In Re: Apple Inc. Device Performance Litigation
Plaintiff: Beckie Erwin, Allison Varnell, Dae Won Kim, Jonathan David, Tiffany Roberts, Eliezer Rabinovits, Angela Boykin, Chad White, Sherri Yelton, Drew Victory, Loren Haller, Sandra Merola, Heather Schwartz, Laura Ciccone, Lauren Weintraub, Kirk Pedelty, Matthew Shaske, Elisa Gaudio, Joshua Mosby, Mark Davis, Joel Santucci, Amanda Holman, Jessica Greenshner, Susan Rutan, Charlene Lowery, Burim Daci, Mary Jackson, Brinley McGill, Donna Vlassich, Dakota Speas, Jeffrey Aberman, Allyson Werner, Danielle Sanguedolce, Kevin Browne, Kevin Fahey, Yael Aburos, Judith Dean, Dennis Johnson, Kelly Jankowski, Jennifer Bond, Anna Luna, Gary P Simon, Eric Tanovan, Herman Praszkier, Marc Honigman, Aja Johnson, Violetta Mailyan, Georgiana D'Alessandro, Steven Connolly, Jodie L. Kasun, David Johnson, Johnjulee Ray, Margaret Wetherald, Tammy Greenfield, Brian Taylor, Brady Lankford, Andrew Yashchuk, Nikita Santino, Benjamin Lazarus, Megan Mesloh, Trent Young, Melody Munro, Christopher Gautreaux, Ruth Beauchan, Sean Neilan, Steven Henry, Anthony Oliver, Patty Burriss, Cynthia Chapel, Lilav Akrawy, Robert Montgomery, Ryan Ward, Barbara Moriello, A. Kevin Fahey, Dale Johnson, Ryan Young, Kristopher Kingston, Ashley Antonucci, Adam Shapiro, Aniledis Batista, Kristin Bilic, Sean Griffin, Charles Saadiq, Victoria Childs, Jenifer Kachik, Youngro Lee, Peter A. Schroeder, Fiona M. Cunningham, John P Webb, Sandy Brodsky, Tamica Gordon, Kenneth L. Buck, Thomas Ciccone, Keaton Harvey, Robert Gilson, Megan McDonald, Ricky Fung, Donald Littlefied, Thomas Toth, Frank Henderson, Raisa Drantivy, Gary Merenstein, Carter Donahoe, Neill McInnis, Ala Abdulla, Gregory Stenstrom, Alvin Davis, James Sokol, Kelly Schulze, Sarah Stone, Timothy Baldwin, Bryan Schell, Craig Stanford, Amy Brown, Cynthia Stacy, Roman Dubianskii, Aurelia Flores, Mark Miller, Daniel Borstelmann, Caren Schmidt, Nicholas Ford, Gene Schlaefer, Kaixuan Ni, Blake Brand, Matt Hosking, Noelle Boehme, Geoffrey Schlottman, Jill Klingman, Shiriam Torres, Jason Ratner, Jodi Johnson, Juliana Caceres, Patrick DeFellippo, Kristin Edgerly, Alex Rodriguez, Gye Soon Yun, Sara Hawes, Christina Neumann, Irwin Darack, Quinn Lewis, Judy Milman, Alisha Boykin, Abdul Mohammed, Samara Diner, Denise Bakke, Kelli Beaugez, Kenyotta Smith, Guilherme Rafael Canoa de Oliveira, John Farris, Sam Mangano, Elliot Rosen, Laura Gail Diamond, Lawrence Pethick, Arisa Wakabayashi, Matthew Homonoff, Judy Mills, Ryan Banks, Suzanne Block, Brent Jones, Daphne Bowels Rodriguez, Derrick Marzette, Stephen Margolis, Suzanne Carter, Heidi Valle, Brandi White, Natasha Bryant, Nakul Chandra, Jay Brodsky, Carla Compagnone, John Solak, Miriam Feldman, Alberto R. Marzana, Victor Mazzeo, Aaron Rabbanian, Khendle Williams, Linda Sonna, Brian Macinanti, Karen Palmer, Michelle Martino, Aisha Boyd, John Ferguson, Trent Clinton Go, Jonathan Meyers, Christina Labajo, Craig Moore, Scott Grillo, Darlane Saracina, Annamarie Vinacco, David Haury, Jacquelyn O'Neill, Charlie Bell Daily, James Martillaro, Ida Villegas, Victor Mallh, Romeo James Alba, Tonya Thompson, Kim Burton, Lauri Sullivan-Stefanou, Alain Liebermann, Yisroel Brody, Lillie Diaz, Thomas T. Cook, Kent Harrison, Pedro Espejo, Jarrod Byer, Rifah Alexander, Henry Becker, Tiffany Williams, Brian Hogue, Melissa Koncinsky, Brandon Farmer, J. Scott Archer, Heekyung Jo, Margie Cleveland, Alex Sens, Hanpeng Chen, Nicole Gallmann, Estrella Gonzalez Navarro, John Rufty, III, Corporacion Nacional de Consumidores Y Usuarios de Chile, Judith Thompson, Chris Spearman, Marianne Wagner, William Ellis, Stephen Heffner, Patricia Johnson, Paul Sohayegh, Kristin Hansen, Crystal Saldana, Kyle Herman, Carly Byer, Linda Sauer, Abdul Azeem Mohammed, Josue Salazar, Jose Gonzalez, Gamaliel Aranda, Pedro Diaz, Olivia Ejiofor, Oscar Lemus, Pasqualo Sodano, Hansel Hernandez, Michelle Ejiofor, Arturo Arzamendia and Michael Maeng
Defendant: Apple Inc. Device Performance Litigation and Apple Inc.
Petitioner: Terrence Zehrer
Special Master: Hon. Rebecca Westerfield (Ret.)
Case Number: 5:2018md02827
Filed: April 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Filing 413 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward J. Davila: Status Conference held on 1/29/2020. Further Status Conference set for 4/3/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila.Plaintiff Attorney: Joseph Cotchett,Mark Molumphy,Anya Thepot,Frederic Fox,Laurence King, Donald Hall. Defendant Attorney: Christopher Chorba,Wesley Sze. Court Reporter: Not applicable (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/29/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 412 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT [Eight Supplemental Joint Case Management Conference Statement] filed by Angela Boykin, Robert Gilson. (Choi, Mario) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 411 NOTICE of Change of Address by Mario M Choi for the law firm Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP (Choi, Mario) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 14, 2020 Filing 410 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING. Please take NOTICE that a Status Conference is set for 1/29/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Joint Status Report due by 1/21/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 409 Order Granting #408 Motion to Relate and Consolidate Cases Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/16/2019.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 6, 2019 Filing 408 MOTION to Relate Case and Consolidation 5:19-cv-06646-EJD filed by Jose Gonzalez, Olivia Ejiofor, Michelle Ejiofor, Gamaliel Aranda, Arturo Arzamendia, Pedro Diaz, Hansel Hernandez, Oscar Lemus, Michael Maeng, Josue Salazar, Pasqualo Sodano. Responses due by 12/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ugonne Ndukwu Lord, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Ndukwu Lord, Ugonne) (Filed on 12/6/2019) Modified on 12/6/2019 (cvS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2019 Filing 407 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Ben Barnow (Barnow, Ben) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 406 NOTICE of Change of Address by Archie I. Grubb, II (Grubb, Archie) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 405 NOTICE of Appearance by Rosanne L. Mah (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 404 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward J. Davila: Further Status Conference held on 11/7/2019. Parties conducted conference in chambers. Parties shall contact the Court with a proposed schedule re this action. Plaintiff Attorney: Joseph Cotchett, Mark Molumphy, Laurence King, Donald Hall, Frederic Fox. Defendant Attorney: Christopher Chorba,Alex Harris.Total Time in Court:10:11-10:13am(2 Mins.) Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/7/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 403 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Gordon M. Fauth, Jr NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL (Fauth, Gordon) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER Granting #398 Administrative Request to Appear Telephonically filed by Chair, Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/4/2019. If a request to appear telephonically is granted, the parties must contact CourtCall Phone Conferencing at (866) 582-6878 in advance of the hearing to schedule a telephonic appearance. TO ENSURE THE QUALITY OF THE RECORD, THE PARTIES SHOULD AVOID THE USE OF MOBILE PHONES, SPEAKERPHONES, PUBLIC TELEPHONE BOOTHS, OR PHONES IN OTHER PUBLIC PLACES. USE OF LANDLINE AND HAND OR HEAD SET IS PREFERRED BY THE COURT. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER Granting #397 Administrative Request to Appear Telephonically filed by Counsel for Plaintiffs William Ellis and James Kile. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/4/2019. If a request to appear telephonically is granted, the parties must contact CourtCall Phone Conferencing at (866) 582-6878 in advance of the hearing to schedule a telephonic appearance. TO ENSURE THE QUALITY OF THE RECORD, THE PARTIES SHOULD AVOID THE USE OF MOBILE PHONES, SPEAKERPHONES, PUBLIC TELEPHONE BOOTHS, OR PHONES IN OTHER PUBLIC PLACES. USE OF LANDLINE AND HAND OR HEAD SET IS PREFERRED BY THE COURT. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER Granting #396 Administrative Request to Appear Telephonically filed by Johnston Pratt PLLC firm. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila. If a request to appear telephonically is granted, the parties must contact CourtCall Phone Conferencing at (866) 582-6878 in advance of the hearing to schedule a telephonic appearance. TO ENSURE THE QUALITY OF THE RECORD, THE PARTIES SHOULD AVOID THE USE OF MOBILE PHONES, SPEAKERPHONES, PUBLIC TELEPHONE BOOTHS, OR PHONES IN OTHER PUBLIC PLACES. USE OF LANDLINE AND HAND OR HEAD SET IS PREFERRED BY THE COURT. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 399 NOTICE of Change of Address by Rosemary M. Rivas (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 398 MOTION to Appear by Telephone and Proposed Order filed by Nicole Gallmann, Robert Gilson. (Dearman, Mark) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 397 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by William Ellis. (Lear, Bradford) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 396 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by J. Scott Archer, Jennifer Bond, Corporacion Nacional de Consumidores Y Usuarios de Chile, Elisa Gaudio, David Haury, Alberto R. Marzana, Neill McInnis, Mark Miller, John Rufty, III, Chris Spearman, Craig Stanford, Ryan Young. (Gifford, Robert) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 395 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Seventh Supplemental Joint Case Management Statement) filed by Angela Boykin, Robert Gilson. (Choi, Mario) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 394 Order Denying #391 Motion to Relate Case Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/7/2019.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 393 NOTICE by Angela Boykin Withdrawal of Appearance of Counsel (Labaton, Ralph) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 392 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #391 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed byApple Inc.. (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 391 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Terrence Zehrer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley R. Rifkin, #2 Exhibit A - Derivative Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Consumer Complaint, #4 Proposed Order)(Rifkin, Ashley) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 390 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ben Barnow (Barnow, Ben) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 389 NOTICE by Rebecca Westerfield (Ret.) re: Special Discovery Master Order No. 10 (Westerfield, Rebecca) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 388 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING. Please take NOTICE that a Further Case Management Conference has been set for 11/7/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/28/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 387 STATUS REPORT Joint Report Regarding Mediation Session by Apple Inc.. (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER DISMISSING THREE PLAINTIFFS WITH PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/29/2019. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 385 NOTICE by Robert Gilson re #373 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 [Regarding Order to Show Cause Dkt # 373] (Redenbarger, Tyson) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 384 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Robert Gilson Declaration of Gayle M. Blatt [Response to Dkt. #373]. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 383 Declaration of Daniel C. Levin [Response to Dkt. #373 . (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 8/26/2019) Modified text on 8/27/2019, (to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2019 Filing 382 Declaration of James C. Vlahakis [Response to Dkt. #373 . (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 8/26/2019) Modified text on 8/27/2019, (to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER DENYING #359 MOTION TO MODIFY SPECIAL DISCOVERY MASTER ORDER NO. 9 Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/22/2019.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019) Modified on 8/22/2019 (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 380 Order Granting #375 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/22/2019.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 379 CLERK'S NOTICE TAKING MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT PER CIVIL LR 7-1(b)and VACATING HEARING as to ( #359 ) Motion to Modify Special Discovery Master Order No. 9 set for 8/16/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 378 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Special Discovery Master's Entry of Phone Inspection Protocol (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER RELATING CASE re #368 SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/15/2019. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 14, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Document not properly linked. [err102]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #374 Declaration in Support, filed by Appl e Inc. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 376 REPLY (re #359 MOTION to Modify Special Discovery Master Order No. 9 re #354 Notice (Other) ) filed byRobert Gilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF RALPH E. LABATON ISO PLAINTIFFS' REPLY, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 375 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Robert Gilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ON JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF OBJECTIONS AND MOTION TO MODIFY SPECIAL DISCOVERY MASTER ORDER NO. 9, #2 Exhibit A (REDACTED), #3 Exhibit A (SEALED), #4 Exhibit B (REDACTED), #5 Exhibit B (SEALED), #6 Exhibit C (REDACTED), #7 Exhibit C (SEALED), #8 Exhibit D (REDACTED), #9 Exhibit D (SEALED), #10 Exhibit E (REDACTED), #11 Exhibit E (SEALED), #12 Exhibit F (REDACTED), #13 Exhibit F (SEALED), #14 REPLY BRIEF (REDACTED), #15 REPLY BRIEF (SEALED))(Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 374 Declaration of G. Charles Nierlich in Support of #359 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Reply in Further Support of Objections and Motion to Modify Special Discovery Master Order No. 9 filed by Apple Inc.. (Nierlich, George) (Filed on 8/13/2019) Modified on 8/14/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 373 Order Denying #361 Administrative Motion; Order to Show Cause Signed by by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/12/2019. Responses to Order to Show Cause due by 8/26/2019.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 372 Statement re #368 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases by Apple Inc.. (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 371 REPLY (re #361 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Withdraw Putative Class Representatives and Dismiss Claims Without Prejudice ) filed byRobert Gilson. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 370 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #359 MOTION to Modify Special Discovery Master Order No. 9 re #354 Notice (Other) ) Defendant Apple Inc.'s Response and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Objections and Motion to Modify Special Discovery Master Order No. 9 filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jillian London ISO Apple's Opposition, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jillian London)(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER Directing Plaintiffs to File Reply re #361 Administrative Motion (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
August 5, 2019 Filing 368 SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases 5:19-cv-04421 NC and 5:18-md-02827 EJD. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/5/2019. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
August 1, 2019 ***Set/Reset Deadlines per ECF #367 Order: as to #359 Motion to Modify Special Discovery Master Order No. 9 re #354 Notice (Other). Motion Hearing set for 8/16/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 367 Order Granting #366 Motion to Expedite Singed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/1/2019. Hearing re #359 Motion to Modify Special Discovery Master Order No. 9 is advanced to 8/16/2019 at 10:00 a.m.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 366 MOTION to Expedite Motion for Administrative Relief to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify Special Discovery Master Order No. 9 filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify Special Discovery Master Order No. 9)(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 365 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byApple Inc.. (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER Granting #362 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Ralph E. Labaton, Counsel for Plaintiff Angela Boykin. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/30/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 363 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #361 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Withdraw Putative Class Representatives and Dismiss Claims Without Prejudice ) filed byApple Inc.. (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 362 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13556463.) filed by Angela Boykin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Labaton, Ralph) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 361 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Withdraw Putative Class Representatives and Dismiss Claims Without Prejudice filed by Robert Gilson. Responses due by 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark C. Molumphy, #2 Proposed Order)(Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 360 Order Granting In Part and Denying In Part #357 Administrative Motion Signed by by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/24/2019.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 359 MOTION to Modify Special Discovery Master Order No. 9 re #354 Notice (Other) filed by Angela Boykin, Robert Gilson. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 8/6/2019. Replies due by 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(Straite, David) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 358 *** *** OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #357 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection or To Move To Modify Special Discovery Master Order No. 9 [Dkt. No. 354] and To Set Page Limits ) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Wesley Sze)(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 7/22/2019) Modified text doc. lock on 7/22/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified text doc. unlock on 7/23/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2019 Filing 357 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection or To Move To Modify Special Discovery Master Order No. 9 [Dkt. No. 354] and To Set Page Limits filed by Angela Boykin, Robert Gilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Straite, David) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER APPROVAL re #355 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Plaintiffs Ruth Beauchan and Stephen Heffner ONLY. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/11/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 355 NOTICE by Ruth Beauchan, Stephen Heffner NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 354 *** DOCUMENT LOCKED *** NOTICE by Rebecca Westerfield (Ret.) re: Special Discovery Master Order No. 9 (Westerfield, Rebecca) (Filed on 7/9/2019) Modified on 7/9/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2019 Filing 353 NOTICE by Rebecca Westerfield (Ret.) re: Special Discovery Master Report No. 3 (Westerfield, Rebecca) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 352 STIPULATION to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Apple Inc.. (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 351 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Ariana J. Tadler (Tadler, Ariana) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 350 Order Regarding #313 Motion for Sanctions Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/14/2019.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 349 Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part #328 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/14/2019.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 348 Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part #327 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 347 NOTICE by Angela Boykin, Robert Gilson [Plaintiffs' Notice Concerning Amending Complaint] (Choi, Mario) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 346 NOTICE by Kelli Beaugez of Withdrawal of Appearance of Counsel (Handmaker, Sally) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 344 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C Lo for Defendant Apple Inc. (Lo, Jason) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 343 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Joseph Doren for Defendant Apple Inc. (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 342 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/30/2019 before Judge Edward J. Davila by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 341 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/30/19 before Judge Edward J. Davila by Angela Boykin, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Choi, Mario) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 340 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward J. Davila: Motion Hearing re #313 Motion for Sanctions filed by Apple Inc. held on 5/30/2019. Oral argument heard and the Court took the matter under submission. Court to issue the order. Plaintiff Attorney: Joseph Cotchett,Mark Molumphy,Brian Danitz,Anya Thepot,Elle Lewis. Defendant Attorney: Christopher Chorba,Theodore Boutrous, Jr., Total Time in Court:9:12-10:24am(1Hr.12Mins.) Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/30/2019)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 339 Order Granting #337 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Amended Complaint Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 338 NOTICE by Rebecca Westerfield (Ret.) re: Stipulation and Order Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions of Apple Inc. and Rule 30(b)(1) Depositions of Current and Former Apple Inc. Employees (Westerfield, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 337 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed Schedule on Filing of Amended Complaint] filed by Angela Boykin. (Choi, Mario) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 336 CORRECTED #333 ORDER Granting #326 Motion to Shorten Time and Denying [326-3] Motion for Protective Order Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/6/2019. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER APPROVAL re ( #325 in 5:18-md-02827-EJD) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Abdul Azeem Mohammed. The Clerk shall terminate this plaintiff from the action. 5:18-cv-02438-EJD shall be terminated and filed closed. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 334 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyson Carl Redenbarger (Redenbarger, Tyson) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 333 Order Granting #326 Motion to Shorten Time and Denying [326-3] Motion for Protective Order Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/6/2019.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 5, 2019 Filing 332 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #326 MOTION to Shorten Time ) Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Objections to Special Master's Order and Motion for a Protective Order [Docket No. 326-3] filed byRobert Gilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark C. Molumphy)(Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 5/5/2019)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 331 REDACTED VERSION OF #315 ORDER Granting [236-1] Motion for Reconsideration; Granting in Part and Denying in Part #272 #297 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint; Denying #285 Motion to Compel Discovery; Granting #177 Request for Judicial Notice; Denying #281 Request for Judicial Notice; Denying #282 Motion for Leave to File Objections; Denying #307 and #308 Administrative Motions for Leave to File Statements of Recent Decision Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/22/2019. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 330 REPLY (re #326 MOTION to Shorten Time ) Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion to Shorten Time filed byRobert Gilson. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER Setting Deadline for Plaintiffs to Respond to #326 Motion to Shorten Time Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/3/2019. Plaintiffs shall respond before 11:59 p.m. PDT on 5/3/2019. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 328 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Apple's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Robert Gilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of G. Charles Nierlich, #2 Redacted -Opposition Memorandum, #3 Unredacted -Opposition Memorandum, #4 Exhibit Redacted Ex. 1 to Joseph W. Cotchett Declaration, #5 Exhibit Unredacted Ex. 1 to Joseph W. Cotchett Declaration, #6 Exhibit Redacted Ex. 2 to Joseph W. Cotchett Declaration, #7 Exhibit Unredacted Ex. 2 to Joseph W. Cotchett Declaration, #8 Exhibit Redacted Ex. 3 to Joseph W. Cotchett Declaration, #9 Exhibit Unredacted Ex. 3 to Joseph W. Cotchett Declaration, #10 Proposed Order)(Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 327 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Transcript of March 7, 2019 Hearing on Apple's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of G. Charles Nierlich in Support of Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted version of document sought to be filed under seal, #4 Unredacted version of document to be filed under seal)(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 326 MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diana M. Feinstein, #2 Proposed Order re Motion to Shorten Time, #3 Supplement Objections to Special Discovery Master's Order and Motion for a Protective Order, #4 Proposed Order re Objections to Special Discovery Master's Order and Motion for a Protective Order)(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 325 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Abdul Azeem Mohammed (Mohammed, Abdul) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 1, 2019 Filing 324 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Michelle Feinstein for Defendant Apple Inc. (Feinstein, Diana) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
May 1, 2019 Filing 323 NOTICE by Rebecca Westerfield (Ret.) re: Special Discovery Master's Order No. 8 (Westerfield, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 322 REPLY (re #313 MOTION for Sanctions ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Chorba Suppl. Decl., #2 Exhibit F)(Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 321 Order Referring #319 Motion to Compel to Special Discovery Master Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/30/2019.(ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 26, 2019 Filing 320 Proposed Order re #319 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Protective Order (Confidentiality Designations) by Robert Gilson. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 319 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Protective Order (Confidentiality Designations) filed by Angela Boykin, Robert Gilson. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 5/9/2019. Replies due by 5/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Straite, David) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 24, 2019 Filing 318 NOTICE of refiling of Corrected Redacted Public Version of Second Consolidated Amended Complaint Pursuant to Court Order] (Attachments: #1 A - [Corrected] Redacted Public Version of Second Consolidated Amended Complaint)(Choi, Mario) (Filed on 4/24/2019) Modified on 4/24/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2019 Filing 317 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #313 MOTION for Sanctions ) filed byRobert Gilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark C. Molumphy, #2 Declaration of Joseph W. Cotchett, #3 Proposed Order)(Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 316 NOTICE of Appearance by Winslow Taub (Taub, Winslow) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 315 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. ORDER Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/22/2019: Granting [236-1] Motion for Reconsideration; Granting in Part and Denying in Part #272 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint; Denying #285 Motion to Compel Discovery; Granting #177 Request for Judicial Notice; Denying #281 Request for Judicial Notice; Denying #282 Motion for Leave to File Objections; Denying #307 and #308 Administrative Motions for Leave to File Statements of Recent Decision. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019) Copy of Order provided to Counsel by AMK on 4/22/2019. Modified text on 4/22/2019 (amkS, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice #279 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; Granting in Part and Denying in Part #304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; Denying Without Prejudice #311 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 313 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 4/23/2019. Replies due by 4/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Chorba Decl., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Nierlich Decl., #8 Proposed Order)(Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 312 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #311 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Transcript of Hearing on Apple's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint ) filed byRobert Gilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 311 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Transcript of Hearing on Apple's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of G. Charles Nierlich in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of document sought to be filed under seal, #4 Unredacted version of document to be filed under seal)(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 310 NOTICE by Rebecca Westerfield (Ret.) re: Special Discovery Master's Order No. 7 (Westerfield, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 309 NOTICE by Amanda Holman OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM NAME (Carpenter, Todd) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 308 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Response to Statement of Recent Decision filed by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 3/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 3/18/2019) Modified on 3/18/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 15, 2019 Filing 307 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Statement of Recent Decision and Statement of Recent Decision filed by Angela Boykin, Robert Gilson. Responses due by 3/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Straite, David) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 306 RESPONSE re #305 Notice (Other), [Plaintiffs' Response to Apple's "Notice of Proceedings" Dated March 14, 2019 (Dkt. No. 305)] by Angela Boykin, Robert Gilson. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 305 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #304 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Second Consolidated Amended Complaint, #279 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 304 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Second Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Angela Boykin, Robert Gilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of G. Charles Nierlich, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Second Consolidated Amended Complaint)(Choi, Mario) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 303 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/7/2019 before Judge Edward J. Davila by Angela Boykin, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 302 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward J. Davila: Motion Hearing re #272 Motion to Dismiss, #297 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Apple Inc., and Further Case Management Conference held on 3/7/2019. The Court heard oral argument. The Court took the motions under submission and Court shall issue order. Plaintiff Attorney: Joseph Cotchett,Brian Danitz,Laurence King,Mark Molumphy,Fred Fox,David Straite,Gina Stassi,Elle Lewis,Donal Hall,(Mark Dearman and Robert Gifford via Courtcall). Defendant Attorney: Christopher Chorba,Charles Nierlich,Diana Feinstein,Alex Harris. Total Time in Court:10:24-11:18am(54Mins.) Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/7/2019)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER Granting #299 Motion to Appear by Telephone. COUNSEL SHALL CONTACT COURTCALL DIRECTLY AT (866) 582-6878 TO ARRANGE FOR TELEPHONE APPEARANCE. COUNSEL MUST BE ON A LANDLINE TELEPHONE FOR TELEPHONE APPEARANCE - NO MOBILE TELEPHONE TO BE USED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/5/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 300 Declaration of G. Charles Nierlich in Support of #279 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #279 ) (Nierlich, George) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 299 First MOTION to Appear by Telephone Matthew Donahue filed by Raisa Drantivy. (Donahue, Matthew) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 298 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #272 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint ) [Redacted Version per Court Order at #289 ] filed byAngela Boykin, Robert Gilson. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 297 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 2/14/2019. Replies due by 2/28/2019. (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 296 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jay Barnes Change of Firm Affiliation and Contact Information (Barnes, Jay) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 295 NOTICE by Rebecca Westerfield (Ret.) re: Special Discovery Master Report No. 2 (Westerfield, Rebecca) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 294 Order by Judge Edward J. Davila Granting #292 Motion to Appear by Telephone. COUNSEL SHALL CONTACT COURTCALL DIRECTLY TO ARRANGE FOR TELEPHONE APPEARANCE. COUNSEL MUST BE ON A LANDLINE TELEPHONE FOR TELEPHONE APPEARANCE - NO MOBILE TELEPHONE TO BE USED.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 293 NOTICE by Nicole Gallmann of Change of Attorney's Firm Name and Contact Information (Keller, Amy) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 292 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Corporacion Nacional de Consumidores Y Usuarios de Chile. (Gifford, Robert) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 291 Order Denying #271 Apple's Motion to Seal Portions of the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on February 27, 2019.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019) Modified on 2/27/2019 (mdllcS, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 290 Order Denying Without Prejudice #243 #249 Motions to Seal. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on February 27, 2019. (mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 289 Order Requiring Plaintiffs to Publicly File a Redacted Version of the Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on February 27, 2019. (mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 288 Order by Judge Edward J. Davila Granting #284 Motion to Appear by Telephone. COUNSEL SHALL CONTACT COURTCALL DIRECTLY TO ARRANGE FOR TELEPHONE APPEARANCE. COUNSEL MUST BE ON A LANDLINE TELEPHONE FOR TELEPHONE APPEARANCE - NO MOBILE TELEPHONE TO BE USED.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (amkS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2019 Filing 287 OBJECTIONS to re #281 Request for Judicial Notice by Apple Inc.. (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 286 REPLY (re #272 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint ) filed byApple Inc.. (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 285 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Sixth Supplemental Joint Case Management Conference Statement) filed by Angela Boykin, Robert Gilson. (Choi, Mario) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 284 MOTION to Appear by Telephone and Proposed Order filed by Nicole Gallmann, Robert Gilson. (Dearman, Mark) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 283 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #279 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #279 ) (Nierlich, George) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 282 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Objections to Portions of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Angela Boykin, Robert Gilson. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 281 Request for Judicial Notice re #280 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byAngela Boykin, Robert Gilson. (Related document(s) #280 ) (King, Laurence) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 280 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #272 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint ) filed byAngela Boykin, Robert Gilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph W. Cotchett, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(King, Laurence) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 279 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Angela Boykin, Robert Gilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #4 Sealed Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit 1 Redacted, #6 Exhibit 1 Sealed, #7 Exhibit 2 Redacted, #8 Exhibit 2 Sealed, #9 Exhibit 3 Redacted, #10 Exhibit 3 Sealed, #11 Certificate/Proof of Service)(King, Laurence) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 13, 2019 Filing 278 NOTICE of Appearance by Elle D. Lewis (Lewis, Elle) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 277 Order Denying without Prejudice #206 #116 Motions to Compel. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on February 8, 2019. (mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 276 NOTICE by Robert Gilson Withdrawal of Counsel (Biehl, Stephanie) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
January 30, 2019 ***Set Deadlines/Hearings per ECF #274 Order: Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/25/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 275 Order Regarding #273 Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Administrative Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on January 30, 2019. (mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 274 Order Regarding Discovery Disputes. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on January 30, 2019. (mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 273 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #271 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed byAngela Boykin, Robert Gilson. (Straite, David) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 272 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 2/14/2019. Replies due by 2/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of G. Charles Nierlich, #2 Proposed Order)(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 271 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Chorba, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Apple's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint, #4 Unredacted Version of Apple's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complaint, #5 Certificate of Service)(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 14, 2019 Filing 270 NOTICE of Change of Address by Anthony Oliver (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 269 REPLY re #254 Order on Stipulation, #246 Order on Motion for Leave to File [Apple's Reply in Support of Motion for Reconsideration [ECF No. [236-1]) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #254 , #246 ) (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 1/11/2019) Modified on 1/14/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2019 Filing 268 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/20/2018, before Judge Davila. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, email address Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing., TRANSCRIPT COPY DELIVERED Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/10/2019. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 9, 2019 Filing 267 NOTICE of Appearance by Anjalee Meren Behti (Behti, Anjalee) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
December 21, 2018 Filing 266 Brief re #246 Order on Motion for Leave to File [Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration (or in the Alternative, for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal), ECF No. 236-1] filed byAngela Boykin, Robert Gilson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Related document(s) #246 ) (Straite, David) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 265 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/20/2018 before Judge Edward J. Davila by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 264 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/20/2018 before Judge Edward J. Davila by Angela Boykin, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 263 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward J. Davila: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/20/2018. The parties updated the Court as to the status of the matters which included discovery. The Court set a hearing on the Motion to Dismiss and briefing schedule and set page limitations. Motion filing deadline 1/24/2019 (35 page limit). Responses due by 2/14/2019(35 page limit). Replies due by 2/28/2019 (25 page limit). Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Plaintiff Attorney: Joseph Cotchett,Mark Molumphy,Stephanie Biehl, Brian Danitz, Laurence King. Defendant Attorney: Christopher Chorba, Cynthia McTernan, Timothy Loose. Total Time in Court:10:29-10:47am(18 Mins.)Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/20/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 262 RESPONSE to re #255 Declaration in Support, Request for Leave by Angela Boykin, Robert Gilson. (Choi, Mario) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Amended Order Granting #258 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/19/2018. (mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 260 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #261 . *** (mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018) Modified on 12/19/2018 (mdllcS, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2018 Filing 259 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Edward Donahue (Donahue, Matthew) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 17, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #258 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Fi led Documents (Dkt. Nos. 256-2, 256-3) filed by Apple Inc. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 258 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents (Dkt. Nos. 256-2, 256-3) filed by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 12/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation in Support of Administrative Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents, #2 Proposed Order(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 12/17/2018) Modified on 12/17/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2018 Filing 257 Declaration of Timothy W. Loose in Support of #256 Response ( Non Motion ), filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #256 ) (Loose, Timothy) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 256 RESPONSE to re #250 Objection, by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Chorba in Support of Apple's Reply, #2 Declaration of Timothy W. Loose in Support of Apple's Reply, *** #3 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Timothy W. Loose DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** )(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 12/14/2018) Modified on 12/17/2018 (ewn, COURT STAFF). DOCUMENT(S) 256-1 TO 256-3 REMOVED PURSUANT TO ORDER #261 (jy, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/20/2018 (jy, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2018 Filing 255 Declaration of Christopher Chorba in Support of #249 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [and Notice of Lodging Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5] filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #249 ) (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Order by Judge Edward J. Davila granting as modified #252 Stipulation regarding briefing schedule.(mdllcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 253 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT [Fifth Supplemental Joint Case Management Conference Statement] filed by Angela Boykin, Robert Gilson. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 252 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #246 Order on Motion for Leave to File filed by Angela Boykin, Robert Gilson. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 251 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #250 Objection, Notice of Intent to Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Declaration of Christopher Chorba re: Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 250 OBJECTIONS to re #247 Affidavit in Support of Motion, Response to Declaration of Christopher Chorba re: Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal] by Angela Boykin, Robert Gilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Straite, David) (Filed on 12/10/2018) Modified on 12/12/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2018 Filing 249 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [and Notice of Lodging Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5] filed by Angela Boykin, Robert Gilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 Public Version, #3 Exhibit 2 Sealed Version, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(King, Laurence) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Order re #243 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/5/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 4, 2018 Filing 247 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #243 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [and Notice of Lodging Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5] Declaration of Christopher Chorba In Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Document Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(E)(1) filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #243 ) (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER granting #236 Motion for Leave to File motion for reconsideration. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/4/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
December 3, 2018 Filing 245 NOTICE by Rebecca Westerfield (Ret.) regarding Special Discovery Master's Order No. 6 (Westerfield, Rebecca) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 244 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT [Redacted Version] against Apple Inc.. Filed by Angela Boykin, Robert Gilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(King, Laurence) (Filed on 11/30/2018) Modified on 12/3/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2018 Filing 243 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [and Notice of Lodging Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5] filed by Angela Boykin, Robert Gilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laurence D. King in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit 1 Public Version, #3 Exhibit 2 Sealed Version, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(King, Laurence) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER Granting #239 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Mark W. Mosier, Counsel for Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/19/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER Granting #238 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Rafael Reyneri, Counsel for Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila ON 11/19/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 240 NOTICE by Rebecca Westerfield (Ret.) re: Special Discovery Master's Order No. 5 and Discovery & Search Protocol Order (Westerfield, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 239 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12855212.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Mosier, Mark) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 238 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12854956.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Reyneri, Rafael) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 237 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth S Brinkmann for Defendant Apple Inc. (Brinkmann, Beth) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 236 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion for Reconsideration, #2 Appendix, #3 Exhibits 1-39, #4 Loose Declaration, #5 Exhibit 40)(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 235 NOTICE by Rebecca Westerfield (Ret.) Special Discovery Master Report No. 1 (Westerfield, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
October 31, 2018 Filing 234 EXHIBIT C in support of #227 by Angela Boykin, Robert Gilson. Amendment to #227 . (Choi, Mario) (Filed on 10/31/2018) Modified on 10/31/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2018 Filing 233 OBJECTIONS to re #228 Response ( Non Motion ), [Plaintiffs' Opposition and Objections to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Request to Submit Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of New Authority] by Angela Boykin, Robert Gilson. (Straite, David) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
October 30, 2018 Filing 232 NOTICE by Rebecca Westerfield (Ret.) Special Discovery Master's Order No. 4 (Westerfield, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 30, 2018 Filing 231 NOTICE by Rebecca Westerfield (Ret.) Special Discovery Master's Order No. 3 (Westerfield, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 30, 2018 Filing 230 NOTICE by Rebecca Westerfield (Ret.) Special Discovery Master's Order No. 2 (Westerfield, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 30, 2018 Filing 229 NOTICE by Rebecca Westerfield (Ret.) Special Discovery Master's Order No. 1 (Westerfield, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 228 RESPONSE to re #227 Notice (Other), Defendant Apple Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of New Authority In Support of Motion to Compel Discovery and Request for Leave by Apple Inc.. (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 227 NOTICE by Angela Boykin, Robert Gilson re #206 MOTION to Compel Discovery [Plaintiffs' Notice of New Authority in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery; Request for Leave] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Straite, David) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 24, 2018 ***Set Deadlines per ECF #226 Order: Amended Pleadings due by 11/30/2018. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Stipulated Scheduling Order #225 extending deadline to file Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/24/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 225 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated [Proposed] Scheduling Order filed by Angela Boykin, Robert Gilson. (Choi, Mario) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 224 NOTICE by Rebecca Westerfield (Ret.) re Protective Order (Westerfield, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER denying #174 Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief Pursuant to Rule 23(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on10/15/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 222 Proposed Order Stipulated [Proposed] Protective Order by Angela Boykin. (Straite, David) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 3, 2018 Filing 220 REPLY (re #206 MOTION to Compel Discovery ) filed byAngela Boykin, Robert Gilson. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #176 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/1/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER Granting #211 Application for Admission of Attorney for Pro Hac Vice for Thomas C. Willcox, Counsel for Kevin Fahey. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/28/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 217 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #206 MOTION to Compel Discovery ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy W. Loose, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 216 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/28/2018 before Judge Edward J. Davila by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 215 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/28/2018 before Judge Edward J. Davila by Angela Boykin, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 214 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward J. Davila: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/28/2018., Motions Hearings held on 9/28/2018. re #174 MOTION Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 23(d) filed by Robert Gilson, #176 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Apple Inc. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2018 10:00 AM. Counsel present arguments. Motion are taken under submission. Court to issue written order.Total Time in Court: 1 hr 26 minutes. Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. Plaintiff Attorney: Joseph Cotchett, Stephanie Biehl, Brian Danitz, Mark Molumphy, David Straite; Frederick Fox, Laurence King, Derek Howard, Mark Dearman. Defendant Attorney: Theane Evangelis, Charles Nierlich, Christopher Chorba, Rachel Bass. Also present by phone: Kathleen Herkenhoff, Kennth Johnston, Amy Keller and Stephen Rosenthal. Also present: Terence Edwards (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/28/2018)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 213 Order granting #212 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/27/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 212 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by J. Scott Archer, Jennifer Bond, Corporacion Nacional de Consumidores Y Usuarios de Chile, Elisa Gaudio, David Haury, Alberto R. Marzana, Neill McInnis, Mark Miller, John Rufty, III, Chris Spearman, Craig Stanford, Ryan Young. (Johnston, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 211 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12715175.) filed by Kevin Fahey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DC cetificate of good standing)(Willcox, Thomas) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER Granting #204 Application for Admission of Attorney for Pro Hac Vice for Robert W. Gifford. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/25/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER Granting #203 Application for Admission of Attorney for Pro Hac Vice for Kenneth C. Johnston. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/25/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting #205 Motion to Appear by Telephone. The applicant counsel should contact Court-Call and make arrangements to participate by telephone. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/24/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER granting #202 Motion to Appear by Telephone. The applicant counsel should contact Court-Call and make arrangements to participate by telephone. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/24/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 21, 2018 Filing 206 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Angela Boykin, Robert Gilson. Responses due by 9/28/2018. Replies due by 10/3/2018. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 21, 2018 Filing 205 MOTION to Appear by Telephone Administrative Request to Appear Telephonically and [Proposed] Order for A. Keller and K. Herkenhoff filed by Patrick DeFellippo, Brandon Farmer, Nicole Gallmann, Gary Merenstein. (Keller, Amy) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 21, 2018 Filing 204 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12700586.) filed by J. Scott Archer, Jennifer Bond, Corporacion Nacional de Consumidores Y Usuarios de Chile, Elisa Gaudio, David Haury, Alberto R. Marzana, Neill McInnis, Mark Miller, John Rufty, III, Chris Spearman, Craig Stanford, Ryan Young. (Attachments: #1 List of Represented Parties, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gifford, Robert) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 21, 2018 Filing 203 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12700521.) filed by J. Scott Archer, Jennifer Bond, Corporacion Nacional de Consumidores Y Usuarios de Chile, Elisa Gaudio, David Haury, Alberto R. Marzana, Neill McInnis, Mark Miller, John Rufty, III, Chris Spearman, Craig Stanford, Ryan Young. (Attachments: #1 List of Represented Parties, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(Johnston, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 21, 2018 Filing 202 MOTION to Appear by Telephone Administrative Request to Appear Telephonically and [Proposed] Order filed by Yael Aburos. (Rosenthal, Stephen) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER Granting #200 Administrative Request to Appear Telephonically. COUNSEL SHALL CONTACT COURTCALL DIRECTLY TO ARRANGE FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/19/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 200 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Brady Lankford. (Artrip, Eric) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 199 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Fourth Supplemental) filed by Angela Boykin, Robert Gilson. (Choi, Mario) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 14, 2018 Filing 198 RESPONSE to re #192 Objection to Request for Judicial Notice by Apple Inc.. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 14, 2018 Filing 197 REPLY (re #176 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Rebuttal Decl. of Guido Alpa, #3 Rebuttal Decl. of Jean-Paul Beraudo, #4 Rebuttal Decl. of Kristian Brabander, #5 Rebuttal Decl. of Masato Dogauchi, #6 Rebuttal Decl. of Jonathan Kirk, #7 Rebuttal Decl. of Jianguo Xiao)(Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 196 NOTICE by Romeo James Alba re Change of Phone Number by Rosemary M. Rivas (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 3, 2018 Filing 195 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Angela Boykin, Robert Gilson re #193 Objection, #192 Objection, #194 Opposition/Response to Motion,, (Straite, David) (Filed on 9/3/2018)
September 3, 2018 Filing 194 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #176 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint ) filed byAngela Boykin, Robert Gilson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Declaration of Kyle J. McGee in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Declaration of David A. Straite in Support, #10 Exhibit 1, #11 Exhibit 2, #12 Exhibit 3, #13 Exhibit 4, #14 Exhibit 5, #15 Exhibit 6)(Straite, David) (Filed on 9/3/2018)
September 3, 2018 Filing 193 OBJECTIONS to re #176 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint by Angela Boykin, Robert Gilson. (Straite, David) (Filed on 9/3/2018)
September 3, 2018 Filing 192 OBJECTIONS to re #177 Request for Judicial Notice, by Angela Boykin, Robert Gilson. (Straite, David) (Filed on 9/3/2018)
August 28, 2018 Filing 191 REPLY (re #174 MOTION Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 23(d) ) filed byRobert Gilson. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER for exemption from Pacer fees. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/27/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 27, 2018 Filing 189 Request and Order for Exemption from Pacer Fees (Special Master) . (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 8/27/2018) Modified on 8/27/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/27/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL DISCOVERY MASTER #171 . Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/22/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2018 Filing 187 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #174 MOTION Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 23(d) ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chris Chorba)(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER RELATING CASE. It is hereby ordered that Case 5:18-md-02827-EJD In Re: Apple Inc. Device Performance Litigation is HEREBY RELATED to 5:18-cv-04930-NC Brodsky v. Apple, Inc., and such case shall be reassigned to Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/20/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 17, 2018 Filing 185 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING AND RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/17/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. COUNSEL SHALL CONTACT COURTCALL DIRECTLY TO CANCEL TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES WHICH WERE SCHEDULED FOR 8/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 17, 2018 Filing 184 MOTION to Appear by Telephone Administrative Request to Appear Telephonically and [Proposed] Order filed by Yisroel Brody, Laura Ciccone, Thomas Ciccone. (Graifman, Gary) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 17, 2018 Filing 183 STIPULATION Selecting a Private Mediator Pursuant to ADR L.R. 3-5 filed by Apple Inc.. (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 16, 2018 Filing 182 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT [Third Supplemental Joint Case Management Conference Statement] filed by Angela Boykin. (Choi, Mario) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 15, 2018 Filing 181 SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases 18-cv-04930 NC and 18-md-02857 EJD. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
August 15, 2018 Filing 180 ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Nicole Gallmann, Robert Gilson. (Dearman, Mark) (Filed on 8/15/2018) Modified on 8/15/2018 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER Granting #178 Administrative Request to Appear Telephonically by Counsel Stephen Rosenthal. COUNSEL SHALL CONTACT COURTCALL DIRECTLY TO ARRANGE FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/15/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
August 14, 2018 Filing 178 MOTION to Appear by Telephone Administrative Request to Appear Telephonically and [Proposed] Order filed by Yael Aburos. (Rosenthal, Stephen) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
August 9, 2018 Filing 177 Request for Judicial Notice re #176 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chris Chorba)(Related document(s) #176 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 9, 2018 Filing 176 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 9/3/2018. Replies due by 9/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Fabian Ajogwu, #2 Declaration of Ziya Akinci, #3 Declaration of Guido Alpa, #4 Declaration of Jean-Paul Beraudo, #5 Declaration of Kristian Brabander, #6 Declaration of Jin-Yeong Chung, #7 Declaration of Masato Dogauchi, #8 Declaration of Jonathan Kirk, #9 Declaration of Jose Tam Perez, #10 Declaration of Jianguo Xiao, #11 Proposed Order)(Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Danitz (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 7, 2018 Filing 174 MOTION Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 23(d) filed by Robert Gilson. Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 8/21/2018. Replies due by 8/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark C. Molumphy, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-17 to Mark C. Molumphy's Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL DISCOVERY MASTER. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
August 2, 2018 Filing 172 TRANSFER ORDER - dated 8/1/2018) transferring case to the Northern District of California re: MDL 2827 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Edward J. Davila. (Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair of the Panel). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
August 1, 2018 ***Set Deadlines/Hearings as to Motion to Dismiss per ECF #170 Order: Dispositive Motion due by 8/9/2018. Replies due by 9/14/2018. Responses due by 9/3/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
August 1, 2018 Filing 171 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SPECIAL DISCOVERY MASTER filed by Robert Gilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hon. Rebecca Westerfield (Ret.))(Cotchett, Joseph) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER SETTING DEADLINES FOR MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/1/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
July 23, 2018 Filing 169 NOTICE of Change of Address by Phong L. Tran (Tran, Phong) (Filed on 7/23/2018)
July 23, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]***NOTICE of Change In Counsel ***Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #168 Notice (Other) filed by Alain Liebermann, Romeo James Alba (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2018)
July 20, 2018 Filing 168 NOTICE by Romeo James Alba, Alain Liebermann of Withdrawal of Attorney Quentin A. Roberts ***NOTICE of Change In Counsel *** (Roberts, Quentin) (Filed on 7/20/2018) Modified on 7/23/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2018 Filing 167 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07/11/2018, before Judge Davila. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, email address Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/17/2018. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER Granting #164 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Eric J. Fierro, Counsel for Plaintiff Margaret Wetherald. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/16/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 164 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12515956.) filed by Margaret Wetherald. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Fierro, Eric) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 4. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/13/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2018 Filing 162 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/11/2018 before Judge Edward J. Davila by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 161 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/11/2018 before Judge Edward J. Davila by Angela Boykin, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Choi, Mario) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 11, 2018 Filing 160 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward J. Davila: Further Case Management Conference held on 7/11/2018. The Court stayed discovery as to other devices(Ipad) and the International parties without prejudice. The Court informed the parties that as to the Pro Se Litigants(3) the Federal Legal Assistance Coordinator (Kevin Knestrick) shall reach out to the Pro Se Litigants to be available to assist should they desire legal assistance. No objection from the parties as to this. As to #115 Motion to Compel Defendant's Compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) filed by Robert Gilson, Nicole Gallmann the parties agreed this motion is now MOOT. With regard to #116 Motion to Compel Expedited Production of Documents filed by Robert Gilson, Nicole Gallmann the parties shall meet and confer and if this issue is not resolved, the Court ordered it referred to Magistrate Judge DeMarchi. The Court set a further case management conference for 8/23/2018 at 1:30 pm and a joint case management statement is due 7 days prior (8/16/2018). The Court RESET Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss which was scheduled for 9/20/2018 to 9/28/2018 at 10 AM. The parties shall meet and confer and submit a proposed briefing schedule for review/approval of the Court. Plaintiff Attorney: Charles Nierlich, Christopher Chorba, Brooke Wallace, Jillian London. Defendant Attorney: Joseph Cotchett, Mark Molumphy, Stephanie Biehl, David Straite, Laurence King, Frederick Fox,Terence Edwards, and Stephen Rosenthal(Via Courtcall),Mark Dearman(Via Courtcall),Larry Gabriel(Courtcall). Total Time in Court:1:41pm-2:34,2:39-2:42pm(56 Mins.) Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/11/2018)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER in case 5:18-md-02827-EJD; Granting (17) Plaintiff Anthony Oliver's Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:18-cv-03638-EJD. PLAINTIFF SHALL CONTACT COURTCALL DIRECTLY AT (866)582-6878 TO ARRANGE FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/10/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER Granting #157 Administrative Request to Appear by Telephone. COUNSEL SHALL CONTACT COURTCALL DIRECTLY AT (866)582-6878 TO ARRANGE FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/10/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 157 MOTION to Appear by Telephone Administrative Request to Appear Telephonically and [Proposed] Order filed by Yael Aburos. (Rosenthal, Stephen) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 156 Proposed Order [Case Management Order No. 4] by Angela Boykin. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER Granting #154 Motion to Appear by Telephone. COUNSEL SHALL CONTACT COURTCALL DIRECTLY TO ARRANGE FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/6/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 154 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Trent Clinton Go, Jodie L. Kasun, Brady Lankford. (Artrip, Eric) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 153 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Second Supplemental Joint Statement) filed by Nicole Gallmann. (Choi, Mario) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER Granting #150 Motion to Appear by Telephone. COUNSEL SHALL CONTACT COURTCALL DIRECTLY TO ARRANGE FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/6/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER Granting #147 Motion to Appear by Telephone. COUNSEL SHALL CONTACT COURTCALL DIRECTLY TO ARRANGE FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/6/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 150 MOTION to Appear by Telephone Administrative Request to Appear Telephonically and [Proposed Order] filed by Chad White. (Gabriel, Larry) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 3, 2018 Filing 149 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy E. Keller (Keller, Amy) (Filed on 7/3/2018)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 3: PROTOCOL FOR WORK PERFORMED AND EXPENSES INCURRED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/3/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2018)
July 3, 2018 Filing 147 MOTION to Appear by Telephone and Proposed Order filed by Nicole Gallmann, Robert Gilson. (Dearman, Mark) (Filed on 7/3/2018)
July 3, 2018 Filing 146 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING HEARING TIME. Please take NOTICE that the hearing as to Further Case Management Conference and Motions to Compel as to #115 #116 is NOW SET for 7/11/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2018) Modified text on 7/5/2018 (amkS, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER Granting Plaintiff Anthony Oliver Permission for Electronic Case Filing. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 145 CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc.. Filed by Robert Gilson. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 7/2/2018) Modified on 7/3/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2018 Filing 144 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6-19-18, before Judge Edward J. Davila. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #135 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2018. (Related documents(s) #135 ) (las, ) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER Granting #140 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Aaron Schwartz, Counsel for Plaintiff Nicole Gallmann. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/27/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2018)
June 26, 2018 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina Stassi (Stassi, Gina) (Filed on 6/26/2018)
June 26, 2018 Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Biehl (Biehl, Stephanie) (Filed on 6/26/2018)
June 26, 2018 Filing 140 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12466272.) Filing fee previously paid on 6/26/2018 filed by Nicole Gallmann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Schwartz, Aaron) (Filed on 6/26/2018)
June 26, 2018 Filing 139 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederic S. Fox (Fox, Frederic) (Filed on 6/26/2018)
June 26, 2018 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Straite (Straite, David) (Filed on 6/26/2018)
June 26, 2018 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald R Hall (Hall, Donald) (Filed on 6/26/2018)
June 19, 2018 Filing 136 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/19/2018 before Judge Edward J. Davila by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 6/19/2018)
June 19, 2018 Filing 135 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/19/2018 before Judge Edward J. Davila by Nicole Gallmann, Robert Gilson, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 6/19/2018)
June 19, 2018 ***Set/Reset Hearing per ECF #133 Order: as to #116 Motion to Compel Expedited Production of Documents, #115 Motion to Compel Defendant's Compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Motions to Compel Hearing set for 7/11/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2018)
June 19, 2018 Filing 134 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward J. Davila: Status Conference held on 6/19/2018. The Court informed the parties that the Complaint should be filed and then the parties are to identify the claims it would like to advance as priority claims and then the Court can address the discovery issues. Therefore, NO motion hearing was held re #116 Motion to Compel Expedited Production of Documents filed by Robert Gilson, Nicole Gallmann, #115 Motion to Compel Defendant's Compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) filed by Robert Gilson, Nicole Gallmann. The parties informed the Court of the Discovery Master/Referee agreed upon is Rebecca Westerfield. Defendant's raised the issue of the battery preservation and the Court stated that issue should be addressed by the discovery master/referee. Court to finalize and issue Case Management Order. Plaintiff Attorney: Joseph Cotchett,Mark Molumphy,David Straite, Laurence King, Mark Dearman, Terrence Edwards. Defendant Attorney: Carhles Nierlich, Christopher Chorba, Alex Harris.Total Time in Court:10:07-10:43am(36 Mins.) Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/19/2018)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER DEFERRING PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/19/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2018)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Granting #124 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Archie I. Grubb, II, Counsel for Plaintiff Bryan Taylor. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/18/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Granting #121 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Stephen F. Rosenthal, Counsel for Plaintiff Yael Aburos. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/18/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER Granting #118 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Stanley D. Bernstein, Counsel for Plaintiffs Eliezer Rabinovits and Victor Mazzeo. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/18/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER Granting #108 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Joshua H. Eggnatz, Counsel for Alex Sens. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/18/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER Granting #94 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Stephanie M. Beige, Counsel for Plaintiffs Eliezer Rabinovits and Victor Mazzeo. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/18/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
June 18, 2018 Filing 127 Declaration of Timothy W. Loose in Support of #122 Opposition/Response to Motion, Supplemental Declaration of Timothy W. Loose in Support of Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Early Discovery and Partial Opposition to Request for an Early Rule 26(f) Conference filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) #122 ) (Loose, Timothy) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
June 18, 2018 Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy William Loose for Defendant Apple Inc. (Loose, Timothy) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
June 18, 2018 Filing 125 REPLY (re #116 MOTION to Compel Expedited Production of Documents, #115 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) ) filed byNicole Gallmann, Robert Gilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David A. Straite and Joseph W. Cotchett, #2 Exhibit K, #3 Exhibit L, #4 Exhibit M, #5 Exhibit N, #6 Exhibit O, #7 Exhibit P, #8 Exhibit Q)(Cotchett, Joseph) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
June 18, 2018 Filing 124 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12444008.) filed by Brian Taylor. (Grubb, Archie) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER RE: PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/18/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
June 15, 2018 Filing 122 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #116 MOTION to Compel Expedited Production of Documents, #115 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy W. Loose, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Proposed Order)(Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
June 14, 2018 Filing 121 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12437383.) filed by Yael Aburos. (Rosenthal, Stephen) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
June 13, 2018 Filing 120 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 4)- Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of April 4, 2018, and, with theconsent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Edward J. Davila. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
June 12, 2018 Filing 119 RESPONSE to re #113 Response ( Non Motion ), #109 Proposed Order, [Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' [Proposed] Case Management Order No. 3: Protocol for Work Performed and Expenses Incurred] by Nicole Gallmann, Robert Gilson. (Dearman, Mark) (Filed on 6/12/2018)
June 11, 2018 Filing 118 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12423490.) filed by Victor Mazzeo, Eliezer Rabinovits. (Bernstein, Stanley) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
June 8, 2018 Filing 117 Declaration of David A. Straite in Support of #116 MOTION to Compel Expedited Production of Documents, #115 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) filed byNicole Gallmann, Robert Gilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) #116 , #115 ) (King, Laurence) (Filed on 6/8/2018)
June 8, 2018 Filing 116 MOTION to Compel Expedited Production of Documents filed by Nicole Gallmann, Robert Gilson. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 6/14/2018. Replies due by 6/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(King, Laurence) (Filed on 6/8/2018)
June 8, 2018 Filing 115 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) filed by Nicole Gallmann, Robert Gilson. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 6/14/2018. Replies due by 6/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(King, Laurence) (Filed on 6/8/2018)
June 7, 2018 ***Set Deadlines/Hearings per ECF #114 Order: Status Conference set for 6/19/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER setting status conference re Proposed Protocol for Work Performed and Expenses Incurred. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/7/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
June 5, 2018 Filing 113 RESPONSE to re #109 Proposed Order, Defendant Apple Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' [Proposed] Case Management Order No. 3: Protocol for Work Performed and Expenses Incurred by Apple Inc.. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #111 Motion to Relate Case. The motion is consolidated into the multidistrict litigation for pretrial purposes. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/5/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 111 MOTION to Relate Case and consolidation filed by Nicole Gallmann, Robert Gilson, Corporacion Nacional de Consumidores Y Usuarios de Chile. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Joint Declaration of Mario M. Choi and Kenneth C. Johnston, #2 Proposed Order)(Choi, Mario) (Filed on 5/31/2018) Modified on 5/31/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2018 Filing 110 NOTICE by Nicole Gallmann, Robert Gilson re #99 Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel,,,, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Response of Co-Lead Counsel to Request for Further Information Regarding Roles of Steering Committee Members (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 5/30/2018)
May 30, 2018 Filing 109 [Proposed] Case Management Order No. 3: Protocol for Work Performed and Expenses Incurred - by Nicole Gallmann, Robert Gilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Dearman, Mark) (Filed on 5/30/2018) Modified on 5/30/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2018 Filing 108 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Joshua H. Eggnatz, Counsel for Alex Sens. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12382124.) filed by Alex Sens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Eggnatz, Joshua) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Granting #106 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Anthony G. Simon, Counsel for Daniel Borstelmann. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/24/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
May 23, 2018 Filing 106 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of A ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12376416.) filed by Daniel Borstelmann. (Simon, Anthony) (Filed on 5/23/2018)
May 22, 2018 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew N. Friedman (Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
May 22, 2018 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Sally Mae Handmaker (Handmaker, Sally) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
May 22, 2018 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas James McNamara (McNamara, Douglas) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
May 18, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2018) Modified on 6/14/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/14/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2018 ***Set Deadlines/Hearings per ECF #101 Order: Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2018. Motion to Dismiss due by 8/9/2018. Replies due by 9/6/2018. Responses due by 8/30/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 9/20/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER requesting proposal re: protocol for common benefit work and expenses. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/18/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/18/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED ACTIONS re Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel AND Consolidate Actions re ECF #99 in 5:18-md-02827-EJD. ORIGINAL ORDER #99 WAS NOT SPREAD TO THE OTHER ACTIONS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/15/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018) Modified on 5/16/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED ACTIONS denying #30 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel; granting in part and denying in part #35 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel; denying #38 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/15/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/16/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #97 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/15/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2018 Filing 97 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Abdul Mohammed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
May 11, 2018 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry Wayne Gabriel (Gabriel, Larry) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
May 11, 2018 Filing 95 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/10/2018 before Judge Edward J. Davila by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
May 11, 2018 Filing 94 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12344392.) filed by Victor Mazzeo, Eliezer Rabinovits. (Beige, Stephanie) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
May 11, 2018 Filing 93 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/10/2018 before Judge Edward J. Davila by Nicole Gallmann, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
May 10, 2018 Filing 92 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward J. Davila: Motion Hearing held on 5/10/2018 re ( #30 in 5:18-md-02827-EJD) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Karen Palmer, Brent Jones, Mark Davis, ( #38 in 5:18-md-02827-EJD) Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by John Solak, ( #35 in 5:18-md-02827-EJD) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Robert Gilson. The Court heard the parties positions regarding the motions. The Court took the matters under submission. Court to issue the order. Attorneys Appearances: SEE ATTACHMENT: Attorney Attendance Sheet. Total Time in Court:10:16am-12:08pm(1Hr.52Mins.) Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/10/2018)
May 10, 2018 Filing 91 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Trent Clinton Go, Jodie L. Kasun, Brady Lankford. (Artrip, Eric) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
May 9, 2018 Filing 90 REPLY (re #35 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) Plaintiffs' Objection to Defendant Apple Inc.'s "Response" to Motions to Consolidate Related Actions and Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel filed byNicole Gallmann, Robert Gilson. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 9, 2018 Filing 89 NOTICE of Withdrawal from Motion by Keaton Harvey re #35 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dina E. Micheletti in Support of Notice of Withdrawal)(Fazio, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/9/2018) Modified text on 5/10/2018 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2018 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary S. Graifman (Graifman, Gary) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 9, 2018 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E. Schaffer (Schaffer, Charles) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 9, 2018 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C. Levin (Levin, Daniel) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 9, 2018 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by James Constantine Vlahakis (Vlahakis, James) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 9, 2018 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Tina Wolfson for Plaintiff Sara Hawes (Wolfson, Tina) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Granting #80 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Ben Barnow, Counsel for Sean Neilan. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila 5/9/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Granting #72 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Todd C. Werts, Counsel for Kim Burton and William Ellis. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/9/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Granting #71 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Bradford B. Lear, Counsel for Kim Burton and William Ellis. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/9/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 9, 2018 Filing 80 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12336979.) filed by Sean Neilan. (Attachments: #1 Barnow Certificate of Good Standing)(Barnow, Ben) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Paul Ridout for Plaintiff Scott Grillo (Ridout, Christopher) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 78 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #30 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #38 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases CORRECTION OF DOCKET #29 , #35 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr for Defendant Apple Inc. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by George Charles Nierlich, III for Defendant Apple Inc. (Nierlich, George) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Theane Evangelis Kapur for Defendant Apple Inc. (Kapur, Theane) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Chorba for Defendant Apple Inc. (Chorba, Christopher) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting #63 Motion to Appear by Telephone. COUNSEL SHALL CONTACT COURTCALL DIRECTLY TO ARRANGE FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/8/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 72 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12335485.) filed by Kim Burton, William Ellis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Werts, Todd) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 71 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12335454.) filed by Kim Burton, William Ellis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Werts, Todd) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Quentin Alexandre Roberts (Roberts, Quentin) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #60 Motion to Appear by Telephone. COUNSEL SHALL CONTACT COURTCALL DIRECTLY TO ARRANGE FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/8/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting #54 Motion to Appear by Telephone. COUNSEL SHALL CONTACT COURTCALL DIRECTLY TO ARRANGE FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/8/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting #62 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Ariana J. Tadler, Counsel for Plaintiffs Allyson Werner & Judy Milman. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/8/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Granting #57 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Joseph J. Braun, Counsel for Lauri Stefanou, Carly Byer and Jarrod Byer. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/8/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting #56 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Richard S. Wayne, Counsel for Lauri Stefanou, Carly Byer and Jarrod Byer. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/8/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting #55 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for James C. Vlahakis, Counsel for Sam Mangano, Ala Abdulla, Kirk Pedelty. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/8/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 63 Joint MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Robert Gilson. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 62 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12334207.) filed by Judy Milman, Allyson Werner. (Tadler, Ariana) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa R. Emert (Emert, Melissa) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 60 MOTION to Appear by Telephone Phyllis E. Brown filed by Carly Byer, Jarrod Byer, Lauri Sullivan-Stefanou. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Phyllis) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Phyllis Elaine Brown (Brown, Phyllis) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 7, 2018 Filing 58 ERRATA re #38 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases CORRECTION OF DOCKET #29 by John Solak. (Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 7, 2018 Filing 57 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12331098.) filed by Carly Byer, Jarrod Byer, Lauri Sullivan-Stefanou. (Braun, Joseph) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 7, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12331061.) filed by Carly Byer, Jarrod Byer, Lauri Sullivan-Stefanou. (Wayne, Richard) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 7, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12330583.) filed by Ala Abdulla, Sam Mangano, Kirk Pedelty. (Vlahakis, James) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 7, 2018 Filing 54 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Melody Munro. (Wagner, Avraham) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Order Granting Motion to Remand, ECF No. 12 in Santino, et al. v. Apple Inc., Case No. 5:18-cv-02486-EJD. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/7/2018. (mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting #48 Motion to Appear by Telephone. COURT SHALL CONTACT COURTCALL DIRECTLY TO ARRANGE FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/4/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting #44 Order to Appear by Telephone. COUNSEL SHALL CONTACT COURTCALL DIRECTLY TO ARRANGE FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/4/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting #40 Motion to Appear by Telephone. COUNSEL SHALL CONTACT COURTCALL DIRECTLY TO ARRANGE FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/4/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting #34 Motion to Appear by Telephone. COUNSEL SHALL CONTACT COURTCALL DIRECTLY TO ARRANGE FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/4/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 4, 2018 Filing 48 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the Motion to Consolidate and Appointment of Lead Counsel on May 10, 2018 10:00 a.m. filed by Alex Sens. (Eggnatz, Joshua) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 4, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa M Williams (Williams, Alyssa) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 4, 2018 Filing 46 Proposed Order re #35 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Amended [Proposed] Order Granting Consolidation of Related Actions' Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Counsel, Plaintiffs' Executive Committee & Steering Committee by Robert Gilson(18-00216). (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 4, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Gayle Meryl Blatt (Blatt, Gayle) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 4, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at May 10, 2018 Hearing filed by Kenneth L. Buck, Carla Compagnone, Judith Dean, Judy Mills. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Seeger, Christopher) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 4, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by S. Clinton Woods (Woods, S. Clinton) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 4, 2018 Filing 42 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 3)Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to theNorthern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of April 4, 2018, and, with theconsent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Edward J. Davila. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 4, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Dearman (Dearman, Mark) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 4, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Samara Diner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blatt, Gayle) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 4, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd S. Garber (Garber, Todd) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases CORRECTION OF DOCKET #29 filed by John Solak. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 5/17/2018. Replies due by 5/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 37 Declaration of THOMAS V. GIRARDI IN SUPPORT OF COTCHETT, PITRE & McCARTHY, LLP and KAPLAN FOX'S LEAD COUNSEL APPLICATION filed byDakota Speas. (Steele, Alexandra) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 36 Declaration of Joseph W. Cotchett and Laurence D. King in Support of #35 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byRobert Gilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-40)(Related document(s) #35 ) (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Robert Gilson. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 5/8/2018. Replies due by 5/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Motions to Consolidate and to Appoint Lead Counsel Hearing filed by Romeo James Alba, Alain Liebermann. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Rosemary M. Rivas (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 32 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #29 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byJohn Solak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #29 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 31 Statement in Support of Joseph W. Cotchett and Laurence D. King by Brian Taylor. (Grubb, Archie) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Mark Davis, Brent Jones, Karen Palmer. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 5/17/2018. Replies due by 5/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William M. Audet, #2 Exhibit Ekhs. 1 & 9, #3 Proposed Order)(Audet, William) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 29 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see #38 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by John Solak. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 5/17/2018. Replies due by 5/24/2018. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/3/2018) Modified on 5/4/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Audet (Audet, William) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey Conrad Rushing (Rushing, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting #25 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Counsel Melissa R. Clark, Counsel for Plaintiffs' Allyson Werner & Judy Milman. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/2/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2018)
May 2, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12320731.) filed by Allyson Werner, Judy Milman. (Clark, Melissa) (Filed on 5/2/2018)
April 30, 2018 18-cv-02458-EJD Shaw et al v. Apple, Inc. et al was erroneously associated with the Apple MDL action. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018) Modified on 4/30/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Karin B Swope, Counsel for Plaintiff Margaret Wetherald. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/30/2018.(iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
April 27, 2018 Filing 23 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/25/2018, before Judge Edward J. Davila. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (18 in 5:18-md-02827-EJD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/26/2018. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
April 27, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12309354.) filed by Margaret Wetherald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Swope, Karin) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO.1. All filings shall be made in the master docket (No. 18-md-02827). Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/26/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (iym, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/27/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2018 Filing 20 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/25/2018 before Judge Edward J. Davila by Apple Inc., for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
April 26, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Armen Kiramijyan (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kiramijyan, Armen) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
April 26, 2018 Filing 18 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/25/18 before Judge Edward J. Davila by Nicole Gallmann, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
April 25, 2018 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward J. Davila: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/25/2018. Counsel will continue to meet and confer regarding the procedure for preservation of evidence. The Court continued to STAY request for injunctive relief until Lead Counsel is appointed. Motion for consolidation AND to Appoint Lead Counsel are due by 5/3/2018. Motions will be limited to 15 pages and no responses shall be filed per agreement of counsel. Motions to Consolidate AND to Appoint Lead Counsel Hearing SPECIAL SET for 5/10/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. The parties agreed to submit to the Court a list of 4 names for a potential discovery referee for the matter. The Court will in turn appoint a discovery referee. The parties agreed and Court ordered that a Consolidated Complaint shall be filed by 7/12/2018. The Court ordered the deadline for a Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/16/2018 by NOON; and SPECIAL SET a Further Case Management Conference for 7/18/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Total Time in Court:10:24-10:52am(28 Mins.) Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: See ATTACHMENT Attendance Sheet. Defendant Attorney: See ATTACHMENT Attendance Sheet. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/25/2018) (amkS, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RELATING CASES. The following cases are ordered related to In re Apple Inc. Device Performance Litigation, Case No. 18-md-02827-EJD: Liebermann et al. v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00110-EJD,Holman v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00125-EJD, Solak v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00123-EJD,Munro v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00128-EJD,Grillo v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00148-EJD,Diner v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00179-EJD,Littlefield et al. v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00182-EJD,Ferguson v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00206-EJD,Gilson v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00216-EJD,Banks et al. v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00241-EJD,Werner et al. v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00283-EJD,White v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00305-EJD,Neumann v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00324-EJD,Cunningham v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00338-EJD,Wetherald v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00371-EJD,Johnson v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00385-EJD,Jones, et al. v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00406-EJD,Bilic, et al. v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00449-EJD,Williams, et al. v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00440-EJD,Block v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00481-EJD,Canoa de Oliveira v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00735-EJD,Ford v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00760-EJD, Merenstein v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00771-EJD,Bond v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00833-EJD, Hawes v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-01339-EJD,Fung v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-01585-EJD,Yun v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-01632-EJD,Hogue v. Apple Inc., 18-cv-00910-EJD. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/25/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #14 Administrative Request to Appear Telephonically. COUNSEL SHALL CONTACT COURTCALL DIRECTLY TO ARRANGE FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/24/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
April 24, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for Case Management Conference on April 25, 2018 filed by Kenneth L. Buck, Carla Compagnone, Judith Dean, Judy Mills. (Seeger, Christopher) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
April 24, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra T Steele as Counsel for Dakota Speas (Steele, Alexandra) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
April 23, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Herkenhoff (Herkenhoff, Kathleen) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Administrative Request to Appear Telephonically. COUNSEL SHALL CONTACT COURTCALL DIRECTLY TO ARRANGE FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/23/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
April 20, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for Case Management Conference on April 25, 2018 filed by Peter A. Schroeder. (Miller, Vess) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #7 Administrative Request to Appear by Telephonically. COUNSEL SHALL CONTACT COURTCALL DIRECTLY TO ARRANGE FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/19/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #6 Administrative Request to Appear by Telephonically. COUNSEL SHALL CONTACT COURTCALL DIRECTLY TO ARRANGE FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/19/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 18, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #7 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Appear Telephonically a t Hearing filed by Melody Munro (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
April 18, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Telephone at Hearing filed by Melody Munro. Responses due by 4/23/2018. (Wagner, Avraham) (Filed on 4/18/2018) Modified on 4/18/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2018 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Appear by Telephone for Case Management Conference on April 25, 2018 filed by Robert Gilson. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
April 16, 2018 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-1)CERTIFIED - Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on MultidistrictLitigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to theNorthern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of April 4, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Edward J. Davila (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 13, 2018 Filing 4 Appendix re #3 Case Management Statement - Schedule of Related Actions filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
April 13, 2018 Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Jointly Filed) filed by Apple Inc.. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
April 6, 2018 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/13/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
April 5, 2018 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 5:18-md-2827 has been opened and assigned to Judge Edward J. Davila. Documents relating to all actions should be filed in the master docket sheet and in the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed in the master docket sheet, and in the docket sheets for each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed in the master docket sheet and in the docket sheet of that action. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
April 5, 2018 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER that the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the Northern District of California are transferred to the Northern District of California and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Edward J. Davila for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2018) Modified on 4/5/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Apple Inc. Device Performance Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc. Device Performance Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Theane Evangelis Kapur
Represented By: Timothy William Loose
Represented By: George Charles Nierlich, III
Represented By: Rachel S. Brass
Represented By: Christopher Chorba
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Theane Evangelis
Represented By: Mark W. Mosier
Represented By: Rafael Reyneri
Represented By: Beth S Brinkmann
Represented By: Winslow Taub
Represented By: Diana Michelle Feinstein
Represented By: Richard Joseph Doren
Represented By: Jason C Lo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beckie Erwin
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Varnell
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Patrice L. Bishop
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dae Won Kim
Represented By: Kyle J McGee
Represented By: Eli Greenstein
Represented By: Jay W. Eisenhofer
Represented By: Joseph H. Meltzer
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan David
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Roberts
Represented By: Mark A. Chavez
Represented By: Bryan L. Clobes
Represented By: Christopher Phillip Taylor Tourek
Represented By: Anthony Fata
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliezer Rabinovits
Represented By: Uri Seth Ottensoser
Represented By: Stephanie Mara Beige,
Represented By: Stanley David Bernstein
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Boykin
Represented By: David A. Straite
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Represented By: Ralph E. Labaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad White
Represented By: Larry Wayne Gabriel
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Mulligan
Represented By: Derek G. Howard
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Yelton
Represented By: Mark Cotton Molumphy
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drew Victory
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loren Haller
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Merola
Represented By: Daniel C. Levin
Represented By: David Michael Birka-White
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Schwartz
Represented By: Daniel C. Levin
Represented By: David Michael Birka-White
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Ciccone
Represented By: Patrice L. Bishop
Represented By: Gary S. Graifman
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Weintraub
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Patrice L. Bishop
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Pedelty
Represented By: Omar Tayseer Sulaiman
Represented By: James Constantine Vlahakis
Represented By: Mohammed Omar Badwan
Represented By: Nathan Charles Volheim
Represented By: Ahmad Tayseer Sulaiman
Represented By: Mohammed Omar Badwan,
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Shaske
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Patrice L. Bishop
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisa Gaudio
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Sullivan
Represented By: Robert Wesley Gifford
Represented By: Kenneth C Johnston
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Mosby
Represented By: Daniel C. Levin
Represented By: David Michael Birka-White
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Davis
Represented By: S. Clinton Woods
Represented By: Ling Yue Kuang
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Santucci
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Holman
Represented By: Timothy G. Blood
Represented By: Thomas Joseph O'Reardon, II
Represented By: Todd David Carpenter
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Greenshner
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Patrice L. Bishop
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Rutan
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Lowery
Represented By: Daniel C. Levin
Represented By: David Michael Birka-White
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burim Daci
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jackson
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brinley McGill
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Vlassich
Represented By: Mark A. Chavez
Represented By: Bryan L. Clobes
Represented By: Christopher Phillip Taylor Tourek
Represented By: Anthony Fata
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dakota Speas
Represented By: Colin M. Jones
Represented By: Alexandra T Steele
Represented By: B Bobby Saadian
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Aberman
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allyson Werner
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Represented By: Melissa Ryan Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Sanguedolce
Represented By: Daniel C. Levin
Represented By: David Michael Birka-White
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Browne
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Fahey
Represented By: Thomas C. Willcox
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yael Aburos
Represented By: Stephen F. Rosenthal
Represented By: Richard Brian Rosenthal
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Dean
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Johnson
Represented By: Daniel C. Levin
Represented By: David Michael Birka-White
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Jankowski
Represented By: Daniel C. Levin
Represented By: David Michael Birka-White
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Bond
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Sullivan
Represented By: Robert W. Gifford
Represented By: Robert Wesley Gifford
Represented By: Kenneth C Johnston
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Luna
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Patrice L. Bishop
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary P Simon
Represented By: Richard E. Shevitz
Represented By: Richard Brian Rosenthal
Represented By: Vess Allen Miller
Represented By: Lynn A Toops
Represented By: Irwin B. Levin
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Tanovan
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Praszkier
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Honigman
Represented By: Mark S. Reich
Represented By: Avital Orly Malina
Represented By: Samuel H. Rudman
Represented By: Mark Dearman
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aja Johnson
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Violetta Mailyan
Represented By: Hovsep Hovsepyan
Represented By: Armen Kiramijyan
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgiana D'Alessandro
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Connolly
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodie L. Kasun
Represented By: Dennis A. Mastando
Represented By: Eric James Artrip
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnjulee Ray
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Wetherald
Represented By: Eric Jason Fierro
Represented By: Karin Bornstein Swope
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Greenfield
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Taylor
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: Wilson F Green
Represented By: Archie I. Grubb, II
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brady Lankford
Represented By: Dennis A. Mastando
Represented By: Eric James Artrip
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Yashchuk
Represented By: Daniel C. Levin
Represented By: David Michael Birka-White
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikita Santino
Represented By: Bonner Charles Walsh
Represented By: Mark J. Geragos
Represented By: Joshua Nassir
Represented By: Benjamin Heikali
Represented By: Benjamin J. Meiselas
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Lazarus
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Mesloh
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trent Young
Represented By: Daniel C. Levin
Represented By: David Michael Birka-White
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melody Munro
Represented By: Avraham Noam Wagner
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Gautreaux
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Beauchan
Represented By: Daniel C. Levin
Represented By: David Michael Birka-White
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Represented By: Mark Cotton Molumphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Neilan
Represented By: Erich Paul Schork
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Represented By: Jeffrey Daniel Blake
Represented By: Aron David Robinson
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Henry
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Oliver
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patty Burriss
Represented By: Daniel C. Levin
Represented By: David Michael Birka-White
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Chapel
Represented By: Jason Barnes
Represented By: Jay Barnes
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilav Akrawy
Represented By: Kyle J McGee
Represented By: Eli Greenstein
Represented By: Jay W. Eisenhofer
Represented By: Joseph H. Meltzer
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Montgomery
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Patrice L. Bishop
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Ward
Represented By: Daniel C. Levin
Represented By: David Michael Birka-White
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Moriello
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. Kevin Fahey
Represented By: Thomas C. Willcox
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Johnson
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Patrice L. Bishop
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Young
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Sullivan
Represented By: Robert Wesley Gifford
Represented By: Kenneth C Johnston
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristopher Kingston
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Antonucci
Represented By: Daniel C. Levin
Represented By: David Michael Birka-White
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Shapiro
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aniledis Batista
Represented By: Nathan Michael Smith
Represented By: Todd S. Garber
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Bilic
Represented By: Mark A. Chavez
Represented By: Bryan L. Clobes
Represented By: Christopher Phillip Taylor Tourek
Represented By: Anthony Fata
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Griffin
Represented By: Mark A. Chavez
Represented By: Bryan L. Clobes
Represented By: Christopher Phillip Taylor Tourek
Represented By: Anthony Fata
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Saadiq
Represented By: Daniel C. Levin
Represented By: David Michael Birka-White
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Childs
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenifer Kachik
Represented By: Daniel C. Levin
Represented By: David Michael Birka-White
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Youngro Lee
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter A. Schroeder
Represented By: Richard E. Shevitz
Represented By: Vess Allen Miller
Represented By: Lynn A Toops
Represented By: Irwin B. Levin
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiona M. Cunningham
Represented By: Mark Dearman
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P Webb
Represented By: R Alexander Saveri
Represented By: Anjalee Meren Behti
Represented By: Sarah Jane Van Culin
Represented By: Geoffrey Conrad Rushing
Represented By: Cadio R. Zirpoli
Represented By: Randall Robinson Renick
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Brodsky
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamica Gordon
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth L. Buck
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Ciccone
Represented By: Patrice L. Bishop
Represented By: Gary S. Graifman
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keaton Harvey
Represented By: Jeffrey Louis Fazio
Represented By: Dina Elizabeth Micheletti
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Gilson
Represented By: David A. Straite
Represented By: Stephanie Biehl
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Represented By: Mark Cotton Molumphy
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Elle D. Lewis
Represented By: Mark Dearman
Represented By: Brian Danitz
Represented By: Gina Stassi
Represented By: Tyson Carl Redenbarger
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan McDonald
Represented By: James O. Latturner
Represented By: Emiliya Gumin Farbstein
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Represented By: Cathleen M. Combs
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Fung
Represented By: Sean Tamura-Sato
Represented By: Lisa P Mak
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Littlefied
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Toth
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Henderson
Represented By: Mark A. Chavez
Represented By: Bryan L. Clobes
Represented By: Christopher Phillip Taylor Tourek
Represented By: Anthony Fata
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raisa Drantivy
Represented By: Matthew Edward Donahue
Represented By: Gregg A Pinto
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Merenstein
Represented By: Robert M. Foote
Represented By: Aaron Michael Olsen
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Herkenhoff
Represented By: Amber L. Eck
Represented By: Alreen Haeggquist
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carter Donahoe
Represented By: James S. Wertheim,
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neill McInnis
Represented By: Robert Wesley Gifford
Represented By: Kenneth C Johnston
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ala Abdulla
Represented By: Omar Tayseer Sulaiman
Represented By: James Constantine Vlahakis
Represented By: Mohammed Omar Badwan
Represented By: Nathan Charles Volheim
Represented By: Ahmad Tayseer Sulaiman
Represented By: Mohammed Omar Badwan,
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Stenstrom
Represented By: Douglas James McNamara
Represented By: Sally Mae Handmaker
Represented By: Joshua Jacob Bloomfield
Represented By: David K. Stein
Represented By: Andrew N. Friedman
Represented By: Eric H. Gibbs
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Davis
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Sokol
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Schulze
Represented By: Daniel C. Levin
Represented By: David Michael Birka-White
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Stone
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Baldwin
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Represented By: Mark Cotton Molumphy
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Schell
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Stanford
Represented By: Kenneth Craig Johnston
Represented By: Robert Wesley Gifford
Represented By: Kenneth C Johnston
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Brown
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Patrice L. Bishop
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Stacy
Represented By: Daniel C. Levin
Represented By: David Michael Birka-White
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Dubianskii
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurelia Flores
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Miller
Represented By: Kenneth Craig Johnston
Represented By: Robert Wesley Gifford
Represented By: Kenneth C Johnston
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Borstelmann
Represented By: Anthony Gerard Simon
Represented By: Richard I Woolf
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caren Schmidt
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Ford
Represented By: Jason A Hobson
Represented By: Rafael Bernardino, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Kierstead
Represented By: Peter Wasylyk
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Schlaefer
Represented By: Daniel C. Levin
Represented By: David Michael Birka-White
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaixuan Ni
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Brand
Represented By: Aaron Cole Mayer
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Hosking
Represented By: Aaron Cole Mayer
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noelle Boehme
Represented By: Daniel C. Levin
Represented By: David Michael Birka-White
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geoffrey Schlottman
Represented By: Mark A. Chavez
Represented By: Bryan L. Clobes
Represented By: Christopher Phillip Taylor Tourek
Represented By: Anthony Fata
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Klingman
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shiriam Torres
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Ratner
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi Johnson
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliana Caceres
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick DeFellippo
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Edgerly
Represented By: Daniel C. Levin
Represented By: David Michael Birka-White
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Rodriguez
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Mark Cotton Molumphy
Represented By: Noah Benjamin Novogrodsky
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gye Soon Yun
Represented By: Kyle J McGee
Represented By: Eli Greenstein
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Represented By: Mark Cotton Molumphy
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Jay W. Eisenhofer
Represented By: Joseph H. Meltzer
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Hawes
Represented By: Bradley Keith King
Represented By: Tina Wolfson
Represented By: Robert Ahdoot
Represented By: Theodore Walter Maya
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Neumann
Represented By: Andrew Daniel Weaver
Represented By: Mark G. Griffin
Represented By: Scott Edward Cole
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irwin Darack
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quinn Lewis
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Milman
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Represented By: David E. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisha Boykin
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdul Mohammed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samara Diner
Represented By: Alyssa M Williams
Represented By: Gayle Meryl Blatt
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Bakke
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Represented By: Mark Cotton Molumphy
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli Beaugez
Represented By: Douglas James McNamara
Represented By: Sally Mae Handmaker
Represented By: Joshua Jacob Bloomfield
Represented By: David K. Stein
Represented By: Andrew N. Friedman
Represented By: Eric H. Gibbs
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenyotta Smith
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guilherme Rafael Canoa de Oliveira
Represented By: Kyle J McGee
Represented By: Eli Greenstein
Represented By: Jay W. Eisenhofer
Represented By: Joseph H. Meltzer
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Farris
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Mangano
Represented By: Omar Tayseer Sulaiman
Represented By: James Constantine Vlahakis
Represented By: Mohammed Omar Badwan
Represented By: Nathan Charles Volheim
Represented By: Ahmad Tayseer Sulaiman
Represented By: Mohammed Omar Badwan,
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliot Rosen
Represented By: Mark A. Chavez
Represented By: Bryan L. Clobes
Represented By: Christopher Phillip Taylor Tourek
Represented By: Anthony Fata
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Gail Diamond
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Pethick
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arisa Wakabayashi
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Homonoff
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Patrice L. Bishop
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Mills
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Banks
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Patrice L. Bishop
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Block
Represented By: Marc A. Wites
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Jones
Represented By: S. Clinton Woods
Represented By: Ling Yue Kuang
Represented By: William M. Audet
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daphne Bowels Rodriguez
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web |