Tanner v. Crosby Valve, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Winston Tanner
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC, Parker Hannifin Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Warren Pumps, L.L.C., General Electric Company, Crane Co., Asbestos Corporation Limited, Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor Inc., A.W CHESTERTON COMPANY, ViacomCBS Inc., Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc., Triple A Machine Shop Inc, Pacific Ship Repair 1960, Inc., Johnson Controls Inc, IMO Industries Inc., Crosby Valve, LLC, Morse TEC LLC, f/k/a BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC, and Successor-by-Merger to Borg-Warner Corporation and Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv02683
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 Filing 13 Receipt from San Francisco Superior Court Acknowledging Receipt of Remand Documents. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
April 20, 2021 Filing 12 Certified copy of Remand Order and certified copy of docket entries transmitted to the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT CROSBY VALVE, LLC AND REMAND CASE TO CALIFORNIA SUPERIOR COURT AND ORDER THEREON by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #10 Stipulation. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
April 19, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss Defendant Crosby Valve, LLC and Remand Case to California Superior Court County of San Francisco, filed by Winston Tanner, Crosby Valve, LLC. (Grant, Richard) (Filed on 4/19/2021) Modified on 4/20/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case,. Signed by The Clerk on 4/16/21. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 16, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 16, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Winston Tanner.. (Chu, Kimberly) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Kimberly Joy Wai Jun Chu as Counsel, filed by Winston Tanner (Chu, Kimberly) (Filed on 4/16/2021) Modified on 4/19/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2021 Filing 5 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Crosby Valve, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Emerson Electric Co, Corporate Parent J.R. Clarkson Company LLC for Crosby Valve, LLC. (Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Crosby Valve, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Crosby Valve, LLC . (Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Clerk is unable to randomly assign case to judge due to lack of filing completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please file completed Civil Cover Sheet (JS-CAND 44 ( Rev 10/20) at your earliest convenience as a separate docket entry. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Crosby Valve, LLC (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/28/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2021)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-21-276913, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number 0971-15838410). Filed by Crosby Valve, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration)(Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 4/14/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tanner v. Crosby Valve, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Hannifin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asbestos Corporation Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W CHESTERTON COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple A Machine Shop Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Ship Repair 1960, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby Valve, LLC
Represented By: Jocelyn Mislang Soriano
Represented By: Andrew Livingston Sharp
Represented By: Tsun-Chi Eric Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morse TEC LLC, f/k/a BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC, and Successor-by-Merger to Borg-Warner Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winston Tanner
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Represented By: Alan R. Brayton
Represented By: Richard Martin Grant
Represented By: Kimberly Joy Wai Jun Chu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?