Adams v. Arab et al

Plaintiff: Paul Adams
Defendant: Arab, Al Lopez, K Ball, D Hjerpe, J Walker, Larry Small, State of California, United States and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv00706
Filed: April 1, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2012 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) denying 61 Motion for Leave to Appeal and (2) granting 63 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint: Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint on or before 4/20/12. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 3/20/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
January 10, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion to Serve Summons Upon Alternate Defendants ; denying 17 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting 17 Motion to Obtain Defendants' Addresses to Provide to the US Marshals; denying 19 Motion for Default Judgment. The Cou rt grants Plaintiff's motion to the extent it requests the USMS to obtain a forwarding address for Defendant Small and to attempt to effect service on this Defendant at his forwarding address. The Court therefore directs the USMS to attempt to o btain the confidential address of Defendant Small pursuant to the directions set forth above. Following the receipt of any available address for Defendant Small, the Court Orders the USMS to serve a copy of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint an d summons upon this Defendant. All costs of service shall be advanced by the United States pursuant to the Courts Order granting Plaintiff leave to proceed IFP and directing service pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(d) and FED.R.CIV.P. 4(c)(3). Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 1/10/2011. (cc: USM) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
July 30, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing Defendants State of California and United States pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2) and 1915A(b) and directing USM to effect service of Amended Complaint pursuant to FRCP 4(c)(3) and 28 USC 1915(d). Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 7/30/2010; IFP package mailed 8/2/2010(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl)
May 6, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying as moot 3 Motion for Court to Serve Summons Upon the Defendants; and Dismissing Complaint Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2) & 1915A(b). It is ordered that Plainti ff's claims for monetary damages against the State of California are dismissed with prejudice. The remainder of Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is granted 45 days leave from the date this order is filed to file a First Amended Complaint.. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 5/6/2010. (Order electronically transmitted to Matthew Cate, Secretary CDCR) (1983 Form mailed to Plaintiff) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh) (av1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Arab et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Hjerpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?