Talley v. Neotti et al

Plaintiff: Perry Talley
Defendant: George Neotti, S Pauley, Ratherfur and J Walker
Case Number: 3:2010cv00426
Filed: February 23, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing U.S. Marshal to effect service of Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 4(c)(3) & 28 U.S.C. § 1915(d). (USM service package sent) Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/6/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
May 19, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Judgment Entered on October 25, 2010 Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.60(b) and Granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint must be received by the Court no later than Monday, June 27, 2011. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 5/19/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Mailed Plaintiff a Court approved Form § 1983 Civil Rights Complaint. )(jer)
August 3, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILING TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO 28USC§§ 1915(e)(2)(B) & 1915A(b). Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. However, Plaintiff is granted sixty (60) days leave from the date this Order is "Filed" in which to file a Second Amended Complaint. If Plaintiff fails to file a Second Amended Complaint within this time frame, the Court will issue an Order dismissing this action and entering a final judgment for the Defendants. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 8/2/10. (Mailed a copy of this order as well as a form § 1983 complaint to Plaintiff.)(jer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Talley v. Neotti et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Neotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Pauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ratherfur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?