Hernandez et al v. Sonoma-Marin Area Rail Transit District (SMART)
Plaintiff: Michael Caldwell, Phyllis Accornero, Paul Naepflin, Filemon Hernandez, Kathleen Caldwell, Martha Lopez, Robert Accornero, Susan Cummings, Jack Pere, Michael Hart, C. William Ibbbs, Jr., Michael Martin, Linda Lockwood, Lee Rosichan, Commerce Boulevard LLC, Karen Martin, Theresa Giacomino, Jane Gyorgy Investments LLC, Frank Gyorgy, Vladislaw LLC, Dennis Muelrath, Jenna Sartori, Ralph Sartori, David Armstrong, Victoria Skiver, Jose Lopez, Norma Tawney, Raquel Guinn, Kerry Messer, Randall Stevens, Cindy Mongeon, Maria Elana Callaghan, Erin Armstrong, Hooi Bee Naepflin, David Tarca, Leonard Pieraccini, Bertha Lozano Day Hernandez, Michael Gregg, Jane Gyorgy, Debbie Tarca, Stella Corda, Elizabeth Wellman, Darryl Guinn, Donald Brandenburg, Stacy Horton, Charlotte Johnson-Langhofer and Edward Callaghan
Defendant: Sonoma-Marin Area Rail Transit District (SMART)
Case Number: 4:2021cv01782
Filed: March 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #17 Stipulation to stay litigation until 6/30/2021; to extend Defendant's responsive pleading to 7/30/2021 and to continue Initial Case Management Conference to 8/18/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
April 29, 2021 Filing 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sonoma-Marin Area Rail Transit District (SMART).. (Lyons, Thomas) (Filed on 4/29/2021)
April 29, 2021 Filing 19 ***ERROR IN FILING. SEE DOCKET #20 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sonoma-Marin Area Rail Transit District (SMART).. (Lyons, Thomas) (Filed on 4/29/2021) Modified on 4/30/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2021 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/29/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 14, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Stay Litigation and Continue CMC Date filed by Phyllis Accornero, Robert Accornero, David Armstrong, Erin Armstrong, Donald Brandenburg, Kathleen Caldwell, Michael Caldwell, Edward Callaghan, Maria Elana Callaghan, Commerce Boulevard LLC, Stella Corda, Susan Cummings, Theresa Giacomino, Michael Gregg, Darryl Guinn, Raquel Guinn, Frank Gyorgy, Jane Gyorgy, Michael Hart, Filemon Hernandez, Stacy Horton, C. William Ibbbs, Jr, Jane Gyorgy Investments LLC, Charlotte Johnson-Langhofer, Linda Lockwood, Jose Lopez, Martha Lopez, Bertha Lozano Day Hernandez, Karen Martin, Michael Martin, Kerry Messer, Cindy Mongeon, Dennis Muelrath, Hooi Bee Naepflin, Paul Naepflin, Jack Pere, Leonard Pieraccini, Lee Rosichan, Jenna Sartori, Ralph Sartori, Victoria Skiver, Randall Stevens, David Tarca, Debbie Tarca, Norma Tawney, Vladislaw LLC, Elizabeth Wellman and Sonoma-Marin Area Rail Transit District (SMART). (Talley, Stuart) (Filed on 4/14/2021) Modified on 4/14/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Victoria Skiver, Jane Gyorgy Investments LLC, Ralph Sartori, Vladislaw LLC, Theresa Giacomino, Bertha Lozano Day Hernandez, Kathleen Caldwell, Filemon Hernandez, Dennis Muelrath, Raquel Guinn, Michael Caldwell, Robert Accornero, Randall Stevens, Edward Callaghan, Maria Elana Callaghan, Erin Armstrong, Kerry Messer, Michael Martin, Elizabeth Wellman, Stacy Horton, Lee Rosichan, Jane Gyorgy, Linda Lockwood, Jenna Sartori, Paul Naepflin, Jose Lopez, Debbie Tarca, Cindy Mongeon, Darryl Guinn, Michael Hart, David Armstrong, Susan Cummings, Donald Brandenburg, Jack Pere, David Tarca, Stella Corda, Martha Lopez, Karen Martin, Michael Gregg, Commerce Boulevard LLC, Leonard Pieraccini, Frank Gyorgy, Phyllis Accornero, Charlotte Johnson-Langhofer, Hooi Bee Naepflin, C. William Ibbbs, Jr, Norma Tawney. Service waived by Sonoma-Marin Area Rail Transit District (SMART) waiver sent on 3/22/2021, answer due 5/21/2021. (Talley, Stuart) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
March 30, 2021 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Phyllis Accornero, Robert Accornero, David Armstrong, Erin Armstrong, Donald Brandenburg, Kathleen Caldwell, Michael Caldwell, Edward Callaghan, Maria Elana Callaghan, Commerce Boulevard LLC, Stella Corda, Susan Cummings, Theresa Giacomino, Michael Gregg, Darryl Guinn, Raquel Guinn, Frank Gyorgy, Jane Gyorgy, Michael Hart, Filemon Hernandez, Stacy Horton, C. William Ibbbs, Jr, Jane Gyorgy Investments LLC, Charlotte Johnson-Langhofer, Linda Lockwood, Jose Lopez, Martha Lopez, Bertha Lozano Day Hernandez, Karen Martin, Michael Martin, Kerry Messer, Cindy Mongeon, Dennis Muelrath, Hooi Bee Naepflin, Paul Naepflin, Jack Pere, Leonard Pieraccini, Lee Rosichan, Jenna Sartori, Ralph Sartori, Victoria Skiver, Randall Stevens, David Tarca, Debbie Tarca, Norma Tawney, Vladislaw LLC, Elizabeth Wellman.. (Talley, Stuart) (Filed on 3/30/2021)
March 30, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/13/2021. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2021)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #10 Thomas S. Stewart's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #9 Steven M. Wald's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #8 Elizabeth Gepford McCulley's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 23, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Thomas S. Stewart ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15738204.) filed by Phyllis Accornero, Robert Accornero, David Armstrong, Erin Armstrong, Donald Brandenburg, Kathleen Caldwell, Michael Caldwell, Edward Callaghan, Maria Elana Callaghan, Commerce Boulevard LLC, Stella Corda, Susan Cummings, Theresa Giacomino, Michael Gregg, Darryl Guinn, Raquel Guinn, Frank Gyorgy, Jane Gyorgy, Michael Hart, Filemon Hernandez, Stacy Horton, C. William Ibbbs, Jr, Jane Gyorgy Investments LLC, Charlotte Johnson-Langhofer, Linda Lockwood, Jose Lopez, Martha Lopez, Bertha Lozano Day Hernandez, Karen Martin, Michael Martin, Kerry Messer, Cindy Mongeon, Dennis Muelrath, Hooi Bee Naepflin, Paul Naepflin, Jack Pere, Leonard Pieraccini, Lee Rosichan, Jenna Sartori, Ralph Sartori, Victoria Skiver, Randall Stevens, David Tarca, Debbie Tarca, Norma Tawney, Vladislaw LLC, Elizabeth Wellman. (Talley, Stuart) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 23, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Steven M. Wald ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15738184.) filed by Phyllis Accornero, Robert Accornero, David Armstrong, Erin Armstrong, Donald Brandenburg, Kathleen Caldwell, Michael Caldwell, Edward Callaghan, Maria Elana Callaghan, Commerce Boulevard LLC, Stella Corda, Susan Cummings, Theresa Giacomino, Michael Gregg, Darryl Guinn, Raquel Guinn, Frank Gyorgy, Jane Gyorgy, Michael Hart, Filemon Hernandez, Stacy Horton, C. William Ibbbs, Jr, Jane Gyorgy Investments LLC, Charlotte Johnson-Langhofer, Linda Lockwood, Jose Lopez, Martha Lopez, Bertha Lozano Day Hernandez, Karen Martin, Michael Martin, Kerry Messer, Cindy Mongeon, Dennis Muelrath, Hooi Bee Naepflin, Paul Naepflin, Jack Pere, Leonard Pieraccini, Lee Rosichan, Jenna Sartori, Ralph Sartori, Victoria Skiver, Randall Stevens, David Tarca, Debbie Tarca, Norma Tawney, Vladislaw LLC, Elizabeth Wellman. (Talley, Stuart) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 23, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Elizabeth Gepford McCulley ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15738156.) filed by Phyllis Accornero, Robert Accornero, David Armstrong, Erin Armstrong, Donald Brandenburg, Kathleen Caldwell, Michael Caldwell, Edward Callaghan, Maria Elana Callaghan, Commerce Boulevard LLC, Stella Corda, Susan Cummings, Theresa Giacomino, Michael Gregg, Darryl Guinn, Raquel Guinn, Frank Gyorgy, Jane Gyorgy, Michael Hart, Filemon Hernandez, Stacy Horton, C. William Ibbbs, Jr, Jane Gyorgy Investments LLC, Charlotte Johnson-Langhofer, Linda Lockwood, Jose Lopez, Martha Lopez, Bertha Lozano Day Hernandez, Karen Martin, Michael Martin, Kerry Messer, Cindy Mongeon, Dennis Muelrath, Hooi Bee Naepflin, Paul Naepflin, Jack Pere, Leonard Pieraccini, Lee Rosichan, Jenna Sartori, Ralph Sartori, Victoria Skiver, Randall Stevens, David Tarca, Debbie Tarca, Norma Tawney, Vladislaw LLC, Elizabeth Wellman. (Talley, Stuart) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #6 : Initial Case Management Conference rescheduled to 6/16/2021 10:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. Upon receipt of this Order, Plaintiffs shall serve the Defendant with a copy of this Order and file a proof of service with the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/23/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 15, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/9/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2021)
March 15, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Sonoma-Marin Area Rail Transit District (SMART). (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2021)
March 15, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Talley, Stuart) (Filed on 3/15/2021)
March 15, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/29/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2021)
March 15, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used re: #1 .[err101]. The correct event is Proposed Summons. The summons should NOT be filed as an attachment to the Complaint. The co rrect event can be found at Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Proposed Summons. Please refile just the summons. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Ralph Sartori, Erin Armstrong, Darryl Guinn, Dennis Muelrath, Commerce Boulevard LLC, Kerry Messer, Martha Lopez, Jane Gyorgy, Charlotte Johnson-Langhofer, Stella Corda, Hooi Bee Naepflin, Michael Gregg, Cindy Mongeon, Vladislaw LLC, Filemon Hernandez, Randall Stevens, Frank Gyorgy, Bertha Lozano Day Hernandez, Victoria Skiver, Elizabeth Wellman, Paul Naepflin, Jenna Sartori, Michael Hart, David Armstrong, Robert Accornero, Linda Lockwood, Jose Lopez, Lee Rosichan, Donald Brandenburg, Leonard Pieraccini, Karen Martin, Edward Callaghan, Norma Tawney, Michael Caldwell, Jack Pere, Raquel Guinn, Michael Martin, C. William Ibbbs, Jr., Debbie Tarca, Jane Gyorgy Investments LLC, Stacy Horton, Maria Elana Callaghan, Susan Cummings, Theresa Giacomino, Kathleen Caldwell, Phyllis Accornero, David Tarca (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2021)
March 15, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Phyllis Accornero, Robert Accornero, David Armstrong, Erin Armstrong, Donald Brandenburg, Kathleen Caldwell, Michael Caldwell, Edward Callaghan, Maria Elana Callaghan, Commerce Boulevard LLC, Stella Corda, Susan Cummings, Theresa Giacomino, Michael Gregg, Darryl Guinn, Raquel Guinn, Frank Gyorgy, Jane Gyorgy, Michael Hart, Filemon Hernandez, Stacy Horton, C. William Ibbbs, Jr, Jane Gyorgy Investments LLC, Charlotte Johnson-Langhofer, Linda Lockwood, Jose Lopez, Martha Lopez, Bertha Lozano Day Hernandez, Karen Martin, Michael Martin, Kerry Messer, Cindy Mongeon, Dennis Muelrath, Hooi Bee Naepflin, Paul Naepflin, Jack Pere, Leonard Pieraccini, Lee Rosichan, Jenna Sartori, Ralph Sartori, Victoria Skiver, Randall Stevens, David Tarca, Debbie Tarca, Norma Tawney, Vladislaw LLC, Elizabeth Wellman (Talley, Stuart) (Filed on 3/15/2021)
March 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sonoma-Marin Area Rail Transit District (SMART) with jury demand ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15700206.). Filed byVictoria Skiver, Jane Gyorgy Investments LLC, Ralph Sartori, Vladislaw LLC, Theresa Giacomino, Bertha Lozano Day Hernandez, Kathleen Caldwell, Filemon Hernandez, Dennis Muelrath, Raquel Guinn, Michael Caldwell, Robert Accornero, Randall Stevens, Edward Callaghan, Maria Elana Callaghan, Erin Armstrong, Kerry Messer, Michael Martin, Elizabeth Wellman, Stacy Horton, Lee Rosichan, Jane Gyorgy, Linda Lockwood, Jenna Sartori, Paul Naepflin, Jose Lopez, Debbie Tarca, Cindy Mongeon, Darryl Guinn, Michael Hart, David Armstrong, Susan Cummings, Donald Brandenburg, Jack Pere, David Tarca, Stella Corda, Martha Lopez, Karen Martin, Michael Gregg, Commerce Boulevard LLC, Leonard Pieraccini, Frank Gyorgy, Phyllis Accornero, Charlotte Johnson-Langhofer, Hooi Bee Naepflin, C. William Ibbbs, Jr, Norma Tawney. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Talley, Stuart) (Filed on 3/15/2021) Modified on 3/15/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez et al v. Sonoma-Marin Area Rail Transit District (SMART)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Caldwell
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Accornero
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Represented By: Steven M. Wald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Naepflin
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Filemon Hernandez
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Caldwell
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Lopez
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Accornero
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Cummings
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Pere
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hart
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. William Ibbbs, Jr.
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Martin
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Lockwood
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Rosichan
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commerce Boulevard LLC
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Martin
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Giacomino
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Gyorgy Investments LLC
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Gyorgy
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vladislaw LLC
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Represented By: Steven M. Wald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Muelrath
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenna Sartori
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Sartori
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Armstrong
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Skiver
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Represented By: Steven M. Wald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Lopez
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Tawney
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Represented By: Steven M. Wald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raquel Guinn
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Messer
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Stevens
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Represented By: Steven M. Wald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Mongeon
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Elana Callaghan
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Armstrong
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hooi Bee Naepflin
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Tarca
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Represented By: Steven M. Wald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Pieraccini
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertha Lozano Day Hernandez
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gregg
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Gyorgy
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Tarca
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Represented By: Steven M. Wald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stella Corda
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Wellman
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Represented By: Steven M. Wald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Guinn
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Brandenburg
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Horton
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Johnson-Langhofer
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Callaghan
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Thomas S. Stewart
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonoma-Marin Area Rail Transit District (SMART)
Represented By: Thomas F. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?