Throop v. Secretary of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Edward Anthony Throop
Defendant: Secretary of Corrections, Larry Scribner, Mark Bourland, Tim Ochoa, Gary Stratton, Manuel Tamayo, J. Gentry, J. Tyree, R. Parrilla, R Nelson, Jr., Everett Fischer, Kevin Shomura, M Ruff and DOES
Case Number: 3:2008cv02109
Filed: November 12, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2012 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 82 Motion for a Stay of Action. It is hereby ordered that Plaintiff's Motion for Stay is Denied to the extent it requires an indefinite stay of the entire action pending the outcome of Plaintiff' ;s Appeal in the Throop v. Woodford case. Plaintiff's Motion for Stay is granted to the extent it requests a limited stay so his case can be evaluated by Prison Focus. Plaintiff shall file a serve a status report advising the Court whether Priso n Focus has completed its evaluation of Plaintiff's case by 7/6/2012. All of the pre-trial dates and deadlines set in the 12/22/2011 Order are vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 522/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
April 4, 2011 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 65 Request for Appointment of Counsel. Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel is Denied without prejudice for failure to demonstrate exceptional circumstances. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 4/4/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
August 27, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons stated herein, the Court grants in part and denies in part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff 9;s retaliation claim against Defendants Scribner and Ochoa are permitted to proceed, however, the Court Dismisses all other claims. Plaintiff is Granted forty-five days leave from the date this Order is "Filed" in which to file a Second Am ended Complaint which cures all the deficiencies of pleading stated herein. Further, if Plaintiff's Amended Complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, it may be dismissed without further leave to amend. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 8/27/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Throop v. Secretary of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Anthony Throop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Scribner
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Bourland
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Ochoa
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Stratton
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Tamayo
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Gentry
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Tyree
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Parrilla
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Nelson, Jr.
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everett Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Shomura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Ruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?