Marshall v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Deborah L. Marshall
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 3:2008cv01735
Filed: September 23, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; Granting in Part 13 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, Denying 18 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, and Reversing and Remanding Action for Further Administrative Proceedings. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/10/2010.(mjj) Modified on 3/10/2010 - Certified copy sent to SSA via U.S. Mail Service (mjj). (mam).
February 8, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Deborah L. Marshall, 18 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Michael J. Astrue: Recommending the Court GRANT IN PART Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment, DENY the Commissioners cross-motion for summary judgment and REMAND this action for further administrative proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 2/22/2010 Replies due by 3/8/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 2/8/2010.(mjj) (jrl).
December 1, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Order to Show Cause: On 12/1/2009 an order to show cause hearing was held. No later than December 14, 2009 Plaintiff shall file either a dismissal or a motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff shall forthwith contact the chambers of the Hon. William McCurine Jr. to schedule a case management conference to address the ongoing settlement negotiations and set a new briefing schedule on cross-motions for summary judgment on an expedited basis. If Plaintiff does not file either a dismissal or a summary judgment motion on or before December 14, 2009, this action will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 12/1/2009. (mjj) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah L. Marshall
Represented By: Thomas Garrett Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?