of American Hospitals. (Marotta, Sean) (Filed on 9/11/2019) Modified on 9/12/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by American Hospital Association, America's Essential Hospitals, Association of American Medical Colleges, Catholic Health Association of the United States, The Children's Hospital Association, The Federation of American Hospitals. Responses due by 9/25/2019. Replies due by 10/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Amici Curiae Brief, #2 [Proposed] Order)(Gonzales, Michelle) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Jonathan Lowe (Lowe, Justin) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit (Levin-Gesundheit, Michael) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly M. Dermody (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICI BRIEFS. (pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 71 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae filed by Members of the Congressional Black Caucus - CBC (Rep. Karen Bass, Rep. Yvette D. Clarke, Rep. Emanuel Cleaver, Rep. Bonnie Watson Coleman, Rep. Danny K. Davis, Rep. Val Demings, Rep. Steven Horsford, Rep. Henry C. Hank Johnson, Jr., Rep. Eleanor Holmes Norton, Rep. Lisa Blunt Rochester, Rep. Robert C. Bobby Scott, Rep. Bennie Thompson); Members of the Congressional Hispanic Caucus - CHC (Rep. Nanette Diaz Barragn, Rep. Salud O. Carbajal, Rep. Joaquin Castro, Rep. J. Luis Correa, Rep. Veronica Escobar, Rep. Adriano Espaillat, Rep. Ruben Gallego, Rep. Jess G. Chuy Garca, Rep. Jimmy Gomez, Rep. Sylvia R. Garcia, Rep. Ral M. Grijalva, Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell, Rep. Grace F. Napolitano, Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez, Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard, Rep. Gregorio Kilili Camacho Sablan, Rep. Linda T. Snchez, Rep. Jos E. Serrano, Rep. Albio Sires, Rep. Darren Soto, Rep. Norma J. Torres, Rep. Juan Vargas, Rep. Nydia M. Velzquez); Members of the Congressional Asian Pacific American Caucus - CAPAC (Rep. Judy Chu, Rep. Bonnie Watson Coleman, Rep. TJ Cox, Rep. Anna G. Eshoo, Rep. Al Green, Rep. Deb Haaland, Rep. Pramila Jayapal, Rep. Barbara Lee, Rep. Ted W. Lieu, Rep. Grace Meng, Rep. Grace F. Napolitano, Rep. Gregorio Kilili Camacho Sablan, Rep. Mark Takano, Rep. Juan Vargas, Rep. Linda T. Sanchez, Rep. Nydia M. Velzquez). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief)(Reider, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/10/2019) Modified on 9/26/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2019 Filing 70 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice | AAJC, Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, and National Womens Law Center, and 60 other amici curiae. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - - Memorandum of Law Of Amici Curiae Asian Americans Advancing Justice | AAJC, Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, and National Womens Law Center, and 60 other amici curiae, #2 Proposed Order)(Kuwahara, Emily) (Filed on 9/10/2019) Modified on 9/11/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2019 Filing 69 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Austin Joan Sutta on behalf of Asian Americans Advancing Justice | AAJC, Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, and National Womens Law Center, and 60 other amici curiae. (Sutta, Austin) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 68 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Christopher Cadena on behalf of Asian Americans Advancing Justice | AAJC, Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, and National Womens Law Center, and 60 other amici curiae. (Cadena, Christopher) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 67 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Emily Tomoko Kuwahara on behalf of Asian Americans Advancing Justice | AAJC, Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, and National Womens Law Center, and 60 other amici curiae. (Kuwahara, Emily) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Dexter Newman, Jr (Newman, Robert) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #55 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Natalie Kean. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #53 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Regan Bailey. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #52 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Denny Chan. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #49 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Edward T. Waters. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #48 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Phillip A. Escoriaza. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #47 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Owen T. Masters. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher J. Frisina. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Russell L. Hirschhorn. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE by Deans, Chairs, and Scholars of Additional Amici (Frisina, Christopher) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief)(Assi, Christina) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Natalie Kean ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13687736.) filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Kean, Natalie) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn E. Doi. (Frisina, Christopher) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Regan Bailey ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13687573.) filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Bailey, Regan) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Denny Chan ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13687357.) filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Chan, Denny) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, Deans - Ayman El-Mohandes, MBBCh, MD, MPH, Barbara K. Rimer, DrPH, MPH, Boris Lushniak, MD, MPH, G. Thomas Chandler, MS, PhD, Hilary Godwin, PhD, Karen Drenkard, PhD, RN, NEA-BC, FAAN, Laura A. Siminoff, PhD, Linda P. Fried, MD, MPH, Lynn R. Goldman, MD, MPH, MS, Mark A. Schuster, MD, PhD, Michael C. Lu, MD, MS, MPH, Pamela R. Jeffries, PhD, RN, FAAN, ANEF, FSSH, Paula Lantz, PhD, Sandro Galea, MD, DrPH, Sherry Glied, PhD, MA, Sten H. Vermund, MD, PhD, Thomas E. Burroughs, PhD, MS, MA; Chairs - Alan G. Wasserman, MD, MACP, Becky Slifkin, PhD, Claire D. Brindis, DrPH, Jane Thorpe, JD, Karen A. McDonnell, PhD; and Scholars - Alan B. Cohen, Sc.D., Allison K. Hoffman, JD, Amita N. Vyas, PhD, MHS, Andy Schneider, JD, Benjamin D. Sommers, MD, PhD, Colleen M. Grogan, PhD, Daniel Skinner, PhD, David M. Frankford, JD, David Michaels, PhD, MPH, Diana J. Mason, RN, PhD, FAAN, Dora L. Hughes, MD, MPH, Harold Jillian Catalanotti, MD, MPH, FACP, Joan Alker, Jonathan Oberlander, PhD, Julia Zoe Beckerman, JD, MPH, Katherine Horton, RN, MPH, JD, Katherine Swartz, PhD, Krista M. Perreira, PhD, Lynn A. Blewett, PhD, MA, Mark A. Peterson, PhD, Maureen Byrnes, MPA, Melissa M. Goldstein, JD, Michael K. Gusmano, PhD, Naomi Seiler, JD, Neal Halfon, MD, MPH, Nicole Huberfeld, JD, Pam Silberman, JD, DrPH, Rand E. Rosenblatt, JD, Sara Rosenbaum, JD, Sylvia A. Law, JD, Timothy Stoltzfus Jost, JD, Timothy M. Westmoreland, JD, Wendy K. Mariner, JD, LLM, MPH, William B. Borden, MD, FACC, FAHA. Responses due by 9/23/2019. Replies due by 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amici Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Waters, Edward) (Filed on 9/9/2019) Modified on 9/26/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2019 Filing 50 Certificate of Interested Entities by American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, Deans, Chairs, and Scholars (Waters, Edward) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Edward T. Waters ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13687118.) filed by American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, Deans, Chairs, and Scholars. (Waters, Edward) (Filed on 9/9/2019) Modified on 9/10/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Phillip A. Escoriaza ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13687099.) filed by American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, Deans, Chairs, and Scholars. (Escoriaza, Phillip) (Filed on 9/9/2019) Modified on 9/10/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Owen Masters ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13687072.) filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Masters, Owen) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 46 ***DISREGARD, ENTERED IN ERROR. SEE DOCKET #54 FOR CORRECTED ENTRY***MOTION for Leave to Appear by Kathryn E. Doi filed by American Academy of Nursing, American Public Health Association, Deans, Chairs, and Scholars. (Frisina, Christopher) (Filed on 9/9/2019) Modified on 9/10/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Christopher J. Frisina ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13687023.) filed by Deans, Chairs, and Scholars, American Public Health Association, American Academy of Nursing. (Frisina, Christopher) (Filed on 9/9/2019) Modified on 9/10/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Russell Hirschhorn ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13686925.) filed by American Society on Aging, Caring Across Generations, Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles, Justice in Aging, MAZON, National Council on Aging, National Hispanic Council on Aging, PHI, The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging. (Hirschhorn, Russell) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Maria Assi (Assi, Christina) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #35 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Opposition due by 9/16/2019. Reply due by 9/20/2019. Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2019 at 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Michael Kolsky (Kolsky, Joshua) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING DATE AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/4/2019. (pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 4, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #35 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2019 at 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by African Communities Together, California Primary Care Association, Central American Resource Center, Council on American Islamic Relations-California, Farmworker Justice, Korean Resource Center, La Clinica De La Raza, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Maternal and Child Health Access re #36 Declaration in Support,,,, #39 Declaration in Support,, #37 Declaration in Support,, #38 Declaration in Support,, #35 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Espiritu, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 39 Declaration of Jennifer L. Van Hook in Support of #35 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byAfrican Communities Together, California Primary Care Association, Central American Resource Center, Council on American Islamic Relations-California, Farmworker Justice, Korean Resource Center, La Clinica De La Raza, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Maternal and Child Health Access. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #35 ) (Espiritu, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 38 Declaration of Danilo Trisi, Ph.D. in Support of #35 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byAfrican Communities Together, California Primary Care Association, Central American Resource Center, Council on American Islamic Relations-California, Farmworker Justice, Korean Resource Center, La Clinica De La Raza, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Maternal and Child Health Access. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #35 ) (Espiritu, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 37 Declaration of Leighton Ku, Ph.D. in Support of #35 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byAfrican Communities Together, California Primary Care Association, Central American Resource Center, Council on American Islamic Relations-California, Farmworker Justice, Korean Resource Center, La Clinica De La Raza, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Maternal and Child Health Access. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #35 ) (Espiritu, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 36 Declaration of Michelle Y. Cho in Support of #35 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byAfrican Communities Together, California Primary Care Association, Central American Resource Center, Council on American Islamic Relations-California, Farmworker Justice, Korean Resource Center, La Clinica De La Raza, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Maternal and Child Health Access. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC)(Related document(s) #35 ) (Espiritu, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by African Communities Together, California Primary Care Association, Central American Resource Center, Council on American Islamic Relations-California, Farmworker Justice, Korean Resource Center, La Clinica De La Raza, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Maternal and Child Health Access. Responses due by 9/18/2019. Replies due by 9/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Amaha Kassa, #3 Declaration Castellano-Garcia, #4 Declaration Daniel Sharp, #5 Declaration Jane Garcia, #6 Declaration Bruce Goldstein, #7 Declaration Hussam Ayloush, #8 Declaration Jenny Seon, #9 Declaration Lynn Kersey, #10 Declaration Hope Nakamura, #11 Declaration Thu Quach)(Espiritu, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by African Communities Together, Maternal and Child Health Access, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Korean Resource Center, California Primary Care Association, Central American Resource Center, Farmworker Justice, La Clinica De La Raza, Council on American Islamic Relations-California. All Defendants. (Espiritu, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXCEED APPLICABLE PAGE LIMITATIONS FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #29 Administrative Motion. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/30/19. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RELATING CASE. Case C-19-4980 is related to case C-19-4717-PJH. Case reassigned to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/30/19. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE to #28 Order in Support of #26 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases by African Communities Together, California Primary Care Association, Central American Resource Center, Council on American Islamic Relations-California, Farmworker Justice, Korean Resource Center, La Clinica De La Raza, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Maternal and Child Health Access. (Espiritu, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/29/2019) Modified on 8/30/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2019 Filing 29 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Motion To Exceed Applicable Page Limitations For Plaintiffs Motion For Preliminary Injunction filed by African Communities Together, California Primary Care Association, Central American Resource Center, Council on American Islamic Relations-California, Farmworker Justice, Korean Resource Center, La Clinica De La Raza, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Maternal and Child Health Access. Responses due by 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration Of Mayra Joachin In Support Of Plaintiffs Administrative Motion To Exceed Applicable Page Limitations For Plaintiffs Motion For Preliminary Injunction, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order In Support Of Plaintiffs Administrative Motion To Exceed Applicable Page Limitations For Plaintiffs Motion For Preliminary Injunction)(Espiritu, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE RESPONSE TO #26 JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Responses due by 8/29/2019.Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/27/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Max S. Wolson. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 26 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 19-cv- 4717-PJH. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/22/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for November 19, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by November 12, 2019. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:19-cv-04980-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Antionette Deshun Dozier (Dozier, Antionette) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 8/21/19. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Yanin Senachai (Senachai, Yanin) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Young Cho (Cho, Michelle) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Laboni Amena Hoq (Hoq, Laboni) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Kane (Kane, David) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Max S. Wolson ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13627809.) filed by African Communities Together, California Primary Care Association, Central American Resource Center, Council on American Islamic Relations-California, Korean Resource Center, La Clinica De La Raza, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Maternal and Child Health Access. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Wolson, Max) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanna Elise Cuevas Ingram (Cuevas Ingram, Joanna) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Tanya Broder (Broder, Tanya) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Mayra Beatriz Joachin (Joachin, Mayra) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Alvaro Moises Huerta (Huerta, Alvaro) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Linton Joaquin (Joaquin, Linton) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha Jane Perkins (Perkins, Martha) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Kevin K. McAleenan. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Homeland Security. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Donald J. Trump. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by AFRICAN COMMUNITIES TOGETHER, California Primary Care Association, Central American Resource Center, Council on American Islamic Relations-California, Farmworker Justice, Korean Resource Center, La Clinica De La Raza, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Maternal and Child Health Access.. (Espiritu, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/30/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Espiritu, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13617966.). Filed byAFRICAN COMMUNITIES TOGETHER, Maternal and Child Health Access, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Korean Resource Center, California Primary Care Association, Central American Resource Center, Farmworker Justice, La Clinica De La Raza, Council on American Islamic Relations-California. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Espiritu, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/16/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: La Clinica De La Raza et al v. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Joshua Michael Kolsky
Represented By: Eric Joseph Soskin
Represented By: Ethan Price Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Joshua Michael Kolsky
Represented By: Eric Joseph Soskin
Represented By: Ethan Price Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: Joshua Michael Kolsky
Represented By: Eric Joseph Soskin
Represented By: Ethan Price Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Joshua Michael Kolsky
Represented By: Eric Joseph Soskin
Represented By: Ethan Price Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Joshua Michael Kolsky
Represented By: Eric Joseph Soskin
Represented By: Ethan Price Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maternal and Child Health Access
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Represented By: Alvaro Moises Huerta
Represented By: Antionette Deshun Dozier
Represented By: Laboni Amena Hoq
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: David Michael Kane
Represented By: Joanna Elise Cuevas Ingram
Represented By: Max Samuel Wolson
Represented By: Yanin Senachai
Represented By: Mayra Beatriz Joachin
Represented By: Michelle Young Cho
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Robert Dexter Newman, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Lee Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central American Resource Center
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Represented By: Alvaro Moises Huerta
Represented By: Antionette Deshun Dozier
Represented By: Laboni Amena Hoq
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: David Michael Kane
Represented By: Joanna Elise Cuevas Ingram
Represented By: Max Samuel Wolson
Represented By: Yanin Senachai
Represented By: Mayra Beatriz Joachin
Represented By: Michelle Young Cho
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Robert Dexter Newman, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Lee Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Represented By: Alvaro Moises Huerta
Represented By: Antionette Deshun Dozier
Represented By: Laboni Amena Hoq
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: David Michael Kane
Represented By: Joanna Elise Cuevas Ingram
Represented By: Max Samuel Wolson
Represented By: Yanin Senachai
Represented By: Mayra Beatriz Joachin
Represented By: Michelle Young Cho
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Robert Dexter Newman, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Lee Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Council on American Islamic Relations-California
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Represented By: Alvaro Moises Huerta
Represented By: Antionette Deshun Dozier
Represented By: Laboni Amena Hoq
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: David Michael Kane
Represented By: Joanna Elise Cuevas Ingram
Represented By: Max Samuel Wolson
Represented By: Yanin Senachai
Represented By: Mayra Beatriz Joachin
Represented By: Michelle Young Cho
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Robert Dexter Newman, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Lee Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Primary Care Association
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Represented By: Alvaro Moises Huerta
Represented By: Antionette Deshun Dozier
Represented By: Laboni Amena Hoq
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: David Michael Kane
Represented By: Joanna Elise Cuevas Ingram
Represented By: Max Samuel Wolson
Represented By: Yanin Senachai
Represented By: Mayra Beatriz Joachin
Represented By: Michelle Young Cho
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Robert Dexter Newman, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Lee Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFRICAN COMMUNITIES TOGETHER
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Represented By: Alvaro Moises Huerta
Represented By: Antionette Deshun Dozier
Represented By: Laboni Amena Hoq
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: David Michael Kane
Represented By: Joanna Elise Cuevas Ingram
Represented By: Max Samuel Wolson
Represented By: Yanin Senachai
Represented By: Mayra Beatriz Joachin
Represented By: Michelle Young Cho
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Robert Dexter Newman, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Lee Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmworker Justice
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Represented By: Alvaro Moises Huerta
Represented By: Antionette Deshun Dozier
Represented By: Laboni Amena Hoq
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: David Michael Kane
Represented By: Yanin Senachai
Represented By: Mayra Beatriz Joachin
Represented By: Michelle Young Cho
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Robert Dexter Newman, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Lee Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Clinica De La Raza
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Represented By: Alvaro Moises Huerta
Represented By: Antionette Deshun Dozier
Represented By: Laboni Amena Hoq
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: David Michael Kane
Represented By: Joanna Elise Cuevas Ingram
Represented By: Max Samuel Wolson
Represented By: Yanin Senachai
Represented By: Mayra Beatriz Joachin
Represented By: Michelle Young Cho
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Robert Dexter Newman, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Lee Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Korean Resource Center
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Represented By: Alvaro Moises Huerta
Represented By: Antionette Deshun Dozier
Represented By: Laboni Amena Hoq
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: David Michael Kane
Represented By: Joanna Elise Cuevas Ingram
Represented By: Max Samuel Wolson
Represented By: Yanin Senachai
Represented By: Mayra Beatriz Joachin
Represented By: Michelle Young Cho
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Robert Dexter Newman, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Lee Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders (GLAD)
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Japanese American Citizens League (JACL)
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MinKwon Center for Community Action
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Women's Bar Association of the District of Columbia
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Members of the Congressional Hispanic Caucus
Represented By: Nicholas A. Reider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Population Connection
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Anti-Defamation League
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Union for Reform Judaism, Central Conference of American Rabbis, Women of Reform Judaism, and Men of Reform Judaism
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Immigration Justice Center
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian & Latino Solidarity Alliance of Central Virginia
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Chinese American Planning Council
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Chinese for Affirmative Action
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PHI
Represented By: Denny W Chan
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Regan M Bailey
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Natalie Elise Kean
Represented By: Christina Maria Assi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Southeast Asia Resource Action Center (SEARAC)
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Colorado Organization for Latina Opportunity and Reproductive Rights (COLOR)
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Apna Ghar, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Women Lawyers on Guard Inc.
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Society on Aging
Represented By: Denny W Chan
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Regan M Bailey
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Natalie Elise Kean
Represented By: Christina Maria Assi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Services, Immigrant Rights & Education Network (SIREN)
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: In Our Own Voice: National Black Women's Reproductive Justice Agenda
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Association of Asian Pacific Community Health Organizations
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Oklahoma Call for Reproductive Justice
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian Pacific Development Center
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Members of the Congressional Asian Pacific American Caucus
Represented By: Nicholas A. Reider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: OneAmerica
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The National Asian Pacific Center on Aging
Represented By: Denny W Chan
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Regan M Bailey
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Natalie Elise Kean
Represented By: Christina Maria Assi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sikh American Legal Defense and Education Fund (SALDEF
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: In the Public Interest
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Council on Aging
Represented By: Denny W Chan
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Regan M Bailey
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Natalie Elise Kean
Represented By: Christina Maria Assi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KWH Law Center for Social Justice and Change
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jewish Family Service of Los Angeles
Represented By: Denny W Chan
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Regan M Bailey
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Natalie Elise Kean
Represented By: Christina Maria Assi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Academy of Nursing
Represented By: Edward Todd Waters
Represented By: Kathryn Ellen Doi
Represented By: Christopher John Frisina
Represented By: Phillip Anselm Escoriaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Public Health Association
Represented By: Edward Todd Waters
Represented By: Kathryn Ellen Doi
Represented By: Christopher John Frisina
Represented By: Phillip Anselm Escoriaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Asian Pacific American Women's Forum (NAPAWF)
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EMBARC
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Center on Reproductive Rights and Justice at Berkeley School of Law
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Advocates for Pregnant Women
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Women's Law Center of Maryland
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MAZON
Represented By: Denny W Chan
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Regan M Bailey
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Natalie Elise Kean
Represented By: Christina Maria Assi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: End Rape on Campus
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian American Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian Law Alliance
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Equal Rights Advocates
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Hispanic Council on Aging
Represented By: Denny W Chan
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Regan M Bailey
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Natalie Elise Kean
Represented By: Christina Maria Assi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LatinoJustice PRLDEF
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California Asian Pacific Islander Legislative Caucus
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Women's Law Project
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Immigrant Women's Advocacy Project
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: OCA - Asian Pacific American Advocates
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Planned Parenthood Federation of America
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Coalition on Human Needs
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: If When How: Lawyering for Reproductive Justice
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Caring Across Generations
Represented By: Denny W Chan
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Regan M Bailey
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Natalie Elise Kean
Represented By: Christina Maria Assi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sexuality Information and Education Council of the United States (SIECUS)
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Partnership for Women & Families
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Members of the Congressional Black Caucus
Represented By: Nicholas A. Reider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: South Asian Americans Leading Together (SAALT)
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian Americans Advancing Justice | AAJC, Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, and National Womens Law Center, and 60 other amici curiae
Represented By: Christopher Cadena
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Represented By: Austin Joan Sutta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian Pacific American Legal Resource Center
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Justice in Aging
Represented By: Denny W Chan
Represented By: Owen Masters
Represented By: Regan M Bailey
Represented By: Russell Laurence Hirschhorn
Represented By: Natalie Elise Kean
Represented By: Christina Maria Assi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Women's Bar Association of the State of New York
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian Pacific Community in Action
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Crittenton
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Coalition for Asian Pacific American Community Development (National CAPACD)
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Korean American Service & Education Consortium (NAKASEC)
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Deans, Chairs, and Scholars
Represented By: Edward Todd Waters
Represented By: Kathryn Ellen Doi
Represented By: Christopher John Frisina
Represented By: Phillip Anselm Escoriaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Reproductive Health Access Project
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: 9to5, National Association of Working Women
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Transgender Law Center
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Connecticut Women's Education and Legal Fund
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Girls Inc.
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Washington Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights and Urban Affairs
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Community Healthcare Network
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Presidents' Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: America's Essential Hospitals
Represented By: Michelle Roberts Gonzales
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Center for Law and Economic Justice
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Northwest Health Law Advocates
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kentucky Equal Justice Center
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: California Pan-Ethnic Health Network
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NHLP; FRAC; CLASP, et al.
Represented By: Frances Cheston Thacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Asian Pacific Institute on Gender-Based Violence
Represented By: Alexander Eugene Potente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fiscal Policy Institute
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Public Health Law Watch
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Families USA
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Boundless Immigration
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Association of American Medical Colleges
Represented By: Michelle Roberts Gonzales
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maine Immigrant Rights Coalition
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Academy of Pediatrics, California
Represented By: Susan Marie Krumplitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Latino Coalition for a Healthy California
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Hospital Association
Represented By: Michelle Roberts Gonzales
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Florida Health Justice Project
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michigan Immigrant Rights Center
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Morton Rosenberg
Represented By: Michael Temple Risher
Represented By: Joseph Carl Cecere, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Economic Progress Institute
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Oasis Legal Services
Represented By: Emily Tomoko Kuwahara
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Child Care Law Center
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Health Law Advocates, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Christian Springer
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kids Forward
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Federation of American Hospitals
Represented By: Michelle Roberts Gonzales
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Community Catalyst
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American College of Physicians
Represented By: Susan Marie Krumplitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Northeastern University Center for Health Policy and Law
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Virginia Interfaith Center for Public Policy
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Children's Hospital Association
Represented By: Michelle Roberts Gonzales
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Treatment Action Group
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: California Immigrant Policy Center
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Community Action Marin
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Academy of Pediatrics
Represented By: Susan Marie Krumplitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Health Care For All
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charlotte Center for Legal Advocacy
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Catholic Health Association of the United States
Represented By: Michelle Roberts Gonzales
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Health in Justice Action Lab
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Korean Community Center of the East Bay
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Medical Association
Represented By: Susan Marie Krumplitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Massachusetts Law Reform Institute
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: New York Immigration Coalition
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Welcome Project
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Emily Joanne Nash
Represented By: Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit
Represented By: Justin Jonathan Lowe
Represented By: Andrew Paul Cohen
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Parmet
Represented By: Andrew M. London
Represented By: Kristyn Marie DeFilipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?