Sandoval-Vela v. Napolitano et al

Petitioner: Eduardo Sandoval-Vela
Respondent: Janet Napolitano, Eric Holder, Robin F Baker and Eric Noonan
Case Number: 3:2010cv00059
Filed: January 8, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Petitioner's 19 Emergency Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal. Court's 18 Order of 1/26/2010 shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 1/29/2010. (jah) Modified on 1/29/2010 to correct docket text, order denies motion (ag). (jrl).
January 26, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Petitioner's 2 Ex Parte Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Because Court concludes that Petitioner is still in custody for purposes of Section 2241, or is subject to "collateral consequences" of the prior detention, Co urt declines to to dismiss the petition as moot. Court dissolves the TRO entered on 1/8/2010. Court stays any further proceeding on the merits in this case pending resolution of Petitioner's administrative appeal to the Administrative Appeals Office. Court refers matter to Magistrate Judge Brooks to determine the scope and timing of any discovery necessary to address the derivative citizenship issue. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 1/26/2010. (jah) (jrl).
January 8, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 ex parte application for Temporary Restraining Order, to show cause why preliminary injunction should not be issued, denying as moot 3 motion to consolidate cases or alternatively for assignment under the low number rule; the Tem porary Restraining Order is effective immediately; the Court sets Friday, January 22, 2010 at 2:00pm as the hearing on Petitioner's request for a Preliminary Injunction; the Court also orders Petitioner to serve this Order to Show Cause and supp orting papers on Respondents no later than Friday, January 8, 2010 at 5:00pm; Any response or opposition to this Order to Show Cause must be filed and personally served on Petitioner's counsel no later than Friday, January 15, 2010. Petitioner may file a reply and serve it upon Respondents no later than Wednesday, January 20, 2010 at 12:00pm. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 1/8/10. (kaj) Modified on 1/8/2010 certified copy to USM (kaj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandoval-Vela v. Napolitano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eduardo Sandoval-Vela
Represented By: Janet Tung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Janet Napolitano
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric Holder
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robin F Baker
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric Noonan
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?