Acer Inc. et al v. Lite-On It Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Acer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Gateway, Inc. and Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc.
Defendant: Lite-On It Corporation, NEC Corporation, Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V., Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation, Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc., Pioneer Corporation, Pioneer Digital Design & Manufacturing Company, Pioneer Electronics (USA) Inc., Pioneer High Fidelity Taiwan Co., Ltd, Pioneer North America, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics Inc., Sony NEC Optiarc Inc., Sony Optiarc America Inc., Sony Optiarc Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation and Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation
Case Number: 5:2013cv04991
Filed: October 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF SONY DEFENDANTS (1938 in 3:10-md-02143-RS) (73 in 3:13-cv-04991-RS). Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/29/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' RESPONSES TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/29/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' RESPONSES TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/18/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS AND GRANTING PANASONIC'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/10/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/20/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' RESPONSES TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/18/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/3/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acer Inc. et al v. Lite-On It Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acer Inc.
Represented By: James Blaker Baldinger
Represented By: David Bedford Esau
Represented By: Hsiang James H Lin
Represented By: Kaiwen Tseng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acer America Corporation
Represented By: James Blaker Baldinger
Represented By: David Bedford Esau
Represented By: Hsiang James H Lin
Represented By: Kaiwen Tseng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gateway, Inc.
Represented By: James Blaker Baldinger
Represented By: David Bedford Esau
Represented By: Hsiang James H Lin
Represented By: Kaiwen Tseng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gateway U.S. Retail, Inc.
Represented By: James Blaker Baldinger
Represented By: David Bedford Esau
Represented By: Hsiang James H Lin
Represented By: Kaiwen Tseng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lite-On It Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips & Lite-On Digital Solutions USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Digital Design & Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Electronics (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer High Fidelity Taiwan Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Electronics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony NEC Optiarc Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Optiarc America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Optiarc Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Samsung Storage Technology Korea Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?