Dahilig v. Napolitano et al

Petitioner: Eduardo Dahilig
Respondent: Janet Napolitano, Eric Holder, Robin Baker and Robert Rillamas
Case Number: 3:2009cv00632
Filed: April 6, 2009
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainees Office
County: Imperial
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is denied Under 28 USC 2241.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
March 24, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 14 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/24/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh) (kaj).
August 13, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Govt's 9 Ex Parte Motion to Hold Proceedings in Abeyance. Proceedings are held in abeyance and Govt shall file a status report by 9/14/2009. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/13/2009. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah) (jrl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dahilig v. Napolitano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eduardo Dahilig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Janet Napolitano
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric Holder
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robin Baker
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Rillamas
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?