Silverman v. Schulman et al

Plaintiff: Stephen Silverman
Defendant: Daniel H. Schulman, John D. Rainey, Patrick L.A. Dupuis, Wences Casares, Jonathan Christodoro, John J Donahoe, David W. Dorman, Gail J. McGovern, David M. Moffett, Pierre M. Omidyar, Frank D Yeary and PayPal Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2017cv00162
Filed: January 12, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 25 Regarding Briefing Schedule for Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/14/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
June 30, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Consolidating Related Derivative Actions and Appointing Co-Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs (14 in 3:17-cv-02428-RS), (18 in 3:17-cv-00162-RS),(14 in 3:17-cv-02206-RS), (14 in 3:17-cv-02446-RS). Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/30/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 29, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases. The above-entitled action is referred to the Honorable Richard Seeborg for a determination as to whether this case is related to Silverman v. Shulman, Case No. 3:17-cv-00162-RS, a case currently pending before Judge Seeborg. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/29/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
February 8, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING STAY OF CASE PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTIONS TO DISMISS RELATED SECURITIES CLASS ACTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/8/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silverman v. Schulman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Silverman
Represented By: Evan Jason Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel H. Schulman
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Suzette Pringle
Represented By: Alexander K Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Rainey
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Suzette Pringle
Represented By: Alexander K Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick L.A. Dupuis
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Suzette Pringle
Represented By: Alexander K Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wences Casares
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Suzette Pringle
Represented By: Alexander K Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Christodoro
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Suzette Pringle
Represented By: Alexander K Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J Donahoe
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Suzette Pringle
Represented By: Alexander K Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W. Dorman
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Suzette Pringle
Represented By: Alexander K Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail J. McGovern
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Suzette Pringle
Represented By: Alexander K Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Moffett
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Suzette Pringle
Represented By: Alexander K Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierre M. Omidyar
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Suzette Pringle
Represented By: Alexander K Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank D Yeary
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Suzette Pringle
Represented By: Alexander K Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PayPal Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Suzette Pringle
Represented By: Alexander K Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?