Webster v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Christopher Webster
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 3:2008cv00189
Filed: February 8, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 16 Motion for Summary Judgment: The Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation WITH MODIFICATIONS; GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTS IN PART AND DENI ES IN PART Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; and REMANDS this case pursuant to the fourth sentence of 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/16/09. (Order sent to Social Security)(asw (av1). Modified on 9/22/2009 to clarify text (asw).
August 21, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - Recommending granting in part and denying in party Plaintiff's [14-3] Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendant's 16 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. Objections to R&R due by 9/4/2009. Any reply to the objections shall be filed and served no later than 10 days after being served with the objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 8/21/09. (asw) (kaj).
February 8, 2008 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Presently before the Court is Plaintiffs Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 2 . Plaintiff filed a declaration in support of his motion. Having reviewed Plaintiffs declaration, the Court finds that he has no available funds from which to pay filing fees at this time. Therefore, the Court grants Plaintiffs Motion to Proceed IFP 2 . Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 02/08/08. (joeh) (av1, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webster v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Webster
Represented By: Thomas Garrett Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?